Depot: Bathgate
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | D31 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2072 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2439 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4468 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4491 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4504 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4529 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4534 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5211 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5225 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5229 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5230 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5231 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5234 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5235 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5248 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5250 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5254 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5261 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5265 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5271 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5276 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5277 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5278 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5280 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5282 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5303 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5314 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5318 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5327 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5341 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5342 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5344 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62458 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 62463 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9142 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9156 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9157 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9158 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9159 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9216 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | on | 05/03/1948 | 62463 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D33 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 62458 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 65346 | Transfer in from: | STG | Stirling | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 69157 | Transfer out to: | PKD | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J75 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 2495 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 5271 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | D31 | 4-4-0 | on | 28/02/1951 | 62283 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 64512 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 64601 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 65327 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 64512 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 64601 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 64512 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/03/1951 | 64601 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/04/1951 | 65254 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 5331 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5331 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5331 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 64583 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/01/1952 | 65278 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 65268 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64484 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 64553 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1952 | 65231 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 64484 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 64553 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 64484 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/04/1952 | 64553 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 65235 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 65331 | Transfer out to: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 68533 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 62692 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/05/1953 | 64794 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 64601 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Large/Scottish Director | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1953 | 62692 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 14/07/1953 | 68533 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/01/1954 | 61333 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/1954 | 64794 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 17/04/1954 | 43138 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1954 | 61333 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1955 | 65314 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/11/1955 | 65259 | Transfer in from: | HAW | Hawick | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 64634 | Transfer in from: | 64D | Carstairs | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/05/1956 | 65248 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/06/1956 | 65303 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 65290 | Transfer in from: | POL | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 65280 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1957 | 65250 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1957 | 65211 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/10/1957 | 65225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 24/01/1958 | 69142 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/05/1958 | 69158 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/08/1958 | D3416 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/09/1958 | D3416 | Transfer out to: | 65E | Kipps | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1958 | D3554 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1958 | D3555 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/10/1958 | D3556 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/11/1958 | D3557 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | D3556 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/12/1958 | D3557 | Transfer out to: | 64E | Polmont | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/07/1959 | 65259 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/09/1959 | 65277 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/1959 | 64484 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D30 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/10/1959 | 62439 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/10/1959 | 65230 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/12/1959 | 65233 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/02/1960 | 65342 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/05/1960 | 65229 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/05/1960 | 64468 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/07/1960 | 43138 | Transfer out to: | 65C | Parkhead | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 64512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1960 | 64529 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1960 | 64504 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/09/1960 | 65344 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 65281 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/10/1960 | 65309 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/12/1960 | 65233 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/02/1961 | 64491 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 21/02/1961 | D2779 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/03/1961 | 65276 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/04/1961 | 64527 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 64497 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65277 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/05/1961 | 65305 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/05/1961 | 64534 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65251 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65267 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65227 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/07/1961 | 65281 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/08/1961 | 65227 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 25/09/1961 | D2779 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/10/1961 | D2719 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 30/10/1961 | 69159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 64554 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 64569 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/02/1962 | 69156 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 12/02/1962 | 69216 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | D2719 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 64510 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1962 | 64527 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1962 | 65305 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/03/1962 | 64553 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1962 | 64497 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1962 | 65318 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1962 | 65316 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1962 | 65268 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1962 | 65316 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1963 | 57634 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | 652 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/05/1963 | 57634 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/06/1963 | 65277 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/06/1963 | 65261 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/07/1963 | 65297 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/07/1963 | 65341 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/08/1963 | 65290 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/08/1963 | 64625 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/08/1963 | 65307 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/08/1963 | 65329 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 64625 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/11/1963 | 65251 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1963 | 78052 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/12/1963 | 65265 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/12/1963 | 64583 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 65307 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1963 | 65329 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/01/1964 | 64554 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/01/1964 | 64634 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 46461 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 65243 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 78046 | Transfer in from: | 64G | Hawick | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 64606 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/02/1964 | 64614 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/03/1964 | 76105 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/03/1964 | 76106 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 65309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/06/1964 | 65346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 78045 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 78054 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1964 | 46461 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 78050 | Transfer in from: | 65D | Dawsholm | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 26/09/1964 | 65234 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 76104 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 76107 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 76111 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 64569 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 64606 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J37 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/12/1964 | 64614 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 76106 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/10/1965 | 76107 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3560 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/10/1965 | D3893 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/12/1965 | 78054 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/01/1966 | 65282 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/01/1966 | 65297 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1966 | 76111 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1966 | 78045 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1966 | 78050 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 03/01/1966 | 78052 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1966 | 61099 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/01/1966 | 61307 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1966 | 76105 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | D3879 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 46462 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 65319 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 65345 | Transfer in from: | THJ | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 76049 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 78047 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 29/01/1966 | 76104 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61099 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1966 | 61307 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/07/1966 | 65243 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 22/08/1966 | 46462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/09/1966 | 78047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3554 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3555 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3560 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3879 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | D3893 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 65319 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/09/1966 | 78046 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1966 | 65267 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | 65345 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction |