Depot: Northampton
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1930 | 4304 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1930 | 4304 | Transfer out to: | W37 | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5290 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5296 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5298 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5406 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9396 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25406 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1936 | 25296 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1936 | 25290 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1936 | 5290 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1938 | 25298 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 03/1939 | 8114 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 653 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4076 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 420 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 421 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4366 | Snapshot | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4491 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4596 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4915 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5150 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5191 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5282 | Snapshot | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5290 | Snapshot | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 534 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 653 | Snapshot | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 653 | Snapshot | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 657 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6666 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6742 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 692 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7299 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7318 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7612 | Snapshot | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8114 | Snapshot | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8422 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8423 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8426 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8445 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8914 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8929 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8936 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9004 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9042 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9103 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9153 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9157 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9158 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9169 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9203 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9205 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9270 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9271 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9321 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9324 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9395 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9396 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9414 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9426 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 6742 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 6742 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 49324 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 8929 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 49158 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 8936 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9004 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9157 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9203 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9042 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9103 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 45282 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8011 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8054 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8090 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8122 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8441 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8493 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8534 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8535 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8536 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8549 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 483 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 692 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9395 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9414 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 46616 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 44387 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 49069 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 6711 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 49426 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 8557 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 41219 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 41218 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 6711 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 6742 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 48908 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5379 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9205 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 48908 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 48908 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 44072 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 44366 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 48908 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Coventry | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 49357 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 9444 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 49069 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 40483 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 48536 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42670 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42671 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 42672 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 8354 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 45150 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 4915 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 42671 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 42666 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 48122 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 8354 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 45021 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 45091 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 42670 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 42672 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 44596 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 49169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 42666 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 48011 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 48550 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 9399 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 58290 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 49430 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1950 | 49399 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 44061 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 48054 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 48535 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 48549 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 48693 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44061 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44061 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44387 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 40527 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 40531 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44448 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 49104 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 49105 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 49153 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40529 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40527 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44448 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 40529 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 40529 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40531 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 49271 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 49430 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 45014 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 49096 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45014 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 49096 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 45014 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 49096 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 44354 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 44072 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 58290 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 40529 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 44685 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 40464 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44685 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 44120 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/04/1952 | 49096 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 44525 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48446 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 44525 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 58281 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 44525 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 44391 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 58281 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 58281 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 49105 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 48914 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 44120 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 44354 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 44525 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 40683 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44186 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44242 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 44524 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Stratford-on-Avon (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48426 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48441 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 48534 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 48426 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 48441 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 48534 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 48445 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 48445 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 48426 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 48423 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 40677 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 43399 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90369 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90392 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90423 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 90532 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 58281 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40420 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 19/06/1954 | 46666 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 41229 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 40412 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 45231 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 45292 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 48147 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 48423 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 41229 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44219 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 45231 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 48446 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40657 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 48441 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 12071 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 44186 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 47299 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 12071 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 41226 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45014 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45379 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 41226 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45050 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 40421 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 44491 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 44491 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40464 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40534 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40653 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44061 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 48305 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 48360 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 48692 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 90369 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 90392 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 90423 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 90532 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 48269 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45021 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48290 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48659 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 42353 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 47499 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 49321 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 49357 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 41320 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40677 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40683 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48659 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48692 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45409 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 48423 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 43877 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 45222 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 45237 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48012 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48018 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 49270 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 42615 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 44712 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 45147 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 44353 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 43877 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 45307 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 48012 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 47612 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 48018 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48529 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48736 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45237 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 45409 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 41278 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 41320 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42467 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 49104 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | D3798 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | D3799 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | D3798 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | D3799 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48122 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48440 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 43957 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44110 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44239 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44247 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44522 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 42467 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44712 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 44391 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 45292 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 44110 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 44239 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 44075 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 44110 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 44239 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 44504 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45292 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 44504 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 27/08/1960 | 43399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 44340 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 42576 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 42579 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45191 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45222 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45292 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 45020 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 45222 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 41278 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 44057 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 48131 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 48349 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 48757 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45020 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45050 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45091 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45147 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45222 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45307 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45392 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 48680 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 42579 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42579 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 42430 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42430 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 48360 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 41278 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 42576 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 45301 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 40010 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 42579 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 44075 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 43957 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 44869 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 45332 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 45454 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 44057 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 44110 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 44340 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 44242 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 44076 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 48360 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 42381 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 42579 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40010 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 42579 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 48529 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 42615 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 48534 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1961 | D2395 | Transfer in from: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | D2395 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45302 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45427 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 44936 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45147 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45184 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 45147 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 42351 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 45184 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 45332 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 41219 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 45302 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 45302 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 45051 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 45134 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 48269 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 48122 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 42183 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 42351 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 41219 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 42183 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 42183 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 44364 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 44370 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 48445 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 48736 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 42233 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 44364 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 43052 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 43112 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 43115 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42353 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 42381 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 48360 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42562 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42573 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 43026 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 44219 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 44239 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 44353 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 44491 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 44522 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 44524 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 47286 | Transfer in from: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 48658 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 48754 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 42562 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 42573 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 47318 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 41278 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 44247 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 44370 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45301 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45427 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 48757 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/10/1962 | 42183 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 44713 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 48305 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 48440 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 48493 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 48680 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 45050 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 48131 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 48290 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 48422 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 48754 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 47653 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45044 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45392 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 45044 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45349 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48016 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48449 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 43112 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 43115 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 48506 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | D2907 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 45270 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 48247 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 48440 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 48754 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44713 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45050 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 45270 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 47590 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1964 | 48018 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48020 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48347 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48354 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48369 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48738 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48739 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 47653 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 45426 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45349 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45426 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45454 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 42233 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45056 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45349 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45426 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45454 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48016 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48018 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48147 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48347 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48354 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48369 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48658 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48738 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 48754 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 48134 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 48147 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 45056 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48134 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48147 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 48385 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1965 | 48506 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 48365 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D3066 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | D3068 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 48550 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 48688 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 41218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 92033 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 17/07/1965 | 92087 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 41219 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48688 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 48247 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 48020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 92132 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 48365 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 48739 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 47286 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 47499 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 12009 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 92033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 12009 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D2907 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D3066 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D3068 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44869 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44936 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45051 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45134 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45302 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45349 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45392 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45426 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45454 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 47590 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48349 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48385 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48440 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48449 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48550 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 92087 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 92132 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 24/09/1966 | 43026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 05/11/1966 | 43052 | Condemned |