Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 81 Today
» 1072 Yesterday
» 81 Week
» 11226 Month
» 111011 Year
» 1776387 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Keadby


Type Class Wheels Period Date Number Event Code Depot Length of Stay Notes
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 02/1904 139 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 02/1904 140 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 03/1904 143 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 03/1904 147 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 04/1904 150 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 05/1904 153 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 07/1905 1074 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 04/1907 1144 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 02/1909 39 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 07/1909 63 1st Allocation        
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 08/1910 956 1st Allocation        
Steam O4 2-8-0 m/e 1920 1206 Transfer in from: GRI Grimsby    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 23/02/1920 160 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 1922 1076 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 1922 1178 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 1922 162 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 1922 57 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 10/1922 85 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam O4 2-8-0 m/e 1923 1240 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 m/e 1923 164 Transfer in from: MEX Mexborough    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/01/1924 353 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/01/1924 377 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/01/1924 394 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/01/1924 396 Transfer in from: GOR Gorton    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 24/04/1924 1206 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 09/06/1924 1240 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/03/1927 5396 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 26/10/1927 5394 Transfer out to: CLK Colwick    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 01/11/1927 5160 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 11/11/1927 6076 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 04/12/1927 5377 Transfer out to: LIN Lincoln    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 07/12/1927 5353 Transfer out to: LIN Lincoln    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 10/06/1929 5062 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 13/06/1929 5151 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam L3 2-6-4T on 24/06/1929 5273 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam L3 2-6-4T on 24/06/1929 5367 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 11/09/1929 6140 Transfer in from: CLK Colwick    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 20/09/1929 6177 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 27/09/1929 6278 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 10/10/1929 5163 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 10/10/1929 5404 Transfer in from: WFD Woodford Halse    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 10/10/1929 5964 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 10/10/1929 6076 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 10/10/1929 6518 Transfer in from: WFD Woodford Halse    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 12/10/1929 5356 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 16/10/1929 6073 Transfer in from: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 29/10/1929 5085 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 15/11/1929 6243 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam L3 2-6-4T on 21/11/1929 5367 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam L3 2-6-4T on 30/11/1929 5273 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 03/12/1929 5143 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 03/12/1929 6177 Transfer out to: DON Doncaster    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 31/12/1929 6178 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 10/01/1930 5139 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 27/02/1930 6568 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 27/02/1930 6572 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 22/03/1930 6076 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 01/04/1930 6073 Transfer out to: ARD Ardsley    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 02/08/1930 6144 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 12/10/1930 5162 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 30/10/1930 5057 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 01/11/1930 5063 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 01/11/1930 5404 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 04/11/1930 5352 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/11/1930 6242 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 06/11/1930 6248 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 12/12/1930 5163 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 07/01/1931 6569 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 25/03/1931 6140 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 10/04/1931 5062 Transfer out to: SHF Sheffield Neepsend    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 16/06/1931 6223 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 29/06/1931 6278 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 23/07/1931 6215 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/08/1931 6250 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 07/11/1931 5956 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 22/12/1931 6237 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 17/03/1932 6362 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 17/03/1932 6568 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 09/04/1932 6518 Transfer out to: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 14/04/1932 6366 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 08/06/1932 6074 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 11/06/1932 5085 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 11/06/1932 5139 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 11/06/1932 6515 Transfer in from: IMM Immingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 5352 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6215 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6223 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6237 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6242 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6243 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6248 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6250 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6362 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6366 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6515 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6569 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam O4 2-8-0 on 12/06/1932 6572 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5039 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5085 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5139 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5140 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5147 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5150 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5151 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5153 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5164 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5356 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham    
Steam Q4 0-8-0 on 18/06/1932 5964 Transfer out to: FRO Frodingham