Depot: Widnes
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9347 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 527 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8907 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8939 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9020 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9038 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9058 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9067 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9071 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9073 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9074 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9079 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9170 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9347 | Snapshot | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 125 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8318 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8708 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8771 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8772 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8907 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/02/1948 | 8939 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8320 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 8764 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 527 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 9038 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 9074 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 28511 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8519 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8318 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8320 | Transfer out to: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 28511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 49232 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 207 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8462 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8554 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 49232 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 8519 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 28551 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 27/11/1948 | 46423 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | on | 27/11/1948 | 46424 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 28403 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9058 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 28403 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8466 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8558 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 28403 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 8466 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 8558 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 8466 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 8558 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 58363 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 49170 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 28622 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 49343 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 12/1949 | 49067 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 9116 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 49071 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 9116 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 9116 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 48753 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48753 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48753 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 49079 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 40207 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1950 | 58373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 28559 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 58398 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28559 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 28559 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 58398 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 58411 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 28555 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 48466 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1950 | 46434 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46434 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46434 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 58363 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 58400 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 9116 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 58400 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 58400 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 49020 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 48323 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 48708 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 48323 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 48323 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 40134 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/09/1951 | 58400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 40134 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 40134 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 49080 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 58419 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 48764 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 48720 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 49125 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 49126 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 49157 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 49157 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40137 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 58396 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40125 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40137 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 40137 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 48323 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 46420 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1953 | 58419 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 40201 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 58378 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 58394 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 46424 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1953 | 58378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46423 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46423 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 46434 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1953 | 58396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 46424 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 48017 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 49416 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 48772 | Transfer out to: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/11/1953 | 58415 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1954 | 58413 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 65198 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 46422 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 65138 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 65209 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 46422 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 58394 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 65167 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 46421 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 46422 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 65167 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 65209 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 58375 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 58376 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 58427 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 49125 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1955 | 58375 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1955 | 58430 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 65157 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 65186 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1955 | 58376 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 51204 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 49366 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 65184 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/12/1955 | 58427 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 78032 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 78033 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 78034 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 78035 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 78039 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46420 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Coventry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46421 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46422 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46423 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46424 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 49073 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 47490 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 47616 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 65138 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40143 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1957 | 65186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49343 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 48764 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 48764 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 47361 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 48188 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 48323 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 49417 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 78035 | Transfer out to: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 48175 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 78035 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 47361 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Workington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 48188 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 48323 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 48720 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 48502 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 49417 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 49150 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 49357 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 48425 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 48749 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 49126 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 49150 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 49357 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 49366 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 49416 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48166 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48308 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48326 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48709 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48017 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 48462 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 48506 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 48697 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 51204 | Transfer out to: | 26B | Agecroft | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 51218 | Transfer in from: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 40118 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 47006 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 90178 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 90227 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 90242 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 90257 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 90423 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 48166 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 48175 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 48697 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 48749 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 48753 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/07/1959 | 48771 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 90317 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 48506 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 65198 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 90227 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 47006 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 51218 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 65184 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/10/1959 | D3793 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/11/1959 | D3794 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 47601 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 65157 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90257 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 90317 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 48206 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48039 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 90178 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 40202 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 78032 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 48558 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 47601 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 40107 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 40122 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 48139 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 40202 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 48039 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 48502 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1960 | 78033 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 44359 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 44595 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 41244 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 41230 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 41237 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 41239 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40107 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40122 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40137 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 40201 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 41210 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 41217 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 41221 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 47594 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 47597 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 40003 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 40007 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 48437 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 40118 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 44359 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 44595 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 48296 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 48437 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 41210 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 41239 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 47659 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 18/02/1961 | 40003 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 47659 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 47594 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 12H | Tebay | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 47349 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48045 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 47597 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/07/1961 | D2394 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 22/07/1961 | 40007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1961 | D2372 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 78034 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 47490 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/10/1961 | 40134 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/10/1961 | 40143 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 78017 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 48529 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 84023 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 84024 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 48529 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 41217 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 41221 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 78017 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 90147 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 90532 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 48045 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 48139 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 48129 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 48139 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 48326 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/05/1962 | 48554 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48206 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48425 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84023 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 84024 | Transfer out to: | Crewe Works | |||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 90157 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 90192 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/11/1962 | 41230 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 41244 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 49080 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 90532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 41237 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 90141 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90140 | Transfer in from: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 90141 | Transfer out to: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 48045 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 48714 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 90140 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 90423 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 48676 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 90147 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 90157 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 90192 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 90242 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 48676 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 48714 | Transfer out to: | 26F | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46423 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46424 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78035 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78039 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 48536 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 47656 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 47349 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 46410 | Transfer in from: | 12F | Workington | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 47656 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 47616 | Transfer out to: | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 48045 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 48536 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48139 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | D2372 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | D2394 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | D3793 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | D3794 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 46410 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 46423 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 46424 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 48129 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 48296 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 48308 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 48709 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 44571 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44571 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South |