Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 35 Today
» 929 Yesterday
» 1872 Week
» 13017 Month
» 112802 Year
» 1778178 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Newton Heath


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 07/02/1934 13280 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 08/02/1934 13282 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 12/02/1934 13281 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 07/03/1934 13284 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 09/03/1934 13283 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1934 13280 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1934 13281 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1934 13282 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1934 13283 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1934 13284 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 by 31/12/1934 13277 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 by 31/12/1934 2976 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1935 13277 Transfer out to: 7C Holyhead    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1935 2976 Transfer out to: 7C Holyhead    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 09/07/1938 2618 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2476 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2477 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 10818 Snapshot        
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST on 01/01/1948 11222 Snapshot        
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST on 01/01/1948 11234 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11379 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11404 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11424 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11425 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11436 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11470 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11472 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11488 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11496 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 11510 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12120 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12124 Snapshot 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12132 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12136 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12138 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12156 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12207 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12239 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12266 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12279 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12300 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12343 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12345 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12355 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12358 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12437 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12443 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12466 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12517 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 13 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 14 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 15 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2278 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2279 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2280 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2281 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2282 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2283 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2284 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2285 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2286 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2287 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2288 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2289 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2290 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2476 Snapshot 26D Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2477 Snapshot 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2477 Snapshot 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2486 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2491 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2492 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2549 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2551 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2619 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2620 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2621 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2622 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2623 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2624 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2625 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2626 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2630 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2700 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2701 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2702 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2703 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2704 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2705 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2706 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2707 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2708 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2709 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2710 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2711 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2713 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2714 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2750 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2766 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2789 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2820 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2871 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2901 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4311 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4543 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4544 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4781 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4782 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4888 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4889 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4890 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4891 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4893 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4894 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4895 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4933 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4934 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4940 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4951 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4987 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 50736 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 50738 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5079 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5102 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5103 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5105 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 51400 Snapshot        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 01/01/1948 51438 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5202 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5203 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5222 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 52229 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5224 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5232 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5233 Snapshot        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5234 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 52518 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 52578 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5635 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5642 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5661 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5700 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5701 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5706 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5710 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5711 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5712 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5717 Snapshot        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5719 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 582 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 584 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 588 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 63 Snapshot        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 6418 Snapshot        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 6419 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 65 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7586 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8460 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8462 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8756 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8759 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8760 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8761 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8762 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8763 Snapshot        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8765 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9510 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9511 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9512 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9520 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9533 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9554 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9556 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9560 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9565 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9607 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9608 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9636 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9637 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9639 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9642 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9650 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9651 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9652 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9653 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9654 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9655 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9656 Snapshot        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9657 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 12437 Transfer out to: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 27 0-6-0 m/e 02/1949 52518 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 03/1949 49565 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST m/e 04/1949 51438 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 05/1949 49512 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 49533 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 49607 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 49642 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 16/07/1949 50738 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 52229 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 m/e 08/1949 52578 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 09/1949 49639 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 09/1949 49652 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 09/1949 49656 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 12/11/1949 51400 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 m/e 12/1949 49654 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 2w/e 03/12/1949 90525 Reinstated        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 2w/e 03/12/1949 90706 Reinstated        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 2w/e 03/12/1949 90708 Reinstated        
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 3w/e 14/01/1950 11338 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 3w/e 14/01/1950 11458 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam 11 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 12102 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 11 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 52569 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 8318 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 44544 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 8756 Transfer out to: NTH Northwich    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 08/03/1950 49556 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 14/03/1950 49655 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 03/05/1950 49520 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45220 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 49536 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 49580 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 49583 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 5104 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 48318 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 02/07/1950 61223 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 04/08/1950 49653 Condemned      
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 11/08/1950 61326 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 11/08/1950 61223 Transfer out to: 39A Gorton    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 16/08/1950 49636 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 23/08/1950 49583 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 48722 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 48727 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 48761 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 40584 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 48761 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 09/09/1950 50818 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 52138 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 52466 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 24/09/1950 61326 Transfer out to: 39A Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48720 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48751 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48755 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48768 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/10/1950 42477 Transfer out to: 25C Goole    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45211 Transfer in from: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45225 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45336 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 49660 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 49661 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 682 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 691 Transfer in from: 26E Bacup    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 30/11/1950 44696 1st Allocation        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 on 30/11/1950 44697 1st Allocation        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1950 48761 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1950 48768 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48036 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48110 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48518 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48706 Transfer in from: NTH Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48718 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48756 Transfer in from: NTH Northwich    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 45079 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49554 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49650 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49657 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49660 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49661 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 29/12/1950 49651 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 45702 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48725 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48766 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 49570 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 70843 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 77000 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 77005 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 77015 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 77026 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 77064 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 77079 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 78521 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 78542 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 90561 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 90568 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 90589 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 90715 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44888 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 45211 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 45222 Transfer out to: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48036 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48110 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48518 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48706 Transfer out to: 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48751 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48756 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 48760 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 49510 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 45068 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 77196 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 44697 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 48718 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 48720 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 49511 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 45216 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 48713 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 45068 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49637 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 24/03/1951 49580 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 44778 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 50818 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 90226 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 90390 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 45216 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 40676 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 45396 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 16/06/1951 50757 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90245 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 44778 Transfer out to: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 49536 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 49608 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 90390 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 48765 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 17/07/1951 50736 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 52102 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 52358 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90360 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90533 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90558 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90641 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 90669 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 40676 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 48762 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 11/08/1951 51338 Transfer out to: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 11/08/1951 51510 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 44697 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90219 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90222 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90248 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90265 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90289 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90291 Transfer in from: 64A St Margarets    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90376 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90389 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90523 Transfer in from: 91X To Scottish Region    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90530 Transfer in from: 91X To Scottish Region    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90552 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 90675 Transfer in from: 91X To Scottish Region    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/09/1951 42551 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48713 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48722 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48725 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48727 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48755 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 48766 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 09/09/1951 45396 Transfer out to: 65F Grangemouth    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 06/10/1951 51338 Transfer in from: 28B Fleetwood    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 52102 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 52358 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 40588 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 90226 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 90265 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 49557 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 49591 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 90123 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 90413 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 52334 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 52389 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 42700 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 44697 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 90552 Transfer out to: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 44697 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 14/06/1952 50818 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 52390 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 40691 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 682 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 42706 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 52124 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40680 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 52165 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 682 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1952 42626 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1952 42630 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45711 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 52136 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 24/10/1952 80049 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 06/11/1952 80050 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 21/11/1952 80051 1st Allocation        
Steam 11 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 52300 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 05/12/1952 80052 1st Allocation        
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 06/12/1952 49591 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 13/12/1952 52266 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 22/12/1952 80053 1st Allocation        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 5w/e 03/01/1953 40582 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 11 0-6-0 5w/e 03/01/1953 52345 Transfer out to: 25C Goole    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 44927 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 3w/e 24/01/1953 51447 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 11 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52089 Transfer in from: 20D Normanton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52159 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 52559 Transfer in from: 20C Royston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 44697 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 3w/e 24/01/1953 51424 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 24/01/1953 52102 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 31/01/1953 52559 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52089 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52108 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 44889 Transfer out to: 24A Accrington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 44987 Transfer out to: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 52089 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 07/03/1953 52156 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 49508 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 21/03/1953 42708 Transfer out to: 62A Thornton Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 21/03/1953 42871 Transfer out to: 62A Thornton Junction    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 50757 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 21/03/1953 51496 Transfer out to: Horwich Works    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 90219 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 28/03/1953 52279 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 42708 Transfer in from: 62A Thornton Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 42871 Transfer in from: 62A Thornton Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 42878 Transfer in from: 62A Thornton Junction    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 18/04/1953 51496 Transfer in from: Horwich Works    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 52360 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 45719 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 52517 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 90641 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 44927 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 52239 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 52212 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 52132 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 52569 Transfer out to: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 45063 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 40680 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 52212 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 682 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 44697 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 45063 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 05/09/1953 51425 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 52271 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 52207 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 52343 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 52355 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 90173 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 46410 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 46411 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 49666 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 49667 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90283 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90576 Transfer in from:        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 42901 Transfer out to: 64A St Margarets    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 44940 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 90568 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 52300 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 52328 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 42901 Transfer in from: 64A St Margarets    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42726 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42727 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42728 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42732 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 42733 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 19/06/1954 42625 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 90101 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 52317 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 14/08/1954 45284 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 14/08/1954 48763 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 11/09/1954 51336 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/09/1954 47586 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/10/1954 42651 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/11/1954 42619 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/11/1954 42620 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 52443 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 46487 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 42820 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 01/01/1955 52334 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 52120 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 12/03/1955 51436 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 09/04/1955 51379 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 23/04/1955 51472 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 04/06/1955 52317 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 20/08/1955 49570 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 40014 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 40062 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 44040 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 44291 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 40014 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 08/10/1955 51470 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 05/11/1955 51390 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 52108 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 52360 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 52389 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 19/11/1955 49557 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 49511 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 49515 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 03/12/1955 51381 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 03/12/1955 51488 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 44040 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 03/12/1955 51488 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 90535 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 90675 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1955 44291 Transfer out to: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 07/01/1956 52300 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 52108 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 13089 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/02/1956 80044 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/02/1956 80046 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/02/1956 80060 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/02/1956 80061 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/02/1956 80093 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 10/03/1956 51488 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 46437 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 90163 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 13089 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1956 42285 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 43756 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 44022 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 44119 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 44486 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 44803 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 44845 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 45031 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/04/1956 47440 Transfer in from: 19E Belle Vue    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 58128 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90122 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90126 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90140 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90142 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90197 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90316 Transfer in from: 26F Belle Vue    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 90552 Transfer in from: 26G Belle Vue    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 28/04/1956 49666 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 90236 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 16/06/1956 42622 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 42713 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 42766 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 42789 Transfer out to: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 16/06/1956 48460 Transfer out to: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 07/07/1956 51390 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 49552 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 49624 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/08/1956 42289 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 90236 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 90283 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 90360 Transfer out to: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1956 52390 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 01/09/1956 49552 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1956 45076 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1956 45101 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1956 45341 Transfer in from: 25G Farnley Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1956 45435 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42063 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42450 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42451 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42461 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42568 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 42660 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80049 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80050 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80051 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80052 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1956 80053 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 42702 Transfer out to: 55C Farnley Junction    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 90122 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 20/10/1956 90126 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 52278 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 44486 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 44893 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 15/12/1956 52358 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 44893 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 29/12/1956 47301 Transfer in from: 21C Bromsgrove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 29/12/1956 47303 Transfer in from: 21C Bromsgrove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 29/12/1956 47305 Transfer in from: 21C Bromsgrove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 29/12/1956 47425 Transfer in from: 21C Bromsgrove    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52141 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52275 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52341 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 45234 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 29/12/1956 51338 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 26/01/1957 51447 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 45290 Transfer in from: 15D Bedford    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/02/1957 51307 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/02/1957 51338 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/02/1957 51343 Transfer in from: 23B Aintree    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/02/1957 51371 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 52270 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 42732 Transfer out to: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 45712 Transfer out to: 17F Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1957 47301 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1957 47303 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1957 47305 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/02/1957 47425 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/03/1957 51481 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 42711 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 42727 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 42878 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 23/03/1957 51371 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/04/1957 52165 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 10/04/1957 42618 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 45154 Transfer in from: 31A St Rollox (Balornock)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 45156 Transfer in from: 31A St Rollox (Balornock)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 52431 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 11 0-6-0 5w/e 20/04/1957 52089 Transfer out to: 56F Low Moor    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 58128 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 18/05/1957 51415 Transfer in from: 25A Wakefield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/05/1957 42278 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/05/1957 42491 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 18/05/1957 42492 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 43756 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 18/05/1957 51496 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 20/07/1957 51338 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 10/08/1957 D3372 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42281 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42290 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 46410 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 15/08/1957 D3373 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 16/08/1957 D3374 1st Allocation        
Steam 6P 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 45700 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 44119 Transfer out to: 24G Skipton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 90589 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST w/e 19/10/1957 51234 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 26/10/1957 51481 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 23/11/1957 51307 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 23/11/1957 51381 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 23/11/1957 52328 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 80046 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 80093 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 90140 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/12/1957 90113 Transfer out to: 56E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 21/12/1957 49560 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49592 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 28/12/1957 51371 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 28/12/1957 51497 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 52140 Transfer in from: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 52322 Transfer in from: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 52366 Transfer in from: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 90584 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 90675 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 22/02/1958 51336 Transfer out to: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 12/04/1958 52366 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 52161 Transfer in from: Horwich Works    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 52275 Transfer out to: Horwich Works    
Steam 11 0-6-0 m/e 06/1958 52159 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 07/06/1958 42618 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 52230 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 52275 Transfer in from: Horwich Works    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 90271 Transfer in from: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 90589 Transfer in from: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42282 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42283 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/06/1958 42284 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 90525 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 90708 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 92015 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 92016 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 92017 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 92161 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 92162 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1958 42286 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1958 42621 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 90289 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 90316 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 90327 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 90584 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 90706 Transfer out to: 24H Hellifield    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 42787 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 42853 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 44892 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 09/08/1958 45503 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1958 42280 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1958 42451 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1958 42486 Transfer out to: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/09/1958 42618 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/09/1958 42618 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42451 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 45509 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42450 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42461 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42568 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 52322 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST 4w/e 04/10/1958 51457 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 90289 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 D3374 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 42279 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 42787 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 42853 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 44892 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 45503 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 05/10/1958 42618 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST m/e 11/10/1958 51404 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48115 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48148 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48372 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48491 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48553 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48716 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/10/1958 48720 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 25/10/1958 51415 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/11/1958 47217 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 15/11/1958 44894 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 48462 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/11/1958 48745 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 22/11/1958 90552 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 22/11/1958 90558 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 28/11/1958 D3588 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/12/1958 D3589 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 10/12/1958 D3590 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/12/1958 47493 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/12/1958 47517 Transfer in from: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 17/12/1958 D3591 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 03/01/1959 D3592 1st Allocation        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 24/01/1959 90561 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 31/01/1959 90328 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/02/1959 90675 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 44894 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 28/02/1959 47546 Transfer in from: 19C Canklow    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 28/02/1959 47547 Transfer in from: 19C Canklow    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/03/1959 42548 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/03/1959 42549 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/03/1959 42549 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/03/1959 47493 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/03/1959 47517 Transfer out to: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST on 21/03/1959 51457 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 16/05/1959 49511 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 16/05/1959 49592 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 16/05/1959 49667 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 16/05/1959 51458 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 16/05/1959 51497 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42063 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42451 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 27/06/1959 42852 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 04/07/1959 42785 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1959 45614 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 11 0-6-0 m/e 08/1959 52278 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/08/1959 42568 Transfer in from: 91X To Scottish Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 12/09/1959 D3784 1st Allocation        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 42785 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 42852 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 19/09/1959 D3785 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1959 42568 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1959 45614 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1959 D3785 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 24/10/1959 52108 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 31/10/1959 42287 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 07/11/1959 40065 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 52431 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/11/1959 42651 Transfer out to: 87E Landore    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 28/11/1959 49515 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 D3779 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 D3842 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 D3843 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 D3844 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1959 D3845 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/12/1959 90245 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 12/12/1959 40013 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/12/1959 47440 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1960 42619 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 09/01/1960 42707 Transfer out to: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 09/01/1960 90669 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 16/01/1960 70045 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 16/01/1960 70048 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/01/1960 42280 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/01/1960 42620 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 49544 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 23/01/1960 49618 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 45031 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 45225 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 45284 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 30/01/1960 51343 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 05/02/1960 D3868 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42696 Transfer in from: 66B Motherwell    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42697 Transfer in from: 67D Ardrossan    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/02/1960 42698 Transfer in from: 66D Greenock Ladyburn    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 06/02/1960 70049 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90561 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 90570 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 13/02/1960 49544 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 27/02/1960 90222 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 27/02/1960 90530 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 27/02/1960 90570 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 on 27/02/1960 49624 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/03/1960 80060 Transfer out to: 63B Stirling    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 26/03/1960 45500 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 26/03/1960 45539 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/04/1960 45515 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/04/1960 47284 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/04/1960 42696 Transfer out to: 65J Fort William    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/04/1960 80044 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/04/1960 80061 Transfer out to: 65J Fort William    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 09/04/1960 90576 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/04/1960 42651 Transfer in from: 87E Landore    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/04/1960 42697 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/04/1960 42697 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 44746 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 45339 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 46106 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 46137 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/04/1960 42624 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 m/e 05/1960 52141 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 07/05/1960 40014 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 44894 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 45601 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 45652 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 45679 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 02/07/1960 45102 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 02/07/1960 45103 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 16/07/1960 52140 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/08/1960 44431 Transfer in from: 24H Hellifield    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/08/1960 47576 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 20/08/1960 52275 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 44746 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46106 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46137 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 44746 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46106 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46137 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/09/1960 47576 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 44746 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 44746 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 52161 Condemned      
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 05/11/1960 49508 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/11/1960 42703 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/11/1960 42728 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/11/1960 42901 Transfer out to: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 52341 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 03/12/1960 40062 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/12/1960 47582 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 on 21/12/1960 D2858 1st Allocation        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/12/1960 47640 Transfer in from: 56B Ardsley    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 31/12/1960 70014 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 31/12/1960 70015 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 46106 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 45255 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/01/1961 42660 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 46137 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1961 52270 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 28/01/1961 45105 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 04/03/1961 40015 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 11/03/1961 45500 Condemned      
Steam 23 0-6-0ST w/e 25/03/1961 51371 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/04/1961 42485 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1961 52230 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/05/1961 52271 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 06/05/1961 90142 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/06/1961 42485 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 44311 Transfer out to: 26D Bury    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45585 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45622 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45636 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45650 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45712 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 08/07/1961 45615 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/07/1961 45628 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/07/1961 45622 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 7F 0-8-0 w/e 15/07/1961 49618 Transfer out to: 26B Agecroft    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 12/08/1961 45509 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/08/1961 44951 Transfer out to: 56D Mirfield    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 26/08/1961 45650 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45522 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46133 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46139 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46140 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46142 Transfer in from: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84025 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84026 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 16/09/1961 84027 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 16/09/1961 70014 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 16/09/1961 70015 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 16/09/1961 70045 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 16/09/1961 70048 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 16/09/1961 70049 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 16/09/1961 45539 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 45585 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 45615 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 45628 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 45636 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1961 45712 Transfer out to: 14B Kentish Town    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 07/10/1961 D221 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 21/10/1961 84027 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 04/11/1961 84026 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 11/11/1961 84025 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/11/1961 42549 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/12/1961 D221 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/02/1962 D141 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 45290 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 45602 Transfer in from: 41D Canklow    
Steam 1153 0-4-0ST on 06/03/1962 51222 Condemned      
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 10/03/1962 D155 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 45578 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 17/03/1962 45623 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 45737 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 31/03/1962 D141 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/04/1962 44746 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 14/04/1962 90548 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 14/04/1962 90589 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Diesel 46 1Co-Co1 w/e 05/05/1962 D155 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 45515 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/07/1962 47546 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1962 47217 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 08/09/1962 40063 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42614 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42632 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42640 Transfer in from: 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 43952 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 44221 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 15/09/1962 47300 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 42704 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 42705 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 42708 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 46419 Transfer out to: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90248 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/09/1962 90328 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/09/1962 92015 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/09/1962 92016 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 15/09/1962 92017 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 29/09/1962 42714 Condemned      
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 46139 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 27/10/1962 42726 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/12/1962 92015 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/12/1962 92016 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/12/1962 92017 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 45156 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 45224 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 45232 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 29/12/1962 45679 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 29/12/1962 90105 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 29/12/1962 90163 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 29/12/1962 90376 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 29/12/1962 90523 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 90248 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 90328 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 90390 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 90399 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 90530 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 90548 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 90589 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 48115 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 48148 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 48491 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 48716 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 48720 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/01/1963 48745 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/01/1963 90183 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/01/1963 90371 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 12/01/1963 90568 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/01/1963 90589 Transfer out to: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 09/02/1963 90331 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/02/1963 45701 Condemned      
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 23/02/1963 46133 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 27/04/1963 45702 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 42709 Transfer out to: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/05/1963 90530 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/05/1963 48515 Transfer in from: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/05/1963 48618 Transfer in from: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 15/06/1963 42632 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44676 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44817 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44818 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44822 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45118 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45246 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45368 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45437 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45590 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45654 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45664 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45716 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/06/1963 47408 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 45522 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 46140 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 7P 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 46142 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/06/1963 48372 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/07/1963 42379 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1963 45652 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/07/1963 45103 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/07/1963 45195 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 20/07/1963 D2869 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 20/07/1963 D2858 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 27/07/1963 D2864 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 27/07/1963 D2865 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 45057 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 45073 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 45109 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 45380 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 45388 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 42701 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 42710 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 42733 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 42750 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 27/07/1963 42871 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/08/1963 42686 Transfer in from: 14E Bedford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 08/08/1963 47582 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/08/1963 47300 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/08/1963 46523 Transfer in from: 89C Machynlleth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/08/1963 47230 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 24/08/1963 D2865 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/08/1963 45109 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 24/08/1963 45380 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45590 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45664 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 46487 Transfer out to: 9P Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 28/09/1963 42288 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 28/09/1963 45706 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1963 42698 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 45057 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 45103 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 45118 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 45195 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 05/10/1963 45388 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 on 06/10/1963 92208 Transfer in from: 88L Cardiff East Dock    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 on 06/10/1963 92233 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 on 06/10/1963 92249 Transfer in from: 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport)    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 19/10/1963 D2866 Transfer in from: 26B Agecroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/10/1963 42492 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/10/1963 47230 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 26/10/1963 45717 Condemned      
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 02/11/1963 D2865 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 09/11/1963 D2867 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/11/1963 47656 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44817 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 44822 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 45368 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 45437 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44460 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 48106 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 48523 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 30/11/1963 44022 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 30/11/1963 90331 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/12/1963 48539 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/12/1963 43952 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/12/1963 48515 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/12/1963 48553 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 07/12/1963 90183 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/12/1963 47547 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/12/1963 44481 Transfer in from: 27E Walton on the Hill    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/01/1964 90390 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 44893 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 45104 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/01/1964 45154 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/01/1964 90366 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/01/1964 90568 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 08/02/1964 45635 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 15/02/1964 90533 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/02/1964 44696 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/02/1964 45220 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 22/02/1964 42623 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/02/1964 48618 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/03/1964 47660 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 07/03/1964 42280 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/03/1964 42054 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/03/1964 42464 Transfer in from: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 14/03/1964 45654 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 14/03/1964 90248 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/03/1964 47480 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 28/03/1964 92010 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 04/1964 90197 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 m/e 04/1964 90548 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42079 Transfer in from: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/04/1964 42115 Transfer in from: 26F Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46449 Transfer in from: 9P Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46452 Transfer in from: 9P Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/04/1964 46485 Transfer in from: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90123 Transfer in from: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90398 Transfer in from: 9P Lees (Oldham)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90525 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90708 Transfer in from:        
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1964 90718 Transfer in from: 26E Lees (Oldham)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/04/1964 43979 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/04/1964 44092 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 25/04/1964 45568 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 48331 Transfer in from: 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 48391 Transfer in from: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 48533 Transfer in from: 18D Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 48765 Transfer in from: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90346 Transfer in from: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90516 Transfer in from: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90520 Transfer in from: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90697 Transfer in from: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 25/04/1964 45602 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 25/04/1964 45568 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 90371 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/05/1964 44221 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/05/1964 44543 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 09/05/1964 90328 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 09/05/1964 90715 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 16/05/1964 42614 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 16/05/1964 42686 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/05/1964 42697 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 30/05/1964 42619 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 30/05/1964 45578 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 30/05/1964 45737 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 06/06/1964 45710 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/06/1964 42656 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 13/06/1964 90346 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42087 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1964 42660 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45017 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45083 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45150 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45154 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45271 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45343 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45381 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45592 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45653 Transfer in from: 10B Blackpool Central    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 45705 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 20/06/1964 92077 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 45104 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 45451 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1964 48318 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1964 48321 Transfer in from: 28B Dalry Road    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1964 48372 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1964 48397 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1964 48612 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1964 48708 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1964 48758 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/06/1964 48775 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92022 Transfer in from: 15C Kettering    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92080 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92081 Transfer in from: 15B Kettering    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92010 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92015 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92017 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92208 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92233 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 27/06/1964 92249 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90123 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90271 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90289 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90291 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90389 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 04/07/1964 90398 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 04/07/1964 42054 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/07/1964 44676 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/07/1964 48756 Transfer in from: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1964 45154 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/07/1964 45451 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 11/07/1964 90399 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 11/07/1964 90520 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 11/07/1964 90561 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 D2224 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 D2225 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 D2226 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 D2227 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 D2228 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45564 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/07/1964 48136 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/07/1964 48426 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/07/1964 48464 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45716 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 18/07/1964 45564 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 25/07/1964 45623 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/08/1964 42379 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/08/1964 45252 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/08/1964 45409 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 08/08/1964 46472 Transfer in from: 8E Northwich    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/08/1964 48532 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 08/08/1964 90697 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/08/1964 45558 Transfer in from: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/08/1964 45661 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 15/08/1964 45558 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 29/08/1964 90520 Transfer in from: 8L Aintree    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1964 47640 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/09/1964 44092 Condemned      
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1964 90516 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1964 90520 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 19/09/1964 90718 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 19/09/1964 42620 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 19/09/1964 42651 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/09/1964 47284 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92018 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92110 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92114 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 26/09/1964 92159 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 45409 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 26/09/1964 42640 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 26/09/1964 44431 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 26/09/1964 45592 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 26/09/1964 45601 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 03/10/1964 45580 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 03/10/1964 92026 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 10/10/1964 D2859 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92050 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92051 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92052 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 10/10/1964 92076 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/10/1964 48106 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/10/1964 48523 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1964 44247 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 17/10/1964 D2867 Transfer out to: 10C Fleetwood    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/10/1964 48318 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/10/1964 48397 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/10/1964 48708 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 24/10/1964 92056 Transfer in from: 16E Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 31/10/1964 44460 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 44544 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/11/1964 48318 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 44895 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 45017 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 45104 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 45150 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 45233 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/11/1964 45381 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 14/11/1964 43979 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 45073 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/11/1964 48539 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 44481 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 05/12/1964 45252 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 12/12/1964 45580 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/12/1964 48464 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/01/1965 45593 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 02/01/1965 45600 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/01/1965 42660 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 09/01/1965 92076 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 09/01/1965 45642 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 46472 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1965 46513 Transfer in from: 89A Oswestry    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1965 46514 Transfer in from: 89A Oswestry    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/03/1965 48759 Transfer out to: 15B Wellingborough    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 28/03/1965 45593 Transfer out to: 55A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/04/1965 44544 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 03/04/1965 45653 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/04/1965 46406 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/04/1965 46412 Transfer in from: 26D Bury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/04/1965 46501 Transfer in from: 9M Bury    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 24/04/1965 45604 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Diesel 01 0-4-0 w/e 01/05/1965 D2954 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 01 0-4-0 w/e 01/05/1965 D2955 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 01 0-4-0 w/e 01/05/1965 D2956 Transfer in from: 30A Stratford    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/05/1965 92026 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/05/1965 92110 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/05/1965 92114 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/05/1965 92159 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/05/1965 92161 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 22/05/1965 92162 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/06/1965 D3699 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/06/1965 42700 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/06/1965 42715 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/06/1965 42831 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/06/1965 42905 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/06/1965 42938 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/06/1965 48543 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/06/1965 48557 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 12/06/1965 42492 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 44696 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 44822 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 44926 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 44949 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45026 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45077 Transfer in from: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45133 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45382 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45420 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/06/1965 47681 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/06/1965 48744 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46513 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 46523 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42542 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 45291 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 46514 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44861 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44938 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 45206 Transfer in from: 24F Fleetwood    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 46485 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 17/07/1965 42542 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 17/07/1965 42905 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 17/07/1965 45604 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48174 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/07/1965 48602 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 24/07/1965 70017 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 24/07/1965 70021 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 24/07/1965 70034 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 24/07/1965 70044 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 24/07/1965 92031 Transfer in from: 16G Westhouses    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 24/07/1965 92071 Transfer in from: 38B Annesley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 31/07/1965 44846 Transfer in from: 16D Annesley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 07/08/1965 42844 Transfer in from: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/08/1965 47681 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 14/08/1965 45632 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/08/1965 42464 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/08/1965 45077 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/08/1965 42283 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/08/1965 47362 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48171 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48369 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 28/08/1965 42844 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 09/1965 47480 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/09/1965 42676 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/09/1965 46452 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 25/09/1965 42938 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/10/1965 45026 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 09/10/1965 45632 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 16/10/1965 45654 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/10/1965 45291 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 30/10/1965 42715 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 30/10/1965 42831 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/10/1965 48532 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 w/e 06/11/1965 12024 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 06/11/1965 42700 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/11/1965 48171 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/11/1965 48765 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 06/11/1965 45705 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/11/1965 47362 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/11/1965 D3772 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/11/1965 47520 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/11/1965 47408 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/11/1965 47388 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/11/1965 47520 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 04/12/1965 92051 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 04/12/1965 92071 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 44247 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 18/12/1965 45600 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/12/1965 48391 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/12/1965 47656 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/01/1966 47660 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/01/1966 47383 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/01/1966 47631 Transfer in from: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/01/1966 44926 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/01/1966 44933 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/01/1966 48369 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/01/1966 48744 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 15/01/1966 45435 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Diesel 01 0-4-0 w/e 05/02/1966 D2956 Transfer out to: 36A Doncaster    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 05/02/1966 92022 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 05/02/1966 92050 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/02/1966 45205 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/02/1966 45234 Transfer in from: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/02/1966 48543 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 12/02/1966 92081 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/02/1966 48691 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 26/02/1966 48331 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/03/1966 48046 Transfer in from: 16G Westhouses    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 05/03/1966 70000 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1966 48612 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/03/1966 48691 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/04/1966 48536 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/04/1966 48010 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1966 44736 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1966 44893 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1966 45411 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 21/05/1966 70017 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 21/05/1966 70021 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 21/05/1966 70034 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 w/e 21/05/1966 70044 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 28/05/1966 12095 Transfer in from: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 28/05/1966 D3988 Transfer in from: 84F Stourbridge Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/05/1966 48471 Transfer in from: 89A Shrewsbury    
Steam Britannia 4-6-2 on 28/05/1966 70000 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 06/1966 47631 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48026 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48775 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/06/1966 48426 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 25/06/1966 45654 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/07/1966 D3699 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 02/07/1966 D3988 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 46490 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 46505 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/08/1966 47202 Transfer in from: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/08/1966 48742 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/08/1966 42087 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/08/1966 42283 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/08/1966 42548 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 44934 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 45133 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 45339 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 45343 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 45382 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/08/1966 48536 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 06/08/1966 92018 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 06/08/1966 92056 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/08/1966 46412 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 13/08/1966 46504 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 13/08/1966 46506 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/08/1966 48200 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/08/1966 42079 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/08/1966 42115 Transfer out to: 12C Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/08/1966 42656 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 13/08/1966 92080 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 20/08/1966 46436 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 25/08/1966 42676 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 03/09/1966 46417 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/09/1966 48197 Transfer in from: 40E Colwick    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1966 D2207 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1966 D2214 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1966 D2234 Transfer in from: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 17/09/1966 92247 Transfer in from: 84C Banbury    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 24/09/1966 D2207 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 10/1966 48318 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 08/10/1966 92247 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/10/1966 46443 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/10/1966 46448 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/10/1966 46504 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 44781 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 44782 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/10/1966 D3860 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/10/1966 45205 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 12050 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 12051 Transfer in from: 16G Westhouses    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 12081 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 12098 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 D3686 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/11/1966 45222 Transfer in from: 16B Colwick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/11/1966 48620 Transfer in from: 16B Colwick    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1966 12060 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/12/1966 48612 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/12/1966 47202 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 17/12/1966 47388 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/12/1966 48372 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 07/01/1967 12033 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 07/01/1967 D3335 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/01/1967 45341 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/01/1967 48756 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 07/01/1967 92031 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1967 45336 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 14/01/1967 46411 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 46406 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 46418 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/02/1967 47383 Transfer out to: 16G Westhouses    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/02/1967 45222 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/02/1967 46417 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48655 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/03/1967 48136 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/03/1967 48090 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/03/1967 46443 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 01/04/1967 92077 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/04/1967 48174 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46505 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46436 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46437 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46448 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46449 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46490 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46501 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/05/1967 46506 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/05/1967 44696 Condemned      
Diesel 01 0-4-0 w/e 10/06/1967 D2954 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Diesel 01 0-4-0 w/e 10/06/1967 D2955 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 17/06/1967 D3779 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 17/06/1967 92016 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam Standard Class 9F 2-10-0 w/e 17/06/1967 92052 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/07/1967 48557 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/07/1967 48602 Condemned      
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 22/07/1967 D2859 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 22/07/1967 D2865 Transfer out to: 50D Goole    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48368 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/08/1967 48655 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/09/1967 48742 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1967 45234 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1967 44736 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/09/1967 45271 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 44809 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 45330 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/10/1967 48335 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/10/1967 48345 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/10/1967 48373 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 14/10/1967 44938 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 21/10/1967 44822 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 11/1967 44861 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 11/1967 44893 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/11/1967 48369 Transfer in from: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/11/1967 48471 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/11/1967 44697 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 44780 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 44962 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 45268 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1967 45310 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/12/1967 48132 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/12/1967 48678 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel D3/7 0-6-0 on 16/12/1967 12024 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/12/1967 45083 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/12/1967 48758 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/12/1967 44962 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 30/12/1967 45246 Condemned      
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 06/01/1968 D2858 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 44884 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 44910 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/01/1968 45254 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1968 48046 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1968 48200 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1968 48335 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1968 48345 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 13/01/1968 44846 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/01/1968 48010 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/02/1968 48026 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/02/1968 48090 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1968 44735 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/03/1968 44851 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/03/1968 45101 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 30/03/1968 48197 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 04/1968 44851 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 13/04/1968 D2224 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 13/04/1968 D2226 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 13/04/1968 D2227 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 13/04/1968 D2234 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 20/04/1968 D2373 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 20/04/1968 D2389 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 20/04/1968 D2391 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 05/1968 45254 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 45200 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48356 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48529 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48665 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48687 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/05/1968 48746 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 11/05/1968 D2373 Condemned      
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2214 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2225 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2228 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2389 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2391 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/05/1968 48533 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/05/1968 48687 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/05/1968 48746 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 06/1968 44803 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 06/1968 45411 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/06/1968 48132 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/06/1968 48321 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/06/1968 48373 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 44780 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 44818 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 44845 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 44884 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 44890 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 44891 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 44910 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 44949 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 45076 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 45202 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 45203 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 45255 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1968 45420 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/06/1968 48356 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/06/1968 48368 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/06/1968 48369 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/06/1968 48529 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/06/1968 48612 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/06/1968 48620 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/06/1968 48678 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 12033 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 12050 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 12051 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 12060 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 12081 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 12095 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 12098 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D2858 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D2864 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D2866 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 02 0-4-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D2869 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3335 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3372 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3373 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3588 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3589 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3590 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3591 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3592 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3686 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3772 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3784 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3842 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3843 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3844 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3845 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3860 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 D3868 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 44735 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 44809 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45200 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45206 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45268 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45310 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/07/1968 45330 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/07/1968 48665 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 08017 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3588 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3589 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3590 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3592 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3686 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3695 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3765 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3767 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3793 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3842 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3843 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3844 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3845 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1973 D3927 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/08/1973 08017 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/08/1973 D3695 Transfer out to: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 06/10/1973 D3109 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 06/10/1973 D3197 Transfer in from: 8J Allerton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/11/1973 08759 Transfer out to: KM Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/12/1973 D3283 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1974 08600 Transfer out to: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1974 D3845 Transfer out to: LA Laira    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/04/1974 08068 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/04/1974 08068 Transfer out to: LO Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/10/1974 08703 Transfer in from: LO Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1974 08016 Transfer in from: TO Toton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/11/1974 08703 Transfer out to: TO Toton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 05/04/1975 08605 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 05/04/1975 08473 Transfer out to: CD Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 14/06/1975 08605 Transfer out to: DY Derby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 23/08/1975 08569 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 3w/e 08/05/1976 08598 Transfer out to: DY Derby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 24/07/1976 08474 Transfer out to: BS Bescot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/05/1980 08016 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/11/1980 08084 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/11/1980 08213 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 17/07/1983 08129 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 06/01/1986 08524 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 07/12/1986 08477 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 09/03/1987 08475 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 27/04/1988 08626 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 10/06/1993 08677 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 31/08/2005 08675 Condemned