Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 832 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6232 Week
» 24284 Month
» 257204 Year
» 1922580 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Three Bridges


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2002 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2007 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2078 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2079 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2080 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2081 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2082 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Goods 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2303 Snapshot        
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2352 Snapshot        
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2353 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2400 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2405 Snapshot        
Steam Small Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2436 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2441 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2445 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2451 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2465 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2480 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2484 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2497 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2516 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2519 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2520 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2522 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2527 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2529 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2532 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2545 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2552 Snapshot        
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 2553 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2572 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2585 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2593 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2598 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2599 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2601 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2602 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2604 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 541 Snapshot GFD Guildford    
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 542 Snapshot GFD Guildford    
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 02/1948 2601 Condemned      
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 07/1948 2598 Condemned      
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 09/1948 2007 Condemned      
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 09/1948 2599 Condemned      
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 09/1948 2604 Condemned      
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T m/e 03/1949 32572 Condemned      
Steam Small Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 01/1950 32436 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 03/1950 32080 Condemned      
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/09/1950 32584 Transfer in from: HOR Horsham    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 30542 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 09/09/1950 32585 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32082 Transfer in from: 3B Three Bridges    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32090 Transfer in from: EBN Eastbourne    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 32347 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 32348 Transfer in from: EBN Eastbourne    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 32349 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam I1X 4-4-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32002 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32082 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 04/11/1950 32079 Condemned      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 13/11/1950 32348 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 12/1950 32090 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32029 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32582 Transfer in from: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32591 Transfer in from: TWW Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32593 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 02/1951 32078 Condemned      
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T m/e 02/1951 32584 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32081 Transfer in from: 3B Three Bridges    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32029 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32081 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32075 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 32348 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 6w/e 20/03/1951 32347 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32582 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 11/04/1951 32021 Transfer in from: TWW Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32075 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32348 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32526 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32528 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32534 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32535 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32536 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32537 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32538 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32021 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32075 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32348 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32441 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32445 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32451 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32522 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32545 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32552 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 12/05/1951 32553 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 06/1951 32602 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T w/e 23/06/1951 32082 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32021 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 32348 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 32349 Transfer out to: 71D Fratton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 27/07/1951 32538 Transfer out to: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 09/1951 32081 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 05/09/1951 32481 Transfer in from: NORW Norwood Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 05/09/1951 32497 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 10/1951 32021 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Goods 0-6-0 m/e 10/1951 32303 Condemned      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 32348 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 32482 Transfer in from: HOR Horsham    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 32465 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 32591 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 12/1951 32075 Condemned      
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T m/e 12/1951 32405 Condemned      
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T w/e 01/12/1951 32400 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 42099 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 42102 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 30544 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 19/03/1952 32347 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32399 Transfer in from: 75D Horsham    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/03/1952 32571 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 42092 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 42099 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 42102 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 04/1952 41307 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 42093 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 13/08/1952 42066 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 8w/e 07/10/1952 32538 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 5w/e 14/02/1953 30951 Transfer in from: HIT Hither Green    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 14/02/1953 41303 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/05/1953 32399 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 32345 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 32346 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 32482 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 41297 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 42106 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Q 0-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30541 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q 0-6-0 8w/e 20/07/1953 30544 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 32482 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 32571 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/12/1953 32571 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 08/02/1954 31591 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 18/06/1954 32571 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 20/08/1954 32344 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/11/1954 32482 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam C 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 31724 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 31591 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 11/12/1954 32484 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 32526 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 11/12/1954 32527 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 18/12/1954 42093 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 9w/e 08/02/1955 31591 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 9w/e 08/02/1955 32484 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 9w/e 08/02/1955 42086 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 08/02/1955 41303 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 11/03/1955 41313 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Coppernobs 4-4-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 31591 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam C 0-6-0 5w/e 11/03/1955 31724 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 11/03/1955 32481 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 20/04/1955 32516 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30028 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30052 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30379 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 42069 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 21/06/1955 41297 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 21/06/1955 41307 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 21/06/1955 41313 Transfer out to: 73E Faversham    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 32526 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 32527 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/10/1955 32484 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 32536 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 32537 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 10/10/1955 32538 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 3w/e 01/11/1955 32536 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Z 0-8-0T 3w/e 01/11/1955 30951 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 19/12/1955 30328 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 19/12/1955 30379 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 31521 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 31530 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30028 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30052 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30328 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 32438 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42067 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42068 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42070 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42071 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 3w/e 17/11/1956 32480 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 3w/e 17/11/1956 32536 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42086 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42092 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42106 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T w/e 12/01/1957 32520 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 6w/e 25/01/1957 32536 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 6w/e 01/04/1957 32523 Transfer in from: 75D Horsham    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 6w/e 01/04/1957 32526 Transfer out to: 75D Horsham    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 12/06/1957 41319 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 08/10/1957 30052 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 08/10/1957 30056 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 7w/e 08/10/1957 32443 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 14/01/1958 31521 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 14/01/1958 31521 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 14/01/1958 32443 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1958 42074 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 32438 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 22/03/1958 32519 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 30110 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31530 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 31162 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 31269 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30052 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30056 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 30110 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 3w/e 13/10/1958 41319 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 11/03/1959 75075 Transfer in from: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 11/03/1959 80010 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 11/03/1959 80011 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 11/03/1959 80012 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/03/1959 42066 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/03/1959 42067 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/03/1959 42074 Transfer out to: 73H Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31161 Transfer in from: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31522 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31269 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Q 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 30544 Transfer in from: 75D Horsham    
Steam Q 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 30545 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Q 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 30546 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam Q 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 30547 Transfer in from: 75D Horsham    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 18/07/1959 32463 Transfer in from: 75D Horsham    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 18/07/1959 32469 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 18/07/1959 32470 Transfer in from: BTN Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 32522 Transfer in from: 75D Horsham    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 32526 Transfer in from: 75D Horsham    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 18/07/1959 32541 Transfer in from: 75D Horsham    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T m/e 09/1959 32463 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 10/1959 32529 Condemned      
Steam E2 0-6-0T 6w/e 22/10/1959 32107 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 6w/e 22/10/1959 32541 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30052 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30055 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 30109 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 32337 Transfer in from: 70F Fratton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 5w/e 26/11/1959 32349 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 31162 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 31522 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42068 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42069 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42070 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42071 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80087 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80088 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80089 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80094 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T m/e 31/01/1960 80087 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 06/02/1960 32526 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 6w/e 09/02/1960 75070 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 10/03/1960 32564 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam E2 0-6-0T 4w/e 10/03/1960 32107 Transfer out to: 71I Southampton Docks    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 32337 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 32349 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 32337 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 4w/e 05/04/1960 32349 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 06/1960 32532 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 10/06/1960 31306 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 5w/e 10/06/1960 30052 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 10/06/1960 31161 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 6w/e 05/10/1960 32337 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 6w/e 05/10/1960 32344 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 32527 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 03/1961 32528 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 11/03/1961 32536 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 32441 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 32449 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 5w/e 18/03/1961 32553 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 03/05/1961 30053 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31551 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31553 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31892 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31893 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 31894 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 80087 Transfer in from: 73F Ashford    
Steam Q 0-6-0 3w/e 26/05/1961 30544 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 06/1961 30109 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 06/1961 31553 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 17/06/1961 32449 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 19/08/1961 32553 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 23/08/1961 30055 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 23/08/1961 30055 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T w/e 23/09/1961 32564 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 10/1961 32534 Condemned      
Steam Radials 0-6-2T w/e 07/10/1961 32469 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 2w/e 10/10/1961 31891 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 2w/e 10/10/1961 32474 Transfer in from: BA Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 21/10/1961 32441 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 21/10/1961 32522 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 09/11/1961 32525 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 30540 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 08/12/1961 31530 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 m/e 08/12/1961 32438 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 30/12/1961 31306 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 30/12/1961 32438 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 03/02/1962 32525 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 32523 Condemned      
Steam Large Vulcans 0-6-0 w/e 10/02/1962 32535 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 24/03/1962 31530 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 01/05/1962 31897 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/05/1962 32470 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 01/05/1962 32474 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 19/05/1962 31521 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 28/05/1962 31324 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 31263 Transfer in from: 73FSub Ashford Chart Leacon    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 02/07/1962 31890 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 5w/e 02/07/1962 30053 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 5w/e 02/07/1962 31897 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 28/07/1962 31324 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 30/07/1962 30055 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 24/09/1962 33024 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 24/09/1962 33026 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 24/09/1962 33028 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 24/09/1962 33029 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 24/09/1962 31263 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 24/09/1962 31551 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 24/09/1962 75070 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 24/09/1962 75075 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 32348 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 30540 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 31892 Condemned      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 32346 Condemned      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 32349 Condemned      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 w/e 24/11/1962 32352 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 30549 Transfer in from: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 33014 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 33015 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 33016 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 33017 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 33018 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 31890 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 4w/e 17/12/1962 31891 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/12/1962 80087 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 on 22/12/1962 32347 Condemned      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 on 29/12/1962 32345 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 30/12/1962 31893 Condemned      
Steam U Boats 2-6-0 on 30/12/1962 31894 Condemned      
Steam Moguls 2-6-0 on 30/12/1962 32353 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 3w/e 07/01/1963 30543 Transfer in from: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q 0-6-0 3w/e 07/01/1963 30544 Transfer in from: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q 0-6-0 3w/e 07/01/1963 30548 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam Q 0-6-0 3w/e 30/01/1963 30536 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam Q 0-6-0 3w/e 30/01/1963 30548 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80010 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80011 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80012 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80088 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80089 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80094 Transfer out to: 75D Stewarts Lane    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 03/02/1963 33028 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 14/07/1963 30531 Transfer in from: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 21/07/1963 30549 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1963 33016 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 25/08/1963 33024 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30029 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30053 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30055 Transfer in from:        
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30133 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30379 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 31005 Transfer in from:        
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 31263 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 31518 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 31544 Transfer in from:        
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 31551 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 06/10/1963 30379 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 14/10/1963 33004 Transfer in from: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 4w/e 14/10/1963 33006 Transfer in from: GFD Guildford    
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 30536 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 30544 Condemned      
Steam Q 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 30547 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 05/01/1964 31263 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 05/01/1964 31518 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 05/01/1964 31551 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 33014 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 33017 Condemned      
Steam Q1 0-6-0 w/e 05/01/1964 33029 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 06/01/1964 30029 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 06/01/1964 30053 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T m/e 06/01/1964 30133 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 30531 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 30543 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 30546 Transfer out to: 70F Bournemouth    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33004 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33006 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33015 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33018 Transfer out to: 70C Guildford    
Steam Q1 0-6-0 m/e 06/01/1964 33026 Transfer out to: 70B Feltham    
Steam Q 0-6-0 m/e 27/01/1964 30545 Transfer out to: 70A Nine Elms