Depot: Stranraer
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1092 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17375 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17445 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17458 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56351 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 56372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57421 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 57440 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 600 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 611 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 623 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 1127 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 1099 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1948 | 57421 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 20/11/1948 | 56351 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 55125 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1950 | 57440 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 57340 | Transfer in from: | 28C | Carstairs | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 42749 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 45481 | Transfer in from: | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/11/1952 | 57458 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 40600 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 45481 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 16/07/1953 | 41092 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 41129 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 05/11/1953 | 41099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 41135 | Transfer in from: | 12G | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 57238 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1955 | 57315 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/04/1955 | 57315 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 25/05/1955 | 41129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 09/07/1955 | 41131 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 10/08/1955 | 41127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 25/08/1955 | 41135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 41147 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 41177 | Transfer in from: | 28B | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 17/11/1955 | 41177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/12/1955 | 41132 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 14/03/1956 | 41147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 04/1956 | 41131 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 40920 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/09/1956 | 41155 | Transfer in from: | 30D | Ayr | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 02/10/1956 | 41132 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 54492 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 54508 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Greenock Ladyburn | ||
Steam | 92 | 0-4-4T | on | 16/01/1957 | 55125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 55240 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 25/02/1957 | 41155 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 76112 | Transfer in from: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 42749 | Transfer out to: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/01/1958 | 56302 | Transfer in from: | 31E | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 13/05/1958 | 40920 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 30/06/1958 | 40566 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/07/1958 | D2574 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1958 | D2575 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | 42749 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/10/1958 | 56372 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | 45125 | Transfer in from: | 63B | Stirling | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 09/07/1959 | 40616 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 40613 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 40615 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/08/1959 | 45125 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 40629 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 40629 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 29/09/1959 | 40611 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 56302 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 40613 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 40615 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 07/12/1959 | 54508 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 40641 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 40642 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 40641 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/01/1960 | 40642 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 431 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 09/04/1960 | 55240 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 44186 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 44992 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 44789 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Inverness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 44992 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/08/1960 | 45486 | Transfer in from: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 44186 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45486 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 02/12/1960 | 40566 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1961 | 40623 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 40638 | Transfer in from: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1961 | 57238 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 72 | 4-4-0 | on | 27/11/1961 | 54492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 42738 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1962 | 40638 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 45485 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 80023 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1962 | 42749 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 711 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1962 | 57445 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1962 | 57340 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 57266 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/12/1962 | 57355 | Transfer in from: | 30C | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 46467 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1963 | 44789 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 80023 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 45384 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 80028 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1963 | 45485 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 57355 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 294 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1963 | 57375 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 46479 | Transfer in from: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 80028 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 78016 | Transfer in from: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 78026 | Transfer in from: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 46467 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 46479 | Transfer out to: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/03/1964 | D2574 | Transfer out to: | 67D | Ardrossan | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 14/05/1964 | 42738 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 45384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 44999 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 78026 | Transfer out to: | 67A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 29/10/1965 | 76112 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1965 | 76101 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1966 | 76101 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 25/06/1966 | 45463 | Transfer in from: | 67E | Dumfries | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/08/1966 | 78016 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 02/09/1966 | 44999 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1966 | 45463 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | D2575 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 29/04/1967 | D2434 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/03/1968 | D2434 | Transfer out to: | 67C | Ayr |