Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 259 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1167 Week
» 12312 Month
» 112097 Year
» 1777473 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bangor


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1940 2980 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1940 2980 Transfer in from: 7B Bangor    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1940 2980 Transfer out to: 7B Bangor    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 20/04/1940 2984 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 20/07/1940 2980 Transfer in from: 7B Bangor    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 20/07/1940 2980 Transfer out to: 7B Bangor    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 17/08/1940 2948 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1940 2951 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1940 2952 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1940 2954 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/01/1941 2952 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/01/1941 2980 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/10/1941 2951 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 03/10/1942 2951 Transfer in from: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/06/1943 2954 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 20/05/1944 2945 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 08/07/1944 2945 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 18/11/1944 2962 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/12/1944 2962 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1946 27602 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 1200 Snapshot 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 1201 Snapshot 5A Crewe North    
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12176 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12230 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 124 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12407 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 133 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2258 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2259 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2260 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2261 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2460 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2628 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4305 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4445 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 6643 Snapshot        
Steam 1560 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 6926 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 72 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 73 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 83 Snapshot        
Steam 1560 0-6-2T on 14/02/1948 6926 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 28/05/1949 42947 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/06/1949 2951 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/06/1949 42947 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/06/1949 42948 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/06/1949 42984 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 07/1949 41200 Transfer out to: IPS Ipswich    
Steam 11 0-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 12269 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 45417 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 4913 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 5144 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 42156 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 42157 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 2w/e 17/06/1950 42588 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 2w/e 17/06/1950 40072 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 2w/e 17/06/1950 40073 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 40124 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/11/1950 42677 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 27/01/1951 42677 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 27/01/1951 46643 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 27/01/1951 52407 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 41287 Transfer in from: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 46430 Transfer in from: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 27/10/1951 52176 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 46430 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 4w/e 29/02/1952 58888 Transfer out to: 86K Abergavenny    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 41230 Transfer in from: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 45255 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 3w/e 17/05/1952 41201 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52162 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40132 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 41239 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1952 42234 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1952 42455 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 46701 Transfer in from: 7D Rhyl    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 58375 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45255 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 41324 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1952 42663 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1952 40132 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1952 42234 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 29/11/1952 42663 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T w/e 28/02/1953 46701 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 52162 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 11/07/1953 40102 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 11/07/1953 42444 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 8w/e 11/07/1953 46604 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 11/07/1953 41324 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 41212 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 41239 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/01/1954 42628 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 02/01/1954 46604 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 4w/e 02/01/1954 58375 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 41324 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 27/03/1954 41287 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 17/04/1954 42258 Transfer out to: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 17/04/1954 42259 Transfer out to: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 17/04/1954 42260 Transfer out to: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 17/04/1954 42261 Transfer out to: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/04/1954 41215 Transfer in from: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42415 Transfer in from: 27B Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42416 Transfer in from: 27B Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42417 Transfer in from: 27B Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42418 Transfer in from: 27B Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 41239 Transfer in from: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 19/06/1954 42178 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 58394 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 41215 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/07/1954 42233 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 40102 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/10/1954 42233 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41320 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41321 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41322 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41323 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41212 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41230 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1955 41230 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 41320 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 41322 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 16/07/1955 40122 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 16/07/1955 41233 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 16/07/1955 41323 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 16/07/1955 42662 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 16/07/1955 41321 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 16/07/1955 41323 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Cauliflowers 0-6-0 w/e 06/08/1955 58394 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/10/1955 42662 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 40003 Transfer in from: 2C Warwick    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 40043 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 40085 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 41323 Transfer out to: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/11/1955 41324 Transfer out to: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 05/11/1955 42178 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 03/12/1955 42566 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/12/1955 40043 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST 4w/e 28/01/1956 51221 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/01/1956 42566 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/04/1956 41323 Transfer in from: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/04/1956 41324 Transfer in from: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 16/06/1956 42453 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 41323 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 16/06/1956 41324 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/08/1956 42421 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 898 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 52551 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 40085 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 40122 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1956 41234 Transfer in from: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80087 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80088 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80089 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80090 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80091 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80092 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80094 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80095 Transfer in from: 14C St Albans    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42156 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42157 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42417 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42418 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42421 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42444 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42453 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42455 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42460 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42588 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 898 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 52551 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 40132 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 45271 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 45271 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1956 80092 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1957 41220 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/01/1957 80092 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 75010 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 75012 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 75031 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41220 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42426 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42430 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42478 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42611 Transfer in from: 5E Alsager    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 4w/e 10/08/1957 47006 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 75032 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 75035 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/08/1957 40003 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42415 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42416 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 75010 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 75012 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 75031 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 05/10/1957 40136 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 75034 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/11/1957 47511 Transfer in from: 13B Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/11/1957 47558 Transfer in from: 13B Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 78057 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 52230 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 52269 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 75032 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 75034 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 75035 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 80091 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 80092 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42426 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42430 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/02/1958 40185 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/05/1958 80059 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42482 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42494 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42586 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42604 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42627 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/06/1958 40083 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST 4w/e 14/06/1958 51221 Transfer out to: 82E Bristol Barrow Road    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1958 40071 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1958 42538 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42478 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42482 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42494 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42538 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42586 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42604 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42611 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42627 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 80059 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 29/11/1958 47006 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 13/12/1958 80090 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42425 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42487 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42489 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42544 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42562 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42567 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42601 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42674 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1959 47267 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44305 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44445 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 25/07/1959 41237 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 25/07/1959 41244 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/07/1959 42235 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/07/1959 42594 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/09/1959 42235 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/09/1959 42594 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/10/1959 40185 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 17/10/1959 80094 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 17/10/1959 80095 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44075 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44355 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 78058 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 78059 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47558 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/11/1959 42425 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 28/11/1959 42562 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 78057 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42074 Transfer in from: 73H Dover Marine    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42075 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42076 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42425 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42674 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1959 42074 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1959 42075 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1959 42076 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1959 42567 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1959 42601 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80087 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80088 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80089 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/01/1960 42074 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/01/1960 42075 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/01/1960 44504 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/01/1960 42562 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/02/1960 42567 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/02/1960 44355 Transfer out to: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/04/1960 45429 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/04/1960 40076 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/04/1960 40078 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45225 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45247 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45302 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45345 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/06/1960 42567 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/06/1960 42601 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/06/1960 42567 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/06/1960 44075 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/06/1960 44504 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/06/1960 42674 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/06/1960 40081 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42247 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42270 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42416 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45429 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 02/07/1960 41244 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/07/1960 42069 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/07/1960 42081 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/07/1960 42576 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/07/1960 42579 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/07/1960 41230 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/07/1960 41237 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 16/07/1960 41239 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/08/1960 42431 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/08/1960 42482 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/08/1960 42247 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/08/1960 42270 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42446 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42416 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42431 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42482 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 44504 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 44493 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45429 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45438 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46447 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 17/09/1960 40081 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42081 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42425 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42562 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42576 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42579 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/09/1960 42674 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/02/1961 42074 Transfer out to: 65C Parkhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/03/1961 45302 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 45302 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 45438 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/05/1961 42075 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/06/1961 40110 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/06/1961 40205 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 44493 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42077 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42078 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42211 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42454 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42579 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42599 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/07/1961 42615 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/07/1961 42101 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/07/1961 42585 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/07/1961 42611 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/07/1961 42616 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 15/07/1961 40116 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 44478 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 78034 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 40110 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42069 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42077 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42078 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42101 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42454 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42544 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42585 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42599 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42611 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42615 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42616 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45225 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45302 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45429 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46447 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 20/10/1961 40076 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/10/1961 40132 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/10/1961 40133 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/10/1961 40136 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/11/1961 42074 Transfer in from: 65C Parkhead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 09/12/1961 41219 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/12/1961 40071 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 06/01/1962 40173 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 31/03/1962 41219 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 07/04/1962 41226 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42353 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/06/1962 42381 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 17/06/1962 42579 Transfer out to: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42061 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42198 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42309 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45412 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45413 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 75050 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/06/1962 42075 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/06/1962 42076 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/06/1962 42282 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/06/1962 42283 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/06/1962 42368 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 21/07/1962 40173 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 75050 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 45412 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 45413 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/11/1962 40116 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/11/1962 40205 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/12/1962 42381 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 01/12/1962 40078 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/12/1962 42211 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/12/1962 42061 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1963 46442 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 44821 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 45223 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 78003 Transfer in from: 89C Machynlleth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 45144 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 45417 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 78034 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42209 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42482 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 75018 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 75036 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 75035 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 75036 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/07/1963 47267 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/07/1963 42482 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 07/09/1963 78032 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 07/09/1963 42487 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75018 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 10/1963 44504 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/10/1963 42075 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/10/1963 42309 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/11/1963 42198 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/11/1963 42353 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/11/1963 42368 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/11/1963 42446 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/11/1963 42567 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/11/1963 42601 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/12/1963 42446 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/12/1963 44310 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/01/1964 42076 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 01/02/1964 42283 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 01/02/1964 46442 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/04/1964 47511 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 25/04/1964 78059 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 25/04/1964 42446 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/06/1964 42283 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 41204 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 41241 Transfer in from: 2M Wellington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42104 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42251 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42267 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42478 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42488 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42606 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45145 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45298 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 82021 Transfer in from: 89C Machynlleth    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 82031 Transfer in from: 89C Machynlleth    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/06/1964 82033 Transfer in from: 89C Machynlleth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 27/06/1964 80102 Transfer in from: 89A Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 27/06/1964 82032 Transfer in from: 89A Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 27/06/1964 82021 Transfer out to: 6F Machynlleth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/07/1964 42075 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 25/07/1964 41204 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 25/07/1964 41241 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/08/1964 42104 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1964 80102 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/09/1964 41226 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 19/09/1964 42282 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/10/1964 42104 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 31/10/1964 78059 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42075 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42104 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42209 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42478 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1964 42488 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/11/1964 42489 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 44478 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/01/1965 44310 Transfer out to: 10G Skipton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 23/01/1965 80131 Transfer in from: 89D Oswestry    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 23/01/1965 80132 Transfer in from: 89D Oswestry    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1965 42209 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1965 42478 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 06/02/1965 42209 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 06/02/1965 42478 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/02/1965 42488 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 13/02/1965 42488 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 03/04/1965 82031 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/04/1965 44913 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/04/1965 45247 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 01/05/1965 80132 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 01/05/1965 82033 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T on 01/05/1965 82032 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 08/05/1965 80131 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/05/1965 42075 Transfer in from: 2J Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 22/05/1965 42075 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/06/1965 42074 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/06/1965 42251 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/06/1965 42267 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/06/1965 42283 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/06/1965 42606 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/06/1965 41233 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/06/1965 41234 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 44821 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45145 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45223 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45298 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45345 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 78003 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 78032 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 78058 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 78059 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 75035 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke