Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1093 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 7776 Week
» 18822 Month
» 18822 Year
» 1684198 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Bletchley


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 23/02/1935 2956 Transfer in from:        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 20/04/1935 2956 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 13/12/1947 2957 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 20/12/1947 2949 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2442 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2458 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2566 Snapshot        
Steam Prince of Wales 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 25722 Snapshot        
Steam Prince of Wales 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 25827 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2591 Snapshot        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 01/01/1948 2600 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 3841 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4072 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4438 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4447 Snapshot        
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4549 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 4968 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5025 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5130 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5314 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5316 Snapshot        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 on 01/01/1948 5331 Snapshot        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T on 01/01/1948 6604 Snapshot        
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 6909 Snapshot        
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T on 01/01/1948 6912 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7288 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7298 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7452 Snapshot        
Steam 3F 0-6-0T on 01/01/1948 7521 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8894 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8902 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8913 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8925 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8931 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8935 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8951 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 8952 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9005 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9007 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9037 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9076 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9093 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9100 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9117 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9127 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9154 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9173 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9179 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9193 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9201 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9208 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9213 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9237 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9300 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9307 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9332 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9359 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9371 Snapshot        
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9372 Snapshot        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9391 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9401 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9406 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9416 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9427 Snapshot        
Steam G2 0-8-0 on 01/01/1948 9443 Snapshot        
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 06/03/1948 2949 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 6P5F 2-6-0 w/e 06/03/1948 2957 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam Prince of Wales 4-6-0 on 06/03/1948 25722 Condemned      
Steam Prince of Wales 4-6-0 on 06/03/1948 25827 Condemned      
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T on 27/03/1948 6909 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 19/06/1948 9201 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 08/1948 8913 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 11/1948 9127 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 5025 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam G1 0-8-0 3w/e 11/12/1948 9359 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam G1 0-8-0 on 18/12/1948 9179 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 01/1949 48894 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 02/1949 48935 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 04/1949 49372 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 06/1949 48931 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 5w/e 16/07/1949 49332 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 17/09/1949 48925 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 48964 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 5w/e 24/12/1949 9070 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 31/12/1949 49237 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 3w/e 14/01/1950 9049 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 05/1950 49076 Condemned      
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 05/1950 49100 Condemned      
Steam 2P 4-4-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 40438 Transfer in from: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 48016 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 48020 Transfer in from: 2D Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 48036 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 49181 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam N5 0-6-2T 2w/e 17/06/1950 69304 Transfer in from: TFD Trafford Park (LNER)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 2w/e 17/06/1950 45331 Transfer out to: 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 09/09/1950 48207 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 30/09/1950 49307 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T m/e 10/1950 41275 1st Allocation        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 45353 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48373 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48535 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48549 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48550 Transfer in from: 2C Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48688 Transfer in from: 4A Shrewsbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48693 Transfer in from: 2C Northampton    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48964 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 4w/e 07/10/1950 58911 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 48964 Transfer out to: 4A Bletchley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 07/10/1950 49173 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 58887 Transfer in from:        
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 04/11/1950 49401 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 4w/e 04/11/1950 58911 Transfer out to: 7D Rhyl    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 44712 Transfer in from:        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 02/12/1950 48036 Transfer out to: 26A Newton Heath    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/12/1950 42378 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 31/12/1950 44712 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Diesel HAWK Bo-Bo m/e 1951 10800 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 27/01/1951 42582 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 27/01/1951 42667 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 48754 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 48756 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 44438 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 27/01/1951 49406 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 02/1951 49208 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/02/1951 42155 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 48953 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49086 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/02/1951 49391 Transfer out to: 10B Preston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1951 42584 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/03/1951 42378 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 24/03/1951 9007 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 19/05/1951 6683 Transfer in from: 2E Warwick    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 48964 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 19/05/1951 49118 Transfer out to: 3A Bescot    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 48544 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Canal    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 16/06/1951 48756 Transfer out to: 12B Carlisle Canal    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 44364 Transfer in from: 11A Carnforth    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 9385 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 17/07/1951 49093 Transfer out to: 8B Warrington Dallam    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 17/07/1951 6683 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 09/1951 49213 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 08/09/1951 44593 Transfer in from: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 4w/e 08/09/1951 58908 Transfer in from: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 48898 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 49310 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 49077 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 49371 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 06/10/1951 9385 Transfer out to: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G1 0-8-0 m/e 11/1951 49193 Condemned      
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T w/e 10/11/1951 58908 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 24/11/1951 49300 Condemned      
Steam 18" Passenger Tank 0-6-2T w/e 08/12/1951 46912 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1951 42061 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1951 42062 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1951 45135 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 4w/e 26/01/1952 58932 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 45130 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1952 48373 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T 4w/e 19/04/1952 58932 Transfer out to: 3E Monument Lane    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 45070 Transfer in from: 3D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 14/06/1952 45071 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 18/06/1952 80039 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 27/06/1952 80040 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 05/07/1952 80041 1st Allocation        
Steam G1 0-8-0 4w/e 12/07/1952 48902 Transfer out to: 3D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 15/07/1952 80042 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 24/07/1952 80043 1st Allocation        
Diesel HAWK Bo-Bo m/e 08/1952 10800 Transfer out to: 75C Norwood Junction    
Steam 2P 4-4-0 4w/e 09/08/1952 40438 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1952 42061 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1952 42566 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 09/08/1952 42584 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1952 42061 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1952 42600 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 06/09/1952 42667 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 49086 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 04/10/1952 49416 Transfer out to: 3B Bushbury    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 8w/e 29/11/1952 44549 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 5w/e 03/01/1953 49070 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/04/1953 41275 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 16/05/1953 41275 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 15/06/1953 75030 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 16/06/1953 75031 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 30/06/1953 75032 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 07/1953 75034 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 03/07/1953 75033 1st Allocation        
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 8w/e 11/07/1953 46601 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 8w/e 11/07/1953 41275 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45070 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 11/07/1953 45316 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 8w/e 11/07/1953 46604 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 45135 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 08/08/1953 45353 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 13/08/1953 75035 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 14/08/1953 75036 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 14/08/1953 75037 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 25/08/1953 75038 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 27/08/1953 75039 1st Allocation        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 05/09/1953 45071 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 48426 Transfer in from: 2C Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 48441 Transfer in from: 25C Goole    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 48534 Transfer in from: 18B Westhouses    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 03/10/1953 45314 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 31/10/1953 41275 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 31/10/1953 42591 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 4w/e 31/10/1953 46601 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 48426 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 48441 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 31/10/1953 48534 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/01/1954 42580 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 02/01/1954 80039 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 44072 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 30/01/1954 42442 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/01/1954 44072 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 27/02/1954 42178 Transfer in from: 24C Lostock Hall    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 27/03/1954 47500 Transfer in from: 13B Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 31/03/1954 80081 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 15/04/1954 80082 1st Allocation        
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42580 Transfer out to: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 24/04/1954 42582 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 03/05/1954 80083 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 14/05/1954 80084 1st Allocation        
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T on 28/05/1954 80085 1st Allocation        
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 12/06/1954 44968 Transfer out to: 65A Eastfield    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 19/06/1954 42061 Transfer out to: 11B Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 19/06/1954 42155 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 19/06/1954 42178 Transfer out to: 6H Bangor    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 8w/e 19/06/1954 75030 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 14/08/1954 13051 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 m/e 14/08/1954 13052 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/09/1954 47288 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/09/1954 47298 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/09/1954 47452 Transfer out to: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/01/1955 42541 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/01/1955 42597 Transfer in from: 8E Brunswick    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/01/1955 42669 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/01/1955 80083 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/01/1955 80085 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 45004 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 45020 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 45195 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 45307 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 45331 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 45388 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 45393 Transfer in from: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 80039 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 80083 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 80085 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 42062 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 42541 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 42597 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/02/1955 42669 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 75031 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 75032 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 75033 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 75034 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 75035 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 26/02/1955 75039 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam N5 0-6-2T w/e 12/03/1955 69304 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 26/03/1955 42669 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam Coal Tank 0-6-2T w/e 09/04/1955 58887 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 23/04/1955 48446 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 2F 0-6-0T 4w/e 21/05/1955 58854 Transfer in from: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 16/07/1955 42487 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 12050 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 12053 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 49005 Transfer in from: 2B Bletchley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 13051 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 13052 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 49005 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 13/08/1955 49049 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 05/11/1955 48535 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 48535 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 03/12/1955 48693 Transfer out to: 9F Heaton Mersey    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 49330 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 12050 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 4w/e 28/01/1956 12053 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 4w/e 21/04/1956 41902 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 11/08/1956 49094 Transfer in from: 10C Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 84002 Transfer in from: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 4w/e 11/08/1956 84004 Transfer in from: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 2F 0-6-0T 4w/e 11/08/1956 58854 Transfer out to: 1D Devons Road (Bow)    
Steam 2P 0-4-4T 4w/e 08/09/1956 41902 Transfer out to: 2C Warwick    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 m/e 20/12/1956 75052 1st Allocation        
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 49061 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 4w/e 29/12/1956 75030 Transfer in from: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1956 42487 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 4w/e 29/12/1956 42669 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 23/02/1957 49330 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/03/1957 41324 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 23/03/1957 41275 Transfer out to: 1C Watford    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 20/04/1957 49330 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41275 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 4w/e 18/05/1957 41324 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 4w/e 18/05/1957 48952 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 10/08/1957 45307 Transfer out to: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 10/08/1957 80040 Transfer out to: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 10/08/1957 49005 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 31/08/1957 48951 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 45307 Transfer in from: 3C Ryecroft (Walsall)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 07/09/1957 45195 Transfer out to: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 45195 Transfer in from: 12A Carlisle Upperby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 8w/e 05/10/1957 49093 Transfer in from: 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 8w/e 05/10/1957 42458 Transfer out to: 10C Patricroft    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 44370 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 48610 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 30/11/1957 44364 Transfer out to: 6E Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 44397 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 4w/e 25/01/1958 44593 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 22/02/1958 49450 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam G2 0-8-0 4w/e 22/03/1958 49403 Transfer in from: 86G Pontypool Road    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 14/06/1958 45004 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 45089 Transfer in from: 6J Holyhead    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 4w/e 04/10/1958 45184 Transfer in from: 26F Patricroft    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 4w/e 04/10/1958 80083 Transfer out to: 14D Neasden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 08/11/1958 44364 Transfer in from: 84K Wrexham Rhosddu    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 44364 Transfer in from: 1E Bletchley    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 31/01/1959 44364 Transfer out to: 1E Bletchley    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/02/1959 45307 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 28/02/1959 42467 Transfer in from: 12B Carlisle Upperby    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 on 07/03/1959 49330 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 04/04/1959 49181 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 48074 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 20/06/1959 48764 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/07/1959 45195 Transfer out to: 26F Patricroft    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/08/1959 48074 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 22/08/1959 48535 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/09/1959 42467 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 26/09/1959 47500 Transfer out to: Wolverton Works    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 07/11/1959 47348 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 45184 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 48754 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 48764 Transfer out to: 8E Northwich    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 75030 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 07/11/1959 75052 Transfer out to: 6D Chester Northgate    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80081 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T w/e 07/11/1959 80084 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 07/11/1959 49427 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 14/11/1959 49450 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44117 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 on 28/11/1959 43841 Condemned      
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 28/11/1959 44072 Condemned      
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42066 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42067 Transfer in from: 75A Brighton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42069 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42071 Transfer in from: 75E Three Bridges    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42105 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 05/12/1959 42106 Transfer in from: 75F Tunbridge Wells West    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80039 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80041 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80042 Transfer out to: 73F Ashford    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80043 Transfer out to: 73H Dover Marine    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80082 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 5w/e 31/12/1959 80085 Transfer out to: 73B Bricklayers Arms    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 27/02/1960 44308 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 23/04/1960 47500 Transfer in from: Wolverton Works    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 30/04/1960 47348 Transfer out to: Wolverton Works    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 21/05/1960 44308 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/06/1960 42069 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 18/06/1960 44117 Transfer out to: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45222 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 17/09/1960 45292 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/09/1960 48646 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 17/09/1960 49131 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 17/09/1960 49439 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 01/10/1960 45292 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 45020 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 45222 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 05/11/1960 45388 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 12/11/1960 49037 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 12/11/1960 49439 Transfer out to: 2B Nuneaton    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 12073 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 03/12/1960 12074 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 24/12/1960 45292 Transfer in from: 21D Aston    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/01/1961 42351 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 07/01/1961 42586 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/01/1961 45020 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 28/01/1961 49079 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 01/04/1961 41289 Transfer in from: 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 08/04/1961 45020 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 22/04/1961 49079 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/05/1961 44780 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/05/1961 45037 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 06/05/1961 45379 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 13/05/1961 48657 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 03/06/1961 49131 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/06/1961 48203 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/06/1961 48427 Transfer in from: 4B Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/06/1961 48656 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/06/1961 48668 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 44780 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/06/1961 75036 Transfer out to: 6G Llandudno Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/06/1961 48529 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 24/06/1961 42351 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/07/1961 48534 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/07/1961 42067 Transfer out to: 12C Carlisle Canal    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 09/09/1961 45020 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42454 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42479 Transfer in from: 17F Trafford Park (LMS)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 16/09/1961 42615 Transfer in from: 6H Bangor    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/09/1961 48408 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 30/09/1961 41275 Transfer out to: 91W To Western Region / GWR    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T on 07/10/1961 42479 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 07/10/1961 48953 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 07/10/1961 49061 Condemned      
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 07/10/1961 49443 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 14/10/1961 49310 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 04/11/1961 45147 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 11/11/1961 48529 Transfer out to: 8D Widnes    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 18/11/1961 49246 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2 0-8-0 w/e 02/12/1961 49403 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1962 48529 Transfer in from: 8D Widnes    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 06/01/1962 48529 Transfer out to: 21B Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 13/01/1962 49246 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 27/01/1962 49079 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam G1 0-8-0 w/e 27/01/1962 49107 Transfer in from: 3A Bescot    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 03/02/1962 48898 Transfer out to: 9D Buxton (LNWR)    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/03/1962 75039 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/03/1962 42066 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 10/03/1962 42071 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 31/03/1962 44397 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 75013 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 75014 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 75028 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 75053 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 05/05/1962 75054 Transfer in from: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 44364 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 44370 Transfer out to: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4F 0-6-0 w/e 12/05/1962 44447 Transfer out to: 12E Barrow in Furness    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 09/06/1962 42454 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 16/06/1962 48360 Transfer in from: 2E Northampton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42221 Transfer in from: 33C Shoeburyness    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 48626 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 48729 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 23/06/1962 48755 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 23/06/1962 75051 Transfer in from: 6A Chester (MR)    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 23/06/1962 42615 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/07/1962 45222 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 04/08/1962 48154 Transfer in from: 2B Nuneaton    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 11/08/1962 42221 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 18/08/1962 42227 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 20/10/1962 42227 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 45020 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/11/1962 45037 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 49079 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 49093 Condemned      
Steam G2A 0-8-0 w/e 01/12/1962 49094 Condemned      
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 08/12/1962 41289 Transfer out to:        
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 48154 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/12/1962 48446 Transfer out to: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 15/12/1962 48085 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 22/12/1962 41289 Reinstated        
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 75037 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 22/12/1962 75053 Transfer out to: 21D Aston    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 19/01/1963 48077 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T w/e 19/01/1963 41289 Condemned      
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45064 Transfer in from: 21B Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 26/01/1963 45299 Transfer in from: 5B Crewe South    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T w/e 20/04/1963 84004 Transfer out to: 89D Oswestry    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/05/1963 47341 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 11/05/1963 47606 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/05/1963 47307 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 18/05/1963 47341 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75055 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75056 Transfer in from: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75039 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 25/05/1963 75051 Transfer out to: 17A Derby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1963 D3796 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/08/1963 48366 Transfer in from: 5C Stafford    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/08/1963 48368 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/08/1963 48493 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 17/08/1963 48554 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/09/1963 45434 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/09/1963 48016 Transfer out to: 1H Northampton    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75014 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 21/09/1963 75056 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 28/09/1963 48020 Transfer out to: 6C Croes Newydd    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/10/1963 48085 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 05/10/1963 48646 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/10/1963 48368 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/10/1963 48729 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 12/10/1963 48755 Transfer out to: 1F Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 22/02/1964 42586 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73004 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73013 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73014 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73033 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73038 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73039 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73040 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73048 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73067 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 73070 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45147 Transfer out to: 5C Stafford    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45292 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45299 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45331 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 07/03/1964 45379 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/03/1964 45064 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/03/1964 45089 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/03/1964 45222 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/03/1964 45393 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 14/03/1964 45434 Transfer out to: 5B Crewe South    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 14/03/1964 48366 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 25/04/1964 73160 Transfer in from: 55E Normanton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 20/06/1964 73070 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 m/e 09/1964 48657 Condemned      
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/09/1964 75055 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 75055 Transfer in from: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 10/10/1964 75038 Transfer out to: 6D Shrewsbury    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 07/11/1964 48668 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 43017 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 28/11/1964 43122 Transfer in from: 21A Saltley    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 12/12/1964 D4111 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1964 42105 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 4P 2-6-4T w/e 12/12/1964 42106 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 19/12/1964 D2510 Transfer in from: 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 73004 Transfer out to: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 73039 Transfer out to: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 73040 Transfer out to: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 09/01/1965 73048 Transfer out to: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 44837 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 44863 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 44870 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 44909 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 44915 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 44938 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 73013 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 73014 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 73033 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 73038 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 73067 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 5 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 73160 Transfer out to: 2B Oxley    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 16/01/1965 75054 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 23/01/1965 43073 Transfer in from: 5D Stoke    
Diesel 09 0-6-0 w/e 13/02/1965 D4111 Transfer out to: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 27/02/1965 45027 Transfer in from: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 27/02/1965 48757 Transfer in from: 1G Woodford Halse    
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T on 17/04/1965 84002 Condemned      
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 48203 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 48544 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 48554 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 08/05/1965 48757 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 D3069 Transfer in from: 1C Watford    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 75013 Transfer out to: 6F Machynlleth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 75028 Transfer out to: 6F Machynlleth    
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 w/e 19/06/1965 75055 Transfer out to: 6F Machynlleth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 19/06/1965 47606 Condemned      
Steam 3F 0-6-0T m/e 07/1965 47500 Condemned      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/07/1965 D320 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/07/1965 D323 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/07/1965 D331 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/07/1965 D334 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/07/1965 D337 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/07/1965 D5002 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/07/1965 D5003 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/07/1965 D5005 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/07/1965 D5010 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/07/1965 D5011 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 03/07/1965 48360 Condemned      
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 43017 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 43073 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam 4MT 2-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 43122 Transfer out to: 12D Workington    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44837 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44863 Transfer out to: 8A Edge Hill    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44870 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44909 Transfer out to: 10F Rose Grove    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44915 Transfer out to: 10D Lostock Hall    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 44938 Transfer out to: 9D Newton Heath    
Steam Black Five 4-6-0 w/e 10/07/1965 45027 Transfer out to: 10A Carnforth    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/07/1965 47307 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 3F 0-6-0T w/e 10/07/1965 47521 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48077 Transfer out to: 10J Lancaster Green Ayre    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48207 Transfer out to: 5D Stoke    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48408 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48427 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48493 Transfer out to: 8C Speke Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48534 Transfer out to: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48549 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48550 Transfer out to: 1H Northampton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48610 Transfer out to: 5E Nuneaton    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48626 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48656 Transfer out to: 6B Mold Junction    
Steam 8F 2-8-0 w/e 10/07/1965 48688 Transfer out to: 1H Northampton    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D309 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D312 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D315 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D318 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D322 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D324 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D329 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D339 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D340 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D343 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D344 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 02/10/1965 D384 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 02/10/1965 D5000 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 16/10/1965 D2510 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 16/10/1965 D315 Transfer out to: 2F Bescot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/10/1965 D3795 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5007 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5009 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5016 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5018 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5019 Transfer in from: 1B Camden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5025 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5032 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5040 Transfer in from: 32B Ipswich    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 03/01/1966 D5140 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/01/1966 D309 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/01/1966 D312 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/01/1966 D318 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/01/1966 D320 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/01/1966 D322 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 w/e 03/01/1966 D323 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/01/1966 D5028 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/01/1966 D5030 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/01/1966 D5033 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 08/01/1966 D5034 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 19/03/1966 D2510 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 19/03/1966 D3795 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 26/03/1966 D5133 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe North    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 26/03/1966 D5002 Transfer out to: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 26/03/1966 D5018 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 16/04/1966 D5011 Transfer out to: D01      
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D324 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D329 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D331 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D334 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D337 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D339 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D340 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D343 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D344 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 40 1Co-Co1 on 18/04/1966 D384 Transfer out to: WL Western Lines (LMR)    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5000 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5003 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5005 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5007 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5009 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5010 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5016 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5019 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5025 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5028 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5030 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5032 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5033 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5034 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5133 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo on 18/04/1966 D5140 Transfer out to: D01 London Division    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 28/05/1966 D3976 Transfer in from: 2C Stourbridge Junction    
Diesel D2/12 0-6-0 w/e 01/10/1966 D2510 Transfer out to: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 24 Bo-Bo w/e 12/08/1967 D5040 Transfer out to: D05 Stoke Division    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 09/03/1968 D3852 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 D3023 Transfer in from: 2F Bescot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/05/1968 D3024 Transfer in from: 2F Bescot    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2301 Transfer in from: Wolverton Works    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2383 Transfer in from: Wolverton Works    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D2385 Transfer in from: Wolverton Works    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 D3228 Transfer in from: Wolverton Works    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 12073 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1968 12074 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/06/1968 D3852 Transfer out to: 16A Toton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1968 D3054 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1968 D2383 Transfer out to: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel 03 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1968 D2385 Transfer out to: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 04 0-6-0 on 21/09/1968 D2301 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 12045 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 12046 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 12049 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 12088 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 12090 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 12099 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 D3053 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 D3055 Transfer in from: 2A Rugby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 D3066 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 D3797 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1969 D3859 Transfer in from: 1F Rugby    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 25/01/1969 12045 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 25/01/1969 12046 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 31/05/1969 D3795 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 w/e 29/11/1969 12088 Transfer out to: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1970 D3015 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1970 D3850 Transfer in from: 14B Cricklewood West    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 23/05/1970 D3795 Transfer out to: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/05/1971 D3110 Transfer in from: 2A Tyseley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 17/07/1971 D3018 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 17/07/1971 12090 Condemned      
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 17/07/1971 12099 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 21/08/1971 D3188 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 11 0-6-0 on 03/10/1971 12049 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/11/1971 D3107 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/01/1972 D3699 Transfer in from: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/01/1972 D3107 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/03/1972 D3069 Transfer out to: 30A Stratford    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 06/05/1972 D3179 Transfer in from: 14A Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/05/1972 D4139 Transfer in from: 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 01/07/1972 D4098 Transfer in from: 65A Eastfield    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 08/07/1972 D3797 Transfer out to: 82A Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/07/1972 D3015 Transfer out to: 41A Tinsley    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 02/09/1972 D3572 Transfer in from: 14B Cricklewood West    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 02/09/1972 D3976 Transfer out to: 81D Reading (W.R.)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/09/1972 D3850 Transfer out to: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 07/10/1972 D3024 Transfer out to: 9A Longsight    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 10/02/1973 D3107 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/05/1973 D3699 Transfer out to: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/06/1973 08040 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 16/06/1973 D3067 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/08/1973 D3067 Transfer out to: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 15/09/1973 D4098 Transfer out to: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 20/10/1973 D3936 Transfer in from: 1A Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 17/11/1973 D3833 Transfer in from: 8H Birkenhead Mollington Street    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 22/12/1973 D3023 Transfer out to: TO Toton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1974 08627 Transfer in from: 8J Allerton    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 12/01/1974 D3291 Transfer in from: 5A Crewe Diesel    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 26/01/1974 08627 Transfer out to: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/05/1974 D3699 Transfer in from: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/05/1974 D4139 Transfer out to: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 18/05/1974 D3066 Transfer out to: LA Laira    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/07/1974 08684 Transfer in from: CW Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/07/1974 08702 Transfer in from: CD Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/07/1974 08535 Transfer out to: CW Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 13/07/1974 08768 Transfer out to: CW Cricklewood East    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 27/07/1974 08113 Transfer out to: BR Bristol Bath Road    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 03/08/1974 08042 Transfer out to: YK York (North)    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 2w/e 24/08/1974 08667 Transfer in from: WN Willesden    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 11/01/1975 08692 Transfer out to: LR Leicester Midland    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 w/e 04/12/1976 08041 Transfer out to: BS Bescot    
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 02/11/1980 08082 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/03/1981 08221 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 10/06/1984 08121 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 01/09/1985 08457 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 24/12/1985 08160 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 23/03/1986 08085 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 07/12/1986 08684 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 13/12/1991 08011 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 11/11/1992 08667 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 16/01/1995 08666 Condemned      
Diesel 08 0-6-0 on 28/02/2004 08702 Condemned