Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 145 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 3658 Week
» 23951 Month
» 201855 Year
» 1867231 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Merthyr Tydfil


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/11/1945 8736 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1949 5793 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/05/1950 5603 Transfer in from: CED Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/08/1950 5603 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/08/1950 5655 Transfer in from: 18 Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/08/1950 5603 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/09/1950 5623 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/09/1950 5635 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5603 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5635 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5659 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5661 Transfer in from: 58 Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5672 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 6627 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5603 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5623 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1950 5635 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1950 1629 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1950 5603 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1950 5659 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1950 5661 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1950 5603 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1950 5659 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1950 5661 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1950 4690 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 5603 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 16xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1950 1629 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1950 5603 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/01/1951 5659 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/01/1951 5660 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/01/1951 5659 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/02/1951 5660 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/02/1951 5660 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 19/05/1951 4630 Transfer in from: CED Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT on 31/05/1951 8471 1st Allocation        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1951 5666 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 30/06/1951 8465 Transfer in from: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 30/06/1951 8471 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 30/06/1951 8471 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 31/07/1951 5672 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 31/07/1951 5672 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1951 4143 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/12/1951 4152 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/01/1952 5661 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/01/1952 5661 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/01/1952 8471 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/02/1952 379 Transfer in from:        
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/02/1952 393 Transfer in from:        
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/02/1952 8465 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/03/1952 5666 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/03/1952 5672 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/03/1952 5666 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 31/03/1952 5672 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 17/05/1952 4616 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 5617 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 5655 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 5666 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 5672 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 5655 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 5666 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 5672 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 30/06/1952 4684 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1952 5617 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1952 5655 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1952 5666 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1952 5617 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1952 5655 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 30/06/1952 5666 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 2w/e 12/07/1952 4684 Transfer out to: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1952 5672 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1952 5672 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 5671 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4101 Transfer in from: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4160 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4161 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4163 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 4164 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 5195 Transfer in from: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1953 6433 Transfer in from: CHYS Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1953 6435 Transfer in from:        
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/10/1953 6436 Transfer in from:        
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 379 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 393 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 5660 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/10/1953 6627 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/12/1953 4162 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/12/1953 5195 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1954 5660 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1954 5617 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/05/1954 378 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/06/1954 376 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 14/08/1954 5793 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/10/1954 9747 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/12/1954 5615 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/12/1954 5681 Transfer in from:        
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/12/1954 378 Transfer out to: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam A 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/01/1955 376 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 16/07/1955 5659 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 13/08/1955 6606 Transfer in from: 85C Hereford    
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 13/08/1955 9451 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 4101 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 5650 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 03/12/1955 6436 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/12/1955 6436 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1956 5632 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/02/1956 5632 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 24/03/1956 6423 Transfer in from:        
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/04/1956 6435 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 14/07/1956 6427 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 5677 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 6606 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1957 5626 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 26/01/1957 5728 Transfer in from: 126 Pontypool Road    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 23/02/1957 6416 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1958 3681 Transfer in from: 88B Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 22/02/1958 5728 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1958 4161 Transfer out to: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1958 4162 Transfer out to: 84E Tyseley    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 19/04/1958 6416 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 5630 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 5670 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4143 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4152 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4160 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4163 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 5101 2-6-2T 4w/e 17/05/1958 4164 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/06/1958 4616 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT m/e 08/1958 6423 Condemned      
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT m/e 08/1958 6427 Condemned      
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/08/1958 6416 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 5615 Transfer out to: 88A Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/11/1958 9631 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/11/1958 9679 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 9676 Transfer in from:        
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 29/11/1958 9776 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 24/01/1959 5636 Transfer in from: 88A Cardiff Cathays    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 21/02/1959 8736 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 11/03/1959 4630 Transfer out to: 73H Dover Marine    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 18/04/1959 4632 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1959 5622 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 31/10/1959 3681 Transfer out to: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/12/1959 5670 Transfer out to: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 5610 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 5660 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 5671 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 5674 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 5660 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/01/1960 5671 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 5681 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 5636 Transfer out to: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/03/1960 5681 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 13/08/1960 5618 Transfer in from: 88A Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5603 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5605 Transfer in from: RHY Rhymney    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5610 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5618 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5622 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5636 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5650 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5652 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5655 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5660 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5662 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5666 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5671 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5672 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5674 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5681 Transfer in from: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5696 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5603 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5610 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5618 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5622 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5630 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5635 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5650 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5655 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5660 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5666 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5671 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5672 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5674 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/01/1961 5681 Transfer out to: 88D Merthyr Tydfil    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/05/1961 6629 Transfer in from: 86H Aberbeeg    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1961 5674 Transfer out to: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 01/1962 4632 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1962 5636 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/06/1962 8723 Transfer in from: 16 Aberbeeg    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/06/1962 6436 Transfer out to: 88H Tondu    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 07/1962 5661 Condemned      
Steam 94xx 0-6-0PT m/e 07/1962 9451 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 09/1962 5652 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 6658 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1962 5677 Transfer out to: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T on 22/10/1962 6629 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1962 5677 Transfer in from: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1962 5687 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 15/12/1962 5672 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 12/01/1963 9747 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 8723 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/02/1963 6433 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/03/1963 4635 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/03/1963 6613 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 09/03/1963 8723 Transfer in from: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/05/1963 6613 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 04/05/1963 8723 Transfer out to: 88J Aberdare    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1963 5622 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1963 5650 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/06/1963 5615 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/06/1963 5651 Transfer in from: 88B Radyr    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 6612 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/06/1963 6685 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 07/1963 5615 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 07/1963 5666 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 6608 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 27/07/1963 6613 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 64xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1963 6416 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1963 4690 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1963 6655 Transfer in from: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 02/11/1963 9649 Transfer in from: TDU Tondu    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 02/11/1963 6613 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 3690 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 30/11/1963 3707 Transfer in from: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5602 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 30/11/1963 5621 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 12/1963 5610 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 12/1963 5626 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 12/1963 5687 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 5609 Transfer in from: 87D Swansea East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 28/12/1963 5670 Transfer in from: 87B Duffryn Yard    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 01/1964 5671 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1964 6686 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 25/01/1964 6691 Transfer in from:        
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 04/1964 6686 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 6w/e 13/04/1964 6685 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 3w/e 04/05/1964 6622 Transfer in from: ABDR Aberdare    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT on 17/05/1964 4635 Transfer out to: 2A Tyseley    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT on 17/05/1964 9776 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1964 6608 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 5659 Transfer in from: 88F Treherbert    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 7w/e 22/06/1964 5605 Transfer out to: 88E Abercynon    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 4w/e 20/07/1964 5602 Transfer out to: 88B Radyr    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/1964 3707 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 09/1964 5603 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 10/1964 5609 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 10/1964 5660 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 10/1964 5670 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 4675 Transfer in from: 88C Barry    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 6w/e 12/10/1964 9676 Transfer out to: 88A Cardiff East Dock    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 11/1964 5662 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 11/1964 9679 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 3690 Transfer out to: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 4675 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 08/11/1964 5677 Transfer out to: 88D Rhymney    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 9631 Transfer out to: 87A Neath (Court Sart)    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT w/e 08/11/1964 9649 Transfer out to: 86B Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T w/e 15/11/1964 6658 Transfer out to: 88D Rhymney    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 12/1964 5651 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 12/1964 6622 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 03/1965 5618 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 03/1965 6655 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T 2w/e 11/04/1965 6691 Transfer out to: 87F Llanelly    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T on 25/04/1965 5659 Transfer out to: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1965 5681 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1965 5696 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 05/1965 6612 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1965 5621 Condemned      
Steam 56xx 0-6-2T m/e 06/1965 5655 Condemned