Depot: Staveley (G.C.)
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1903 | 71 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1903 | 86 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1909 | 5212 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1229 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1230 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1231 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1912 | 1233 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 04/01/1913 | 161 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/10/1915 | 1211 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1919 | 1235 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1919 | 1236 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 17/02/1922 | 138 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/10/1922 | 1232 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/10/1922 | 1251 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1923 | 271 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1924 | 1234 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/02/1924 | 92 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/08/1926 | 5271 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/08/1926 | 6251 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 02/1927 | 6211 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/04/1927 | 5213 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1928 | 6272 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1928 | 6506 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/02/1928 | 5138 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/02/1929 | 6272 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1929 | 6506 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 14/03/1929 | 5962 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/06/1929 | 5071 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/06/1931 | 5062 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/01/1932 | 5062 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1932 | 6503 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/03/1932 | 6282 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/03/1932 | 5213 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1932 | 6525 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 30/03/1932 | 5212 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/01/1934 | 6599 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1934 | 6638 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1934 | 6230 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/01/1934 | 6236 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1934 | 6229 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1934 | 6234 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1934 | 6235 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1934 | 6281 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1934 | 6602 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1934 | 6335 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1934 | 6233 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1934 | 6232 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1934 | 6603 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 1935 | 5161 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 6357 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 6358 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 5811 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/02/1937 | 6599 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/04/1937 | 5086 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1937 | 6641 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/11/1937 | 6294 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/12/1937 | 5355 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/12/1937 | 2782 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/07/1938 | 6589 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/07/1938 | 2782 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/03/1939 | 6525 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6231 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6231 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 740 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1941 | 780 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1941 | 789 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1943 | 6231 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1943 | 6261 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1943 | 6364 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 31/08/1943 | 5092 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 5962 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/03/1944 | 6311 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/04/1944 | 6629 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/04/1944 | 6639 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6536 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6640 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6358 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/05/1944 | 6641 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/05/1944 | 6281 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/08/1944 | 6357 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/08/1944 | 6364 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1944 | 5355 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/08/1944 | 6589 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 5010 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 6192 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/09/1944 | 6213 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1946 | 3702 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1946 | 6213 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/07/1946 | 6353 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/07/1946 | 3890 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3633 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3700 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3720 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3759 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3873 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3899 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/10/1947 | 3912 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1947 | 3609 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1947 | 3613 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1947 | 3746 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/11/1947 | 3749 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2133 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8371 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8379 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8382 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9279 | Snapshot | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9292 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9295 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9301 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9351 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9360 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9363 | Snapshot | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 4317 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 9360 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1948 | 3720 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 3720 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 3720 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 5497 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 3805 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/12/1948 | 63746 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3805 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 4386 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3805 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5497 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 3609 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 3850 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1949 | 3889 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | D2 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 4396 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 77017 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 77432 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1949 | 63859 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/06/1949 | 63838 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 63859 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 63859 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 62133 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/08/1949 | 63675 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/08/1949 | 63734 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 77055 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 78601 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 78614 | Transfer in from: | NEV | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 90606 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 62148 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 62148 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 78553 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63694 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1950 | 63805 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63694 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 63694 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 62140 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | D3 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 62140 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1950 | 63827 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/09/1950 | 63859 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63767 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 63702 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 90330 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/10/1950 | 90358 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 20/11/1950 | 68379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90330 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90358 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90330 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 90358 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90002 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 90036 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90002 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90036 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90002 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 90036 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/02/1951 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 63587 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1951 | 63847 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90036 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 90358 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 63587 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 63847 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 63587 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 63847 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 90202 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 90202 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 90202 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 90202 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 90606 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 90330 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69637 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69643 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69637 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69643 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69637 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69643 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 90002 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 90551 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90551 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 90551 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 63762 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 63762 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 63762 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 90139 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 90634 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1951 | 63706 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/11/1951 | 63767 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 63706 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 63706 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1951 | 63884 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63648 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63884 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 64336 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 64418 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 67410 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 67419 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90052 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90346 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90460 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 63884 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 69637 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 69643 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 90139 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 64336 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 64336 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 90052 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 64433 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 90526 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 90551 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1952 | 63702 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1952 | 63705 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 63702 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 63705 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 63702 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 63705 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68618 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/03/1952 | 63675 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63675 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 63675 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 68618 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/04/1952 | 63772 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/05/1952 | 63787 | Transfer in from: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63772 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63787 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90532 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63772 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 63787 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 06/1952 | 68382 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 68618 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 90346 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68618 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 68618 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 68592 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 68618 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/07/1952 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 68592 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 68592 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 90532 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 63801 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68632 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68632 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 90263 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 90486 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68632 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68632 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 90263 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 90486 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1953 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 68523 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69292 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69295 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 23/03/1953 | 67410 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 69269 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 65147 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/04/1953 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67408 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 68558 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 64418 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 68523 | Transfer out to: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68374 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68383 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68558 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68592 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1953 | 63899 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 64313 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/12/1953 | 63735 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/04/1954 | 68371 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69469 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 10/05/1954 | 67408 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 68589 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/06/1954 | 68374 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/06/1954 | 63613 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/06/1954 | 63706 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 68512 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 68512 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 69263 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N1 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 69469 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1954 | 63804 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90299 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 90403 | Transfer out to: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 68512 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 13/06/1955 | 69279 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/07/1955 | 63674 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/07/1955 | 63706 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90115 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90394 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90418 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 90460 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64292 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64361 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 64317 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 17/10/1955 | 68383 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68616 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69309 | Transfer in from: | 40C | Louth | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 69269 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/12/1955 | 69301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 69351 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 63587 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 63674 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 63675 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1956 | 63694 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 68617 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90007 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90276 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90391 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 90418 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/01/1956 | 63877 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/01/1956 | 68589 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68608 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/07/1956 | 69363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 69269 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 28/10/1956 | 69803 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/11/1956 | 63845 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 90085 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | C13 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 67419 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/04/1957 | 68512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 64361 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1957 | 63648 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1957 | 63648 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 26/01/1958 | 69800 | Transfer in from: | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/04/1958 | 69803 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 62663 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/06/1958 | 69800 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68591 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/07/1958 | 68617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90055 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90087 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 90502 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 15/10/1958 | 68608 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 17/10/1958 | 69269 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 27/11/1958 | 68616 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/05/1959 | 63847 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 62661 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 64354 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/07/1959 | 64336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1959 | 61312 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 68591 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 69263 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/10/1959 | 63749 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/11/1959 | 63590 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1959 | 63663 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63773 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1959 | 63801 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 90391 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 63784 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/12/1959 | 63804 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/12/1959 | 63795 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/01/1960 | 63571 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/01/1960 | 61312 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/01/1960 | 63596 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 90502 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1960 | 63619 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/01/1960 | 63630 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63646 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63648 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63702 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63772 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63877 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 63884 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 61826 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90007 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90087 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/02/1960 | 63650 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 61877 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/02/1960 | 63652 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1960 | 64433 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 61908 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/02/1960 | 63670 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 61926 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90055 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90085 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90276 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 90418 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/02/1960 | 63678 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 61959 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 61958 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 43145 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 61981 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 61989 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 90276 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 61877 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 61926 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/03/1960 | 63661 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 43087 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 61976 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 64354 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 90276 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 61820 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 61811 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 61973 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 61822 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 64292 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 23/05/1960 | 62663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61820 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61822 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 61959 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1960 | 63612 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/10/1960 | 63656 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 64417 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | on | 18/11/1960 | 62661 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/11/1960 | 69309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 43160 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 43161 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1960 | 63661 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/12/1960 | 63720 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 43160 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 43161 | Transfer out to: | 41B | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/05/1961 | 64313 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/06/1961 | 63845 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61811 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61908 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61958 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61976 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61981 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 61989 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1961 | 64417 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 61959 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 61989 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/11/1961 | 61959 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/02/1962 | 63661 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/02/1962 | 63701 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/02/1962 | 63841 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/02/1962 | 63913 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1962 | 63762 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1962 | 61041 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/06/1962 | 61162 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/06/1962 | 63787 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61826 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 61973 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/06/1962 | 61989 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/09/1962 | 63661 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/09/1962 | 63841 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 63786 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 63887 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1962 | 61312 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 43145 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1962 | 63652 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1962 | 63663 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/11/1962 | 63656 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1962 | 63604 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 63735 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 90634 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/12/1962 | 63685 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/01/1963 | 63772 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/01/1963 | 63774 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1963 | 61041 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1963 | 61162 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1963 | 63841 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/02/1963 | 63852 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1963 | 63868 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 63887 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/03/1963 | 63772 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/03/1963 | 61312 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/03/1963 | 63774 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/04/1963 | 63705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 43087 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 25/05/1963 | 63899 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/05/1963 | 63611 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63589 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63592 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63652 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63663 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63768 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1963 | 63863 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1963 | 63678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/07/1963 | 63592 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1963 | 63596 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/08/1963 | 63784 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/10/1963 | 63619 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/10/1963 | 63795 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/11/1963 | 63652 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63594 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63725 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63746 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63872 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/11/1963 | 63879 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 12/01/1964 | 63827 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1964 | 63852 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1964 | 63872 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/02/1964 | 63746 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1964 | 63822 | Transfer in from: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1964 | 63841 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1964 | 63822 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/03/1964 | 63611 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/03/1964 | 63685 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/04/1964 | 63594 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/05/1964 | 63604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/06/1964 | 63670 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1964 | 63786 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1964 | 63773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/11/1964 | 63663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/12/1964 | 63571 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 63813 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 10/01/1965 | 63878 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90121 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90227 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90258 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90266 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 90301 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/03/1965 | 63813 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1965 | 63878 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 90069 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 90401 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 90719 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/06/1965 | 63913 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63589 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63590 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63612 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63630 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63646 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63650 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63701 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63706 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63725 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63768 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63863 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63868 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/06/1965 | 63879 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90069 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90121 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90227 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90258 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90266 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90301 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90401 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 90719 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Langwith Junction |