Depot: Sowerby Bridge
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 12605 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10891 | Snapshot | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 10925 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11381 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11429 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 11479 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12099 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12243 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12376 | Snapshot | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12416 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12575 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12587 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4038 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4042 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4464 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50711 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50835 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50934 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 50943 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | on | 01/01/1948 | 51482 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 52574 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 52590 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9527 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9528 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9568 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9569 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9628 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 50711 | Transfer out to: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 9540 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 9582 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/01/1948 | 9600 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/05/1948 | 42149 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 07/08/1948 | 50835 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 14/08/1948 | 50934 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 42384 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4038 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4042 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 44464 | Transfer out to: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1948 | 52574 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 52590 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | on | 18/12/1948 | 50943 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1949 | 49507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1949 | 49527 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 49615 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 49617 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | Rebuilt Compound | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 9614 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 49606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 10909 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 52189 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 52400 | Transfer in from: | 23C | Southport | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 52452 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 51429 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 49528 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 10/1949 | 51482 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 12521 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | Rebuilt Compound | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 9603 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 9648 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 51348 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 12521 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 52416 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 51348 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 51348 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 2w/e | 14/01/1950 | 49569 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 52587 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 49624 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 52217 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 04/03/1950 | 50891 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 50893 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 50953 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 42639 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 42384 | Transfer out to: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 50953 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 52099 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 25/04/1950 | 49615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 50893 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 10765 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 51488 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 49628 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 90321 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 90531 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 90593 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 90406 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 90724 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 90277 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 90385 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/07/1950 | 90707 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/08/1950 | 90728 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 49582 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 49600 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 49624 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/09/1950 | 90721 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 90721 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 90726 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 49508 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 49568 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 49617 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 90721 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 49662 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 49663 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 90321 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 90531 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 90593 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 90707 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 90721 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 49662 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 49663 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 50898 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 49662 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 49663 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 50712 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 50892 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 49650 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 49657 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 49660 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 49661 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 49673 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 49674 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 52616 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90277 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90385 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90406 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90724 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90726 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 90728 | Transfer out to: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49650 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49657 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49660 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49661 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49673 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49674 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49650 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49657 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49660 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49661 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49673 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 49674 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 49660 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 49660 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 50715 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 52408 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 52592 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 24/02/1951 | 49673 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 49660 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 50715 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 52408 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 52592 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 49660 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 50715 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 52408 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 52592 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 10887 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 50909 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 10887 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 10887 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 49620 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 52154 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 31/03/1951 | 49660 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 52255 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 50712 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 49602 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 28/04/1951 | 49663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49602 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49620 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 52154 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 52255 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 52351 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49602 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49620 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 52154 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 52255 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 19/05/1951 | 49540 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 26/05/1951 | 49650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 77484 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 50892 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 50715 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50892 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 77484 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 77484 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 50765 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 90354 | Transfer in from: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 50715 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 50892 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50715 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 50715 | Transfer out to: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 52243 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 52376 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 50887 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90226 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 90390 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 50715 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 50778 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 90226 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 90390 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 52355 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 52558 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 52351 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 52408 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 19/01/1952 | 49661 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90181 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90308 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 52189 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 52592 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 23/02/1952 | 50898 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 50715 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 49662 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 09/08/1952 | 50925 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 50752 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 52255 | Transfer out to: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 90316 | Transfer in from: | 25G | Farnley Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 90581 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/03/1953 | 50778 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 49511 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 50757 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 90316 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 52408 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 52410 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 51479 | Transfer out to: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 52575 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 90181 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 90308 | Transfer out to: | 26D | Bury | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 90354 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 90581 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 90621 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 49620 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 52452 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 05/09/1953 | 51348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 49624 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 52355 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 27/02/1954 | 49602 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 49554 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 50818 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52351 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 50757 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 52154 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 50777 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/06/1954 | 52558 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 52399 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 49511 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 50757 | Transfer in from: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 05/02/1955 | 50715 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 49552 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 50757 | Transfer out to: | 25F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1955 | 49554 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1955 | 52408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 49592 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 52452 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 52576 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 47266 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 47299 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 47379 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 51381 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 51488 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 52410 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 90412 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 49648 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 52411 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90310 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 90329 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 49674 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 52576 | Transfer out to: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 90236 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 90360 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 49552 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 49624 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 90122 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 16/02/1957 | 49657 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/07/1957 | 52217 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 12/08/1957 | 50752 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 42073 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 42094 | Transfer in from: | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 43126 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 47249 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 90113 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 49592 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 03/1958 | 52399 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41251 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41252 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 42405 | Transfer in from: | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42311 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42380 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42073 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42639 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 90236 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 03/10/1958 | 50777 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | on | 03/10/1958 | 50818 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 90210 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1958 | 47249 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 40147 | Transfer in from: | 20E | Manningham | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 40190 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 41251 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 41252 | Transfer out to: | 50F | Malton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 40190 | Transfer in from: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 40190 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 90470 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42311 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42380 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 47266 | Transfer out to: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 42083 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 43126 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 42380 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 42411 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 46438 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 46483 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 25/11/1959 | 47299 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 90233 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 90281 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 40147 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 40190 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42380 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42411 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1960 | 52452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1960 | 52351 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47510 | Transfer in from: | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47379 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47510 | Transfer out to: | 56E | Sowerby Bridge | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1960 | 52400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1960 | 52411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 11/11/1960 | 47510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 52133 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 52355 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 09/12/1960 | 47509 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1961 | 52133 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1961 | 52355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90200 | Transfer in from: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90692 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Ardsley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 42094 | Transfer out to: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42094 | Transfer in from: | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 30/09/1961 | 47508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 47379 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 25/02/1962 | 42149 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 42083 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 52121 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 52413 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 52461 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 52515 | Transfer in from: | 56D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 46438 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 46483 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47379 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1962 | 52461 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 16/11/1962 | 42094 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1962 | 52121 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1962 | 52413 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1962 | 52515 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 44055 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 44094 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 44153 | Transfer in from: | 20B | Stourton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 90310 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 43968 | Transfer in from: | 55B | Stourton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 44039 | Transfer in from: | 55F | Manningham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1963 | 44153 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1963 | 44094 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 90329 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 90360 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 90412 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1963 | 44055 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/12/1963 | 90692 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 43968 | Transfer out to: | 55D | Royston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 44039 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90113 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90122 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90200 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90210 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90233 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90281 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 90470 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/10/1964 | 42405 | Condemned |