Depot: Blyth (South)
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 1855 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | H | 12/1935 | 1939 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/11/1939 | 1211 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5063 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5069 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5123 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5808 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5810 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5829 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7244 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7261 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7285 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7295 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7320 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7326 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7334 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7341 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7347 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/02/1948 | 5063 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5029 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/04/1948 | 5069 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5099 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 68400 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | on | 10/1948 | 68400 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 5026 | Transfer in from: | TWD | Tweedmouth | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 5122 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 5781 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 5029 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 20/11/1948 | 8431 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 04/12/1948 | 8428 | Transfer in from: | BLA | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 65123 | Transfer out to: | AUK | West Auckland | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 65026 | Transfer out to: | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 23/07/1949 | 67246 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 65824 | Transfer in from: | HTN | Heaton | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 65122 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Neville Hill | ||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/04/1950 | 65099 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 31/05/1950 | 67320 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 06/1950 | 67285 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 67244 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/10/1951 | 65844 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 68428 | Transfer out to: | 52B | Heaton | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | on | 08/03/1954 | 67295 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 67261 | Transfer out to: | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 4w/e | 14/05/1955 | 67341 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 67334 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 67347 | Transfer out to: | 54A | Sunderland | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 67246 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 67326 | Transfer out to: | 52C | Blaydon | ||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 68431 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1959 | 65829 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/10/1959 | 65781 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1959 | 65824 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/01/1961 | D2310 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/04/1961 | 77011 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 77014 | Transfer in from: | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1961 | D2310 | Transfer out to: | 52G | Sunderland | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | on | 21/10/1962 | 77011 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1962 | 77014 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 62002 | Transfer in from: | 52K | Consett | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 62060 | Transfer in from: | 52K | Consett | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 08/09/1963 | 62060 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/12/1963 | 65810 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J27 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1965 | 65808 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 77012 | Transfer in from: | 50D | Goole | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1966 | 77012 | Transfer out to: | 50A | York (North) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 19/06/1966 | 62011 | Transfer in from: | 52d | Alnmouth | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/10/1966 | 62002 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) | ||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 23/10/1966 | 62011 | Transfer out to: | 52F | Blyth (North) |