Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 1172 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7855 Week
» 18901 Month
» 18901 Year
» 1684277 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Tweedmouth


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1899 2001 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 03/1900 2007 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1908 738 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1908 739 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 06/1908 741 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 08/1908 745 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 09/1908 747 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1909 754 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 08/1920 909 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 12/1920 924 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 12/1920 926 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 m/e 01/1921 928 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/10/1923 1375 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 31/10/1923 1376 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 15/11/1923 1378 1st Allocation        
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1924 2001 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/01/1924 1384 1st Allocation        
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 08/05/1924 1384 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 08/05/1924 924 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 01/07/1924 754 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/07/1924 747 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 09/1924 2007 Transfer out to: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/09/1924 756 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1925 2002 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/01/1925 752 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/01/1925 754 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/01/1925 759 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/02/1926 752 Transfer out to: ANN Annesley    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 20/09/1926 752 Transfer in from: ANN Annesley    
Steam B13 4-6-0 m/e 01/1927 2002 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 04/02/1927 738 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 04/02/1927 739 Transfer out to: SKN Stockton    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 18/02/1927 752 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 18/02/1927 754 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 18/02/1927 756 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 04/04/1927 754 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 07/04/1927 752 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 22/10/1927 933 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 11/06/1928 921 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 22/07/1929 921 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 22/07/1929 926 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 01/08/1929 928 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 09/08/1929 933 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 29/08/1929 1376 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 30/08/1929 909 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 16/09/1929 1375 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 09/10/1929 1378 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 31/01/1930 741 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 20/07/1931 1372 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 20/07/1931 1379 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/10/1931 911 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 28/10/1931 921 Transfer in from: YK York (North)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 08/12/1931 745 Condemned      
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 27/03/1933 759 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 23/06/1934 752 Condemned      
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 16/10/1934 1372 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 16/10/1934 1379 Transfer out to: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 16/10/1934 911 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B16 4-6-0 on 16/10/1934 921 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Steam B13 4-6-0 on 13/06/1936 754 Transfer out to: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/03/1939 2735 Transfer in from: STM St Margarets    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/03/1939 2736 Transfer in from: STM St Margarets    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/06/1939 1467 Transfer in from: NPT Newport (Teeside)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 01/07/1939 2735 Transfer out to: MAL Malton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/07/1939 1585 Transfer in from: SUN Sunderland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/07/1939 2736 Transfer out to: CON Consett    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/01/1940 1585 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/01/1940 1467 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/09/1943 1459 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/09/1943 1508 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 08/09/1943 1587 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 14/02/1944 4890 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 24/04/1944 4890 Transfer out to: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/07/1945 1459 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/07/1945 1508 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/07/1945 1587 Transfer out to: DAR Darlington    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 03/11/1945 3659 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/04/1947 1024 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 22/04/1947 1025 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 02/06/1947 1198 1st Allocation        
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 04/06/1947 1199 1st Allocation        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2344 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2347 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2351 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2352 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2354 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2357 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2358 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2362 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2380 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2396 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5026 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5039 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5067 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5082 Snapshot        
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5099 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5869 Snapshot        
Steam J27 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5873 Snapshot        
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 62377 Snapshot        
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 01/01/1948 7248 Snapshot        
Steam J73 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8363 Snapshot        
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1948 4863 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1948 4949 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 24/02/1948 4949 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/02/1948 4711 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/02/1948 4813 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 28/02/1948 4863 Transfer out to: BLA Blaydon    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 29/08/1948 1025 Transfer out to: HAY Haymarket    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 31/10/1948 1025 Transfer in from: HAY Haymarket    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 26/12/1948 61198 Transfer out to: BOR Borough Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 02/01/1949 61019 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam D20 4-4-0 m/e 05/1949 62377 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/05/1949 64982 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 05/06/1949 64843 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 17/07/1949 64854 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/08/1949 64844 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 14/08/1949 64925 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J21 0-6-0 m/e 10/1949 65026 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 23/10/1949 4917 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam D20 4-4-0 m/e 12/1949 62344 Transfer out to:        
Steam D20 4-4-0 m/e 12/1949 62396 Transfer out to: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/03/1950 61241 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/03/1950 61322 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 19/11/1950 64982 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 62344 Transfer in from:        
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 62365 Transfer in from:        
Steam D15 4-4-0 4w/e 25/11/1950 62538 Transfer in from: STR Stratford    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 23/12/1950 90008 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 08/01/1951 62357 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 5w/e 24/03/1951 65067 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 28/03/1951 62344 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 02/04/1951 62354 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 04/04/1951 62365 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 11/04/1951 62362 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 62358 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 62358 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 21/04/1951 65039 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 29/04/1951 60884 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 29/04/1951 60885 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 29/04/1951 60886 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 29/04/1951 60887 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam WD/8 2-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 90008 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 62355 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 62375 Transfer in from: SBK Starbeck    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 62383 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 23/06/1951 62396 Transfer in from: HLB Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/07/1951 61024 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 01/07/1951 61199 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 06/01/1952 60885 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 06/01/1952 60886 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 06/01/1952 60887 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 61901 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 61917 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 61930 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 61962 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 19/01/1952 61985 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam D15 4-4-0 5w/e 16/02/1952 62538 Transfer out to: 32A Norwich Thorpe    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 65082 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 65082 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 19/07/1952 67248 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 30/11/1952 60801 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 30/11/1952 60806 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 30/11/1952 60811 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 30/11/1952 60835 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 30/11/1952 60926 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 61899 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 61932 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 61952 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 13/12/1952 61969 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1953 64941 Transfer in from: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 04/01/1953 64854 Transfer out to: 54C Borough Gardens    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 21/03/1953 62371 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 21/03/1953 62396 Transfer in from: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 5w/e 21/03/1953 67270 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 21/03/1953 62396 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 12/04/1953 60807 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 12/04/1953 60808 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 12/04/1953 60860 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 12/04/1953 60806 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 12/04/1953 60811 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 12/04/1953 60835 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 07/06/1953 60801 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 07/06/1953 60807 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 62352 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 62371 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 20/06/1953 62375 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 24/10/1953 62349 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 24/10/1953 62352 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 24/10/1953 62360 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 24/10/1953 62371 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 24/10/1953 62375 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 24/10/1953 68436 Transfer in from:        
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 27/12/1953 60805 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/01/1954 61014 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 17/01/1954 61019 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 23/01/1954 61932 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J73 0-6-0T 4w/e 23/01/1954 68363 Transfer out to: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/05/1954 67268 Transfer in from: BLA Blaydon    
Steam J77 0-6-0T 4w/e 22/05/1954 68402 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 22/05/1954 62349 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam G5 0-4-4T 4w/e 22/05/1954 67270 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 62352 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 62360 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 62375 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 62380 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/06/1954 62396 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 19/10/1954 62358 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 19/10/1954 62371 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 23/10/1954 62360 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 23/10/1954 62375 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 23/10/1954 62396 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 w/e 15/11/1954 62347 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 23/11/1954 62351 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 01/01/1955 65082 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 5w/e 22/01/1955 65091 Transfer in from: DAR Darlington    
Steam J21 0-6-0 5w/e 23/04/1955 65099 Transfer in from: TWD Tweedmouth    
Steam J21 0-6-0 5w/e 23/04/1955 65099 Transfer out to: 52D Tweedmouth    
Steam G5 0-4-4T on 27/04/1955 67268 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 03/05/1955 60801 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 08/05/1955 60884 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 5w/e 18/06/1955 65078 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 23/07/1955 62396 Transfer out to: 50C Selby    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 17/09/1955 61899 Transfer out to: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 25/09/1955 61199 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 14/11/1955 62355 Condemned      
Steam J27 0-6-0 3w/e 16/06/1956 65873 Transfer out to: 54A Sunderland    
Steam J77 0-6-0T on 18/06/1956 68436 Condemned      
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 21/07/1956 68682 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J72 0-6-0T m/e 21/07/1956 68725 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam J77 0-6-0T m/e 21/07/1956 68402 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 23/10/1956 62360 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 17/11/1956 43057 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 4w/e 17/11/1956 43071 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 04/03/1957 65078 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 07/05/1957 62375 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 13/05/1957 62383 Condemned      
Steam V3 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 67656 Transfer in from: NEV Neville Hill    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 67683 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 16/06/1957 60805 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 16/06/1957 60860 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 62387 Transfer in from: 50C Selby    
Steam D20 4-4-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 62395 Transfer in from: 50A York (North)    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 43057 Transfer out to: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 5w/e 20/07/1957 43071 Transfer out to: 51D Middlesbrough    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 5w/e 20/07/1957 67656 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V3 2-6-2T 5w/e 20/07/1957 67683 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 02/09/1957 62387 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/10/1957 62381 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam D20 4-4-0 4w/e 19/10/1957 62396 Transfer in from: 53B Hull Botanic Gardens    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 09/11/1957 65091 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 19/11/1957 62381 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 on 20/11/1957 62395 Condemned      
Steam D20 4-4-0 m/e 12/1957 62396 Condemned      
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 14/12/1957 65061 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 14/12/1957 65070 Transfer in from: 52C Blaydon    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/12/1957 67641 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/12/1957 67642 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 4w/e 14/12/1957 67647 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 08/02/1958 46476 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam J21 0-6-0 4w/e 08/03/1958 65099 Transfer out to: 51E Stockton    
Steam J21 0-6-0 on 12/05/1958 65061 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 08/06/1958 60808 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 08/06/1958 60932 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 61854 Transfer in from: 53A Hull Dairycoates    
Steam K3 2-6-0 5w/e 14/06/1958 61934 Transfer in from: HLD Hull Dairycoates    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67641 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67642 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V1 2-6-2T 5w/e 14/06/1958 67647 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 14/09/1958 60069 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 14/09/1958 60072 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 14/09/1958 60843 Transfer in from: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 14/09/1958 60865 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 14/09/1958 60913 Transfer in from: 37B Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam K3 2-6-0 4w/e 11/10/1958 61962 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 14/06/1959 61014 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/10/1959 46482 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam J21 0-6-0 w/e 17/10/1959 65070 Transfer out to: 52F Blyth (North)    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 07/12/1959 68682 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T w/e 23/01/1960 68314 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 04/04/1960 68725 Condemned      
Steam J71 0-6-0T on 14/04/1960 68314 Condemned      
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 30/04/1960 D2594 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Steam J72 0-6-0T w/e 14/05/1960 68720 Transfer in from: GHD Gateshead    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 12/06/1960 60069 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam A3 4-6-2 on 12/06/1960 60072 Transfer out to: 56C Copley Hill (Leeds)    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/06/1960 61025 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/06/1960 61199 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/06/1960 61241 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam B1 4-6-0 on 12/06/1960 61322 Transfer out to: 52C Blaydon    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 61844 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 61962 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 61984 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 61901 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 26/11/1960 61985 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 10/12/1960 61844 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam J27 0-6-0 w/e 05/08/1961 65869 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 20/08/1961 64843 Transfer out to: 52G Sunderland    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 10/09/1961 60929 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 10/09/1961 60934 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 10/09/1961 60947 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 10/09/1961 60949 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 61854 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 61917 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 61934 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 61952 Transfer out to: 50B Hull Dairycoates    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 16/09/1961 61984 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam J72 0-6-0T on 26/09/1961 68720 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 01/10/1961 60511 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 01/10/1961 60517 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 01/10/1961 60521 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 01/10/1961 60538 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 01/10/1961 60539 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 14/10/1961 61930 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 14/10/1961 61962 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Steam K3 2-6-0 w/e 14/10/1961 61969 Transfer out to: 52H Tyne Dock    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 16/12/1961 D2615 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 16/12/1961 D2594 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 on 29/01/1962 46476 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 46471 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 46473 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 46474 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 17/02/1962 46479 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1962 64711 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 11/08/1962 46473 Transfer out to: 50F Malton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60116 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60127 Transfer in from: HTN Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60129 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60132 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60137 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60142 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60143 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60147 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60151 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 09/09/1962 60155 Transfer in from: 52B Heaton    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 09/09/1962 64917 Transfer out to: 52d Alnmouth    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 01/10/1962 60801 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 01/10/1962 60926 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 01/10/1962 60947 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 on 18/10/1962 46471 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 22/10/1962 60934 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 29/10/1962 60137 Condemned      
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 04/11/1962 60155 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 12/11/1962 60511 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 12/11/1962 60517 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 12/11/1962 60521 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 12/11/1962 60538 Condemned      
Steam A2 4-6-2 on 12/11/1962 60539 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 26/11/1962 60949 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 46475 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 w/e 01/12/1962 46482 Transfer out to: 51A Darlington    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 02/12/1962 60843 Transfer out to: 56B Ardsley    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 02/12/1962 60929 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64813 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64844 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64925 Condemned      
Steam J39 0-6-0 on 03/12/1962 64941 Condemned      
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 30/12/1962 60865 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Steam V2 2-6-2 on 13/01/1963 60913 Transfer out to: 52B Heaton    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 24/08/1963 D2594 Transfer in from: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 w/e 24/08/1963 D2615 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 08/09/1963 60143 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 08/09/1963 60147 Transfer out to: 50A York (North)    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 19/10/1963 78024 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 19/10/1963 78025 Transfer in from: 51F West Auckland    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 02/11/1963 46475 Transfer out to: 67E Dumfries    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 w/e 09/11/1963 78012 Transfer in from: 51A Darlington    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 46474 Transfer out to: 67E Dumfries    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1963 46479 Transfer out to: 67F Stranraer    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 18/10/1964 60116 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 18/10/1964 60127 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 18/10/1964 60151 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 25/10/1964 60142 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 21/11/1964 77002 Transfer in from: 55B Stourton    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 w/e 21/11/1964 77004 Transfer in from: 55B Stourton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 on 29/11/1964 78012 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 on 29/11/1964 78024 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 on 29/11/1964 78025 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 06/12/1964 60129 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Steam A1 4-6-2 on 06/12/1964 60132 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 D2049 Transfer in from: 52E Percy Main    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 D2594 Transfer out to: 51C West Hartlepool    
Diesel 05 0-6-0 4w/e 19/06/1965 D2594 Transfer out to: 52E Percy Main    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 19/06/1966 77002 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Steam Standard Class 3 2-6-0 on 19/06/1966 77004 Transfer out to: 55B Stourton    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 D2049 Transfer out to: 52A Gateshead