Depot: New England
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1902 | 404 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1903 | 420 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1903 | 424 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1903 | 423 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1903 | 422 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1903 | 426 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1903 | 427 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1903 | 429 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1903 | 430 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 10/1903 | 431 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1904 | 432 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1904 | 434 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1904 | 435 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1904 | 440 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1905 | 255 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1905 | 256 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1905 | 987 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1905 | 988 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1906 | 441 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1907 | 442 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1909 | 446 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1909 | 447 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1912 | 255 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1912 | 255 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1912 | 256 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1912 | 256 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1912 | 987 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1912 | 987 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1912 | 988 | Snapshot | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1913 | 1636 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1913 | 1637 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1913 | 456 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1913 | 457 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1914 | 458 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 01/1914 | 459 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 02/1914 | 460 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1914 | 1643 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 04/1914 | 1644 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1914 | 1646 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1914 | 1647 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1918 | 461 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1918 | 1660 | 1st Allocation | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1918 | 1661 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1918 | 1662 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1918 | 1663 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1918 | 1664 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1918 | 1665 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 04/1919 | 462 | 1st Allocation | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 04/1919 | 463 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1919 | 465 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 05/1919 | 466 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1919 | 467 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1919 | 468 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1919 | 472 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1919 | 473 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1919 | 474 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1919 | 475 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 10/1919 | 476 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 255 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 255 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 256 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 256 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 257 | Snapshot | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 258 | Snapshot | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 259 | Snapshot | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 982 | Snapshot | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 985 | Snapshot | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 987 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 987 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 988 | Snapshot | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 989 | Snapshot | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1920 | 990 | Snapshot | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 04/1921 | 477 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 04/1921 | 478 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 1680 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 1681 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 1682 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 1683 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 1684 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 479 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 480 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 481 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 06/1921 | 482 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1921 | 1695 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1921 | 1696 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1921 | 483 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1921 | 484 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1921 | 485 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 07/1921 | 486 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1921 | 1697 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1921 | 1698 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1921 | 1699 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1921 | 1700 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1921 | 1701 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1921 | 1702 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 08/1921 | 1703 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1921 | 1704 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 255 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 255 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 256 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 256 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 257 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 257 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 258 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 258 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 259 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 259 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 982 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 982 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 985 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 985 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 987 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 987 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 988 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 988 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 989 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 989 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 990 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C2 | 4-4-2 | y/e | 1923 | 990 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1648 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1659 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1646 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1661 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1662 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1923 | 1663 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/03/1923 | 1637 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/07/1923 | 1636 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/11/1923 | 487 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1923 | 488 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1923 | 489 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/11/1923 | 490 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1923 | 1641 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1923 | 491 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/12/1923 | 492 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/12/1923 | 493 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1923 | 494 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1924 | 495 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/03/1924 | 3497 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1924 | 3498 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/04/1924 | 3499 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1924 | 1640 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/05/1924 | 500 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/06/1924 | 3294 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/06/1924 | 4406 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 15/06/1924 | 3282 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1924 | 1644 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/11/1924 | 1703 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/12/1924 | 4695 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/12/1924 | 4698 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/12/1924 | 4700 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/12/1924 | 4704 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1925 | 1648 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1925 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1925 | 3496 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1925 | 6264 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/02/1925 | 1443 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/02/1925 | 3420 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/02/1925 | 4659 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/02/1925 | 6308 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/02/1925 | 6266 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1925 | 6270 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/02/1925 | 3501 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | m/e | 03/1925 | 4417 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1925 | 6279 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/03/1925 | 4696 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/03/1925 | 4701 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/03/1925 | 469 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 3471 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 6270 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 6279 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 6308 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1925 | 3464 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1925 | 3470 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1925 | 6266 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/04/1925 | 4697 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/04/1925 | 4699 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/04/1925 | 4408 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 18/04/1925 | 4443 | Transfer out to: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1925 | 6102 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 28/04/1925 | 4443 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1925 | 6095 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/05/1925 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/05/1925 | 4665 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1925 | 6096 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1925 | 6099 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/06/1925 | 3293 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | P1 | 2-8-2 | on | 29/07/1925 | 2393 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/07/1925 | 4635 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 20/08/1925 | 4702 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1925 | 6504 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1925 | 6541 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/09/1925 | 3447 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/09/1925 | 6496 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 02/10/1925 | 4437 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1925 | 6507 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/10/1925 | 6102 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 6313 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 6314 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 3459 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 3469 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/11/1925 | 3475 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/11/1925 | 3468 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | P1 | 2-8-2 | on | 02/12/1925 | 2394 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/01/1926 | 6099 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1926 | 6495 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/01/1926 | 6509 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/01/1926 | 6498 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1926 | 6377 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/01/1926 | 6311 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/01/1926 | 6095 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1926 | 6096 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 22/01/1926 | 4400 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 05/02/1926 | 4437 | Transfer out to: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1926 | 3434 | Transfer out to: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1926 | 3435 | Transfer out to: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/10/1926 | 3290 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1927 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/02/1927 | 4654 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/03/1927 | 4418 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/05/1927 | 4689 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/06/1927 | 6619 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1927 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/08/1927 | 4640 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/08/1927 | 4634 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/08/1927 | 6606 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/08/1927 | 1728 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/09/1927 | 4630 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/09/1927 | 4631 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/10/1927 | 3424 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/11/1927 | 4481 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/11/1927 | 6587 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/11/1927 | 4481 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/12/1927 | 6565 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 1928 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1928 | 6590 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/01/1928 | 4408 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1928 | 3490 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/04/1928 | 4689 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/04/1928 | 3490 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 24/05/1928 | 4408 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/06/1928 | 3423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/07/1928 | 3404 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/07/1928 | 6593 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1928 | 6634 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/08/1928 | 3422 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/08/1928 | 6604 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/08/1928 | 3404 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/09/1928 | 3441 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/09/1928 | 3446 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/09/1928 | 6635 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/10/1928 | 3429 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1928 | 5392 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1928 | 6507 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/11/1928 | 6634 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1929 | 4643 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/02/1929 | 3432 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1929 | 6498 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/03/1929 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/03/1929 | 3426 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/04/1929 | 3427 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/04/1929 | 3404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/05/1929 | 4634 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/07/1929 | 6635 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/07/1929 | 3468 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1929 | 6590 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/08/1929 | 6635 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1929 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1929 | 5405 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1929 | 6504 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/12/1929 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 13/02/1930 | 4403 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 13/02/1930 | 4443 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1930 | 6561 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 24/03/1930 | 4443 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 24/03/1930 | 4403 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1930 | 3456 | Transfer out to: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/06/1930 | 3460 | Transfer out to: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/07/1930 | 4654 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/08/1930 | 4639 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/08/1930 | 4641 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/09/1930 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1930 | 4654 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/09/1930 | 3442 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/10/1930 | 3460 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/10/1930 | 4639 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 27/10/1930 | 4403 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1930 | 4630 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/12/1930 | 4639 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/01/1931 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/01/1931 | 6634 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/01/1931 | 6604 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/02/1931 | 3456 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/05/1931 | 6634 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/06/1931 | 206 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/07/1931 | 4639 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/08/1931 | 4639 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/1931 | 4680 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/10/1931 | 3430 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/10/1931 | 4682 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/11/1931 | 4684 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/11/1931 | 3431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/11/1931 | 3440 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/02/1932 | 4681 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1932 | 6313 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1932 | 6593 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/06/1932 | 4639 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/08/1932 | 4672 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/08/1932 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1932 | 6587 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1932 | 6565 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/10/1932 | 6541 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/11/1932 | 4630 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/01/1933 | 6495 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1933 | 6496 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1933 | 6264 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/03/1933 | 4404 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/05/1933 | 6264 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/06/1933 | 4654 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/08/1933 | 4654 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/09/1933 | 4413 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1933 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/10/1933 | 5397 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/10/1933 | 4657 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/11/1933 | 6311 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1933 | 6619 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/12/1933 | 6321 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1933 | 6321 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/03/1934 | 4681 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1934 | 3469 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/08/1934 | 3475 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1934 | 3475 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/10/1934 | 3469 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/10/1934 | 4683 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/11/1934 | 3469 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/11/1934 | 3475 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/11/1934 | 5397 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/11/1934 | 6314 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 4660 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/02/1935 | 4443 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/02/1935 | 3279 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/05/1935 | 6606 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/07/1935 | 6264 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/08/1935 | 3459 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/09/1935 | 6509 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1935 | 5392 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/10/1935 | 5405 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/10/1935 | 6321 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/10/1935 | 6377 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 146 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 2459 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 7927 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 6635 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1935 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1935 | 6509 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J4 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 4090 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 4379 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 4639 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 8235 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 8236 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 3465 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1935 | 6509 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/12/1935 | 2437 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/12/1935 | 4639 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/12/1935 | 4639 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 3306 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4103 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 4510 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/01/1936 | 2555 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/01/1936 | 2437 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/02/1936 | 2555 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/02/1936 | 2555 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/03/1936 | 4630 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/03/1936 | 4639 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/09/1936 | 4659 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/10/1936 | 2555 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/10/1936 | 4774 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 26/11/1936 | 4460 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/05/1937 | 3456 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/05/1937 | 3457 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/10/1937 | 4786 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/11/1937 | 4791 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/12/1937 | 4665 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/12/1937 | 3466 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/12/1937 | 4795 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/01/1938 | 4798 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1938 | 3474 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1938 | 2987 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/05/1938 | 4630 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/05/1938 | 2987 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 28/05/1938 | 4431 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 05/07/1938 | 3282 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/09/1938 | 2693 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1938 | 2695 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1938 | 2693 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/09/1938 | 4639 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/10/1938 | 4798 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1938 | 2695 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/10/1938 | 4800 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 30/11/1938 | 3296 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 30/11/1938 | 4414 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 30/11/1938 | 4446 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/12/1938 | 4813 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/04/1939 | 4825 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1939 | 4844 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/06/1939 | 4829 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/06/1939 | 4844 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/06/1939 | 4672 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/06/1939 | 4836 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/07/1939 | 4400 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/07/1939 | 3476 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/08/1939 | 4681 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/08/1939 | 4841 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/08/1939 | 4841 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/08/1939 | 3458 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/09/1939 | 4842 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/09/1939 | 4416 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/09/1939 | 4439 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/09/1939 | 4672 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1939 | 3459 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/11/1939 | 4833 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/01/1940 | 4864 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 14/02/1940 | 3296 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/02/1940 | 4870 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/02/1940 | 1952 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/02/1940 | 2982 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/02/1940 | 4661 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/02/1940 | 4666 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/02/1940 | 4670 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/02/1940 | 4678 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 4645 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 4649 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 4668 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/02/1940 | 4679 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/04/1940 | 4876 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/05/1940 | 4681 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/05/1940 | 4883 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/05/1940 | 4847 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/06/1940 | 4884 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1940 | 4885 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/06/1940 | 4657 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/06/1940 | 4886 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1940 | 4681 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/06/1940 | 4654 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1940 | 1952 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/06/1940 | 256l | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/06/1940 | 4848 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/06/1940 | 4475 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/06/1940 | 4476 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/07/1940 | 4849 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/07/1940 | 4657 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/07/1940 | 4635 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/07/1940 | 4821 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/07/1940 | 4826 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/08/1940 | 4816 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 06/08/1940 | 4850 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 3471 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 3475 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1941 | 3089 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1941 | 3090 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/05/1941 | 3089 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/05/1941 | 3090 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/07/1941 | 3095 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/07/1941 | 3094 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1941 | 3094 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1941 | 3095 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1941 | 3097 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 06/10/1941 | 4408 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/10/1941 | 4649 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/10/1941 | 4659 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/10/1941 | 4665 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/10/1941 | 4892 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/01/1942 | 2548 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/01/1942 | 2549 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/01/1942 | 2550 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/01/1942 | 4479 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/03/1942 | 4414 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/03/1942 | 4446 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/04/1942 | 4678 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/04/1942 | 4645 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/04/1942 | 4668 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/04/1942 | 4679 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/04/1942 | 4661 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/04/1942 | 1926 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/04/1942 | 1927 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/04/1942 | 1952 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/04/1942 | 2983 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1942 | 1493 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/07/1942 | 2548 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/07/1942 | 2549 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/10/1942 | 2560 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/10/1942 | 2548 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/10/1942 | 2549 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/10/1942 | 2553 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/10/1942 | 4479 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/11/1942 | 3462 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1942 | 3469 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/11/1942 | 3468 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1942 | 3460 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1942 | 3464 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1942 | 3467 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 3845 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 3846 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4788 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4789 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4792 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4797 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4801 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4837 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4840 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4868 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/11/1942 | 4895 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 3463 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 3470 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 3472 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 3473 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1943 | 2982 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1943 | 3097 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1943 | 3497 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1943 | 2983 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/05/1943 | 2550 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/05/1943 | 2549 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/05/1943 | 2548 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1943 | 3461 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/05/1943 | 3478 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/05/1943 | 3479 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/05/1943 | 3477 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1943 | 3480 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/05/1943 | 4670 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/05/1943 | 4672 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 02/06/1943 | 4431 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1943 | 1952 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/06/1943 | 1927 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/06/1943 | 1493 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1943 | 3481 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1943 | 3482 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/06/1943 | 4630 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1943 | 1926 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/07/1943 | 4670 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/07/1943 | 4672 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1943 | 2969 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1943 | 2950 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1943 | 2983 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1943 | 3097 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 3485 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 3486 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 3483 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 3484 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 3489 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1943 | 3490 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1943 | 3488 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/09/1943 | 3487 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1943 | 4774 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1943 | 4786 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1943 | 4788 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1943 | 4789 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1943 | 4791 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1943 | 4792 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/12/1943 | 3493 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/12/1943 | 3494 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/12/1943 | 3495 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/12/1943 | 3492 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 5163 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 6134 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 6136 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 6176 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 6179 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 3498 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/03/1944 | 4800 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/03/1944 | 4795 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/03/1944 | 4813 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1944 | 4797 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1944 | 4801 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/03/1944 | 4816 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/03/1944 | 2543 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1944 | 3460 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1944 | 3467 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/03/1944 | 4472 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 25/03/1944 | 4404 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1944 | 3486 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1944 | 3854 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1944 | 3856 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1944 | 3857 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/04/1944 | 2752 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/04/1944 | 4475 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/04/1944 | 2744 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/04/1944 | 4476 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/04/1944 | 2558 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/04/1944 | 2752 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/04/1944 | 4471 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1944 | 6244 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1944 | 2551 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1944 | 2752 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1944 | 4478 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1944 | 4480 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1944 | 2550 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1944 | 4476 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 25/06/1944 | 4415 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 25/06/1944 | 4432 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/07/1944 | 256l | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/07/1944 | 4472 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/07/1944 | 4476 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/07/1944 | 2550 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/07/1944 | 2952 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 5163 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 6134 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 6136 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 6176 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 6179 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 5163 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 6134 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 6136 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 6176 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1944 | 6179 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/09/1944 | 3479 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/09/1944 | 3489 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/09/1944 | 3492 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1944 | 3471 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1944 | 3490 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1944 | 3493 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1944 | 3497 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/09/1944 | 3498 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/09/1944 | 2543 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/09/1944 | 2558 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/09/1944 | 4478 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 3460 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 3467 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O3 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 3471 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/10/1944 | 4471 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/11/1944 | 4472 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/11/1944 | 4837 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/11/1944 | 4876 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/11/1944 | 4886 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/12/1944 | 4472 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/12/1944 | 3480 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 3461 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 3477 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/12/1944 | 3478 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/12/1944 | 3652 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/12/1944 | 3663 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/12/1944 | 4830 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/12/1944 | 4861 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/12/1944 | 2552 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3481 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3482 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3483 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3484 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3485 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3487 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3488 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3494 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3495 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1945 | 3833 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 2543 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4475 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4848 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1945 | 4885 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/02/1945 | 4418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 1996 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 2695 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 4635 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/04/1945 | 4654 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 21/04/1945 | 4417 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/05/1945 | 3490 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/05/1945 | 6140 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 206 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3461 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3477 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3478 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3479 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3480 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3481 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3482 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3483 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3484 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3485 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3486 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3487 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3488 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3489 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3491 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3492 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3493 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3494 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3495 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 3496 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/06/1945 | 6244 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1945 | 2950 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1945 | 2952 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | P1 | 2-8-2 | on | 05/07/1945 | 2394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | P1 | 2-8-2 | on | 24/07/1945 | 2393 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 26/07/1945 | 4432 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/08/1945 | 1997 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/08/1945 | 1996 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/09/1945 | 206 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/10/1945 | 4415 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 20/10/1945 | 4416 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 27/10/1945 | 4460 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/10/1945 | 5163 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/10/1945 | 6134 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/10/1945 | 6136 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/10/1945 | 6140 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/10/1945 | 6176 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/11/1945 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/11/1945 | 3290 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1945 | 3097 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1945 | 3854 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/11/1945 | 3498 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/11/1945 | 3497 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/11/1945 | 3499 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/11/1945 | 500 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/12/1945 | 3445 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/12/1945 | 3501 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/12/1945 | 3833 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/12/1945 | 3845 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/12/1945 | 4639 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1945 | 3856 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1945 | 3857 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/12/1945 | 3846 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1945 | 1996 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1945 | 2969 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/01/1946 | 2843 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/01/1946 | 2983 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/01/1946 | 2983 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 16/02/1946 | 2836 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 05/05/1946 | 3293 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/05/1946 | 3445 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/06/1946 | 1762 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/06/1946 | 3294 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/06/1946 | 1736 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/06/1946 | 4668 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/06/1946 | 1744 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/06/1946 | 4670 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/07/1946 | 790 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/08/1946 | 4635 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4729 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4738 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4666 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1946 | 4668 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/08/1946 | 98 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/08/1946 | 9936 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1946 | 1997 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/10/1946 | 2983 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/10/1946 | 828 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/10/1946 | 874 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/10/1946 | 741 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/10/1946 | 742 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/10/1946 | 763 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/10/1946 | 811 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/10/1946 | 835 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/10/1946 | 838 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/10/1946 | 843 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/10/1946 | 703 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/10/1946 | 766 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/10/1946 | 845 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/10/1946 | 905 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/10/1946 | 1863 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/11/1946 | 816 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/11/1946 | 908 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 02/01/1947 | 2869 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 22/01/1947 | 2821 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 22/01/1947 | 2870 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 22/01/1947 | 2879 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | w/e | 22/01/1947 | 2888 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 01/02/1947 | 2876 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 01/02/1947 | 2821 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/02/1947 | 943 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/02/1947 | 935 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/02/1947 | 4746 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/02/1947 | 4965 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/02/1947 | 1863 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 09/03/1947 | 9064 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/04/1947 | 1863 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/04/1947 | 2888 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1947 | 1070 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1947 | 1073 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1947 | 1075 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/05/1947 | 1027 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1947 | 1143 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1947 | 1144 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1947 | 1207 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1947 | 2178 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/07/1947 | 1209 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1947 | 1206 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/07/1947 | 1210 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/07/1947 | 2833 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/07/1947 | 2879 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/10/1947 | 1997 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/11/1947 | 106 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/11/1947 | 44 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/11/1947 | 1863 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1804 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1809 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1810 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1811 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1825 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1827 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1828 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1832 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1833 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1834 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1840 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1841 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1843 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1844 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1844 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1848 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1850 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1853 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1862 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1864 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1867 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1868 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1869 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1877 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1880 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1890 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1896 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1915 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1929 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1938 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1946 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1950 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1951 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1953 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1954 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1961 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1967 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1972 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2128 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2131 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2165 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2190 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4171 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4176 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4177 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4184 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4186 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4187 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4191 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4192 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4207 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4216 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4217 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4220 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4221 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4225 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4228 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4235 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4238 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4245 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4246 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4249 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4254 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4257 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4266 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4273 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4275 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4278 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5002 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5004 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5005 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5006 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5416 | Snapshot | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5585 | Snapshot | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5586 | Snapshot | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 68387 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7362 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7363 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7365 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7368 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7368 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7373 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7390 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8133 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8185 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8380 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8546 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8588 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8632 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8765 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8789 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8798 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8817 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8819 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8820 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8821 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8823 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8824 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8840 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8850 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8852 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8866 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8868 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8876 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8879 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 8880 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 8185 | Transfer out to: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 03/01/1948 | 2876 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/01/1948 | 1144 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4265 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8185 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/02/1948 | 1209 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 14/02/1948 | 2870 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 14/02/1948 | 62808 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/04/1948 | 60533 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1948 | 3865 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3865 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 1954 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 3865 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1948 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1948 | 61329 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1948 | 61330 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1948 | 61331 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/07/1948 | 3865 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63179 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 63088 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 63169 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77173 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77186 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77351 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77401 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77414 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77415 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 77432 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/09/1948 | 78522 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 1954 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 2190 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 924 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 77364 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 63070 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 63174 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/12/1948 | 523 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1948 | 525 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1948 | 60520 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1948 | 60530 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1948 | 111 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/12/1948 | 60052 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 525 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 525 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1948 | 60513 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1948 | 60514 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/12/1948 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 60530 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 60530 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/12/1948 | 60536 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 60536 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 01/01/1949 | 60536 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/01/1949 | 60537 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 60537 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 60537 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 1832 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 1877 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 61828 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 61848 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 77351 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60054 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/02/1949 | 60061 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/02/1949 | 60053 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/02/1949 | 60090 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 61869 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 61946 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 67363 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 77432 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 62165 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 7357 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/05/1949 | 1739 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/05/1949 | 61735 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 1739 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 61735 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 1739 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 61735 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 61825 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 61827 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 90256 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1949 | 61329 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 63079 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 77181 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 61809 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 61833 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 61834 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 61896 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 61938 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 61950 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/07/1949 | 60537 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 77006 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 77095 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 77170 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 77248 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 77263 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 77441 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 78587 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 79220 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 79310 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/08/1949 | 60525 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 68380 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8546 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8588 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1949 | 1737 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/10/1949 | 61740 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 1737 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 61740 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 1737 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 61740 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 8185 | Transfer out to: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 31/10/1949 | 62131 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 8185 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 77327 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/11/1949 | 61729 | Transfer in from: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/11/1949 | 61997 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 61729 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 61729 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1949 | 60506 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/11/1949 | 60536 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 63191 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 77334 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 90528 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 77334 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 90528 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 77334 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 90528 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 62128 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1949 | 64748 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/12/1949 | 60505 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 90438 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/01/1950 | 60504 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/01/1950 | 60530 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 63096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 68844 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 68846 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 90028 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 90659 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 90665 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1950 | 60906 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/01/1950 | 4969 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1950 | 60921 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/01/1950 | 64746 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 60906 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 60906 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/01/1950 | 60966 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 04/02/1950 | 60945 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 61206 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 90383 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/03/1950 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 61810 | Transfer out to: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/03/1950 | 60829 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/03/1950 | 60862 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/03/1950 | 64729 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 60829 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 60829 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 61730 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 1737 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 64965 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 61730 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 61730 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 61840 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/04/1950 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/05/1950 | 61206 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 13/05/1950 | 61206 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 13/05/1950 | 61206 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 61880 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61804 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61844 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61961 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60113 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60500 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/06/1950 | 60508 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/06/1950 | 64738 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60113 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 60113 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61864 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/07/1950 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/07/1950 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/07/1950 | 63933 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/07/1950 | 63948 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/08/1950 | 63923 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/08/1950 | 63935 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 69337 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 90253 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 90657 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 67362 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 90438 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/08/1950 | 90438 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/08/1950 | 90554 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 69337 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 90438 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 90554 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 90438 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 90554 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 29/09/1950 | 43058 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 90070 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 11/10/1950 | 43059 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/10/1950 | 61730 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/10/1950 | 61747 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 20/10/1950 | 43060 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/10/1950 | 43080 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 27/10/1950 | 43061 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 27/10/1950 | 43081 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 63933 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 63935 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 64187 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 03/11/1950 | 43062 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 03/11/1950 | 43082 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 10/11/1950 | 43063 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 11/11/1950 | 43083 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 15/11/1950 | 43084 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 17/11/1950 | 43064 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/11/1950 | 61729 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 21/11/1950 | 43085 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 24/11/1950 | 43065 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 24/11/1950 | 43086 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 29/11/1950 | 43087 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 01/12/1950 | 43066 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 01/12/1950 | 43088 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 08/12/1950 | 43089 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 10/12/1950 | 69064 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 14/12/1950 | 43067 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 20/12/1950 | 43068 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 43064 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 68798 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 31/12/1950 | 43069 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 43067 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 43068 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 43069 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 43089 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 43067 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 43068 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 43069 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 43089 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1951 | 61736 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1951 | 61739 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1951 | 61740 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/01/1951 | 61735 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/01/1951 | 63948 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 67376 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 68786 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/01/1951 | 60820 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/01/1951 | 60871 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60820 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 67376 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68786 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60820 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 67376 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68387 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68786 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64186 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64225 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64235 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64238 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64249 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64257 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 64273 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/02/1951 | 60832 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/02/1951 | 60859 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 61370 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 61373 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 04/03/1951 | 60863 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/03/1951 | 60826 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 05/03/1951 | 67373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/03/1951 | 61143 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 63923 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90162 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90460 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90647 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8632 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60826 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61370 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61373 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90162 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90460 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90647 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 60826 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61370 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90162 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90460 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 90647 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/04/1951 | 61370 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/04/1951 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 43069 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 43089 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 67389 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 18/05/1951 | 43107 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 67389 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 67389 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 64116 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 64119 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 43107 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 64245 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 64252 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/06/1951 | 60830 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/06/1951 | 60826 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/06/1951 | 60865 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/06/1951 | 60879 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/06/1951 | 60913 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 60830 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 60830 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1951 | 64119 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1951 | 65006 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 90490 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 90647 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 68828 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 68828 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 18/08/1951 | 68828 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1951 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1951 | 60853 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1951 | 60878 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/09/1951 | 60966 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 60853 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 60845 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 60853 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 60876 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1951 | 61143 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A1/1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1951 | 60113 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 61143 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 61143 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 90256 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1951 | 63933 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1951 | 63949 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1951 | 63950 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63933 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63949 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63950 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63933 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63949 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1951 | 63950 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90346 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90460 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/10/1951 | 63933 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/10/1951 | 63949 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O2 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/10/1951 | 63950 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 90246 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 90502 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 90709 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 90495 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 90287 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1951 | 61389 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J4 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1951 | 64112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/12/1951 | 61390 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1951 | 61391 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/12/1951 | 61392 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 90305 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 90526 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 90551 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90526 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90551 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61915 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90526 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90551 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 90108 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 90220 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 90290 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64118 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90108 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90220 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 90290 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1952 | 61210 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 29/04/1952 | 68789 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/05/1952 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/05/1952 | 60845 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64259 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 65004 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1952 | 60803 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1952 | 60830 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1952 | 60858 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1952 | 60899 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1952 | 60938 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/05/1952 | 65005 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1952 | 64116 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1952 | 61210 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 61210 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 64172 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 43084 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 61210 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 64172 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 64219 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 64172 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1952 | 61390 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 64219 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61862 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 64219 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 64210 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 64210 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 64210 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 68760 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 68826 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 64221 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 64266 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68760 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68826 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68760 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68826 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/09/1952 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/09/1952 | 60845 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68512 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 60845 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 61863 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68512 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61951 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 68512 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/10/1952 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/10/1952 | 60845 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68512 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 43084 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 64224 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 43087 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65002 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43084 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 64224 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43058 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43084 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 64224 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 43087 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1952 | 61139 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1952 | 61210 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 61139 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 61139 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1952 | 61113 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1952 | 61138 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1952 | 61206 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1952 | 61331 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/02/1953 | 60966 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/02/1953 | 60820 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67366 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67369 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | J3 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 64140 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/03/1953 | 61210 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/03/1953 | 61139 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64181 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64198 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64231 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64272 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64279 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 43065 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 43066 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 43067 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 43068 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67366 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/04/1953 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/04/1953 | 60845 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/05/1953 | 60893 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/05/1953 | 60908 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/05/1953 | 60916 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/05/1953 | 60893 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/05/1953 | 60908 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/05/1953 | 60916 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 68185 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/05/1953 | 60803 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/05/1953 | 61095 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 15/06/1953 | 67390 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 90500 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60893 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60908 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60916 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60803 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60893 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60908 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/06/1953 | 60916 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 65586 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67350 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67368 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90162 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 90288 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 64738 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 64833 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61330 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 68771 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 68793 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 68884 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 68868 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 90512 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/09/1953 | 60876 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61085 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61122 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61204 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61205 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61364 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 61282 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64738 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 64833 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61811 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61841 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61843 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61850 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61853 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61867 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61868 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61890 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61929 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/10/1953 | 61047 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/11/1953 | 60855 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/11/1953 | 60876 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 23/11/1953 | 68786 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 90156 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 90079 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 43058 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 43064 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 64397 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 43080 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90208 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1954 | 61075 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/06/1954 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/06/1954 | 60828 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 19/07/1954 | 67369 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1954 | 13127 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 43127 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 64397 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 68880 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1954 | 13128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1954 | 13129 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1954 | 13130 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1954 | 13131 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1954 | 61113 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 43065 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 43066 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 43067 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 43080 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 43127 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 68496 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 68819 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 25/10/1954 | 68844 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 25/10/1954 | 68850 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 07/11/1954 | 92030 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 09/11/1954 | 68760 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 68821 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 68876 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 17/11/1954 | 92032 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 19/11/1954 | 92033 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 02/12/1954 | 92034 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 02/12/1954 | 92036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 03/12/1954 | 92035 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/12/1954 | 61113 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 08/12/1954 | 92037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 14/12/1954 | 92038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 17/12/1954 | 92039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 23/12/1954 | 92040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/12/1954 | 92041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 12/01/1955 | 92042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68759 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68783 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68765 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68826 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 68852 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90259 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90502 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90554 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/02/1955 | 61364 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68819 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68496 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 90526 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 90551 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 92031 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 90709 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/04/1955 | 60826 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 03/04/1955 | 60916 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 13/04/1955 | 67350 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 15/04/1955 | 67361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 15/04/1955 | 67389 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67352 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67392 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67394 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 68817 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 61085 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 61122 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 61138 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1955 | 61143 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90709 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/08/1955 | 60867 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/08/1955 | 60841 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 14/09/1955 | 68884 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/09/1955 | 60845 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/09/1955 | 60966 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 20/09/1955 | 68879 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 03/10/1955 | 68783 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 10/10/1955 | 68771 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68507 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68527 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68626 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68817 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 92011 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 92012 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68759 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68819 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 11/1955 | 6 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68519 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68817 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/11/1955 | 60875 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/11/1955 | 60905 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1955 | 61047 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 16/12/1955 | 68820 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 47429 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 47458 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67379 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68809 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68817 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 64259 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67352 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68507 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68519 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68527 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 90659 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 13130 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90659 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90244 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 90528 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68635 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90156 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90244 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90528 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1956 | 61392 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68846 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/04/1956 | 11156 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1956 | 11157 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/05/1956 | 11158 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 21/05/1956 | 68793 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 68491 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 68831 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 47429 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 47458 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 68817 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/06/1956 | 11159 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1956 | 11160 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 43063 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/07/1956 | 60821 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/07/1956 | 60950 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 11/09/1956 | 68809 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/09/1956 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/09/1956 | 60845 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/09/1956 | 60966 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61954 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61967 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61005 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61006 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61302 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 61392 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 19/10/1956 | 67392 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64799 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64805 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64873 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64874 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64985 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61864 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61978 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61979 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 67380 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1956 | 13326 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61006 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1957 | 61005 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Diesel | D3/14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 15004 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 67398 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1957 | 61095 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61805 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61830 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1957 | 64799 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1957 | 64805 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 64873 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 64874 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 64985 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 47282 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 47306 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 47311 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 68823 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 68831 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 68840 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92011 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92012 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92030 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92031 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92032 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 92033 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1957 | 60854 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1957 | 60911 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61204 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61205 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 92044 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 43086 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 43087 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/07/1957 | 92140 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/07/1957 | 92142 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/08/1957 | 60821 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/08/1957 | 60842 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/08/1957 | 61777 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 47458 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 47306 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/08/1957 | 92143 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/08/1957 | 92144 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/08/1957 | 92145 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/08/1957 | 92146 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60520 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1957 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/09/1957 | 92147 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/09/1957 | 92148 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/09/1957 | 92178 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1957 | 61060 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1957 | 61074 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1957 | 61389 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1957 | 61392 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1957 | 60893 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1957 | 60966 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 43086 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 47429 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 47311 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90028 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90088 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90438 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90559 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90657 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 90709 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/10/1957 | 60943 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1957 | 61367 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1957 | D3445 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/10/1957 | D3446 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1957 | D3447 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/10/1957 | 92149 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/10/1957 | 92179 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1957 | D3448 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1957 | D3449 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 90528 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/11/1957 | 60943 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1957 | D3450 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1957 | D3451 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1957 | D3452 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1957 | D3453 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/11/1957 | 92180 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 30/11/1957 | 92181 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1957 | D3473 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1957 | D3474 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 47282 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 90156 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 90279 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 90683 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1957 | D3475 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/12/1957 | 92182 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/12/1957 | 92183 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | D3450 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | D3473 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | D3474 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | D3475 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 11156 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 11157 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 11158 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 11159 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 11160 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 43059 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 43061 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 43062 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 43064 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 43065 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 43080 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 43083 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 43085 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64171 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64172 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64181 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64191 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64207 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64231 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64246 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 64278 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 68828 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 92178 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/01/1958 | 92184 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/01/1958 | 92185 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/01/1958 | 92186 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64184 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 64198 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 28/02/1958 | 92187 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 28/02/1958 | 92188 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1958 | D3485 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/03/1958 | D3486 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/03/1958 | 64211 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/03/1958 | D3487 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 90169 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/03/1958 | D3488 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/04/1958 | D3489 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 92178 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 13127 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 13326 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3128 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3129 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3131 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 90106 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 64192 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69258 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69262 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69274 | Transfer in from: | CHR | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69276 | Transfer in from: | STP | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69293 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 64192 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 64216 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 64219 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 68626 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 90244 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/05/1958 | 67357 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/05/1958 | 67365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 22/05/1958 | 67376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 30/05/1958 | 67380 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/06/1958 | 68491 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/06/1958 | 60513 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/06/1958 | 64220 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 10/06/1958 | 67379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68556 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 43058 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 43060 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 43066 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 92187 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 92188 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 16/06/1958 | 67394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 69267 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 69290 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 68556 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/08/1958 | 64275 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | on | 02/09/1958 | 68866 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 67363 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 92187 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 92188 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1958 | 64189 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 04/11/1958 | 67398 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 69314 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 69322 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/11/1958 | 60866 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/11/1958 | 60936 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | on | 20/11/1958 | 67363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 69258 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 69290 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 69314 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/12/1958 | 60821 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/12/1958 | 60893 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/12/1958 | 60966 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/12/1958 | 60523 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 64254 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 68896 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 68976 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 47429 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 47458 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 64254 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1959 | 64217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 92034 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 92035 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 92184 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 68635 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 92039 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 90000 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 90015 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 90223 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 90269 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 65586 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/03/1959 | 64176 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/04/1959 | 61759 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J52 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 68824 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/04/1959 | 60523 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1959 | 61200 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1959 | 61272 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 92034 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/04/1959 | 92035 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/05/1959 | 61777 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1959 | 64224 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1959 | 64210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60513 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60520 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60875 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60908 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/06/1959 | 60912 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61367 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 69513 | Transfer in from: | HSY | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 69540 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 69571 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 69582 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 92184 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/06/1959 | 69322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/07/1959 | 61027 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 69521 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/08/1959 | D3710 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/08/1959 | D3711 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1959 | 64228 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1959 | 64279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/09/1959 | 64272 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/09/1959 | 60061 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/09/1959 | 60066 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/09/1959 | 60067 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D3710 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D3711 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/09/1959 | 60820 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/09/1959 | 60914 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D3629 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D3630 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 64180 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 69266 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1959 | 64254 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/11/1959 | 60066 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/11/1959 | 60067 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1959 | 61393 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/11/1959 | 60061 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/11/1959 | 60826 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/11/1959 | 60850 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1959 | 60505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/11/1959 | 61763 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | D3450 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D3441 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 90073 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 90154 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | D3440 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/12/1959 | 69262 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/12/1959 | 69276 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1960 | 61759 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/01/1960 | 60520 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/01/1960 | 60523 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/01/1960 | 60533 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | D3489 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/01/1960 | 61393 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/01/1960 | 69267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69506 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 68896 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 68976 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 43127 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 43150 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90502 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90024 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90050 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 90075 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 64196 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 64223 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 64233 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 64253 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/03/1960 | 64180 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 43151 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1960 | 61331 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1960 | 61200 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/04/1960 | 64192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90055 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90130 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90146 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90185 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90215 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90618 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90662 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90703 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90717 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 64240 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 64251 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60936 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60956 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 64206 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 92148 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 21/07/1960 | 69540 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/08/1960 | 64240 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1960 | 61091 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1960 | 61097 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1960 | 64196 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/09/1960 | 69582 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/09/1960 | 64206 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1960 | 64251 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/10/1960 | 60841 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/10/1960 | 61075 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/10/1960 | 61174 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/10/1960 | 60936 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61060 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61113 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 25/11/1960 | 69266 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 43094 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 43153 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/11/1960 | 69274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/11/1960 | 69293 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 67718 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 67721 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67717 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67732 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67738 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67778 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67795 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67796 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67798 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 43086 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67717 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67718 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67721 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67732 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 67738 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1961 | 61742 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 61972 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1961 | 60817 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/01/1961 | 60881 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/01/1961 | 60504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/02/1961 | 61763 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/02/1961 | 60508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/04/1961 | 60506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/04/1961 | 64223 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65420 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 43127 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 27/05/1961 | 69531 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 27/05/1961 | 69549 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 27/05/1961 | 69580 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 27/05/1961 | 69583 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/05/1961 | 69513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 31/05/1961 | 69506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/06/1961 | 69521 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/06/1961 | 69571 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90129 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90660 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/07/1961 | 64233 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/07/1961 | 64265 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 07/07/1961 | 69531 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 68989 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 69504 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 43089 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 43146 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 68961 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 68971 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 68976 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 69498 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 69512 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 69520 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 69543 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 69579 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/08/1961 | 61978 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60062 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60108 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60866 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 10/09/1961 | 60912 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 11/09/1961 | 69498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 11/09/1961 | 69543 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 11/09/1961 | 69580 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 12/09/1961 | 69549 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 69529 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 69546 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 69575 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/09/1961 | 60880 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/09/1961 | 60897 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61810 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61835 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 61861 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 92039 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 92148 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1961 | D4075 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1961 | D4076 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/10/1961 | 61979 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1961 | 60803 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1961 | 60830 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1961 | 60858 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1961 | 60938 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1961 | D4077 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 61825 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 90031 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 90270 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 90304 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 90490 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 67796 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 67798 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 65420 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 90106 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 90514 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/12/1961 | D6517 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/12/1961 | 60948 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1962 | 61861 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 90367 | Transfer out to: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/02/1962 | 64177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/03/1962 | 60938 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/03/1962 | 60966 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 61835 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 61835 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/04/1962 | 60853 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/05/1962 | 60867 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 03/05/1962 | 67795 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/05/1962 | 67778 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | D146 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | J6 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1962 | 64253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/05/1962 | 61742 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 69523 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 69535 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 69538 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 69568 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 69593 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 31/05/1962 | 60829 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1962 | 61364 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1962 | 61075 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 68961 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 68971 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 68976 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 68989 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/06/1962 | 60050 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/06/1962 | 60065 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/06/1962 | 60830 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 17/06/1962 | 60948 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/06/1962 | 60820 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 90304 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 90703 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 90717 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | D146 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D3452 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/07/1962 | 69512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/08/1962 | 61810 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 22/08/1962 | 60874 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60046 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60047 | Transfer in from: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1962 | 60048 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1962 | 61091 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1962 | 61391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61122 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61250 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61314 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61805 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61825 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61835 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61864 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69535 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69538 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69568 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69575 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69579 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69583 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69593 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 90106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 61830 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/09/1962 | 60520 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/09/1962 | 60523 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 23/09/1962 | 60533 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/09/1962 | 60845 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/09/1962 | 60893 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/09/1962 | 60914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/09/1962 | 60956 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/09/1962 | 69504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/09/1962 | 69520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/09/1962 | 69529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/09/1962 | 69546 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90000 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90024 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90055 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90075 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90129 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90165 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90185 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90215 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90223 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90239 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90490 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90618 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90660 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90662 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90665 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90730 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 92036 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 92039 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 92044 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 92144 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | D3/14 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1962 | 15004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/11/1962 | 60948 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 25/11/1962 | 60950 | Transfer in from: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | D4083 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60821 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60832 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60866 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90270 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | D4084 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1963 | 60871 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1963 | 60902 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1963 | 60903 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 10/02/1963 | 60903 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 92141 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 92144 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 43088 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 43151 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 92147 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 92148 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/04/1963 | 60047 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 90073 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 90096 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 90130 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 90146 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1963 | 60854 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/04/1963 | 60862 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/04/1963 | 60046 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/04/1963 | 60048 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/04/1963 | 60513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/04/1963 | 60912 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | D4087 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1963 | 90015 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1963 | 90031 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1963 | 90050 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1963 | 90269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1963 | 90502 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1963 | 90659 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/05/1963 | 60906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/06/1963 | 60029 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1963 | 60050 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92040 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92041 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92042 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92183 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92184 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92185 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92186 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92187 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 92188 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/06/1963 | 60533 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60006 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60007 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60008 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60010 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60017 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60021 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60025 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60026 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60032 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60034 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60062 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60065 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60108 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60841 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60858 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60871 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60880 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60902 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60948 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60950 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 61250 | Transfer out to: | 34F | Grantham | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60803 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60817 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60854 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60862 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60869 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 16/06/1963 | 60881 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92034 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92035 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92037 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 92038 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/07/1963 | 60008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/09/1963 | 61074 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61097 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61210 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61073 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1963 | 61331 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 43153 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 90154 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60054 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60062 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60063 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60065 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60106 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60006 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60007 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60010 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60026 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60034 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60017 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60021 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60025 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60029 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/10/1963 | 60112 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 92036 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 92184 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 92185 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 90158 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 90246 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 90514 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1963 | 61105 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1963 | 61109 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1963 | 61194 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 92171 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 92176 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 61041 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 61097 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 61162 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/11/1963 | 61122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 43067 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 43082 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 61174 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 61207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 61314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 05/01/1964 | 43094 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43086 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43092 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43095 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43105 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43108 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43144 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43147 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 43158 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 92036 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 92184 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 92185 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1964 | 61138 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 43087 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1964 | 61041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/05/1964 | D3440 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/05/1964 | 92171 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 31/05/1964 | 92176 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92036 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92038 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 92195 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 43084 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 43089 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/06/1964 | 60054 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/06/1964 | 60063 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/06/1964 | 60065 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/07/1964 | 61109 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 43095 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 43105 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1964 | D3494 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | D2028 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | D2030 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | D2031 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | on | 06/12/1964 | 92036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/12/1964 | 61162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/12/1964 | 43086 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/12/1964 | 43087 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/12/1964 | 43147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/12/1964 | 60062 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/12/1964 | 60106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/12/1964 | 60112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1964 | 61105 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 61070 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 61194 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 61302 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 25 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 43081 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 43146 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 43150 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 43158 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 61097 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1965 | 61138 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 43092 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 43108 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 43144 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92038 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92140 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92141 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92144 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92145 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92146 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92149 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92178 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92179 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92180 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92182 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 92195 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 92142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 92143 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/02/1965 | 92181 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D2028 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D2031 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D2030 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D4070 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D4071 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D4070 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D4071 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 33 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 07/03/1966 | D6517 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | D4070 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1966 | D4071 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1966 | D3494 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D3441 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D3629 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D3630 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D4070 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D4071 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1966 | D3491 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | D3615 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | D3616 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | D3617 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D3446 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D3447 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D3448 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D3449 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D3450 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | D3445 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D3137 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D3138 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D3444 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D4072 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D4074 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D4092 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1968 | D3451 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1968 | D3453 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1968 | D3487 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1968 | D4076 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1968 | D4083 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1968 | D4084 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3132 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3394 | Transfer in from: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3409 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1968 | D4087 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1968 | D4092 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1968 | D3485 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D3275 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D3444 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1968 | D3275 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1968 | D3488 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1968 | D3491 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3132 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3137 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3138 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3394 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3409 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3486 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3615 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3616 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D3617 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D4072 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D4074 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D4075 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D4077 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March |