Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 920 Today
» 908 Yesterday
» 1828 Week
» 12973 Month
» 112758 Year
» 1778134 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Nuneaton


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/09/1937 2956 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/09/1937 2960 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/09/1937 2966 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/09/1937 2977 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 13/11/1937 2956 Transfer out to: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 13/11/1937 2960 Transfer out to: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 04/02/1939 2966 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 29/04/1939 2973 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 29/03/1941 2947 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 29/03/1941 2981 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 10/05/1941 2974 Transfer in from: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/11/1941 2968 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/02/1942 2968 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/02/1942 2974 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 02/05/1942 2959 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 02/05/1942 2964 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/06/1942 2960 Transfer in from: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 15/08/1942 2947 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 19/09/1942 2960 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 05/07/1947 2977 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 06/12/1947 2958 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12107 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12141 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12321 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12322 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 143 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 18 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 201 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 202 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 204 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 205 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 206 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 208 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2777 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2781 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2783 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2814 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2888 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2932 Snapshot        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2941 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 430 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 433 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 447 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 464 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 508 Snapshot        
Steam 11 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 52294 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7285 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7286 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7367 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7594 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8896 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8911 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9068 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9080 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9082 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9114 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9150 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9181 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9190 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9191 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9264 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9268 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9318 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9342 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9345 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9346 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9351 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9352 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9366 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9400 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9412 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9428 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9429 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9430 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9432 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9435 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9436 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9437 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9439 Snapshot        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 19/06/1948 2974 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 17/07/1948 2974 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 17/07/1948 42958 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 8310 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G1 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 9058 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam G1 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 9283 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 9296 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 49088 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 15/01/1949 42964 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 15/01/1949 42973 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/02/1949 2959 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 05/03/1949 2981 Transfer out to: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 48953 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 40433 Transfer out to: TFD Trafford Park (LNER)    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 464 Transfer out to: TFD Trafford Park (LNER)    
Steam G1 0-8-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 8911 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 49283 Condemned      
Steam 11 0-6-0 m/e 08/1949 52294 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 12/11/1949 49351 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 5w/e 24/12/1949 40127 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 01/1950 48896 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 48020 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 48061 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 48077 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 49181 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 02/1950 49190 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 03/1950 49058 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 48020 Transfer out to: 2B Bletchley    
Steam G2 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 49412 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 49396 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 49346 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 49293 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 49396 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 40137 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 58272 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 40127 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 40208 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 43027 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48953 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 13/01/1951 49264 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 42817 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 42852 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 42854 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 42891 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 49436 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49212 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 43011 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 43027 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 05/1951 49296 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49002 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49435 Transfer out to: 9G Northwich    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 14/07/1951 40508 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 40433 Transfer in from: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 40430 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 8310 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 40676 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 9120 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 40201 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1951 40205 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 40433 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 49172 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 49339 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 49430 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 49430 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 40143 Transfer out to: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 42854 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 42851 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 42854 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 49212 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 49120 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 49212 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 9437 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 40589 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1952 52107 Transfer out to: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 40413 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/02/1952 41239 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 40589 Transfer out to: 7D Rhyl    
Steam 11 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52449 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40047 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40068 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 40677 Transfer in from: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40137 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 40202 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 41239 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40049 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40053 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1952 40066 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/09/1952 40135 Transfer in from: 2E Warwick    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/09/1952 40204 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/09/1952 40018 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/09/1952 40053 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/09/1952 40066 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/09/1952 40204 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 52322 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1952 40143 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40583 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40683 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 48320 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40413 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40447 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 42851 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40087 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40109 Transfer in from: 2E Warwick    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 43786 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 49113 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 49342 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40047 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40068 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40206 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 42932 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 42941 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 49342 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 52449 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 5w/e 03/01/1953 40143 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 3w/e 24/01/1953 40093 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 48479 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 49142 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 40683 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/05/1953 42951 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/05/1953 40093 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 16/05/1953 48479 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 06/06/1953 42951 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 42810 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 58221 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 49318 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 48343 Transfer in from: 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 48372 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 41211 Transfer in from: 10D Plodder Lane    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 05/09/1953 41213 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 43002 Transfer in from: 31A Cambridge    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 43003 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 43005 Transfer in from:        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 48751 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 42777 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1953 40003 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 48154 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 48061 Transfer out to: 15B Kettering    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 28/11/1953 40104 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 27/02/1954 40583 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 27/02/1954 40676 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 27/02/1954 40677 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 11 0-6-0 w/e 27/02/1954 52321 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/03/1954 48658 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 48154 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 m/e 06/1954 58272 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 58281 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 19/06/1954 40003 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/09/1954 40109 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 48154 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 49120 Transfer in from: 2C Warwick    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 82020 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/10/1954 82021 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 58221 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 30/10/1954 42964 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 48679 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 49009 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/11/1954 40135 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 43034 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 43035 Transfer in from:        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 48312 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 42810 Transfer out to: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 42888 Transfer out to: 11E Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 49009 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 49345 Transfer out to: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 25/12/1954 49339 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 01/01/1955 48679 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 08/01/1955 42964 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41230 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41211 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 26/02/1955 41213 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 49314 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 49377 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 42852 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 43035 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/04/1955 41230 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 23/04/1955 43005 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/05/1955 40073 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 16/07/1955 41244 Transfer in from: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 11 0-6-0 8w/e 16/07/1955 52201 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 08/10/1955 41231 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 49366 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 48398 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 48686 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/03/1956 40207 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/03/1956 49377 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 48456 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 21/04/1956 49212 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 16/06/1956 47367 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41226 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41322 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41323 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 40073 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 40104 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41231 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 41244 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1956 40157 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 48258 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 40104 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 40122 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 40138 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 03/11/1956 47491 Transfer in from: 5F Uttoxeter    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 82020 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam Standard Class 3 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 03/11/1956 82021 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 01/12/1956 40156 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 44157 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 01/12/1956 47491 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 43308 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 48526 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52141 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 19/01/1957 49068 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 44292 Transfer in from: 11E Tebay    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 43615 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 43618 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 43308 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/03/1957 40156 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 20/04/1957 40122 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/04/1957 47286 Transfer out to: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 43011 Transfer out to: 11D Tebay    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 49430 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1957 49430 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 48623 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 10/08/1957 49172 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 49154 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 on 26/10/1957 43786 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43000 Transfer in from: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43001 Transfer in from: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43024 Transfer in from: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/11/1957 47499 Transfer in from: 13B Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43615 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43618 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 49115 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 11 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 52201 Transfer out to: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49154 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 44593 Transfer in from: 4A Bletchley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 49154 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 25/01/1958 47499 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 42854 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 43020 Transfer in from: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 49440 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 44593 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 48372 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 43005 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 43007 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 44157 Transfer out to: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 44292 Transfer out to: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 09/08/1958 40157 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 40135 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 40157 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 48526 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 49150 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 01/11/1958 49400 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/11/1958 46446 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49270 Transfer in from: 2C Northampton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49415 Transfer in from: 2D Coventry    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49425 Transfer in from: 2D Coventry    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49431 Transfer in from: 2D Coventry    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49441 Transfer in from: 2F Coventry    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 15/11/1958 41226 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 15/11/1958 41322 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 15/11/1958 41323 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 15/11/1958 49191 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/12/1958 46423 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 03/01/1959 43026 Transfer in from: 12C Workington    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 46423 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 46446 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 58281 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 m/e 31/01/1959 49113 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/02/1959 40049 Transfer out to: 67B Hurlford    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 11/04/1959 49352 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/04/1959 48251 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 18/04/1959 49428 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 18/04/1959 49439 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/05/1959 47285 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/05/1959 47594 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 76020 Transfer in from: 51H Kirkby Stephen    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 06/06/1959 43022 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 06/06/1959 76020 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 42926 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 42811 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 42853 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 42933 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 42935 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 42939 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/08/1959 48111 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/08/1959 48263 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/08/1959 48287 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/08/1959 48289 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/08/1959 48291 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/08/1959 48504 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 05/09/1959 49120 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/10/1959 40185 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/10/1959 43052 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43052 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 49080 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 49135 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 42817 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43007 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 43052 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 49268 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 49270 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 49429 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 21/11/1959 40204 Condemned      
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 on 15/12/1959 D2911 1st Allocation        
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 23/01/1960 D2911 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 30/01/1960 D2911 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 30/01/1960 D2912 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 30/01/1960 D2913 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 30/01/1960 42935 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 30/01/1960 43026 Transfer out to: 11B Workington    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 30/01/1960 49154 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/02/1960 48754 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 20/02/1960 40077 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 20/02/1960 40081 Transfer in from:        
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 20/02/1960 D2911 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 20/02/1960 D2912 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Diesel D3/1 0-4-0 w/e 20/02/1960 D2913 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 27/02/1960 40129 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/02/1960 48632 Transfer in from: 8E Northwich    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 05/03/1960 40180 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/03/1960 48188 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 09/04/1960 40185 Transfer out to: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 16/04/1960 40081 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/04/1960 40129 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 23/04/1960 40180 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/05/1960 44110 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/05/1960 44239 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 21/05/1960 40010 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 21/05/1960 40051 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/05/1960 48188 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/05/1960 48632 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 11/06/1960 40077 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/06/1960 44110 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/06/1960 44239 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42811 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 13/06/1960 42891 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 48054 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 48074 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 48166 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 48264 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 18/06/1960 48753 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/06/1960 43009 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 16/07/1960 40157 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 43009 Transfer out to: 12H Tebay    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 43052 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 17/09/1960 49430 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 12/11/1960 49439 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 42772 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 42924 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 42925 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 42944 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 42811 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 42814 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 42810 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 46420 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/12/1960 40087 Transfer out to: 24K Preston    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/12/1960 40010 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 45533 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 45537 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 45541 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 45548 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 42772 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 42810 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 42924 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 42925 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/12/1960 42944 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 14/01/1961 45538 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/01/1961 42951 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/01/1961 42953 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/01/1961 42955 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/01/1961 42975 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/01/1961 42977 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 21/01/1961 42978 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 28/01/1961 49002 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 28/01/1961 49135 Transfer out to: 24K Preston    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 28/01/1961 49142 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 28/01/1961 49415 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 28/01/1961 49432 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 11/02/1961 40087 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 42977 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 18/03/1961 40207 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 08/04/1961 40207 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 15/04/1961 43000 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/04/1961 48166 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 22/04/1961 40051 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 12099 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 D3089 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 17/06/1961 40104 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 42853 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/06/1961 40104 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/07/1961 47294 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/07/1961 47385 Transfer in from: 21E Monument Lane    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/07/1961 47396 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/07/1961 47653 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 15/07/1961 49373 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/07/1961 43977 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 22/07/1961 45542 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 43006 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 42945 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 42960 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 42965 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 42976 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 78034 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 43006 Transfer out to: 12F Workington    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 42954 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 42964 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46447 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 42781 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 42926 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 42933 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 45533 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 78034 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 07/10/1961 49441 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 14/10/1961 49342 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 04/11/1961 45599 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 04/11/1961 45603 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 04/11/1961 45624 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 04/11/1961 45669 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 42773 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 18/11/1961 42786 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 15/12/1961 D4111 1st Allocation        
Diesel 09 0-6-0 on 22/12/1961 D4112 1st Allocation        
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 06/01/1962 42854 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 06/01/1962 49277 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 06/01/1962 49439 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/01/1962 D3089 Transfer out to: 21E Monument Lane    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/02/1962 40138 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/02/1962 40207 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 42885 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 43007 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 43021 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 43052 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 43112 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 43113 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 43115 Transfer in from: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 17/02/1962 49277 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 24/02/1962 49045 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 24/03/1962 49440 Condemned      
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 42852 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 42859 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 42870 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 42935 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 12099 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 49045 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 49080 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 49293 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 49314 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 49373 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 49425 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 05/05/1962 49431 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 42849 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 42886 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 42941 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 42944 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/05/1962 48365 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/05/1962 48736 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/05/1962 48326 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 45537 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 45541 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 45542 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/06/1962 45548 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42946 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42950 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42958 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42967 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42968 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42969 Transfer in from: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42970 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42971 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42973 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42981 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42982 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42773 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42783 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42786 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42811 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42849 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42852 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42854 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42859 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42870 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42885 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42886 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42935 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42939 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42941 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam CRAB 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 42944 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 43007 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 43021 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 43052 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 43112 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 43115 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 42947 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 42956 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 48206 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 48526 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 48326 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 30/06/1962 42962 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 07/07/1962 45724 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/07/1962 47478 Transfer in from: Wolverton Works    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/07/1962 47479 Transfer in from: Wolverton Works    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/07/1962 47294 Transfer out to: Wolverton Works    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/07/1962 47385 Transfer out to: Wolverton Works    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/07/1962 48074 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/07/1962 48287 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/07/1962 48365 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/07/1962 48526 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/07/1962 48658 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/07/1962 48736 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/07/1962 48754 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/08/1962 48077 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/08/1962 48154 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/08/1962 48258 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/08/1962 48312 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/08/1962 47479 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 31/08/1962 D4144 1st Allocation        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 15/09/1962 40104 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 45538 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 20/10/1962 75033 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 03/11/1962 45724 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 45723 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 42953 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/11/1962 40087 Condemned      
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 24/11/1962 40135 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 49081 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 45603 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/12/1962 45643 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 42956 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 42965 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 1963 42982 Transfer out to: 5E Alsager    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/01/1963 D3053 Transfer in from: 21F Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/01/1963 75030 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/01/1963 75052 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 19/01/1963 43022 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/01/1963 47653 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/02/1963 45599 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 23/02/1963 45723 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 09/03/1963 48154 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/03/1963 48074 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/03/1963 47396 Transfer out to: Wolverton Works    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/04/1963 47478 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 45599 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 42975 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 on 19/05/1963 75033 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 42980 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 46495 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/05/1963 47478 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75016 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75018 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75045 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75063 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 46447 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/06/1963 43977 Transfer out to: 18A Toton    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 01/06/1963 45669 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42950 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42951 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42954 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42958 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42960 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42964 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42968 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42969 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42970 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42971 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42978 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42980 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 42981 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 43001 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 75018 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 75036 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 42947 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 20/07/1963 42976 Condemned      
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 D4111 Transfer out to: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 D4112 Transfer out to: 1F Rugby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 43003 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75030 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75036 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1963 42950 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1963 42951 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1963 42964 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1963 42970 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 26/10/1963 42978 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 42971 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 45643 Transfer out to: 55C Farnley Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 09/11/1963 42973 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 23/11/1963 45624 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 18/01/1964 D4144 Transfer out to: 1F Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 02/1964 42954 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 15/02/1964 42962 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45027 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45056 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/03/1964 48251 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/03/1964 48291 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/03/1964 48398 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/04/1964 47478 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 25/04/1964 48650 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 02/05/1964 48386 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 73032 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 73073 Transfer in from: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45027 Transfer out to: 2J Aston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45056 Transfer out to: 1F Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 08/1964 42954 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 w/e 15/08/1964 45723 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 15/08/1964 45599 Condemned      
Steam 6P 4-6-0 on 22/08/1964 45723 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 73045 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 73159 Transfer in from: 2F Woodford Halse    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 75063 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/10/1964 47653 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 24/10/1964 42970 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/10/1964 47653 Condemned      
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/1964 42945 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/1964 42946 Transfer out to: 2K Bushbury    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/1964 42951 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/1964 42955 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 11/1964 42964 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1964 48623 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/1964 42950 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/1964 42967 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 12/1964 42978 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 05/12/1964 46430 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 05/12/1964 46459 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 on 19/12/1964 42971 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 73004 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 73039 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 73040 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 73048 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 46420 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1965 46520 Transfer in from: 89C Machynlleth    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 73033 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 73038 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 73096 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 2w/e 11/04/1965 73032 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 2w/e 11/04/1965 73033 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 24/04/1965 48718 Transfer in from: 2E Saltley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 22/05/1965 73045 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/05/1965 44771 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/05/1965 44831 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/05/1965 44866 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/05/1965 45001 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/05/1965 45065 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/05/1965 45113 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 29/05/1965 45448 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 29/05/1965 48445 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45310 Transfer in from: 2J Aston    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45405 Transfer in from: 2J Aston    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 73004 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 73048 Transfer out to: 2D Banbury    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 73096 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 75016 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 75052 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 45113 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48534 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48610 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 73038 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 73039 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 73040 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 73073 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 24/07/1965 73159 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/08/1965 48247 Transfer in from: 1H Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/08/1965 48610 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48154 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 21/08/1965 48386 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 m/e 09/1965 46459 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 46512 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 46519 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 78003 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 78018 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 78019 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 78039 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 78059 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 78063 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 09/10/1965 46430 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 06/11/1965 43005 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/01/1966 48713 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/01/1966 78003 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 15/01/1966 78019 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/02/1966 48343 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/03/1966 48713 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 75050 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1966 48206 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/03/1966 48650 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/03/1966 D3053 Transfer out to: 1F Rugby    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 26/03/1966 43002 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 78018 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 78039 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 78063 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/04/1966 48718 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 75045 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 30/04/1966 75018 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 28/05/1966 45065 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 28/05/1966 45448 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/05/1966 48504 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/05/1966 48534 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/05/1966 48753 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 44771 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 44831 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 44866 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 45001 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 45310 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 45405 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 46495 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 46512 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 46519 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 46520 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48054 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48074 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48111 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48247 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48263 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48264 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48289 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48320 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48445 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48456 Transfer out to: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48686 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/06/1966 48751 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 75018 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 75050 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 04/06/1966 78059 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 03/09/1966 43113 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 08/10/1966 43020 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 27/05/1967 43024 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 on 03/06/1967 43034 Condemned