Depot: Willesden
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 08/01/1934 | 13267 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 12/01/1934 | 13269 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 15/01/1934 | 13272 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 16/01/1934 | 13274 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 20/01/1934 | 13273 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | on | 24/01/1934 | 13268 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1934 | 13270 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1934 | 13271 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1934 | 13271 | Transfer out to: | 28C | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1934 | 13272 | Transfer out to: | 28C | Grangemouth | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1934 | 13273 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1934 | 13274 | Transfer out to: | 28A | Motherwell | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1934 | 13269 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1934 | 13270 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1935 | 13282 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1935 | 13284 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 13267 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 13268 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 13284 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1935 | 2982 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1935 | 2960 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/08/1935 | 2984 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1935 | 2960 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1935 | 2984 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 2389 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5286 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 7344 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 7675 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8336 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 8904 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 7318 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 7395 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9029 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9244 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 9333 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1936 | 8336 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1114 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1150 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1151 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5993 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 5999 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 6004 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9263 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9244 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9548 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9555 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9589 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1936 | 5993 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1936 | 2969 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1936 | 2981 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/11/1936 | 2983 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1937 | 2983 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 2969 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1937 | 2981 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1937 | 5999 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Precursor | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1937 | 25286 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1940 | 7081 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/05/1941 | 2975 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/05/1941 | 2978 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/05/1941 | 2968 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/11/1941 | 2975 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1941 | 2968 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1942 | 2978 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/03/1942 | 7117 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1942 | 7096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/07/1942 | 7118 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/12/1943 | 7119 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1944 | 7110 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1944 | 7098 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1945 | 7086 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/05/1945 | 7082 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1946 | 7087 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2446 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 2926 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 5091 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1114 | Snapshot | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1150 | Snapshot | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1151 | Snapshot | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2316 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2389 | Snapshot | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2443 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 2446 | Snapshot | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2747 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2786 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2787 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2812 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2817 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2870 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2885 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2926 | Snapshot | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2931 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2940 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4116 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4208 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4348 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4370 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4381 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4397 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4440 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4441 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4442 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4451 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4497 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4507 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5024 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5027 | Snapshot | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5070 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5071 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5140 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5310 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5353 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5431 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5509 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5510 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5525 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5591 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5625 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5721 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5739 | Snapshot | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7099 | Snapshot | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7116 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7281 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7318 | Snapshot | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7327 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7342 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7344 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7355 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7357 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7361 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7362 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7380 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7395 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7395 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7412 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7430 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7474 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7475 | Snapshot | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7520 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7531 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7675 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7675 | Snapshot | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7676 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8171 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8172 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8173 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8174 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8278 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8368 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8372 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8433 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8438 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8476 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8554 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8600 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8601 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8602 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8603 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8605 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8610 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8612 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8624 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8626 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8628 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8629 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8630 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8632 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8633 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8634 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8648 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8656 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8657 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8660 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8679 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8684 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8904 | Snapshot | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8943 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8953 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9012 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9021 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9029 | Snapshot | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9041 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9062 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9128 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9139 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9163 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9164 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9263 | Snapshot | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9277 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9333 | Snapshot | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9334 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9393 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9398 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9438 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9448 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9453 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9454 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9548 | Snapshot | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9555 | Snapshot | 25D | Mirfield | ||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9589 | Snapshot | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 2372 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 4 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 46 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 7355 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 4507 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 50 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8462 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8173 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8372 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 18 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9275 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9296 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9396 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 5070 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 8630 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9157 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | A3 | 4-6-2 | on | 30/05/1948 | 50 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4862 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5048 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5064 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 6 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9127 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9344 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8462 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8554 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8684 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 76 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 78 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 7281 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 7380 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9127 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 9334 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 5549 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/08/1948 | 8557 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 45538 | Transfer in from: | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/09/1948 | 45739 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5606 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 4862 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5310 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5048 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 10000 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 10001 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 48129 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 8904 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 45097 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 48129 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8904 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9285 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 48129 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 48612 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8904 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9296 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | on | 11/12/1948 | 9012 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 45097 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 9285 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 45097 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 9285 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/01/1949 | 49157 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 49127 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 9249 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/02/1949 | 49342 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 17 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 40009 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 76 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 78 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 9249 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 49069 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 49438 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 49356 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 9117 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 48904 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 16/04/1949 | 49285 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | Claughton | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/04/1949 | 46004 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 49298 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 49454 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 44833 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 44911 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45041 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45089 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45146 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 52 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45510 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45538 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45549 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 45721 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 48953 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 09/07/1949 | 8943 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 48312 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 8147 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 48312 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 8147 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 48312 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 8147 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 8416 | Transfer in from: | 25A | Wakefield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 8310 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 206 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 40044 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 40081 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 40109 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 40135 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 40204 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 47327 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/09/1949 | 47362 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45555 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45431 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 45606 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 49393 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 45606 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 48122 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 8354 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 45555 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 49453 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 48736 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 48747 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 48736 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/11/1949 | 48747 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 7491 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 7505 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 44348 | Transfer out to: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 44370 | Transfer out to: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 44860 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 44863 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 48758 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 7491 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 7505 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 44397 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 44440 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 7491 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 7505 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | on | 31/12/1949 | 49298 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48758 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 8340 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44860 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 44863 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 48758 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 8340 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 8340 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 42117 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 42118 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/01/1950 | 42443 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 58291 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 48011 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 48550 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 48550 | Transfer out to: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1950 | 44441 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 04/1950 | 49356 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 48551 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/04/1950 | 48665 | Transfer in from: | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 40054 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 40055 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 7357 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 40072 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 40073 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 40087 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 44875 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 40072 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 40073 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 40087 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44875 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 40072 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 40073 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 40087 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 44875 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 49448 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 49069 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 22/07/1950 | 49122 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | m/e | 08/1950 | 49041 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 12/08/1950 | 49077 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 48327 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/08/1950 | 9396 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 48327 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 48327 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 40072 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 42786 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 44833 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 45353 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58280 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 49077 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 49163 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 49398 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48110 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48188 | Transfer in from: | 19E | Belle Vue | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48327 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48557 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 48633 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45546 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44911 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 45041 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48011 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48110 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 48172 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48188 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48340 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 48354 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 48438 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 48605 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 48660 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 8278 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 12/1950 | 10800 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45546 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 45546 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 45092 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 45374 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 48036 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 48325 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 48518 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 49139 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40001 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40007 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 40006 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 42817 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 47430 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40001 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40007 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 47361 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40001 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 40007 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 47361 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 48036 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 48518 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 48036 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 48518 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 48440 | Transfer in from: | 19G | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 9021 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 40017 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 10/03/1951 | 40109 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/03/1951 | 40017 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/03/1951 | 40109 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44397 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 44440 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 48440 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 48440 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 44370 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1951 | 44372 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 40073 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 40006 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 44370 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 44370 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 49117 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 49062 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 10800 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 06/1951 | 10800 | Transfer out to: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 48074 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 48758 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 48074 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 45509 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 48074 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8310 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 8602 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 45511 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 45511 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 45511 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 12090 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 49180 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 40001 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 49180 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 49180 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 44971 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 12090 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 45140 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 40019 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45387 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 45092 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 44370 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 45071 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 12093 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 44838 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45404 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45506 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45510 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 44971 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45591 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45606 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 45625 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40045 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40053 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40066 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 73020 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40018 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40135 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 40204 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45591 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45625 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 49077 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 49078 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 49082 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 49088 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45506 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 45510 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 73020 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40049 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 40087 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40047 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40048 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40068 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45434 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 45502 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40081 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40109 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 40206 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 49342 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 40045 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 48134 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 49070 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 40045 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 48134 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 49070 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 48134 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 49070 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/01/1953 | 13015 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/01/1953 | 13016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 12093 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45434 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 45502 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 47269 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 47270 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 48165 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 48287 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 48674 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 40009 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 40017 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/03/1953 | 13017 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/03/1953 | 13018 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/03/1953 | 13019 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 46424 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 48165 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 48287 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 48674 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 40002 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 40016 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 40069 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 44372 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 47378 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 48290 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | on | 19/04/1953 | 10000 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | on | 19/04/1953 | 10001 | Transfer out to: | 70A | Nine Elms | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44370 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 47350 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 47492 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44372 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 47269 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 47270 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40018 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40042 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 40051 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44372 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45350 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45517 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 42940 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 45146 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 47350 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 46424 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 40001 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44771 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44869 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 44916 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 45003 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1953 | 42948 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1953 | 42966 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 48423 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 42316 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 42937 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 48634 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 48658 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1954 | 12020 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 48154 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 48174 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1954 | 12013 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40003 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40064 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 45591 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 48626 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 44354 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 44473 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 45634 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 40003 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 48147 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 48154 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 48423 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1954 | 12034 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1954 | 12037 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1954 | 12020 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1954 | 12035 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1954 | 12036 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1954 | 12023 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1954 | 12032 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1954 | 12033 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1954 | 12051 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1954 | 12021 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/10/1954 | 12031 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12049 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12054 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12005 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12022 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1954 | 12030 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 48679 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1954 | 12052 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1954 | 12055 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1954 | 12004 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1954 | 12009 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1954 | 12050 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1954 | 12010 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 12078 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 13050 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 45147 | Transfer in from: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 45278 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 45381 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 40052 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 40053 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 40055 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 48312 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1954 | 12053 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1954 | 12019 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 40045 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 40053 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45510 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45547 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/01/1955 | 12013 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | D3/7 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 12029 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 40018 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45625 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 45634 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 42852 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 40001 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 13051 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 13052 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1955 | 12050 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1955 | 12053 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 46458 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 48535 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 48766 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 45097 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 48535 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 48766 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1956 | 12050 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1956 | 12053 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 48368 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 13173 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 13174 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45372 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45429 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 45437 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 44713 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45394 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45003 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 45429 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 47491 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 48433 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46424 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 40125 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 40208 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 44067 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 44381 | Transfer out to: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 44442 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 49082 | Transfer out to: | 85C | Hereford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 40085 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 40104 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 40122 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 40156 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 40157 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 48729 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 45394 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 44916 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45187 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45375 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 45430 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 40157 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 49275 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 40002 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 40069 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 40085 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 40104 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 40122 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 40208 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 44354 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 44916 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45385 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45603 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45740 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 48252 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 48366 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 48526 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 40156 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45437 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 45546 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/12/1956 | 42948 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/12/1956 | 42966 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 42487 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 44491 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 44492 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 80092 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 42747 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 45385 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 48252 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 48366 | Transfer out to: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 48526 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 42747 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 42937 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 44491 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 44492 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 80092 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 45353 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 44067 | Transfer out to: | 5F | Uttoxeter | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 49070 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 40156 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 49070 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 42787 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 42931 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 44473 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 47378 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Patricroft | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/06/1957 | 12053 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/06/1957 | 12053 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 13178 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40045 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12070 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12033 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12034 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12035 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12036 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12037 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12049 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12050 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12051 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12052 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12053 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12054 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1957 | 12055 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12071 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12073 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12074 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12075 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12076 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12099 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12100 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12101 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 12102 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 13177 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40003 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40060 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40069 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 40070 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42787 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42118 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 42885 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 42118 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 42885 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 45147 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 45147 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 40125 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 40156 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 44440 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42315 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42316 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Warwick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42321 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42351 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42359 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42360 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42366 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42367 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42368 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42416 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42422 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 49413 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42787 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 42885 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 44370 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 47474 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48290 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 48610 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47302 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47482 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47486 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47501 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47559 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | D3019 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47505 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47520 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47531 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47675 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 47676 | Transfer out to: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 45333 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 44397 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 15/02/1958 | 40054 | Transfer out to: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 40047 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 42366 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 49180 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 40047 | Transfer in from: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 47315 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 47483 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42315 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42316 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 47475 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 47492 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 42315 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 42316 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 42366 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 47302 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 47361 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/05/1958 | 42975 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 42931 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40010 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40020 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 40043 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 67740 | Transfer in from: | 34E | Neasden | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 67747 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42315 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42351 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42359 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42360 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42416 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 44713 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1958 | 42975 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 42576 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 42316 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45025 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 45089 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 47342 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 48764 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 45517 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 45431 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 48259 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 48504 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 40005 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42304 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42350 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42351 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42359 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42360 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42365 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42482 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42538 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42586 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42604 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42611 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 42627 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 45500 | Transfer in from: | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 12071 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 12099 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 12102 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 67740 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | L1 | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 67747 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 44058 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 40048 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 42944 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 45147 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 45353 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 45430 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 45431 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 48259 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 48504 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 40020 | Transfer out to: | 14E | Bedford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 40006 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 07/02/1959 | 40005 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 42463 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 42579 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 42885 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/02/1959 | 40049 | Transfer out to: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 42430 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 42489 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 42585 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 42859 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 47412 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/05/1959 | D210 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 20/05/1959 | D211 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 25/05/1959 | D212 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 01/06/1959 | D213 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 08/06/1959 | D214 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/06/1959 | D215 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45538 | Transfer in from: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45539 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42482 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42487 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 42489 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44771 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45333 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 45372 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48074 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 48764 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | D212 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | D212 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | D213 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | D215 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 42852 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 42944 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42304 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42576 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 08/1959 | 47315 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 42576 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | D211 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 42321 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 42350 | Transfer out to: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 42367 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 42422 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42359 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42365 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42366 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 42368 | Transfer out to: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 48729 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | D210 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | D212 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 42351 | Transfer out to: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 40049 | Transfer in from: | 67B | Hurlford | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 49277 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 42350 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 42351 | Transfer in from: | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 42368 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 42852 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 42944 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 42321 | Transfer in from: | 24C | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 42366 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 42422 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 45146 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D5015 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | D214 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 42367 | Transfer in from: | 27C | Southport | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D5016 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/09/1959 | D8035 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 45146 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 45601 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 45624 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 45669 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 45722 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 45500 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 45510 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 45539 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 45547 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/10/1959 | D8036 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 45547 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 45511 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1959 | D5015 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/10/1959 | D5016 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 44340 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 45599 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 47302 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 47304 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 80081 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 80084 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 07/11/1959 | 40046 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 07/11/1959 | 40047 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 07/11/1959 | 40066 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/11/1959 | 42321 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 10000 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 10001 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 10201 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 10202 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 10203 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/11/1959 | 40043 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/11/1959 | 40044 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/11/1959 | 40045 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 44058 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 44116 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 44372 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 42068 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 42070 | Transfer in from: | 75E | Three Bridges | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 45146 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 45324 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 40064 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 05/12/1959 | 40019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 05/12/1959 | 40068 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 05/12/1959 | 40069 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42074 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42075 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42076 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42079 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42459 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42583 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42616 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42673 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 42785 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 40053 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 26/12/1959 | 48632 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 26/12/1959 | 40060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 80081 | Transfer out to: | 73A | Stewarts Lane | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 5w/e | 31/12/1959 | 80084 | Transfer out to: | 73B | Bricklayers Arms | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 42074 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 42075 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 42459 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 42583 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 42616 | Transfer out to: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 42673 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 75030 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 75052 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 45284 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 42935 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48122 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 48440 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 45137 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 45139 | Transfer in from: | 15D | Bedford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 12/03/1960 | 40070 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 47486 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 45137 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | D3017 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 45137 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5072 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5073 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5074 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5078 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5079 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5080 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5081 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/04/1960 | D5082 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 44869 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5075 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5083 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/04/1960 | D5080 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 46472 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 46458 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 42463 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 44875 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45064 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45146 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 45387 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 47395 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 42463 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 73004 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 73013 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 73014 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 73033 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 44838 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 45187 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 21/05/1960 | D5086 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 42081 | Transfer in from: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 48632 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 73032 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 73039 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D8004 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 40010 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 40051 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 42070 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D5081 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D5082 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/05/1960 | D5083 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 09/06/1960 | D5087 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/06/1960 | D5087 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/06/1960 | D5087 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42069 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42101 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42478 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 42931 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45024 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45139 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 45324 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45601 | Transfer out to: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45350 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45624 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45551 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/07/1960 | D5082 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45603 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 45740 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 48476 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Bidston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 42069 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 42081 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 42576 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 42579 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/07/1960 | D5076 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/07/1960 | D5077 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 42422 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 42885 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 40016 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 20/08/1960 | D5085 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/08/1960 | D5081 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/08/1960 | D5079 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 40003 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 40007 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 44741 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45624 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 45733 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/09/1960 | D5080 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 44208 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 44340 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 44451 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 44497 | Transfer out to: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 44842 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 45188 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D8002 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D3015 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | D3016 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 45603 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/09/1960 | D5079 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 44842 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 44741 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/10/1960 | D5079 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 73032 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 45381 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 22/10/1960 | D5059 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 42079 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 42944 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 45188 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Black Tanks | 0-6-0T | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 4 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/10/1960 | D8001 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/10/1960 | D8003 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45284 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45374 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45375 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 45404 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 47482 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D3016 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D5063 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D5064 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D5065 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/11/1960 | D5083 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 47483 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D5061 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D5061 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/11/1960 | D5061 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45020 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45050 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45147 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45222 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45284 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45288 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45374 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45375 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45624 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45722 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5074 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5081 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/11/1960 | D5083 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/11/1960 | D5143 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 45704 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/11/1960 | D8038 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/12/1960 | D5144 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 45634 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 45670 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 45722 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 46122 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 46141 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 46158 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 12073 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 12074 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 07/12/1960 | D5145 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/12/1960 | D5146 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 45666 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 45684 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/12/1960 | D5032 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 40128 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 40206 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 42315 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 42579 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D5027 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 70017 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 46122 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/12/1960 | D5087 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/12/1960 | D5133 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 70004 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42810 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 70042 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 40128 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 40206 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42315 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 42579 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 46141 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 46158 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 42351 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 42368 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 42430 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 42586 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 45020 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 45547 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 45634 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 45666 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45525 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45528 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45529 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45735 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46114 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46126 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 46159 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/01/1961 | D5030 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 70032 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 42463 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 42538 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45050 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45137 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45147 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45284 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45375 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45538 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45599 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45670 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45684 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45704 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 45722 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 49070 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 45523 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 46120 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 46146 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/01/1961 | D5086 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 48247 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 48268 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 48368 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 48531 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/01/1961 | D5031 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 42076 | Transfer out to: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 49078 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 49122 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 49164 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 49344 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/01/1961 | D5085 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 70021 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 04/02/1961 | 70033 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 42925 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 45191 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/02/1961 | D5060 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/02/1961 | D5059 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/02/1961 | D5063 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 48106 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 18/02/1961 | 48268 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 42576 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 42616 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 45593 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 45672 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/03/1961 | 46114 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/03/1961 | 46205 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 11/03/1961 | 46207 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1961 | D5064 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 40180 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 40207 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 42430 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 42579 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5060 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5061 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5083 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5060 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5061 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 18/03/1961 | D5024 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 42443 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 42663 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/03/1961 | D5035 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/04/1961 | D5034 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 01/04/1961 | D5060 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 45020 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/04/1961 | D5035 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 40180 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 40207 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/04/1961 | D5035 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/04/1961 | D5028 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/04/1961 | D5029 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/04/1961 | D5033 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/04/1961 | D5034 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/04/1961 | D5034 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/04/1961 | D5065 | Transfer out to: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/04/1961 | D5020 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 40006 | Transfer in from: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 42889 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 48106 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 48129 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/05/1961 | D5072 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 47559 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 48657 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 42430 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 42443 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 42579 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 42663 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/05/1961 | D5146 | Transfer out to: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/05/1961 | D5021 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/06/1961 | D5079 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42368 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42470 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 44780 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 44844 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45130 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45276 | Transfer in from: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45530 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45534 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 46111 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 46144 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 46152 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45551 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45593 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45603 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45669 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45672 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 48656 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40010 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 40104 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 70047 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 40104 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 46154 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/07/1961 | D5146 | Transfer in from: | 21E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 42101 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 42585 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 42611 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/07/1961 | 42616 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/07/1961 | D5025 | Transfer in from: | 32B | Ipswich | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 15/07/1961 | 46205 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 15/07/1961 | 46207 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/07/1961 | D5061 | Transfer out to: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 22/07/1961 | 40010 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 22/07/1961 | 40042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 22/07/1961 | 40049 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 40144 | Transfer in from: | 21B | Bournville | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 40157 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 40201 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 44916 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 44916 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 19/08/1961 | 42360 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/08/1961 | D8005 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1961 | 46205 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | on | 09/09/1961 | 46207 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 70046 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 75031 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45020 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45130 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 45222 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1961 | D5031 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/09/1961 | D5035 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 70017 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 40110 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 40128 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42585 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42611 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70014 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70015 | Transfer in from: | 26A | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70046 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70014 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 70015 | Transfer out to: | 14D | Neasden | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45525 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45530 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 45534 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46120 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46144 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46152 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46154 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 70047 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 07/10/1961 | 42627 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 49413 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 70046 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 70047 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/10/1961 | D8035 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 11/11/1961 | 48648 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 46205 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 46207 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/12/1961 | D3797 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/12/1961 | 12075 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 23/12/1961 | 40144 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 40080 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D8035 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/02/1962 | D8038 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 12076 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | D3796 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 42351 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 46147 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 46148 | Transfer in from: | 41D | Canklow | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 70004 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | D3835 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 42066 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 42071 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 12078 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 70021 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/03/1962 | D5003 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 70021 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 45374 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 70047 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | D3795 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45044 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45111 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45282 | Transfer in from: | 12F | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45305 | Transfer in from: | 12F | Workington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45434 | Transfer in from: | 12F | Workington | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 12100 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42747 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42785 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42810 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42812 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42852 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42859 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42870 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42889 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42925 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 42935 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | D3834 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 45198 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 12070 | Transfer out to: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 42183 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 42541 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 46169 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/04/1962 | D8043 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 21/04/1962 | D8044 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 46148 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 70004 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 70046 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/05/1962 | D5011 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/05/1962 | D5017 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 40110 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 48445 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 42183 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 42541 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1962 | D5082 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 19/05/1962 | D5002 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/05/1962 | D5133 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | m/e | 01/06/1962 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/06/1962 | D8038 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 73033 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5000 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5007 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 73033 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5002 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5003 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5011 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5017 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5000 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5007 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5000 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/06/1962 | D5007 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 17/06/1962 | 42576 | Transfer out to: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42099 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42101 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42218 | Transfer in from: | 33C | Shoeburyness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42577 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 42615 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46101 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46154 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 46163 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 47606 | Transfer in from: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48085 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48252 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48479 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 48506 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/06/1962 | D5023 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44780 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 44916 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45027 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45278 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 45282 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 47304 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/06/1962 | D5000 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42351 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42366 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 42368 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 30/06/1962 | D5000 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 42562 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 42573 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 45530 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/07/1962 | D5133 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 42066 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/07/1962 | D5133 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 47307 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 47606 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 40128 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 40201 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/07/1962 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/07/1962 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 73033 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 48077 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 48258 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 48312 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 48435 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 44844 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 42221 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 73033 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 42581 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 12/08/1962 | 42182 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 12/08/1962 | 42566 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Leamington | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 44844 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 25/08/1962 | 42367 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 40080 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 47302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45301 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 45427 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48258 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 48312 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 47341 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/09/1962 | D5004 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 42470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 42615 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 70014 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 70015 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 70048 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 70049 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1962 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 40006 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/10/1962 | 10201 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 15/10/1962 | 10203 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 42077 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 45020 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 45037 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 48440 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 48493 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 11/11/1962 | 10202 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/11/1962 | D5007 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 24/11/1962 | D5007 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46126 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 40157 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 42585 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46146 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46147 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46154 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 46159 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 01/12/1962 | 49128 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 42430 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 48085 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 49077 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 45191 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 70014 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 70015 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 70033 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 70048 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 70049 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 75031 | Transfer out to: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 42117 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | D2518 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 46101 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 46169 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/01/1963 | D5083 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 46111 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 46163 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 48077 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 75030 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 75052 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 45528 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 45044 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 42101 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/02/1963 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/02/1963 | D5031 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 42431 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/03/1963 | 45301 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 45257 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 45270 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 42099 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 46401 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 46503 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 46504 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 46505 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 46506 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 46517 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 70000 | Transfer in from: | 32A | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 70001 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 70005 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 70010 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 70012 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 70034 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 48435 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 42182 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 70024 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 70031 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 70043 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 45020 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 45037 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 45257 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 45111 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1963 | 45427 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 47341 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 42583 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 47341 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 70014 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 47307 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | D3851 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42080 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42222 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42289 | Transfer in from: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42606 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70020 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70028 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70033 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78018 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78019 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78033 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78038 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78039 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78043 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78060 | Transfer in from: | 27B | Aintree | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 78063 | Transfer in from: | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42077 | Transfer out to: | 26C | Bolton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42218 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42221 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42350 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 42566 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46401 | Transfer out to: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46424 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46472 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46503 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46504 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46505 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46506 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 46517 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Northwich | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70000 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70004 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 70042 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 42068 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 42604 | Transfer out to: | 21C | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45065 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45392 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45527 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 45736 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46114 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46125 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46150 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46156 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 46167 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D3173 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | D3796 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/07/1963 | D8041 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 20/07/1963 | D8042 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 70004 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 45065 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 45276 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 48368 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 48493 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1963 | D5000 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/08/1963 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 41239 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 46240 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 46245 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 46239 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D5000 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 14/09/1963 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45288 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45392 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45434 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45527 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 45736 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 46114 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 46125 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 46150 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70028 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 70033 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 46114 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 46167 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 46114 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/09/1963 | 48600 | Transfer out to: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 05/10/1963 | 48506 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 45529 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 45735 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 46156 | Transfer out to: | 16B | Annesley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 48551 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 48629 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 45044 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 45270 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73038 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73040 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73048 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73067 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 73070 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 44844 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45044 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45198 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 45305 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 70024 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/11/1963 | D5009 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/11/1963 | D5012 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 45584 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 45617 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 45676 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | on | 12/1963 | 10000 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 45672 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 45733 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 70047 | Transfer in from: | 21D | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 70001 | Transfer out to: | 2J | Aston | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 70005 | Transfer out to: | 2J | Aston | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 44520 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 45572 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 04/01/1964 | 42562 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 44520 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | on | 04/01/1964 | 45572 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 48247 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 70047 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | on | 25/01/1964 | 45523 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 01/02/1964 | 48440 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8006 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8007 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8008 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8009 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8010 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8011 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/02/1964 | D8012 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45292 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45299 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45331 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 45379 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73004 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73013 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73014 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73033 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73038 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73039 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73040 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73048 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73067 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 73070 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 45393 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 47341 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48445 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 48632 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 70049 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 70053 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 48007 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 25/04/1964 | D5146 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 45584 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Blackpool Central | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/05/1964 | 42289 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 42289 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1964 | 41239 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 45530 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44833 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44860 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 44862 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42478 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 42606 | Transfer out to: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 70034 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 70043 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 70053 | Transfer out to: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 46245 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 29/08/1964 | D5089 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 45617 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 45672 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 45676 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 45733 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 46239 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | w/e | 29/08/1964 | 46240 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/09/1964 | D5091 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/09/1964 | D5089 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Cricklewood West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 92085 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 92107 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 48007 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 47501 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 70032 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 70049 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 12089 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 12090 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 21/11/1964 | 42573 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D299 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D301 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D302 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D304 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D305 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D306 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D309 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D312 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 44844 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45349 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45418 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45426 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 45454 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48134 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48325 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48479 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48518 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 48665 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D5144 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/11/1964 | D5145 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1964 | D5009 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 05/12/1964 | D5012 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 92085 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 92107 | Transfer out to: | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 12058 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 12064 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 12067 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 12068 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D4112 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 42105 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 42106 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 42114 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 47432 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 47435 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D5087 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D5089 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Cricklewood West | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D5090 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D5092 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/12/1964 | D5093 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 76035 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 76037 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 76039 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 76041 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 76089 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D211 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D217 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D230 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D233 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D292 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D297 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D329 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5035 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5074 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5081 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45349 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45426 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 45454 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48036 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48171 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48252 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 48416 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5000 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5004 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5007 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5020 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5021 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/01/1965 | D5023 | Transfer out to: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70004 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70010 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70012 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70014 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70020 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70021 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 70031 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/01/1965 | 76089 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 12049 | Transfer in from: | 2H | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 48754 | Transfer in from: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44661 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44774 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44780 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44865 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 44985 | Transfer in from: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 46507 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 46508 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 46509 | Transfer in from: | 89B | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/02/1965 | 46512 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/02/1965 | D5088 | Transfer in from: | D14 | London (Midland) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 13/02/1965 | 48518 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 48036 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 48347 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 48658 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | D309 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | D312 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | D329 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D5000 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D5001 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 27/02/1965 | D5004 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 13/03/1965 | D5084 | Transfer in from: | D14 | London (Midland) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 27/03/1965 | 42430 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 12053 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | D3069 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 42096 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 42102 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 42233 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 42287 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 42616 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 43007 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 43018 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/04/1965 | D5085 | Transfer in from: | D14 | London (Midland) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 78029 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 78034 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 78035 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D3068 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D5086 | Transfer in from: | D14 | London (Midland) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/04/1965 | D3069 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D309 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D312 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 17/04/1965 | D329 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 44763 | Transfer in from: | 1G | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48203 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48544 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48554 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48757 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48036 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48347 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 48658 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 08/05/1965 | 42106 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 08/05/1965 | 42222 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 08/05/1965 | 42289 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/05/1965 | 42071 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 48526 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 48559 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 42105 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 29/05/1965 | 42431 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D3067 | Transfer in from: | 38E | Woodford Halse | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | D324 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48002 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48005 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48010 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48011 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48081 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48088 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48121 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48336 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48517 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48527 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 78003 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 78032 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 78058 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 78059 | Transfer in from: | 6H | Bangor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 44833 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 44844 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 45393 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 19/06/1965 | 42114 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 48601 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | D3068 | Transfer out to: | 1H | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42080 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42096 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42102 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42118 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42233 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42583 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 42616 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 46507 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 46512 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 48549 | Transfer in from: | 4A | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 48626 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 17/07/1965 | D5143 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 42287 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 42577 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 42581 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 42611 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48002 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48005 | Transfer out to: | 10C | Fleetwood | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48011 | Transfer out to: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48081 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48088 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48518 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 48624 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 76035 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 45379 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 46508 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Croes Newydd | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 48544 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 48559 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 44862 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 48549 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 48626 | Transfer out to: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 47432 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | D3797 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 44763 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 76106 | Transfer in from: | 64F | Bathgate | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D5008 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/09/1965 | D5017 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 76106 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D8000 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D309 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D312 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D324 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D329 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 43007 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 43018 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44661 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44774 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44780 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44860 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44865 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 44985 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45292 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45299 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45331 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 45418 | Transfer out to: | 2D | Banbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 46509 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 47435 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48121 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48203 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48336 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48517 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48526 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48527 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48531 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48554 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48603 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48628 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48754 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 48757 | Transfer out to: | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D5000 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D5001 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 02/10/1965 | D5004 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 76037 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 76039 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 76041 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78003 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78018 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78019 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78034 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78035 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78038 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78039 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78058 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78059 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78060 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78063 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78029 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78032 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78033 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 78043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D2510 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5083 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 16/10/1965 | D5143 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | D3795 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/01/1966 | D8039 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/01/1966 | D8040 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D3015 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D3017 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D370 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D371 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D377 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D378 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D380 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D3847 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D3848 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D3849 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D3850 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D8037 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D211 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D217 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D230 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D233 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D292 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D297 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D299 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D301 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D302 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5024 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5025 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5029 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5032 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5083 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/01/1966 | D5143 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5008 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5017 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5027 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5028 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5030 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5033 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D5034 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D8041 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D304 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D305 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D306 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D8041 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | 12089 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D3174 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 12/03/1966 | 48010 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D8041 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D8042 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/03/1966 | D8043 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | on | 12/03/1966 | 10001 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | D3795 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/03/1966 | D2510 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D370 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D371 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D377 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D378 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 18/04/1966 | D380 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5031 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5035 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5073 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5074 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5075 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5076 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5077 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5078 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5079 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5080 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5081 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5084 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5085 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5086 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5087 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5088 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5090 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5091 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5092 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D5093 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8000 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8001 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8002 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8003 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8004 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8005 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8006 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8007 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8008 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8009 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8010 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8011 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8012 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8035 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8036 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8037 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8038 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8039 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8040 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | on | 18/04/1966 | D8044 | Transfer out to: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 12089 | Transfer in from: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | D2518 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/11/1966 | D4112 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D5089 | Transfer out to: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | 12049 | Transfer out to: | 1F | Rugby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/11/1967 | D3850 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Cricklewood West | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/12/1967 | D3050 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Toton | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/12/1967 | 12068 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1968 | D4132 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1968 | D4133 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1969 | 12090 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1969 | 12067 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1969 | D3177 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/04/1969 | 12064 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/05/1969 | D3795 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1970 | D4151 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D3269 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1970 | D3518 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 21/05/1970 | D3518 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D4134 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1970 | D3015 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 29/05/1970 | D3269 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/06/1970 | D3936 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1970 | 12101 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1970 | 12089 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/09/1970 | D3188 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1970 | D3107 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/01/1971 | D3027 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1971 | D4116 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1971 | D3188 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/04/1971 | 12053 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1971 | D3795 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/04/1971 | 12058 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1971 | D3770 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1971 | D3018 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1971 | D3834 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/11/1971 | D3107 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1972 | D3107 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1972 | D3795 | Transfer out to: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/03/1972 | D4135 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1972 | D3770 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D3835 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D3850 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 02/12/1972 | D3700 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/12/1972 | D3700 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 23/12/1972 | D3700 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D3106 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D3700 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D3107 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D3178 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1973 | D3178 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/05/1973 | 86201 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | on | 06/05/1973 | 86202 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7523 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7564 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/05/1973 | D3699 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/06/1973 | 08038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/06/1973 | D7662 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1973 | D3869 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/06/1973 | D3067 | Transfer out to: | BY | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D7534 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D7535 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1973 | D3067 | Transfer in from: | BY | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1973 | D3695 | Transfer in from: | NH | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/08/1973 | D3869 | Transfer out to: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D7592 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D7658 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D7659 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1973 | D4098 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7606 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7607 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/10/1973 | D3936 | Transfer out to: | BY | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/11/1973 | D7606 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 03/11/1973 | D7607 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/12/1973 | 08039 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1973 | D3834 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/12/1973 | D3067 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1974 | 08600 | Transfer in from: | NH | Newton Heath | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D7522 | Transfer in from: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/01/1974 | D7665 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/01/1974 | 08627 | Transfer in from: | BY | Bletchley | ||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 26/01/1974 | E3161 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7536 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7537 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | D3851 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/03/1974 | 25189 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 23/03/1974 | D7537 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 25221 | Transfer in from: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 25222 | Transfer in from: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 86002 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 86007 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 86011 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 25312 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 25315 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1974 | D3016 | Transfer out to: | AF | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25036 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25236 | Transfer in from: | CD | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25243 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25312 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25315 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | D4139 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 86006 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 86010 | Transfer in from: | GS | Glasgow Shields Road | ||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 87003 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 87005 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 87006 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 87008 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 87012 | Transfer in from: | O/L | |||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25172 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25214 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | D3699 | Transfer out to: | BY | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 25265 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 25243 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 08943 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1974 | 08902 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 25072 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 25036 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 25189 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 08234 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 08667 | Transfer out to: | BY | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25185 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25186 | Transfer out to: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25242 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25308 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 25184 | Transfer out to: | KM | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 25070 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 08019 | Transfer out to: | DY | Derby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25185 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 25190 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 05/04/1975 | 08934 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 05/04/1975 | 08112 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25137 | Transfer in from: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25184 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25193 | Transfer in from: | KD | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25302 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 08235 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 08236 | Transfer in from: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1975 | 08081 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25070 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25072 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25137 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25173 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25184 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25185 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25190 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25193 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25221 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25222 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25236 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25265 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25302 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25309 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25312 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 14/06/1975 | 25315 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08600 | Transfer out to: | SG | Slade Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/09/1975 | 08236 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 08926 | Transfer in from: | BW | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1975 | 08627 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 21/08/1976 | 87101 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1976 | 08535 | Transfer in from: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1976 | 08806 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1976 | 08943 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08742 | Transfer in from: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1977 | 08806 | Transfer out to: | BY | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1977 | 08742 | Transfer out to: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1977 | 08121 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/12/1977 | 08010 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1978 | 08199 | Transfer in from: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 12/03/1978 | 08199 | Transfer out to: | CW | Cricklewood East | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1979 | 08908 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1981 | 08680 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08201 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08374 | Transfer in from: | HG | Hither Green | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08381 | Transfer in from: | 73F | Ashford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08484 | Transfer in from: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08235 | Transfer out to: | BY | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/09/1982 | 08234 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/12/1982 | 08374 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1982 | 08201 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/12/1982 | 08381 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 04/1984 | 08617 | Reinstated | 98Su | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/06/1984 | 08121 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/10/1985 | 08681 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL3 | Bo-Bo | on | 26/09/1986 | 83009 | Reinstated | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/10/1987 | 08625 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Electric | 90 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/04/1988 | 90001 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | 90 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/04/1988 | 90002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | 90 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/04/1988 | 90003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | 90 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 04/04/1988 | 90004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | 90 | Bo-Bo | on | 16/05/1988 | 90008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Electric | AL3 | Bo-Bo | on | 17/05/1988 | 83012 | Reinstated | ||||
Electric | AL3 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/03/1989 | 83012 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL3 | Bo-Bo | on | 19/03/1989 | 83009 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/10/1992 | 08533 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/10/2000 | 08535 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | on | 12/2001 | 86101 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | on | 04/2002 | 86102 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | on | 10/2003 | 86249 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/2003 | 86606 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | on | 11/2003 | 86611 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 31/01/2004 | 08625 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | AL6 | Bo-Bo | on | 03/2005 | 86602 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/04/2005 | 87005 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | on | 01/07/2006 | 87008 | Condemned | ||||
Electric | 87 | Bo-Bo | on | 30/11/2006 | 87012 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/2007 | 08926 | Condemned |