Depot: Tebay
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 16 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2308 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2403 | Snapshot | 11D | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2404 | Snapshot | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2424 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4083 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4292 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4469 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 70 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9088 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9104 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9252 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2396 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 2308 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 67 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 49252 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 9088 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 49104 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 4459 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 40070 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40016 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 40064 | Transfer in from: | 20G | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 43980 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 40064 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 40067 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 42393 | Transfer in from: | 11C | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 42393 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 42393 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 40536 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 40536 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 43028 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 43029 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 43035 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 42404 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 44292 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 44459 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 42404 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44360 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 43011 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 44360 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 06/07/1957 | 43980 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44345 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 44469 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 42393 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44083 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44345 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 43011 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 43028 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 43029 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 43009 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 43029 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 42379 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42379 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 21/10/1961 | 42404 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 42317 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 42414 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 42317 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 42396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 42415 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42187 | Transfer in from: | 24F | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42278 | Transfer in from: | 24H | Hellifield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42403 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42415 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/02/1963 | 42110 | Transfer in from: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 42424 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 42187 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 42095 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 42278 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 42210 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1964 | 42439 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 10/10/1964 | 42414 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 42232 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 42225 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 14/08/1965 | 42439 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 43035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1965 | 43033 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 29/01/1966 | 42232 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/02/1966 | 42154 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 04/06/1966 | 42095 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/06/1966 | 42665 | Transfer in from: | 8M | Southport | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 11/06/1966 | 42110 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1966 | 42251 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 18/06/1966 | 42225 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 42611 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1966 | 43119 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 26/11/1966 | 43009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 42134 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 42236 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 42252 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1966 | 43119 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1967 | 42611 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 14/01/1967 | 42154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/04/1967 | 42134 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 75019 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 75026 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 75027 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 75039 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 43029 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 43033 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 42251 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 42665 | Transfer out to: | 56F | Low Moor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 06/05/1967 | 42210 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 75024 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 75032 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 75037 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 75035 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 42236 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 27/05/1967 | 42252 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1967 | 75035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 75039 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 75024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 75026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1967 | 75037 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 75019 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 75027 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 75032 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth |