Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 585 Today
» 1156 Yesterday
» 5056 Week
» 16102 Month
» 16102 Year
» 1681478 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Preston


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/03/1935 2962 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 20/04/1935 2962 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 15/06/1935 13273 Transfer in from: 27A Polmadie    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 06/07/1935 13272 Transfer in from: 28C Carstairs    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 13/07/1935 13274 Transfer in from: 27A Polmadie    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/11/1935 13272 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/11/1935 13273 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 16/11/1935 13274 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1946 5091 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 10639 Snapshot        
Steam 21 0-4-0ST on 01/01/1948 11218 Snapshot        
Steam 25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12016 Snapshot        
Steam 25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12034 Snapshot        
Steam 25 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12051 Snapshot        
Steam 27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12341 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 12619 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 356 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 50676 Snapshot        
Steam 5 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 50793 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5091 Snapshot 10B Preston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5091 Snapshot 10B Preston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5142 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5185 Snapshot        
Steam 28 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 52618 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5345 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5373 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5502 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5505 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5513 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5515 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5516 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5519 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5524 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5536 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5537 Snapshot        
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5544 Snapshot        
Steam 2P 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 6762 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7291 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7293 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7296 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7319 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9102 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9119 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9231 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9250 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9299 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9348 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9417 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9419 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9420 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9421 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9442 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9451 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 02/1948 9231 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 10/04/1948 9250 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 on 15/05/1948 52618 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 on 04/12/1948 46428 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 on 04/12/1948 46429 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 on 11/12/1948 46430 1st Allocation        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 49088 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 27 0-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 52393 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 5522 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 45185 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 45536 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 3w/e 11/12/1948 47293 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 49348 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 3w/e 11/12/1948 7319 Transfer out to: 12E Moor Row    
Steam 27 0-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 12105 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 45333 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 49103 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 16/07/1949 49299 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 40397 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 45742 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 49104 Transfer in from: 2F Coventry    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 45513 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam G2 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 49442 Transfer out to: 2F Coventry    
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 02/1950 50793 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T m/e 03/1950 50676 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 44892 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45599 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45502 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45522 Transfer out to: 1B Camden    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45742 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G2 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 49421 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 45547 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 46428 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45333 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 46428 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 49088 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 49160 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 50678 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam 264 0-4-0ST 4w/e 04/11/1950 56027 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 45547 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 4w/e 04/11/1950 51218 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 49451 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49196 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49391 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 45519 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 45524 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 03/03/1951 40397 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 45332 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 45519 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 45524 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 46428 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 46430 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 45096 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 44892 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Canal    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 40673 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45505 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45593 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45673 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45505 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam 25 0-6-0 m/e 08/1951 52034 Condemned      
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 52598 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1951 52105 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 49396 Transfer in from: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 9417 Transfer out to: 2D Coventry    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 40524 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45505 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45516 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45524 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45537 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45593 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 45599 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 46430 Transfer in from: 7B Bangor    
Steam 28 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 52598 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 2P 2-4-2T w/e 16/02/1952 46762 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 17/05/1952 50639 Condemned      
Steam 5 2-4-2T 8w/e 14/06/1952 50643 Transfer in from: 10D Plodder Lane    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 8w/e 14/06/1952 50643 Transfer in from:        
Steam 28 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 52619 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45235 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45516 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45537 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 45630 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 50644 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 50644 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 46430 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 45582 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45235 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45516 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45537 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45544 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45630 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 45673 Transfer out to: 68A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 8w/e 29/11/1952 40003 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 40410 Transfer in from: 16B Spital Bridge    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 46430 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 40673 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 40673 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 3w/e 24/01/1953 47451 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 02/1953 40410 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/02/1953 47659 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 21/02/1953 40003 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 49149 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 50644 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 21/03/1953 50644 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45518 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45550 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 49149 Transfer out to: 10D Plodder Lane    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/08/1953 47269 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 4w/e 08/08/1953 51218 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 47360 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 47413 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 47472 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 47269 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 47296 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 05/09/1953 47451 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST 4w/e 31/10/1953 51218 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 28/11/1953 50643 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 28/11/1953 50643 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST m/e 12/1953 47008 1st Allocation        
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 26/12/1953 50678 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 45373 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 40420 Transfer in from: 2C Northampton    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 45505 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 45508 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 m/e 07/1954 40524 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1954 46430 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 m/e 09/1954 78030 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 46430 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 45505 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 45519 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 on 13/11/1954 78036 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 on 13/11/1954 78037 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 46429 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 04/12/1954 46430 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 40694 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 45520 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 21/05/1955 45587 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/09/1955 45345 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 45520 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 45587 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 25 0-6-0 w/e 04/02/1956 52051 Condemned      
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 52393 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 49335 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 78030 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 49335 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1956 45508 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45142 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 25 0-6-0 on 20/10/1956 52016 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 03/11/1956 40671 Transfer in from: 7A Llandudno Junction    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 03/11/1956 45519 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 03/11/1956 40420 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 01/12/1956 45519 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 27 0-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 52341 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 45623 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 264 0-4-0ST 4w/e 26/01/1957 56027 Transfer out to: Crewe Works    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 45623 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40356 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40671 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 40673 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 40695 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 40699 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45454 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45538 Transfer in from: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 40695 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 40699 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 40657 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 4w/e 28/12/1957 47005 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 49121 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 49357 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST 4w/e 25/01/1958 47005 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 78035 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 4w/e 17/05/1958 78035 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 40677 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 40683 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 25/09/1958 D3579 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/10/1958 D3580 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 13089 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 13172 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 D3368 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 D3369 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 D3371 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 04/10/1958 47291 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 49357 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 07/10/1958 D3581 1st Allocation        
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 18/10/1958 D3579 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 25/10/1958 D3581 Transfer in from: 24K Preston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 25/10/1958 D3580 Transfer out to: 11B Workington    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 25/10/1958 D3581 Transfer out to: 24K Preston    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/11/1958 13089 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/11/1958 42463 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/11/1958 42616 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/11/1958 45340 Transfer in from: 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/11/1958 42579 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 15/11/1958 45542 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 15/11/1958 45543 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/11/1958 42616 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 29/11/1958 47659 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 17/01/1959 45543 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 17/01/1959 49391 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/02/1959 42463 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/02/1959 42579 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 18/04/1959 D3763 1st Allocation        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/04/1959 45096 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 02/05/1959 47392 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 30/05/1959 D3763 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 44682 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45248 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45451 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45538 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1959 45550 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 20/06/1959 47392 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/08/1959 45348 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 05/09/1959 D3846 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 44827 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 45150 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 45302 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 45735 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 46154 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 46161 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 46163 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 46168 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 12/09/1959 45348 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46126 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46136 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46165 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 46167 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45340 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45451 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 49396 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 49419 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 49420 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 49160 Condemned      
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45502 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45507 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 21/11/1959 45508 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 46108 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 28/11/1959 40677 Condemned      
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 05/12/1959 46170 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1960 45507 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 46108 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 23/01/1960 46170 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 45518 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 02/04/1960 45515 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 02/04/1960 46163 Transfer out to: 6J Holyhead    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 42945 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 42960 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 42965 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 42976 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 44682 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 44827 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45248 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45302 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45502 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1960 45508 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 07/05/1960 40694 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 44807 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45315 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45351 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 45414 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 45351 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/08/1960 45140 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/08/1960 45188 Transfer in from: 21E Monument Lane    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 27/08/1960 58177 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 27/08/1960 58182 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 27/08/1960 90212 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 27/08/1960 90702 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45140 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 45188 Transfer out to: 21E Monument Lane    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 58177 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 10/09/1960 58182 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/09/1960 90212 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 w/e 10/09/1960 90702 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46449 Transfer in from: 12D Kirkby Stephen    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 44807 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45735 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46126 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46136 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46154 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 46167 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 19/11/1960 45091 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/12/1960 40087 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 10/12/1960 40106 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 45024 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 10/12/1960 40657 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 w/e 10/12/1960 40683 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST w/e 31/12/1960 51232 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST w/e 07/01/1961 51232 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 28/01/1961 49135 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST w/e 28/01/1961 51253 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 11/02/1961 40087 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 04/03/1961 46161 Transfer out to: 21C Bushbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 25/03/1961 45297 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 21 0-4-0ST w/e 25/03/1961 51253 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/04/1961 45332 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 11/04/1961 45454 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/04/1961 45340 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T w/e 13/05/1961 40106 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 46161 Transfer in from: 21C Bushbury    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 46167 Transfer in from: 21C Bushbury    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 44936 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 44936 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/07/1961 45340 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 15/07/1961 45002 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Patriot 4-6-0 w/e 22/07/1961 45542 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 42945 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 42960 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 42965 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 42976 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45002 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45024 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45150 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45297 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45315 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45414 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam Jubilee 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45582 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 46161 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 46165 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 46167 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Royal Scot (Scot) 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 46168 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 09/09/1961 49196 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3172 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3368 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3369 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3371 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3581 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 D3846 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 46449 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 0F 0-4-0ST w/e 16/09/1961 47008 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47360 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47413 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 16/09/1961 47472 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 49135 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 78036 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 78037 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 49104 Condemned