Depot: Sheffield Neepsend
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 11/1903 | 70 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | m/e | 09/1909 | 213 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1910 | 694 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1910 | 695 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1910 | 696 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1910 | 697 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1910 | 698 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1910 | 699 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 08/1912 | 1205 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1912 | 1246 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 12/1912 | 1247 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1914 | 385 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/03/1916 | 382 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/08/1916 | 381 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/12/1916 | 399 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/11/1920 | 383 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 694 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 695 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 696 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 697 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 698 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | D5 | 4-4-0 | by | 1921 | 699 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/02/1921 | 14 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/03/1921 | 17 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1921 | 19 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/04/1921 | 22 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/02/1922 | 465 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/02/1922 | 466 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/04/1922 | 1104 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1922 | 102 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1922 | 1101 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/05/1922 | 1103 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/10/1922 | 1098 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/10/1922 | 1097 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/12/1922 | 1095 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/12/1922 | 1096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/12/1922 | 1100 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | m/e | 05/1923 | 364 | Transfer in from: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | m/e | 06/1923 | 1420 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | m/e | 06/1923 | 1434 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | m/e | 06/1923 | 1449 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1923 | 102 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1923 | 1101 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1923 | 1104 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/06/1923 | 1100 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/06/1923 | 1433 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 23/12/1923 | 1428 | Transfer in from: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1924 | 1095 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1924 | 1097 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1924 | 1098 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/02/1924 | 1259 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/02/1924 | 6359 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/02/1924 | 6266 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/02/1924 | 6263 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1924 | 1247 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/03/1924 | 6275 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1924 | 17 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1924 | 19 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/03/1924 | 6377 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/03/1924 | 6265 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/03/1924 | 6358 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/03/1924 | 381 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/03/1924 | 6281 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/03/1924 | 382 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 13/03/1924 | 399 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1924 | 6254 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/03/1924 | 6279 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1924 | 6261 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/03/1924 | 6363 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1924 | 6317 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1924 | 6357 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/03/1924 | 6308 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/03/1924 | 14 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O5 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/03/1924 | 22 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/03/1924 | 6324 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/03/1924 | 1246 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/03/1924 | 383 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1924 | 6360 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/03/1924 | 385 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/04/1924 | 34 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1924 | 471 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1924 | 5470 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/05/1924 | 5070 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1924 | 5472 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/05/1924 | 34 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/05/1924 | 6256 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/05/1924 | 6361 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/05/1924 | 6374 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/05/1924 | 6258 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1924 | 5465 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1924 | 5465 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/06/1924 | 5470 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/06/1924 | 6295 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/07/1924 | 6335 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/07/1924 | 6371 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/07/1924 | 6349 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/07/1924 | 471 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 12/08/1924 | 6104 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/10/1924 | 6316 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/11/1924 | 6359 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1924 | 6360 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/12/1924 | 6254 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/12/1924 | 5472 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1925 | 102 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1925 | 6099 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/01/1925 | 6374 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/01/1925 | 6377 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1925 | 6263 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/01/1925 | 6371 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/01/1925 | 6324 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/01/1925 | 6361 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1925 | 6363 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1925 | 6266 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/02/1925 | 6279 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/02/1925 | 6308 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1925 | 6349 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1925 | 6357 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/02/1925 | 6358 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/04/1925 | 3295 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 27/04/1925 | 4412 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/04/1925 | 6102 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 27/05/1925 | 3287 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1925 | 6103 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1925 | 6104 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/05/1925 | 6096 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | B4 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1925 | 6099 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 04/06/1925 | 3277 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 25/08/1925 | 3272 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 31/08/1925 | 4433 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 05/09/1925 | 5416 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1925 | 5466 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/11/1925 | 6513 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1926 | 378 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/01/1926 | 6261 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1926 | 5052 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1926 | 5465 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/03/1926 | 6529 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/03/1926 | 6532 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/03/1926 | 6503 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/03/1926 | 6516 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 06/04/1926 | 6514 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 15/06/1926 | 3280 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/08/1926 | 6358 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1926 | 6272 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/08/1926 | 6357 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/10/1926 | 5049 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/10/1926 | 5064 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/10/1926 | 5146 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/10/1926 | 5149 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/10/1926 | 5159 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/12/1926 | 5149 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 07/12/1926 | 5159 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/12/1926 | 6506 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/12/1926 | 5146 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/12/1926 | 5049 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/12/1926 | 6297 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 15/12/1926 | 5064 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/12/1926 | 5966 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/01/1927 | 4433 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 14/01/1927 | 4451 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 21/01/1927 | 5213 | Transfer out to: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/02/1927 | 5053 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/03/1927 | 3287 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/04/1927 | 5416 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/05/1927 | 5416 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/07/1927 | 1911 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/08/1927 | 6602 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1928 | 6272 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1928 | 6506 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 1928 | 6532 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 21/01/1928 | 1921 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1928 | 5052 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/02/1928 | 2896 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/02/1928 | 5033 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1928 | 5032 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1928 | 5053 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1928 | 5416 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1928 | 6513 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/12/1928 | 3276 | Transfer in from: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 02/03/1929 | 5065 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/03/1929 | 6295 | Transfer out to: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 16/03/1929 | 5065 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 06/05/1929 | 5033 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/05/1929 | 5483 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 09/05/1929 | 5056 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 03/06/1929 | 5056 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1929 | 5033 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 29/06/1929 | 5071 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 29/06/1929 | 5032 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/07/1929 | 3287 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/07/1929 | 5484 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/07/1929 | 6590 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/09/1929 | 6638 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 02/10/1929 | 5272 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 06/10/1929 | 5272 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/11/1929 | 2782 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/11/1929 | 2783 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/11/1929 | 5427 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 30/11/1929 | 3272 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1929 | 2784 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/12/1929 | 2785 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/01/1930 | 6297 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/01/1930 | 5070 | Transfer in from: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 08/01/1930 | 5071 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/01/1930 | 5423 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 31/01/1930 | 3295 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 25/02/1930 | 5070 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1930 | 5480 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1930 | 5484 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1930 | 5426 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1930 | 5423 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/11/1930 | 5427 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1930 | 5423 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1930 | 6244 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/12/1930 | 6245 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/12/1930 | 6244 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/12/1930 | 6245 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/02/1931 | 6203 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 10/04/1931 | 5062 | Transfer in from: | KEA | Keadby | ||
Steam | Q4 | 0-8-0 | on | 20/06/1931 | 5062 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/08/1931 | 5424 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1932 | 6503 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C5 | 4-4-2 | on | 28/01/1932 | 5364 | Transfer out to: | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/02/1932 | 2973 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/02/1932 | 2974 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/05/1932 | 4433 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 03/08/1932 | 3280 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 19/09/1932 | 3277 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/11/1932 | 3276 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/11/1932 | 3276 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1933 | 5427 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1933 | 5426 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/06/1933 | 5424 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1933 | 5427 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1933 | 5423 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/01/1934 | 6599 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1934 | 6230 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/01/1934 | 6638 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/01/1934 | 6236 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1934 | 6229 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/01/1934 | 6234 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/01/1934 | 6235 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1934 | 6281 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/01/1934 | 6602 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1934 | 6244 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/02/1934 | 6335 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/02/1934 | 3273 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/02/1934 | 6232 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/02/1934 | 6603 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/02/1934 | 6529 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/02/1934 | 6233 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 24/02/1934 | 6589 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 26/02/1934 | 4451 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/03/1934 | 2785 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 20/03/1934 | 6590 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/03/1934 | 6245 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/04/1934 | 2974 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/05/1934 | 2973 | Transfer out to: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/05/1934 | 5052 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1934 | 5416 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/06/1934 | 5053 | Transfer in from: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/08/1934 | 3299 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1934 | 1277 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/12/1934 | 1277 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 6357 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 01/01/1935 | 6358 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/02/1935 | 5428 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1935 | 5425 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/02/1935 | 5426 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1935 | 2947 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/08/1935 | 2948 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 5209 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 5821 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1935 | 6589 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/11/1935 | 6230 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 15/11/1935 | 6067 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 6017 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/02/1936 | 5182 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/03/1936 | 6068 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1936 | 5186 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1936 | 1277 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/04/1936 | 2783 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 30/05/1936 | 6069 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/06/1936 | 2784 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1936 | 5183 | Transfer in from: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/07/1936 | 2783 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1936 | 2784 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/09/1936 | 1277 | Transfer out to: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/09/1936 | 3000 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1936 | 2999 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 23/02/1937 | 4449 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/03/1937 | 4434 | Transfer out to: | HIT | Hitchin (GNR) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 13/03/1937 | 3273 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 16/08/1937 | 3273 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 17/08/1937 | 4454 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 09/10/1937 | 3273 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 12/10/1937 | 4454 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1937 | 5034 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 16/12/1937 | 5340 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/12/1937 | 2782 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 08/01/1938 | 5471 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 15/01/1938 | 5340 | Transfer out to: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 06/02/1938 | 3273 | Transfer in from: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 07/03/1938 | 5481 | Transfer in from: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 14/04/1938 | 5462 | Transfer in from: | NEA | Neasden | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/05/1938 | 1927 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/05/1938 | 2986 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/05/1938 | 1930 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/06/1938 | 3299 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/06/1938 | 2783 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/07/1938 | 2782 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/07/1938 | 6589 | Transfer out to: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/08/1938 | 4428 | Transfer out to: | COP | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1938 | 2783 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/09/1938 | 1942 | Transfer in from: | CAR | Carlisle Canal | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 22/11/1938 | 6523 | Transfer in from: | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/03/1939 | 6523 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 17/03/1939 | 5034 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1939 | 1270 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 09/06/1939 | 6516 | Transfer out to: | FRO | Frodingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/07/1939 | 5426 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 23/07/1939 | 5428 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1939 | 5425 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 06/08/1939 | 3298 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 06/08/1939 | 3276 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 27/09/1939 | 6244 | Transfer out to: | GRA | Grantham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 05/10/1939 | 6275 | Transfer out to: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 02/12/1939 | 6275 | Transfer in from: | LNG | Langwith Junction | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1940 | 1927 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/02/1940 | 1930 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/03/1940 | 4828 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 01/03/1940 | 4860 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 30/03/1940 | 4452 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 01/04/1940 | 4425 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 31/08/1940 | 6514 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1940 | 5378 | Transfer out to: | YK | York (North) | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6205 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6232 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6236 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6245 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6258 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6265 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6275 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6205 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6232 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6236 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6245 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6258 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6265 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/11/1940 | 6275 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/02/1941 | 4820 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/02/1941 | 4852 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/02/1941 | 5483 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1941 | 3081 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1941 | 3082 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1941 | 3083 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1941 | 3084 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1941 | 3086 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/04/1941 | 1270 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 07/04/1941 | 5966 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/04/1941 | 6203 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 17/04/1941 | 6229 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/04/1941 | 6232 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/04/1941 | 6236 | Transfer in from: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/04/1941 | 6232 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/04/1941 | 6236 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 19/09/1941 | 747 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 04/10/1941 | 773 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/10/1941 | 784 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 18/07/1942 | 6205 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 23/07/1942 | 6258 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/11/1942 | 5272 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/11/1942 | 5338 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 21/11/1942 | 5345 | Transfer in from: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 5423 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 21/11/1942 | 5426 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1942 | 5428 | Transfer in from: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 13/12/1942 | 5426 | Transfer out to: | IMM | Immingham | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 28/01/1943 | 6275 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 30/01/1943 | 6265 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/02/1943 | 6245 | Transfer out to: | WFD | Woodford Halse | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 3273 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 3287 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 3298 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 4412 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 4420 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 4425 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 4452 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 4820 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 4828 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 4852 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | V2 | 2-6-2 | on | 11/04/1943 | 4860 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5033 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5052 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5053 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5182 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5183 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5186 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B6 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5416 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5423 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B19 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5428 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5462 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5471 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5480 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 5481 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 6067 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 6068 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | B5 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 6069 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 6232 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 6234 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 6236 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 6256 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 11/04/1943 | 6316 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Darnall | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 20/02/1944 | 5272 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 20/02/1944 | 5338 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | L3 | 2-6-4T | on | 20/02/1944 | 5345 | Transfer out to: | MEX | Mexborough | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/05/1944 | 2948 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/05/1944 | 3084 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1945 | 3000 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1945 | 3081 | Transfer out to: | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/09/1946 | 4976 | Transfer out to: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 2999 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/10/1946 | 4972 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1946 | 2784 | Transfer out to: | BRN | Barnsley | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2304 | Snapshot | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5153 | Transfer out to: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | J11 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 23/08/1952 | 64334 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 15/08/1954 | 64960 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1954 | 64890 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1954 | 64973 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/10/1957 | 64809 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/02/1961 | 64878 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/02/1961 | 64808 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 16/06/1963 | 63822 | Transfer out to: | 41F | Mexborough |