Depot: Workington
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1935 | 2946 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 1008 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 4390 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2945 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/07/1937 | 2946 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1937 | 2946 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/01/1938 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1939 | 2945 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1939 | 2946 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1940 | 2945 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1940 | 2946 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1940 | 2949 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/11/1940 | 2950 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1942 | 2945 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1942 | 2946 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1942 | 2949 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1942 | 2950 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 28525 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1008 | Snapshot | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4064 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4075 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4192 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4364 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4385 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4390 | Snapshot | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4399 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4449 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4495 | Snapshot | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4505 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4593 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 656 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 694 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 695 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7290 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7292 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7593 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7604 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 28339 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 28512 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 3006 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4192 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4385 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 4399 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 28559 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | 28622 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 28458 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | 28532 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 4019 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 28532 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 28532 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 4365 | Transfer in from: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1948 | 4019 | Transfer out to: | 3E | Monument Lane | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 28532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 28318 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 28553 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 28525 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 58421 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1949 | 58429 | Transfer in from: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 58367 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 7604 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | 28622 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 44596 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 44596 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1950 | 58384 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 46447 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 46448 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/05/1950 | 28559 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 58412 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 58412 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 58429 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 46447 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 46448 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 58412 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 46447 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 46448 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 58412 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 46456 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 58418 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 58412 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 46457 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 4593 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46457 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | D5 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/10/1950 | 52499 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 46457 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 46458 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 58418 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 46458 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 46458 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 43004 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 44064 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 44364 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 58421 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 58362 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1951 | 46491 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Cauliflowers | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 58396 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 47604 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 47604 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 47604 | Transfer out to: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 44549 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44454 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 46455 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 46489 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 46491 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 46459 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 46448 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 46455 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 44454 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 47350 | Transfer in from: | 1B | Camden | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 44390 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 44461 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 47337 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 47390 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 47525 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 52201 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 52418 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Moor Row | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 44525 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 47350 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 44525 | Transfer out to: | 6G | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 47292 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 43005 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 46455 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 46491 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Durran Hill (Carlisle) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 40694 | Transfer out to: | 10B | Preston | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40582 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40656 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 40695 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 52201 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 46458 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 46459 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/01/1957 | 52418 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 43025 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 43026 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 46432 | Transfer in from: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | D5 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 02/1957 | 52499 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 40582 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 44360 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Tebay | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 44343 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 47503 | Transfer in from: | 11D | Oxenholme | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 46457 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 42427 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 47361 | Transfer in from: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 42233 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 43005 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 44292 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 46433 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 47662 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 42233 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 42427 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 47503 | Transfer out to: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/10/1958 | D3580 | Transfer in from: | 24K | Preston | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 13/12/1958 | 47337 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 43026 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 43868 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 46489 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 44365 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 46447 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 43026 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 46455 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 47451 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 44343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 44360 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/03/1960 | 44495 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 47610 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 47451 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/03/1960 | 47525 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 44035 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 75028 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 75033 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 75028 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 75033 | Transfer out to: | 6B | Mold Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 46488 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 46442 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Kirkby Stephen | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 44065 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 44454 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 44454 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 47662 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 44302 | Transfer in from: | 3D | Aston | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45282 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45305 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 45434 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 43868 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 44439 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 45364 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 44302 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 43006 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 43006 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 47344 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 47522 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 46456 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 46442 | Transfer out to: | 21B | Bescot | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45282 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45305 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 31/03/1962 | 45434 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 78018 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 43026 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 47290 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 47522 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 47604 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 47610 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 47406 | Transfer in from: | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 47564 | Transfer in from: | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 47373 | Transfer in from: | 11A | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 47564 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 47593 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 47676 | Transfer in from: | 11B | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | Standard Class 2 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 78018 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 44386 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 47612 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 47647 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 44390 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/02/1963 | 44386 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 44390 | Transfer in from: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 45364 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 47406 | Transfer out to: | 27A | Bank Hall | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 47647 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 44439 | Transfer out to: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 46410 | Transfer in from: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 46433 | Transfer out to: | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 43004 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1963 | 44292 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1963 | 44027 | Transfer in from: | 3A | Bescot | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 47279 | Transfer in from: | 15A | Wellingborough | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 44390 | Transfer out to: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 44390 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 16/11/1963 | 46410 | Transfer out to: | 8D | Widnes | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 43908 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 47344 | Transfer out to: | 10F | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 44346 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 44348 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 43963 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 44549 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1964 | 44348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 44377 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 44461 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 05/09/1964 | 47390 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 44061 | Transfer in from: | 24G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44484 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 44390 | Transfer out to: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 43964 | Transfer in from: | 16D | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 14/11/1964 | 43908 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 44027 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1964 | 43963 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 44484 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 43950 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 43953 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44035 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 44377 | Transfer out to: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 44192 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 44489 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 44160 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 16/01/1965 | 43950 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/01/1965 | 44358 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 44065 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/01/1965 | 44358 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 44356 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/02/1965 | 44536 | Transfer in from: | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 44462 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 44597 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 44192 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 47361 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 44310 | Transfer in from: | 10G | Skipton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 44061 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 46488 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 43017 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 43073 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 43122 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 46424 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 46485 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/08/1965 | 44449 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 44390 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/08/1965 | 47676 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 47531 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 44489 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 44536 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1965 | 44597 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 04/09/1965 | 46452 | Transfer in from: | 9D | Newton Heath | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 11/09/1965 | 43964 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/09/1965 | 44505 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 43010 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 43036 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 43045 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 18/09/1965 | 43025 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/09/1965 | 43011 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/10/1965 | 44451 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1965 | 43953 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 06/11/1965 | 44346 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 44356 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 44390 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 44462 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/12/1965 | 47279 | Transfer out to: | 8L | Aintree | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 44160 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/12/1965 | 44451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 44310 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 46432 | Transfer out to: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 07/05/1966 | 43036 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1966 | 43047 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 46485 | Transfer out to: | 9L | Buxton (LNWR) | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 03/09/1966 | 43045 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | D2511 | Transfer in from: | 12E | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 19/11/1966 | D3202 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 47531 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 10/12/1966 | 46424 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 44691 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 17/12/1966 | 45294 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/12/1966 | 47373 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/12/1966 | 47612 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 45371 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | 12086 | Transfer in from: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/01/1967 | D3202 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | 43011 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 43118 | Transfer in from: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 18/03/1967 | 43122 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 43023 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 43027 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 01/04/1967 | 44691 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 12079 | Transfer in from: | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 44715 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 44759 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | D3580 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/04/1967 | 45371 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1967 | D2514 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1967 | 44829 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 46452 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 46491 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 43028 | Transfer in from: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D2117 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D2511 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Diesel | D2/12 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/06/1967 | D2514 | Transfer out to: | 12C | Barrow in Furness | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 12/08/1967 | 43002 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 19/08/1967 | 43073 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 23/09/1967 | 44759 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1967 | 43028 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 18/11/1967 | 43118 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 02/12/1967 | 43017 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | 43002 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | 43010 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | 43023 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | on | 30/12/1967 | 43047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 12079 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 12086 | Transfer out to: | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | D2117 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 43006 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 43027 | Transfer out to: | 10D | Lostock Hall | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 44715 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 44829 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 06/01/1968 | 45294 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton |