Depot: Sheffield Grimesthorpe
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1255 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1256 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1257 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1259 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1260 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1267 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1268 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1880 | 1269 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 06/1883 | 1632 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 08/1883 | 1635 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1884 | 1642 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1884 | 1643 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1884 | 1644 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1255 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1256 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1257 | Snapshot | 20 | Buxton (MR) | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1259 | Snapshot | 20 | Buxton (MR) | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1260 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1260 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1261 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1262 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1263 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1267 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1268 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1269 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1632 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1635 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1642 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1643 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1892 | 1644 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1895 | 2240 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1895 | 2241 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1895 | 2259 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1895 | 2242 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1895 | 2243 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1895 | 2244 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1895 | 2245 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1895 | 2246 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1895 | 2247 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1260 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1261 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1262 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1263 | Snapshot | 29I | Ilkley | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 1542 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2238 | Snapshot | 18M | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2240 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2240 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2241 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2241 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2242 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2242 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2243 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2243 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2244 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2244 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2245 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2245 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2246 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2246 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2247 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2247 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2259 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 01/1899 | 2259 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1542 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 1542 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2238 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2238 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2240 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2240 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2241 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2241 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2242 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2242 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2243 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2243 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2244 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2244 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2245 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2245 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2246 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2246 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2247 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2247 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2259 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1902 | 2259 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1276 | Snapshot | 28 | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1391 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1391 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1397 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1397 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1399 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1399 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1908 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 04/1914 | 1232 | Snapshot | M&GN | M&GN Joint Railway | |||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1250 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1255 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1256 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1258 | Snapshot | 18M | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1261 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1391 | Snapshot | 3 | Saltley | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1397 | Snapshot | 8 | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1399 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1399 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1914 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 12/1921 | 1232 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 12/1921 | 1232 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | |||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1250 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1250 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1255 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1255 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1256 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1256 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1258 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1258 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1261 | Snapshot | 18 | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1372 | Snapshot | 16 | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1399 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1399 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1921 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 6 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 31/01/1926 | 1232 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/12/1928 | 1256 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1930 | 1372 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1250 | Snapshot | 2 | Burton | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1255 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1258 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1258 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1332 | Snapshot | 2 | Burton | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1333 | Snapshot | 2 | Burton | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1351 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1352 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1399 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1399 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1930 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 05/09/1931 | 1332 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 03/10/1931 | 1399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/12/1931 | 1333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 26/12/1931 | 1352 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 25/02/1933 | 1351 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1258 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1258 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1266 | Snapshot | 30 | Skipton | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1358 | Snapshot | 29 | Manningham | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1368 | Snapshot | M10 | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1392 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1393 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1394 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1395 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1396 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1398 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1400 | Snapshot | 25 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1933 | 1426 | Snapshot | M16 | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/12/1934 | 1398 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 18/05/1935 | 1266 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9555 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9589 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 3835 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 515 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 2796 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5089 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 757 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8003 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8004 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8005 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9555 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9589 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 1262 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 27/02/1937 | 1258 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/10/1937 | 1400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 31/12/1938 | 1392 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 30/12/1939 | 1394 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/09/1944 | 1393 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1358 | Snapshot | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1368 | Snapshot | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1395 | Snapshot | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1396 | Snapshot | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1945 | 1426 | Snapshot | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1768 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1855 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1857 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2761 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2769 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2796 | Snapshot | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2797 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2904 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 324 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3241 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3334 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3468 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3595 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3596 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3636 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3661 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3715 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3731 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3749 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3755 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3772 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3775 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3835 | Snapshot | 17C | Coalville | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3844 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4006 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 401 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4165 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4284 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4285 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4334 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4355 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4418 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4426 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4437 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4568 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4572 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4573 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4858 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4921 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5089 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 515 | Snapshot | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5262 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5407 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7235 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7236 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 728 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 729 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7513 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7545 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 757 | Snapshot | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8003 | Snapshot | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8004 | Snapshot | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8005 | Snapshot | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8017 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8105 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8116 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8216 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8219 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8284 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8314 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8642 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 2099 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 2109 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8189 | Transfer in from: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8105 | Transfer out to: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 4802 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 4921 | Transfer out to: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8134 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8354 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 4006 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 4971 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1781 | Transfer in from: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1855 | Transfer out to: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 22969 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 23002 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8354 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8179 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8134 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 2099 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 2109 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 545 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 40401 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4418 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1948 | 22969 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 324 | Transfer out to: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 47545 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 3335 | Transfer in from: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 3604 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 43193 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3335 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3604 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 43193 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3335 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3604 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 43193 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 18/12/1948 | 545 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 3463 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 5088 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 43193 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 44556 | Transfer in from: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 44572 | Transfer out to: | 20H | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 48007 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 48017 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 44355 | Transfer out to: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 48007 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1949 | 43037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 42761 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 45263 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 43038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44665 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44804 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 44843 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 45263 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 45263 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 42761 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 44665 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45056 | Transfer in from: | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 44804 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 45088 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 45263 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 7432 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | on | 31/12/1949 | 41768 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 42761 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 7432 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 42761 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 7432 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/02/1950 | 7563 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 44165 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 41660 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 25/03/1950 | 43772 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 43468 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1950 | 43596 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 44944 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 42761 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 42769 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 44845 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 45225 | Transfer in from: | 23A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 44477 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 43037 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 44477 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45128 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 44477 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 44845 | Transfer out to: | 26G | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 45225 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 42769 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45062 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45335 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 42769 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 45238 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 58192 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 42769 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 45128 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 42797 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 09/05/1951 | 43114 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 19/05/1951 | 43115 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 40729 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 07/1951 | 41781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 41661 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 41661 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 41661 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 42904 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 40411 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 45272 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1951 | 45272 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 40411 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 42904 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 40411 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 48765 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48765 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48765 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 41661 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 58175 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 58175 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 47238 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44020 | Transfer in from: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 42769 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 43605 | Transfer out to: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 43038 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45062 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45238 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45335 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48447 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48452 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45062 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45238 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45335 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 48219 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 44004 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 41660 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48447 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48452 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48447 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 48452 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 43225 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 43800 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 44004 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 44211 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 41190 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 41191 | Transfer in from: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 43225 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 43800 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 43225 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 43800 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2781 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 05/07/1952 | 40728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 41190 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 41191 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 43341 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 43856 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44171 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 44174 | Transfer in from: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 48216 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 48284 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 43882 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44457 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 43225 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 43463 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 43856 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 44287 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43882 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44287 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44457 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 47228 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43882 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44287 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44457 | Transfer out to: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 42904 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 47238 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 44275 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 44171 | Transfer out to: | 20D | Normanton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48314 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 42904 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44855 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 48144 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 48216 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 43241 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 43636 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44275 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1953 | 43662 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 43252 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 48216 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 45059 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 40411 | Transfer out to: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 44020 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1953 | 43604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 43332 | Transfer in from: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 43388 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 44550 | Transfer out to: | 20C | Royston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 45238 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 43012 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 45056 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 45407 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 1357 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 58244 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 44284 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 44285 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 78025 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 1357 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 58244 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 48447 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 45238 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 45447 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 44334 | Transfer out to: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 44556 | Transfer out to: | 17D | Rowsley | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 42797 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 45335 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 43781 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 47636 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1954 | 43683 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1954 | 43661 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 42794 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 43254 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 45059 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 78025 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 44265 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 44843 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45238 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45262 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 43243 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 48144 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 47563 | Transfer out to: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1955 | 13251 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/1955 | 13252 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/1955 | 13253 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/1955 | 13254 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1955 | 43252 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 43637 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1955 | 43755 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1955 | 43775 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1955 | 43781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 43181 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 43325 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 43669 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 48452 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 48144 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 58175 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 48452 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 43325 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1956 | 43334 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 44039 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 43114 | Transfer out to: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 45447 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 09/06/1956 | 43607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 41795 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 47236 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 43745 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 44547 | Transfer in from: | 20F | Skipton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 44855 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1956 | 13288 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1956 | 13289 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/12/1956 | 13291 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/12/1956 | 13292 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1956 | 13293 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 13086 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 13289 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 13291 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 13292 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 13293 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1957 | 43595 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44087 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1957 | 43181 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 48452 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 47228 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 43872 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44944 | Transfer out to: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 47432 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 47235 | Transfer out to: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1957 | 43341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44535 | Transfer in from: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 43012 | Transfer out to: | 15B | Kettering | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45062 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 48116 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48178 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 43115 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 43174 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 43203 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 43307 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 43361 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 43395 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 43406 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 43431 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Mansfield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 43222 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 92189 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 43361 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 43395 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 73000 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 73043 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 92189 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1958 | 43332 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 44802 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 44858 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 43634 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Mansfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | D3129 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | D3662 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 13289 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 13293 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D3574 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D3575 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1958 | 43745 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 44036 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48178 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 30/11/1958 | 43751 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1958 | 58192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 58165 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 73074 | Transfer in from: | 19B | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 73156 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | 1142 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 58165 | Transfer out to: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 05/1959 | 41795 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1121 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/05/1959 | 41857 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48037 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48178 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 27/06/1959 | 43222 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/07/1959 | 43731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 48037 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1959 | 43335 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 43234 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 43361 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 43395 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1959 | 43388 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 43159 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 13127 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 43111 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1959 | 13127 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 43146 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44097 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 44518 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 47625 | Transfer in from: | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 20/02/1960 | 43174 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 20/02/1960 | 43406 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 20/02/1960 | 43431 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 48216 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 08/03/1960 | 43749 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 09/03/1960 | 47636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 41835 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 68497 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 68569 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 68569 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90418 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 43882 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 44036 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/06/1960 | D4029 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | D4028 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1960 | D4030 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | D4030 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1960 | 43243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1960 | 43307 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 73156 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/09/1960 | 68497 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/1960 | 43203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1377 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 41835 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1960 | 43361 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1960 | D4035 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1960 | D4036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/10/1960 | D4037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1960 | 43634 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1960 | D4038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/11/1960 | D4039 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1960 | D4040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1960 | D4041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1960 | D4042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1960 | D4043 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/12/1960 | D4044 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/12/1960 | D4046 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/12/1960 | D4047 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1960 | D4048 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 43234 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 48178 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 73000 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 43160 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 04/02/1961 | 43800 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 15/02/1961 | 43715 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 43089 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 43161 | Transfer in from: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 43844 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 44518 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 44535 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 44573 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1961 | 43395 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 48144 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 48189 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 13336 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | D3698 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | D3727 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 42904 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 44039 | Transfer out to: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 44087 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 44097 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 44457 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 73043 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 73074 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 43111 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 43159 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 48642 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 90418 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 09/05/1961 | 47513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 09/05/1961 | 47625 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 48179 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 48216 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 48765 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 07/07/1961 | 44477 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 43089 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 43146 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 42794 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 42797 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1961 | 43751 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1961 | 43872 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1961 | 44547 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 09/1961 | 47624 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 13251 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 13288 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 13289 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 13293 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 13336 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3086 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3129 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3252 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3253 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3254 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3574 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3575 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3662 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3698 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3727 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4028 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4029 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4035 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4036 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4037 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4038 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4039 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4040 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4041 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4042 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4043 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4044 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4046 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4047 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D4048 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43160 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43161 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43254 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43637 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 43669 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44174 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44212 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44265 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44287 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44426 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44437 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44568 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow |