Depot: Ryecroft (Walsall)
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1239 | Snapshot | 24 | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1275 | Snapshot | 28 | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1239 | Snapshot | M14 | Bedford | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1275 | Snapshot | 30 | Skipton | ||
Steam | 1282 | 2-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 20157 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6643 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 6713 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8531 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 2982 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/07/1936 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1937 | 2982 | Transfer out to: | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1937 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | m/e | 09/1946 | 6713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 11 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12438 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 17 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 19 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2452 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2562 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2586 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2604 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2627 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3410 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3502 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3786 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4069 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4115 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 413 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 42 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4339 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4345 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4454 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 45 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 462 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4873 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 501 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5308 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5395 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6643 | Snapshot | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6661 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6679 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 6757 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 69 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9003 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9015 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9031 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9040 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9048 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9056 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9222 | Snapshot | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9236 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9248 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9283 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9325 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9349 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9350 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9364 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9388 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 6712 | Transfer in from: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9198 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 413 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 4339 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | m/e | 02/1948 | 6679 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 7413 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 413 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 9066 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/03/1948 | 9236 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 9326 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 9195 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 9211 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 42 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 29/05/1948 | 9198 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | m/e | 06/1948 | 6661 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2482 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 2488 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9193 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 17 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 69 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 4078 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 4352 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 4360 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 9056 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 9211 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 413 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9248 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 58333 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 58341 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 58349 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 28531 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 58348 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 58349 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 4937 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 25344 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4937 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9283 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 22978 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 58122 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 22978 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 58122 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 22978 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 58122 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 58348 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 58333 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 58116 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Coal Engines | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 58341 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1949 | 49195 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 49040 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 48904 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 49285 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 9300 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 49015 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 42660 | Transfer out to: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49133 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49135 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 49213 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 49285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 157 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 58420 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 58420 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 157 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 58420 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 49058 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 48904 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 58420 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 48966 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 49100 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 49324 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/11/1949 | 49373 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 49258 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 4069 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 49325 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 49349 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 44454 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 48966 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 43633 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 43787 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 49133 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43633 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43787 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43633 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 43787 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 49401 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 44352 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1950 | 49058 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 49324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 49208 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 49171 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1950 | 49100 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45069 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 58123 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45069 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58122 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 10/1950 | 41279 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 42469 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58283 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58302 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 43633 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 43787 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 48943 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 49401 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 42469 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48943 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 58283 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 58302 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 42469 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48943 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 58283 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 58302 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 46757 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1950 | 49364 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 40047 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40006 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 49241 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 49241 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 49241 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 49208 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 49258 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 49388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 40068 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 58279 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 44360 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 40068 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 58279 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 40011 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 40068 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 58279 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 9239 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 49301 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 9239 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 40462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1951 | 49031 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 40073 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40073 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40531 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49301 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40006 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40073 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49301 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 49020 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 48907 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 58302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48907 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 48907 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 40531 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/07/1951 | 40531 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1951 | 49213 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 40068 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 40068 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 49222 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48905 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48917 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1951 | 49193 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 49300 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 49092 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 46712 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 40073 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 40073 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1952 | 49171 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40080 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40084 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40108 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 46712 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40019 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40045 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40047 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40068 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 58116 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 40079 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 40096 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 40149 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 40155 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 40173 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42448 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42452 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42466 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42469 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48922 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 40085 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 40180 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 49092 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42538 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42578 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45307 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 49162 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 58122 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40149 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40155 | Transfer out to: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40079 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 40096 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 20/09/1952 | 49241 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45307 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40206 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40401 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44448 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 49107 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 49108 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 42444 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43786 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/05/1953 | 13021 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/05/1953 | 49162 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 49354 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 58125 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40206 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1953 | 40401 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/08/1953 | 49326 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 47296 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 47413 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 49271 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 40084 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 41902 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40108 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40180 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 46712 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 44444 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 45195 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42538 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42562 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42578 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/12/1954 | 13091 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 41213 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 42441 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 40080 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 45195 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 41214 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 40073 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 48922 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 49048 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 58169 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 43502 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 40122 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 41214 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 45416 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40122 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 40085 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1955 | 58125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/03/1956 | 49354 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 40080 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 41223 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 41224 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44512 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 58174 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 58203 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 58279 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 58288 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 41902 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 45416 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1956 | 40531 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45403 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 48932 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 40129 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 40421 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45403 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 58123 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 45308 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40010 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 40010 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/02/1957 | 12056 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 41324 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 58157 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 41324 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44488 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49387 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 48932 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41212 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41220 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41320 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 41324 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45067 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45113 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45307 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45328 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 45419 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44345 | Transfer out to: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 48917 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 49387 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41212 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41220 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41320 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 41324 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45067 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45113 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45307 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45328 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1957 | 48907 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 49278 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/11/1957 | 49066 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 02/11/1957 | 49271 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 23/11/1957 | 49107 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49114 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49249 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49343 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 40129 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42488 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40673 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40421 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 40501 | Transfer out to: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 40692 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/01/1958 | 58203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 45344 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 58181 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42560 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40080 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40173 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40673 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40692 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41213 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41223 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41224 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 41279 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42441 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42482 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42560 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42586 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42604 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42627 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 43410 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44078 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44115 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44444 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44448 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44512 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44873 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45344 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45395 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 45419 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 47296 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48905 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48943 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49020 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49114 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49249 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49278 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49301 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49343 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 49373 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58122 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58169 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58174 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58181 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 58283 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 07/03/1959 | 49108 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 52438 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D3780 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D3781 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 12056 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | D3053 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 49350 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | D3053 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | D3802 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1966 | D3866 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12004 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12013 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12056 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12077 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12087 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12091 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | 12093 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3088 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3090 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3111 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3112 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3115 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3116 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D3867 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D3802 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D3866 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 15105 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | 15106 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 12077 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 12091 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1966 | 12093 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12056 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12087 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 15105 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 15106 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3021 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3088 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3090 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3091 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3111 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3112 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3115 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3116 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3780 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3781 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D3867 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 12004 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 12013 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |