Depot: Norwich Thorpe
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 14/12/1924 | 07228 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 08/03/1925 | 07228 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 27/05/1926 | 07228 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 03/01/1927 | 07228 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/12/1928 | 4655 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/03/1930 | 4655 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/09/1930 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/10/1930 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/10/1930 | 4644 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1930 | 4644 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/05/1932 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/08/1932 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/10/1932 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/10/1932 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/01/1933 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1933 | 4676 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/08/1933 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/10/1934 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/10/1934 | 4676 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/11/1934 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/11/1934 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/12/1934 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/12/1934 | 4676 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1935 | 4678 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1935 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1935 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1935 | 4678 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/10/1935 | 4653 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/10/1935 | 4661 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1935 | 4655 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/10/1935 | 4644 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 289 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 4678 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1935 | 7045 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1935 | 7047 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 7530 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 7566 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J19 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 8145 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J19 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 8148 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 8154 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J19 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 8261 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 8843 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 8859 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/11/1935 | 4653 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | q/e | 12/1935 | 2495 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 7824 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 12/1935 | 8080 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 8831 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 8886 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 4678 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/12/1935 | 4678 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4631 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 8094 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 8880 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4661 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4678 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 8080 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 8154 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J19 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 8261 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 8831 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 7824 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/02/1936 | 4631 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/02/1936 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/02/1936 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/02/1936 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/10/1936 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/10/1936 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/10/1936 | 4676 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/01/1937 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/01/1937 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/01/1937 | 4676 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/05/1938 | 1922 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/06/1938 | 1971 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/07/1938 | 1974 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1938 | 289 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/10/1938 | 4671 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1939 | 2996 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1939 | 1974 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/07/1939 | 2996 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1939 | 1974 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1939 | 1974 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1939 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/11/1939 | 4655 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/12/1939 | 4655 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/01/1940 | 4667 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1940 | 1971 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/02/1940 | 4667 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/02/1940 | 4676 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1941 | 1922 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1941 | 3401 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/12/1941 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/02/1942 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/07/1943 | 8302 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/07/1943 | 1266 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/07/1943 | 2965 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/07/1943 | 2988 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1943 | 1259 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1943 | 2774 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1943 | 2708 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1943 | 2972 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1943 | 2968 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1943 | 1266 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1943 | 1259 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1943 | 2774 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1944 | 8304 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/05/1944 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/05/1944 | 4655 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1944 | 8302 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/06/1944 | 8304 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 1930 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1944 | 2772 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/09/1944 | 2777 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1944 | 2953 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1944 | 2776 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/02/1945 | 4644 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/02/1945 | 4671 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/02/1945 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/02/1945 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/02/1945 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/09/1945 | 8304 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1945 | 8301 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1945 | 8309 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1945 | 8305 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 4658 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 4662 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1946 | 1268 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1946 | 1269 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/04/1946 | 4656 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/04/1946 | 2773 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1946 | 2965 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1946 | 2968 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/05/1946 | 1043 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/05/1946 | 2771 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1946 | 1044 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1946 | 1045 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1946 | 1046 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1946 | 1047 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/06/1946 | 1048 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1946 | 1049 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1946 | 1050 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1946 | 1051 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1946 | 1041 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1946 | 1040 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1946 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/07/1946 | 1042 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1946 | 1003 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1946 | 1004 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/07/1946 | 2777 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1946 | 1052 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1946 | 1008 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1946 | 4833 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/10/1946 | 2772 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/10/1946 | 3445 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1946 | 2550 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1946 | 2988 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1946 | 4957 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/12/1946 | 4655 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1946 | 2951 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1946 | 4798 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1946 | 4913 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/12/1946 | 4833 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/02/1947 | 1737 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/02/1947 | 1738 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1947 | 4726 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1947 | 4889 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1947 | 4959 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1947 | 4968 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1947 | 1738 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1947 | 1745 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1947 | 1748 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1947 | 1754 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/04/1947 | 4838 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/05/1947 | 1730 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/06/1947 | 1721 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/06/1947 | 1740 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/06/1947 | 1742 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/06/1947 | 1743 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/07/1947 | 4730 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 27/08/1947 | 1730 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1947 | 4784 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1947 | 4884 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 4798 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/10/1947 | 1721 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/10/1947 | 1997 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1740 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1742 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1743 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1752 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1947 | 1737 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1947 | 1746 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1947 | 1753 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 11/1947 | 7116 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1947 | 4798 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1947 | 4799 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1947 | 1254 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/12/1947 | 1270 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1947 | 1271 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/12/1947 | 1272 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1626 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1644 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1670 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1921 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1939 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1942 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1947 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1953 | Snapshot | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1957 | Snapshot | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1970 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1971 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1973 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1989 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2203 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2495 | Snapshot | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2511 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2511 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2517 | Snapshot | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2522 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2529 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2541 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2545 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2554 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2554 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2555 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2563 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2564 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2568 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2570 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2577 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2581 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2583 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2585 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2599 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2600 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2610 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2619 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2620 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2782 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2787 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2789 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2792 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2793 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2797 | Snapshot | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5355 | Snapshot | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5373 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5390 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5394 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5398 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5401 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5404 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5408 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5411 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5417 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5422 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5426 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5435 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5460 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5464 | Snapshot | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5470 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5471 | Snapshot | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5478 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5516 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5534 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5553 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5569 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5570 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5578 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 68384 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7127 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7134 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7139 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7156 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7174 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7176 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7178 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7184 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7186 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7663 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7664 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8377 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8495 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8501 | Snapshot | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8586 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8595 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8641 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8641 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8643 | Snapshot | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 1970 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 1971 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 5435 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 7158 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 7177 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 7186 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 1970 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 1971 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 5435 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/01/1948 | 7186 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1948 | 4799 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2588 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4799 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 4799 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 7156 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 2560 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 2617 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J65 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8214 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 5417 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7157 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1948 | 1254 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 25/01/1948 | 7157 | Transfer out to: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 5469 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 2564 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 5435 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 2555 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 2560 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 5516 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5524 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5568 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5553 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2555 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2593 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5419 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2616 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 2617 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 5472 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 5574 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 7158 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 5417 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 2560 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 2560 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/04/1948 | 5411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 2616 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 8570 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 5574 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 5507 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 5553 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 8536 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 8377 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 7126 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 2545 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 7177 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 7184 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1948 | 5394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | on | 29/05/1948 | 7134 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1626 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 2560 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 5470 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/06/1948 | 2600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5512 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 5513 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 2207 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 1625 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1948 | 61334 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1948 | 61332 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1948 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 61332 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 61332 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 5470 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 5574 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 5401 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 7174 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J65 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 8214 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 06/08/1948 | 2563 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 2545 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 61947 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1948 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/08/1948 | 61334 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 2545 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 2560 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 5574 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 67665 | Transfer out to: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 67677 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J65 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 8214 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 1953 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2560 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 2620 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 24/09/1948 | 2560 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 1812 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 1835 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 1847 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 2561 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 1644 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 1939 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 1989 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 5470 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 5479 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 61659 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 61921 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 61973 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 1959 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 2613 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 2611 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 2612 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5470 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 7673 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 2545 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | on | 08/11/1948 | 2207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 23/11/1948 | 2583 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 1644 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 61659 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 2561 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 61670 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/11/1948 | 8570 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/12/1948 | 8570 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 1953 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 1989 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2606 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 61921 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 61947 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7174 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7224 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7229 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 1835 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 2545 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 5507 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 2545 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 5433 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 7667 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 7671 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 7679 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 8905 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 2612 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 61959 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 62613 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 2612 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 5507 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 68381 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 68388 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 5478 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 30537 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 30539 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32546 | Transfer in from: | FRA | Fratton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 1939 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2780 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5514 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 5551 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 65353 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 69709 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 9707 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2606 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 67127 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 7667 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 7671 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 69706 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 5470 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 7673 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 61644 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J65 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8214 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 68899 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 65553 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 61629 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 5433 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 65353 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 11/06/1949 | 67176 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 2796 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 64834 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 62553 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 07/1949 | 67232 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 7224 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 62553 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 67232 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 62553 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 16/07/1949 | 67232 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 62612 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 67186 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 68536 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 7174 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 61629 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 61670 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 7224 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 65534 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 5471 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/10/1949 | 68595 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 19/10/1949 | 62535 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/10/1949 | 64834 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 2584 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 2529 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 61939 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 65551 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 65553 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 62203 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 7176 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 68602 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 7224 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 62540 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 65471 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 67176 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 67231 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68602 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68602 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 65471 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 67231 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 8924 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 65471 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 67231 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 65367 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 65367 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 65367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 01/1950 | 67126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61939 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61942 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61971 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61812 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61942 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 61971 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 65396 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 5574 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 65396 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 65419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 04/1950 | 68384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/04/1950 | 62556 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1950 | 64872 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1950 | 64798 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1950 | 64838 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 64724 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 64799 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 64872 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 62588 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 62599 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62611 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 67224 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 67794 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 67231 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/07/1950 | 62606 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1950 | 69708 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 30/07/1950 | 67224 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 08/1950 | 67798 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 69679 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 67224 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 67224 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 69679 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 67224 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 69679 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1950 | 61052 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 10/1950 | 68381 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 65570 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 67794 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/10/1950 | 61730 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61545 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61730 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61730 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 61545 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 61545 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 65510 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 5578 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 61971 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 62556 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65388 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65510 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65510 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1950 | 65373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65388 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65388 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F3 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 12/1950 | 67139 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/12/1950 | 61747 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 61971 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 69708 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61971 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61971 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1951 | 64771 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 61545 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/01/1951 | 64833 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/01/1951 | 69835 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 64771 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 69835 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 64771 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 69835 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/02/1951 | 69836 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/02/1951 | 69840 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 65512 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 65570 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 18/02/1951 | 69837 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 18/02/1951 | 67663 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 18/02/1951 | 67677 | Transfer out to: | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 61530 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/02/1951 | 69842 | Transfer in from: | SAL | Salisbury | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 69842 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61730 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 61747 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 61530 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 61877 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 61908 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65570 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 61530 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65422 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65570 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61877 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61908 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61877 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 61908 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69835 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69837 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69840 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 64771 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 28/04/1951 | 70008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 04/05/1951 | 70009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 05/05/1951 | 70010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 62556 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 65512 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 65514 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70006 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70007 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/05/1951 | 69835 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/05/1951 | 69840 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/05/1951 | 61050 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/05/1951 | 61051 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 14/05/1951 | 70011 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61514 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61542 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 62556 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 65512 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69835 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69840 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 70006 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 70007 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61530 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61877 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61908 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 62556 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 65512 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69835 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 19/05/1951 | 69840 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 70006 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 70007 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1951 | 69837 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 21/05/1951 | 70012 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/05/1951 | 65426 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 62598 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 62608 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 65514 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 69837 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61514 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 65390 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 65472 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 65507 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 68388 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 69837 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1951 | 61047 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 30/05/1951 | 70013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 65472 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/06/1951 | 69840 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62598 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62608 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 65514 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67710 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61542 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62598 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 62608 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 65514 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67232 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 61047 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64900 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 70009 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 61047 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64900 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 61047 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 61921 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 61942 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 61947 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 62608 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64900 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 67176 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 67178 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 01/07/1951 | 69837 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61568 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61661 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61665 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61659 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61670 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 61568 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 61661 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 61665 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 61568 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 61661 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 61665 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 67710 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/08/1951 | 69835 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/08/1951 | 69836 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 62610 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 61040 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 61049 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 61847 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 65507 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 68623 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 68635 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 65507 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 68623 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 68635 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 2796 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 65507 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 68623 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 68635 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 61664 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 62788 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 61661 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 62780 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1951 | 64959 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 65574 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 61664 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 62788 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65547 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 69708 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 70009 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 61664 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 62788 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64784 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 67224 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 70006 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 64797 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 67704 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 67708 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1951 | 61050 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1951 | 61112 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1951 | 61182 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 61050 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 61112 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 61182 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 61050 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 61112 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 61182 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 65574 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 70006 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 62610 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 65586 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 65404 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1951 | 61110 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1951 | 61377 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1951 | 65408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/12/1951 | 61051 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61051 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61377 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61877 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61908 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61981 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 62608 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 65567 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61051 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 61377 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 65510 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 61877 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 62608 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 61877 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 62608 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 61110 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 61112 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 61182 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1952 | 61377 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1952 | 64797 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61659 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61670 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 62509 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 62538 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65551 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61664 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61665 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65512 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65514 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65547 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/02/1952 | 65398 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61659 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61670 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62509 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62538 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 64797 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65551 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61659 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61670 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62509 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 62538 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 64797 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65551 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62523 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 65516 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68567 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62541 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 62616 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 65388 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68586 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 62562 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | on | 28/04/1952 | 62538 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/05/1952 | 69824 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/05/1952 | 62598 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69824 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 8568 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 68623 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 69824 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/05/1952 | 69826 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62568 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62588 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62599 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 68494 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 68586 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 69826 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 62568 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 67664 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 67704 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 67708 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 69826 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62568 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62588 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62599 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68494 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68586 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62568 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62588 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 62599 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68494 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68586 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 8568 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62545 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62562 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62568 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62585 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62588 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 62599 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 67229 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 65586 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 62545 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 62561 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 62564 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 62592 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 62596 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 65388 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/09/1952 | 62509 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1952 | 64797 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62545 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62561 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62564 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62592 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62596 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 65388 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62545 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62561 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62564 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62592 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 62596 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 65388 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61981 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65541 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65542 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65573 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65568 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65541 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65542 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65573 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68557 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65541 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65542 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65573 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68557 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68557 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 22/12/1952 | 70035 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 65541 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1952 | 64797 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65514 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65586 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65507 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 09/02/1953 | 70039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61981 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 68557 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 09/03/1953 | 62581 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 21/03/1953 | 70040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67707 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67714 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67718 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69690 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69696 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 61981 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 67798 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 61981 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67718 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 69709 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/05/1953 | 61041 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/05/1953 | 61050 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/05/1953 | 61050 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1953 | 61041 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 61041 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 61044 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/06/1953 | 64882 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/06/1953 | 64968 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61637 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61656 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61664 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61665 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62552 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61659 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61670 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62545 | Transfer out to: | 31E | Bury St Edmunds | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62570 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62576 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 62606 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 67714 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 70039 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 70040 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 65509 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 70030 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 61568 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 61637 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 62592 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 65586 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68514 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68516 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68592 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68597 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68608 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68616 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68645 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68664 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68494 | Transfer out to: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68495 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68501 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68567 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68570 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68602 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68603 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68635 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61332 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 61530 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 62592 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 68523 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 68586 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 64882 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61271 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61272 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/10/1953 | 64968 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/10/1953 | 64724 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61918 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 67739 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61953 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61989 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/10/1953 | 61047 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 62596 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 61953 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 61989 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 62596 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65557 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65509 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 67707 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/01/1954 | 64724 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 65513 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 69708 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 67707 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 62564 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1954 | 64726 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 65551 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 30537 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 61530 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 62552 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 69696 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 61540 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 62564 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 69698 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 61989 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 62797 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 61568 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 61629 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1954 | 61113 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/09/1954 | 61279 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/09/1954 | 61317 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 61545 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 61547 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/10/1954 | 61312 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1954 | 64900 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 61989 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1954 | 61279 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 29/11/1954 | 62782 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/12/1954 | 61113 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 61629 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 61514 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 61533 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 61542 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 61545 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 61656 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 61664 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 61665 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 62564 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/02/1955 | 64882 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1955 | 65569 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | on | 28/02/1955 | 62793 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/03/1955 | 64900 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1955 | 65516 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 61520 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 61664 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 65537 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 61514 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 62592 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1955 | 65524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/04/1955 | 65574 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 62564 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 65512 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 62592 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 65533 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 65566 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 65588 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 67739 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 61514 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 65507 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 61664 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 25/07/1955 | 68514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/07/1955 | 68592 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/08/1955 | 61270 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/08/1955 | 11124 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1955 | 11125 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 68642 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 61533 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 61629 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 62792 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1955 | 11126 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 11/09/1955 | 69829 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/09/1955 | 30539 | Transfer out to: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/09/1955 | 65512 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/10/1955 | 64724 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 11/10/1955 | 68597 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65519 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 67739 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 11126 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 62553 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 62561 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 62608 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65460 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65533 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65537 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65567 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/10/1955 | 61270 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 30/10/1955 | 69824 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 65537 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68640 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 61918 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 62564 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 62610 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 65507 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 65514 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 67707 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68616 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68664 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 28/11/1955 | 62554 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/12/1955 | 68523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/01/1956 | 69829 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 62564 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 67707 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 62522 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 65472 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 67739 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/01/1956 | 61312 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 29/01/1956 | 69826 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 67717 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 11139 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 61918 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 67714 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68555 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 11124 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68608 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/04/1956 | 61312 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 65472 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 61918 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1956 | 64913 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 61918 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 61970 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1956 | 11141 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1956 | 61050 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1956 | 61051 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 61812 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 61829 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 69690 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1956 | 64802 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 61970 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 62510 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 62584 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 62788 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 65557 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 69679 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 69698 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1956 | 65417 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 62787 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 62789 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 69706 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1956 | 64802 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/08/1956 | 62523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 10/1956 | 62577 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/10/1956 | 64913 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1956 | 11161 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1956 | 11162 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69706 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 11141 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 68516 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1957 | 62556 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61042 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 64802 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 64913 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61519 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61556 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61540 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61957 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61970 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 62564 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 62592 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/01/1957 | 65537 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/02/1957 | 64913 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 61957 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 61812 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 61829 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/02/1957 | 61042 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61970 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 65557 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 65588 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/05/1957 | 64968 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1957 | 11166 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1957 | 11167 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1957 | 11168 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 11164 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 11165 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 62511 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 62544 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 62586 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 61957 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 62511 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 69706 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1957 | 61223 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1957 | 61520 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 11139 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 65469 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 65472 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/07/1957 | 64968 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/08/1957 | 11169 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/08/1957 | 11170 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 11164 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/09/1957 | 11171 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/09/1957 | 11172 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 65469 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 65472 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1957 | 64797 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 07/10/1957 | 62593 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 07/10/1957 | 62619 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1957 | 64802 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1957 | 64882 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 11139 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 65509 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 11171 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 28/10/1957 | 62596 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1957 | 11174 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1957 | 11173 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/12/1957 | 61223 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61571 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 61957 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 11174 | Transfer out to: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J19 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 64655 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1957 | 61519 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/12/1957 | 61556 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1957 | 11175 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 61989 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1958 | 11176 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/01/1958 | 65509 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 11111 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 11143 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 11167 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 11173 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 05/03/1958 | 62586 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | D2214 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 61989 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 11170 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 11175 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 11176 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 65388 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 68555 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 24/03/1958 | 62555 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 11143 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 11172 | Transfer out to: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 64968 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61566 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61826 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61970 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 70035 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1958 | 61542 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 11172 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 61636 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 61654 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 11139 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1958 | 61279 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 61577 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 11139 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 65472 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 68642 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 68645 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61223 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1958 | 65573 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 61970 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 67707 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 70013 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 70030 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1958 | 61235 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/10/1958 | 61547 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 70012 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 68645 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1958 | D2032 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1958 | 64802 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1958 | 64882 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/12/1958 | 64889 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1958 | D2033 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 61949 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 61973 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 67786 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 70013 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/01/1959 | D2034 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 25/01/1959 | 70002 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 25/01/1959 | 70003 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/01/1959 | 61566 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/01/1959 | D2035 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 61530 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 61533 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 62517 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 62524 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70000 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70001 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70005 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70012 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70030 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70034 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70035 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70036 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70037 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70038 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70039 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70040 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70041 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61399 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/02/1959 | D2036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/02/1959 | D2037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/02/1959 | D2038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D2567 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D2573 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43145 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43146 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43156 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43157 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43159 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43160 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43161 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 62597 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 65551 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 65581 | Transfer in from: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 65586 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1959 | D2039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 90559 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 43157 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 43159 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 61577 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 62597 | Transfer out to: | 31F | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/04/1959 | 65553 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1959 | 65557 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 22/04/1959 | 68640 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/04/1959 | D5524 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 30/04/1959 | D5528 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1959 | 61223 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1959 | 61312 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/05/1959 | 65542 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/05/1959 | D2039 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1959 | D2573 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/06/1959 | D5532 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/06/1959 | D5533 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 61530 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 61533 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 18/06/1959 | D5535 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D200 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D202 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D203 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D204 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D205 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D5500 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 61664 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D5524 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D5528 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 67733 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 62517 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 61845 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 61954 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/07/1959 | 61054 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1959 | 64731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1959 | 64900 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 61611 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 61845 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 61954 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/08/1959 | 61568 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 24/08/1959 | 62540 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 61656 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 61664 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/09/1959 | D8035 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D5022 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D8035 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1959 | 61001 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/10/1959 | D8036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1959 | 61228 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/10/1959 | 61279 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/10/1959 | 61514 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/10/1959 | D8037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 69707 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1959 | D8036 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/10/1959 | 61611 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/10/1959 | D8038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 61572 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1959 | D8037 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/10/1959 | 61270 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1959 | 61636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1959 | 64913 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/10/1959 | D8039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D8038 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/10/1959 | D8040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/10/1959 | D8040 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/10/1959 | D8040 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 31/10/1959 | D5528 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 31/10/1959 | D5529 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 31/10/1959 | D8039 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 31/10/1959 | D8039 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/11/1959 | D8041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1959 | 61654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1959 | 64761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 06/11/1959 | 68641 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 06/11/1959 | 68645 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5530 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5534 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 61535 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D8200 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D200 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D202 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D203 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D204 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D205 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5022 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J19 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1959 | 64658 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/11/1959 | D8042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/11/1959 | D8043 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/11/1959 | D8041 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/11/1959 | D8201 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/11/1959 | D8041 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/11/1959 | D8042 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 61926 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/11/1959 | D8043 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/11/1959 | D8044 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 24/11/1959 | 62544 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/11/1959 | D8044 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 29/11/1959 | D8202 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 61001 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 61042 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1959 | 61571 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D8201 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D8039 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D8040 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D8200 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D8201 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/12/1959 | 61535 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 17/12/1959 | 62511 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 23/12/1959 | D5574 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 23/12/1959 | D5575 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 67714 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/12/1959 | D5576 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/12/1959 | D5577 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/01/1960 | D8041 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/01/1960 | D8203 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/01/1960 | D8204 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/01/1960 | D8205 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/01/1960 | D8206 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1960 | 61235 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/01/1960 | D5580 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/01/1960 | D5581 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 61656 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 67733 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/01/1960 | 61228 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 21/01/1960 | D5582 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/01/1960 | D8207 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 43146 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 61399 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 61826 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 61877 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 61908 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 61926 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 67786 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90559 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1960 | 65551 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/02/1960 | D8200 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 43156 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/02/1960 | 61317 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | D2203 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | D2210 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1960 | D5515 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 10/03/1960 | 62524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1960 | 65519 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 43145 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 61981 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/03/1960 | D5566 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/03/1960 | D5567 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 61989 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5565 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5569 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/04/1960 | 61054 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5515 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 68899 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 68905 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 68924 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/04/1960 | D5568 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 61973 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1960 | 65570 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61046 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1960 | 61048 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1960 | 65471 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 65588 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61918 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 29/06/1960 | D8229 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 30/06/1960 | D5629 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 65462 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1960 | 65566 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 07/07/1960 | D5630 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 07/07/1960 | D5631 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/07/1960 | D8230 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/07/1960 | D8231 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/08/1960 | D8232 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1960 | 61054 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 65460 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5629 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D8229 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D8230 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D8231 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D8232 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 65567 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 67738 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | D2553 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61252 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61253 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61254 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61280 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1960 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 76034 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5568 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5569 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5630 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5631 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 70036 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 70037 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 70038 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 43160 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 43161 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 61939 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 61949 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 70039 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67715 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67730 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61953 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 61957 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67717 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67738 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 70040 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 65460 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 70041 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 61970 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 61971 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 65462 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/02/1961 | D6706 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/02/1961 | D5575 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/02/1961 | D5581 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/02/1961 | D5582 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/02/1961 | D8200 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/02/1961 | D8201 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 32546 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/05/1961 | D6702 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1961 | 65588 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/06/1961 | D2553 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/06/1961 | D8202 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/06/1961 | D8203 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/06/1961 | D8204 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/06/1961 | D8205 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/06/1961 | D8206 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5531 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5536 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5555 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5556 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5557 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5558 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5559 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5560 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5561 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5562 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5575 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5582 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5630 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5631 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 67720 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 67723 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 67734 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6702 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6706 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 70030 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 70034 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D8207 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1961 | 61335 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 25/06/1961 | 70002 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/07/1961 | D6721 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 09/07/1961 | 70003 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/07/1961 | D6722 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/07/1961 | D6722 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61252 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61253 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61283 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61335 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 65521 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 65583 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D5528 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D5529 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D5530 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D5531 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D5580 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D5582 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 65469 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D6721 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 67720 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 67723 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 67734 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70001 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70005 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70008 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70009 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70011 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70013 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 76034 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1961 | 61572 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/09/1961 | 70012 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 70035 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 70007 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1961 | 61095 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1961 | 61205 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 70006 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 70010 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1962 | 61043 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1962 | 61045 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1962 | 61054 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1962 | 61095 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1962 | 61205 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1962 | 61254 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1962 | 61280 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D5563 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D5564 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D5568 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 65581 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 65586 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 67730 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/02/1962 | 65521 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/02/1962 | 65583 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 28/02/1962 | 67715 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 65567 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5530 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5531 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D2553 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5500 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5574 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5575 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5576 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5577 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2039 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2210 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2212 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2568 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2570 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2571 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2573 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5537 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2571 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2573 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5630 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5631 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 70000 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D5553 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D5554 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D2229 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | D2229 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | D2566 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/10/1963 | D5567 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | D2219 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Hereford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1531 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/10/1964 | D1532 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1542 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1532 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/11/1964 | D1542 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5569 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5570 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5571 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5572 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5573 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5574 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1531 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5545 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5534 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5557 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1965 | D5685 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5662 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5663 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5556 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5559 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D5662 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D5663 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D2233 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D2234 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5574 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/06/1965 | D5835 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/06/1965 | D5570 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5661 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5835 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/08/1965 | D5666 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/08/1965 | D5571 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D5568 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D5682 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | D2569 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | D2570 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | D2569 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | D2570 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1965 | D2569 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1965 | D2570 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1965 | D2568 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5660 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5662 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5664 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5667 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5692 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5694 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5533 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5536 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5553 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5555 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5558 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5561 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5565 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5663 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/10/1965 | D5573 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D2558 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D2562 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D2565 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D2556 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5847 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/03/1966 | D1885 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1885 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D2018 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D2019 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/07/1966 | D2029 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1966 | D2020 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/09/1966 | D2303 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2203 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2214 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2233 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2234 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2556 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2559 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2563 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2567 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1966 | D5861 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5587 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5588 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5589 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5854 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5533 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5543 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5544 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5587 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5588 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1967 | D5589 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5579 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5616 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5580 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5665 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5562 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1967 | D2303 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D2175 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D5535 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D5537 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/01/1968 | D5530 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/01/1968 | D5531 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/02/1968 | D5861 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/02/1968 | D5554 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1562 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1563 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1564 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1565 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1566 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1567 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1568 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D2297 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5534 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/05/1968 | D5543 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5535 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D5543 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5568 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D5685 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 30/11/1968 | D5535 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D5660 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D1706 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D1568 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D5568 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D5543 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/04/1969 | D1703 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5653 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5854 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/06/1969 | D1705 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/06/1969 | D1567 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1704 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1565 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1566 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D5544 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/08/1969 | D2297 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1562 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1563 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1564 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1703 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1704 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1705 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1706 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5532 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5533 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5534 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5545 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5560 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5563 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5564 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5566 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5569 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5572 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5579 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5580 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5616 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5653 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5661 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5662 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5663 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5664 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5665 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5666 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5667 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5682 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5692 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5694 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5847 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/10/1969 | D2370 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1970 | D2210 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D2062 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1970 | D2212 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1971 | D2048 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/07/1971 | D2155 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/07/1971 | D2019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/07/1971 | D2032 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1971 | D2050 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1971 | D2103 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/12/1971 | D2036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1971 | D2033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D2081 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/02/1972 | D2039 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/03/1972 | D2038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D2149 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1972 | D2048 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | 03045 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 01/06/1974 | 03081 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/06/1975 | 03155 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 03084 | Transfer in from: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 03086 | Transfer in from: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 03197 | Transfer in from: | SG | Slade Green | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1975 | 03018 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1975 | 03020 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08124 | Transfer in from: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08138 | Transfer in from: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08250 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1976 | 03035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1976 | 03037 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1976 | 03034 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1977 | 03149 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1977 | 03029 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1977 | 03397 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1977 | 03175 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 03029 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 03045 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1977 | 03034 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1978 | 08138 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 08495 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/08/1978 | 03050 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1979 | 03103 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/09/1979 | 03029 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1980 | 03062 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/03/1981 | 08124 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 03180 | Transfer in from: | CR | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1981 | 08495 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1982 | 03370 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/02/1983 | 03034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1983 | 03086 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/03/1984 | 03180 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1987 | 03084 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1987 | 03197 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1987 | 03397 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08685 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08936 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1988 | 08250 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1992 | 08936 | Condemned |