Depot: Hull Springhead
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1907 | 117 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 118 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 119 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1907 | 120 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1907 | 122 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1907 | 123 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1907 | 124 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1907 | 125 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1907 | 126 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 06/1907 | 578 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1907 | 121 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1907 | 127 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 10/1907 | 128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 10/1907 | 129 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 10/1907 | 130 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1907 | 131 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1908 | 656 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1911 | 764 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1913 | 1249 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1913 | 1280 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 07/1913 | 1311 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1917 | 2230 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1918 | 2237 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 05/1920 | 2277 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1921 | 2299 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/09/1922 | 1032 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | by | 01/01/1923 | 1617 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | by | 01/01/1923 | 1649 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | by | 01/01/1923 | 1650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | by | 01/01/1923 | 1653 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/05/1923 | 2234 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/05/1923 | 2301 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/03/1924 | 1032 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/03/1924 | 578 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/05/1924 | 1280 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/05/1924 | 2299 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/05/1924 | 1249 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/05/1924 | 2237 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/05/1924 | 764 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/07/1924 | 2234 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/07/1924 | 3119 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/08/1924 | 1002 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/08/1924 | 645 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/08/1924 | 1292 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/10/1924 | 1110 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/10/1924 | 443 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/10/1924 | 785 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/11/1924 | 2264 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/12/1924 | 2252 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/01/1925 | 652 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/01/1925 | 715 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/01/1925 | 785 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/01/1925 | 2231 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/01/1925 | 2243 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/01/1925 | 2508 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/02/1925 | 443 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/02/1925 | 2247 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/02/1925 | 2294 | Transfer in from: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/05/1925 | 1136 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/08/1925 | 1032 | Transfer in from: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/12/1925 | 652 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/12/1925 | 656 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 03/1926 | 1110 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 01/1927 | 2264 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/01/1927 | 2230 | Transfer out to: | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/02/1927 | 1032 | Transfer out to: | SHI | Shildon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/02/1927 | 1311 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/02/1927 | 2243 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/02/1927 | 2247 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/02/1927 | 2277 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/02/1927 | 2294 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/03/1927 | 2231 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/03/1927 | 2252 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/05/1927 | 2301 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/05/1927 | 1292 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 26/05/1927 | 1002 | Transfer out to: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/05/1927 | 2501 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/05/1927 | 2502 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/06/1927 | 645 | Transfer out to: | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/06/1927 | 1136 | Transfer out to: | MAL | Malton | ||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | on | 24/11/1927 | 715 | Transfer out to: | TSK | Thirsk | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/10/1928 | 2501 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 22/10/1928 | 2502 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/07/1929 | 2501 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1929 | 6581 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1929 | 6613 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1929 | 6580 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/10/1929 | 6612 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/10/1929 | 6614 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/10/1929 | 2510 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1929 | 6610 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 12/11/1929 | 2512 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 6577 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 6578 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 6584 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 6609 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 6615 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 6618 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2499 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2504 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2505 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2506 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2507 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2509 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/11/1929 | 2511 | Transfer out to: | SEL | Selby | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/01/1930 | 6607 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/01/1930 | 6608 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1930 | 6549 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1930 | 6617 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1930 | 6549 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1930 | 6577 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1930 | 6578 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/03/1930 | 6583 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/03/1930 | 6616 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1930 | 6630 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1930 | 6632 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/04/1930 | 2503 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/05/1930 | 6262 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/05/1930 | 6261 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/08/1930 | 6579 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/08/1930 | 6631 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/11/1930 | 2248 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 27/11/1930 | 2255 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/12/1930 | 2248 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/12/1930 | 2255 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/01/1931 | 2502 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/10/1931 | 2498 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1931 | 6611 | Transfer in from: | BUL | Bullcroft Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/06/1933 | 6261 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/06/1933 | 6262 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1933 | 6580 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1933 | 6614 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1933 | 6615 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1934 | 6579 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1934 | 6611 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/07/1935 | 6632 | Transfer out to: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 2038 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 613 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6581 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6583 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6584 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6607 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6608 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6609 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6610 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6612 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6613 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6616 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6617 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6618 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6630 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6631 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6581 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6583 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6584 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6607 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6608 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6609 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6610 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6612 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6613 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6616 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6617 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6618 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6630 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | S | 01/1936 | 6631 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1938 | 6615 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1940 | 6607 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1940 | 6609 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1940 | 6613 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1940 | 6618 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1940 | 6577 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1940 | 6578 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/01/1940 | 2217 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/01/1940 | 2220 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/01/1940 | 2229 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/01/1940 | 2244 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/01/1940 | 2264 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/01/1940 | 2283 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1940 | 6577 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1940 | 6583 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1940 | 6610 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/03/1940 | 2244 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/05/1940 | 2227 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/05/1940 | 2257 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1940 | 6631 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/05/1940 | 2244 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/05/1940 | 6615 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/05/1940 | 6581 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/05/1940 | 1284 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/05/1940 | 6616 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/05/1940 | 6612 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/05/1940 | 6608 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/05/1940 | 2254 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/05/1940 | 6578 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 23/05/1940 | 2239 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/05/1940 | 2291 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 06/07/1940 | 2234 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/07/1940 | 6630 | Transfer out to: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1940 | 6617 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/05/1941 | 2275 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/05/1941 | 6584 | Transfer out to: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 1284 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2217 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2220 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2227 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2229 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2234 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2239 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2244 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2254 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2257 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2264 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2275 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2283 | Transfer out to: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 28/03/1943 | 2291 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/10/1943 | 1276 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/10/1943 | 2219 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 18/10/1943 | 2241 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/05/1944 | 1276 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/05/1944 | 2219 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | on | 13/05/1944 | 2241 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/01/1945 | 5404 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/01/1945 | 6615 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/01/1945 | 6211 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/01/1945 | 6616 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/01/1945 | 6352 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1945 | 5008 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1945 | 6501 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1945 | 6606 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/01/1945 | 6581 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1945 | 6578 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1945 | 6350 | Transfer in from: | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/03/1945 | 1136 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/03/1945 | 1174 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 12/03/1945 | 1190 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1945 | 6350 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1945 | 6334 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/06/1945 | 6630 | Transfer in from: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1946 | 6334 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1946 | 5008 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1946 | 5404 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1946 | 6211 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1946 | 6581 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/04/1946 | 6606 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1946 | 6578 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1946 | 6630 | Transfer out to: | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/09/1946 | 6616 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1947 | 5678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5035 | Snapshot | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5654 | Snapshot | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5724 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5728 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 65707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N12 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9089 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9110 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9111 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9112 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9113 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9116 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9119 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9410 | Snapshot | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9421 | Snapshot | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9422 | Snapshot | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9425 | Snapshot | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 77135 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 77175 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 77260 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 77320 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 77468 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 79280 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/06/1948 | 9110 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 63047 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 63052 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N12 | 0-6-2T | on | 30/08/1948 | 9089 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 3007 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 3008 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63009 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63010 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63011 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63057 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63094 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63108 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63149 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 63176 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 77468 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | 79280 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63009 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63011 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 63057 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 69111 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1949 | 63673 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1949 | 63732 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/09/1949 | 63849 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | D7 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 5705 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 90026 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 90382 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 90677 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 90008 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 65112 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 65654 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/10/1949 | 69789 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 5667 | Transfer in from: | CUD | Cudworth | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 69789 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 69789 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 65112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1949 | 65724 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 90026 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 90382 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 90677 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1949 | 63673 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1949 | 63732 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1949 | 63754 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63673 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63732 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63754 | Transfer in from: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63673 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63732 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 63754 | Transfer out to: | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 65707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63676 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63712 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63740 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63755 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63760 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63856 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63874 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63676 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63712 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63740 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63755 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63760 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63856 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63874 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63052 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63676 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63712 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63740 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63755 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63760 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63856 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63874 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 90007 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 90010 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 90217 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 90470 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 90586 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63011 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90010 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90052 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90378 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90470 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90478 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90571 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90586 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90661 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 90677 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63673 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63676 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63712 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63732 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63740 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63754 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63755 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63760 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63856 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1950 | 63874 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 79227 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90007 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90010 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90052 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90217 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90378 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90470 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90478 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90571 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90586 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90661 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90677 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90010 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90052 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90378 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90470 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90478 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90571 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90586 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90661 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 90677 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 90007 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 90378 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 77175 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90047 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 69111 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 69111 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 69111 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 65728 | Transfer out to: | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1951 | 5667 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/04/1951 | 63753 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/04/1951 | 63770 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 63753 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 63770 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 63753 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 63770 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 90052 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 90233 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/05/1951 | 69789 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/06/1951 | 69780 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 69780 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 23/06/1951 | 69780 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 90427 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 90663 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 68673 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90427 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90663 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90427 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 90663 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 90010 | Transfer out to: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63770 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/09/1951 | 69784 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63753 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/09/1951 | 63770 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 69784 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 90467 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 69784 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1951 | 63770 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90467 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 90467 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 90233 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 90704 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90233 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90704 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90233 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90704 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 90704 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90082 | Transfer in from: | SKN | Stockton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90623 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 90082 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 90623 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 90082 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 90623 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | on | 21/08/1952 | 69111 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 68718 | Transfer in from: | SUN | Sunderland | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/09/1952 | 69783 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68718 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68718 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69783 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69783 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/11/1952 | 69112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 69113 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69010 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69011 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 90511 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 10/05/1953 | 69787 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 69116 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 68284 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 68741 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 69378 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | N13 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 69119 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1953 | 13070 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 12114 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 12115 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69378 | Transfer out to: | 53D | Bridlington | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 12113 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 13071 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 13072 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 68743 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 68747 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 68284 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1954 | 90061 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/03/1954 | 69776 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 02/05/1954 | 69776 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 12116 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 12117 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 12118 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 12119 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 12120 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 13070 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 68718 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 68741 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 14/06/1954 | 69776 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 68743 | Transfer out to: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 09/08/1954 | 69787 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/08/1954 | 69774 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 68747 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 03/10/1954 | 69771 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 03/10/1954 | 69778 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 03/10/1954 | 69781 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 08/11/1954 | 69771 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 68745 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 15/11/1954 | 69780 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1955 | 13137 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/03/1955 | 13138 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1955 | 13139 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1955 | 13139 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1955 | 13139 | Transfer out to: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 12121 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 12122 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 13071 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 13072 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/04/1955 | 13140 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 03/05/1955 | 69778 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/05/1955 | 13141 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/10/1955 | 69788 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 90352 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 90082 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 90467 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 90663 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/11/1955 | 69785 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 21/11/1955 | 69788 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 27/11/1955 | 69772 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 12113 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 05/03/1956 | 69784 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1956 | 13139 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1956 | 13137 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1956 | 13138 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1956 | 13140 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1956 | 13141 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12113 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 13232 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 13233 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 13234 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 13235 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 13236 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12115 | Transfer out to: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 25/03/1956 | 69786 | Transfer in from: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 12115 | Transfer in from: | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 68361 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 23/11/1956 | 69781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/12/1956 | 69782 | Transfer in from: | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 17/12/1956 | 69783 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 90378 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 90482 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 68672 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 68741 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 65663 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 65685 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90429 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 90470 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 90503 | Transfer in from: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 90497 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/12/1957 | 69772 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/12/1957 | 69782 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | on | 16/12/1957 | 69786 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 28/12/1957 | 77000 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 68360 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 90378 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 90677 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 90265 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 90378 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 90677 | Transfer in from: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1958 | D3675 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 90061 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1958 | D3676 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 46409 | Transfer in from: | 25C | Goole | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 65663 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 65685 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 90265 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 90661 | Transfer out to: | 51G | Haverton Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 77010 | Transfer in from: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 46409 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 90094 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 90217 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 90571 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 90478 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 13233 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | D3675 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | D3676 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/12/1958 | 77000 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/12/1958 | 77010 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 13232 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 68360 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 68361 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90011 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90233 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90352 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90378 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90427 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90482 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90503 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90511 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90586 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90623 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90677 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 90688 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 68672 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 68741 | Transfer out to: | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 68673 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 68745 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 69010 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 69011 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | D3235 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 12122 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | D3234 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1962 | D3236 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 12113 | Transfer out to: | 55E | Normanton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 12114 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 12115 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 12116 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1968 | 12119 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1968 | 12117 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1968 | 12118 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1968 | 12120 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 12121 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |