Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Barrow in Furness


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 03/07/1937 2970 Transfer in from: BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 25/09/1937 2970 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/06/1946 2571 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 10643 Snapshot        
Steam 1008 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 10644 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2321 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2359 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2386 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2392 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2393 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2427 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2430 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2462 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2493 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2570 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2571 Snapshot 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2571 Snapshot 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2573 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2581 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2594 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2602 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4059 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4120 Snapshot 1B Camden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4306 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4347 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4351 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4361 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4368 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4487 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4594 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-0 on 01/01/1948 58021 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 67 Snapshot        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T on 01/01/1948 68 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7287 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7322 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7323 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-0 on 14/08/1948 58021 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 44086 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 44387 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 44306 Transfer out to: 12C Durran Hill (Carlisle)    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 58287 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 24/03/1951 40068 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1951 42376 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 45141 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Canal    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 41217 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42462 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 50643 Transfer out to: 10D Plodder Lane    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 58116 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 44120 Transfer out to: 4B Northampton    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 22/03/1952 46727 Transfer in from: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 58177 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 58257 Transfer in from: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 58277 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 58281 Transfer in from:        
Steam 2F 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 58303 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 58330 Transfer in from:        
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 58334 Transfer in from: 84G Shrewsbury    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 58277 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 58281 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 12/07/1952 42393 Transfer out to: 11C Oxenholme    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 12/07/1952 50644 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 40673 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T m/e 12/1952 46727 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 3w/e 24/01/1953 40673 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 m/e 02/1953 58330 Condemned      
Steam Coal Engines 0-6-0 m/e 03/1953 58334 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 58139 Transfer in from:        
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 21/03/1953 58156 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 11/07/1953 42323 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/08/1953 42364 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/08/1953 42323 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 58273 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1953 58303 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 24/04/1954 58281 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 19/06/1954 42061 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 58281 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/08/1954 42427 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 14/08/1954 42427 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/10/1954 58221 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/12/1954 40067 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 01/01/1955 47605 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 29/01/1955 44361 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 42061 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/03/1955 42601 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 26/03/1955 44059 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/04/1955 42601 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 08/10/1955 45294 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 08/10/1955 58273 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1955 58257 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 58217 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 03/12/1955 42321 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1955 44387 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/01/1956 42332 Transfer in from: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 44366 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/02/1956 42427 Transfer out to: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 42427 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1956 58293 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/05/1956 42573 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 44443 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 44971 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45286 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45289 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 45291 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 11/08/1956 42320 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 45317 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 44971 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 43904 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 58123 Transfer in from:        
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45286 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45289 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45291 Transfer out to: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1956 45317 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 on 30/11/1956 58139 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 01/12/1956 42493 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 23/02/1957 42571 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 on 24/03/1957 58156 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 58171 Transfer in from: 18A Toton    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 58190 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42351 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42560 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 44837 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/08/1957 47494 Transfer in from: 13B Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 42430 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 40695 Transfer in from: 10B Preston    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 09/11/1957 44368 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 43618 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42351 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42359 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42560 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/11/1957 42594 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/11/1957 47494 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 58287 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 58293 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 28/12/1957 47505 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 28/12/1957 47520 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 28/12/1957 47531 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 28/12/1957 47675 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 28/12/1957 47676 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 28/12/1957 42602 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 4w/e 28/12/1957 58171 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/01/1958 42320 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1958 42386 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/04/1958 42427 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0 4w/e 19/04/1958 43618 Transfer out to: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 12/07/1958 45072 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42233 Transfer in from: 11B Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1958 42427 Transfer in from: 11B Workington    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 06/09/1958 47503 Transfer in from: 11B Workington    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 06/09/1958 47517 Transfer in from: 13B Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 4w/e 06/09/1958 45072 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 04/10/1958 41217 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/12/1958 47517 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/03/1959 47517 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42119 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42120 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42440 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42478 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42666 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/06/1959 42673 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 27/06/1959 43904 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/07/1959 42397 Transfer in from: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 29/08/1959 58177 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/09/1959 42372 Transfer in from: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/09/1959 42395 Transfer in from: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1959 42320 Transfer in from: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 10/10/1959 58217 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/10/1959 42372 Transfer out to: 9B Stockport Edgeley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42432 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 42591 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 44537 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47345 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47356 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47373 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 58221 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 14/11/1959 58123 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44601 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 58190 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1959 58293 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1959 42673 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/01/1960 42376 Transfer in from: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/01/1960 42673 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 02/01/1960 42376 Transfer out to: 11A Barrow in Furness    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 16/01/1960 58287 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 on 28/01/1960 58116 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 58160 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 47317 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 12/03/1960 40695 Transfer out to: 67A Corkerhill    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44366 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 12/03/1960 47323 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/03/1960 42478 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 45445 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42440 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42570 Transfer out to: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 44086 Transfer out to: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/07/1960 45258 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42420 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/08/1960 42392 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 44186 Transfer in from: 12H Stranraer    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 24/09/1960 44454 Transfer in from: 12F Workington    
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 58287 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 22/10/1960 58177 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/10/1960 42233 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/10/1960 42320 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/11/1960 44439 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 44439 Transfer out to: 12F Workington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 07/01/1961 44676 Transfer in from:        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 21/01/1961 47520 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 21/01/1961 42397 Condemned      
Steam 2F 0-6-0 w/e 28/01/1961 58293 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/02/1961 47520 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 04/02/1961 58181 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/05/1961 47605 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/06/1961 42318 Transfer in from: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/06/1961 42340 Transfer in from: 8E Northwich    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/06/1961 42347 Transfer in from: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/06/1961 42355 Transfer in from: 9C Macclesfield    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 44882 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/06/1961 42351 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 on 14/07/1961 58181 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/07/1961 47648 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 29/07/1961 58120 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 29/07/1961 58182 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 28/08/1961 D2511 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/09/1961 44594 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 11/09/1961 D2512 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 44345 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1961 42332 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T m/e 10/1961 42364 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 05/10/1961 D2513 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 07/10/1961 42427 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 16/10/1961 D2514 1st Allocation        
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 18/10/1961 D2515 1st Allocation        
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 10/11/1961 D2516 1st Allocation        
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 10/11/1961 D2517 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/11/1961 42395 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 42415 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 42351 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/11/1961 42355 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 25/11/1961 44837 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/11/1961 47322 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/11/1961 47356 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/11/1961 47517 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 25/11/1961 47648 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 02/12/1961 47505 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 30/12/1961 D5719 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5700 Reinstated 98S      
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5701 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5702 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5703 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5704 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5705 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5706 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5707 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5708 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5709 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5710 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5711 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5712 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5713 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5714 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5715 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5716 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5717 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 03/02/1962 D5718 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/03/1962 47520 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/04/1962 44487 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 44447 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/05/1962 42420 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/06/1962 42340 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 45421 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42415 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/07/1962 47317 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/07/1962 42581 Transfer out to: 68D Beattock    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/08/1962 42581 Transfer in from: 68D Beattock    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/08/1962 42581 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 46400 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/08/1962 44454 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/09/1962 47564 Transfer in from: 12F Workington    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 01/09/1962 47373 Transfer out to: 12F Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/09/1962 42318 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 on 08/09/1962 58160 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 15/09/1962 47676 Transfer out to: 12F Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 15/09/1962 42347 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/09/1962 42591 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 29/09/1962 42666 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 29/09/1962 58177 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/10/1962 44367 Transfer in from: 6K Rhyl    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 06/10/1962 47345 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 08/10/1962 44537 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 44676 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 45421 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/11/1962 42376 Condemned      
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 58120 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 78022 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 78023 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 08/12/1962 78027 Transfer in from: 31B March    
Steam 1142 0-6-0 w/e 19/01/1963 58182 Transfer out to: 15D Coalville    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 06/04/1963 44351 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/04/1963 44439 Transfer in from: 12F Workington    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/05/1963 47564 Transfer out to: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 78022 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 11/05/1963 78027 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 18/05/1963 78023 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 46504 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/06/1963 44345 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 08/06/1963 47531 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42278 Transfer in from: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42335 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42447 Transfer in from: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/06/1963 42634 Transfer in from: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 22/06/1963 47287 Transfer out to: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 29/06/1963 44347 Transfer out to: 24D Lower Darwen    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/07/1963 42634 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/07/1963 44447 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/09/1963 42278 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/09/1963 42447 Transfer out to: 9H Patricroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 44439 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 28/09/1963 42120 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/10/1963 44186 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 45294 Transfer out to: 9J Agecroft    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/03/1964 47503 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 04/04/1964 47305 Transfer in from: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 25/04/1964 42335 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/05/1964 42697 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 46499 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 27/06/1964 46506 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/07/1964 45451 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/09/1964 44367 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1964 42148 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/09/1964 42657 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 44200 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 46504 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 46506 Transfer out to: 9M Bury    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 07/11/1964 42657 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 19/12/1964 42148 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 45182 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 27/02/1965 47305 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 45294 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 06/03/1965 45340 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 03/04/1965 47614 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/04/1965 42610 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/06/1965 42134 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 45258 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 26/06/1965 42267 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 26/06/1965 45445 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/07/1965 44200 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/07/1965 42080 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/07/1965 42581 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 24/07/1965 47614 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 07/08/1965 44443 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/08/1965 42673 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/08/1965 42233 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/08/1965 42236 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/08/1965 44086 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/08/1965 44350 Transfer in from: 10D Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 21/08/1965 42119 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 21/08/1965 42432 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 45340 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 45451 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 18/09/1965 46400 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 02/10/1965 46499 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 16/10/1965 D5700 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 16/10/1965 D5701 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 16/10/1965 D5702 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 16/10/1965 D5703 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 16/10/1965 D5714 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 16/10/1965 D5715 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 16/10/1965 D5716 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 30/10/1965 42581 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 06/11/1965 42267 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/11/1965 44086 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/11/1965 44601 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/11/1965 44311 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 27/11/1965 42233 Transfer out to: 8M Southport    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1965 44500 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/12/1965 44394 Transfer in from: 9L Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/12/1965 44350 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/01/1966 44310 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/01/1966 42080 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/01/1966 42697 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 22/01/1966 12086 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 29/01/1966 12086 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/02/1966 44310 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 12/03/1966 45182 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 04/1966 47675 Condemned      
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 23/04/1966 45012 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 23/04/1966 42610 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/05/1966 42159 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 21/05/1966 42159 Transfer out to: 9K Bolton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/06/1966 42252 Transfer in from: 9K Bolton    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 02/07/1966 12086 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 02/07/1966 44394 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1966 44311 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 09/07/1966 44500 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 13/08/1966 42115 Transfer in from: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 20/08/1966 44691 Transfer in from: 2B Oxley    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 08/10/1966 45012 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 22/10/1966 D2511 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 12/11/1966 42115 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 19/11/1966 D2058 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 19/11/1966 D2059 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/11/1966 D3412 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/12/1966 42134 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/12/1966 42236 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 17/12/1966 42252 Transfer out to: 12E Tebay    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/12/1966 44691 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/12/1966 44882 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/12/1966 45141 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Steam 5MT 4-6-0 w/e 17/12/1966 45294 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5704 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5705 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5706 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5707 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5708 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5709 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5710 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5711 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5712 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5713 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5717 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5718 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel 28 Co-Bo w/e 17/12/1966 D5719 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 31/12/1966 D2505 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 07/01/1967 D2504 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 14/01/1967 D2506 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D2501 Transfer in from: 40B Immingham    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D2507 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D3202 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 12086 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D2513 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D2514 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 21/01/1967 D2517 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 on 18/02/1967 D2501 Condemned      
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 on 18/03/1967 D2504 Condemned      
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 on 25/03/1967 D2507 Condemned      
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 D2500 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 D2502 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 D2503 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 22/04/1967 D2513 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 on 13/05/1967 D2500 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 13/05/1967 D2512 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 D2118 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 D2511 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 24/06/1967 D2514 Transfer in from: 12D Workington    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 01/07/1967 D2124 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 on 05/08/1967 D2503 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 05/08/1967 D2514 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 05/08/1967 D2515 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 05/08/1967 D2516 Condemned      
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 on 19/08/1967 D2505 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 19/08/1967 D2513 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 09/09/1967 D2116 Transfer in from: 16A Toton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1967 D2129 Transfer in from: 16C Derby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 07/10/1967 D2394 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 on 07/10/1967 D2502 Condemned      
Diesel D2/7 0-6-0 on 25/11/1967 D2506 Condemned      
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 on 30/12/1967 D2511 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/01/1968 D3210 Transfer in from: 10D Lostock Hall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D3008 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D3200 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D3286 Transfer in from: 66C Hamilton (West)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D3566 Transfer in from: 10A Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D4139 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D4140 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D4141 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/08/1968 D4142 Transfer in from: 24L Carnforth    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/10/1968 D3008 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/10/1968 D3566 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/11/1968 D3412 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 23/11/1968 D2394 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 07/12/1968 D2129 Transfer out to: 41E Staveley (Barrow Hill)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 29/03/1969 D4142 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/01/1970 D3283 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/01/1970 D4141 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 17/01/1970 D2392 Transfer in from: 8J Allerton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 28/02/1970 D2124 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 28/03/1970 D2392 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/06/1970 D4152 Transfer in from: 8J Allerton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 31/10/1970 D4139 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 09/10/1971 D2199 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 09/10/1971 D2116 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/01/1972 D3784 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/02/1972 D3784 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 5w/e 01/04/1972 D3202 Transfer out to: 67C Ayr    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/05/1972 D3283 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 18/06/1972 D2118 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 18/06/1972 D2199 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/08/1974 08926 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/08/1974 08132 Transfer out to: KM Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/08/1974 08910 Transfer out to: KM Carlisle Kingmoor    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 17/06/1975 03058 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/10/1975 08922 Transfer out to: AN Allerton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/10/1975 08926 Transfer out to: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/11/1980 08216 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 13/11/1983 08142 Condemned      
Diesel 03 0-6-0 on 05/07/1987 03059 Condemned