Depot: Rhymney
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 79 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 80 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 292 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 77 | Transfer in from: | rhy | Dowlais Central | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 82 | Transfer in from: | rhy | Dowlais Central | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 292 | Transfer out to: | rhy | Dowlais Central | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 39 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5128 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5635 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5692 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5696 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 76 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 77 | Snapshot | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 77 | Snapshot | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 78 | Snapshot | rhy | Dowlais Central | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 79 | Snapshot | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 79 | Snapshot | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 80 | Snapshot | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 80 | Snapshot | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 81 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 82 | Snapshot | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 82 | Snapshot | RHY | Rhymney | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 293 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 6608 | Transfer in from: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1948 | 73 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 61 | Transfer in from: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6626 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6608 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 73 | Transfer out to: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 348 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 360 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 371 | Transfer in from: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 293 | Transfer out to: | RYR | Radyr | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 6626 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 348 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 360 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 371 | Transfer out to: | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 61 | Transfer out to: | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 440 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 5662 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 3100/5100 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 5128 | Transfer out to: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 388 | Transfer in from: | CV.BRY | Barry | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5605 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 39 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 5660 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 388 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 316 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 5635 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5683 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 5692 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1950 | 76 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 82 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | m/e | 11/1953 | 77 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 80 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1954 | 81 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 79 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 78 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5605 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5662 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5696 | Transfer out to: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 5601 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 5605 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 5677 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 5686 | Transfer in from: | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 5688 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1964 | 6649 | Transfer in from: | 88E | Abercynon | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1964 | 6658 | Transfer in from: | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | 6658 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 01/1965 | 5601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 02/1965 | 6649 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 03/1965 | 5686 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 25/04/1965 | 5605 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | on | 25/04/1965 | 5677 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/1965 | 5688 | Condemned |