Depot: Tonbridge
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1048 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1057 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1063 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1086 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1150 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1193 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1219 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1221 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1225 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1227 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1272 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1320 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1327 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1369 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1461 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1490 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1513 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1518 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1519 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1540 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1543 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1580 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1586 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1590 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1591 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1593 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1670 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1671 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1672 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1675 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1686 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1700 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1703 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1704 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 1707 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1731 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1732 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1733 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1734 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1761 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1762 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1763 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1830 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1859 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1862 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2113 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2129 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2138 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2145 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | E1-1 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2164 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2367 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2374 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2378 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2488 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2503 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2580 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31380 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31396 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31437 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C26 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C27 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C28 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C29 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | C30 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 1572 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/03/1948 | 1150 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 31109 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 31432 | Transfer in from: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C31 | Transfer in from: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C32 | Transfer in from: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C33 | Transfer in from: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C34 | Transfer in from: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | C35 | Transfer in from: | FEL | Feltham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1086 | Transfer out to: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1221 | Transfer out to: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1225 | Transfer out to: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1227 | Transfer out to: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1830 | Transfer out to: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1859 | Transfer out to: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/04/1948 | 1862 | Transfer out to: | RED | Redhill | ||
Steam | E1-1 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 06/1948 | 2164 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 1075 | Transfer in from: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 1244 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 1740 | Transfer in from: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 1743 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/06/1948 | 1745 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 31396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 1057 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 1730 | Transfer in from: | HOR | Horsham | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 01/08/1948 | 1057 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 09/1948 | 2370 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 31437 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | 1760 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | 1764 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | 1765 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1948 | 1763 | Transfer out to: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1746 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1750 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 31667 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 13/11/1948 | 2378 | Transfer out to: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 31109 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1949 | 31707 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1949 | 32367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Bogie Tanks | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1949 | 32374 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 1277 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 31246 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 12/02/1949 | 31380 | Transfer out to: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2456 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2581 | Transfer in from: | TWW | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32457 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2138 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 31732 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/03/1949 | 32129 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | m/e | 05/1949 | 32457 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 2169 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 32167 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 03/05/1949 | 31761 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31490 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31731 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31763 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31490 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 28/05/1949 | 31731 | Transfer out to: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 1075 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 31743 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | 31520 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | 31761 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | 31767 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 31/07/1949 | 31518 | Transfer out to: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 12/08/1949 | 31762 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 12/08/1949 | 31764 | Transfer out to: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 1778 | Transfer in from: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 31164 | Transfer in from: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 31523 | Transfer in from: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 31779 | Transfer in from: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 1519 | Transfer out to: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 1543 | Transfer out to: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 26/09/1949 | 31057 | Transfer out to: | RDG | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1949 | 31672 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 2454 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 31517 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 31548 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 33036 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 33037 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 33038 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 1513 | Transfer out to: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 1540 | Transfer out to: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 1572 | Transfer out to: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 31432 | Transfer out to: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 31503 | Transfer out to: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 31763 | Transfer out to: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 04/02/1950 | 32113 | Transfer out to: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1950 | 31509 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31550 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 33039 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 33040 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31048 | Transfer out to: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31063 | Transfer out to: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 22/04/1950 | 31520 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 31767 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1950 | 31684 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1950 | 33039 | Transfer out to: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/06/1950 | 33040 | Transfer out to: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 31760 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 31760 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 31750 | Transfer out to: | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 31706 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/11/1950 | 31164 | Transfer out to: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 31706 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 32455 | Transfer in from: | BTN | Brighton | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 31706 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 32145 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 33026 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 1574 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31265 | Transfer in from: | RAM | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31706 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31746 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 32455 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31488 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31490 | Transfer out to: | 75B | Redhill | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31586 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31591 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31706 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 31746 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/12/1950 | 32455 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31545 | Transfer in from: | DOV | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31729 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31732 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31762 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31763 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31764 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 1574 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31246 | Transfer out to: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31745 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31778 | Transfer out to: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 31779 | Transfer out to: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/02/1951 | 32455 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 31730 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 31740 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 14/03/1951 | 32169 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 20/03/1951 | 31746 | Transfer out to: | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | m/e | 04/1951 | 31667 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31177 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31727 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31735 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31320 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31509 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1951 | 31545 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 31177 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 31727 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 31177 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1951 | 31727 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 31670 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 1271 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31184 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31239 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31259 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31270 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31665 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31666 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31734 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31265 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31327 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 31734 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 33027 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1951 | 33028 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 31731 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 31735 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 27/06/1951 | 32581 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31260 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31589 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31716 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31717 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31461 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 31580 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 33036 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 33037 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/07/1951 | 33038 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1951 | 31732 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 33026 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 33027 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 33028 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 31593 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 31684 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/09/1951 | 31686 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 31164 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 31585 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 31588 | Transfer in from: | GIL | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 31739 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 31260 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 31517 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 31164 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 31585 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 31739 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 31164 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 31585 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 08/10/1951 | 31739 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 32578 | Transfer in from: | NORW | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/12/1951 | 31589 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/01/1952 | 32167 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31038 | Transfer in from: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31554 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31729 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31731 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31766 | Transfer in from: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31271 | Transfer out to: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31550 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 30/06/1952 | 31729 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/1952 | 31665 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/1952 | 31700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 31770 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 31771 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 31773 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 07/10/1952 | 33036 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1952 | 31675 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 12/1952 | 31706 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 31037 | Transfer in from: | STL | St Leonards | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 31727 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 11/12/1952 | 31739 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31519 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31698 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31244 | Transfer out to: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31671 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 14/02/1953 | 31704 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 31244 | Transfer in from: | 74B | Ramsgate | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 31704 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 27/03/1953 | 31519 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31261 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 31530 | Transfer in from: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 32454 | Transfer in from: | TON | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 32578 | Transfer in from: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 32454 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/07/1953 | 32578 | Transfer out to: | 74D | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 31552 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 31553 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 33026 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1953 | 33027 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 31166 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 31543 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 33024 | Transfer in from: | ELH | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 29/10/1953 | 31553 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1953 | 31733 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 31037 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1954 | 31219 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | m/e | 03/1954 | 31038 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | m/e | 03/1954 | 31703 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | m/e | 05/1954 | 31729 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 13/05/1954 | 31737 | Transfer in from: | 70E | Reading (S.R.) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 31544 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 31261 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 18/06/1954 | 31552 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/08/1954 | 31909 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 30950 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 31908 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 31910 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 31764 | Transfer out to: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/12/1954 | 32578 | Transfer out to: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 9w/e | 08/02/1955 | 32578 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | E | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/05/1955 | 31166 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 21/06/1955 | 31517 | Transfer in from: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1955 | 31277 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 16/09/1955 | 32503 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 31246 | Transfer in from: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/10/1955 | 31583 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 15/10/1955 | 31698 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1955 | 31734 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Z | 0-8-0T | 3w/e | 01/11/1955 | 30950 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31470 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31487 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31489 | Transfer in from: | FAV | Faversham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31492 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | Coppernobs | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31737 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31765 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 7w/e | 19/12/1955 | 31766 | Transfer out to: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | Bob Tails | 0-4-4T | w/e | 24/12/1955 | 31666 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | R1 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 14/04/1956 | 31704 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 31530 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 15/06/1956 | 31544 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 3w/e | 17/11/1956 | 31246 | Transfer out to: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | w/e | 01/12/1956 | 31761 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/12/1956 | 31717 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 25/01/1957 | 32443 | Transfer in from: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 31280 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 31894 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 31896 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 31554 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 31583 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 01/04/1957 | 32454 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | w/e | 08/06/1957 | 32488 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 31772 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 31773 | Transfer out to: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 9w/e | 12/06/1957 | 31894 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Large Vulcans | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 08/10/1957 | 32443 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 08/03/1958 | 31184 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 31266 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 31279 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 31295 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 31773 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 31774 | Transfer in from: | 74E | St Leonards | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | q/e | 06/06/1958 | 31548 | Transfer out to: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | O1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 13/10/1958 | 31370 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 31774 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 31523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 31585 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/02/1959 | 31772 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 31295 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 06/1959 | 31470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31319 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31322 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31512 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31518 | Transfer in from: | 73D | Gillingham (Kent) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31519 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31520 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31822 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31876 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31877 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31878 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31879 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31880 | Transfer in from: | HIT | Hither Green | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31901 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31902 | Transfer in from: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31903 | Transfer in from: | 73E | Faversham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31904 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31905 | Transfer in from: | BAT | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31906 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31907 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 33001 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 33002 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 33003 | Transfer in from: | GFD | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 33004 | Transfer in from: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 33014 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 33037 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 33039 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 33040 | Transfer in from: | 73C | Hither Green | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31266 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31279 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31543 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31760 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31762 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31763 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31770 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31771 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | German Engines | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31773 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/06/1959 | 31896 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 31270 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Small Radials | 0-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 32456 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 31272 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 31684 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 6w/e | 22/10/1959 | 32580 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 31164 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 11/1959 | 31259 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 26/11/1959 | 31500 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 31239 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 31492 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 31319 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 31061 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 31324 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 31553 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 31592 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 31756 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 6w/e | 09/02/1960 | 31783 | Transfer in from: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 30328 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 10/03/1960 | 30379 | Transfer in from: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 31263 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 05/04/1960 | 31324 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 31533 | Transfer in from: | BA | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 06/05/1960 | 31322 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31892 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31893 | Transfer in from: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31061 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31487 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | D1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31489 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31756 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | L1 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/07/1960 | 31783 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 08/1960 | 31520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 23/08/1960 | 30328 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | M7 | 0-4-4T | 7w/e | 23/08/1960 | 30379 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | Radials | 0-6-2T | 7w/e | 23/08/1960 | 32578 | Transfer out to: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 31543 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 31551 | Transfer in from: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 05/10/1960 | 31280 | Transfer out to: | 75C | Norwood Junction | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 31543 | Transfer in from: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 24/11/1960 | 31543 | Transfer out to: | 73J | Tonbridge | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 02/1961 | 31519 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31276 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31308 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31322 | Transfer in from: | 75A | Brighton | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31324 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31402 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31403 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31404 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31405 | Transfer in from: | AFD | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31406 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31407 | Transfer in from: | 74A | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31818 | Transfer in from: | 74C | Dover Marine | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31908 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31909 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 31910 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33001 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33002 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33003 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33004 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33014 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/02/1961 | 33024 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 31590 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 31276 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/03/1961 | 31530 | Transfer in from: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 31193 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 31322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 05/1961 | 31517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80037 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80038 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80039 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80040 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80041 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80042 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80043 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80059 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80064 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80065 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80066 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 80085 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31402 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31403 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31404 | Transfer out to: | 72B | Salisbury | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31405 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31406 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31407 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31533 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31543 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31551 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31553 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | Mongolipers | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31818 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31892 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31893 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31901 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31902 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31903 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31904 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31905 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31906 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | U Boats | 2-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 31907 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 33034 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 33035 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 33036 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 33037 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 33039 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 26/05/1961 | 33040 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 31500 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 31512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 31177 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 31244 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 31684 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1961 | 31716 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 31588 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | C | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/11/1961 | 31592 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | m/e | 08/12/1961 | 31530 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 01/02/1962 | 31263 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 31308 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 31324 | Transfer out to: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | H | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 31518 | Transfer out to: | 75F | Tunbridge Wells West | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 33028 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 33029 | Transfer out to: | 70B | Feltham | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 33030 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 33031 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 33032 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Q1 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 33033 | Transfer out to: | 70C | Guildford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/05/1962 | 80037 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31822 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31876 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31877 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31878 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31879 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | N1 | 2-6-0 | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 31880 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80038 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80039 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80040 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80041 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80042 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80043 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80059 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80064 | Transfer out to: | 72A | Exmouth Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80065 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80066 | Transfer out to: | 71A | Eastleigh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 02/07/1962 | 80085 | Transfer out to: | 75D | Stewarts Lane |