Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
05/06/1934 |
5032 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
22/06/1934 |
4000 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
10/07/1935 |
4078 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/11/1935 |
4078 |
Transfer out to: |
LDR |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
25645 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
5125 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
4375 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
58xx |
0-4-2T |
4w/e |
16/11/1935 |
5813 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Prince of Wales |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1935 |
25645 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
517 |
0-4-2T |
4w/e |
14/12/1935 |
1442 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2021 |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
14/12/1935 |
2096 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/01/1936 |
4355 |
Transfer in from: |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
264 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
16027 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
2404 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/03/1936 |
6348 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
264 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
16027 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
264 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
16027 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
06/06/1936 |
5053 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
11/05/1937 |
4000 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
11/06/1937 |
5061 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1937 |
5064 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
25/10/1937 |
5053 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1937 |
5293 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1938 |
5086 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1938 |
4000 |
Transfer in from: |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1938 |
4355 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
04/06/1938 |
2948 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/08/1938 |
2948 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1938 |
5061 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1938 |
2963 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1938 |
2983 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1938 |
2961 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1938 |
5061 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1938 |
2961 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1938 |
2963 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
6P5F |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/11/1938 |
2983 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
11/12/1938 |
5015 |
Transfer in from: |
LA |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
17/12/1938 |
5021 |
Transfer in from: |
LA |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1939 |
5073 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/03/1939 |
5088 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
04/05/1939 |
4000 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
17/07/1939 |
5097 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
29/11/1939 |
5086 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
17/06/1940 |
4076 |
Transfer in from: |
NA |
Newton Abbot |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
28/06/1940 |
5015 |
Transfer out to: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
25/11/1940 |
5021 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/02/1941 |
5097 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
03/1941 |
5097 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
05/04/1941 |
5021 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
08/03/1942 |
5088 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/05/1942 |
5021 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
23/05/1942 |
5015 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
24/07/1942 |
4076 |
Transfer out to: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
03/08/1942 |
5086 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/04/1943 |
5061 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
22/04/1943 |
5061 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
08/09/1945 |
5021 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/10/1945 |
5015 |
Transfer out to: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
58xx |
0-4-2T |
8w/e |
23/03/1946 |
5813 |
Transfer out to: |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
28/06/1946 |
7006 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1946 |
4040 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2021 |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2096 |
Snapshot |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2228 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2229 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2233 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2234 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2235 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2721 |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2744 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2721 |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2745 |
Snapshot |
BHD |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
2897 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Bulldog |
4-4-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3377 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Bird |
4-4-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3442 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3602 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3702 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3782 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
3788 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4040 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4040 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4044 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4046 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4061 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4375 |
Snapshot |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4602 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4623 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4672 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
47xx |
2-8-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4704 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
4919 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5021 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5021 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5032 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5032 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5061 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5061 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5064 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5064 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5073 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5073 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5086 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5086 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5097 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5097 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5154 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5168 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5642 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5673 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5774 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5981 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
5994 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
6307 |
Snapshot |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
6338 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
6348 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
6348 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
on |
15/06/1947 |
6633 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
6963 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
7006 |
Snapshot |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
7006 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
7319 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Earl/Dukedog |
4-4-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9024 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Duke |
4-4-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9073 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Duke |
4-4-0 |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9076 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9657 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
15/06/1947 |
9719 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12105 |
Snapshot |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12119 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12233 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12414 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12428 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12429 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
27 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12525 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
264 |
0-4-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16027 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
264 |
0-4-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
16027 |
Snapshot |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1725 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2404 |
Snapshot |
11E |
Tebay |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3394 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3573 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3581 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3600 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3618 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
3679 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
48 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5125 |
Snapshot |
29A |
Perth South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5180 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5190 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
52103 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
52374 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5245 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
52457 |
Snapshot |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5281 |
Snapshot |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5283 |
Snapshot |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5292 |
Snapshot |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5293 |
Snapshot |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5318 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5330 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5384 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5406 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5445 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
5492 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
58 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6601 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7181 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8165 |
Snapshot |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8307 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8308 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8327 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8328 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8347 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8369 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8373 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8375 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8454 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8474 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8556 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8613 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8631 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8674 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8688 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8689 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8736 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8743 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8895 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8945 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9028 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9046 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9138 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9445 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
3570 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
5112 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1948 |
5292 |
Transfer out to: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
12269 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
George V |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
25400 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
5298 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
5492 |
Transfer out to: |
28B |
Dalry Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1948 |
8631 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
58930 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
9046 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1948 |
9046 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
55 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
58886 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
20/03/1948 |
58930 |
Transfer out to: |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
3237 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
58334 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
58338 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
12119 |
Transfer out to: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
12233 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
12269 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1948 |
8454 |
Transfer out to: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
3757 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1948 |
3760 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
7794 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
30/04/1948 |
2886 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
30/04/1948 |
9656 |
Transfer in from: |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
30/04/1948 |
5774 |
Transfer out to: |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
28543 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
08/05/1948 |
52457 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
7006 |
Transfer out to: |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
898 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
12551 |
Transfer in from: |
12E |
Moor Row |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
4835 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
6601 |
Transfer out to: |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
29/06/1948 |
5021 |
Transfer out to: |
LA |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
Bird |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
07/1948 |
3442 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
28093 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/07/1948 |
2878 |
Transfer in from: |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/07/1948 |
3852 |
Transfer in from: |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
10/07/1948 |
7794 |
Transfer out to: |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
5143 |
Transfer in from: |
5C |
Stafford |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
5145 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
5183 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
17/07/1948 |
58896 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/08/1948 |
5050 |
Transfer in from: |
LA |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
8689 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
8689 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Earl/Dukedog |
4-4-0 |
on |
10/08/1948 |
9024 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
28543 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
5050 |
Transfer in from: |
SALOP |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
5050 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/09/1948 |
2897 |
Transfer out to: |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/09/1948 |
52374 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
48901 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
8934 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
8895 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
28345 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/10/1948 |
2886 |
Transfer out to: |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/10/1948 |
4044 |
Transfer out to: |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
45422 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
45436 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/11/1948 |
4044 |
Transfer in from: |
BRD |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
49276 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
2721 |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
27/11/1948 |
2745 |
Transfer out to: |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
43237 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
9445 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
49276 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/12/1948 |
58342 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
9353 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
3618 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
49276 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
8743 |
Transfer out to: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
2323 |
Transfer in from: |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
9353 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
9353 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
58333 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
8684 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
58342 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
9353 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
01/1949 |
58886 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
01/1949 |
58896 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
7720 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
47183 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
7181 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
44908 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
48165 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
49028 |
Transfer out to: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
58368 |
Transfer out to: |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
58881 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
5445 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
12429 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
05/1949 |
52103 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
49046 |
Transfer out to: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
12105 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
48207 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
5w/e |
16/07/1949 |
48736 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
48207 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
48207 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
46727 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
58334 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Duke |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
9076 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Duke |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
05/11/1949 |
9073 |
Transfer out to: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
58213 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
46727 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Bulldog |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
03/12/1949 |
3377 |
Transfer out to: |
WOS |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
14/01/1950 |
42323 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1950 |
2841 |
Transfer in from: |
SDN |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
40055 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1950 |
58330 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
44352 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1950 |
4904 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
48934 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/03/1950 |
5061 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/03/1950 |
4052 |
Transfer in from: |
WOS |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
58900 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
58338 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/06/1950 |
58327 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
49448 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
77064 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
48375 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
49448 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1950 |
49448 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
58900 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/07/1950 |
4083 |
Reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
15/07/1950 |
77079 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
15/07/1950 |
77097 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
15/07/1950 |
2878 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/07/1950 |
48684 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/08/1950 |
48556 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/08/1950 |
48674 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/08/1950 |
7035 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/08/1950 |
77012 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/08/1950 |
77015 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/08/1950 |
78521 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
12/08/1950 |
3852 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/08/1950 |
48613 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
48207 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/08/1950 |
48689 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/08/1950 |
48327 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/08/1950 |
77012 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/08/1950 |
77015 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/08/1950 |
78521 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/08/1950 |
77012 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/08/1950 |
77015 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/08/1950 |
78521 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
7035 |
1st Allocation |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1950 |
7035 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
09/1950 |
58881 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
4083 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
70843 |
Transfer in from: |
DID |
Didcot |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
77026 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
78542 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
90589 |
Transfer in from: |
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
90715 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
4083 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1950 |
48373 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1950 |
48688 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/09/1950 |
5086 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
58926 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
70843 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
77026 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
78542 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
90589 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
90715 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
70843 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
77026 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
78542 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
90589 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1950 |
90715 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
05/10/1950 |
5064 |
Transfer out to: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
2721 |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
11/1950 |
2744 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
1024 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
1025 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
4061 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
264 |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
56027 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/11/1950 |
4083 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
1024 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
1025 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
48172 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
48309 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
48344 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
48354 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
48438 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
48660 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
48730 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
48732 |
Transfer in from: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
1024 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1950 |
1025 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
7810 |
Transfer in from: |
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
4919 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
5994 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
77015 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
77064 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
48110 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
48468 |
Transfer in from: |
26C |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
48760 |
Transfer in from: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
7810 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
48730 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
48732 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
70843 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
77026 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
77079 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
7810 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
78521 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
78542 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
90561 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
90589 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
90715 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/01/1951 |
48707 |
Transfer in from: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
77012 |
Transfer out to: |
26C |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
2206 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
1024 |
Transfer out to: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
28/02/1951 |
48707 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/03/1951 |
2206 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/03/1951 |
2206 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1951 |
1003 |
Transfer in from: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
19/05/1951 |
1003 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
3w/e |
19/05/1951 |
6624 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
19/05/1951 |
1003 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1951 |
4040 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1951 |
6338 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1951 |
49448 |
Transfer out to: |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
31/07/1951 |
47180 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
2823 |
Transfer in from: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
75000 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
75001 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
75002 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
75003 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
45180 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
45245 |
Transfer out to: |
61B |
Aberdeen Ferryhill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
45318 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
45330 |
Transfer out to: |
62C |
Dunfermline Upper |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
09/09/1951 |
45436 |
Transfer out to: |
64A |
St Margarets |
|
|
Steam |
47xx |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
4704 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1951 |
52428 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
w/e |
29/09/1951 |
47183 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1951 |
2823 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1951 |
75000 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1951 |
2823 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/09/1951 |
75000 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
45183 |
Transfer out to: |
64C |
Dalry Road |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
45384 |
Transfer out to: |
62B |
Dundee Tay Bridge |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/10/1951 |
75004 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/10/1951 |
75007 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
31/10/1951 |
75008 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
5032 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1951 |
4046 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
47180 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
03/11/1951 |
75009 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
w/e |
03/11/1951 |
47180 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
1004 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
1013 |
Transfer in from: |
83G |
Penzance |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
1017 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
1018 |
Transfer in from: |
83G |
Penzance |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
1019 |
Transfer in from: |
83G |
Penzance |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
45112 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
45281 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
6963 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/12/1951 |
52414 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
2203 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
3782 |
Transfer out to: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1004 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1013 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1017 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1018 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1019 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
48707 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
48739 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
48893 |
Transfer in from: |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
49260 |
Transfer in from: |
4B |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1004 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1013 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1017 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1018 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
1019 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1951 |
2203 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
01/1952 |
58333 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/01/1952 |
58322 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
26/01/1952 |
3782 |
Transfer in from: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/01/1952 |
2203 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
31/01/1952 |
3782 |
Transfer out to: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
3203 |
Transfer in from: |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/02/1952 |
49117 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
29/02/1952 |
3782 |
Transfer in from: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/02/1952 |
49117 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/02/1952 |
58334 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/02/1952 |
58346 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/02/1952 |
2203 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/02/1952 |
49117 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
03/1952 |
58346 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
5634 |
Transfer in from: |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
58360 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
75006 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
9116 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
22/03/1952 |
9740 |
Transfer in from: |
LMTN |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/03/1952 |
3203 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/03/1952 |
58334 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/03/1952 |
58360 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/03/1952 |
3203 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/03/1952 |
58334 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/03/1952 |
58360 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1952 |
58360 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
19/04/1952 |
44908 |
Transfer out to: |
65A |
Eastfield |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/04/1952 |
49117 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/04/1952 |
5634 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/04/1952 |
75006 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/04/1952 |
9740 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/04/1952 |
49117 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/04/1952 |
5634 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/04/1952 |
75006 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/04/1952 |
9740 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43277 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43491 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43621 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
43822 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bournville |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
49157 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
58203 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
58207 |
Transfer in from: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
58241 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/05/1952 |
58258 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/05/1952 |
48901 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1952 |
58327 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
5300 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1952 |
49157 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
27 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
52525 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
898 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
52551 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
58330 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Engines |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
58334 |
Transfer out to: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
5300 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
58203 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
58207 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
58241 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
58258 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
43277 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
43491 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
43621 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
43822 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
5300 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
58203 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
58207 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
58241 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
30/06/1952 |
58258 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
2w/e |
12/07/1952 |
2233 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
2w/e |
12/07/1952 |
5673 |
Transfer out to: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
2822 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
5967 |
Transfer in from: |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
6929 |
Transfer in from: |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1952 |
3203 |
Transfer out to: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
7w/e |
31/08/1952 |
2822 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
31/08/1952 |
5967 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
31/08/1952 |
6929 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
7w/e |
31/08/1952 |
2822 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
31/08/1952 |
5967 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
31/08/1952 |
6929 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
06/09/1952 |
4602 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
06/09/1952 |
6624 |
Transfer out to: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
06/09/1952 |
9719 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
2233 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
3203 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
2823 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1952 |
5300 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
3820 |
Transfer in from: |
BAN |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
7828 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
7829 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
2228 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
3203 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
5642 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
6307 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
6348 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1952 |
7319 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
1016 |
Transfer in from: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
2832 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
48738 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
8w/e |
29/11/1952 |
40048 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
49117 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
5967 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1952 |
6929 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
48738 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3100/5100 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
5112 |
Transfer in from: |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
6683 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
6698 |
Transfer in from: |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
2233 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
48738 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1952 |
49116 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
6956 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
7811 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
1018 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/01/1953 |
1019 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1953 |
4044 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
90069 |
Transfer in from: |
40B |
Immingham |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
90563 |
Transfer in from: |
PPRD |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
1004 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
3100/5100 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
5112 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
90323 |
Transfer in from: |
86J |
Aberdare |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
90716 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
2822 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
2841 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
48893 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
7829 |
Transfer out to: |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
2841 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
3865 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1953 |
90701 |
Transfer in from: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
05/1953 |
5091 |
Transfer in from: |
SDN |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
2232 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
3861 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
6683 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
6698 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/05/1953 |
90323 |
Transfer out to: |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Star |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1953 |
4052 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
4105 |
Transfer in from: |
81F |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
47183 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
48893 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
58194 |
Transfer in from: |
15B |
Kettering |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/08/1953 |
90527 |
Transfer in from: |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
31/08/1953 |
47180 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1953 |
7035 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
5962 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
90466 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1953 |
2229 |
Transfer out to: |
83B |
Taunton |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
2244 |
Transfer in from: |
OSY |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73012 |
Transfer in from: |
20A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73013 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73014 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73015 |
Transfer in from: |
19B |
Sheffield Millhouses |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73017 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73018 |
Transfer in from: |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73025 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73026 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73033 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73034 |
Transfer in from: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73035 |
Transfer in from: |
66A |
Polmadie |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73036 |
Transfer in from: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
73037 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
90010 |
Transfer in from: |
40B |
Immingham |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
90483 |
Transfer in from: |
40B |
Immingham |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
75001 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
75002 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
75004 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
75006 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
75007 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
75009 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
90466 |
Transfer out to: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
90527 |
Transfer out to: |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1953 |
90563 |
Transfer out to: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43277 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43491 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43621 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
43822 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
90261 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
90356 |
Transfer in from: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1953 |
75008 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/11/1953 |
5328 |
Transfer in from: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/11/1953 |
6339 |
Transfer in from: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/11/1953 |
7821 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/11/1953 |
3865 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1953 |
58258 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
2841 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
3861 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
75000 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
75003 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/12/1953 |
7821 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
5312 |
Transfer in from: |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
58162 |
Transfer in from: |
20C |
Royston |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
3820 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
5962 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/01/1954 |
7810 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
03/02/1954 |
5091 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
7797 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/02/1954 |
5634 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
6317 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
7309 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
90466 |
Transfer in from: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
6956 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/03/1954 |
90010 |
Transfer out to: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1954 |
5091 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
2822 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
90563 |
Transfer in from: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
5312 |
Transfer out to: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/04/1954 |
90483 |
Transfer out to: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/05/1954 |
58926 |
Transfer out to: |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
58900 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/06/1954 |
6338 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
73025 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/07/1954 |
73026 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/08/1954 |
2235 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Brecon |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
10/1954 |
58900 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
2826 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Grange |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
6858 |
Transfer in from: |
TYS |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
73020 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
73024 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
2822 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
4904 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
6338 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
6339 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
7797 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/10/1954 |
48893 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
4915 |
Transfer in from: |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
4937 |
Transfer in from: |
CARM |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
5331 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
5690 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
5986 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
6944 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
90069 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
90563 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
49243 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
04/12/1954 |
49345 |
Transfer in from: |
4D |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/03/1955 |
13111 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
26/03/1955 |
49028 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
26/03/1955 |
49051 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
26/03/1955 |
5319 |
Transfer in from: |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
26/03/1955 |
2826 |
Transfer out to: |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
26/03/1955 |
2832 |
Transfer out to: |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
8w/e |
26/03/1955 |
48660 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
26/03/1955 |
6633 |
Transfer out to: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
19/04/1955 |
13114 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
23/04/1955 |
90716 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
25/04/1955 |
13115 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/04/1955 |
13116 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/05/1955 |
43600 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
13112 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
13113 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
7912 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
7913 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
82030 |
Transfer in from: |
88C |
Barry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
82031 |
Transfer in from: |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
4915 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
18/06/1955 |
5634 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
1357 |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
30/06/1955 |
58241 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
09/07/1955 |
43581 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
4915 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
6980 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
7908 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
13112 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
13113 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
13115 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
4937 |
Transfer out to: |
87E |
Landore |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
5319 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
58203 |
Transfer out to: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
5986 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Grange |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
6858 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
73013 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
7912 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
7913 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1955 |
90466 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
1377 |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
08/1955 |
41725 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
2206 |
Transfer out to: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1955 |
73014 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1955 |
5091 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
09/1955 |
47183 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
47181 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
48402 |
Transfer in from: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
48660 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
48724 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
6942 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
10/09/1955 |
48309 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
30/09/1955 |
58207 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
30/09/1955 |
58904 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
on |
06/10/1955 |
58162 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
1026 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
58926 |
Transfer in from: |
86K |
Abergavenny |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
5986 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
7824 |
Transfer in from: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
82038 |
Transfer in from: |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1955 |
7908 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
90176 |
Transfer in from: |
SPM |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/11/1955 |
3702 |
Transfer out to: |
83F |
Truro |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/11/1955 |
13192 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/11/1955 |
13193 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
24/11/1955 |
13194 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
82000 |
Transfer in from: |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
82007 |
Transfer in from: |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
4105 |
Transfer out to: |
88A |
Cardiff Cathays |
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
5154 |
Transfer out to: |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
5168 |
Transfer out to: |
88F |
Treherbert |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/12/1955 |
82038 |
Transfer out to: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
13192 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1955 |
82030 |
Transfer out to: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
28/01/1956 |
6620 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1956 |
58194 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
5347 |
Transfer in from: |
GLO |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
5379 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
6378 |
Transfer in from: |
WOS |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
9318 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
9740 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
03/03/1956 |
49028 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
2854 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
73001 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
9740 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
2232 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
2244 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
73015 |
Transfer out to: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
49424 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
5968 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
9470 |
Transfer in from: |
88B |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1956 |
2854 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1956 |
5004 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
5379 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
6378 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
6620 |
Transfer out to: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
73017 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
9318 |
Transfer out to: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
9740 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
73017 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
90010 |
Transfer in from: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
73024 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1956 |
90261 |
Transfer out to: |
84D |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
5362 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
Y3 |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
68164 |
Transfer in from: |
WRX |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
9308 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
73033 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
73034 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
73035 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
73036 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
73037 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
30/11/1956 |
47181 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
73001 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
73012 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
73017 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
73018 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1956 |
73020 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
5981 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
6942 |
Transfer out to: |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/12/1956 |
7824 |
Transfer out to: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
9472 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
4672 |
Transfer out to: |
88E |
Abercynon |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1957 |
49051 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
8w/e |
20/04/1957 |
6681 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
20/04/1957 |
6928 |
Transfer in from: |
CDF |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
15/06/1957 |
49082 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
1142 |
Transfer in from: |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
4904 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
5355 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
5791 |
Transfer in from: |
CHR |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
6357 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
6395 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
6964 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
90148 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
6928 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
9401 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
5986 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Y3 |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
07/09/1957 |
68164 |
Transfer out to: |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/09/1957 |
5004 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/10/1957 |
5355 |
Transfer out to: |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
48444 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
4913 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
90176 |
Transfer in from: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
48344 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
90176 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
02/11/1957 |
9401 |
Transfer out to: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
16/11/1957 |
49082 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
9498 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
4913 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
5958 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
73036 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
73037 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
8449 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
48308 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
48444 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
48760 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
5328 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
6357 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
90010 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
90176 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
90356 |
Transfer out to: |
81C |
Southall |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
90701 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1958 |
49345 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/02/1958 |
43491 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
6357 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
75024 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/03/1958 |
5038 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
20/03/1958 |
5073 |
Transfer out to: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
2274 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
48921 |
Transfer in from: |
4E |
Tredegar |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
4968 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
6998 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
49424 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
90148 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1958 |
5347 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
6317 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
30/04/1958 |
48921 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
30/04/1958 |
49260 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
6357 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
12/06/1958 |
5095 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
12/06/1958 |
82007 |
Transfer out to: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
1022 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
5977 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
5998 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
6916 |
Transfer in from: |
HFD |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
73034 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
73035 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
48402 |
Transfer out to: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
21/06/1958 |
43757 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
24/06/1958 |
5095 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1958 |
5362 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
5319 |
Transfer in from: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
43394 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
73090 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
73091 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
73092 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
73093 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
73094 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
73095 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
73096 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
73097 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
7921 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
7922 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
40058 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
26/09/1958 |
5001 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
7817 |
Transfer in from: |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
2234 |
Transfer out to: |
84C |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
40005 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
43760 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
31/10/1958 |
58926 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
2210 |
Transfer in from: |
OSY |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
2289 |
Transfer in from: |
81F |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
3400 |
Transfer in from: |
88A |
Radyr |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
5651 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
6303 |
Transfer in from: |
CNYD |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
4915 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
5958 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
5977 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
6681 |
Transfer out to: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/11/1958 |
7817 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
48460 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
4912 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
6926 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
6956 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
29/11/1958 |
40008 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
12/1958 |
49276 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/12/1958 |
44352 |
Transfer out to: |
5E |
Alsager |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
5651 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/12/1958 |
75024 |
Transfer out to: |
81F |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
3769 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
4693 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
7336 |
Transfer in from: |
OXY |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
82000 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
24/01/1959 |
82031 |
Transfer out to: |
84K |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
42320 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
42362 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
42372 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
42395 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
42418 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
42420 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
45281 |
Transfer in from: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/02/1959 |
6698 |
Transfer in from: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
43570 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
43621 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
43679 |
Transfer out to: |
17B |
Burton |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/02/1959 |
58213 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/02/1959 |
43277 |
Transfer out to: |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/02/1959 |
43822 |
Transfer out to: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
4212 |
Transfer in from: |
DYD |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
4918 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1959 |
2274 |
Transfer out to: |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
31/03/1959 |
48945 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1959 |
6303 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
73025 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
73026 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Chester West |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
5324 |
Transfer in from: |
81D |
Reading (W.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
48347 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
48438 |
Transfer out to: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
4912 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/04/1959 |
6980 |
Transfer out to: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1959 |
49243 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
42xx |
2-8-0T |
m/e |
06/1959 |
4212 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
02/06/1959 |
5097 |
Transfer out to: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
82004 |
Transfer in from: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
82009 |
Transfer in from: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
13116 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
4918 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/06/1959 |
6926 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/06/1959 |
4081 |
Transfer in from: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
3207 |
Transfer in from: |
84K |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
48347 |
Transfer in from: |
87K |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
4904 |
Transfer out to: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/07/1959 |
7921 |
Transfer out to: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/07/1959 |
4081 |
Transfer out to: |
82A |
Bristol Bath Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/08/1959 |
5971 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
08/08/1959 |
9463 |
Transfer in from: |
81B |
Slough |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/08/1959 |
1022 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
42320 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
42362 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
42372 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
42395 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
42418 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
42420 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
45281 |
Transfer out to: |
91W |
To Western Region / GWR |
|
|
Steam |
4575 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
5564 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
48707 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
82004 |
Transfer out to: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
05/09/1959 |
82009 |
Transfer out to: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
3836 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
5167 |
Transfer in from: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
48328 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
03/10/1959 |
48460 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
1022 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
48737 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
48768 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5110 |
Transfer in from: |
KDR |
Kidderminster |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
2289 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
4968 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
31/10/1959 |
5791 |
Transfer out to: |
85D |
Kidderminster |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
m/e |
11/1959 |
1142 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1959 |
5319 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
04/11/1959 |
7015 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
2210 |
Transfer out to: |
81D |
Reading (W.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
28/11/1959 |
5110 |
Transfer out to: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
1143 |
Transfer in from: |
DG |
Danygraig |
|
|
Steam |
45xx |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
4564 |
Transfer in from: |
83G |
Penzance |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
4644 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
5942 |
Transfer in from: |
81F |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/12/1959 |
6922 |
Transfer in from: |
81F |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
82020 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
82021 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
4644 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
5101 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
5167 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
4575 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
30/01/1960 |
5564 |
Transfer out to: |
83E |
St Blazey |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
10/02/1960 |
5070 |
Transfer in from: |
SRD |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
40110 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/02/1960 |
6904 |
Transfer in from: |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
40126 |
Transfer in from: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
40205 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
41240 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
4957 |
Transfer in from: |
83B |
Taunton |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
6949 |
Transfer in from: |
83B |
Taunton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
82020 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/03/1960 |
82021 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
22/04/1960 |
4080 |
Transfer in from: |
83A |
Newton Abbot |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/04/1960 |
4946 |
Transfer in from: |
83B |
Taunton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/04/1960 |
73021 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/04/1960 |
73024 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/04/1960 |
73049 |
Transfer in from: |
71G |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
23/04/1960 |
41240 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
17/05/1960 |
5059 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
2214 |
Transfer in from: |
81E |
Didcot |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
2222 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
2276 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Grange |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
6858 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
4957 |
Transfer out to: |
82D |
Westbury |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
5634 |
Transfer out to: |
88C |
Barry |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
5690 |
Transfer out to: |
86F |
Tondu |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/05/1960 |
73021 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
2222 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
3207 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
6395 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
56xx |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
18/06/1960 |
6698 |
Transfer out to: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1960 |
D3748 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
16/07/1960 |
40126 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1960 |
48172 |
Transfer out to: |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
Grange |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1960 |
6858 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
16/07/1960 |
9470 |
Transfer out to: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
02/08/1960 |
7025 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
02/08/1960 |
4080 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
02/08/1960 |
5001 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/08/1960 |
3205 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1960 |
5324 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
08/09/1960 |
5095 |
Transfer in from: |
86C |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/09/1960 |
2214 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/09/1960 |
5050 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1960 |
D3970 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1960 |
6904 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/10/1960 |
6944 |
Transfer out to: |
88A |
Cardiff Canton |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
05/11/1960 |
40086 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/11/1960 |
6374 |
Transfer in from: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
74xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/11/1960 |
7431 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
05/11/1960 |
9741 |
Transfer in from: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/11/1960 |
D3114 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
on |
10/11/1960 |
5331 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Unclassified |
0-4-0ST |
on |
16/11/1960 |
1143 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/12/1960 |
6342 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
03/12/1960 |
9741 |
Transfer out to: |
84H |
Wellington |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1960 |
2214 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1960 |
48418 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
31/12/1960 |
1017 |
Transfer out to: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1961 |
1017 |
Transfer in from: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1961 |
1003 |
Transfer out to: |
83D |
Laira |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/01/1961 |
6998 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1961 |
6915 |
Transfer in from: |
81E |
Didcot |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1961 |
6956 |
Transfer out to: |
81F |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
74xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
25/02/1961 |
7431 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/04/1961 |
5991 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/04/1961 |
6934 |
Transfer in from: |
84A |
Stafford Road |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/04/1961 |
3205 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82005 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
82032 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40086 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40110 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
on |
23/04/1961 |
40205 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
05/1961 |
6949 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
20/05/1961 |
7828 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
3205 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
6380 |
Transfer in from: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1961 |
2276 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
4575 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
15/07/1961 |
5538 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
4575 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
15/07/1961 |
5555 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
15/07/1961 |
82005 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/08/1961 |
3204 |
Transfer in from: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
12/08/1961 |
82032 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1961 |
D3748 |
Transfer out to: |
86A |
Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
|
|
Steam |
4575 |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
10/1961 |
5538 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
45572 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
45577 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
45651 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
45660 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
45662 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
45699 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
7300 |
Transfer in from: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
7314 |
Transfer in from: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
4575 |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
5555 |
Transfer out to: |
83C |
Exeter |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
73091 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
73092 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
73093 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
73094 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1961 |
7811 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
04/11/1961 |
82002 |
Transfer in from: |
82G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1961 |
5968 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
02/12/1961 |
82032 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
02/12/1961 |
82036 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/12/1961 |
48436 |
Transfer in from: |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/12/1961 |
48471 |
Transfer in from: |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/12/1961 |
48307 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/12/1961 |
48347 |
Transfer out to: |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/12/1961 |
48737 |
Transfer out to: |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
27/01/1962 |
4693 |
Transfer out to: |
86F |
Aberbeeg |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1962 |
48468 |
Transfer out to: |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
02/1962 |
3602 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1962 |
48404 |
Transfer in from: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
24/02/1962 |
48660 |
Transfer out to: |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
24/03/1962 |
4617 |
Transfer in from: |
84J |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/04/1962 |
41202 |
Transfer in from: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
21/04/1962 |
41203 |
Transfer in from: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/04/1962 |
73037 |
Transfer out to: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
19/05/1962 |
1632 |
Transfer in from: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
19/05/1962 |
3400 |
Transfer out to: |
88B |
Radyr |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
19/05/1962 |
5038 |
Transfer out to: |
81F |
Oxford |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1962 |
48474 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/06/1962 |
73049 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
22/06/1962 |
5059 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
14/07/1962 |
4090 |
Reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1962 |
4924 |
Transfer in from: |
83C |
Exeter |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1962 |
4944 |
Transfer in from: |
83C |
Exeter |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
14/07/1962 |
1632 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1962 |
73024 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/07/1962 |
73096 |
Transfer out to: |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
14/07/1962 |
82036 |
Transfer out to: |
82B |
St Philips Marsh |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80078 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80096 |
Transfer in from: |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80100 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80101 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80135 |
Transfer in from: |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
15/07/1962 |
80136 |
Transfer in from: |
33B |
Tilbury |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
08/1962 |
6374 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1962 |
4944 |
Transfer out to: |
81C |
Southall |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
16/08/1962 |
5095 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
1026 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
6342 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
7300 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
7309 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
7330 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1962 |
7336 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
09/1962 |
8449 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/09/1962 |
4090 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/09/1962 |
5070 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
07/09/1962 |
7015 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
80098 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
80105 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
80131 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
48724 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
7314 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
7922 |
Transfer out to: |
84F |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
08/09/1962 |
80101 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
49138 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
on |
05/10/1962 |
1022 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
1019 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
1023 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
41240 |
Transfer in from: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Castle |
4-6-0 |
on |
06/10/1962 |
7025 |
Transfer out to: |
85A |
Worcester |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
80105 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
06/10/1962 |
82002 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
30/10/1962 |
3769 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
1002 |
Transfer in from: |
81E |
Didcot |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
5962 |
Transfer in from: |
88L |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
6375 |
Transfer in from: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
7314 |
Transfer in from: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
03/11/1962 |
4924 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
3709 |
Transfer in from: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
5962 |
Transfer out to: |
88L |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
80096 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
2w/e |
17/11/1962 |
80098 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
23/11/1962 |
45651 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
23/11/1962 |
45662 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
41209 |
Transfer in from: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
5994 |
Transfer in from: |
83C |
Exeter |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
80070 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
80102 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
80132 |
Transfer in from: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
48110 |
Transfer out to: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
5971 |
Transfer out to: |
81C |
Southall |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
9472 |
Transfer out to: |
88C |
Barry |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
15/12/1962 |
9656 |
Transfer out to: |
87B |
Duffryn Yard |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
on |
19/12/1962 |
1017 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/01/1963 |
3204 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/01/1963 |
3205 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
12/01/1963 |
4623 |
Transfer out to: |
86C |
Hereford |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/01/1963 |
48757 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1963 |
7314 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
1008 |
Transfer in from: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
7800 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
7801 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
7809 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
7812 |
Transfer in from: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
7819 |
Transfer in from: |
OSY |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
80131 |
Transfer out to: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
80132 |
Transfer out to: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
80135 |
Transfer out to: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
09/02/1963 |
80136 |
Transfer out to: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/02/1963 |
1019 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
80070 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
80078 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/02/1963 |
1025 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/03/1963 |
1008 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/03/1963 |
1027 |
Transfer in from: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/03/1963 |
1008 |
Transfer out to: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/03/1963 |
1023 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
1014 |
Transfer in from: |
87H |
Neyland |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
46524 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/03/1963 |
46525 |
Transfer in from: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
80070 |
Transfer in from: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
7819 |
Transfer out to: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/03/1963 |
5994 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/03/1963 |
48757 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
18/03/1963 |
73024 |
Transfer in from: |
85C |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
1014 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
6994 |
Transfer in from: |
81C |
Southall |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
73003 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/03/1963 |
1014 |
Transfer out to: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
06/04/1963 |
1663 |
Transfer in from: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/04/1963 |
7809 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
16xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
04/05/1963 |
1663 |
Transfer out to: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
on |
15/05/1963 |
7820 |
Transfer in from: |
88L |
Cardiff East Dock |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1963 |
4946 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
5942 |
Transfer out to: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
29/06/1963 |
6375 |
Transfer out to: |
87G |
Carmarthen |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
14/07/1963 |
3754 |
Transfer in from: |
PDN |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
14/07/1963 |
9641 |
Transfer in from: |
SHL |
Southall |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
14/07/1963 |
9463 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
94xx |
0-6-0PT |
on |
14/07/1963 |
9498 |
Transfer out to: |
81A |
Old Oak Common |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
41207 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
27/07/1963 |
41304 |
Transfer in from: |
82E |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
on |
11/08/1963 |
41207 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
on |
11/08/1963 |
41304 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
on |
11/08/1963 |
41207 |
Transfer out to: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
on |
11/08/1963 |
41304 |
Transfer out to: |
89A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
31/08/1963 |
D3956 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
2251 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
31/08/1963 |
2214 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
on |
08/09/1963 |
1008 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
on |
08/09/1963 |
1013 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
on |
08/09/1963 |
1014 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
on |
08/09/1963 |
1027 |
Transfer out to: |
82C |
Swindon |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
08/09/1963 |
73003 |
Transfer out to: |
83E |
Yeovil Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
09/09/1963 |
73024 |
Transfer out to: |
83E |
Yeovil Town |
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
on |
09/09/1963 |
1002 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
County |
4-6-0 |
on |
09/09/1963 |
1016 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
4933 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/09/1963 |
5942 |
Transfer in from: |
84E |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
45xx |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
28/09/1963 |
4564 |
Transfer out to: |
85B |
Gloucester Horton Road |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
10/1963 |
41203 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
10/1963 |
41240 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
10/1963 |
4617 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
48020 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
05/10/1963 |
48269 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
D3956 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
28xx |
2-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
3836 |
Transfer out to: |
87A |
Neath (Court Sart) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
5998 |
Transfer out to: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
43xx |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1963 |
6380 |
Transfer out to: |
86E |
Severn Tunnel Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1963 |
5942 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/01/1964 |
45572 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
6903 |
Transfer in from: |
86G |
Pontypool Road |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/01/1964 |
6907 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
01/02/1964 |
41202 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/04/1964 |
45272 |
Transfer in from: |
21A |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
73050 |
Transfer in from: |
87F |
Llanelli |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/05/1964 |
73094 |
Reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
41202 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
73045 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
73070 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
41202 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45145 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45272 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
45298 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
48269 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
48768 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
6907 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
6916 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
6994 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
80102 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 3 Tank |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
27/06/1964 |
82032 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1964 |
5991 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
on |
12/07/1964 |
73047 |
Transfer in from: |
71G |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
73053 |
Transfer in from: |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
3782 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
45660 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
6903 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/07/1964 |
6915 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
08/1964 |
4933 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
08/1964 |
7800 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1964 |
73167 |
Transfer in from: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/09/1964 |
45660 |
Transfer in from: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
05/09/1964 |
45577 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
45660 |
Transfer out to: |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
75014 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
75053 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
75055 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
75063 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
80048 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
80102 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
80135 |
Transfer in from: |
89D |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
80136 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
45283 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
45422 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
48020 |
Transfer out to: |
1H |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
48354 |
Transfer out to: |
1H |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
48369 |
Transfer out to: |
1H |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
48738 |
Transfer out to: |
1H |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
48739 |
Transfer out to: |
1H |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
73045 |
Transfer out to: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
75038 |
Transfer in from: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
44835 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
45143 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
45190 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
45406 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/10/1964 |
75055 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
6934 |
Transfer out to: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/10/1964 |
73026 |
Transfer out to: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/10/1964 |
7820 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
3788 |
Transfer out to: |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
6922 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Modified Hall |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
6964 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
9641 |
Transfer out to: |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
6P |
4-6-0 |
on |
21/11/1964 |
45699 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
05/12/1964 |
73047 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1964 |
46525 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
46510 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
46511 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
46512 |
Transfer in from: |
89A |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
48122 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
48345 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Oswestry |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
7802 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
7803 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
7819 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
7822 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
7827 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
7828 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
73025 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/01/1965 |
73090 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/02/1965 |
46512 |
Transfer out to: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1965 |
46524 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
27/02/1965 |
46519 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
73025 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/03/1965 |
73090 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1965 |
7803 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
73000 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
73067 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/04/1965 |
73071 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
80070 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
01/05/1965 |
80102 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
D3111 |
Transfer out to: |
1F |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
75016 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
80072 |
Transfer in from: |
2L |
Leamington |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
46512 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1965 |
7801 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
17/07/1965 |
41209 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
17/07/1965 |
80048 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
73038 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
73035 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
73053 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
73071 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
73094 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
24/07/1965 |
73097 |
Transfer out to: |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
24/07/1965 |
80072 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
24/07/1965 |
80100 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
24/07/1965 |
80135 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
on |
24/07/1965 |
80136 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
41304 |
Transfer out to: |
8K |
Bank Hall |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
48122 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
48345 |
Transfer out to: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
73167 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
41207 |
Transfer out to: |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1965 |
73095 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1965 |
46510 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1965 |
46511 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1965 |
73038 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/09/1965 |
73036 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1965 |
7827 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
10/1965 |
7828 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44814 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44821 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44966 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
44981 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45045 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45132 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45143 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45145 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45185 |
Transfer in from: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45311 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
45348 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
78035 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
78038 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
78058 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
78060 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
7820 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
7821 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
46512 |
Transfer out to: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1965 |
46519 |
Transfer out to: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
09/10/1965 |
73090 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
45058 |
Transfer in from: |
2J |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/10/1965 |
45430 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1965 |
7802 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1965 |
7812 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1965 |
7819 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1965 |
7820 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1965 |
7821 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Manor |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
11/1965 |
7822 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
06/11/1965 |
75006 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
06/11/1965 |
3709 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
13/11/1965 |
3754 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1965 |
45045 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
12/1965 |
78035 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/12/1965 |
44775 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/12/1965 |
45143 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
25/12/1965 |
75038 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/01/1966 |
75020 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
15/01/1966 |
78003 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1966 |
75004 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1966 |
75012 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/03/1966 |
75021 |
Transfer in from: |
89B |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
04/1966 |
9657 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
44800 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
44897 |
Transfer in from: |
6B |
Mold Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
78018 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
78039 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
78063 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
73000 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
73025 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
73034 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
73050 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
73067 |
Transfer out to: |
9J |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
30/04/1966 |
73070 |
Transfer out to: |
9K |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
48471 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1966 |
75063 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
06/1966 |
45185 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
75012 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
8718 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
75012 |
Transfer out to: |
6D |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
75021 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
13/08/1966 |
45348 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
20/08/1966 |
78038 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
45430 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
48404 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1966 |
48418 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
75029 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
45310 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1966 |
75053 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
44711 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
44777 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
44780 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
44942 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
44971 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
45134 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
45149 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
45279 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
45287 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
45447 |
Transfer in from: |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
45493 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Banbury |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1966 |
44966 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/10/1966 |
78039 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
78017 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
45058 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
78060 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
29/10/1966 |
45311 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
44661 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
45051 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
45052 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Tyseley |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
78036 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
78018 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
45051 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
03/12/1966 |
78036 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
D3049 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
46446 |
Transfer in from: |
89C |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
46508 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
75009 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
75013 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
75055 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Machynlleth |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
44775 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
45134 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
78017 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
78058 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
78063 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/12/1966 |
46446 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/12/1966 |
46508 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/12/1966 |
78003 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
75014 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1967 |
44981 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1967 |
75033 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1967 |
75047 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
28/01/1967 |
75012 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1967 |
48436 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
04/03/1967 |
45132 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D3035 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
D3039 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44661 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44711 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44800 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44814 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44821 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
44942 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45052 |
Transfer out to: |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45145 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45149 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45279 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45310 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45447 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
45493 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75006 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75009 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75013 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75016 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75020 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75029 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75033 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75047 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75055 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Croes Newydd |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1967 |
75004 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
44777 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
44780 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
44897 |
Transfer out to: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1967 |
45287 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/03/1967 |
D3028 |
Transfer in from: |
84B |
Oxley |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/03/1967 |
D3039 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Oxley |
|
|
Steam |
5MT |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
01/04/1967 |
44971 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
on |
16/09/1967 |
D3193 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/10/1968 |
D3510 |
Transfer in from: |
Hookagate PAD |
|
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/04/1970 |
D3194 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1971 |
D3028 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1971 |
D3035 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1971 |
D3049 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1971 |
D3510 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/06/1971 |
D3970 |
Transfer out to: |
5A |
Crewe Diesel |
|
|