Steam |
Lord Nelson |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
08/1926 |
850 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Lord Nelson |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
03/1930 |
850 |
Transfer out to: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Lord Nelson |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
04/1930 |
850 |
Transfer in from: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
q/e |
12/1935 |
1067 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
q/e |
12/1935 |
1504 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
q/e |
12/1935 |
1817 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
q/e |
12/1935 |
1890 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
q/e |
12/1935 |
2100 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Lord Nelson |
4-6-0 |
on |
27/02/1940 |
850 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1005 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1019 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1067 |
Snapshot |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1067 |
Snapshot |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1145 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1160 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1163 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1165 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1177 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1179 |
Snapshot |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1184 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1247 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1259 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1263 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1266 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1293 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1295 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1302 |
0-4-0CT |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1302 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1307 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1311 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1319 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1321 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1329 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1405 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1410 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1411 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1412 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1413 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1414 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Flying Bedsteads |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1445 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Flying Bedsteads |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1454 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1492 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1494 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1497 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1498 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1504 |
Snapshot |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1504 |
Snapshot |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1506 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1507 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1508 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1511 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1514 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1515 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1516 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1554 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1575 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1576 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1578 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1582 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
T |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1602 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Bob Tails |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1661 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1681 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1683 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1690 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1694 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
R1 |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1706 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
R1 |
0-4-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1710 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1712 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1714 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1716 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1717 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1718 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1719 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1722 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1736 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1743 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1745 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1749 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1760 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1764 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1765 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1769 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1810 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1811 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1812 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1813 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1817 |
Snapshot |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1890 |
Snapshot |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1903 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1904 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1905 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1906 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1907 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1908 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1909 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1910 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1912 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1914 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
1915 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2100 |
Snapshot |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2100 |
Snapshot |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2101 |
Snapshot |
NX |
New Cross Gate |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2102 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2103 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2104 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2105 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2106 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
2107 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C133 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C134 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C135 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C136 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C137 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C138 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C139 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C140 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C154 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
21C155 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
763 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
764 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
765 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
775 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
776 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
778 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
780 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
781 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
793 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
794 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
795 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
796 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
797 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
86 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
90 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
P |
02/01/1948 |
86 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
P |
02/01/1948 |
90 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
P |
02/01/1948 |
86 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
P |
02/01/1948 |
90 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Flying Bedsteads |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
02/1948 |
1445 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
9w/e |
01/03/1948 |
1016 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
01/03/1948 |
21C153 |
Transfer in from: |
SAL |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
9w/e |
01/03/1948 |
89 |
Transfer in from: |
SOT |
Southampton Docks |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
9w/e |
01/03/1948 |
1259 |
Transfer out to: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
01/03/1948 |
21C136 |
Transfer out to: |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1814 |
Transfer in from: |
NORW |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1815 |
Transfer in from: |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1816 |
Transfer in from: |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
C36 |
Transfer in from: |
FEL |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
C37 |
Transfer in from: |
FEL |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
C38 |
Transfer in from: |
FEL |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
C39 |
Transfer in from: |
FEL |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
C40 |
Transfer in from: |
FEL |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1293 |
Transfer out to: |
GFD |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1405 |
Transfer out to: |
AFD |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1498 |
Transfer out to: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1508 |
Transfer out to: |
GFD |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1690 |
Transfer out to: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/04/1948 |
1694 |
Transfer out to: |
HIT |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
05/1948 |
90 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
1406 |
Transfer in from: |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
21C130 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
21C157 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
21C163 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
281 |
Transfer in from: |
DOR |
Dorchester |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
301 |
Transfer in from: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
304 |
Transfer in from: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
311 |
Transfer in from: |
GFD |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
312 |
Transfer in from: |
SAL |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
704 |
Transfer in from: |
GFD |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
726 |
Transfer in from: |
GFD |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
729 |
Transfer in from: |
SAL |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
88 |
Transfer in from: |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Flying Bedsteads |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
1454 |
Transfer out to: |
RDG |
Reading (S.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
1492 |
Transfer out to: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
1494 |
Transfer out to: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
E |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
1514 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
1516 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
1743 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/06/1948 |
1745 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
1739 |
Transfer in from: |
FAV |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
31246 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
34074 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
34075 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
34076 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
1160 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
1163 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
1165 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
01/08/1948 |
1179 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
21C131 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
30928 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
34032 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
929 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
1247 |
Transfer out to: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
1736 |
Transfer out to: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
1760 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
1764 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
1765 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
21C130 |
Transfer out to: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
21C133 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
21C135 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
281 |
Transfer out to: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
301 |
Transfer out to: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
31769 |
Transfer out to: |
STL |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
34034 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
726 |
Transfer out to: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
729 |
Transfer out to: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
763 |
Transfer out to: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
764 |
Transfer out to: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1948 |
765 |
Transfer out to: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Bob Tails |
0-4-4T |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
1661 |
Transfer out to: |
FAV |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
21C137 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
21C138 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
34039 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
34040 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
13/11/1948 |
781 |
Transfer out to: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
34033 |
Transfer in from: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
34064 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
34065 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
34077 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
8w/e |
08/01/1949 |
34032 |
Transfer out to: |
SAL |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
30537 |
Transfer in from: |
NORW |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
30539 |
Transfer in from: |
NORW |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
548 |
Transfer in from: |
BM |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
1903 |
Transfer out to: |
FAV |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
1904 |
Transfer out to: |
FAV |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
12/02/1949 |
31246 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
1903 |
Transfer in from: |
FAV |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
1904 |
Transfer in from: |
FAV |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
30086 |
Transfer out to: |
BM |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
304 |
Transfer out to: |
BAS |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
30537 |
Transfer out to: |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
30539 |
Transfer out to: |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/03/1949 |
548 |
Transfer out to: |
BM |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
1735 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
30764 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
30766 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
7w/e |
03/05/1949 |
31761 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
301 |
Transfer in from: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30281 |
Transfer in from: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
304 |
Transfer in from: |
BAS |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30726 |
Transfer in from: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
756 |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30756 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30774 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30793 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30797 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
311 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
312 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
31504 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
31749 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
31767 |
Transfer in from: |
STL |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
763 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30793 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30797 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30928 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
30929 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
311 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
312 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
31504 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
31507 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
31749 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
780 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
3w/e |
28/05/1949 |
88 |
Transfer out to: |
PLY |
Plymouth Friary |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
30/06/1949 |
31743 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
30/06/1949 |
34056 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
30/06/1949 |
1497 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
30/06/1949 |
31511 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
1302 |
0-4-0CT |
m/e |
07/1949 |
31302 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
31555 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
31016 |
Transfer out to: |
TWW |
Tunbridge Wells West |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
31761 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
31/07/1949 |
31767 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
1807 |
Transfer in from: |
FRA |
Fratton |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
31619 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
31638 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
31762 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
31764 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
31806 |
Transfer in from: |
GFD |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
34055 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
34058 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
301 |
Transfer out to: |
GFD |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
30281 |
Transfer out to: |
GFD |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
2w/e |
12/08/1949 |
34055 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
1755 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
31756 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
1735 |
Transfer out to: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
1807 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
31806 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
34055 |
Transfer out to: |
SAL |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
34058 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
B4 |
0-4-0T |
6w/e |
26/09/1949 |
89 |
Transfer out to: |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
15/10/1949 |
31638 |
Transfer out to: |
FAV |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
Black Tanks |
0-6-0T |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
32128 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34066 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34067 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34068 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34069 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34070 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34071 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
30793 |
Transfer out to: |
AFD |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
31904 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34031 |
Transfer out to: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34033 |
Transfer out to: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34056 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34057 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
12/12/1949 |
34077 |
Transfer out to: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
31234 |
Transfer in from: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
31409 |
Transfer in from: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
31828 |
Transfer in from: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
1712 |
Transfer out to: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
1755 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
30794 |
Transfer out to: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
31406 |
Transfer out to: |
AFD |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
E |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
31515 |
Transfer out to: |
RDG |
Reading (S.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
T |
0-6-0T |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
31602 |
Transfer out to: |
RDG |
Reading (S.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
31619 |
Transfer out to: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
33036 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
33037 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
33038 |
Transfer out to: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
34053 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
34054 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
04/02/1950 |
704 |
Transfer out to: |
YEO |
Yeovil Town |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1950 |
31817 |
Transfer in from: |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1950 |
31818 |
Transfer in from: |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1950 |
30795 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1950 |
30797 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/03/1950 |
31817 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/03/1950 |
31818 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/03/1950 |
31817 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/03/1950 |
31818 |
Transfer out to: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
1860 |
Transfer in from: |
RDG |
Reading (S.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
31859 |
Transfer in from: |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
31861 |
Transfer in from: |
RDG |
Reading (S.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
35025 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
35026 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
35027 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
35028 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
31554 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
31828 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
33039 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
33040 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
34063 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
34064 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
22/04/1950 |
34065 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
2w/e |
20/05/1950 |
31165 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Bob Tails |
0-4-4T |
2w/e |
20/05/1950 |
31660 |
Transfer in from: |
AFD |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
R1 |
0-4-4T |
2w/e |
20/05/1950 |
31710 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
31904 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
34033 |
Transfer in from: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
31860 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
31861 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
31764 |
Reinstated |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
31767 |
Reinstated |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
30793 |
Transfer in from: |
AFD |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
31904 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
34033 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
31764 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
31904 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
17/06/1950 |
34033 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
1623 |
Transfer in from: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
31793 |
Transfer in from: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
31803 |
Transfer in from: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
34034 |
Transfer in from: |
SAL |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
34035 |
Transfer in from: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
34074 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
34075 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
1558 |
Transfer in from: |
FOL |
Folkestone Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
34074 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
34075 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
1623 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
30726 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
311 |
Transfer out to: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
31555 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
R1 |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
31706 |
Transfer out to: |
74E |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
31793 |
Transfer out to: |
70E |
Reading (S.R.) |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
34034 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
07/10/1950 |
34035 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
09/10/1950 |
34034 |
Transfer in from: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
09/10/1950 |
34035 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
5w/e |
09/10/1950 |
31319 |
Transfer out to: |
74E |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
09/10/1950 |
34074 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
09/10/1950 |
34075 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
34074 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
34075 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
34034 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
31/10/1950 |
34035 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
02/11/1950 |
42070 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
06/11/1950 |
42071 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
12/11/1950 |
42072 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/11/1950 |
30791 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/11/1950 |
30792 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
13/11/1950 |
30778 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
17/11/1950 |
42073 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
24/11/1950 |
42074 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
30772 |
Transfer in from: |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
30773 |
Transfer in from: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
30775 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
30776 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
30791 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
30792 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
30775 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
30776 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
30791 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
3w/e |
30/11/1950 |
30792 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
31803 |
Transfer out to: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
31859 |
Transfer out to: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
30772 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
30773 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
31497 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
31500 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
30772 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
30773 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
30796 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
31762 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
31764 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
German Engines |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
08/12/1950 |
31767 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
12/01/1951 |
42080 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D16/2 |
1Co-Co1 |
on |
20/01/1951 |
10201 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
24/01/1951 |
42081 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
01/02/1951 |
42082 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30765 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30794 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30795 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30796 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
31745 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42080 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42081 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42082 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
304 |
Transfer out to: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30772 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30773 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30774 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30775 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30776 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30791 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
30792 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
31145 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
31165 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
31497 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
31500 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
31903 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
31904 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
34074 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
34075 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42070 |
Transfer out to: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42071 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42072 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42073 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42074 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42080 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42081 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
05/02/1951 |
42082 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
09/02/1951 |
42083 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
on |
19/02/1951 |
42084 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
31745 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
30791 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Black Tanks |
0-6-0T |
6w/e |
14/03/1951 |
32128 |
Transfer out to: |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
20/03/1951 |
30791 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
20/03/1951 |
30791 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
11/04/1951 |
31320 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
11/04/1951 |
31177 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
31320 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
13/04/1951 |
31320 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
30791 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
30792 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
30797 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
30798 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31265 |
Transfer in from: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31269 |
Transfer in from: |
AFD |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31573 |
Transfer in from: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31579 |
Transfer in from: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31712 |
Transfer in from: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31713 |
Transfer in from: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31715 |
Transfer in from: |
FAV |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
I1X |
4-4-2T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
32596 |
Transfer in from: |
EBN |
Eastbourne |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
34087 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
34088 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
34089 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
34090 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
34100 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
42085 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
30791 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31184 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31234 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31295 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31307 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31582 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31681 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31683 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31722 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
31739 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
34033 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
34076 |
Transfer out to: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
42080 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
42081 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
12/05/1951 |
42082 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
I1X |
4-4-2T |
m/e |
06/1951 |
32596 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30767 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30768 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30769 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30777 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30778 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30779 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
31758 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
31759 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
31901 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
31902 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
31903 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
31904 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30796 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30797 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
30798 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
27/06/1951 |
34100 |
Transfer out to: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31580 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31581 |
Transfer in from: |
HIT |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31582 |
Transfer in from: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31583 |
Transfer in from: |
GIL |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31584 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31899 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31900 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
33036 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
33037 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
33038 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31712 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31713 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31714 |
Transfer out to: |
73E |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31715 |
Transfer out to: |
73E |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31716 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31717 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31817 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/07/1951 |
31818 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
70004 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
30777 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
30778 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
30779 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
31816 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
31899 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
31900 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
756 |
0-6-0T |
m/e |
11/1951 |
30756 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
31158 |
Transfer in from: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
31557 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
31329 |
Transfer out to: |
74E |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
Bob Tails |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
31660 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/12/1951 |
31815 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
21/01/1952 |
31756 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
21/01/1952 |
31758 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
21/01/1952 |
31759 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
5w/e |
16/02/1952 |
34089 |
Transfer out to: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
Greyhounds |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
03/1952 |
30312 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/03/1952 |
42089 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/03/1952 |
42091 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Diesel |
D16/2 |
1Co-Co1 |
4w/e |
19/03/1952 |
10201 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
19/03/1952 |
35025 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
42083 |
Transfer out to: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
42084 |
Transfer out to: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
8w/e |
19/03/1952 |
42085 |
Transfer out to: |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
30770 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
30771 |
Transfer in from: |
DOV |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
30772 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
30773 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
30774 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
30922 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31892 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31893 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31899 |
Transfer in from: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31900 |
Transfer in from: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31915 |
Transfer in from: |
BAT |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
34089 |
Transfer in from: |
30A |
Stratford |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
41291 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
41295 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
41296 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
30/06/1952 |
41297 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
42090 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31311 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31907 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31908 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31909 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31910 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
9w/e |
30/06/1952 |
31915 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
30/07/1952 |
31758 |
Transfer in from: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
30/07/1952 |
31759 |
Transfer in from: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
13/08/1952 |
31758 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
13/08/1952 |
31759 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
13/08/1952 |
31758 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
13/08/1952 |
31759 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
07/10/1952 |
31891 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
07/10/1952 |
30922 |
Transfer out to: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
07/10/1952 |
33036 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
07/10/1952 |
33037 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
07/10/1952 |
33038 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
11/12/1952 |
30915 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
5w/e |
11/12/1952 |
31555 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
11/12/1952 |
31758 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
11/12/1952 |
31759 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
11/12/1952 |
31891 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Z |
0-8-0T |
5w/e |
14/02/1953 |
30950 |
Transfer in from: |
ELH |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
14/02/1953 |
31165 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
5w/e |
14/02/1953 |
31558 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
14/02/1953 |
31743 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
5w/e |
14/02/1953 |
31749 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
5w/e |
14/02/1953 |
41297 |
Transfer out to: |
75F |
Tunbridge Wells West |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
27/03/1953 |
30769 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
27/03/1953 |
30772 |
Transfer out to: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
27/03/1953 |
30915 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Z |
0-8-0T |
6w/e |
27/03/1953 |
30950 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
26/05/1953 |
30915 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
26/05/1953 |
31509 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
26/05/1953 |
31545 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
26/05/1953 |
31165 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
30541 |
Transfer in from: |
3B |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
30544 |
Transfer in from: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
30769 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
30772 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
30915 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
31743 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
31749 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
31758 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
31759 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
33018 |
Transfer in from: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
33019 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
33022 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
30915 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
31509 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
8w/e |
20/07/1953 |
31545 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/08/1953 |
31580 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
31912 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
33018 |
Transfer out to: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
24/08/1953 |
33019 |
Transfer out to: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31461 |
Transfer in from: |
73E |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31815 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31816 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
30541 |
Transfer out to: |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
30544 |
Transfer out to: |
75D |
Horsham |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31758 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
L1 |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31759 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31813 |
Transfer out to: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31814 |
Transfer out to: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31892 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31893 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31899 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
31900 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/10/1953 |
33022 |
Transfer out to: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
29/10/1953 |
31158 |
Transfer out to: |
74E |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
29/10/1953 |
31269 |
Transfer out to: |
74E |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
4w/e |
29/10/1953 |
31320 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1954 |
31221 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
19/03/1954 |
34017 |
Transfer in from: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
19/03/1954 |
34069 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
31551 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
31815 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
8w/e |
13/05/1954 |
31816 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
30537 |
Transfer in from: |
NOR |
Norwich Thorpe |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
30538 |
Transfer in from: |
NORW |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
31261 |
Transfer in from: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
31550 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
31552 |
Transfer in from: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
31900 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
31907 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
31908 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
34065 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
30794 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
18/06/1954 |
30795 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
20/08/1954 |
30794 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
20/08/1954 |
30795 |
Transfer in from: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
20/08/1954 |
31921 |
Transfer in from: |
HIT |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
Small Radials |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
20/08/1954 |
32455 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
20/08/1954 |
30772 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
20/08/1954 |
41295 |
Transfer out to: |
72E |
Barnstaple Junction |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
20/08/1954 |
41296 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
33015 |
Transfer in from: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
33017 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
33038 |
Transfer in from: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
30537 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
30538 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
31221 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
31906 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
31907 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
31908 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
31906 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
31907 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
42088 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
31900 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
31901 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
31902 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/12/1954 |
31903 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
on |
05/02/1955 |
31555 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
08/02/1955 |
31408 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
08/02/1955 |
33015 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
08/02/1955 |
33017 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Q1 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
08/02/1955 |
33038 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
5w/e |
11/03/1955 |
41296 |
Transfer in from: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
20/04/1955 |
31253 |
Transfer in from: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
09/05/1955 |
31558 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
09/05/1955 |
31896 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
09/05/1955 |
31897 |
Transfer in from: |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
09/05/1955 |
31898 |
Transfer in from: |
RED |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
3w/e |
09/05/1955 |
31263 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
31545 |
Transfer in from: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
31894 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
31895 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
35014 |
Transfer in from: |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
31005 |
Transfer out to: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
34065 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
34070 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
34071 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
21/06/1955 |
35027 |
Transfer out to: |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1955 |
73082 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1955 |
73083 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
07/07/1955 |
30764 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
2w/e |
07/07/1955 |
30774 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
12/08/1955 |
30763 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
12/08/1955 |
30765 |
Transfer out to: |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
12/08/1955 |
30770 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
30773 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
16/09/1955 |
30791 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1955 |
31718 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/10/1955 |
30771 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/10/1955 |
30795 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
10/10/1955 |
31583 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
15/06/1956 |
30795 |
Transfer in from: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
15/06/1956 |
35015 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
15/06/1956 |
35014 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Large Vulcans |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
17/11/1956 |
32448 |
Transfer in from: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
17/11/1956 |
42086 |
Transfer in from: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
17/11/1956 |
42087 |
Transfer in from: |
75F |
Tunbridge Wells West |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
17/11/1956 |
30915 |
Transfer out to: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
3w/e |
17/11/1956 |
41296 |
Transfer out to: |
72E |
Barnstaple Junction |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/12/1956 |
31719 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
25/01/1957 |
31719 |
Transfer in from: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
25/01/1957 |
35001 |
Transfer in from: |
EXJ |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
6w/e |
25/01/1957 |
32101 |
Transfer out to: |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
|
|
Steam |
Large Vulcans |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
25/01/1957 |
32448 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
25/01/1957 |
35026 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
01/04/1957 |
30915 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
01/04/1957 |
31583 |
Transfer in from: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
6w/e |
01/04/1957 |
42106 |
Transfer in from: |
75F |
Tunbridge Wells West |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
01/04/1957 |
31461 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
01/04/1957 |
31894 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
01/04/1957 |
31896 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
30908 |
Transfer in from: |
74E |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
30909 |
Transfer in from: |
74E |
St Leonards |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
31037 |
Transfer in from: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
O1 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
31048 |
Transfer in from: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
O1 |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
31064 |
Transfer in from: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
31317 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
31894 |
Transfer in from: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
34005 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
42074 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
30792 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
32104 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
32105 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
32107 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
9w/e |
12/06/1957 |
34090 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/09/1957 |
31557 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
7w/e |
08/10/1957 |
31178 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
7w/e |
08/10/1957 |
73087 |
Transfer in from: |
71G |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
7w/e |
08/10/1957 |
31037 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
7w/e |
08/10/1957 |
31253 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
7w/e |
08/10/1957 |
31573 |
Transfer out to: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
7w/e |
08/10/1957 |
31576 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
7w/e |
08/10/1957 |
31579 |
Transfer out to: |
73D |
Gillingham (Kent) |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
7w/e |
08/10/1957 |
34017 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
m/e |
11/1957 |
31321 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
14/01/1958 |
30915 |
Transfer in from: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
14/01/1958 |
34077 |
Transfer in from: |
RAM |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
14/01/1958 |
34082 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
14/01/1958 |
30915 |
Transfer out to: |
73A |
Stewarts Lane |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
14/01/1958 |
34005 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
15/02/1958 |
31504 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
24/02/1958 |
34084 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
24/02/1958 |
34100 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Small Radials |
0-6-2T |
6w/e |
24/02/1958 |
32455 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
34085 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
34086 |
Transfer in from: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
34082 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
34084 |
Transfer out to: |
74C |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
42074 |
Transfer out to: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
42086 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
42106 |
Transfer out to: |
75F |
Tunbridge Wells West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1958 |
73087 |
Transfer out to: |
82F |
Bath Green Park (S&D) |
|
|
Steam |
O1 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/05/1958 |
31064 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
q/e |
06/06/1958 |
30802 |
Transfer in from: |
AFD |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
q/e |
06/06/1958 |
30803 |
Transfer in from: |
AFD |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
q/e |
06/06/1958 |
30937 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
q/e |
06/06/1958 |
30938 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
q/e |
06/06/1958 |
30939 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
q/e |
06/06/1958 |
31266 |
Transfer out to: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/06/1958 |
31178 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/06/1958 |
31582 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Britannia |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
12/07/1958 |
70004 |
Transfer out to: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
09/1958 |
31506 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
13/10/1958 |
31145 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
O1 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
13/10/1958 |
31370 |
Transfer in from: |
TON |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
27/12/1958 |
30766 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Electric |
Class 70 |
C-C |
1w/e |
11/03/1959 |
20001 |
Transfer in from: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Electric |
Class 70 |
C-C |
1w/e |
11/03/1959 |
20002 |
Transfer in from: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Electric |
Class 70 |
C-C |
1w/e |
11/03/1959 |
20003 |
Transfer in from: |
BTN |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1959 |
75074 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
w/e |
11/03/1959 |
30794 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
01/05/1959 |
31724 |
Transfer in from: |
73C |
Hither Green |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30920 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30921 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30922 |
Transfer in from: |
74B |
Ramsgate |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30923 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31714 |
Transfer in from: |
73E |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31715 |
Transfer in from: |
73E |
Faversham |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31896 |
Transfer in from: |
74D |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31899 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31900 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30767 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30768 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30769 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30793 |
Transfer out to: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30795 |
Transfer out to: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30802 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
King Arthur |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30803 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30908 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30909 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30915 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30937 |
Transfer out to: |
73F |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30938 |
Transfer out to: |
73H |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
30939 |
Transfer out to: |
73H |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31019 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
O1 |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31048 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31067 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31145 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
O1 |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31370 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31408 |
Transfer out to: |
73F |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31409 |
Transfer out to: |
73F |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31413 |
Transfer out to: |
73H |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31414 |
Transfer out to: |
73H |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31545 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31552 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31743 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
D1 |
4-4-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31749 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31810 |
Transfer out to: |
73H |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31811 |
Transfer out to: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31812 |
Transfer out to: |
70C |
Guildford |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31904 |
Transfer out to: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31905 |
Transfer out to: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31906 |
Transfer out to: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
31907 |
Transfer out to: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
35001 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
35015 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Merchant Navy |
4-6-2 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
35028 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
73082 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 5 |
4-6-0 |
6w/e |
14/06/1959 |
73083 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
18/07/1959 |
42087 |
Transfer out to: |
75F |
Tunbridge Wells West |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
5w/e |
26/11/1959 |
75069 |
Transfer in from: |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
26/11/1959 |
31724 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42088 |
Transfer out to: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42089 |
Transfer out to: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42090 |
Transfer out to: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
4P |
2-6-4T |
w/e |
05/12/1959 |
42091 |
Transfer out to: |
14D |
Neasden |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
31/12/1959 |
80066 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
31/12/1959 |
80067 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
31/12/1959 |
80068 |
Transfer in from: |
1C |
Watford |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
31/12/1959 |
80081 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
P |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
06/02/1960 |
31558 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
09/02/1960 |
31229 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
6w/e |
09/02/1960 |
80066 |
Transfer out to: |
73F |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/03/1960 |
31581 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/05/1960 |
31019 |
Transfer in from: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
06/05/1960 |
31067 |
Transfer in from: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/07/1960 |
31823 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/07/1960 |
31824 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/07/1960 |
31229 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
31265 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Large Vulcans |
0-6-0 |
6w/e |
05/10/1960 |
32438 |
Transfer in from: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
6w/e |
05/10/1960 |
31551 |
Transfer out to: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
24/11/1960 |
31914 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
24/11/1960 |
31915 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
W |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
24/11/1960 |
31921 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
17/01/1961 |
31579 |
Transfer in from: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
Large Vulcans |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
17/01/1961 |
32438 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
8w/e |
17/01/1961 |
34085 |
Transfer out to: |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
10/02/1961 |
30925 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
10/02/1961 |
30926 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
m/e |
10/02/1961 |
34001 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
m/e |
10/02/1961 |
34004 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
m/e |
10/02/1961 |
84020 |
Transfer in from: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
10/02/1961 |
30920 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
10/02/1961 |
31575 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
m/e |
10/02/1961 |
34066 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
25/02/1961 |
31550 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
5w/e |
18/03/1961 |
31542 |
Transfer in from: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1961 |
31019 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
7w/e |
03/05/1961 |
41291 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31854 |
Transfer in from: |
74A |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
30923 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
30926 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31719 |
Transfer out to: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31894 |
Transfer out to: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31895 |
Transfer out to: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31896 |
Transfer out to: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31897 |
Transfer out to: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31898 |
Transfer out to: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31899 |
Transfer out to: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
31900 |
Transfer out to: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
32100 |
Transfer out to: |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
32102 |
Transfer out to: |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
32103 |
Transfer out to: |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
|
|
Steam |
E2 |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
32106 |
Transfer out to: |
71I |
Southampton Docks |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
34001 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
34004 |
Transfer out to: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
34067 |
Transfer out to: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
34068 |
Transfer out to: |
72B |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
34077 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
34086 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
34087 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
34088 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 2 Tank |
2-6-2T |
3w/e |
26/05/1961 |
84020 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1961 |
31578 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1961 |
31583 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
07/1961 |
31714 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
7w/e |
23/08/1961 |
30921 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
7w/e |
23/08/1961 |
30925 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
31261 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/10/1961 |
31579 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
09/11/1961 |
30926 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
09/11/1961 |
30929 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
09/11/1961 |
30930 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
m/e |
09/11/1961 |
4631 |
Transfer in from: |
73H |
Dover Marine |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
m/e |
09/11/1961 |
30922 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
E1A |
4-4-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
31067 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/11/1961 |
31715 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
04/01/1962 |
30926 |
Transfer out to: |
70D |
Basingstoke |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
04/01/1962 |
30929 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Schools |
4-4-0 |
4w/e |
04/01/1962 |
30930 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/02/1962 |
31584 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
C |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/02/1962 |
31317 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
28/05/1962 |
80034 |
Transfer in from: |
73F |
Ashford |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
30537 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
30538 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
30544 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
30549 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31305 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31822 |
Transfer in from: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31825 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31826 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31827 |
Transfer in from: |
BA |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31876 |
Transfer in from: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31877 |
Transfer in from: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31878 |
Transfer in from: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31879 |
Transfer in from: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31880 |
Transfer in from: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31895 |
Transfer in from: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31896 |
Transfer in from: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31897 |
Transfer in from: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
31898 |
Transfer in from: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
80084 |
Transfer in from: |
73B |
Bricklayers Arms |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
5w/e |
02/07/1962 |
80085 |
Transfer in from: |
73J |
Tonbridge |
|
|
Steam |
57xx |
0-6-0PT |
4w/e |
30/07/1962 |
4631 |
Transfer out to: |
72C |
Yeovil Town |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/09/1962 |
75070 |
Transfer in from: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/09/1962 |
75075 |
Transfer in from: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31305 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
H |
0-4-4T |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31542 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31822 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31876 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31877 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31878 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31879 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
N1 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31880 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
17/11/1962 |
31897 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/12/1962 |
30537 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/12/1962 |
30543 |
Transfer in from: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/12/1962 |
30549 |
Transfer out to: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
23/12/1962 |
31895 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
30/12/1962 |
31896 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
U Boats |
2-6-0 |
on |
30/12/1962 |
31898 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
07/01/1963 |
30538 |
Transfer out to: |
71B |
Bournemouth |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
07/01/1963 |
30543 |
Transfer out to: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
Q |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
07/01/1963 |
30544 |
Transfer out to: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
30/01/1963 |
80012 |
Transfer in from: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
30/01/1963 |
80089 |
Transfer in from: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
3w/e |
30/01/1963 |
80094 |
Transfer in from: |
75E |
Three Bridges |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1963 |
75067 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1963 |
75068 |
Transfer in from: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
24/06/1963 |
80012 |
Transfer out to: |
70B |
Feltham |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
31410 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
31411 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
31412 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
31823 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
31824 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
75074 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
75075 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
22/07/1963 |
80081 |
Transfer out to: |
71G |
Weymouth Radipole (GWR) |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
11/08/1963 |
31818 |
Transfer in from: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
on |
11/08/1963 |
31854 |
Transfer out to: |
72A |
Exmouth Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/08/1963 |
31825 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/08/1963 |
75069 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/08/1963 |
75070 |
Transfer out to: |
70A |
Nine Elms |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
19/08/1963 |
80034 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1963 |
31826 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1963 |
31818 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Mongolipers |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
31827 |
Transfer out to: |
75B |
Redhill |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
34089 |
Transfer out to: |
70E |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
West Country/Battle of Britain |
4-6-2 |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
34100 |
Transfer out to: |
70E |
Salisbury |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
75067 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
4-6-0 |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
75068 |
Transfer out to: |
75C |
Norwood Junction |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
80068 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
80084 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
80085 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
80089 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
4w/e |
16/09/1963 |
80094 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 Tank |
2-6-4T |
6w/e |
12/10/1964 |
80067 |
Transfer out to: |
83G |
Templecombe (S&D) |
|
|
Electric |
Class 70 |
C-C |
4w/e |
22/08/1966 |
20001 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Electric |
Class 70 |
C-C |
4w/e |
22/08/1966 |
20002 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Electric |
Class 70 |
C-C |
4w/e |
22/08/1966 |
20003 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6007 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6008 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6009 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6010 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6011 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6012 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6013 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6014 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6015 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6016 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6017 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6018 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6019 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6020 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6021 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6022 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6023 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6024 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6025 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6026 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6027 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
4w/e |
14/06/1968 |
E6028 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/07/1972 |
E6027 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/08/1981 |
73118 |
To Store |
|
|
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
73118 |
Reinstated |
98Ss |
|
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
73122 |
Reinstated |
98Ss |
|
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
73123 |
Reinstated |
98Ss |
|
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
73206 |
Reinstated |
98Ss |
|
|
|
Electric |
Class 73 |
Bo-Bo |
m/e |
11/1981 |
73207 |
Reinstated |
98Ss |
|
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1987 |
33115 |
Transfer in from: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1987 |
33116 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1987 |
33117 |
Transfer in from: |
71A |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1987 |
33118 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
04/10/1987 |
33119 |
Transfer in from: |
70D |
Eastleigh |
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
10/05/1989 |
33115 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
26/10/1989 |
33119 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
25/03/1991 |
60045 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/04/1991 |
60046 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
04/04/1991 |
60047 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
29/08/1991 |
60001 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
16/01/1992 |
60086 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
06/02/1992 |
60040 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
21/02/1992 |
60093 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
09/02/1993 |
60016 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
60 |
Co-Co |
on |
11/02/1993 |
60009 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
16/04/1993 |
33118 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
33 |
Bo-Bo |
on |
01/05/1993 |
33117 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|