Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
10793 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
02/11/1935 |
7778 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
08/02/1936 |
9176 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
11/04/1936 |
10657 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
22/06/1946 |
7765 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1153 |
0-4-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11204 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11316 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11319 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11471 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
11491 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12091 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12126 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12177 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12280 |
Snapshot |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12349 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12366 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12393 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12397 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12449 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
12453 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4125 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4358 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
4473 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1008 |
2-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
50793 |
Snapshot |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
01/01/1948 |
51495 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6628 |
Snapshot |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6637 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6676 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6682 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
6692 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7180 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7183 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7184 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7393 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
on |
01/01/1948 |
7453 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8918 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
8954 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9152 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9176 |
Snapshot |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9303 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9312 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
01/01/1948 |
9317 |
Snapshot |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
10/01/1948 |
11397 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
6632 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
6727 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
9212 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1948 |
4125 |
Transfer out to: |
5E |
Alsager |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
on |
20/03/1948 |
6692 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
58917 |
Transfer out to: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
108 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
40084 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
80 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
9072 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
12453 |
Transfer out to: |
12E |
Moor Row |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
9152 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
9259 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
46643 |
Transfer in from: |
7B |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
6742 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Northampton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
44379 |
Transfer in from: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
44473 |
Transfer out to: |
10D |
Plodder Lane |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
9053 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
on |
27/11/1948 |
9303 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
44379 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
47293 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
9053 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
44379 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
52393 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
3w/e |
11/12/1948 |
9053 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
47293 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
47293 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
47293 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
52393 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
7181 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
47183 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
7451 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
49072 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
48918 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G1 |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1949 |
49259 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1153 |
0-4-0ST |
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
51204 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
43026 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
43027 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
43028 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
43029 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
49389 |
Transfer in from: |
25G |
Farnley Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
44379 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
9212 |
Transfer out to: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
m/e |
05/1949 |
51495 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
44358 |
Transfer out to: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
16/07/1949 |
48954 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
06/08/1949 |
46727 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
17/09/1949 |
46637 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
47444 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
49262 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
46727 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
m/e |
12/1949 |
46676 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
m/e |
12/1949 |
46742 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
46658 |
Transfer in from: |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1949 |
49205 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
49205 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
5w/e |
24/12/1949 |
49205 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/02/1950 |
52126 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
03/1950 |
49317 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
58908 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
05/1950 |
49053 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
27/05/1950 |
9377 |
Transfer in from: |
3A |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
m/e |
06/1950 |
46632 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
9377 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
2w/e |
17/06/1950 |
9377 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
58900 |
Transfer in from: |
4A |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
w/e |
01/07/1950 |
58908 |
Transfer out to: |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
09/09/1950 |
47184 |
Transfer out to: |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1950 |
58378 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
58378 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/11/1950 |
58378 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
43025 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
46757 |
Transfer in from: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
58418 |
Transfer in from: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
58932 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
7180 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
43027 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
7180 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
43025 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
46757 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
58418 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
58932 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
43025 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
46757 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
58418 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
02/12/1950 |
58932 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
on |
09/12/1950 |
46658 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
41285 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
41286 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
41287 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
31/12/1950 |
46727 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
46643 |
Transfer out to: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
27/01/1951 |
58418 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
31/01/1951 |
44303 |
Transfer in from: |
9A |
Longsight |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
47184 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
24/02/1951 |
58900 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
47184 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
49196 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
49391 |
Transfer in from: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
28/02/1951 |
47184 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
24/03/1951 |
52280 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
49205 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
04/1951 |
49312 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
49288 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
05/05/1951 |
9239 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
46643 |
Transfer in from: |
6D |
Chester Northgate |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
49288 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
9239 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
49288 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1951 |
9239 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
23/06/1951 |
41287 |
Transfer out to: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
m/e |
07/1951 |
46628 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/07/1951 |
47366 |
Transfer in from: |
3D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
m/e |
31/07/1951 |
47180 |
Transfer out to: |
84G |
Shrewsbury |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
47366 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
46643 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/08/1951 |
47366 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
52125 |
Transfer in from: |
7D |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
52125 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
08/09/1951 |
52125 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/10/1951 |
52196 |
Transfer in from: |
23B |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1951 |
52162 |
Transfer in from: |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1951 |
52196 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/11/1951 |
52196 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
52196 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
52196 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Coal Tank |
0-6-2T |
4w/e |
01/12/1951 |
58932 |
Transfer out to: |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
40080 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
40080 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
29/12/1951 |
47184 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
41288 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
41289 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
40080 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
40084 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
3P |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
40108 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
1P |
2-4-2T |
4w/e |
23/02/1952 |
46757 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
17/05/1952 |
44280 |
Transfer in from: |
20H |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44280 |
Transfer in from: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
51441 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
44280 |
Transfer out to: |
10E |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
52162 |
Transfer out to: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
14/06/1952 |
52449 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
13/12/1952 |
47181 |
Transfer out to: |
39A |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
5w/e |
03/01/1953 |
47181 |
Transfer in from: |
39A |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
3w/e |
24/01/1953 |
47451 |
Transfer out to: |
10B |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
Cauliflowers |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/02/1953 |
58378 |
Transfer out to: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
21/03/1953 |
52338 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/07/1953 |
52091 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
8w/e |
11/07/1953 |
41285 |
Transfer out to: |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
21/11/1953 |
47181 |
Transfer out to: |
39A |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
44438 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
47181 |
Transfer in from: |
39A |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
02/01/1954 |
49318 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
on |
28/08/1954 |
49389 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
47288 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
47298 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
11/09/1954 |
47452 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/09/1954 |
52349 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
49281 |
Transfer in from: |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
52270 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
09/10/1954 |
52366 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
16/10/1954 |
51471 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
52429 |
Transfer in from: |
2D |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
06/11/1954 |
52270 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
43035 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
26/03/1955 |
49377 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
Sentinel |
0-4-0T |
4w/e |
21/05/1955 |
47181 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/06/1955 |
52397 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
8w/e |
16/07/1955 |
43915 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
58174 |
Transfer in from: |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/02/1956 |
52393 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
24/03/1956 |
58174 |
Transfer out to: |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/05/1956 |
43915 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
16/06/1956 |
44350 |
Transfer in from: |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
44300 |
Transfer in from: |
5E |
Alsager |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
52322 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
11/08/1956 |
52366 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
03/11/1956 |
51397 |
Transfer out to: |
27B |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/12/1956 |
52177 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
05/01/1957 |
52196 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
41211 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
43025 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
43026 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
43028 |
Transfer out to: |
11D |
Tebay |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
43029 |
Transfer out to: |
11D |
Tebay |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
26/01/1957 |
43035 |
Transfer out to: |
11D |
Tebay |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
m/e |
02/1957 |
76079 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
51397 |
Transfer in from: |
6E |
Wrexham Rhosddu |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
23/02/1957 |
52393 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
23/03/1957 |
51491 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/06/1957 |
52338 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
m/e |
09/1957 |
49239 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
8w/e |
05/10/1957 |
49304 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1957 |
49318 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
47166 |
Transfer in from: |
6F |
Bidston |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
49448 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
52140 |
Transfer in from: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
30/11/1957 |
52201 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/11/1957 |
52125 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
28/12/1957 |
52429 |
Transfer out to: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
43185 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
43213 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
43258 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
43294 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
43506 |
Transfer in from: |
22B |
Gloucester Barnwood |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
43763 |
Transfer in from: |
17A |
Derby |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
52140 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
52322 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
52366 |
Transfer out to: |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
25/01/1958 |
52393 |
Transfer out to: |
26C |
Bolton |
|
|
Steam |
11 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/02/1958 |
52201 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
D3367 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
43021 |
Transfer in from: |
1D |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
43022 |
Transfer in from: |
1D |
Devons Road (Bow) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
44280 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/03/1958 |
44303 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
19/04/1958 |
44192 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
44438 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
14/06/1958 |
47288 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
4w/e |
06/09/1958 |
47166 |
Transfer out to: |
6F |
Bidston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
44266 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
44317 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
43021 |
Transfer out to: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
4w/e |
04/10/1958 |
51319 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/11/1958 |
13245 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
13/12/1958 |
43763 |
Transfer out to: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1959 |
49281 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/01/1959 |
49391 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
24/01/1959 |
51316 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
on |
21/03/1959 |
51397 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/04/1959 |
47164 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1959 |
49352 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
02/05/1959 |
43506 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/06/1959 |
76020 |
Transfer in from: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
4MT |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/06/1959 |
43022 |
Transfer out to: |
2B |
Nuneaton |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/07/1959 |
47164 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
18/07/1959 |
43258 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
12022 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
12023 |
Transfer in from: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
13245 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Diesel |
08 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1959 |
D3367 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/08/1959 |
58182 |
Transfer in from: |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
58177 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/08/1959 |
58291 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
07/11/1959 |
47376 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
14/11/1959 |
43294 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
44317 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
12/12/1959 |
49304 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
49428 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1960 |
49449 |
Transfer in from: |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1960 |
44315 |
Transfer in from: |
5D |
Stoke |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1960 |
43344 |
Transfer in from: |
22A |
Bristol Barrow Road |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/05/1960 |
43344 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
41212 |
Transfer in from: |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
13/06/1960 |
41324 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
44086 |
Transfer in from: |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/06/1960 |
44305 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
23 |
0-6-0ST |
w/e |
02/07/1960 |
51441 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
06/08/1960 |
76023 |
Transfer in from: |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
58177 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/08/1960 |
58182 |
Transfer out to: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
44497 |
Transfer in from: |
1A |
Willesden |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
58177 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
58182 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
90170 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
90212 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
90702 |
Transfer in from: |
24K |
Preston |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
49428 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
10/09/1960 |
49449 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
44117 |
Transfer in from: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
90178 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
90464 |
Transfer in from: |
68A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
49262 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
49352 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
G2 |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
17/09/1960 |
49448 |
Transfer out to: |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
43185 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1960 |
43213 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
15/10/1960 |
44596 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1960 |
58177 |
Transfer out to: |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
12022 |
Transfer out to: |
5B |
Crewe South |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
21/01/1961 |
47444 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
2F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/02/1961 |
58291 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/03/1961 |
44075 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Northampton |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
29/03/1961 |
D2387 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
01/04/1961 |
41289 |
Transfer out to: |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
08/04/1961 |
41211 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
08/04/1961 |
41288 |
Transfer out to: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
1142 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
08/04/1961 |
58182 |
Transfer out to: |
2A |
Rugby |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
4w/e |
22/04/1961 |
D2387 |
Transfer out to: |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
10/06/1961 |
44493 |
Transfer in from: |
6H |
Bangor |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
11/08/1961 |
D2374 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
22/08/1961 |
D2375 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
on |
07/09/1961 |
D2376 |
1st Allocation |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
09/09/1961 |
49196 |
Transfer out to: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D2374 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
D2375 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/09/1961 |
41324 |
Transfer out to: |
75A |
Brighton |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
23/09/1961 |
47490 |
Transfer in from: |
8D |
Widnes |
|
|
Diesel |
03 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
30/09/1961 |
D2376 |
Transfer out to: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
G2A |
0-8-0 |
w/e |
14/10/1961 |
49288 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/11/1961 |
44127 |
Transfer in from: |
|
Crewe Works |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
25/11/1961 |
44305 |
Transfer out to: |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
16/12/1961 |
41286 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
03/02/1962 |
41286 |
Transfer in from: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
28/04/1962 |
47366 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
05/05/1962 |
47392 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
76020 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
21/07/1962 |
76023 |
Transfer out to: |
21D |
Aston |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/08/1962 |
47392 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
47668 |
Transfer in from: |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/08/1962 |
44497 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
01/09/1962 |
44315 |
Transfer out to: |
9D |
Buxton (LNWR) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
15/09/1962 |
90606 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
47376 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/01/1963 |
90566 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
01/06/1963 |
90147 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/06/1963 |
90170 |
Transfer out to: |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
47377 |
Transfer in from: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
41212 |
Transfer out to: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
22/06/1963 |
44192 |
Transfer out to: |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
06/07/1963 |
90147 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
13/07/1963 |
47490 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
17/08/1963 |
44484 |
Transfer in from: |
21B |
Bescot |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
m/e |
09/1963 |
44596 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
19/10/1963 |
90702 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
26/10/1963 |
44493 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
02/11/1963 |
44200 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
44439 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
18/01/1964 |
44300 |
Transfer out to: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
29/02/1964 |
44536 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/03/1964 |
90390 |
Transfer in from: |
9G |
Gorton |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/03/1964 |
90464 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
11/04/1964 |
44439 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/04/1964 |
90187 |
Transfer in from: |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/06/1964 |
90187 |
Transfer out to: |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
20/06/1964 |
47367 |
Transfer in from: |
18A |
Toton |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
04/07/1964 |
44484 |
Transfer out to: |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/07/1964 |
90566 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
25/07/1964 |
90702 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/09/1964 |
90606 |
Transfer out to: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44200 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
19/09/1964 |
44117 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
03/10/1964 |
44356 |
Transfer in from: |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
07/11/1964 |
43994 |
Transfer in from: |
16D |
Nottingham |
|
|
Diesel |
D3/7 |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
28/11/1964 |
12023 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
16/01/1965 |
44127 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1965 |
44356 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
20/02/1965 |
44536 |
Transfer out to: |
12D |
Workington |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
76080 |
Transfer in from: |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
76081 |
Transfer in from: |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
76082 |
Transfer in from: |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
76083 |
Transfer in from: |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
76084 |
Transfer in from: |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
13/03/1965 |
90148 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
on |
27/03/1965 |
43994 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
44266 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
27/03/1965 |
47452 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
48053 |
Transfer in from: |
15A |
Leicester Midland |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
48326 |
Transfer in from: |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
48479 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
48623 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
48647 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/04/1965 |
48727 |
Transfer in from: |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/04/1965 |
90148 |
Transfer out to: |
10H |
Lower Darwen |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/05/1965 |
48053 |
Transfer out to: |
16B |
Annesley |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
90178 |
Transfer out to: |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
90212 |
Transfer out to: |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
90390 |
Transfer out to: |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
WD/8 |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
29/05/1965 |
90702 |
Transfer out to: |
36C |
Frodingham |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/06/1965 |
47453 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
48290 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/06/1965 |
48422 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
03/07/1965 |
47367 |
Transfer out to: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
07/08/1965 |
41234 |
Transfer in from: |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/08/1965 |
48290 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
44086 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
21/08/1965 |
44350 |
Transfer out to: |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
28/08/1965 |
48251 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
4F |
0-6-0 |
w/e |
27/11/1965 |
44075 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/02/1966 |
47393 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/02/1966 |
48479 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
26/03/1966 |
48422 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48206 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48215 |
Transfer in from: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/04/1966 |
48647 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
21/05/1966 |
48722 |
Transfer in from: |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
09/07/1966 |
48215 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
16/07/1966 |
48326 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
23/07/1966 |
48121 |
Transfer in from: |
2C |
Stourbridge Junction |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
48614 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
03/09/1966 |
48750 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1966 |
48149 |
Transfer in from: |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/09/1966 |
48362 |
Transfer in from: |
16E |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
m/e |
10/1966 |
48251 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
47668 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
48623 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
08/10/1966 |
76082 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
15/10/1966 |
47377 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
47603 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
47671 |
Transfer in from: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
22/10/1966 |
76083 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
48167 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
76051 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
76075 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
47603 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
12/11/1966 |
47671 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
47279 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
47289 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
41234 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
2MT |
2-6-2T |
w/e |
19/11/1966 |
41286 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
10/12/1966 |
48193 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
47279 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
31/12/1966 |
47298 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1967 |
48185 |
Transfer in from: |
16B |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1967 |
48617 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
14/01/1967 |
48149 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
48153 |
Transfer in from: |
2E |
Saltley |
|
|
Steam |
3F |
0-6-0T |
w/e |
04/02/1967 |
47289 |
Transfer out to: |
16G |
Westhouses |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1967 |
48192 |
Transfer in from: |
40E |
Colwick |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
11/02/1967 |
48185 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
22/04/1967 |
48121 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
29/04/1967 |
76051 |
Condemned |
|
|
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
48617 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
48722 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
48727 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
20/05/1967 |
48750 |
Transfer out to: |
8E |
Northwich |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
48279 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
17/06/1967 |
48676 |
Transfer in from: |
8L |
Aintree |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48153 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48167 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48192 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48193 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48206 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48279 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48362 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48614 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
8F |
2-8-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
48676 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76075 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76079 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76080 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76081 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|
Steam |
Standard Class 4 |
2-6-0 |
w/e |
24/06/1967 |
76084 |
Transfer out to: |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
|