Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 815 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6742 Week
» 5480 Month
» 419801 Year
» 1641366 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Walton on the Hill


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam J11 0-6-0 on 05/01/1947 4304 Transfer in from:        
Steam B7 4-6-0 on 19/01/1947 1395 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam B7 4-6-0 on 09/02/1947 1395 Transfer out to: GOR Gorton    
Steam D9 4-4-0 on 01/01/1948 2311 Snapshot        
Steam J67 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 8584 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9265 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9298 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9338 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9344 Snapshot        
Steam N5 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 9356 Snapshot        
Steam D9 4-4-0 on 18/07/1949 62311 Condemned      
Steam N5 0-6-2T 2w/e 17/06/1950 9353 Transfer in from: 91M To London Midland Region    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 40937 Transfer in from: 23A Bank Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 41194 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 44038 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 44221 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 44464 Transfer in from: 25E Sowerby Bridge    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 44544 Transfer in from: 24B Rose Grove    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 46437 Transfer in from:        
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 41188 Transfer in from: 24A Accrington    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 44474 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44481 Transfer in from: 23B Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44541 Transfer in from: 23B Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44474 Transfer out to: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 46437 Transfer out to: 25C Goole    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 41195 Transfer in from: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 40937 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 41191 Transfer in from: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 41194 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 46435 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 41104 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 41193 Transfer in from: 28A Blackpool Central    
Steam 2MT 2-6-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 46435 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 22/03/1952 41101 Transfer in from: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 19/04/1952 41185 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 41191 Transfer out to: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 5w/e 21/06/1952 41104 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 5w/e 21/06/1952 41188 Transfer out to: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 41104 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 06/09/1952 41104 Transfer out to: 20A Holbeck (MR)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 40937 Transfer in from: 26C Bolton    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 41188 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 41185 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 41195 Transfer out to: 22B Gloucester Barnwood    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41085 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41102 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41186 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41187 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 41189 Transfer in from: 35C Spital Bridge    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 21/02/1953 44218 Transfer in from: 16B Spital Bridge    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 40937 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 41101 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 41189 Transfer out to: 25F Low Moor    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/04/1953 44544 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 41085 Transfer out to: 24E Blackpool Central    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 41102 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 41193 Transfer out to: 27C Southport    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 44464 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42111 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42112 Transfer in from:        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42113 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41186 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41187 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam Compound 4-4-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 41188 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 28/11/1953 44221 Transfer out to: 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)    
Steam N5 0-6-2T w/e 14/03/1955 69338 Condemned      
Steam J67 0-6-0T w/e 13/08/1955 68584 Condemned      
Steam N5 0-6-2T on 14/11/1955 69353 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 44040 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1955 44291 Transfer in from: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/02/1956 44471 Transfer in from: 23C Southport    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 m/e 16/06/1956 44462 Transfer in from: 25D Mirfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 26/01/1957 44241 Transfer in from: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 26/01/1957 47201 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam N5 0-6-2T w/e 23/02/1957 69356 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 44014 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 44188 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 44299 Transfer in from: 20F Skipton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 44605 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 23/03/1957 44241 Transfer out to: 17D Rowsley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/04/1957 47480 Transfer in from: 4C Swansea (Upper Bank)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 20/04/1957 47201 Transfer out to: 24J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 43843 Transfer in from: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 07/09/1957 47235 Transfer in from: 19A Sheffield Grimesthorpe    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/11/1957 47655 Transfer in from: 4C Swansea (Upper Bank)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 30/11/1957 47681 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 5 2-4-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 50781 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 1008 2-4-2T 4w/e 30/11/1957 50781 Transfer in from: 27C Southport    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 25/01/1958 42111 Transfer out to: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 43843 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 44541 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 04/10/1958 47480 Transfer out to: 27A Bank Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/01/1959 47225 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/01/1959 47228 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam J11 0-6-0 w/e 11/04/1959 64304 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/06/1959 42328 Transfer in from: 39A Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 11/07/1959 43907 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 25/07/1959 44023 Transfer in from: 16C Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 25/07/1959 42328 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 01/08/1959 43907 Transfer out to: 16B Kirkby in Ashfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/09/1959 42429 Transfer in from: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/10/1959 42429 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 31/10/1959 D3858 1st Allocation        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44291 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 05/12/1959 44014 Condemned      
Steam N5 0-6-2T w/e 12/12/1959 69265 Condemned      
Steam N5 0-6-2T w/e 12/12/1959 69298 Condemned      
Steam N5 0-6-2T w/e 12/12/1959 69344 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 19/12/1959 43988 Transfer in from: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 5 2-4-2T w/e 06/02/1960 50781 Condemned      
Steam 1008 2-4-2T w/e 06/02/1960 50781 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/03/1960 44471 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 09/04/1960 47655 Transfer out to: 27B Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/06/1960 44299 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/11/1960 42112 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 19/11/1960 42113 Transfer out to: 9E Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/07/1961 42540 Transfer in from: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 20/01/1962 44462 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/01/1962 44462 Transfer in from: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 03/02/1962 44218 Transfer out to: 17B Burton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/07/1962 43988 Transfer out to: 15C Leicester Midland    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 04/08/1962 42054 Transfer in from: 16A Nottingham    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 08/09/1962 42617 Transfer in from: 17C Rowsley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 44118 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1962 44177 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/09/1962 44118 Transfer out to: 15A Wellingborough    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 44023 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 44038 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 44040 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 13/10/1962 44605 Transfer out to: 21A Saltley    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 13/10/1962 47235 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 03/11/1962 42540 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 15/06/1963 47225 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 44192 Transfer in from: 8G Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 09/11/1963 42617 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75043 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75060 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75061 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/11/1963 75064 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 D3858 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 14/12/1963 42054 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/12/1963 47228 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 14/12/1963 47681 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75043 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75060 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75061 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 14/12/1963 75064 Transfer out to: 8L Aintree    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/12/1963 44481 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/01/1964 44177 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/01/1964 44188 Transfer out to: 9G Gorton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/01/1964 44192 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 04/01/1964 44462 Transfer out to: 10H Lower Darwen