Depot: Stratford
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Y4 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 07/1913 | 227 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y4 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 09/1914 | 226 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y4 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 10/1914 | 228 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Y4 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 01/1921 | 229 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/07/1923 | 1636 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 09/1923 | 1639 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 03/1924 | 1674 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1924 | 1632 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1924 | 1633 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 05/1924 | 1634 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 1925 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 08/03/1925 | 07228 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/06/1925 | 4634 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/07/1925 | 4652 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/07/1925 | 4633 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/08/1925 | 4636 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/08/1925 | 1639 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/08/1925 | 4656 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/04/1926 | 4653 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/04/1926 | 4632 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 27/05/1926 | 07228 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 03/01/1927 | 07228 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/01/1927 | 4656 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/01/1927 | 4674 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1927 | 4653 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Y5 | 0-4-0ST | on | 30/06/1927 | 07228 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/07/1927 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/09/1927 | 4675 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/10/1927 | 4662 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1927 | 1269 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1927 | 1295 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/10/1927 | 1296 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1927 | 1265 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/10/1927 | 1484 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1927 | 1266 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1927 | 1267 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1927 | 1268 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/10/1927 | 4644 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/11/1927 | 4663 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/01/1928 | 4676 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1928 | 4655 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/02/1928 | 4669 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/02/1928 | 4687 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/03/1928 | 4650 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/03/1928 | 4690 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/03/1928 | 4688 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/10/1928 | 4655 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/11/1928 | 4674 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1928 | 2712 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1928 | 2711 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1928 | 2713 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1928 | 2714 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1928 | 2715 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1928 | 2716 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1928 | 2718 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/12/1928 | 4687 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1928 | 2720 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1929 | 4644 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1929 | 2717 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/01/1929 | 4663 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1929 | 2720 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/05/1929 | 2726 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/05/1929 | 2725 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1929 | 2727 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/05/1929 | 2729 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/05/1929 | 2730 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/06/1929 | 4676 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1929 | 2728 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1929 | 2774 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/10/1929 | 2773 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1929 | 2775 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/10/1929 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1929 | 2776 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1929 | 2777 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1929 | 2778 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/11/1929 | 4652 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 30/11/1929 | 4652 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 30/11/1929 | 4662 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/12/1929 | 4662 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1929 | 2728 | Transfer out to: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 14/12/1929 | 4652 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/12/1929 | 4652 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 21/12/1929 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 21/12/1929 | 4688 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/12/1929 | 4664 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/01/1930 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1930 | 2777 | Transfer out to: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1930 | 2777 | Transfer in from: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/01/1930 | 4631 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1930 | 1296 | Transfer out to: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1930 | 1296 | Transfer in from: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/02/1930 | 4688 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1930 | 2777 | Transfer out to: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 01/02/1930 | 4690 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1930 | 2777 | Transfer in from: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/02/1930 | 4690 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 08/03/1930 | 4688 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/03/1930 | 4688 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/03/1930 | 1266 | Transfer out to: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 15/03/1930 | 4674 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/03/1930 | 4674 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/04/1930 | 2728 | Transfer in from: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/04/1930 | 2730 | Transfer out to: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/04/1930 | 2730 | Transfer in from: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/04/1930 | 2728 | Transfer out to: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1930 | 1266 | Transfer in from: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | 14/06/1930 | 4662 | Transfer out to: | STR | Southend Victoria | |||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/06/1930 | 4662 | Transfer in from: | STR | Southend Victoria | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/08/1930 | 2725 | Transfer out to: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1930 | 2725 | Transfer in from: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1930 | 2728 | Transfer in from: | ? | Southend on Sea | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/09/1930 | 4650 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/12/1930 | 4650 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/10/1931 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/10/1931 | 4650 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/12/1931 | 4674 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/12/1931 | 4677 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/12/1931 | 4650 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/12/1931 | 4647 | Transfer in from: | 32E | Yarmouth Vauxhall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1932 | 2772 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/05/1932 | 4664 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 15/09/1932 | 4631 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/05/1933 | 1295 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1933 | 1296 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/08/1933 | 1265 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1933 | 1484 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/10/1934 | 4683 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1934 | 2969 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1935 | 2965 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/08/1935 | 2942 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1935 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1935 | 2943 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1935 | 2944 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1935 | 2703 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1935 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1935 | 2985 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 11/1935 | 7372 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1935 | 1457 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1935 | 2725 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1936 | 1824 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/10/1936 | 4683 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1936 | 1870 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1936 | 1869 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/01/1937 | 2995 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/05/1938 | 4650 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/05/1938 | 1940 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1938 | 1933 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/07/1938 | 1984 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/08/1938 | 2703 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/08/1938 | 2772 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/10/1938 | 4687 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1939 | 2703 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/03/1939 | 2772 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2720 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2721 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2722 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2723 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2992 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2703 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2714 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1939 | 2777 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1939 | 2949 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1939 | 2774 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1939 | 2775 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1939 | 2772 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2703 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2714 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2724 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2777 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2989 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2719 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2720 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1939 | 2992 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/02/1940 | 4675 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/02/1940 | 4652 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1940 | 1267 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1940 | 1269 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/04/1940 | 4662 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/04/1940 | 4687 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1940 | 1952 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1940 | 1277 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1940 | 1952 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2991 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2992 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2993 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2723 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2726 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1940 | 2728 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1940 | 1933 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1941 | 1940 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1941 | 2726 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1941 | 2718 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 21/06/1941 | 3401 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1941 | 2720 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1941 | 2716 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1941 | 2716 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/08/1941 | 2720 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1941 | 1869 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1941 | 1266 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1941 | 2965 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1941 | 2969 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/10/1941 | 2949 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1941 | 2719 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1941 | 2714 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1941 | 2989 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1941 | 2714 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1941 | 3401 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/11/1941 | 4669 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/11/1941 | 4688 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/11/1941 | 4690 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/12/1941 | 4647 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/02/1942 | 4677 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1943 | 1965 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1943 | 2771 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/05/1943 | 1269 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/05/1943 | 2772 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/06/1943 | 2775 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1943 | 1268 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/06/1943 | 1267 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/06/1943 | 2946 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1943 | 2951 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1943 | 8302 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/07/1943 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/07/1943 | 8302 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/09/1943 | 1930 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1943 | 2992 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/09/1943 | 2973 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1943 | 2973 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1943 | 2953 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1943 | 2775 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1943 | 2778 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1944 | 8305 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1944 | 8306 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1944 | 2721 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1944 | 2771 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1944 | 2942 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1944 | 8000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1944 | 8001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/09/1944 | 1984 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/09/1944 | 2985 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1944 | 1930 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/09/1944 | 2772 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/09/1944 | 2777 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1944 | 2953 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1944 | 2776 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1945 | 2703 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1945 | 2993 | Transfer out to: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1945 | 8309 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/03/1945 | 8310 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/03/1945 | 8002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/03/1945 | 8003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1945 | 8001 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1945 | 8000 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1945 | 8002 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1945 | 2721 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1945 | 2728 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1945 | 2771 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/06/1945 | 2942 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1945 | 8309 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1945 | 8305 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1946 | 4687 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1946 | 4688 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1946 | 4690 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/01/1946 | 4677 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1946 | 1269 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 2718 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 2720 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 2723 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 1267 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1946 | 1277 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/01/1946 | 2991 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1946 | 8306 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/02/1946 | 1777 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/02/1946 | 4677 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/02/1946 | 1778 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/02/1946 | 1780 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/04/1946 | 2771 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/04/1946 | 2773 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/04/1946 | 1040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/04/1946 | 1041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1946 | 4727 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1946 | 4733 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | DES1 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/06/1946 | 8003 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/07/1946 | 1041 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1946 | 1000 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/07/1946 | 1040 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1946 | 1001 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1946 | 1005 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/08/1946 | 1006 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1946 | 1008 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1946 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1946 | 1005 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1946 | 1104 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1946 | 1005 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/12/1946 | 1759 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1946 | 1001 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1946 | 2951 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1946 | 4913 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 28/12/1946 | 1759 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/01/1947 | 1730 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1947 | 1119 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1947 | 1005 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1947 | 1006 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1947 | 1008 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/01/1947 | 1003 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1947 | 1003 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/03/1947 | 4788 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/03/1947 | 1135 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1947 | 4875 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/04/1947 | 4899 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/04/1947 | 4789 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/04/1947 | 1149 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/05/1947 | 1863 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1947 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1947 | 4788 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/05/1947 | 1863 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/05/1947 | 1730 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1947 | 1004 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1947 | 1135 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/05/1947 | 1149 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/07/1947 | 4730 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/07/1947 | 4953 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/08/1947 | 1226 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1947 | 1004 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1947 | 1104 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1947 | 1232 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1947 | 1233 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1947 | 1234 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/09/1947 | 1235 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1947 | 4877 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/09/1947 | 4963 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1947 | 4839 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/09/1947 | 4840 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1759 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1761 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1765 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1767 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1777 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1778 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 1780 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 4727 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1947 | 4765 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/09/1947 | 1236 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/10/1947 | 1734 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/10/1947 | 1721 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/10/1947 | 1738 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/10/1947 | 1748 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1740 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1742 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1743 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1752 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1947 | 1754 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1947 | 1737 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1947 | 1745 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1947 | 1746 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1947 | 1753 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1947 | 1253 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1947 | 1254 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/11/1947 | 1253 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/11/1947 | 1742 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/11/1947 | 1743 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/11/1947 | 1748 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/12/1947 | 1738 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/12/1947 | 1264 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1947 | 1254 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1947 | 1264 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1514 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1515 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1517 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1525 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1530 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1533 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1537 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1538 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1541 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1542 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1545 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1546 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1547 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1549 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1550 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1554 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1555 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1556 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1558 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1559 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1565 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1567 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1568 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1571 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1572 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1573 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1574 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1575 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1578 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1579 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1580 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1639 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1655 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2532 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2538 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2587 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2602 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4677 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4681 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4682 | Snapshot | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4685 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4686 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4691 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4695 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4696 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5354 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5363 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5375 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5381 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5387 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5388 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5392 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5393 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5395 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5397 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5402 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5418 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5427 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5431 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5434 | Snapshot | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5436 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5441 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5444 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5446 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5449 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5450 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5452 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5454 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5455 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5463 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5464 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5466 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5468 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5475 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5476 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5511 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5523 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5528 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5536 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5541 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 68135 | Snapshot | ||||
Diesel | Y11 | 0-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 68188 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7159 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7161 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7168 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7169 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7170 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7172 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7173 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7179 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7180 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7181 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7183 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7185 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7191 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7192 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7193 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7194 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7195 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7196 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7197 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7198 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7199 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7200 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7201 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7202 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7203 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7205 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7208 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7209 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7210 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7212 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7214 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7215 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7216 | Snapshot | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7217 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7218 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7219 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7220 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7221 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7222 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7224 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7225 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7227 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7228 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7230 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7231 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7232 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7322 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7385 | Snapshot | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7668 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7669 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7671 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7672 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7673 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7677 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7679 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7680 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7681 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8174 | Snapshot | ||||
Diesel | Y11 | 0-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8189 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J65 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8215 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8381 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8388 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8496 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8500 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8508 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8513 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8522 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8523 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8526 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8532 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8534 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8538 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8545 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8548 | Snapshot | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8548 | Snapshot | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8549 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8554 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8556 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8557 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8563 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8569 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8573 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8574 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8575 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8576 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8577 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8578 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8589 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8590 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8591 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8592 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8593 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8594 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8601 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8608 | Snapshot | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8613 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8617 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8619 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8621 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8626 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8631 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8633 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8639 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8643 | Snapshot | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8644 | Snapshot | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8646 | Snapshot | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8647 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8648 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8649 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8652 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8653 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8661 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8663 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8666 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8905 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8924 | Snapshot | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8950 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8963 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8965 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8967 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8977 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9600 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9601 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9602 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9604 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9606 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9607 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9608 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9609 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9610 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9611 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9613 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9614 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9615 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9616 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9617 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9618 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9619 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9620 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9621 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9622 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9623 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9626 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9627 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9628 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9631 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9632 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9633 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9635 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9636 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9637 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9638 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9639 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9640 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9641 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9642 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9643 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9644 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9645 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9646 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9647 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9648 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9649 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9650 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9651 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9652 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9653 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9654 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9655 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9656 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9657 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9659 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9661 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9662 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9663 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9664 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9665 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9666 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9667 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9668 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9669 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9670 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9671 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9672 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9673 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9674 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9677 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9678 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9679 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9680 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9681 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9682 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9683 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9684 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9685 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9686 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9687 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9688 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9693 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9697 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9699 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9701 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9702 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9704 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9705 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9706 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9708 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9709 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9710 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9711 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9712 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9713 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9714 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9715 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9716 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9717 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9718 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9719 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9720 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9721 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9722 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9723 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9724 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9725 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9726 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9727 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9728 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9729 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9730 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9731 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9732 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9733 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 1226 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1948 | 4953 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8642 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7191 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7194 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7195 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7196 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 7230 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8554 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8643 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 8650 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1000 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1001 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1104 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 01/02/1948 | 1761 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1000 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1001 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1104 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 8571 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 8596 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1001 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1104 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1555 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1556 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1557 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 1558 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 5436 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 7231 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 7232 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 1232 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 4783 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1948 | 4789 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4676 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 4690 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 7204 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 7206 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5440 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5453 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5402 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 8509 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 8593 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 4680 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8510 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 8517 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/03/1948 | 5418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 1611 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 1610 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 1613 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 67218 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7161 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7168 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7169 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7170 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7172 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7173 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7179 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7180 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7181 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 24/04/1948 | 7185 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 1545 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 5507 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7269 | Transfer in from: | SBK | Starbeck | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 7279 | Transfer in from: | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 1730 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 1761 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1948 | 61008 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 1730 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 1761 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5385 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5436 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5542 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 61008 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7224 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8221 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8519 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8521 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8629 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 1730 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 1761 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 61008 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 7204 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8500 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 8548 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 1516 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 1530 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 1535 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J65 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8215 | Transfer out to: | YB | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 7213 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 8629 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 7224 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/07/1948 | 61335 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/07/1948 | 67677 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | m/e | 08/1948 | 68135 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/08/1948 | 61336 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 67677 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8378 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8548 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8630 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 8631 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 2572 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 61533 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 67677 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61335 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1948 | 61336 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | on | 23/09/1948 | 2602 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 1602 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J70 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 68221 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 69708 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 69679 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1948 | 1517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 8636 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 7673 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 9700 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 9701 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1948 | 61336 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1948 | 61335 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 61335 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 61336 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 67733 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 67734 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 61335 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 61336 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/11/1948 | 5381 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 65412 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 7201 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 7220 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8630 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 67222 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 67227 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8608 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1948 | 5385 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 67739 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 67740 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 67745 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/12/1948 | 67746 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 12/12/1948 | 7676 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1948 | 7681 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 16/12/1948 | 7676 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/12/1948 | 7681 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 61620 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7671 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7679 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7680 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 61540 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 61547 | Transfer out to: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 69699 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 7671 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9619 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9620 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9621 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 9697 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 67740 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 67745 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 67746 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 7680 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 4765 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 4783 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 64730 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1949 | 64787 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 4765 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 67731 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 67732 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 67737 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 67738 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 4765 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 62509 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 65392 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 65395 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 67676 | Transfer out to: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 68545 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 7667 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 7671 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 7679 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 8378 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/01/1949 | 8905 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 67728 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 1648 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 61830 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 61831 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 61849 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 67725 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 67726 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 67736 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 61537 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 68381 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | 68388 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 67668 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 67721 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 67727 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 67730 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 7667 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 7671 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 69709 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 9707 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 7673 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B2 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 1639 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 69706 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 69615 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8608 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8638 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 9619 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 61609 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 68557 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 69614 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 69615 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 69635 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8571 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8630 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 8636 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1949 | 4768 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1949 | 64766 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1949 | 64767 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 69710 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 9711 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 61510 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 9711 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 9672 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 9717 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 18/06/1949 | 9674 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/1949 | 65369 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | m/e | 07/1949 | 67706 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 5434 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 5475 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 07/1949 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 07/1949 | 7224 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 65369 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 65369 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 67706 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 67706 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 67762 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1949 | 61098 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Electric | EB1 | Bo-Bo | 08/1949 | 26510 | Reinstated | 98S | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 65363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 65387 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1949 | 65393 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 61098 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 67718 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 61098 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 7385 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 67761 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/08/1949 | 61130 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/08/1949 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/08/1949 | 61282 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1949 | 1036 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 1036 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 61130 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 61282 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 7238 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 7239 | Transfer in from: | SL | South Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 1036 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 61130 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 61282 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1949 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1949 | 61109 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 65397 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 61109 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 68380 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8546 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8588 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8636 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 8650 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 61109 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 68607 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 09/09/1949 | 7187 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 65456 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 67758 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1949 | 65431 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 67160 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 4768 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 64766 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 4907 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 64839 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1949 | 64840 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 4768 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64766 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64767 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 67153 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 4768 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 64766 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1949 | 64767 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1949 | 64767 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1949 | 61177 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 61177 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 61801 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 61815 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 61817 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 61177 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 61538 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 90028 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 67758 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 67762 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1949 | 64733 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1949 | 64873 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 17/10/1949 | 1737 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 18/10/1949 | 61740 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 1835 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 61805 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 61820 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 61834 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67715 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 67761 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1949 | 65412 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1949 | 65375 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 67199 | Transfer out to: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 67667 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 67671 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1949 | 61144 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 8571 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 65369 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 67715 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 67718 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/11/1949 | 1036 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 61541 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 67730 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68491 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68616 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 8527 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 8571 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 61565 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 67215 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 67225 | Transfer out to: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68556 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 68578 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 7216 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 7220 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 7228 | Transfer out to: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1949 | 8571 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 65436 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 68491 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 8527 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 68491 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 69613 | Transfer out to: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 69615 | Transfer out to: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 69712 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 69716 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 69727 | Transfer out to: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 8527 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 04/12/1949 | 7216 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/12/1949 | 61175 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | on | 09/12/1949 | 7216 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 61175 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 67730 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 68616 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 69620 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 61175 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 68616 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 69677 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 7220 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 7239 | Transfer out to: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 8924 | Transfer out to: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 9644 | Transfer out to: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/12/1949 | 61171 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 61171 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 67722 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 61171 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 7238 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 61205 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 61554 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 69639 | Transfer out to: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 67723 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 67153 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 7187 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 7201 | Transfer out to: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 9640 | Transfer out to: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 65354 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 65427 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 65542 | Transfer out to: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 67221 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 8554 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 67219 | Transfer out to: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/01/1950 | 68653 | Transfer out to: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 90028 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 29/01/1950 | 67719 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/01/1950 | 67673 | Transfer out to: | MID | Middlesbrough | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 68607 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/03/1950 | 61360 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1950 | 61361 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 1737 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 61001 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 26/03/1950 | 61730 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1950 | 61362 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 04/1950 | 67160 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 04/1950 | 67183 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/04/1950 | 61363 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 61810 | Transfer in from: | 37B | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1950 | 61840 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 16/04/1950 | 69930 | Transfer in from: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 69675 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 69712 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/04/1950 | 69675 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 61001 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 61227 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 69675 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 69712 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 9672 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 69675 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 06/05/1950 | 69712 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 61880 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 68606 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 69699 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 69716 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 69727 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 9697 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 9700 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 9701 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 67706 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 67719 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 68522 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/05/1950 | 68606 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61654 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61880 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 68606 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69699 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69716 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69727 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 9674 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 9697 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 9700 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 5444 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61620 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 61880 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62532 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62572 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 62587 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 68606 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69699 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69711 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69716 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69717 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69726 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 69727 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 9697 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 31/05/1950 | 9700 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 4783 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64779 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1950 | 64780 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 4783 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 64780 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 64770 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1950 | 64777 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61654 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 64780 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 61654 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 64780 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 65441 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 65468 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1950 | 5454 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 68608 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 68608 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/07/1950 | 68616 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1950 | 69701 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/07/1950 | 8500 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | w/e | 30/07/1950 | 62791 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 69703 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | on | 27/08/1950 | 69930 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 61621 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1950 | 61655 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 68557 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 68527 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1950 | 68608 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 61621 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 68557 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 61621 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/09/1950 | 68557 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/09/1950 | 69711 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 5444 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 5454 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1950 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 68629 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 61130 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1950 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 68638 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 69642 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 69711 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 69712 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/10/1950 | 69716 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/10/1950 | 61130 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1950 | 4708 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1950 | 64767 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1950 | 64771 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61130 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1950 | 61130 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 5444 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 5454 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 68629 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 5444 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 5454 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 68629 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 4708 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1950 | 4773 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 4708 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 4708 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 65361 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 65440 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/10/1950 | 69642 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/10/1950 | 69711 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/10/1950 | 69712 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/10/1950 | 69716 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65440 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69642 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69711 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69712 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69716 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D15 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 62538 | Transfer out to: | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 65388 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69642 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69711 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69712 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 69716 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 62572 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65440 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 65440 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1950 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 62572 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 68630 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 62572 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 68636 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61192 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 68630 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 68630 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 05/01/1951 | 70000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/01/1951 | 4773 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 69703 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4773 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 64767 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68387 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68596 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 69703 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4773 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68596 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 68649 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 69703 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 02/1951 | 68387 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 8654 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 65476 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 14/02/1951 | 70001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 68387 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 68596 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 8654 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 68596 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 8654 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 68527 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/02/1951 | 68601 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 01/03/1951 | 70003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/03/1951 | 61227 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 06/03/1951 | 70002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 64732 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/03/1951 | 64966 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68527 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 69726 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8632 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | E4 | 2-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 62791 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65440 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68527 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 30/03/1951 | 70004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 69726 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 70004 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 69726 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 70004 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 64732 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/04/1951 | 64966 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 07/04/1951 | 70005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 61654 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 61621 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 61654 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69830 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69832 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69833 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69835 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69837 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69839 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69840 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/04/1951 | 69842 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 12/04/1951 | 70006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 68556 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69830 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69832 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69833 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69835 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69837 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69839 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69840 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69842 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 67727 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 67739 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 68500 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69830 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69832 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69833 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69835 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69837 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69839 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69840 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 69842 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/04/1951 | 69838 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 15/04/1951 | 69841 | Transfer in from: | DAR | Darlington | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 64771 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 68556 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 69838 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 69841 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 68556 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 69838 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 69841 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 25/04/1951 | 70007 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 69638 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 61621 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 69620 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/05/1951 | 61227 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 61227 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 61227 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70006 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 12/05/1951 | 70007 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/05/1951 | 69833 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/05/1951 | 69835 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/05/1951 | 69839 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/05/1951 | 69840 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 13/05/1951 | 69842 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 34039 | Transfer in from: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 34057 | Transfer in from: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 34065 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61621 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 67701 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61514 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61542 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61568 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 61621 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1951 | 64781 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1951 | 69830 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1951 | 69832 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1951 | 69837 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 20/05/1951 | 69838 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61650 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61664 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 67727 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 67739 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61559 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 61567 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 62565 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | D16 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 62572 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1951 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/06/1951 | 61721 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/06/1951 | 61734 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 61660 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 61672 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 61621 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1951 | 61658 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61650 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61660 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61664 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61672 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 65476 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67727 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67739 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61650 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61660 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61664 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 61672 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 65444 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67727 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 23/06/1951 | 67739 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64770 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64781 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64874 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1951 | 64876 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64770 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64781 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 68565 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 68653 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64770 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 64781 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 68661 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 61515 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 69717 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1951 | 64779 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1951 | 64770 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | A5 | 4-6-2T | on | 08/07/1951 | 69841 | Transfer out to: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 65440 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 65444 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 68565 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 68653 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69701 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 65453 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 68565 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 68653 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69637 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69643 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69678 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 69720 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 64779 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 65440 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 65444 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69701 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 64779 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 65440 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 65444 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 67269 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 67279 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 67322 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 28/07/1951 | 69701 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/08/1951 | 61525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1951 | 64773 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69614 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 69621 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 61580 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 69614 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 69621 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 69614 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 69621 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 61661 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 69678 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 61664 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 65518 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 65572 | Transfer in from: | KL | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 70004 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1951 | 64803 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1951 | 64958 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1951 | 64959 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 61661 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64784 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64803 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64958 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64959 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65518 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65572 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 69678 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 70006 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 61661 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64803 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64958 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 64959 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65518 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 65572 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 69678 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 69717 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61191 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61329 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61370 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61372 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61373 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61375 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61098 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61130 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61144 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61171 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61175 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 61177 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61191 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61329 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61370 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61372 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61373 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61375 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61191 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61329 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61370 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61372 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 61375 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 61567 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 61651 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 61662 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 61667 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 67188 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 67204 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 67215 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 67217 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 67217 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 69672 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 69678 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 69717 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 70006 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 61580 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 61579 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 65545 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1951 | 65588 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 69637 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 69643 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 65525 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 65538 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 65546 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 65555 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 65563 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 68608 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 68616 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 70015 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61636 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 61643 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65525 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65538 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65546 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65555 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65563 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 68608 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 68616 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65525 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65538 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65546 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65555 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 65563 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 68608 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 68616 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/02/1952 | 68550 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 34089 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61643 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61646 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65552 | Transfer in from: | MC | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 65566 | Transfer in from: | 32F | Yarmouth Beach | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 68550 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 70005 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 61643 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 68550 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 70005 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/02/1952 | 68552 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61646 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65552 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65566 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 70005 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61636 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 61646 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65552 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65566 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65588 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 70005 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J66 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 03/1952 | 68380 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/03/1952 | 12103 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 61630 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 67195 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 67219 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68550 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68552 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 70016 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 61605 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 65545 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 65566 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68174 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68550 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68552 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/04/1952 | 12104 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/04/1952 | 12105 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 34057 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 34065 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 65552 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/05/1952 | 12106 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/05/1952 | 12107 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/05/1952 | 12108 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1952 | 12109 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1952 | 12110 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 67679 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 68648 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/06/1952 | 61001 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/06/1952 | 61009 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1952 | 61192 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 34039 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | West Country/Battle of Britain | 4-6-2 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 34089 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61604 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61631 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61655 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 61666 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69621 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69654 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69716 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/07/1952 | 12111 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 61604 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 61631 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 61655 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 61666 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69502 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 69590 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 61604 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 61631 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 61655 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 61666 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/07/1952 | 68592 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69559 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69612 | Transfer in from: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69635 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69677 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69502 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 69612 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69612 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69635 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69677 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69590 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69612 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69635 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 69677 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 61131 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1952 | 61280 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 61605 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 68579 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69550 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69555 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69558 | Transfer in from: | HAT | Hatfield | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 61643 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 67217 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69648 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 69704 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 61033 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 64876 | Transfer in from: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/09/1952 | 64985 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61033 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61131 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61280 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61605 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64876 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64985 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 65587 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68579 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69672 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69716 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61033 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61131 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61280 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 61605 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64876 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 64985 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 65518 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 68579 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69550 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69555 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 69558 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61114 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61157 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61737 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61745 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61746 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61752 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61753 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61754 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61759 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61761 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61765 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61767 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61777 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61778 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 05/10/1952 | 61780 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/10/1952 | 61863 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61862 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61921 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61942 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61951 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61963 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61977 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 61982 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 65587 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69672 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69716 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69717 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 65587 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 67195 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69672 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69716 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69717 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/10/1952 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1952 | 61378 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1952 | 61384 | Transfer in from: | 37C | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1952 | 61399 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1952 | 61033 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1952 | 61131 | Transfer out to: | 37A | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1952 | 61157 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61114 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61378 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61384 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61399 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61862 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61863 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61921 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61942 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61951 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61963 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61977 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61982 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 65443 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61114 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61378 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61384 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61399 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61862 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61863 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61921 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61942 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61951 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61963 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61977 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 61982 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 69617 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 69672 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 69719 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65443 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65443 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 65541 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 68632 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68557 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/12/1952 | 12134 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 68632 | Transfer in from: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 23/12/1952 | 70036 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 24/12/1952 | 70037 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 65541 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68632 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 67214 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 68632 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/01/1953 | 12135 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/01/1953 | 12136 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65541 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/01/1953 | 65541 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 29/01/1953 | 70038 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61600 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61601 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61609 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61668 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61567 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61571 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61572 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61574 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61580 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 61631 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 67206 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 68523 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 20/03/1953 | 70041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68561 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68601 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68649 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68661 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69550 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 61630 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 61666 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 69673 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 09/04/1953 | 70042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 67736 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 61630 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67194 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 68648 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67188 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67204 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 67739 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/05/1953 | 61109 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1953 | 61329 | Transfer out to: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/05/1953 | 61109 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/05/1953 | 61329 | Transfer in from: | SR | To Southern Region | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61663 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 61666 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 67363 | Transfer in from: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 70039 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 70040 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/06/1953 | 64765 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67724 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 67736 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 70034 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 8568 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1953 | 65466 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 70016 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68655 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68657 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68658 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68659 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 12105 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68491 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68606 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68608 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/08/1953 | 68616 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1953 | 61604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1953 | 64765 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 70015 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1953 | 61191 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 12103 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 12104 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/09/1953 | 67363 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1953 | 61205 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/09/1953 | 61282 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 12104 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61654 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61667 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61672 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 61835 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 67737 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/11/1953 | 68548 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 61618 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 61621 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 61634 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 61645 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 67188 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 67729 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 67737 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69719 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 64695 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 65541 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 65572 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 68508 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/11/1953 | 69732 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/11/1953 | 64959 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1953 | 76034 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 41952 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 41975 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61512 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61523 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61555 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61556 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61557 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61558 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61579 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69613 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69617 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61634 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61645 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61646 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61650 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61651 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 61662 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69635 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 69649 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 12103 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 41944 | Transfer in from: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 41949 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 41970 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65545 | Transfer in from: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65552 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 61618 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 61621 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 61630 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 64690 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 64691 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65538 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 65587 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 68569 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 41936 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 41951 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 41976 | Transfer in from: | 13A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1954 | 61249 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/02/1954 | 61114 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69615 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69620 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69621 | Transfer in from: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 68520 | Transfer out to: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 68521 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69631 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69637 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 69650 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 61634 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 61666 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 68589 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 68529 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 68496 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 12105 | Transfer in from: | 36B | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 61630 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 61801 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 61815 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 92014 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/08/1954 | 64696 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/08/1954 | 68534 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 67199 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/09/1954 | 67387 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1954 | 64810 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1954 | 64890 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1954 | 64973 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 61801 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 61815 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 67218 | Transfer in from: | YAR | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 67386 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 69257 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 69692 | Transfer in from: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 69708 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 67199 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 67218 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 67387 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 68594 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 69257 | Transfer out to: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 12134 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | C12 | 4-4-2T | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 67386 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 69692 | Transfer out to: | 38B | Annesley | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 25/12/1954 | 69708 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1955 | 65552 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64729 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64750 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64751 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64799 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64805 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64807 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64828 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1955 | 64838 | Transfer in from: | 40D | Tuxford | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/02/1955 | 90062 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65535 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68500 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68578 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68636 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 69720 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 90443 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 90526 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 90551 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 90668 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 65500 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68554 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/02/1955 | 68561 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | w/e | 14/03/1955 | 67197 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 67718 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 67720 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 68893 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 61520 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 90443 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 90526 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 90668 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1955 | 64810 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1955 | 64828 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1955 | 64838 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1955 | 61523 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 13065 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67218 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 68499 | Transfer in from: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 67194 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 68601 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 05/1955 | 67213 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 61645 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 14/05/1955 | 69720 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1955 | 64729 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1955 | 64751 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1955 | 64803 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 64689 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 64693 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 64694 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1955 | 11121 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 04/07/1955 | 67210 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1955 | 11122 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 61668 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1955 | 64783 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/07/1955 | 11123 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 15/08/1955 | 67198 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 11110 | Transfer in from: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 11112 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 68642 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1955 | 11127 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1955 | 64783 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1955 | 11128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/09/1955 | 12128 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/09/1955 | 13065 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 19/09/1955 | 67215 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y4 | 0-4-0T | on | 19/09/1955 | 68125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1955 | 64890 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/09/1955 | 64958 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1955 | 11129 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 29/09/1955 | 68590 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1955 | 11130 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 30/09/1955 | 13162 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/10/1955 | 11131 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 11109 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 11126 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 61654 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 61668 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 61672 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 65519 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68499 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68507 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68527 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68529 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68556 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 68626 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/10/1955 | 61008 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1955 | 11132 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 12/11/1955 | 68519 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/11/1955 | 11133 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 23/11/1955 | 67205 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1955 | 11134 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1955 | 64876 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1955 | 64985 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1955 | 11135 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 12127 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 12130 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67221 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67227 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67228 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 90508 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 90660 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67188 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 67192 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68550 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68552 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68565 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68621 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 68629 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 69618 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 12132 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 67235 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 68617 | Transfer out to: | 38D | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 69629 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 5w/e | 21/01/1956 | 92014 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | on | 24/01/1956 | 11503 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 12123 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 12124 | Transfer in from: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 12125 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 12126 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 12133 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68508 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68638 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 41949 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68661 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68662 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68666 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68893 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68950 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68963 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68965 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68967 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/02/1956 | 68977 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | on | 19/02/1956 | 11504 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | on | 19/02/1956 | 11505 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/03/1956 | 68517 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 11100 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 11124 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12134 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/03/1956 | 61392 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 67194 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 68529 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 69619 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 69672 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 67228 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 25/03/1956 | 61392 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/03/1956 | 13298 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | on | 30/03/1956 | 11506 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/04/1956 | 13299 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/04/1956 | 13300 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1956 | 13301 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/04/1956 | 13302 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 61634 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | Y4 | 0-4-0T | on | 23/04/1956 | 68127 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1956 | 13303 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1956 | 11126 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1956 | 11128 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 41936 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/05/1956 | 65370 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 67227 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 68638 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 69612 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 69615 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 61645 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 61648 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 21/07/1956 | 61660 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/08/1956 | 69559 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | Y11 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/09/1956 | 15098 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1956 | 61286 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1956 | 61384 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61645 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61646 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61648 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61660 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 69720 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 41975 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 61982 | Transfer out to: | 38A | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/09/1956 | 68579 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 10/1956 | 67194 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 10/1956 | 67211 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Y4 | 0-4-0T | on | 08/10/1956 | 68128 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 61645 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 61646 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 68508 | Transfer out to: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 69550 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 61227 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64764 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64771 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64776 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64799 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1956 | 64805 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1956 | 61336 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 06/11/1956 | 67219 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 67230 | Transfer in from: | LOW | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61555 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61556 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61557 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61558 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61606 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 61611 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 67728 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 67736 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69672 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69675 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69721 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69727 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 69733 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | Y11 | 0-4-0 | on | 21/11/1956 | 15099 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 67195 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 67214 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 15/12/1956 | 68516 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 17/12/1956 | 67201 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 19/12/1956 | 41951 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 19/12/1956 | 41970 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 19/12/1956 | 41976 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 29/12/1956 | 41944 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 29/12/1956 | 41952 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1957 | 61512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1957 | 61550 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1957 | 61578 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1957 | 61579 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61000 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61360 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61361 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61363 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61370 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1957 | 61373 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 10/01/1957 | 67208 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 11508 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61606 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61608 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 67199 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 9401 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61516 | Transfer out to: | 35B | Grantham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61519 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61575 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61576 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61600 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61601 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 61602 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 68654 | Transfer out to: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 05/02/1957 | 67199 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 61111 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1957 | 61311 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 11507 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 90298 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 90498 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 11124 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 61546 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 61549 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 61801 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69616 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69617 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69619 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/02/1957 | 69620 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 61164 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 61182 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1957 | 61279 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 18/02/1957 | 67209 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 65506 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 65514 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | B12 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61573 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61805 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61830 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 61831 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 69621 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1957 | 64799 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1957 | 64805 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 64873 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1957 | 64874 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 29/04/1957 | 68516 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/05/1957 | 65523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/05/1957 | 64962 | Transfer in from: | 39B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 41936 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 41949 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 41975 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 68543 | Transfer in from: | BOS | Boston | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61005 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61006 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1957 | 61171 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 61600 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 61601 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 9401 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/09/1957 | 61089 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 10/10/1957 | D5500 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 61667 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 69679 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 69696 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 69709 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 69721 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 67738 | Transfer out to: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 69613 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | Y4 | 0-4-0T | on | 23/10/1957 | 68126 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 31/10/1957 | 67221 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 04/11/1957 | 67193 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 69691 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 11123 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 69679 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1957 | 64702 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/11/1957 | 64804 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 25/11/1957 | D5501 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1957 | D3497 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 16/12/1957 | D5502 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 16/12/1957 | 67202 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 16/12/1957 | 67203 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 20/12/1957 | 67200 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/12/1957 | D3498 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1957 | D3499 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1958 | D3500 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/5 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/01/1958 | 13162 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 67228 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 09/01/1958 | D5503 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/01/1958 | D3501 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/01/1958 | 61601 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/01/1958 | D3502 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 30/01/1958 | D5504 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 13298 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 20/02/1958 | D5505 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1958 | D3608 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/03/1958 | D3609 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1958 | 61003 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1958 | 61004 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/03/1958 | 61135 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/03/1958 | D3610 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 47282 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 47311 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41949 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 41975 | Transfer out to: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 61815 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 61834 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 61942 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1958 | 64787 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1958 | 64788 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/03/1958 | 64896 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 10/03/1958 | 67218 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 12/03/1958 | 68576 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 13/03/1958 | D5506 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 14/03/1958 | D200 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/03/1958 | 64769 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/03/1958 | 64772 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/03/1958 | 64774 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 03/04/1958 | D201 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 11123 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 47306 | Transfer in from: | 35C | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 65504 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 65505 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 65548 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 65556 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3501 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | D3502 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 61820 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/04/1958 | 61921 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1958 | 64764 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1958 | 64773 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1958 | 61003 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/04/1958 | 61004 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 17/04/1958 | D5508 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/04/1958 | D5507 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/04/1958 | 64782 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 21/04/1958 | 67228 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 28/04/1958 | 69609 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/04/1958 | D202 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/05/1958 | D5509 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/05/1958 | 68588 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/05/1958 | 65535 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 05/05/1958 | 67212 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 05/05/1958 | 67214 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/05/1958 | 68546 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/05/1958 | 68607 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 05/05/1958 | 69601 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | F5 | 2-4-2T | on | 06/05/1958 | 67195 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/05/1958 | 68568 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 08/05/1958 | 68632 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D201 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | D3500 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 61609 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 61610 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 61660 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 61667 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | F6 | 2-4-2T | on | 13/05/1958 | 67230 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/05/1958 | D3495 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/05/1958 | 61605 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 16/05/1958 | D203 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 16/05/1958 | D5510 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 19/05/1958 | 69643 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1958 | 64764 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1958 | 64779 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/05/1958 | D204 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/05/1958 | D8400 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/06/1958 | 65508 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1958 | D3496 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 05/06/1958 | D5511 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/06/1958 | 64962 | Transfer out to: | 33A | Plaistow | ||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/06/1958 | D8401 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68522 | Transfer in from: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68662 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68666 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61606 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61608 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61612 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61613 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 61661 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68510 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68543 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68573 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 68591 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 70042 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/06/1958 | D5512 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/06/1958 | D205 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 05/07/1958 | D5511 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 13/07/1958 | D5513 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/07/1958 | D8402 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/07/1958 | D8403 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/07/1958 | D3680 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | D3500 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | D3501 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 12134 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 13299 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 61654 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/07/1958 | 69607 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 24/07/1958 | D5514 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 28/07/1958 | 61600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/07/1958 | 68653 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/07/1958 | D3681 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/07/1958 | D5515 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1958 | 61182 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1958 | 61279 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/08/1958 | 61311 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 11/08/1958 | 69606 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 11/08/1958 | 69608 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/08/1958 | D3682 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 61630 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 68522 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1958 | 68529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1958 | 68657 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1958 | 68659 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1958 | 68662 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/08/1958 | 68666 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/08/1958 | D8404 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/08/1958 | D3683 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/09/1958 | D3684 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/09/1958 | D5516 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/09/1958 | D8405 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/09/1958 | 65456 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 79 | 4-4-2T | on | 11/09/1958 | 41936 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | D5511 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 69692 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 69695 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | 4w/e | 13/09/1958 | 72009 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61066 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 61096 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 62014 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/09/1958 | 62070 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/09/1958 | D8406 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/09/1958 | D8407 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1958 | 61066 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/09/1958 | 61096 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/09/1958 | 62014 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/09/1958 | 62070 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 25/09/1958 | D5517 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/09/1958 | D8408 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/09/1958 | D8409 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 06/10/1958 | 69605 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D3502 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 61613 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 61661 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 11127 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 12126 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D3495 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | D3680 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 65443 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/10/1958 | 61235 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 16/10/1958 | D5518 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1958 | 65444 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/10/1958 | D3631 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Std 6P | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | 72009 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/10/1958 | D3496 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/10/1958 | 65504 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/10/1958 | D3632 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1958 | D3633 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1958 | D3634 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1958 | D3635 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1958 | D3636 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 70012 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 61672 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 65450 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 65454 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 90298 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 90498 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 12123 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 12124 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 12125 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1958 | 64804 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12133 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12135 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 12136 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/12/1958 | 61648 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/12/1958 | 69624 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/12/1958 | 69628 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/12/1958 | 69641 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/12/1958 | 69695 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 69617 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 69619 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1958 | 64702 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1958 | 64807 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1958 | 64896 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/12/1958 | 62013 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/12/1958 | 62019 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/12/1958 | 62036 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/12/1958 | 62053 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 12/12/1958 | D5519 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 67708 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 67715 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 69615 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 61004 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 62014 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/12/1958 | 62015 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/12/1958 | 68532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61658 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 90298 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 90498 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61663 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61668 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61810 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61817 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61840 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61849 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61862 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61880 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61963 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 61977 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65446 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65505 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65506 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65511 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65514 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 65545 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 69617 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/12/1958 | 69652 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/12/1958 | 64874 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Electric | EB1 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1959 | 26510 | Transfer out to: | 30A.2 | Ilford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1959 | 68630 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1959 | 68636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1959 | 69610 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1959 | 69703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1959 | 69717 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 04/01/1959 | 70002 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 70012 | Transfer out to: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 13/01/1959 | 69634 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67702 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67703 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67704 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67706 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67709 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67716 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67728 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67736 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 67739 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 19/01/1959 | 68574 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 19/01/1959 | 69659 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | on | 25/01/1959 | 70003 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 69686 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70000 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70001 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70005 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70034 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70036 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70037 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70038 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70039 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70040 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 70041 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/02/1959 | 69600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/02/1959 | 69667 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/02/1959 | 69731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 68600 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 69679 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 69708 | Transfer in from: | 32D | Yarmouth South Town | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61004 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61005 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61006 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61104 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61111 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61135 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61249 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61280 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61362 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61372 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61378 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/02/1959 | 61399 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 12/02/1959 | 69623 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 12/02/1959 | 69716 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67752 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67778 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61613 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61655 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61658 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 61661 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 65528 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 65540 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 65556 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67701 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67718 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67720 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67721 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67722 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67733 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 67734 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/02/1959 | 69619 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/02/1959 | 69676 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/02/1959 | D5520 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 67723 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43105 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43144 | Transfer in from: | 31D | South Lynn | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43148 | Transfer in from: | 32G | Melton Constable | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43149 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43150 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43151 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 69620 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D5507 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D5508 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D5510 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D5515 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D5518 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1959 | D5519 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 09/03/1959 | 69666 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 12/03/1959 | D5522 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | D3302 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/03/1959 | D5502 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 67675 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/03/1959 | D5523 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/03/1959 | 69627 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/03/1959 | D5524 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 69692 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 06/04/1959 | 69669 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1959 | 61171 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/04/1959 | 61236 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1959 | 65525 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 16/04/1959 | D5526 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 17/04/1959 | 68639 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 17/04/1959 | 68658 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 17/04/1959 | 69625 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 69690 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 90028 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 90129 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 90156 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 90480 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 23/04/1959 | D5527 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/04/1959 | D5524 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1959 | 61164 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1959 | 61234 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/05/1959 | 69662 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 69686 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1959 | D5503 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/05/1959 | D6111 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 69727 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/05/1959 | 64768 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/05/1959 | 64873 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/05/1959 | 69660 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/05/1959 | D6110 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/05/1959 | D6112 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 21/05/1959 | D5531 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1959 | 61119 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1959 | 61233 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/05/1959 | D6113 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/05/1959 | D6114 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/1959 | 64787 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/06/1959 | D6115 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 08/06/1959 | 69626 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 08/06/1959 | 69657 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/06/1959 | D6116 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/06/1959 | D5500 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/06/1959 | D5504 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61119 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 61233 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 14/06/1959 | 62070 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/06/1959 | D6117 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 18/06/1959 | D5536 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D200 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D202 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D203 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D204 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | D205 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/06/1959 | 64788 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 22/06/1959 | 69705 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/06/1959 | D6118 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 25/06/1959 | D5537 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/06/1959 | D6119 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1959 | 64799 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 27/07/1959 | 69602 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 27/07/1959 | 69603 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 69615 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 69718 | Transfer out to: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/08/1959 | D5031 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/08/1959 | 69604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/08/1959 | 69633 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/08/1959 | 69655 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 69615 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 69718 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 24/08/1959 | 68648 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/08/1959 | 64773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 69621 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 69706 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1959 | 64766 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/09/1959 | 68652 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1959 | 64805 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 08/10/1959 | D5545 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 69707 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 19/10/1959 | 69661 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/10/1959 | D5033 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 67705 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 67711 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 69696 | Transfer out to: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/11/1959 | D8210 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 06/11/1959 | 68596 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D200 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D202 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D203 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D204 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D205 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5502 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 61658 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 61662 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 61666 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65507 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65514 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J16 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65539 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68565 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68579 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68609 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68642 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 69733 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5520 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5522 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5523 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5526 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5527 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5531 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5536 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | D5537 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68526 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 68563 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1959 | 64777 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/11/1959 | D8211 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1959 | 64750 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/11/1959 | 64973 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 61815 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 61820 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1959 | 65463 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/11/1959 | D5566 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 23/11/1959 | 69711 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 24/11/1959 | 68655 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1959 | 69622 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/12/1959 | 61662 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/12/1959 | 61658 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D5503 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D5504 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D5507 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D5508 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D5524 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 61663 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 61668 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 65459 | Transfer in from: | IPS | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 65472 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D2208 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D2209 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D2211 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D5566 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D6117 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1959 | D6119 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 69730 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1959 | 65472 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61300 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61336 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/12/1959 | 61363 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/12/1959 | 65452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 07/12/1959 | 68665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 43152 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 43153 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65424 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65446 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65448 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65465 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65473 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65503 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65506 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65511 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 65564 | Transfer in from: | COL | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 69617 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 69652 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1959 | 61300 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1959 | 61336 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1959 | 61363 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1959 | 64675 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1959 | 65449 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1959 | 65424 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 67701 | Transfer in from: | 32C | Lowestoft | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 67714 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1960 | 65563 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1960 | 64777 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1960 | 64780 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1960 | 65514 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/01/1960 | 65546 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/01/1960 | 64694 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 07/01/1960 | D5578 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 07/01/1960 | D5579 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/01/1960 | 90062 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1960 | D5030 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1960 | D5032 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | D5510 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | D5578 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1960 | D5578 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/01/1960 | 68579 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 21/01/1960 | D5583 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 90298 | Transfer out to: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 24/01/1960 | 62013 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 68526 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69673 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69675 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69704 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69730 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69732 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69690 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69691 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 69708 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/01/1960 | D8208 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 31/01/1960 | 62014 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 69654 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1960 | D8209 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 43150 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/02/1960 | 65459 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 15/02/1960 | 69683 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/02/1960 | D5034 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/02/1960 | D5035 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 43148 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 67752 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/02/1960 | 61663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 43152 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 67727 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/02/1960 | 69665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 68552 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 68563 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 43151 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 68577 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 06/03/1960 | 47312 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1960 | 61666 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/03/1960 | 64781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/03/1960 | 65448 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/03/1960 | 65548 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/03/1960 | D8220 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 47262 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1960 | 65473 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1960 | 65536 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1960 | 65555 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1960 | 65455 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/03/1960 | D8221 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/03/1960 | D8222 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 68899 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 68905 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 68924 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 61820 | Transfer out to: | 41H | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 90480 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1960 | 90660 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 90129 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 90156 | Transfer out to: | 34B | Hornsey | ||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/05/1960 | 67669 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 90028 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 90508 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/05/1960 | D5616 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/05/1960 | D5617 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/05/1960 | D5618 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/05/1960 | D5619 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | on | 06/06/1960 | 61863 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/06/1960 | D6113 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 04/07/1960 | 69617 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | on | 11/07/1960 | 61815 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/07/1960 | D5632 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/07/1960 | D5633 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 21/07/1960 | D5634 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 21/07/1960 | D5635 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 69694 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 28/07/1960 | D5636 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 28/07/1960 | D5637 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 64678 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 68542 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 68566 | Transfer in from: | 31C | Kings Lynn | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 69691 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 64680 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 69686 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 69730 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 11/08/1960 | D5638 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1960 | 64765 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1960 | 65564 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/08/1960 | 64708 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/08/1960 | D6116 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/08/1960 | D6118 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 67739 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 67778 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 68633 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/08/1960 | 64784 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B17 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/08/1960 | 61668 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1960 | 64686 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1960 | 64693 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1960 | 65503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1960 | 65506 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J16 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/08/1960 | 65539 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1960 | 64775 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D5622 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D5623 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 69678 | Transfer in from: | 34C | Hatfield | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D5524 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/08/1960 | D5583 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 29/08/1960 | 69684 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/08/1960 | D8233 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/09/1960 | D6112 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/09/1960 | D6115 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | D2/11 | 0-4-0 | on | 04/09/1960 | D2999 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 12/09/1960 | 69615 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5026 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5027 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5028 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5029 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5045 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5046 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5047 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5048 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5049 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5050 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5515 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5518 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5629 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D8232 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5507 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D5508 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D6110 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D6111 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D6114 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/09/1960 | D8234 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1960 | 64678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1960 | 64682 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 43153 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/10/1960 | 68526 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/10/1960 | 68563 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1960 | 64685 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 06/10/1960 | 68575 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/10/1960 | 65440 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 11/10/1960 | 68650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 11/10/1960 | 68663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 17/10/1960 | 69733 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 18/10/1960 | 68513 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/10/1960 | 69704 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 69686 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 69730 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 69651 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 69694 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90498 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 90551 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 31/10/1960 | 67702 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/11/1960 | 69645 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/11/1960 | 69663 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/11/1960 | 69709 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/11/1960 | 69720 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1960 | 64681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/11/1960 | 64783 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 09/11/1960 | 47262 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5070 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5071 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5026 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 68500 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69611 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69620 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69630 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69636 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69647 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69677 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69688 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69699 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69719 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/11/1960 | 69727 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5507 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5519 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5624 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5625 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5626 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5627 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 64692 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 64697 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8228 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8229 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8230 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8231 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8235 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8236 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5578 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5579 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D5629 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 68578 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 69679 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 76034 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8210 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8211 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8220 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8221 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8222 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61089 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1960 | 61109 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1960 | 65511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 28/11/1960 | 67704 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 28/11/1960 | 67726 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 28/11/1960 | 68644 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/11/1960 | D5070 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/11/1960 | D5070 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 30/11/1960 | D5070 | Transfer out to: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 30/11/1960 | 69664 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 02/12/1960 | D6700 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 90484 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 90501 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 90522 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 90528 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 90559 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 43144 | Transfer out to: | 40F | Boston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 04/12/1960 | 47282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 04/12/1960 | 47311 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67701 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67705 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67709 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67711 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67714 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67725 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 04/12/1960 | 67736 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/12/1960 | 68571 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/12/1960 | 68647 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/12/1960 | 68899 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 04/12/1960 | 68905 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69652 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69654 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69680 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69681 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69682 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69685 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69687 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69691 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69701 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69712 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69715 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69718 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69721 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69722 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69726 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 04/12/1960 | 69729 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1960 | D5032 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 61951 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 12/12/1960 | D6701 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D5069 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D5027 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67681 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67715 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67730 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 67732 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/12/1960 | D6702 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1960 | 65446 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 65460 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 47306 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/12/1960 | D6703 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61149 | Transfer in from: | PKS | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61226 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61311 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61362 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1961 | 61378 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/01/1961 | D6704 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 46468 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 46469 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D5070 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D5592 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D5605 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 64679 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 64680 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 65445 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 65453 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 68500 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 68578 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69651 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69679 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69690 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69708 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D2200 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D5069 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 69632 | Transfer out to: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1961 | D5070 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1961 | 62036 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1961 | 62053 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 12/01/1961 | D6705 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1961 | 64679 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1961 | 64680 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1961 | 64689 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1961 | 64767 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 13/01/1961 | 68500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 13/01/1961 | 69651 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 13/01/1961 | 69690 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 13/01/1961 | 69708 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 65462 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 43149 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46468 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46469 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/01/1961 | D5030 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/01/1961 | 68578 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 17/01/1961 | 69679 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/01/1961 | D5067 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/01/1961 | D5031 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/02/1961 | D6705 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/02/1961 | 68924 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/02/1961 | D6709 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/02/1961 | 61156 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/02/1961 | 62037 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 24/02/1961 | D6710 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 12129 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 90018 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/03/1961 | 47312 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 03/03/1961 | D6711 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 10/03/1961 | D6712 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1961 | D5094 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 17/03/1961 | 69702 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5020 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5024 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5034 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5593 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5594 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5595 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5596 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5597 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5034 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5045 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5046 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5048 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5049 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5050 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5067 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5071 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5024 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 20/03/1961 | D6713 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 24/03/1961 | D6714 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D5598 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D5599 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D5602 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D5603 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D5604 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D5035 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90501 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90522 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/04/1961 | D5021 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 01/04/1961 | D5608 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/04/1961 | D5034 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/04/1961 | D5047 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/04/1961 | D5094 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 07/04/1961 | 69658 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/04/1961 | 69656 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/04/1961 | D5028 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/04/1961 | D5029 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/04/1961 | D5033 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 13/04/1961 | D5694 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 69640 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 69692 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 69696 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 69698 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 20/04/1961 | D5695 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 69618 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 69632 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 27/04/1961 | D5699 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 27/04/1961 | 69696 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 27/04/1961 | 69707 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/04/1961 | D5021 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/04/1961 | D5020 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/04/1961 | D5021 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/05/1961 | D5696 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 11/05/1961 | D5697 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/05/1961 | D6702 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 18/05/1961 | D5698 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/05/1961 | D6715 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 12129 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D5602 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D6703 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D6704 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/05/1961 | D5021 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/05/1961 | D5603 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/05/1961 | D6717 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/06/1961 | D5604 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/06/1961 | D5605 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/06/1961 | D6718 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 08/06/1961 | D5801 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 12/06/1961 | 69674 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 16/06/1961 | D6716 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D201 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D206 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D207 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5585 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5586 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5587 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5588 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5589 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5590 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D5591 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 65521 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 65554 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6702 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6703 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6704 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6705 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6706 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6707 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/06/1961 | D6708 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68499 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68570 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68626 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 68635 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 43105 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90018 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 90559 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1961 | 61335 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 68556 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 68621 | Transfer in from: | 36E | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/06/1961 | D5608 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 26/06/1961 | 68612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 26/06/1961 | 69675 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 27/06/1961 | D6719 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/1961 | D6720 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 90484 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/07/1961 | D5622 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/07/1961 | D5626 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/1961 | D6725 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 08/09/1961 | D6726 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61252 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61253 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61283 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 61335 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 62015 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 62019 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 62037 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 62070 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 64676 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 64677 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 64692 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J20 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 64697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 65507 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/09/1961 | 65554 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/09/1961 | 68538 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/09/1961 | 68552 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/09/1961 | 68570 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/09/1961 | 68642 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/09/1961 | 68646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J68 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/09/1961 | 68649 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69668 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69670 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69673 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69678 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69686 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69693 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69713 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69714 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69723 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69724 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69728 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69730 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 10/09/1961 | 69732 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/09/1961 | D6727 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D5622 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D5626 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D6721 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D6722 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D6723 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D6724 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 67720 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 67723 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 67734 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D8223 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D8224 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D8225 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D8226 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D8227 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J17 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 65521 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 17/09/1961 | 68613 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 22/09/1961 | D6728 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 90528 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1961 | 61233 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/09/1961 | 61252 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 25/09/1961 | 67728 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 03/10/1961 | D6729 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | D208 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | D209 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1961 | D5637 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1961 | D5638 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 30/10/1961 | 68619 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/12/1961 | D5637 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/12/1961 | D5545 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/02/1962 | D8208 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 67730 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D8209 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D8223 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 11/02/1962 | 68549 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 12/02/1962 | 67720 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/02/1962 | D5581 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 03/05/1962 | 68626 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/05/1962 | 69653 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61005 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61048 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61301 | Transfer in from: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61363 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1962 | D8202 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1962 | D8203 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1962 | D8204 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1962 | D8205 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1962 | D8206 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1962 | D8208 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/06/1962 | D8212 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1962 | 61286 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5500 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5508 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 65420 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 80078 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 80079 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 80097 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 80099 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 80100 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 80101 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8200 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8201 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8207 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8209 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8210 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8211 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8213 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8214 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8215 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8216 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8217 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8218 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D8219 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5581 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5585 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5616 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5617 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5618 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5619 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5622 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5623 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5624 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5625 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5626 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5627 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5632 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5633 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5634 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5635 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5636 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5637 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5696 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5697 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5698 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5801 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/06/1962 | D4186 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/07/1962 | D4187 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/07/1962 | D4188 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D2208 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | D4186 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80078 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80079 | Transfer out to: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80097 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80099 | Transfer out to: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80100 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | on | 15/07/1962 | 80101 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 80071 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 80073 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 80074 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 80075 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 80076 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 80077 | Transfer in from: | 33B | Tilbury | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/07/1962 | 61045 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/07/1962 | 61005 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/07/1962 | D4189 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/08/1962 | 65420 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/08/1962 | 65445 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/08/1962 | D4190 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 68009 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 68018 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 78022 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 78023 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 78024 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 78025 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 78027 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 68009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 68018 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/08/1962 | 65453 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 06/08/1962 | 68565 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/08/1962 | D4191 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/08/1962 | D4192 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/08/1962 | D5622 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/08/1962 | D5623 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 23/08/1962 | D5853 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 23/08/1962 | D5854 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 30/08/1962 | 67730 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 30/08/1962 | 67737 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/09/1962 | 65460 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/09/1962 | 65476 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 05/09/1962 | 68566 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 11/09/1962 | 69621 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2209 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D2211 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5545 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5655 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5656 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5657 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5658 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5659 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5660 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5661 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5662 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5663 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5664 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5665 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5666 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5667 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5668 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5669 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5670 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5835 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D3608 | Transfer out to: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5599 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5622 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5623 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5853 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D5854 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 78022 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 78023 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 78024 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 78025 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 78027 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 80071 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 80073 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 80074 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 80075 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 80076 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 80077 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D8224 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D8225 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D8226 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D8227 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D8228 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/09/1962 | D8229 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61119 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61149 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61156 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61329 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61363 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61375 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61378 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61045 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61048 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61226 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61253 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61301 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61311 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61335 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 61362 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 65462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 65464 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J15 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1962 | 65465 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/09/1962 | 67703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/09/1962 | 67716 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/09/1962 | 67723 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/09/1962 | 67724 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/09/1962 | 67729 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/09/1962 | 67731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/09/1962 | 67734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/09/1962 | 68499 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/09/1962 | 68542 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/09/1962 | 68556 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/09/1962 | 68600 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/09/1962 | 68609 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/09/1962 | 68621 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 16/09/1962 | 68635 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69632 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69640 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69646 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69671 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69692 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69697 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N7 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/09/1962 | 69725 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67672 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | on | 29/12/1962 | 67680 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1963 | D5586 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1963 | D5592 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/01/1963 | D5591 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/01/1963 | D5591 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/02/1963 | D5656 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/02/1963 | D5657 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/02/1963 | D5658 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1963 | D5668 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1963 | D5669 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1963 | D5670 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8237 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8238 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8239 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8241 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8242 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8243 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D5590 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D5659 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D5663 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8230 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8231 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8232 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8233 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8235 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/04/1963 | D8236 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D5660 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D5662 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D5667 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D8214 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D8215 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D8216 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D8217 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D8218 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D8219 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D2229 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D2900 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D2901 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D2902 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D2903 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D2904 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D2905 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D2906 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8013 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8014 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8015 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8016 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8017 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8018 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8019 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/03/1964 | D2208 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | D4189 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D2224 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D2225 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D2226 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D2227 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | D2228 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/09/1964 | D5595 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/09/1964 | D5596 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/09/1964 | D5597 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1538 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1565 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1555 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1538 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5662 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5663 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5667 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5668 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5669 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5670 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5696 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5697 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5698 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1555 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1565 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5587 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5588 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5589 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | D4187 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | D4188 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | D4190 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | D3684 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1767 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5527 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5534 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5545 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5668 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/03/1965 | D5645 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/03/1965 | D5593 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1965 | D5698 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5556 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5559 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5662 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5663 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D5664 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D2954 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D2955 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D2956 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/06/1965 | D5632 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/06/1965 | D5669 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5576 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D1767 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D6728 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D6729 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/06/1965 | D5570 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 26/06/1965 | D5835 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5665 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5670 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5587 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5620 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5835 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5598 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5661 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5699 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/08/1965 | D5571 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/08/1965 | D5666 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D2028 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D2031 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | D5525 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | D5667 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5553 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8240 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5694 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8013 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8014 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D5574 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D5695 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1885 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/03/1966 | D1885 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1758 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1759 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1760 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1770 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1772 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1774 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1776 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1777 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1778 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1779 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1780 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1781 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1782 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8214 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8215 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8216 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8217 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8218 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8219 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8220 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8229 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D200 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D201 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D202 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D203 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D204 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D205 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D206 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D207 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D208 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D209 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5525 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5527 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5534 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5559 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5570 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5571 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5574 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6725 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6726 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6727 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8015 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8016 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8017 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8018 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8019 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2900 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2901 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2902 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2903 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2904 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2905 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2906 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/05/1966 | D1771 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2275 | Transfer in from: | 71B | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2276 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2277 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2028 | Transfer out to: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D2031 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Diesel | 01 | 0-4-0 | on | 19/06/1966 | D2953 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1768 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D2000 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D3302 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1771 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1782 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D1540 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1966 | D2000 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5551 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5573 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5575 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5577 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5587 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5591 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5594 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5645 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 13/08/1966 | D2957 | Transfer out to: | 50D | Goole | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/08/1966 | D6724 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/09/1966 | D3494 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 12129 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 12131 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | 12138 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D3334 | Transfer in from: | 34A | Kings Cross | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D3629 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D3630 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D4070 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D4071 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D2277 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2209 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D2211 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3497 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3498 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3499 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3500 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3501 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3502 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3632 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1530 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1760 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D5576 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D5697 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | D3711 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | 12134 | Transfer in from: | 31A | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/10/1966 | D1526 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/11/1966 | D8208 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/11/1966 | D8208 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/11/1966 | D5561 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/11/1966 | D8208 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/11/1966 | D8208 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1966 | D8242 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/12/1966 | D8023 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/12/1966 | D8053 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/12/1966 | D8054 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/12/1966 | D8055 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/12/1966 | D3494 | Transfer out to: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D8225 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D8226 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D8228 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D8236 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D1866 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D8227 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D8053 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D8054 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D8055 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8023 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/02/1967 | D5584 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/02/1967 | D5556 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5551 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5573 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5575 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8220 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8225 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8226 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8227 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5577 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5655 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5696 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D8228 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D8229 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D8234 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D8236 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D8237 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1967 | D3477 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | D3326 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | D3445 | Transfer in from: | 35A | New England | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1967 | D8234 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1967 | D8243 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1967 | 12104 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 12107 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/06/1967 | D6748 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/06/1967 | D3631 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/07/1967 | D6960 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/07/1967 | D6701 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D1544 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D6961 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D6702 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/09/1967 | 12129 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3710 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6962 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6703 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D8235 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D8243 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5517 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5519 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5584 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5835 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D6963 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D6704 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | D2/11 | 0-4-0 | on | 15/10/1967 | D2999 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D2280 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D6964 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D6708 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/10/1967 | D2275 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D6968 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D6705 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1527 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1528 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1866 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D6965 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5514 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5515 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5516 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D6706 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/12/1967 | D6967 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/12/1967 | D6707 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1968 | D6753 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1968 | D6966 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1968 | D6709 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1968 | D6962 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/01/1968 | D5515 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/01/1968 | D5519 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | D1/3 | 0-4-0 | on | 14/01/1968 | D2958 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/01/1968 | D5639 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/01/1968 | D6749 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/02/1968 | D6710 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/02/1968 | D6710 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D6967 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/02/1968 | D6967 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/02/1968 | D8404 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/02/1968 | D6724 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/02/1968 | D6947 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/02/1968 | D6710 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/03/1968 | D6700 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D3332 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D3443 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D6817 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D6818 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/03/1968 | D6968 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/03/1968 | D6968 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/03/1968 | D8217 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D5514 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/04/1968 | D3636 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/04/1968 | D8230 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/04/1968 | D8241 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/04/1968 | D6700 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1968 | D6967 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1968 | D6968 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1968 | D6967 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1968 | D6968 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5516 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5517 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8220 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8221 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8222 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8223 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8224 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8225 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8226 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8227 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8228 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8229 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8236 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D8237 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1526 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D3326 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6713 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6714 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6715 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6716 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6717 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6718 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6719 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6720 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6722 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6723 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6724 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1795 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1796 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1798 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1799 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1758 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1759 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1768 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1770 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1968 | D1570 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1968 | D1571 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/05/1968 | D5543 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/05/1968 | D5659 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 12114 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 12115 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | 12116 | Transfer in from: | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/06/1968 | D3405 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | 12137 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/07/1968 | D8400 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/07/1968 | D8402 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/07/1968 | D8403 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1968 | D3477 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1968 | D4071 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D3918 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D1570 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D1571 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | D3405 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/08/1968 | D8202 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/08/1968 | D8205 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/08/1968 | D8206 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/08/1968 | D8212 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/08/1968 | D8208 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5536 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5537 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D8055 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D8056 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D8057 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1968 | D8019 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/09/1968 | D3337 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/09/1968 | D3338 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/09/1968 | D3920 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1968 | 12136 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D8030 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D8031 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D8032 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1968 | D8033 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D3680 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1968 | D3918 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8219 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8227 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8238 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8401 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8405 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8406 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8407 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8408 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 16 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/09/1968 | D8409 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1968 | D8235 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1968 | D8236 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/10/1968 | D8240 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1792 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1888 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1889 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1896 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D3339 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D3337 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D5543 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/10/1968 | D6825 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/10/1968 | D6831 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/10/1968 | D6711 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/10/1968 | D6712 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1968 | D2280 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1968 | D3445 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3597 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1968 | 12137 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/11/1968 | 12138 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1968 | D3443 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1968 | D3630 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/12/1968 | D8213 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/12/1968 | D8223 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3309 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D3311 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1968 | D3633 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1968 | D3635 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/12/1968 | D1540 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/12/1968 | D1544 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D1676 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D1677 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6720 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6722 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6964 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6965 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/02/1969 | D6819 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/02/1969 | D6818 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/02/1969 | D8243 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/02/1969 | D3523 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D6753 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/03/1969 | D5652 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D3523 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/03/1969 | D5537 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/03/1969 | D2215 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/03/1969 | D8203 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/03/1969 | D8237 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1969 | D3524 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D5685 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/04/1969 | 12131 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1969 | 12103 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1797 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5650 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5651 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/05/1969 | D5536 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1969 | D3629 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/06/1969 | D5537 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/06/1969 | D5679 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/06/1969 | D1797 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/07/1969 | D6938 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/1969 | D2276 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/08/1969 | D2297 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1969 | D3634 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1969 | D4070 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1969 | 12116 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1562 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1563 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1703 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1704 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1705 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1706 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6865 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6700 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6720 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6721 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6722 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6748 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6749 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6817 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6938 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8019 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8030 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8057 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/10/1969 | D3001 | Transfer in from: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D5520 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D8030 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D5620 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D8031 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1969 | D3705 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1969 | D2297 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D6964 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D6965 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/12/1969 | D2164 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D6962 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1579 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1582 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1758 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1759 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1770 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1872 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1873 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1874 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D5653 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D5657 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D5662 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1792 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1795 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1796 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1799 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1888 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1889 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D1896 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1523 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1524 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1525 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1526 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1703 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1704 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1705 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1706 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/02/1970 | D8230 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D6866 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/03/1970 | D5553 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/03/1970 | D5632 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/04/1970 | D8230 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/04/1970 | D8201 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1970 | D2223 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1970 | D6866 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D5661 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D5663 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1970 | D3134 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1970 | D2135 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1970 | 12106 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1970 | 12128 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/08/1970 | D8201 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/08/1970 | D2135 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1970 | D2158 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1970 | 12114 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/10/1970 | 12115 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D1522 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D6712 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D6820 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5517 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5661 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5663 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D5517 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D5518 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D5520 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D5537 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D5662 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D5679 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D8033 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/12/1970 | D8214 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/12/1970 | D8215 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/12/1970 | D1756 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/12/1970 | D1757 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1970 | D8231 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1970 | D8232 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/12/1970 | D1676 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/12/1970 | D1677 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1970 | D2088 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1970 | D2027 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1971 | D2027 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1971 | D2088 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/01/1971 | 12105 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1971 | D3693 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/02/1971 | D3320 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/03/1971 | D6747 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1971 | D2158 | Transfer out to: | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8200 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8201 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8204 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8207 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8209 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8210 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8211 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8216 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8218 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8220 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8221 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8222 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8224 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8225 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8226 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8228 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8229 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8230 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8231 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8232 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8234 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 15 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/03/1971 | D8239 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5518 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5520 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5521 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5522 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5525 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5583 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5616 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5618 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5656 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5658 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5847 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5848 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5849 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5850 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D6830 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D2168 | Transfer in from: | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1574 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D3718 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1774 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1776 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1777 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1778 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1780 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1781 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5657 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5658 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5848 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6960 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1971 | 12111 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/05/1971 | D2216 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/05/1971 | D8032 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1550 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1561 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1576 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1580 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1702 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1703 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1770 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1772 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1872 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1873 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1874 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 20/06/1971 | D1562 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/06/1971 | D6832 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D6749 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 04/09/1971 | D3706 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/09/1971 | D6916 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1535 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1547 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1548 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1549 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1573 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5549 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5802 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5817 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5825 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5848 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6828 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6829 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6833 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6860 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1522 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1523 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1524 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1779 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5520 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5521 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5522 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5583 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5616 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5618 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5650 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5651 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5652 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5653 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5847 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5849 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5850 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8030 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8055 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8056 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1971 | D2217 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D5529 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D5532 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D6759 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D6960 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/11/1971 | D5550 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/11/1971 | D5558 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/11/1971 | D5559 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1971 | 12108 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1971 | D3689 | Transfer in from: | 34D | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/12/1971 | D5654 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/12/1971 | D5656 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/12/1971 | 12136 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1571 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1572 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1704 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3532 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3537 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D6733 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5525 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5529 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5532 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1972 | 12103 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/01/1972 | D2217 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D3892 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D5558 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D5549 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D5550 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D5654 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D5802 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1972 | D5817 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/02/1972 | D6755 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/02/1972 | D6866 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1972 | D3069 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D3555 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1705 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1760 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5659 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D6755 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/05/1972 | D2217 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D3112 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D3248 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D3838 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D3865 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D3935 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1972 | D3684 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1972 | D3935 | Transfer out to: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/06/1972 | 12103 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1522 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1523 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1524 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1529 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1537 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D3022 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1561 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1563 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1576 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1579 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D1582 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/06/1972 | 12132 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/07/1972 | 12130 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6735 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6738 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D1775 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D1580 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/08/1972 | D2055 | Transfer in from: | 52E | Percy Main | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1774 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1776 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1777 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5683 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5802 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5817 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5518 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5559 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5639 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6735 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6738 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6759 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6819 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6820 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6825 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1972 | 12127 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D1751 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D1535 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1743 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1549 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/11/1972 | D1748 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/11/1972 | D1548 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1972 | 12109 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1972 | 12110 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1972 | 12134 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1972 | D3001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D1521 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D1617 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D3716 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D1550 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 02/12/1972 | D1571 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D1706 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D1527 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/12/1972 | D1532 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/12/1972 | D1617 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | D1543 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | D1525 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D1765 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D1547 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/01/1973 | D3069 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D1570 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D1574 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1762 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1764 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1766 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1780 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1781 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D6860 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D6865 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D6866 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D6916 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1749 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5859 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1760 | Transfer out to: | CE | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1762 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1764 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1798 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D6833 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1538 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D5859 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6734 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6743 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6744 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6790 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6811 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6825 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6915 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6953 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6959 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1521 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1522 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1523 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1524 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1526 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1528 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1717 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 47548 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1781 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 47185 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D6953 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1973 | D3834 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1973 | D3067 | Transfer in from: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1973 | D3834 | Transfer out to: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1721 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1773 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5636 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5637 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1717 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | 47125 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5817 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5825 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1974 | 08863 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1974 | 08015 | Transfer out to: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 08207 | Transfer in from: | FH | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 08099 | Transfer out to: | FH | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 03014 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47109 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31143 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31314 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37012 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37033 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37047 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37090 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37111 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 01/06/1974 | 03081 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/1974 | 03014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/1974 | 03055 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47100 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47102 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31212 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31213 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31255 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47182 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 47006 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/11/1974 | 47171 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47008 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47109 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47178 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47016 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47135 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47160 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/01/1975 | 37116 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31212 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31213 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31255 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37125 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37128 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37129 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47180 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47181 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47003 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47004 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47005 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47167 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47172 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31213 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31255 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31272 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37034 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37043 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/06/1975 | 08930 | Transfer in from: | WH | Wath | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 03180 | Transfer in from: | 70F | Bournemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08081 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37132 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/09/1975 | 08054 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/09/1975 | 08087 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1975 | 03180 | Transfer out to: | CR | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/09/1975 | 08081 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31196 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 37160 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47064 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47085 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47093 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31004 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1975 | 08627 | Transfer in from: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1975 | 08268 | Transfer out to: | DN | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1975 | 08758 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1975 | 08671 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 08108 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 08089 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/01/1976 | 03164 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 31004 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 08089 | Transfer out to: | CA | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 08108 | Transfer out to: | CA | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 25/01/1976 | 31196 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 47255 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 47179 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/02/1976 | 03161 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 22/02/1976 | 08180 | Transfer out to: | CA | Cambridge | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 47297 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 47298 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 37131 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 37160 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31101 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31102 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31103 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31114 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31122 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31129 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31133 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31167 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47167 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31001 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31007 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31009 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31010 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31011 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31012 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31014 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31016 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/05/1976 | 31018 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/05/1976 | 31105 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/05/1976 | 31106 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1976 | 47170 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08250 | Transfer out to: | NR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 31103 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/08/1976 | 08495 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/09/1976 | 03161 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31112 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 04/12/1976 | 03389 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1977 | 03149 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37115 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37118 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37247 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37268 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1977 | 03161 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 03092 | Transfer in from: | 30E | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31145 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31148 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31156 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 37026 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 37027 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 37089 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 37091 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/1977 | 03092 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1977 | 03171 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31107 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31109 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31110 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31137 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31138 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31185 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47425 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47426 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47431 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47457 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47458 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47460 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47461 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37026 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37027 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47064 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47158 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47162 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47165 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47172 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47298 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1977 | 03171 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 03154 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47541 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47542 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47543 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47160 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47164 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47297 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1977 | 08478 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/12/1977 | 08661 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/01/1978 | 47541 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 37012 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 47160 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 47167 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 47542 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 47543 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 37014 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 47542 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 47543 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/02/1978 | 47100 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/02/1978 | 47102 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 19/02/1978 | 37267 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1978 | 08418 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1978 | 08478 | Transfer out to: | LN | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1978 | 08661 | Transfer out to: | CR | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/03/1979 | 31013 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1979 | 31151 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 10/03/1979 | 08230 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1979 | 31156 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1979 | 03149 | Transfer out to: | LN | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1979 | 03389 | Transfer out to: | LN | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/01/1980 | 31002 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 05/01/1980 | 31006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 03/02/1980 | 31003 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 03/02/1980 | 31005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/05/1980 | 31015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/05/1980 | 31017 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1980 | 08207 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/09/1980 | 08863 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/10/1980 | 31008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 05/10/1980 | 31004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 05/10/1980 | 31019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1980 | 03081 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1981 | 08233 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/05/1981 | 47162 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 37115 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47041 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47255 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 37115 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47009 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47160 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47163 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/06/1981 | 47255 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/06/1981 | 08231 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1981 | 08440 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/07/1981 | 08440 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 37119 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 37141 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 37166 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 47009 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 47093 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/07/1981 | 31114 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 47093 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1981 | 03168 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1981 | 08547 | Reinstated | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/08/1981 | 08547 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08418 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47294 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47301 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47304 | Transfer in from: | KY | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47552 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47574 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 37262 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47009 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47041 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1981 | 37014 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/10/1981 | 08241 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1981 | 08833 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1981 | 31173 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1981 | 31266 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1981 | 31300 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37021 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37050 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37091 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37099 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37103 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47549 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37091 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37130 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37141 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37166 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37259 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37264 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37265 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37266 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47301 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47304 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47552 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/12/1981 | 03161 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/12/1981 | 08547 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1982 | 08552 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1982 | 08554 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1982 | 08232 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/09/1983 | 03154 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/01/1984 | 08262 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1984 | 08239 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1984 | 08264 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/07/1984 | 08269 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/07/1985 | 08546 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/08/1985 | 08522 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/12/1985 | 08422 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/01/1986 | 08520 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1986 | 08409 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/06/1986 | 08518 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/10/1986 | 31436 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/01/1987 | 47162 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 22/01/1987 | 31122 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/04/1987 | 47011 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08627 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31106 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31119 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31135 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31149 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31156 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31165 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31170 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31181 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31288 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31289 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31305 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31309 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31311 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31323 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37043 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47100 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47113 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47120 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08627 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31106 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31145 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37012 | Transfer out to: | ML | Motherwell | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47019 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47085 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47130 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47150 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47156 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47431 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47543 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47596 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1987 | 08361 | Transfer in from: | MG | Margam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1987 | 08461 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1987 | 08487 | Transfer in from: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1987 | 08779 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/10/1987 | 47093 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/10/1987 | 47113 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/10/1987 | 47118 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/02/1988 | 08361 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/02/1988 | 08461 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/02/1988 | 08487 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/02/1988 | 08779 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 11/03/1988 | 31109 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31134 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31304 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31306 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31308 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37038 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37074 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37077 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37154 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37203 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37350 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47366 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47522 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47523 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31105 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31288 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31289 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31445 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31448 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31450 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37021 | Transfer out to: | ML | Motherwell | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37050 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37215 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37263 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37324 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37350 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47003 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47016 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47018 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47425 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47457 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47458 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47542 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47549 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47660 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47664 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 22/05/1988 | 31304 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/08/1988 | 08494 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 47365 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 47005 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 27/09/1988 | 31167 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 02/02/1989 | 31138 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 07/02/1989 | 31311 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/04/1989 | 31173 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 08/06/1989 | 31323 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/08/1989 | 37260 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 08/01/1990 | 31170 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/02/1990 | 08930 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1990 | 08440 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/07/1990 | 47116 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1991 | 47017 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1991 | 47120 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/03/1991 | 47461 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 08/04/1991 | 31309 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/04/1991 | 47115 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/07/1991 | 47014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/07/1991 | 47100 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/07/1991 | 47117 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/09/1991 | 47006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/09/1991 | 47007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 08/11/1991 | 31305 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 16/12/1991 | 31212 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/02/1992 | 47460 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 28/02/1992 | 31156 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/12/1992 | 31460 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1992 | 47010 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/12/1992 | 47426 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 11/01/1993 | 31101 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/06/1993 | 08521 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/1994 | 08627 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1994 | 37359 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1995 | 37343 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1995 | 31106 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/12/1995 | 31444 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1996 | 47574 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1997 | 37358 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/05/1997 | 31112 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/12/1998 | 47522 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/01/1999 | 47366 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1999 | 37038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1999 | 47523 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1999 | 37350 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/01/2000 | 31134 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 21/01/2000 | 31165 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/02/2000 | 31135 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/03/2000 | 31185 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 05/05/2000 | 31149 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/06/2001 | 08958 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/2002 | 37708 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2002 | 47294 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 13/03/2003 | 31181 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/03/2003 | 37043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/2004 | 08957 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/2004 | 47580 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2004 | 47114 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/2005 | 08758 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 37074 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/2005 | 08541 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/2005 | 08542 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/05/2006 | 31110 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/2006 | 47004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 37116 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2008 | 37077 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/10/2008 | 31107 | Condemned |