Depot: Aberdeen Ferryhill
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/01/1929 | 6582 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/07/1929 | 2742 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/08/1929 | 2741 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/10/1930 | 6582 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 09/1931 | 6286 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/04/1935 | 2563 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/08/1935 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5579 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5580 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5643 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 5644 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/05/1936 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 09/06/1936 | 2565 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 10/09/1936 | 2002 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 16/11/1936 | 2006 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1937 | 2500 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/03/1937 | 2565 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/04/1937 | 2796 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/04/1937 | 2500 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/08/1937 | 6291 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/10/1937 | 4787 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 15/11/1937 | 4790 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A1 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/11/1937 | 2563 | Transfer out to: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/12/1937 | 4793 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 06/03/1938 | 2796 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 09/09/1938 | 4805 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/04/1939 | 4822 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/11/1939 | 6370 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 03/1940 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/07/1940 | 2598 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/08/1941 | 3658 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 10/1941 | 4807 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 18/10/1941 | 2598 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 11/1941 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 11/1941 | 4807 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 12/1941 | 3658 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 08/1942 | 4807 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 23/10/1942 | 2006 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/10/1942 | 4805 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1942 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 12/1942 | 4807 | Transfer out to: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/04/1943 | 2977 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1943 | 2978 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1943 | 2979 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/04/1943 | 2980 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/05/1943 | 4819 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 07/1943 | 3685 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1943 | 6370 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/07/1943 | 6286 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/07/1943 | 6291 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 10/1943 | 3685 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 2977 | Transfer out to: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 2979 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/12/1943 | 2980 | Transfer out to: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 07/1944 | 3658 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | m/e | 07/1944 | 4787 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/10/1944 | 2001 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1944 | 3658 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1944 | 4787 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/10/1944 | 4819 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1945 | 3685 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/08/1945 | 3682 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4859 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4869 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/10/1945 | 4890 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1947 | 824 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1947 | 825 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 27/01/1947 | 827 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/09/1947 | 4839 | Transfer out to: | STR | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1947 | 4975 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5579 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5580 | Snapshot | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5643 | Snapshot | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5644 | Snapshot | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9128 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9129 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 08/03/1948 | 955 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 955 | Transfer in from: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 955 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/05/1948 | 503 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 26/05/1948 | 503 | Transfer out to: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/02/1949 | 61343 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/04/1949 | 61345 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 08/04/1949 | 60506 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 42689 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/05/1949 | 60506 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1949 | 61132 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1949 | 61133 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1949 | 61134 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1949 | 61343 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1949 | 61345 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 61132 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 61133 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 61134 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 61132 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 61133 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1949 | 61134 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/07/1949 | 60537 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 60537 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/07/1949 | 60537 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/08/1949 | 60531 | Transfer in from: | GHD | Gateshead | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 60531 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 60531 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/08/1949 | 60525 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 60525 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/09/1949 | 60525 | Transfer out to: | ABD | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60509 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60510 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60501 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | P2 | 2-8-2 | on | 04/09/1949 | 60502 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/09/1949 | 60509 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 25/09/1949 | 60510 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45086 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45127 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/10/1949 | 61134 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 45086 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 45127 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 20/11/1949 | 60825 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1949 | 64794 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 69201 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 68469 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 67455 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 67478 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 09/04/1950 | 8568 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J83 | 0-6-0T | 3w/e | 22/04/1950 | 68469 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 5213 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1950 | 5297 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 05/11/1950 | 60822 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | N14 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 69125 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | N14 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 69125 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | N14 | 0-6-2T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 69125 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/01/1951 | 60532 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/01/1951 | 60537 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/01/1951 | 61132 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60532 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 60532 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8568 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1951 | 61133 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45245 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 09/09/1951 | 45367 | Transfer in from: | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 67501 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45245 | Transfer in from: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1951 | 45245 | Transfer out to: | 61B | Aberdeen Ferryhill | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 67496 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 90020 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64482 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 64485 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 64482 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 67455 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65247 | Transfer in from: | KIT | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 42689 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 65213 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 10/05/1953 | 61734 | Transfer in from: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 90020 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | N14 | 0-6-2T | on | 25/03/1954 | 69125 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/05/1954 | 61700 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/05/1954 | 61701 | Transfer in from: | EFD | Eastfield | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 69503 | Transfer in from: | KPS | Kipps | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45245 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 45367 | Transfer out to: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | C15 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1954 | 67478 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 07/07/1954 | 61734 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 64483 | Transfer in from: | DFU | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1954 | 65247 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 45162 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/09/1954 | 45367 | Transfer in from: | 63D | Fort William | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/10/1954 | 44794 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/10/1954 | 45367 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 44703 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/08/1955 | 45469 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/09/1955 | 40604 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/10/1955 | 40604 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/11/1955 | 65267 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 23/12/1955 | 60804 | Transfer in from: | DEE | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/01/1956 | 60972 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 02/01/1956 | 60804 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/01/1956 | 65242 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/05/1956 | 65267 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/08/1956 | 45167 | Transfer in from: | 29A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 78053 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 78054 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 65297 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 8w/e | 27/10/1956 | 67496 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 78053 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 22/12/1956 | 78054 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | N2 | 0-6-2T | on | 03/01/1957 | 69503 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 14/03/1957 | 61700 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 40617 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 40618 | Transfer in from: | 30B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 40617 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 40618 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | C16 | 4-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/04/1957 | 67501 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/08/1957 | 65242 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 65247 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 8w/e | 31/08/1957 | 69189 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 28/09/1957 | 69138 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | V4 | 2-6-2 | on | 26/11/1957 | 61701 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 56323 | Transfer in from: | 29C | Dundee West | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 56325 | Transfer in from: | 29C | Dundee West | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 65247 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/12/1957 | 69201 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 18/04/1958 | 69189 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69127 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1958 | D3546 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1958 | D3547 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1958 | D3548 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/09/1958 | D3549 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1958 | D3550 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1958 | D3551 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | on | 07/10/1958 | 56323 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 02/12/1958 | 69129 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/01/1959 | 60819 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/01/1959 | 60824 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/01/1959 | 60827 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/01/1959 | 819 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/03/1959 | 64485 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/03/1959 | 64795 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/03/1959 | 64975 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 65305 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 65310 | Transfer in from: | STM | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J35 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/03/1959 | 64483 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 69224 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1959 | 65310 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | on | 16/06/1959 | 69127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/03/1960 | 65305 | Transfer out to: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/05/1960 | 60527 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 28/05/1960 | 60528 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/05/1960 | 60973 | Transfer out to: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/06/1960 | 45167 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 12/06/1960 | 60970 | Transfer out to: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45469 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1961 | 61346 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1961 | 61347 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1961 | 61350 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/06/1961 | 61400 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1961 | 60528 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/06/1961 | 60532 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 40618 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 45469 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 46460 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65227 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65297 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65303 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65304 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65310 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65338 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 76104 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 76105 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 76106 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 76107 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 76108 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 78045 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 78053 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 78054 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80115 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 80121 | Transfer in from: | 61C | Keith | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 90077 | Transfer in from: | 66E | Carstairs | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | D3546 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | D3547 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | D3548 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | D3549 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | D3550 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | D3551 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 782 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 56325 | Transfer out to: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 69128 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 69138 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | N15 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 69224 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/07/1961 | 65227 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 65310 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 65338 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/07/1961 | 80121 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 40648 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 40650 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Corkerhill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 40663 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 46460 | Transfer out to: | 63C | Oban | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 65297 | Transfer out to: | 68B | Dumfries | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 65303 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | J36 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 65304 | Transfer out to: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/08/1961 | 80115 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 27/09/1961 | 40618 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 27/09/1961 | 40648 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 27/09/1961 | 40650 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 27/09/1961 | 40663 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | D2723 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 76105 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/12/1961 | 76106 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | D2723 | Transfer out to: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 90536 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/05/1962 | 61350 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/05/1962 | 60009 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1962 | 60004 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/06/1962 | 60011 | Transfer in from: | HAY | Haymarket | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 45469 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/09/1962 | 60004 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 29/09/1962 | 90640 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60522 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/12/1962 | 60531 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1962 | 61346 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60970 | Transfer in from: | PTH | Perth (LNER) | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60851 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 29/12/1962 | 60888 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/12/1962 | 60524 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 31/12/1962 | 60959 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/12/1962 | 60522 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 76108 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/01/1963 | 78053 | Transfer out to: | 65J | Stirling | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/03/1963 | 60525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 07/04/1963 | 60042 | Transfer in from: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/05/1963 | 90077 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1963 | 90386 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/06/1963 | 90386 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/06/1963 | 60004 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 30/06/1963 | 60835 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/07/1963 | 60959 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1963 | 90536 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 07/09/1963 | 90596 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1963 | 60524 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 15/09/1963 | 60527 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/10/1963 | 90705 | Transfer in from: | 66B | Motherwell | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/10/1963 | 60010 | Transfer in from: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 27/10/1963 | 60042 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1963 | 60005 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1963 | 60016 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 10/11/1963 | 60019 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 24/11/1963 | 60836 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1963 | 60898 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 28/11/1963 | 60972 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | 90705 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/01/1964 | 60012 | Transfer in from: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 12/03/1964 | 60005 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 13/04/1964 | 60026 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 13/04/1964 | 60836 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/05/1964 | 60006 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/05/1964 | 60919 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 11/05/1964 | 60011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/05/1964 | 60023 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/05/1964 | 60034 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 18/05/1964 | 60955 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/07/1964 | 60835 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 19/07/1964 | 60970 | Transfer out to: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/07/1964 | 60007 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 78045 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/07/1964 | 78054 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1964 | 61347 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/08/1964 | 61400 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 20/08/1964 | 60012 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 73008 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 73056 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 73058 | Transfer in from: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/08/1964 | 45162 | Transfer out to: | 64C | Dalry Road | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/10/1964 | 60023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/11/1964 | 73058 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 76104 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1964 | 76107 | Transfer out to: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 19/03/1965 | 60016 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/03/1965 | 60024 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 29/05/1965 | 60010 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 73056 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 03/09/1965 | 60006 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1965 | 73008 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 21/12/1965 | 60026 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/02/1966 | 60007 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/04/1966 | 60528 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 90596 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 30/04/1966 | 90640 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 01/06/1966 | 60009 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 02/06/1966 | 60528 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 17/07/1966 | 60004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 24/08/1966 | 60034 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/09/1966 | 60019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | A4 | 4-6-2 | on | 05/09/1966 | 60024 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 9w/e | 26/11/1966 | 44703 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/11/1966 | 61180 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 04/12/1966 | 60532 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/12/1966 | 61072 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1966 | 44794 | Transfer out to: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Steam | A2 | 4-6-2 | on | 31/12/1966 | 60532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1967 | 61072 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/03/1967 | 61180 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 44833 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 48074 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/08/1967 | 48252 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1967 | 44833 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6138 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6139 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6141 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6142 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6143 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6144 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6145 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6146 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6147 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6148 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6149 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6150 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6151 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6153 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6154 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6155 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6156 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 24/09/1967 | D6157 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D2420 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D2421 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D2587 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D2597 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3549 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3550 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3551 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3552 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3553 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3930 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3931 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3932 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3933 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3934 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3935 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3936 | Transfer in from: | 61A | Kittybrewster | ||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1967 | D2597 | Transfer out to: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/11/1967 | 48074 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 05 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/12/1967 | D2587 | Transfer out to: | 62C | Dunfermline Upper | ||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6138 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6139 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6141 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6142 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6143 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6144 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6145 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6146 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6147 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6148 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6149 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6150 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6151 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6153 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6154 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6155 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6156 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 21 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/12/1967 | D6157 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | D3660 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/05/1968 | 48252 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D3936 | Transfer out to: | 41C | Wath | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/08/1968 | D3549 | Transfer out to: | 62A | Thornton Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 30/11/1968 | D3660 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1969 | D2421 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/03/1969 | D3551 | Transfer out to: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/06/1969 | D3550 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1969 | D4097 | Transfer in from: | 63A | Perth South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/01/1970 | D3552 | Transfer out to: | 66C | Hamilton (West) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/05/1971 | D3930 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 03/07/1971 | D2423 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 5w/e | 03/07/1971 | D2420 | Transfer out to: | 66A | Polmadie | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/08/1971 | D3211 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/08/1971 | D3550 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 21/08/1971 | D3558 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D3934 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D3677 | Transfer in from: | 64H | Leith Central | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1971 | D3933 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Leicester Midland | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 30/10/1971 | D3935 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/01/1972 | D3539 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/01/1972 | D3877 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/01/1972 | D3985 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/01/1972 | D3932 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1972 | D3243 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1972 | D3931 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/02/1972 | D3932 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1972 | D3550 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/02/1972 | D3553 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/04/1972 | D3929 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/07/1972 | D3211 | Transfer out to: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/10/1972 | D3929 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/10/1972 | D3932 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1972 | D3243 | Transfer out to: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1973 | D2444 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1973 | D3932 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1973 | D3932 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1973 | D3932 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1973 | D4097 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D2444 | Transfer out to: | DE | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1973 | D3539 | Transfer out to: | DE | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1976 | 08828 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 31/12/1976 | 08443 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1977 | 08855 | Transfer in from: | IS | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 06 | 0-4-0 | m/e | 06/1977 | 06006 | Transfer out to: | DE | Dundee West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1977 | 08764 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/1981 | 08728 | Transfer in from: | 60A | Inverness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08515 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/10/1987 | 08728 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1993 | 08710 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/07/1993 | 08855 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/05/2004 | 08817 | Condemned |