Depot: Tinsley
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1500 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1531 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1532 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1533 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1534 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1535 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1536 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1537 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1538 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1539 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1540 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1541 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1542 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1543 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1544 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1545 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1548 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1549 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1550 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1551 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1552 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1553 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1554 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1555 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1556 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1557 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1558 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1559 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1560 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1561 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1562 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D1563 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3086 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3127 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3129 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3131 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3251 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3252 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3253 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3254 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3288 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3289 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3293 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3336 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3574 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3575 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3662 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3698 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D3727 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4028 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4029 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4035 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4036 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4037 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4038 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4039 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4040 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4041 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4042 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4043 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4044 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4046 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4047 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/04/1964 | D4048 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5584 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5682 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5683 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5684 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5687 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5690 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5691 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5692 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5840 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5841 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5842 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5843 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5844 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5845 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5846 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5847 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5848 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5849 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5850 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5851 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5852 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5857 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5858 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5859 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5860 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5861 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/04/1964 | D5862 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6742 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6743 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6744 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6745 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6746 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6747 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6748 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6749 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6750 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6751 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6752 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6753 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6754 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6796 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6797 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6798 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6799 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6800 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6801 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6802 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6803 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6804 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6805 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6806 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6807 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6808 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6809 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6810 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6811 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6812 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6813 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6814 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6815 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6816 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6817 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/04/1964 | D6818 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8022 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8023 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8024 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8050 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8051 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8052 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8053 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8054 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8055 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8056 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8057 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8058 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8059 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8060 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8061 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8062 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8063 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8064 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8065 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8066 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8067 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8068 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/04/1964 | D8069 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/05/1964 | D1758 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/06/1964 | D1758 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/08/1964 | D5592 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/08/1964 | D5599 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/08/1964 | D1759 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/08/1964 | D5590 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/09/1964 | D1761 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/09/1964 | D1762 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/09/1964 | D1760 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/09/1964 | D1764 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/09/1964 | D1763 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/09/1964 | D8604 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/09/1964 | D1766 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/10/1964 | D8605 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1964 | D1765 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1964 | D1770 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/10/1964 | D1772 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/10/1964 | D8606 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/10/1964 | D1771 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/10/1964 | D8607 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 19/10/1964 | D1774 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/10/1964 | D1769 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/10/1964 | D1776 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/10/1964 | D1775 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/10/1964 | D1778 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1531 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1533 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1538 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1549 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1559 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1561 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1562 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1563 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1964 | D1763 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/10/1964 | D8608 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/10/1964 | D1767 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/10/1964 | D1779 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/10/1964 | D1768 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/10/1964 | D1780 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/10/1964 | D1532 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/11/1964 | D1777 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/11/1964 | D1781 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/11/1964 | D1784 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/11/1964 | D1782 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/11/1964 | D1783 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1532 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1538 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1542 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1555 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/11/1964 | D1759 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/11/1964 | D1758 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1964 | D3707 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/11/1964 | D1761 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/11/1964 | D8609 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/11/1964 | D1786 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/11/1964 | D1787 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 27/11/1964 | D1789 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D1763 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D5677 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D1760 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D5599 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/12/1964 | D8610 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/12/1964 | D1785 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 09/12/1964 | D1788 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/12/1964 | D1790 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/12/1964 | D1791 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1964 | D1793 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/12/1964 | D1794 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/12/1964 | D8611 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/12/1964 | D3703 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/01/1965 | D1797 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/01/1965 | D1795 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 08/01/1965 | D1796 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1549 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5855 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5856 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1500 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1532 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1534 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1535 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1536 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1537 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1538 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1539 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1540 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1541 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1543 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1544 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1545 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1554 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1556 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1557 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1558 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1560 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1758 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1762 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1763 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1764 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D1765 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5590 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5592 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 13/01/1965 | D6959 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/01/1965 | D1792 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/01/1965 | D1800 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/01/1965 | D1801 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/01/1965 | D6960 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | D4187 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | D4188 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | D4190 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/01/1965 | D1799 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/01/1965 | D1803 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/01/1965 | D1805 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 21/01/1965 | D6961 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/01/1965 | D1802 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 22/01/1965 | D6962 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/01/1965 | D8613 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 26/01/1965 | D1806 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 27/01/1965 | D6963 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/01/1965 | D8612 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/01/1965 | D1798 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 29/01/1965 | D6964 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/01/1965 | D7638 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | D4189 | Transfer in from: | 30F | Parkeston Quay | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 03/02/1965 | D6965 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 11/02/1965 | D6966 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 11/02/1965 | D6967 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/02/1965 | D8614 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/02/1965 | D1574 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 16/02/1965 | D1804 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 17/02/1965 | D6968 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/02/1965 | D5540 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/02/1965 | D5690 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D5844 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1548 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1549 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1766 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1767 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1768 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D1769 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D5844 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/03/1965 | D8615 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5557 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5685 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/03/1965 | D5844 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/03/1965 | D5844 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/03/1965 | D5692 | Transfer out to: | D15 | Leicester Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/03/1965 | D5855 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/03/1965 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/03/1965 | D5855 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/03/1965 | D5686 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1965 | D5541 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1965 | D5851 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1965 | D5857 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5692 | Transfer in from: | D15 | Leicester Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5851 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5686 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5844 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8604 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8605 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8606 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8607 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8608 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8609 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8610 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8611 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8612 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8613 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8614 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 17 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D8615 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D5842 | Transfer out to: | D15 | Leicester Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D5860 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/04/1965 | D5855 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/04/1965 | D5855 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1965 | D5686 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D5842 | Transfer in from: | D15 | Leicester Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D5844 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D5683 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 01/05/1965 | D5848 | Transfer out to: | O/L | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/05/1965 | D1864 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/05/1965 | D1862 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1965 | D5680 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1965 | D5683 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1965 | D5859 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1965 | D5851 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1965 | D5859 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/05/1965 | D5848 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/05/1965 | D1865 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/05/1965 | D1866 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/05/1965 | D1868 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/05/1965 | D1873 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/05/1965 | D5850 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/06/1965 | D8069 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/06/1965 | D8069 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/06/1965 | D1863 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/06/1965 | D1870 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/06/1965 | D1877 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 11/06/1965 | D1878 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/06/1965 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/06/1965 | D1869 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/06/1965 | D1872 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/06/1965 | D1871 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/06/1965 | D1874 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/06/1965 | D1876 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/06/1965 | D1881 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D1767 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5040 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5046 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5047 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5048 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5049 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5528 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5552 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5660 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5662 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5663 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5664 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5677 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5698 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5860 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D6728 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D6729 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D5677 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/06/1965 | D8069 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/06/1965 | D8069 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/07/1965 | D1867 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D3697 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5681 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5850 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5861 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D1550 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D1551 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D1767 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D1771 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5852 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/07/1965 | D5861 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5698 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5040 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5046 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5047 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5048 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5049 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5698 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/07/1965 | D1889 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/07/1965 | D1890 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D1576 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D1889 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D5843 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D6959 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D6960 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D6961 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D6962 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D6963 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/07/1965 | D6964 | Transfer out to: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/07/1965 | D1888 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/07/1965 | D7624 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/07/1965 | D7625 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 31/07/1965 | D5546 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 31/07/1965 | D5692 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/08/1965 | D7626 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/08/1965 | D1891 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/08/1965 | D1892 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8022 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8023 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8024 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8050 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8051 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8052 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/08/1965 | D8053 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/08/1965 | D7627 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/08/1965 | D7628 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/08/1965 | D5584 | Transfer out to: | 91R | |||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D5568 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D5843 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D5861 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D5841 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D5856 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 21/08/1965 | D5861 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D5584 | Transfer in from: | 91R | |||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D5841 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D5845 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D5682 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D5845 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/09/1965 | D1895 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/09/1965 | D1897 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/09/1965 | D1896 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/09/1965 | D7629 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D1770 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D1770 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D5687 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/09/1965 | D7630 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1965 | D1703 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/09/1965 | D5856 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/09/1965 | D8056 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | D5687 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | D5845 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/09/1965 | D1868 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | D5845 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/09/1965 | D5848 | Transfer out to: | O/L | |||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 29/09/1965 | D7631 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D1773 | Transfer in from: | 92T | Research Department (Toton) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/10/1965 | D7632 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1525 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1527 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1531 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1768 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1769 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1875 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1879 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D1882 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3326 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3330 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3439 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3440 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3443 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3444 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3452 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3475 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3659 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3660 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3661 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3663 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3664 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3685 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D3702 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4045 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4049 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4050 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4051 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4052 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4054 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4055 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4056 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4058 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4059 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4062 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4063 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4064 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4065 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4068 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4070 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4071 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4072 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4073 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4074 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4089 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4090 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4091 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4092 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4093 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D4094 | Transfer in from: | 41B | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5533 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5536 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5538 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5539 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5542 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5543 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5549 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5550 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5555 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5558 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5561 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5565 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5567 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5579 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5583 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5585 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5586 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5665 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5670 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5804 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5805 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5806 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5660 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5662 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5664 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5685 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D5698 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8054 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8055 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1965 | D8057 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5677 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5805 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5848 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5663 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5677 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5805 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/10/1965 | D7634 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/10/1965 | D1771 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/10/1965 | D5677 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/10/1965 | D5677 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/10/1965 | D5686 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/10/1965 | D5805 | Transfer out to: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/10/1965 | D7633 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | on | 04/11/1965 | D1702 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | on | 04/11/1965 | D1705 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/11/1965 | D7635 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D1889 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5578 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5588 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5589 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5590 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5599 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5633 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5668 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5688 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5698 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5805 | Transfer in from: | 16G | Westhouses | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5854 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D3326 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D3661 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D4055 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D4056 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D4058 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5687 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D5861 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D5586 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D4059 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D4062 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D4063 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D4064 | Transfer out to: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D5586 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D5686 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/11/1965 | D7636 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/11/1965 | D5586 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/11/1965 | D5586 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 20/11/1965 | D5588 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/11/1965 | D5686 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D113 | Transfer in from: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1894 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D5588 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1797 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1798 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1799 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1800 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1801 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1802 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1803 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1804 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1805 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D1806 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D4065 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | D4068 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D5616 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D3086 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D3127 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D3129 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D3131 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D4070 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D4071 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/12/1965 | D5599 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 22/12/1965 | D7637 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/12/1965 | D7639 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | D113 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | D4073 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | D4074 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/1965 | D1706 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 31/12/1965 | D7640 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D3251 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D3439 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D3440 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D3663 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D4038 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D4045 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D4048 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D4072 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D4091 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1966 | D4092 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5630 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5633 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5668 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/01/1966 | D8128 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 14/01/1966 | D7641 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D5633 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D5848 | Transfer out to: | O/L | |||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D8066 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5581 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D8066 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5538 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5539 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5542 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5583 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5585 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5665 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5804 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5805 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D5806 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D8058 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D8069 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/01/1966 | D8069 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/01/1966 | D7642 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1631 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1632 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1773 | Transfer out to: | 92D | Research Department (Derby) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/01/1966 | D1776 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/02/1966 | D7598 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/02/1966 | D7599 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4049 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4050 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4051 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4052 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4054 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D1525 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D1527 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4049 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4050 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4051 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4052 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D4054 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/02/1966 | D8128 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/02/1966 | D7643 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/02/1966 | D1880 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/02/1966 | D8129 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1571 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1572 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1894 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1895 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5533 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5550 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5552 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5565 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5578 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5588 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5589 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5698 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5842 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5858 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D5860 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/02/1966 | D7600 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/02/1966 | D7601 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/02/1966 | D8130 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/02/1966 | D1868 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/02/1966 | D5848 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/02/1966 | D1872 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/02/1966 | D7602 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/02/1966 | D7603 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/02/1966 | D8131 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/02/1966 | D8058 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/02/1966 | D8128 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/02/1966 | D8064 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/03/1966 | D8132 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D1550 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D3562 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D88 | Transfer in from: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D1868 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5543 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5558 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5561 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5567 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5579 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5586 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5670 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5688 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5691 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5847 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/03/1966 | D5862 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/03/1966 | D7604 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/03/1966 | D7605 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D5588 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D88 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/03/1966 | D7645 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/03/1966 | D8133 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/03/1966 | D7606 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/03/1966 | D1872 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/03/1966 | D1552 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/03/1966 | D1873 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/03/1966 | D7644 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/03/1966 | D7607 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/03/1966 | D7646 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/03/1966 | D8064 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/03/1966 | D7647 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/04/1966 | D7608 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/04/1966 | D7609 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/04/1966 | D7610 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/04/1966 | D7648 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/04/1966 | D7649 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D1545 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D1547 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D1773 | Transfer in from: | 92D | Research Department (Derby) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D1868 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/04/1966 | D1531 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1631 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/04/1966 | D1632 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1546 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1798 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1799 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1800 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1873 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5807 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5808 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5809 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5810 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5811 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5812 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5813 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5814 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5815 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D5816 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8015 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8016 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8017 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8018 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D8019 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1770 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1772 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1774 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1777 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1778 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1779 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1780 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1781 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1782 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6728 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6729 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6742 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6743 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6744 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D6745 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7624 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7625 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7626 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7627 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7628 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7629 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7630 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7631 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7632 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7633 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7634 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7635 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7636 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7637 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7638 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7639 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7640 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7641 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7642 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7643 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D7644 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/05/1966 | D1787 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/05/1966 | D1894 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/05/1966 | D1994 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/05/1966 | D1787 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/05/1966 | D1788 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/05/1966 | D1791 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/05/1966 | D1771 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/05/1966 | D1544 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/05/1966 | D1874 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8060 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8061 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8062 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8067 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8129 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8131 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/05/1966 | D8133 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/06/1966 | D1893 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/06/1966 | D1800 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/06/1966 | D1575 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/06/1966 | D1545 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D5538 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D5539 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D5542 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D5583 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D5585 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D5804 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D5805 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D5806 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7600 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7601 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7602 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7603 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7604 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7605 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7606 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7607 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D7608 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D8063 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D8128 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D8130 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D8132 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1576 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1768 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1769 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1783 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1784 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1785 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1786 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D1787 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D6746 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D6747 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D6965 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D6966 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D6967 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/06/1966 | D6968 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D1788 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D1791 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D1894 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/07/1966 | D1994 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | on | 21/07/1966 | D1704 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1535 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1536 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1537 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1538 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1539 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1541 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D1542 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5811 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5812 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5813 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5814 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5815 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/08/1966 | D5816 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/08/1966 | D1544 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/08/1966 | D1553 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D1547 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/09/1966 | D1550 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D4030 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D4034 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D8013 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D8014 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D8020 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1535 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1536 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1537 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1538 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D1773 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D5588 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D5590 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D5677 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D7598 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D7599 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1966 | D4039 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D3452 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D3475 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D1867 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D1868 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D5616 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7609 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7610 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7645 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7646 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7647 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7648 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1966 | D7649 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D1867 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D5547 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D1794 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D1866 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8018 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8019 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | D8020 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/02/1967 | D1794 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/02/1967 | D1798 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/02/1967 | D1539 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/02/1967 | D1541 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/02/1967 | D1868 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/02/1967 | D5556 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/02/1967 | D5584 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/03/1967 | D1798 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/03/1967 | D1891 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8052 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8053 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8054 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8055 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8056 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D8057 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D1892 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5528 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5547 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5555 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5854 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/03/1967 | D1891 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/03/1967 | D5834 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/03/1967 | D5633 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5577 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D5696 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/04/1967 | D1892 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/06/1967 | D1524 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/06/1967 | D1525 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/06/1967 | D1867 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/06/1967 | D1868 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/06/1967 | D1539 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/06/1967 | D1541 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/06/1967 | D6748 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5556 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5577 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D5581 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D6749 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D6750 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D6751 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D6752 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D6753 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D6754 | Transfer out to: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D6796 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D6798 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D8052 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D8053 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/08/1967 | D8054 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/08/1967 | D8013 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/08/1967 | D8014 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/08/1967 | D8015 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1885 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1886 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1887 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1898 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1899 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1900 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D5677 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D5678 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D6797 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1862 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1863 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1864 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1869 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1870 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D1871 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D6797 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1967 | D6799 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | D4089 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | D4090 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | D4093 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | D4094 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/09/1967 | D6797 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5547 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5548 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5584 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D5835 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D8055 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D8056 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1967 | D8057 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1520 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1521 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1522 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1523 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1571 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1572 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1574 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1967 | D1775 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D6701 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D6702 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D6703 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D6704 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D6708 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D5535 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D5537 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1510 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1511 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1512 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1513 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1514 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1515 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1516 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1517 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1518 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1519 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1536 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1537 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1891 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1520 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1521 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1522 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1523 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1524 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1525 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1865 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1872 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1873 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1890 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1891 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1892 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1893 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1967 | D1891 | Transfer out to: | 56A | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5577 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5578 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/12/1967 | D5582 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D5589 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D5592 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D3443 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D6817 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1968 | D6818 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8016 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8017 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8058 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8059 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8064 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8065 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8066 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8068 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1968 | D8069 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/04/1968 | D3478 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/04/1968 | D3727 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | D3918 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | D3660 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/05/1968 | D3478 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1520 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1521 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1522 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1523 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1524 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1525 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1526 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1545 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1558 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1559 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1560 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D1561 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D3727 | Transfer in from: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5811 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5812 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5813 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5814 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5815 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5816 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5817 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5818 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5819 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5820 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5821 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5822 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5823 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5824 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5825 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5826 | Transfer in from: | 41F.1 | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5827 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5829 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5830 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5831 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5832 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5833 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D5836 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6705 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6706 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6707 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6709 | Transfer in from: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6713 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6714 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6715 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6716 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6717 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6718 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6719 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6720 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1968 | D6959 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1758 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1759 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1768 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1770 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D3920 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1795 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1796 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1798 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D1799 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D3727 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/06/1968 | D4039 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/06/1968 | D1769 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/06/1968 | D1523 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D3444 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D3664 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/07/1968 | D3685 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1968 | D3918 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/08/1968 | D1570 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/08/1968 | D1769 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5535 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5536 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5537 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D5592 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D6720 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/08/1968 | D5622 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/08/1968 | D5589 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/09/1968 | D3405 | Transfer in from: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/09/1968 | D3920 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1523 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1529 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1531 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1532 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1533 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1534 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1535 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1543 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1571 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1572 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1574 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D6710 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D6953 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1536 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1537 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1758 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1759 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1770 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1790 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1792 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1880 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1881 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1882 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1885 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1888 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1889 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D1896 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D5557 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D5577 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D5578 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D5582 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/10/1968 | D5583 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1782 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1783 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1784 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1785 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1977 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1978 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1980 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1981 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1998 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1999 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1529 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1539 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1558 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1559 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1560 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1561 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1570 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1571 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1572 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1574 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/11/1968 | D5568 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D1833 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D1545 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/11/1968 | D1546 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3252 | Transfer out to: | 36C | Frodingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D1801 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D1802 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D1803 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D1543 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D1833 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D5539 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/12/1968 | D5547 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D1568 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D3308 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D3310 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D1706 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D4040 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D4041 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D5622 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1982 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1983 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1984 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1785 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1788 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D1789 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D5543 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D5697 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/03/1969 | D1998 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/04/1969 | D1999 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/04/1969 | D6912 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/04/1969 | D6913 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/04/1969 | D6935 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/04/1969 | D1703 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D1983 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D1984 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5855 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5856 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/05/1969 | D5859 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/05/1969 | D1768 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/06/1969 | D1567 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/06/1969 | D1705 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1566 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D5544 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1704 | Transfer out to: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1969 | D4052 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/07/1969 | D4042 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/07/1969 | D4043 | Transfer out to: | 55H | Neville Hill | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D3337 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6912 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6913 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 26/07/1969 | D6935 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/08/1969 | D1801 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/08/1969 | D1801 | Transfer out to: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/08/1969 | D1543 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/08/1969 | D1801 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/08/1969 | D4057 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/09/1969 | D1994 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/09/1969 | D1517 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/09/1969 | D1983 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/09/1969 | D1510 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1548 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1766 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5622 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D5847 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6781 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6782 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6783 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6784 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6788 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6789 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D6790 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8057 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8310 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8311 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8312 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8313 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8314 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D8315 | Transfer in from: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1969 | D1803 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1969 | D1768 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/10/1969 | D1514 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1773 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1516 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D1111 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/11/1969 | D1512 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1969 | D1767 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/11/1969 | D1519 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/11/1969 | D1110 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/11/1969 | D1513 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1545 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1546 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1547 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1862 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1863 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D3314 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1110 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1111 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1511 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1518 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1802 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1969 | D4044 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D1765 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/12/1969 | D1515 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5586 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D6836 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D1862 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D1863 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5548 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5549 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5622 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/01/1970 | D5677 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6920 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 31/01/1970 | D6953 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1703 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1704 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1705 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1706 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1523 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1524 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1525 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/02/1970 | D1526 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5801 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5828 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5837 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5838 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5839 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5862 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5813 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5815 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5817 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5825 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5829 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/03/1970 | D5834 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1984 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1985 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1986 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1987 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1988 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1765 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1766 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1767 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1768 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/03/1970 | D1773 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/03/1970 | D1875 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/03/1970 | D1876 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/03/1970 | D1877 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/03/1970 | D1878 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/04/1970 | D1886 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/05/1970 | D1879 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D1533 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D1542 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6821 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6822 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6824 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6826 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6828 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6829 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6830 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6701 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6702 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6703 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6704 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6705 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6706 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/05/1970 | D6707 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D5534 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D5637 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D5630 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D5696 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5550 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5551 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5552 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5554 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5555 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5556 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5558 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5559 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5562 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5565 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D5567 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6835 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6860 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6861 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6863 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6864 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6867 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6868 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6869 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1534 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1535 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1541 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1543 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1545 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1782 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1783 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1791 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1897 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1898 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D1899 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6708 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6709 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6710 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6713 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6714 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6715 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6716 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1970 | D6717 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/08/1970 | D1785 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 01/08/1970 | D1788 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D6732 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8018 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8019 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8020 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8021 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8022 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8023 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8025 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D8026 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D1522 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5540 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5543 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5544 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5546 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5681 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/10/1970 | D5697 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8000 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8001 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8004 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8005 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8007 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8008 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8010 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8017 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8034 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8041 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8046 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8048 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8059 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8060 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8061 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1970 | D8065 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D6785 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/10/1970 | D8033 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D1783 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D1548 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D1702 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D5678 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/11/1970 | D5848 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1970 | D4054 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1970 | D4049 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/12/1970 | D4057 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1971 | D5550 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/01/1971 | D5551 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/01/1971 | D6816 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D6804 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/01/1971 | D6860 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 30/01/1971 | D5540 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 30/01/1971 | D5543 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 30/01/1971 | D5544 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 30/01/1971 | D5546 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/01/1971 | D6828 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/01/1971 | D6829 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/01/1971 | D6830 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5847 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5849 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D5850 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1548 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1549 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1551 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1552 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1553 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6823 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6827 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6834 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6960 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D8058 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1705 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D1706 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5546 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5552 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5554 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5555 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5556 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5586 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5637 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5680 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D5683 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6732 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D6920 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/05/1971 | D8032 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/05/1971 | D5534 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1772 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D1703 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/05/1971 | D5541 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1971 | D4051 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1770 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1771 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1773 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1551 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1552 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D1553 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1971 | D3702 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/09/1971 | D5538 | Transfer out to: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1779 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1880 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1881 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1883 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1884 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5538 | Transfer in from: | D10 | Preston Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5858 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6739 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6786 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6791 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6870 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6915 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6926 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8056 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8300 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8301 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8302 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8303 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8304 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8305 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8306 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8307 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8308 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8309 | Transfer in from: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1546 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1547 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1548 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1549 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1566 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1567 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D1568 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5542 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5543 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5544 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5558 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5559 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5562 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5565 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5567 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D5686 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6801 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6802 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6806 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6807 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6809 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6810 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6812 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6813 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D6814 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8000 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8001 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8004 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8005 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8007 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8008 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8010 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8017 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8018 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8019 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8034 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8041 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8046 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D8048 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D5809 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D5812 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | D4048 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | D4036 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D6835 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/11/1971 | D6960 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/12/1971 | D6835 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/12/1971 | D6785 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/12/1971 | D4050 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 01/01/1972 | D6785 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1570 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3196 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3267 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3355 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3357 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 48 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1704 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5814 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5818 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5823 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5824 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5826 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5827 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5828 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5837 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5843 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/01/1972 | D5806 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/01/1972 | D5806 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1972 | D3196 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1972 | D3267 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1972 | D3355 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1972 | D3357 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/01/1972 | D5685 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/02/1972 | D5685 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/03/1972 | D5558 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 25/03/1972 | D5540 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D4045 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D5540 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D3337 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/04/1972 | D4037 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 15/04/1972 | D5584 | Transfer out to: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/04/1972 | D5584 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/04/1972 | D5607 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1791 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1795 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1796 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3897 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3950 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3969 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D3981 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D5560 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D6720 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1986 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1987 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1972 | D1988 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1982 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 20/05/1972 | D1982 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3032 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1972 | D3799 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1972 | D3799 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1972 | D3917 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D1882 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D3026 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D3034 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D1982 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1972 | D3037 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D3015 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D3035 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/08/1972 | D3181 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/08/1972 | D3471 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/08/1972 | D5169 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 05/08/1972 | D5807 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1541 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1543 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1618 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1619 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5583 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/08/1972 | D6862 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1986 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D5171 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D5174 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1770 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D5811 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 02/09/1972 | D5821 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D1624 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D1632 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D1633 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/09/1972 | D1763 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D1988 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D1520 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5162 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5163 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5164 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5165 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5166 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5167 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5168 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5170 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5172 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5173 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5175 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5183 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5184 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5185 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5214 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5228 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5229 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5811 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6737 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1880 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1881 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1882 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1883 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1884 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D1887 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5538 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5540 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5558 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5560 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5585 | Transfer out to: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5607 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5801 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5835 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5841 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D5844 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6739 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6782 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6783 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6784 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/10/1972 | D6785 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1972 | D1620 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1972 | D3308 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1972 | D3950 | Transfer out to: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D5581 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D1988 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D5684 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D5685 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1995 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/11/1972 | D1771 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5541 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5548 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5657 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5658 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5662 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5680 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5804 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5805 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5808 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5810 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5811 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5816 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5845 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/11/1972 | D3026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/11/1972 | D1996 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/11/1972 | D1541 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1972 | D3034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/11/1972 | D5164 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/11/1972 | D5166 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D1997 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D1521 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/12/1972 | D1617 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/12/1972 | D1532 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/12/1972 | D3035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/12/1972 | D3037 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 23/12/1972 | D1575 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | D1721 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | D1998 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D3278 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 30/12/1972 | D1543 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D6736 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/01/1973 | D6794 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/01/1973 | D1737 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/01/1973 | D1531 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1973 | D4039 | Transfer out to: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1973 | D3199 | Transfer in from: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D1965 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D1570 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1987 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1993 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1783 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D1791 | Transfer out to: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5836 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/03/1973 | D6794 | Transfer out to: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D8128 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D8129 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D8130 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D8131 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D8132 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D8133 | Transfer in from: | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7500 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7501 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1797 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1798 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1799 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5164 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5166 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D6833 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1620 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1737 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1763 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1779 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D1998 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5541 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5820 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D5822 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/05/1973 | D8026 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8026 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8049 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8091 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8092 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1973 | D8127 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1973 | D3284 | Transfer in from: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1786 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1933 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D5834 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D6953 | Transfer in from: | 55C | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/07/1973 | D6864 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/07/1973 | D3091 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/08/1973 | D1999 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/08/1973 | D1965 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 25/08/1973 | D7634 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1622 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1623 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1626 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1628 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1629 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1631 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1635 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1690 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1697 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1778 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1885 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1887 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1896 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1897 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1899 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | 47044 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5239 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5240 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5241 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5242 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5538 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5550 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5558 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5585 | Transfer in from: | 55B | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D8003 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D8050 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5581 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5584 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5662 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5846 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6718 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6720 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6737 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6781 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6786 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6789 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6790 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6791 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6803 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6805 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6811 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6815 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6821 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6822 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6861 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6862 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6863 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6867 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6868 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6915 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6953 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/10/1973 | D6959 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/10/1973 | D5233 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/10/1973 | D5234 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/10/1973 | D5235 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/10/1973 | D8119 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/10/1973 | D7563 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/10/1973 | 25284 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/11/1973 | D5808 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 03/11/1973 | D5822 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/11/1973 | D5166 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/11/1973 | D5168 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 03/11/1973 | D5233 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 47127 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 47132 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D6815 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D6816 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D6953 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1896 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1897 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 31323 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D5862 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1973 | D3702 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1973 | D3284 | Transfer out to: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/11/1973 | D4035 | Transfer out to: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/12/1973 | D1687 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/12/1973 | D1635 | Transfer out to: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/12/1973 | 25101 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1792 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5653 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5662 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5678 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D6801 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D6804 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D6942 | Transfer in from: | 56B | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D6950 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1632 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1633 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1721 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D1773 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/01/1974 | 47127 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D5538 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/02/1974 | D6839 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 02/02/1974 | 37250 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37140 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37209 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37242 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 37253 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/02/1974 | 37140 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/02/1974 | D6827 | Transfer out to: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/02/1974 | D6835 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 25016 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 25018 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37106 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37107 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37140 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47125 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D6827 | Transfer in from: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D6835 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31132 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31167 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 37100 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47177 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 47183 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37037 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37081 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37086 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37089 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37091 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37095 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37103 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 37105 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1974 | 08075 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/03/1974 | D3046 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25001 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25002 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25003 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25004 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31172 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31197 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37121 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 37122 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47166 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47167 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47168 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47169 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47173 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47174 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 20026 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31130 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31278 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31287 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31290 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31297 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31306 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47036 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47037 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47038 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47041 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47042 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47043 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47100 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47102 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47109 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47317 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47318 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47366 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47368 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47380 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47381 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 31274 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 31284 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 31299 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 31300 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1974 | 47368 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1974 | 47380 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1974 | 47314 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1974 | 47315 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 25108 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 31172 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 31302 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 31306 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 31308 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 37036 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/08/1974 | 47314 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 03/08/1974 | 47132 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1974 | 25026 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 17/08/1974 | 31140 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 25026 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/08/1974 | 08008 | Transfer out to: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/09/1974 | 25302 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25105 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25106 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25107 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37099 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37102 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37109 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31302 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31305 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 31308 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37019 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37037 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37081 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37086 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 37121 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47044 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47045 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47046 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 25005 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 25009 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 25010 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 25111 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 19/10/1974 | 31197 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25104 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 09/11/1974 | 31227 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47125 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 20054 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25104 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25105 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25106 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25107 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25302 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 31284 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 37109 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/01/1975 | 47255 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/01/1975 | 37116 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25006 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25007 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25008 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25011 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25033 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25034 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 15/02/1975 | 25035 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 20007 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 20010 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 20144 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 20145 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31116 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31148 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31166 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31170 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31200 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31216 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31221 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31228 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31270 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31308 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37125 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37128 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37129 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37168 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25064 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25078 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25079 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25084 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25085 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31230 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31231 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37099 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37101 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37102 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 37106 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 47166 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31307 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31165 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 30 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31307 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 37107 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47047 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47049 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47167 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 31275 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 31299 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 31300 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 31302 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 31303 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37087 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37090 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37092 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37107 | Transfer in from: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37132 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37137 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 37141 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 47175 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 47176 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 47286 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 47298 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08801 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25001 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25002 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25003 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25004 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25089 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25090 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25091 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25092 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25101 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25108 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25111 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25150 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25151 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25213 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25005 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25006 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25007 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25008 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25009 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25010 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25011 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25012 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25013 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25014 | Transfer out to: | 91X | To Scottish Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1975 | 08888 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1975 | 08185 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 37093 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 37094 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 37119 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31148 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47298 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47307 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47311 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47312 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1975 | 08888 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1975 | 47307 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1975 | 47303 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/12/1975 | 25015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 04/01/1976 | 47601 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 25016 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 25017 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 25020 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 25022 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 25024 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 25018 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 25019 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 25021 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 25023 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/02/1976 | 25025 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31120 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31124 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31132 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31134 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 31167 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 37119 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 47297 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/02/1976 | 47304 | Transfer out to: | KY | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31119 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31147 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 37120 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 37121 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47167 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47177 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47180 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 47181 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31120 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31124 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31132 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31134 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 31167 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 37087 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 37090 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 37093 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 02/05/1976 | 37094 | Transfer out to: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08816 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 05/06/1976 | 08218 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 05/06/1976 | 08816 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20017 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20078 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20079 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20098 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20200 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20201 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20202 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/07/1976 | 20203 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1976 | 08810 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/09/1976 | 08810 | Transfer out to: | 91E | To Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31110 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 04/12/1976 | 08008 | Transfer in from: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 04/12/1976 | 08860 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20019 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20034 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20055 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20100 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20204 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20205 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20206 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1976 | 20207 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20068 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20084 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20142 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20143 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20148 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20159 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47291 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47295 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20084 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/1977 | 20159 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37131 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37143 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47295 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1977 | 20068 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1977 | 20142 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1977 | 20143 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1977 | 20148 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 37115 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1977 | 47380 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 03/1977 | 08076 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08460 | Transfer out to: | CR | Colchester | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 25/04/1977 | 20079 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31111 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31146 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31253 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31271 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31319 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47293 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47294 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 05/1977 | 20100 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31166 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31170 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31200 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31216 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31298 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 37089 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 37091 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47180 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47181 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47292 | Transfer out to: | KY | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47293 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47294 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47283 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47284 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47285 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47286 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47368 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 15/06/1977 | 56024 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 17/06/1977 | 56021 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 07/1977 | 31128 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 07/1977 | 31131 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 07/1977 | 31227 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 20020 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 20049 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 20091 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 07/1977 | 20119 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08240 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08459 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08504 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08862 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08015 | Transfer in from: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08022 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08331 | Transfer in from: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08523 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1977 | 20003 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 09/1977 | 20007 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31297 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31298 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45021 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45022 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45024 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45025 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45026 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45027 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45028 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45029 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45030 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45031 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45032 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45034 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45035 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45036 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45038 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45039 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45040 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45041 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45043 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45047 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45048 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45053 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 10/1977 | 45061 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 10/1977 | 20025 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31110 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 37170 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47167 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47168 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47281 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47293 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47294 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47295 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47313 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/11/1977 | 20033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 31159 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 31166 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 31175 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47167 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47168 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47180 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 47181 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 31111 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 31146 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 31253 | Transfer out to: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 37140 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 37143 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 27/11/1977 | 37168 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/12/1977 | 08485 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1977 | 08866 | Transfer out to: | WH | Wath | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1978 | 37204 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1978 | 37205 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1978 | 37108 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 20023 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 29/01/1978 | 47167 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 02/1978 | 20023 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 02/1978 | 31168 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 02/1978 | 37141 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31131 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 25/03/1978 | 08510 | Transfer in from: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 25/03/1978 | 08075 | Transfer out to: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1978 | 08866 | Transfer in from: | WH | Wath | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1978 | 20001 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1978 | 20004 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1978 | 20005 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1978 | 20008 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1978 | 20009 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1978 | 20035 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1978 | 20096 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 11/1978 | 20112 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 11/1978 | 31203 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1978 | 08115 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 11/1978 | 31147 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 11/1978 | 31252 | Transfer out to: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1979 | 08223 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1979 | 08331 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 37095 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 47307 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 47901 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 03/08/1980 | 45047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/09/1980 | 08015 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 21/09/1980 | 45032 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/10/1980 | 45021 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 26/10/1980 | 45024 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 28/10/1980 | 45039 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 30/11/1980 | 45030 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 29/12/1980 | 56033 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 29/12/1980 | 56045 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/01/1981 | 45028 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/03/1981 | 08131 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/05/1981 | 45025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 45027 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 45031 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 31/05/1981 | 45035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37127 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37134 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37135 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 05/07/1981 | 31219 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/07/1981 | 37001 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 05/07/1981 | 37019 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 05/07/1981 | 31175 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/07/1981 | 08386 | Transfer out to: | BG | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 20/07/1981 | 31234 | Transfer in from: | HO | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 20/07/1981 | 31240 | Transfer in from: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/07/1981 | 20009 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/07/1981 | 20011 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 37074 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 26/07/1981 | 37077 | Transfer in from: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/07/1981 | 20009 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/07/1981 | 20019 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/07/1981 | 31234 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/07/1981 | 31240 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 02/08/1981 | 56075 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 16/08/1981 | 45061 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1981 | 08782 | Transfer in from: | 41J | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1981 | 08260 | Transfer out to: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1981 | 08266 | Transfer out to: | SB | Shirebrook | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/09/1981 | 47574 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1981 | 08861 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/11/1981 | 08655 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Selhurst | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47301 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1981 | 31300 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 37103 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 04/11/1981 | 45053 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1981 | 56075 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/12/1982 | 20017 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/12/1982 | 08024 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/03/1983 | 08219 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1983 | 08008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 12/09/1984 | 45043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/10/1984 | 08208 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/01/1985 | 08033 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1985 | 08022 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/03/1985 | 08186 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 05/06/1985 | 45038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 24/06/1985 | 45048 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/04/1986 | 45026 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/05/1986 | 08244 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/05/1986 | 45036 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/09/1986 | 47275 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/09/1986 | 47282 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1987 | 08335 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 02/02/1987 | 20011 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/07/1987 | 45022 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/07/1987 | 45029 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/07/1987 | 45034 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/07/1987 | 45040 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 06/07/1987 | 97203 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31145 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31159 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31171 | Transfer in from: | HM | Healey Mills | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37058 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37059 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37095 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37204 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37298 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37303 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37304 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47002 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47012 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47095 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47098 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47107 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47130 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47140 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47142 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47143 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47144 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47146 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47150 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47152 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47156 | Transfer in from: | SX | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47157 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47207 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47209 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47211 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47213 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47215 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47220 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47235 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47249 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47285 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47286 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47293 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47297 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47306 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47309 | Transfer in from: | 55G | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08507 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1987 | 20054 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1987 | 20145 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/10/1987 | 20228 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31116 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31119 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31159 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31270 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31271 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31275 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31276 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31319 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37128 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37204 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47276 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47575 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47584 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56033 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 56045 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/02/1988 | 47140 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/03/1988 | 47130 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/04/1988 | 08485 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/04/1988 | 20001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/05/1988 | 47104 | Reinstated | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47016 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47337 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47338 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47376 | Transfer in from: | KY | Knottingley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47377 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47378 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47433 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47463 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47474 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47483 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47599 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47607 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97409 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97410 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97411 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97412 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/05/1988 | 97413 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20212 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 15/05/1988 | 20213 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31227 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31306 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31308 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31454 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37074 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37077 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37226 | Transfer out to: | ML | Motherwell | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47599 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 22/05/1988 | 31248 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 08/06/1988 | 45041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/06/1988 | 47104 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1988 | 97409 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1988 | 97411 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 07/1988 | 97413 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1988 | 08447 | Transfer out to: | CL | |||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 08/1988 | 97410 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | m/e | 08/1988 | 97412 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/08/1988 | 20022 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 47005 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/09/1988 | 47483 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/11/1988 | 47235 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/02/1989 | 20008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/02/1989 | 20907 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/07/1989 | 20009 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 27/07/1989 | 20005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1989 | 47143 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/12/1989 | 47012 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/01/1990 | 20144 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/02/1990 | 08729 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/10/1990 | 20034 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/10/1990 | 20129 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/10/1990 | 20130 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 10/10/1990 | 31299 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/10/1990 | 20004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/01/1991 | 20065 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/01/1991 | 20061 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/01/1991 | 20112 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/02/1991 | 20208 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1991 | 47215 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 08/03/1991 | 20021 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/05/1991 | 20035 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/05/1991 | 20023 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/06/1991 | 47098 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/06/1991 | 47107 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/06/1991 | 20098 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/06/1991 | 47002 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 05/07/1991 | 20211 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 30/08/1991 | 31221 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/09/1991 | 31425 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 13/09/1991 | 20133 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/11/1991 | 47005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/12/1991 | 20010 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 20/12/1991 | 31168 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/01/1992 | 20078 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/02/1992 | 20058 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/03/1992 | 20215 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/03/1992 | 08539 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/06/1992 | 20096 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 28/04/1993 | 20210 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 03/05/1993 | 47433 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/06/1993 | 20214 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/07/1993 | 47220 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 23/07/1993 | 20055 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/04/1995 | 47463 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/1995 | 47599 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/01/1996 | 31558 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/03/1996 | 31549 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/03/1996 | 47249 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/1996 | 37904 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/1996 | 37378 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 12/06/1996 | 31159 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/07/1996 | 08880 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 29/10/1996 | 56024 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1996 | 47576 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/1997 | 37334 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/1997 | 37333 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/08/1997 | 08878 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/02/1998 | 31563 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/04/1998 | 47142 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/08/1998 | 47144 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 25/08/1998 | 47378 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/1998 | 37905 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/12/1998 | 47016 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/01/1999 | 31166 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 28/01/1999 | 37107 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/01/1999 | 47278 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/1999 | 37095 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1999 | 47297 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1999 | 47572 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/1999 | 37887 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/01/2000 | 31145 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 14/01/2000 | 31302 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 11/02/2000 | 31250 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 18/02/2000 | 31219 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/03/2000 | 31248 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 26/05/2000 | 31235 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 14/07/2000 | 37104 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/2000 | 37796 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/2000 | 37894 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/2000 | 47581 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/2000 | 37673 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/2000 | 37679 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/2001 | 47573 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 07/07/2002 | 37209 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2002 | 37088 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/2002 | 37677 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/2002 | 47376 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2003 | 47301 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2003 | 47305 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/05/2003 | 47211 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/07/2003 | 47152 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/07/2003 | 47377 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/10/2003 | 31171 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2003 | 37139 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2004 | 37019 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2004 | 47157 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2004 | 47207 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2004 | 37133 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/11/2004 | 47095 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/2004 | 37692 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/2004 | 47285 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/2005 | 37674 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/2005 | 47156 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/2005 | 08813 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 37131 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 37298 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 47146 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 47474 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/08/2005 | 08655 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/08/2005 | 47213 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/05/2006 | 37137 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/05/2006 | 47306 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47279 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47293 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47309 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 28/02/2007 | 47314 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/04/2007 | 47338 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/2007 | 47316 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 56 | Co-Co | on | 06/2008 | 56021 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/07/2008 | 47150 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/2008 | 08510 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 30/09/2008 | 37058 | Condemned |