Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 799 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6199 Week
» 24251 Month
» 257171 Year
» 1922547 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Tunbridge Wells West


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2001 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2003 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2004 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2006 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2021 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2022 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2023 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2025 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2026 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2027 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2028 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2029 Snapshot        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2030 Snapshot        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2215 Snapshot        
Steam D1M 0-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2253 Snapshot        
Steam Pacific Tanks 4-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2325 Snapshot        
Steam Pacific Tanks 4-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2326 Snapshot        
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 2390 Snapshot        
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 2393 Snapshot        
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 2398 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2512 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2581 Snapshot        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2582 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2589 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2590 Snapshot        
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 2591 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T on 01/01/1948 2603 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 531 Snapshot        
Steam Q 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 534 Snapshot        
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 07/1948 2001 Condemned      
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 07/1948 2003 Condemned      
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 07/1948 2006 Condemned      
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 11/1948 2004 Condemned      
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T m/e 01/1949 32589 Condemned      
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/03/1949 32398 Condemned      
Steam D1M 0-4-2T m/e 09/1949 32253 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 01/1950 32025 Condemned      
Steam D1M 0-4-2T m/e 02/1950 32215 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 15/07/1950 42096 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 21/07/1950 42097 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 28/07/1950 42098 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 18/08/1950 42099 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 25/08/1950 42100 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/09/1950 42101 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 08/09/1950 42102 1st Allocation        
Steam Q 0-6-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 30531 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 14/09/1950 42103 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 20/09/1950 42104 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 27/09/1950 42105 1st Allocation        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32029 Transfer out to: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Pacific Tanks 4-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32325 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Pacific Tanks 4-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32326 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32512 Transfer out to: 75B Redhill    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 32582 Transfer out to: 70E Reading (S.R.)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 31158 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32390 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/12/1950 32591 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 02/1951 32027 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 05/02/1951 32029 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 05/02/1951 42106 Transfer in from: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 05/02/1951 31158 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 03/1951 32029 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 31520 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32582 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Bogie Tanks 0-4-4T 6w/e 20/03/1951 32393 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam I1X 4-4-2T m/e 04/1951 32603 Condemned      
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 11/04/1951 32021 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 11/04/1951 32590 Transfer out to: 70D Basingstoke    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T w/e 05/05/1951 32022 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31520 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32021 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32582 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 12/05/1951 31520 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32026 Transfer out to: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32028 Transfer out to: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 12/05/1951 32582 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 09/06/1951 42095 1st Allocation        
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32581 Transfer in from: TWW Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32585 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32021 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32023 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 7w/e 27/06/1951 32581 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 10/07/1951 80010 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 21/07/1951 80011 1st Allocation        
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 27/07/1951 31322 Transfer in from: AFD Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 17/08/1951 80012 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 28/08/1951 80013 1st Allocation        
Steam Marsh Tanks 4-4-2T m/e 09/1951 32030 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 05/09/1951 80014 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 14/09/1951 80015 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 20/09/1951 80016 1st Allocation        
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 31517 Transfer in from: DOV Dover Marine    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 06/10/1951 32587 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42095 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42096 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42097 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42098 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42099 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42103 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/10/1951 42105 Transfer out to: 72A Exmouth Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 08/10/1951 80017 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 13/10/1951 80018 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 42102 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 80017 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 21/01/1952 80018 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 42099 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 42102 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 19/03/1952 80016 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 06/1952 41318 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 06/1952 41319 1st Allocation        
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41318 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41319 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 32587 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41318 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 9w/e 30/06/1952 41319 Transfer out to: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 42104 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 9w/e 30/06/1952 42106 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 07/10/1952 32517 Transfer in from: RED Redhill    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 07/10/1952 41316 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 07/10/1952 41317 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 8w/e 07/10/1952 80017 Transfer in from: 75G Eastbourne    
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 8w/e 07/10/1952 32585 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 14/02/1953 41297 Transfer in from:        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 14/02/1953 80018 Transfer in from: 75B Redhill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 20/07/1953 42103 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 20/07/1953 41297 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30054 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30055 Transfer in from: 71D Fratton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30056 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30057 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30058 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 30059 Transfer in from: BM Bournemouth    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 42074 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 31322 Transfer out to: 73D Gillingham (Kent)    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 31517 Transfer out to: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 21/06/1955 31520 Transfer out to: 74E St Leonards    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 21/06/1955 41316 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 21/06/1955 41317 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 7w/e 20/04/1956 31278 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam H 0-4-4T 7w/e 20/04/1956 31329 Transfer in from: 74C Dover Marine    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 20/04/1956 30055 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 7w/e 20/04/1956 30059 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 31310 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 31327 Transfer in from: 74A Ashford    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 31544 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 42087 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 42104 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 42105 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30054 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30056 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30057 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 30058 Transfer out to: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 15/06/1956 41318 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 6w/e 15/06/1956 41319 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 80015 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 80017 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 6w/e 15/06/1956 80018 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T w/e 29/10/1956 32582 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42106 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 80015 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 80016 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 80017 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 80018 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 80019 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42074 Transfer out to: 74B Ramsgate    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42087 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42099 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 42100 Transfer out to: 74A Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 80010 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 17/11/1956 80011 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 01/04/1957 31554 Transfer in from: 74D Tonbridge    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 6w/e 01/04/1957 42106 Transfer out to: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1958 42106 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 22/03/1958 80012 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31162 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31269 Transfer in from: 74E St Leonards    
Steam H 0-4-4T q/e 06/06/1958 31530 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 3w/e 13/10/1958 41319 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 31162 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 31269 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 13/10/1958 31554 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 11/03/1959 80013 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T m/e 06/1959 32517 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 14/06/1959 31530 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 5w/e 18/07/1959 42087 Transfer in from: 73A Stewarts Lane    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 5w/e 18/07/1959 41319 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam H 0-4-4T 6w/e 22/10/1959 31266 Transfer in from: 70A Nine Elms    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 07/11/1959 31327 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 14/11/1959 31329 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 31162 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 31306 Transfer in from: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 26/11/1959 31522 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42087 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42101 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42102 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42103 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42104 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42105 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42106 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80095 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80137 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80138 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80139 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80140 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80141 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80142 Transfer in from: 34E Neasden    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 4w/e 05/04/1960 32509 Transfer in from: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 05/1960 31310 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 10/06/1960 31161 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 10/06/1960 31306 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 01/10/1960 31266 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 10/02/1961 31005 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 10/02/1961 31530 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 5w/e 18/03/1961 31530 Transfer out to: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 18/03/1961 32509 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Radials 0-6-2T 5w/e 18/03/1961 32581 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 18/03/1961 80138 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Q 0-6-0 7w/e 03/05/1961 30534 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31533 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 3w/e 26/05/1961 31543 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T m/e 07/1961 31162 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 11/11/1961 31161 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 28/05/1962 31308 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 28/05/1962 31518 Transfer in from: 73J Tonbridge    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 15/09/1962 31533 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 24/09/1962 31263 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 24/09/1962 31551 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 06/10/1962 31278 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/12/1962 80095 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 17/12/1962 80137 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam H 0-4-4T on 23/12/1962 31308 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 27/01/1963 31522 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30021 Transfer in from: 72B Salisbury    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30029 Transfer in from: ELH Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30053 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30055 Transfer in from: 70C Guildford    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30133 Transfer in from: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30328 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 30379 Transfer in from: 71B Bournemouth    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80010 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80011 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 3w/e 30/01/1963 80088 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 03/03/1963 30328 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 07/07/1963 31543 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/07/1963 30021 Transfer out to: 70E Salisbury    
Steam M7 0-4-4T w/e 15/09/1963 30055 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 15/09/1963 31005 Condemned      
Steam H 0-4-4T w/e 15/09/1963 31544 Condemned      
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30029 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30053 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30133 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam M7 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 30379 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 31263 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 31518 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam H 0-4-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 31551 Transfer out to: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80010 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80011 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80014 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80015 Transfer out to: 71A Eastleigh    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80016 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80017 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80018 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80019 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80088 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80139 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80140 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80141 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 16/09/1963 80142 Transfer out to: 75A Brighton