Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 54 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4969 Week
» 16206 Month
» 249126 Year
» 1914502 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Salisbury


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 380 4-4-0 m/e 11/1879 387 1st Allocation        
Steam 380 4-4-0 m/e 11/1879 388 1st Allocation        
Steam 135 4-4-0 m/e 12/1880 143 1st Allocation        
Steam 135 4-4-0 m/e 01/1881 144 1st Allocation        
Steam 135 4-4-0 y/e 1884 143 Transfer out to: - Exeter Queen Street    
Steam 460 4-4-0 m/e 08/1884 477 1st Allocation        
Steam 460 4-4-0 m/e 10/1884 467 1st Allocation        
Steam 460 4-4-0 m/e 10/1884 468 1st Allocation        
Steam X2 4-4-0 m/e 03/1892 592 1st Allocation        
Steam X2 4-4-0 m/e 03/1892 593 1st Allocation        
Steam X2 4-4-0 m/e 05/1892 596 1st Allocation        
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 02/1893 561 1st Allocation        
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 03/1893 562 1st Allocation        
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 10/1893 574 1st Allocation        
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 10/1893 575 1st Allocation        
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 12/1895 660 1st Allocation        
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 12/1895 661 1st Allocation        
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 12/1895 662 1st Allocation        
Steam T6 4-4-0 m/e 04/1896 685 1st Allocation        
Steam 380 4-4-0 m/e 12/1913 0387 Condemned      
Steam 135 4-4-0 m/e 11/1921 0347 Condemned      
Steam 380 4-4-0 m/e 12/1925 0162 Condemned      
Steam 460 4-4-0 m/e 10/1927 E0477 Condemned      
Steam 460 4-4-0 m/e 05/1928 E0468 Condemned      
Steam 460 4-4-0 m/e 12/1928 E0467 Condemned      
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 10/1930 E561 Condemned      
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 04/1931 E562 Condemned      
Steam X2 4-4-0 m/e 05/1931 E596 Condemned      
Steam X2 4-4-0 m/e 07/1931 E593 Condemned      
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 01/1932 E575 Condemned      
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 03/1933 E662 Condemned      
Steam T3 4-4-0 m/e 07/1933 E574 Condemned      
Steam T6 4-4-0 m/e 02/1936 685 Condemned      
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 10/1936 660 Condemned      
Steam X6 4-4-0 m/e 12/1936 661 Condemned      
Steam X2 4-4-0 m/e 12/1936 E592 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 10 Snapshot BM Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 117 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 122 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 127 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 13 Snapshot BM Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1612 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1618 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1626 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1630 Snapshot        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1636 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1846 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1848 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1872 Snapshot        
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1873 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C10 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C148 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C149 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C150 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C151 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C152 Snapshot        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C153 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C6 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C7 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C8 Snapshot        
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 on 01/01/1948 21C9 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 237 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 243 Snapshot        
Steam G6 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 279 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 285 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 288 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 312 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 315 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 317 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 330 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 331 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 332 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 333 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 334 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 335 Snapshot        
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3441 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 355 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 361 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 378 Snapshot        
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 393 Snapshot        
Steam S11 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 398 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 41 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 421 Snapshot        
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 432 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 448 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 449 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 450 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 451 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 452 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 453 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 454 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 455 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 456 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 457 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 475 Snapshot        
Steam H15 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 476 Snapshot        
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 675 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 690 Snapshot        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 691 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 709 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 715 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 721 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 727 Snapshot        
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 729 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 744 Snapshot        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 746 Snapshot        
Steam Z 0-8-0T on 01/01/1948 957 Snapshot        
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 09/1948 10 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 12/1948 279 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 02/1949 30013 Condemned      
Steam T1 0-4-4T m/e 02/1949 30361 Condemned      
Steam Small Hoppers 4-4-0 m/e 02/1949 30393 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 03/1949 30237 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 m/e 28/02/1950 30827 Transfer in from:        
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/06/1950 30031 Transfer in from: FEL Feltham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 17/06/1950 34035 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30334 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30335 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30715 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 17/06/1950 30031 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 30826 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 09/09/1950 34032 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 09/09/1950 34035 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30330 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30331 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30765 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30773 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30330 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30331 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30451 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30332 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30333 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30334 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30335 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30332 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30333 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam H15 4-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 30476 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31612 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 31846 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30300 Transfer in from: DOR Dorchester    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30451 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30455 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30456 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30457 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31874 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31875 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 127 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 30243 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30285 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30355 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30421 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Bulldogs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30432 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30455 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30456 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30457 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30721 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30744 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30746 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30765 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30773 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Jumbos 0-6-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 3441 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30302 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 304 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30710 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30726 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34012 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34015 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34028 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34048 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30117 Transfer out to: 71C Dorchester    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30122 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30288 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31636 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 05/02/1951 34048 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30673 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 30674 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam S11 4-4-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30398 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30455 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30457 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 20/03/1951 34012 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 20/03/1951 34015 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 20/03/1951 34028 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 6w/e 20/03/1951 34032 Transfer out to: 72D Plymouth Friary    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 11/04/1951 30041 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 31848 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34049 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34050 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34051 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34052 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/04/1951 34053 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30455 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30457 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30667 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30670 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30673 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30674 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30723 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31637 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31639 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34045 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34046 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34047 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34048 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34049 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30673 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 30674 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30729 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31618 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 31626 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 12/05/1951 34048 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 06/1951 30723 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30823 Transfer in from:        
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30824 Transfer in from:        
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30825 Transfer in from:        
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30846 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam S15 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30847 Transfer in from:        
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31636 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32506 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34050 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34051 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34052 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34053 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30456 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 30457 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31872 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31873 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31874 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 7w/e 27/06/1951 31875 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34045 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34046 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34047 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 7w/e 27/06/1951 34048 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30703 Transfer in from: WAD Wadebridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 31635 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30726 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30727 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 03/1952 30312 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30702 Transfer in from: YEO Yeovil Town    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 32486 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 9w/e 30/06/1952 34054 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 9w/e 30/06/1952 34055 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30455 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31639 Transfer out to: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 13/08/1952 31637 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 10/1952 30302 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 m/e 10/1952 30703 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 30307 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 30721 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 5w/e 11/12/1952 34099 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 27/12/1952 30307 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/01/1953 30675 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 08/01/1953 34099 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 14/02/1953 31639 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31813 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 31814 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam S15 4-6-0 4w/e 01/10/1953 30846 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 4w/e 29/10/1953 30270 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 30667 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 08/02/1954 35008 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam G6 0-6-0T 8w/e 13/05/1954 30266 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 6w/e 18/06/1954 30313 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/11/1954 34056 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 06/11/1954 34057 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 30690 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30309 Transfer in from:        
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30327 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30315 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 30691 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/12/1954 34056 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 11/12/1954 34057 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 30327 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 76005 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 76006 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 76008 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 30327 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31635 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31636 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 6w/e 21/06/1955 31639 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 16/09/1955 30956 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 16/09/1955 32506 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 10/10/1955 34059 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 27/01/1956 35010 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 7w/e 20/04/1956 30956 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 03/11/1956 30332 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30025 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 30374 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/11/1956 32486 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 4w/e 17/12/1956 30954 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 6w/e 01/04/1957 30953 Transfer in from: 71H Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 01/04/1957 35004 Transfer in from: EXJ Exmouth Junction    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 6w/e 01/04/1957 30954 Transfer out to: 71H Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 6w/e 01/04/1957 35009 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 11/05/1957 30330 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 9w/e 12/06/1957 30374 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 19/07/1957 30954 Transfer in from: 71H Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 19/07/1957 30953 Transfer out to: 71H Templecombe (S&D)    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 28/09/1957 30304 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 on 14/01/1958 30721 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 30315 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 30317 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam H15 4-6-0 m/e 06/1958 30334 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30729 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30957 Transfer in from: SAL Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 3w/e 13/10/1958 76007 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30957 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 18/10/1958 30454 Condemned      
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 25/10/1958 30333 Condemned      
Steam G6 0-6-0T w/e 10/01/1959 30270 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 30692 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 76009 Transfer in from: 72C Yeovil Town    
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 30327 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 11/03/1959 30702 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 14/03/1959 30710 Condemned      
Steam Z 0-8-0T 3w/e 01/05/1959 30957 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 06/06/1959 30335 Condemned      
Steam H15 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30522 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30523 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30524 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30796 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30798 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 30799 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 76059 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 76060 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30378 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 6w/e 14/06/1959 30954 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 31019 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 31067 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 31497 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 31507 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam S15 4-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 30847 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 19/08/1959 30313 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 22/08/1959 30452 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 19/12/1959 30449 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 34048 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 34099 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76017 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76018 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76066 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76067 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 34053 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 10/03/1960 34055 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76006 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76009 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76059 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 10/03/1960 76060 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31019 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31067 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31497 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31507 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31019 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31067 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31497 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 31507 Transfer out to: 72B Salisbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 76053 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 76054 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 76055 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 30729 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 31019 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 31067 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 31497 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam E1A 4-4-0 4w/e 06/05/1960 31507 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam G6 0-6-0T m/e 08/1960 30266 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 06/08/1960 30673 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 on 27/08/1960 30448 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 03/09/1960 30450 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 05/10/1960 30033 Transfer in from: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 6w/e 05/10/1960 30764 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 24/11/1960 30771 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 24/11/1960 30783 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34026 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 4w/e 24/11/1960 30764 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 24/11/1960 34050 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 02/1961 30783 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/02/1961 34003 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/02/1961 34005 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 25/02/1961 30524 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 25/02/1961 30799 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 m/e 03/1961 30771 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 18/03/1961 30300 Condemned      
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 18/03/1961 30331 Condemned      
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31404 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31898 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31899 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31900 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34067 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34068 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34091 Transfer in from:        
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 3w/e 26/05/1961 34092 Transfer in from:        
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 08/07/1961 30453 Condemned      
Steam Greyhounds 4-4-0 w/e 29/07/1961 30709 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 26/08/1961 30674 Condemned      
Steam H15 4-6-0 m/e 10/1961 30522 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 2w/e 10/10/1961 30021 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 2w/e 10/10/1961 30670 Transfer out to: 72E Barnstaple Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 31898 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 31899 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 31900 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 31408 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/11/1961 4626 Transfer in from: 73H Dover Marine    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 09/11/1961 4630 Transfer in from: 73H Dover Marine    
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1961 30475 Condemned      
Steam H15 4-6-0 w/e 09/12/1961 30523 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 w/e 03/02/1962 30692 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 03/03/1962 30796 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 30451 Condemned      
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 w/e 16/06/1962 30798 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 24/09/1962 30034 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/10/1962 30241 Transfer in from: 9E Nine Elms    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 17/11/1962 31630 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 30826 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30532 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T on 22/12/1962 30033 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 23/12/1962 30309 Condemned      
Steam Black Motors 0-6-0 on 23/12/1962 30315 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30249 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30021 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30025 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 17/02/1963 30034 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 01/04/1963 4616 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 30241 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 01/04/1963 30249 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/07/1963 30021 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT on 08/09/1963 4616 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34012 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34013 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34014 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34019 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34027 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34057 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34063 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34089 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 16/09/1963 34100 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4w/e 16/09/1963 4689 Transfer in from: 71G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31404 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31408 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31813 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 4w/e 16/09/1963 31814 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 03/11/1963 34032 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 03/11/1963 34036 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 03/11/1963 34056 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 03/11/1963 34108 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 03/11/1963 34054 Transfer out to: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 16/11/1963 34067 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 12/1963 34049 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 12/1963 34068 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 30532 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 30825 Condemned      
Steam S15 4-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 30827 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 06/01/1964 30025 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 06/01/1964 30133 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 06/01/1964 30254 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 30535 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam S15 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 30823 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam S15 4-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 30824 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 23/02/1964 41210 Transfer in from: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 23/02/1964 41315 Transfer in from: 83D Exmouth Junction    
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 03/1964 4626 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 15/03/1964 30021 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 15/03/1964 30133 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 10/05/1964 30025 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 10/05/1964 30254 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 10/05/1964 41210 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 25/05/1964 41230 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T on 14/06/1964 41320 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 22/06/1964 41300 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 76053 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 76054 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 22/06/1964 76055 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 07/1964 41315 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/08/1964 34027 Condemned      
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 w/e 16/08/1964 35006 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 06/09/1964 34015 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 on 06/09/1964 34066 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34006 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34007 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34019 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 34036 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 m/e 14/09/1964 35004 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 76018 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 m/e 14/09/1964 76066 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 20/09/1964 34003 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 20/09/1964 34091 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 18/10/1964 41300 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 08/11/1964 34099 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 29/11/1964 34092 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 18/01/1965 30535 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Merchant Navy 4-6-2 4w/e 18/01/1965 35007 Transfer out to: 70G Weymouth Radipole (GWR)    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 21/03/1965 34014 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3w/e 28/03/1965 4689 Transfer out to: 85B Gloucester Horton Road    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/05/1965 41230 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 10/05/1965 41320 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80142 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80144 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80145 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80151 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 08/06/1965 80152 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 04/07/1965 76017 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 05/07/1965 76055 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 15/08/1965 34063 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 m/e 10/1965 34051 Condemned      
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT m/e 10/1965 4630 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 17/10/1965 34007 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 w/e 17/10/1965 76055 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 25/10/1965 34064 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 25/10/1965 34076 Transfer in from: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 25/10/1965 34005 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 4w/e 25/10/1965 34012 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 4w/e 25/10/1965 76005 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 20/12/1965 80144 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/01/1966 34076 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/02/1966 80142 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 07/02/1966 80145 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 13/03/1966 34048 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 22/05/1966 34064 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 29/05/1966 34059 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 04/09/1966 34066 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 18/09/1966 34026 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 02/10/1966 34032 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/10/1966 80151 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/10/1966 80152 Transfer out to: 70D Eastleigh    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 19/03/1967 34006 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 16/04/1967 34015 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 17/04/1967 76007 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 17/04/1967 76008 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 2-6-0 5w/e 17/04/1967 76067 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 07/05/1967 34056 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 07/05/1967 34057 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 25/06/1967 34108 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 02/07/1967 34100 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34013 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34052 Condemned      
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 w/e 09/07/1967 34089 Condemned