Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 58 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4973 Week
» 16210 Month
» 249130 Year
» 1914506 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: St Leonards


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1037 Snapshot        
Steam C 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1038 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1075 Snapshot        
Steam R1 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1174 Snapshot        
Steam R1 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 1335 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1737 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1738 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1740 Snapshot        
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1744 Snapshot        
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1766 Snapshot        
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1767 Snapshot        
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 1768 Snapshot        
Steam N1 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1822 Snapshot        
Steam N1 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1876 Snapshot        
Steam N1 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 1877 Snapshot        
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 2371 Snapshot        
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 2379 Snapshot        
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 2383 Snapshot        
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 2394 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31041 Snapshot        
Steam O1 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 31432 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 900 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 901 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 902 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 903 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 904 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 905 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 906 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 907 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 908 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 909 Snapshot        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 910 Snapshot        
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 10/1948 2371 Condemned      
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 12/1948 2383 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30906 Reinstated STL St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 30906 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 17/06/1950 31767 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 09/09/1950 32678 Transfer in from: KESR Kent and East Sussex Railway    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 09/09/1950 32379 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 m/e 10/1950 31738 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30922 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30923 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam R1 0-4-4T 4w/e 07/10/1950 31706 Transfer in from: BAT Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 30909 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 13/11/1950 31164 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam R1 0-4-4T 4w/e 13/11/1950 31706 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 13/11/1950 32678 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30908 Transfer in from: STL St Leonards    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32390 Transfer in from: TWW Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 30908 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/12/1950 31737 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30909 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31496 Transfer in from: FAV Faversham    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 31767 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30922 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 05/02/1951 30923 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 w/e 03/03/1951 31740 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30911 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 30912 Transfer in from: RAM Ramsgate    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32393 Transfer in from: TWW Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32394 Transfer in from: STL St Leonards    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32394 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 30911 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 30912 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 30911 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 11/04/1951 30912 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 05/1951 31041 Condemned      
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32393 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32394 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 30910 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32393 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32394 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam O1 0-6-0 m/e 06/1951 31432 Condemned      
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 10/1951 32393 Condemned      
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30910 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30912 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 32388 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 30912 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 31164 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 12/1951 32394 Condemned      
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T on 15/12/1951 32388 Condemned      
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 32386 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30910 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30911 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30912 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 31518 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30910 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30911 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30912 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 06/1952 32386 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31279 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 31519 Transfer in from: TON Tonbridge    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30911 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 30912 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam C 0-6-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31038 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 9w/e 30/06/1952 31766 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 6w/e 13/08/1952 32640 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 32384 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 32385 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 8w/e 07/10/1952 32640 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 30919 Transfer in from:        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 30920 Transfer in from:        
Steam Schools 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 30923 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 11/12/1952 31274 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31721 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31769 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam C 0-6-0 5w/e 11/12/1952 31037 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 4w/e 08/01/1953 30923 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31162 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31518 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 31519 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 32390 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 m/e 05/1953 31744 Condemned      
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 26/05/1953 31496 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 26/05/1953 32385 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31161 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31295 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 31519 Transfer in from: 73E Faversham    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 01/10/1953 32662 Transfer in from: FRA Fratton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 29/10/1953 31158 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 29/10/1953 31269 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T m/e 11/1953 32384 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 10/12/1953 31158 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/12/1953 32662 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1954 32655 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 08/02/1954 32678 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/08/1954 32670 Transfer in from: KESR Kent and East Sussex Railway    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 20/08/1954 31075 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 20/08/1954 31161 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 06/11/1954 31764 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 11/12/1954 32578 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 9w/e 08/02/1955 32578 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 30920 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 6w/e 20/04/1955 30920 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 31520 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam R1 0-6-0T on 02/07/1955 31335 Condemned      
Steam R1 0-6-0T 5w/e 12/08/1955 31010 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31764 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 31769 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 3w/e 01/11/1955 30930 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 3w/e 01/11/1955 32636 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 3w/e 01/11/1955 32655 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 7w/e 19/12/1955 31767 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 7w/e 19/12/1955 31768 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 30923 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1956 31721 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam C 0-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 31498 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31773 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31774 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 31775 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30903 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30904 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30905 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30906 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30907 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30908 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30909 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30910 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30919 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30920 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30923 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 9w/e 12/06/1957 30930 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 7w/e 08/10/1957 31010 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam R1 0-6-0T 7w/e 08/10/1957 31174 Transfer out to: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 11/1957 31274 Condemned      
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T 4w/e 14/01/1958 32670 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30900 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30901 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Schools 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 30902 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31162 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31269 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31279 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31295 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam C 0-6-0 q/e 06/06/1958 31498 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31519 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31520 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 31773 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 31774 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 q/e 06/06/1958 31775 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T q/e 06/06/1958 32636 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Terriers 0-6-0T q/e 06/06/1958 32678 Transfer out to: 70F Fratton    
Steam N1 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31822 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam N1 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31876 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam N1 2-6-0 6w/e 14/06/1959 31877 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6586 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6587 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6588 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6589 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6590 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6591 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6592 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6593 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6594 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6595 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6596 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo 4w/e 22/07/1963 D6597 Transfer in from: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6586 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6587 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6588 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6589 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6590 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6591 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6592 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6593 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6594 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6595 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6596 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green    
Diesel 33 Bo-Bo w/e 20/10/1967 D6597 Transfer out to: 73C Hither Green