Depot: Royston
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 4003 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 22951 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2895 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2988 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1368 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1428 | Snapshot | M1 | Derby | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 1395 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 28/12/1946 | 1428 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12108 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12252 | Snapshot | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12258 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12559 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 169 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 181 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2895 | Snapshot | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3233 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3250 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3332 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3553 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 362 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3789 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3942 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4003 | Snapshot | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4003 | Snapshot | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4141 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 480 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7421 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7462 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7581 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8062 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8078 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8079 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8080 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8085 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8095 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8103 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8113 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8161 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8162 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8169 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8376 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8377 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8419 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8431 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8439 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8443 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8532 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8542 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8545 | Snapshot | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8546 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8547 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 12559 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 74 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 12559 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 3509 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 8079 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 8080 | Transfer out to: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 8376 | Transfer out to: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 8547 | Transfer out to: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8321 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 43765 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 48085 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8321 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 52095 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 48078 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 48078 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1949 | 48700 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 1429 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 40147 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 48161 | Transfer out to: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 48545 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 48546 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 40362 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 48703 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 8157 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 48093 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 48337 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 48703 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 8157 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 40169 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 58188 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 40521 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 40514 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1950 | 41273 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1950 | 41274 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 44290 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44290 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 44290 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44241 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48080 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44241 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 48080 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 58154 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 44241 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 48080 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 40514 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 58154 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 58090 | Transfer out to: | 23A | Skipton | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 58154 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40147 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 44501 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44501 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44501 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 48062 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 58060 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 58060 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 19/05/1951 | 43765 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 48053 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 40444 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 44241 | Transfer out to: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 48053 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 48053 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63751 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63754 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63772 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63845 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63849 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 63857 | Transfer in from: | 53E | Cudworth | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 40139 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/09/1951 | 40140 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63751 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63754 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63772 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63845 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63849 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63857 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40139 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40140 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48436 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48466 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48469 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48473 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48664 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48689 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48710 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40139 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 40140 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48436 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48466 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48469 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48473 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48664 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48689 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48710 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48436 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48466 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48469 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48473 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48664 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48689 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48710 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 43686 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 40147 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 44475 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 43686 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44475 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/01/1952 | 40514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48459 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 43906 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48459 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 40147 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48459 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 40074 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | m/e | 07/1952 | 58060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 47438 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 58060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 58040 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Skipton | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 58040 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Skipton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 43267 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 43476 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 43705 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 48608 | Transfer in from: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 52095 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 52108 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 52252 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 52258 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 52559 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 58212 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 44161 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48377 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48412 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48419 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 40082 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 43321 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | on | 03/09/1953 | 84009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 40082 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 58066 | Transfer out to: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 43914 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 44550 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 43332 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 58162 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 06/02/1954 | 40480 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 48146 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 48670 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 58135 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 40082 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 58066 | Transfer in from: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 41273 | Transfer out to: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 44501 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 48070 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 48750 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 50646 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44107 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44274 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 50650 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 48053 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 48095 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 48750 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 58040 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 58135 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 84009 | Transfer out to: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | w/e | 19/03/1955 | 58040 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 43983 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 44408 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 84009 | Transfer in from: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40139 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40140 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 48222 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 48265 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 48281 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 44408 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 48431 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 48436 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 48459 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 44582 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 41281 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 41282 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 43321 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 48103 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 48443 | Transfer out to: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 50646 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 50650 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 43553 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/03/1956 | 40521 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1956 | 58212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 07/04/1956 | 40520 | Transfer in from: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 58216 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/06/1956 | 58154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | on | 25/04/1957 | 58188 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | on | 16/05/1957 | 58216 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 58191 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 58197 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 18/05/1957 | 43476 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1957 | D3458 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 43705 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1957 | 58140 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1957 | D3375 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1957 | D3376 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1957 | D3377 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1957 | D3378 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/09/1957 | D3379 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/09/1957 | D3380 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 48123 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 48130 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 18/10/1957 | 40520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 40581 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1957 | D2262 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1957 | D2263 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 47421 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 47438 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Starbeck | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 47448 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 47462 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Starbeck | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 47581 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 47634 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Starbeck | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1958 | D2266 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1958 | D2267 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/02/1958 | D2268 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/02/1958 | D2269 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | D2268 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | D2269 | Transfer in from: | 55D | Royston | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | D2262 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | D2263 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | D2268 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | D2269 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | D3375 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D2269 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D3380 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48080 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48162 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48265 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 58066 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 48130 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 48130 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 48162 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 48537 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 90488 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 90611 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 90661 | Transfer in from: | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 40148 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90243 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 90336 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41274 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41281 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 41282 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 84009 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 90605 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 90664 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 48093 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 48169 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 90661 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 90664 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1959 | 58191 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | D2268 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1959 | 43233 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 42408 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 48093 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 48169 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44003 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44107 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 43250 | Transfer out to: | 17C | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 43789 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 48608 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 90395 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90511 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 43681 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 43737 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/03/1960 | D3937 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/03/1960 | D3941 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | D2267 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42408 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 04/10/1960 | 40581 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | on | 09/11/1960 | 58197 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 90650 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 40193 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 90610 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 43681 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 18/02/1961 | 43737 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 44087 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1961 | 43267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/07/1961 | 44141 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 40082 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 48067 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 48159 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 48443 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 90127 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 90407 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 90684 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 48542 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 48664 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 48689 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/02/1962 | 40181 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 27/02/1962 | 44087 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1962 | 44550 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 44098 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 44099 | Transfer in from: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 90591 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1962 | 43446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42762 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42770 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42795 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 48076 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 25/08/1962 | 40148 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 25/08/1962 | 40193 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 90254 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 48078 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 48469 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 48532 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1962 | 43914 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 73166 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 73170 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 73171 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/11/1962 | 90591 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 90377 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D3376 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 73166 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 48075 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 48080 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 48352 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 90254 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 44912 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45207 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45219 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 90345 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 48080 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73170 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 73171 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90336 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90407 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90511 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90610 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90611 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 90684 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/11/1963 | 44582 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 23/11/1963 | 42762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 23/11/1963 | 42770 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 42795 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1963 | 44098 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/12/1963 | 44274 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90254 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90503 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90645 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 90699 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 43968 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 90377 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/12/1963 | 90395 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 43942 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 48076 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 90650 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 48130 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/04/1964 | 90699 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/06/1964 | 44290 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | D3381 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 48274 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 90254 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 90345 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | D3375 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | D3381 | Transfer out to: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | D3375 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 90243 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1964 | 90127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/12/1964 | 90488 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 15/02/1965 | 44099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 44056 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 90377 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 90650 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 48093 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 48146 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 48274 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 48473 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1965 | 43983 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43076 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43077 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43078 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 43079 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90318 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 90337 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 48537 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 48670 | Transfer out to: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1965 | 43906 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1965 | 43968 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1965 | 44056 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1965 | 44446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/02/1966 | 90377 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 90481 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 44912 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1966 | 45219 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 90054 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 90615 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 90642 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 90721 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1966 | 45207 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1966 | 90481 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 48160 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 48394 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 48537 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 48721 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90054 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90337 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90503 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1966 | 90721 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1966 | 48443 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 48146 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 48473 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1966 | 43079 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 48076 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 48664 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 05/12/1966 | 43078 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1967 | 48146 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/01/1967 | 90645 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D2246 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D2263 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 42141 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 42689 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48084 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48093 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48126 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48130 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48622 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 48703 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90649 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90680 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90694 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90318 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90605 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90615 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90642 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 90650 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1967 | 48130 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 43077 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1967 | 48123 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 12113 | Transfer in from: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1967 | 48159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 42689 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1967 | 48075 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 24/04/1967 | 48126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 08/05/1967 | 48466 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D2271 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D2272 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | D2263 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 42141 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 48162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 24/06/1967 | 48394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 48055 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 48276 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 48454 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 43076 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 31/07/1967 | 48160 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | D2246 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1967 | D2266 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Knottingley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 06/09/1967 | 48281 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 48337 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 48721 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1967 | 48710 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 25/09/1967 | 48703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1967 | 48113 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D3379 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1967 | D3941 | Transfer out to: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1967 | 48067 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 30/10/1967 | 48537 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48055 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48070 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48076 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48084 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48093 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48222 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48276 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48352 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48439 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48473 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48540 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1967 | 48664 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | D3377 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D3294 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2271 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D2272 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1971 | D3294 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1971 | 12113 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1971 | D3378 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1971 | D3458 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1971 | D3937 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) |