Depot: Bristol Bath Road
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 28/07/1907 | 2911 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 19/08/1907 | 2916 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1907 | 2921 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 4600 | 4-4-2T | on | 05/02/1914 | 4600 | Transfer in from: | SW Stock | Swindon Stock shed | ||
Steam | 4600 | 4-4-2T | on | 11/05/1914 | 4600 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 16/02/1918 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 28/08/1918 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/10/1930 | 4098 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/11/1930 | 4098 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/09/1931 | 4079 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1931 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/01/1932 | 4009 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/05/1932 | 4074 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/06/1932 | 4074 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1932 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/11/1932 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/12/1932 | 4079 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/01/1933 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/01/1933 | 4076 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1933 | 4016 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1933 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1933 | 4009 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/01/1934 | 4086 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/05/1934 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/05/1934 | 4076 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/07/1934 | 4086 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/07/1934 | 4097 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/10/1934 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1934 | 4086 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/02/1935 | 4086 | Transfer out to: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1935 | 2911 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/08/1935 | 4082 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/09/1935 | 5042 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 3378 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4566 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4585 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 4592 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 5349 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 5512 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 5536 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 5548 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | 6322 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1935 | 4096 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 12/1935 | 4670 | Transfer in from: | MAR | March | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2526 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2528 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 2955 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 4064 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | 5514 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 01/1936 | 3224 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4661 | Transfer in from: | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | m/e | 01/1936 | 4666 | Transfer in from: | CLK | Colwick | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1936 | 4097 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 4015 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2526 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | 2528 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 22/01/1936 | 4670 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2526 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 2975 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 4019 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 09/02/1936 | 4661 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/02/1936 | 4666 | Transfer out to: | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 2913 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 4042 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | 5556 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1936 | 5042 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/05/1936 | 5048 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/05/1936 | 5042 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1936 | 5042 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1936 | 5042 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1937 | 5084 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1937 | 5084 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/09/1937 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1937 | 5084 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/10/1937 | 5042 | Transfer out to: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1937 | 5084 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/01/1938 | 5048 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/03/1938 | 4082 | Transfer out to: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/03/1938 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1938 | 5006 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1938 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1938 | 5006 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/06/1938 | 5068 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/07/1938 | 5014 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/12/1938 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 5070 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1939 | 5074 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1939 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1939 | 5091 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 14/04/1939 | 4016 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1939 | 5091 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1939 | 5082 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1939 | 4016 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/07/1939 | 5096 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1940 | 5048 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/03/1940 | 5070 | Transfer out to: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/04/1940 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1940 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1940 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1940 | 5096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/06/1940 | 5019 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1940 | 4016 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 10/1940 | 132 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1940 | 5068 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1940 | 5048 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1941 | 5048 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/02/1941 | 5068 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1941 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1941 | 4096 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/07/1941 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 25/07/1941 | 4096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1941 | 5068 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1942 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/02/1942 | 5048 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1942 | 5074 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/06/1942 | 5074 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1942 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1942 | 5096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1942 | 5014 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1942 | 5014 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1942 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1942 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1942 | 5014 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/11/1942 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1942 | 5006 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/01/1943 | 5084 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1943 | 5048 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1943 | 5084 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1943 | 5024 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1943 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1943 | 4093 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/08/1943 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1943 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/01/1944 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1944 | 5082 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1944 | 5082 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1944 | 6962 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1944 | 2975 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1945 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1945 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/08/1945 | 5074 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/09/1945 | 5074 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1945 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Bulldog | 4-4-0 | m/e | 11/1945 | 3378 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1945 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1945 | 2921 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 2534 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1946 | 5964 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 4815 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5343 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 5813 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 2955 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | 6962 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | 5964 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1946 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1946 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1946 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 4019 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/09/1946 | 4019 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1946 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/11/1946 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/05/1947 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1947 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1002 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1005 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1007 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1011 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1013 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1014 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 1028 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1415 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1415 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1430 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 1463 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | on | 15/06/1947 | 2072 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2322 | Snapshot | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2462 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2534 | Snapshot | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2913 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2916 | Snapshot | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2929 | Snapshot | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2931 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2939 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2942 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 2950 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 3950 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4015 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4019 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4019 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4020 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4030 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4033 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4034 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4035 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4041 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4042 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4042 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4043 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4047 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4080 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4080 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4084 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4084 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4089 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4089 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4093 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4093 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4096 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4096 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4142 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4143 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4151 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4536 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4539 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4563 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4566 | Snapshot | PZ | Penzance | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4577 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4580 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4585 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4592 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 4595 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 4942 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5019 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5019 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5024 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5024 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5025 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5048 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5048 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5074 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5074 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5076 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5076 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5082 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5082 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5083 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5084 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5084 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5091 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5091 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5096 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5169 | Snapshot | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5325 | Snapshot | Sw Wks | Swindon Works | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5327 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5343 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5343 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5349 | Snapshot | BAN | Banbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5506 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5511 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5512 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5512 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5514 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5514 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5523 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5527 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5528 | Snapshot | spm | Yatton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5535 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5536 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5536 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5539 | Snapshot | WTD | Whitland | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5546 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5547 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5548 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5548 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5553 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5555 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5556 | Snapshot | TDU | Tondu | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5558 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5559 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5561 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5564 | Snapshot | wes | Frome | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5572 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5803 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5809 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5813 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 15/06/1947 | 5813 | Snapshot | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 5949 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6322 | Snapshot | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 6958 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7809 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7812 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 7814 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | on | 15/06/1947 | 79226 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1947 | 5091 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1947 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1947 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1947 | 5096 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1947 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1947 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1947 | 5083 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/08/1947 | 5083 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1947 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/10/1947 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/10/1947 | 4089 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1947 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1947 | 5096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8923 | Snapshot | BFD | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | 5067 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5327 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | 5949 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1948 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1948 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 4084 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1948 | 5019 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 3950 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | 5083 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1948 | 5019 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/05/1948 | 5084 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 6935 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 6965 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 5803 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 7812 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/05/1948 | 7814 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 2709 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 5327 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 6977 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 4089 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Manor | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | 7809 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 7011 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 5041 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 07/1948 | 5343 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | 4056 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 08/1948 | 7014 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 5041 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | 5041 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1948 | 4096 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 655 | 0-6-0ST | m/e | 09/1948 | 2709 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 8105 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | 4142 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 4096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 5041 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1948 | 4096 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 4142 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | on | 14/10/1948 | 8105 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1948 | 5041 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/10/1948 | 4044 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1948 | 4096 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1948 | 5024 | Transfer out to: | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/11/1948 | 4044 | Transfer out to: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6000 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6018 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | 6019 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/01/1949 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1949 | 1013 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/02/1949 | 4563 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2445 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | 2462 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | 4563 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1949 | 7019 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 5955 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 5984 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1949 | 1002 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 5955 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 5984 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 5955 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/06/1949 | 5984 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1949 | 5024 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 4914 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5024 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 6915 | Transfer in from: | OXY | Oxley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 5024 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 6019 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1949 | 6958 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 7900 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | 4914 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1949 | 4019 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 1002 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 2534 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | 6019 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6351 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6958 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 8105 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 5536 | Transfer out to: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 6915 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | 7900 | Transfer out to: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/11/1949 | 5024 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/11/1949 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 2322 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 5311 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 2322 | Transfer out to: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | 6935 | Transfer out to: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5536 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5955 | Transfer out to: | LLY | Llanelli | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | 5984 | Transfer out to: | CARM | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1949 | 2929 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/12/1949 | 2942 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 5096 | Transfer in from: | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | 5327 | Transfer out to: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1950 | 5041 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/03/1950 | 4539 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | TN | Taunton | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/04/1950 | 5327 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1950 | 4030 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/06/1950 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1950 | 5000 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/07/1950 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1950 | 5018 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/07/1950 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/07/1950 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4091 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5000 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 5000 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 6018 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 6019 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 2948 | Transfer in from: | HFD | Hereford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 4914 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 4951 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 4985 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5018 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 7034 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 7917 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5018 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 5094 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2948 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 4914 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 4951 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 4985 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7917 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 2948 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 4914 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 4951 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 4985 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 7917 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 2445 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/09/1950 | 5018 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 05/10/1950 | 5064 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 7917 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 4951 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 4985 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/11/1950 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1950 | 4093 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1950 | 2939 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4060 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5064 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6102 | Transfer in from: | SHL | Southall | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4034 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 4536 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5064 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5169 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 79226 | Transfer out to: | 24B | Rose Grove | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4060 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4521 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4539 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6102 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6153 | Transfer in from: | RDG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 2534 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4060 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6102 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 6107 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 4521 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 4539 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 6109 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 6153 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 4521 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 4539 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 4954 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 6109 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 6153 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 6965 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 02/1951 | 2931 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/02/1951 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/02/1951 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/02/1951 | 5074 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 03/1951 | 4020 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 04/1951 | 4041 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 24/04/1951 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 5025 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 6982 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 4539 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1951 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4544 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 4151 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5536 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 5558 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 5076 | Reinstated | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 5094 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Dean Goods | 0-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 2322 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1951 | 4033 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1951 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1951 | 4047 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6114 | Transfer in from: | SLO | Slough | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 4142 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5094 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 5564 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 6153 | Transfer out to: | 81B | Slough | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6114 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 6114 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 4592 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 4592 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 4592 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 75004 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1951 | 4035 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/10/1951 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 4961 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 6900 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 4-6-0 | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 75004 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1951 | 2948 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1951 | 4042 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6322 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6374 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 6967 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 4143 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5325 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 5327 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 29/11/1951 | 5076 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 7900 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 81xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 8105 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5904 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 7900 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1951 | 7900 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 01/1952 | 4043 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 7900 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5904 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 5904 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4603 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 4660 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 9604 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4603 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4660 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4603 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 4660 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 4930 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 9604 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 9604 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5919 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 4930 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5919 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 6w/e | 30/06/1952 | 5919 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/08/1952 | 5084 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Saint | 4-6-0 | m/e | 09/1952 | 2950 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 09/1952 | 4544 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 5085 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1952 | 4060 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5085 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5085 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | King | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6000 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/10/1952 | 5069 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4157 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4159 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5069 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5534 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 6986 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 7907 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4521 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 4563 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5069 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 5512 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/11/1952 | 5084 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 07/11/1952 | 5082 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/12/1952 | 4094 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4094 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4517 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 5182 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 4094 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 6109 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 13/01/1953 | 9008 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 13/01/1953 | 9010 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 13/01/1953 | 9016 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 13/01/1953 | 9020 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 13/01/1953 | 9026 | Reinstated | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 1454 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1953 | 4517 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 09/02/1953 | 9010 | To Store | ||||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1026 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 4139 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 5565 | Transfer in from: | YEO | Yeovil Pen Mill | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6322 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6374 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 6958 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/02/1953 | 4075 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5512 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 1002 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5534 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 27/03/1953 | 4073 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 2203 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5311 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 03/05/1953 | 9008 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 03/05/1953 | 9026 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 4150 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 5197 | Transfer in from: | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 14/06/1953 | 9016 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Earl/Dukedog | 4-4-0 | on | 14/06/1953 | 9020 | To Store | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 4150 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5539 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4511 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4532 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4582 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5525 | Transfer in from: | EXE | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 4580 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5511 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5527 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5555 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5572 | Transfer out to: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6967 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 3650 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 5701 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 7901 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 9610 | Transfer in from: | TYS | Tyseley | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 2072 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6102 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6107 | Transfer out to: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6114 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 6986 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 11/1953 | 4511 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4166 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4558 | Transfer in from: | OXF | Oxford | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4909 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 4972 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 5934 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 7782 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 4597 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5532 | Transfer in from: | 86H | Aberbeeg | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5949 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 3650 | Transfer out to: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 5701 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 4972 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5307 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 6867 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2251 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 2203 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 4914 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 5934 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 1000 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 5351 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 6322 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 1026 | Transfer out to: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 6351 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 7907 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 4958 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 6936 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 6954 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 6957 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 6958 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 5307 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 5904 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Grange | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 6867 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 6977 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 6982 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 5027 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 06/1954 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/06/1954 | 5063 | Transfer in from: | WOS | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/06/1954 | 5057 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/06/1954 | 5077 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3759 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 3795 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6908 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6925 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 4166 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 4603 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 4660 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 6322 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/06/1954 | 5069 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1954 | 4094 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 17/07/1954 | 4080 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 1454 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 1454 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 4562 | Transfer in from: | WEY | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 3784 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 4914 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5904 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5949 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5306 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 1430 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 4958 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6908 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 6925 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 4562 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 4562 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 46507 | Transfer in from: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 1007 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 5351 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 1009 | Transfer in from: | NEY | Neyland | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 46527 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 3784 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 4562 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 5514 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1955 | 4532 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1955 | 4535 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 3784 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 41202 | Transfer in from: | 4D | Abergavenny | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4983 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 6977 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 4558 | Transfer out to: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 9604 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 1402 | Transfer in from: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4958 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 4959 | Transfer in from: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 1415 | Transfer out to: | 81C | Southall | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 5306 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 4958 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6137 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6163 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6986 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4942 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 4961 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4918 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4924 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5910 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5950 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6951 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6982 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 7907 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 4592 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5182 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5506 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 11/1955 | 7015 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1955 | 5000 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 4524 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 12/1955 | 4091 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9771 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 7782 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 4909 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 3692 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 4947 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 6363 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 6908 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 4947 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 5548 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 6908 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 41203 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | on | 23/04/1956 | 5813 | To Store | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 05/1956 | 5025 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/05/1956 | 7018 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 3748 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4947 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4958 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4999 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5949 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5964 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6908 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6972 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 8491 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 8795 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 9729 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4159 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 46507 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 4914 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5904 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5919 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 6363 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | m/e | 07/1956 | 5077 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1956 | 5094 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5919 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 4157 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 5964 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 6977 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 4983 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 58xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5809 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 6982 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 10/1956 | 1402 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/10/1956 | 7035 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4927 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 4956 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6915 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6977 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 3784 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 1412 | Transfer in from: | OSY | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 6360 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8714 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 8747 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 3795 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 4999 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1956 | 7035 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 4983 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 01/12/1956 | 7035 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 4959 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/01/1957 | 4073 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 1433 | Transfer in from: | SDN | Swindon | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 5403 | Transfer in from: | WES | Westbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 02/1957 | 5512 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3720 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 4660 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 6391 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 1433 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 8714 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 8747 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 9610 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/04/1957 | 5054 | Transfer in from: | CDF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 1409 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 3676 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4567 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4619 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6997 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 4139 | Transfer out to: | 85D | Kidderminster | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 46527 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 5403 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 6391 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6982 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 6958 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1957 | 5535 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/06/1957 | 4079 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 9481 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 15/06/1957 | 8491 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4922 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 8741 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 3720 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4924 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 4958 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 5547 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 6360 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 9771 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5188 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Star | 4-6-0 | m/e | 10/1957 | 4056 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 9626 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 3759 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5511 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6327 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9769 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 5949 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1958 | 4597 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4553 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4959 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6919 | Transfer in from: | 82F | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 4577 | Transfer out to: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 6163 | Transfer out to: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3759 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 4589 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5529 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 5949 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 3692 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 6936 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5015 | Transfer in from: | SRD | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5073 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5090 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5092 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 4096 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/03/1958 | 5027 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5574 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 6996 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82001 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82003 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 4567 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 5188 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 04/1958 | 4582 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/04/1958 | 5063 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 4553 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 4918 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/04/1958 | 5062 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 23/04/1958 | 5064 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/05/1958 | 5019 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 4595 | Transfer in from: | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5188 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5311 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82002 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82032 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82033 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82034 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82035 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82036 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82037 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 82039 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 4595 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 5525 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6327 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 6951 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | m/e | 06/1958 | 4524 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4918 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 12/06/1958 | 5099 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5527 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5530 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6936 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82040 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82041 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82043 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82044 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 4589 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 5574 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6977 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 6986 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 82037 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1024 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Chester West | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5186 | Transfer in from: | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5525 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 82005 | Transfer in from: | 88F | Treherbert | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 4983 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5527 | Transfer out to: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 20/06/1958 | 5067 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82042 | Transfer in from: | 88C | Barry | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82001 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82002 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82003 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82005 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82032 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82034 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 82036 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 26/08/1958 | 5099 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5536 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 4595 | Transfer out to: | 89A | Oswestry | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5523 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3764 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 3795 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 82007 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 9771 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 4660 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 4959 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5546 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5559 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5565 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6137 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6915 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6996 | Transfer out to: | 81E | Didcot | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 8795 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 9769 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 3677 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 4949 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 3764 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 3795 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5188 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 5511 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 08/11/1958 | 4078 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 3764 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 3795 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 4988 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 6363 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 4949 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 5528 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 5532 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1958 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1958 | 5078 | Transfer in from: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/12/1958 | 7003 | Transfer in from: | LDR | Landore | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 3676 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Chester West | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 5553 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 41249 | Transfer in from: | 71H | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 82039 | Transfer out to: | 82G | Templecombe (S&D) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/02/1959 | 7035 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4163 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 3764 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 3795 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 4956 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 5910 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 6936 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 4918 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 5919 | Transfer out to: | 84B | Oxley | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/03/1959 | 82041 | Transfer out to: | 82F | Bath Green Park (S&D) | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 82030 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6363 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1959 | 6972 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/05/1959 | 4080 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 6972 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 5311 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 82030 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 28/05/1959 | 7015 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/06/1959 | 5097 | Transfer in from: | SALOP | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 18/06/1959 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 4593 | Transfer in from: | 86G | Pontypool Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5940 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5941 | Transfer in from: | PDN | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 1409 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 11/07/1959 | 4078 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5197 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 5950 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 11/07/1959 | 6107 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 15/07/1959 | 4081 | Transfer in from: | 84G | Shrewsbury | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5w/e | 18/07/1959 | 3759 | Transfer out to: | 71G | Weymouth Radipole (GWR) | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 08/1959 | 5186 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 6107 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 1454 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 4927 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 4988 | Transfer out to: | 86E | Severn Tunnel Junction | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/08/1959 | 5529 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | 61xx | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 05/09/1959 | 6107 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 3604 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 3623 | Transfer in from: | SPM | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5509 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 5529 | Transfer in from: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6977 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6988 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 4163 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Radyr | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 4947 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6900 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6908 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 6957 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 03/10/1959 | 9729 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 21/10/1959 | 7011 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/10/1959 | 5941 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 4075 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 4084 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 5054 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 04/11/1959 | 5057 | Transfer out to: | 84C | Banbury | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 1027 | Transfer in from: | 87H | Neyland | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5934 | Transfer in from: | 83G | Penzance | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 5941 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 5536 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/12/1959 | 6954 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 01/1960 | 5530 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 4129 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82006 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82009 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82030 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82037 | Transfer in from: | 84K | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 82038 | Transfer in from: | 84H | Wellington | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 4593 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 5509 | Transfer out to: | 83F | Truro | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/02/1960 | 4077 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 4575 | Transfer in from: | MCH | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 7907 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 26/03/1960 | 4922 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 31/03/1960 | 5076 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 22/04/1960 | 5049 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/04/1960 | 6977 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 21/05/1960 | 41240 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 06/1960 | 1412 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1960 | 5015 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/06/1960 | 7003 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4129 | Transfer out to: | 83C | Exeter | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 4575 | Transfer out to: | 89C | Machynlleth | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 30/06/1960 | 5094 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | m/e | 07/1960 | 5561 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 41304 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5997 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/07/1960 | 5529 | Transfer out to: | 86F | Tondu | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 02/08/1960 | 5092 | Transfer out to: | 86C | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 1426 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 5975 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 13/08/1960 | 41304 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 06/09/1960 | 5052 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1000 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1005 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1009 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1011 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1014 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1024 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1027 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | County | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1028 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1426 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 3604 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 3623 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 3677 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 3748 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41202 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41203 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41240 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 41249 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 4619 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5934 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5940 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5941 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5975 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6919 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6972 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6982 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 7901 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82006 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82007 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82009 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82030 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82033 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82035 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82037 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82038 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82040 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 82044 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8741 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 9481 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 9626 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 10/09/1960 | 9771 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1960 | 4079 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1960 | 5073 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 13/09/1960 | 5096 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 4081 | Transfer out to: | 87G | Carmarthen | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5049 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5052 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5062 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5078 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5085 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5094 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 5097 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 7014 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 7018 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 16/09/1960 | 7034 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5949 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 5997 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82042 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Standard Class 3 Tank | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 08/10/1960 | 82043 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 19/10/1960 | 5090 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 03/11/1960 | 5048 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 10/11/1960 | 4077 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | m/e | 04/1961 | 1463 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/05/1961 | D7000 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 06/1961 | D7000 | Transfer out to: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 19/07/1961 | D7002 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 08/1961 | D7000 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/08/1961 | D7003 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | D7001 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 12/08/1961 | 5525 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/08/1961 | D7004 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | D35 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D33 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D34 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D35 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D36 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D37 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D38 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D39 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D40 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D41 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D42 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 10/09/1961 | D35 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 25/09/1961 | D7005 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/10/1961 | D7006 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/10/1961 | D7008 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3000 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3001 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3002 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3003 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3182 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3183 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3184 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3185 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3186 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3187 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3255 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3256 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3257 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3503 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3504 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3505 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3506 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3507 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3508 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3750 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3751 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3803 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3805 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3806 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3998 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D3999 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4012 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4015 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4016 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4017 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4019 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4020 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4022 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4023 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4024 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4025 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D4026 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D7002 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | D7005 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 07/11/1961 | D7009 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | Castle | 4-6-0 | on | 09/11/1961 | 7019 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Stafford Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 20/11/1961 | D7010 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/12/1961 | D7012 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | D3998 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1961 | D4023 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 04/12/1961 | D7011 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 14/12/1961 | D7013 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 18/12/1961 | D7014 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 22/12/1961 | D7015 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/12/1961 | D4016 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/01/1962 | D7016 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | D149 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/01/1962 | D7017 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 18/01/1962 | D7018 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | D149 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | 5908 | Transfer in from: | FGD | Fishguard Goodwick | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | D149 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1962 | D4019 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/02/1962 | D7020 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 14/02/1962 | D7019 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 14/02/1962 | D7021 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 21/02/1962 | D7023 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D4118 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 24/03/1962 | D149 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | D7023 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 26/03/1962 | D7026 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 07/04/1962 | D7027 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D7002 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D7005 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 21/04/1962 | D7010 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/05/1962 | D4169 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 02/06/1962 | D6347 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 13/07/1962 | D7040 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 13/07/1962 | D7041 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D3403 | Transfer in from: | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | D7007 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 23/07/1962 | D7042 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/07/1962 | D7043 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 02/08/1962 | D6354 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 10/08/1962 | D7045 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/08/1962 | D7046 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 15/08/1962 | D7047 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 18/08/1962 | D7044 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 24/08/1962 | D6355 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 26/09/1962 | D7048 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 27/09/1962 | D6356 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 05/10/1962 | D7049 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 05/10/1962 | D7050 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/10/1962 | D7051 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6351 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6352 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D6353 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 06/10/1962 | D7002 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/10/1962 | D7052 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 24/10/1962 | D7053 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 02/11/1962 | D7055 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 13/11/1962 | D6357 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/11/1962 | D7054 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | D6349 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | D6350 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 17/11/1962 | D6347 | Transfer out to: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | D3186 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 24/12/1962 | D1046 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | D1035 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 12/01/1963 | D1048 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D1035 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D1046 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | D1048 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 22/02/1963 | D7069 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/03/1963 | D7070 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 11/03/1963 | D7071 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 11/03/1963 | D7073 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 22/03/1963 | D7072 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 25/03/1963 | D1058 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 26/03/1963 | D7074 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3255 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3256 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3257 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | D3403 | Transfer out to: | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D7002 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 04/05/1963 | D7048 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7010 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7022 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7023 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7024 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7025 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7028 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D7075 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | D1058 | Transfer out to: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Hall | 4-6-0 | on | 30/07/1963 | 5908 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 28/09/1963 | 6988 | Transfer out to: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 29/10/1963 | D7088 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7001 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7003 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7011 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7015 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | D7021 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/11/1963 | D1689 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/11/1963 | D1692 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/12/1963 | D1693 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 12/12/1963 | D7081 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 13/12/1963 | D7077 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 14/12/1963 | D7093 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/12/1963 | D7079 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 28/12/1963 | D7026 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1041 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1043 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D1053 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7001 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7003 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7011 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7015 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | D7021 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 06/03/1964 | D1720 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 13/03/1964 | D1722 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/03/1964 | D1723 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/03/1964 | D1724 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/03/1964 | D1725 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D1002 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D6349 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D6350 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7027 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7028 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7069 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7070 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7071 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7072 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | D7073 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 20/04/1964 | D1029 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | D1020 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1712 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/05/1964 | D1689 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Oxley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 23/05/1964 | D1734 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 12/06/1964 | D6938 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1006 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1021 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1024 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1068 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D1071 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7027 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7092 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | D7094 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Steam | Modified Hall | 4-6-0 | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 6997 | Transfer out to: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/07/1964 | D1750 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 10/07/1964 | D1749 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/07/1964 | D9500 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/07/1964 | D9502 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/07/1964 | D9503 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/08/1964 | D9504 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/08/1964 | D9505 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 24/08/1964 | D6938 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6351 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6352 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6354 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D6357 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 12/10/1964 | D7081 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | D6355 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 01/11/1964 | D6356 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | w/e | 15/11/1964 | D6353 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D2134 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D2135 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D2145 | Transfer in from: | 82E | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D2195 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3000 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3001 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3002 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3003 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3182 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3183 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3184 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3185 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3187 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3503 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3504 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3505 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3506 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3507 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3508 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3750 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3751 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3803 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3805 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3806 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3999 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4015 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4017 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4018 | Transfer in from: | 82B | St Philips Marsh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4020 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4022 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4024 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4025 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4026 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4118 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4169 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3000 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3001 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3002 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3003 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3182 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3183 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3184 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3185 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3187 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3503 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3504 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3505 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3506 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3507 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3508 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3750 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3751 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3803 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3805 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3806 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D3999 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4015 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4017 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4020 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4022 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4024 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4025 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4026 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4118 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 29/11/1964 | D4169 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1964 | D4118 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/01/1965 | D9526 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/01/1965 | D9525 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/01/1965 | D9527 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/01/1965 | D9528 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | D7087 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 23/01/1965 | D7091 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | D1611 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | D1612 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | D1613 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | D1699 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 21/02/1965 | D1728 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1700 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1721 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1729 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1732 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1748 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1751 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1752 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/03/1965 | D1753 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 19/03/1965 | D1734 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D7089 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1751 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1752 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 28/03/1965 | D1753 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D1735 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D1736 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | D1737 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D1738 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D1739 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D9517 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D4169 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D7074 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | D9528 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1597 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1598 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1599 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1713 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1718 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1719 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1726 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1730 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D1741 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D2135 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | D2145 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1965 | D2130 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | D2134 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | D7027 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 16/09/1965 | D9553 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7027 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7029 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7030 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7031 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7032 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7033 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7037 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7083 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D7084 | Transfer in from: | 88A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 19/09/1965 | D1068 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1965 | D2130 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/10/1965 | D9554 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/10/1965 | D9555 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D1586 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D1588 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D1589 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D9521 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D9522 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D9523 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | D9524 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | on | 07/11/1965 | D33 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/12/1965 | D1925 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/1966 | D1926 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D36 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D37 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D38 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D39 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D40 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D41 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/01/1966 | D42 | Transfer out to: | ML | Line Power Controller, Derby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1585 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1590 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1591 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1603 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1712 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1742 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1743 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D7038 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D7039 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D9531 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D9535 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D1712 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D3187 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D34 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 15/01/1966 | D35 | Transfer out to: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | D3999 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/01/1966 | D1928 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/01/1966 | D1927 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 07/02/1966 | D1929 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 12/02/1966 | D1930 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1692 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1693 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1692 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/02/1966 | D1693 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1707 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D1727 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 20/02/1966 | D7018 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 21/02/1966 | D1931 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 24/02/1966 | D1932 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 02/03/1966 | D1933 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/03/1966 | D1934 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 18/03/1966 | D1935 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1692 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D1693 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 27/03/1966 | D7027 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1699 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1700 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1707 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1712 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 23/04/1966 | D1713 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1636 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1637 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1648 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1649 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1650 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1652 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1653 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1668 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1669 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1670 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1672 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1673 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1674 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1675 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1676 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D1677 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7027 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D9501 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 01/05/1966 | D7094 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1718 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1719 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1720 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1721 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/06/1966 | D1722 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1585 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1636 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1637 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1648 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1649 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1650 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1652 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D1653 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 19/06/1966 | D7093 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6336 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6337 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D6338 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1586 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D1588 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D3504 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7075 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7077 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 28/08/1966 | D7079 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1027 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1030 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D3999 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6333 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D6334 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1589 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1590 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1591 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1597 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1668 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D1669 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7088 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7089 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7091 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | D7092 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1966 | D9503 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1966 | D9504 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/12/1966 | D9505 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | D1925 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 09/01/1967 | D1926 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 09/01/1967 | D9525 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1025 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1744 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D3516 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D3998 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D4165 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D6324 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D6325 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D6329 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6330 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D6331 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9500 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9501 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9502 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9517 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D1670 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | D3508 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D4012 | Transfer out to: | 87B | Margam | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D7032 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D7033 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D7083 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D7084 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9500 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9501 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9502 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9517 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | D9531 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/01/1967 | D9523 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/01/1967 | D9553 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/01/1967 | D9554 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D7032 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D7033 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D7054 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/01/1967 | D7055 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 28/02/1967 | D6313 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 28/02/1967 | D6340 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D1723 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D1724 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D1725 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D1726 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/03/1967 | D1727 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1026 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1745 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D1747 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7027 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7050 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7051 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7052 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 31/03/1967 | D7053 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D1584 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/04/1967 | D3352 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1967 | D1728 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/05/1967 | D1729 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/05/1967 | D1612 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1586 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1588 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1589 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1652 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1653 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 14/05/1967 | D1733 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6336 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6338 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D4162 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Exmouth Junction | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6322 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6323 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6340 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6341 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6604 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6605 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6606 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6607 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6608 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6313 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6340 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9500 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9501 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9502 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9526 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9527 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9535 | Transfer out to: | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D9555 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D6341 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | D4162 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6336 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6338 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6341 | Reinstated | 98S | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6320 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6321 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6342 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D6322 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D7046 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D7047 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D7049 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D9521 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | D9522 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 22/07/1967 | D4026 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1653 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1584 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1586 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1588 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1589 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D1653 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3184 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3352 | Transfer out to: | 91M | To London Midland Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3998 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D3999 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6340 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6341 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D6604 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D7029 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D9517 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/08/1967 | D9524 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3196 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D3964 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6311 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6312 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6313 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6315 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6316 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6317 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6318 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6319 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D7078 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6329 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6330 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6331 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6333 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6334 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6336 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6337 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6605 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6606 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D6607 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 30/09/1967 | D7078 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1730 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1732 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1733 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1735 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1736 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1737 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1739 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1741 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1742 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1743 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1744 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1745 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1747 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/10/1967 | D1748 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1590 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1606 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1607 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1608 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1609 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 31/10/1967 | D1610 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1967 | D1738 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/12/1967 | D1749 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 30/12/1967 | D1750 | Transfer out to: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | D3182 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1614 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1615 | Transfer in from: | WL | Western Lines (LMR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1648 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3186 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3195 | Transfer in from: | 81F | Oxford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3355 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3405 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D7028 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1002 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1006 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1590 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1598 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D1599 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D3503 | Transfer out to: | 91N | To North Eastern Region | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D4022 | Transfer out to: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 18/03/1968 | D6311 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 31/03/1968 | D6316 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | D3405 | Transfer out to: | 51L | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | m/e | 05/1968 | D6318 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6342 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6349 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D1041 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D1043 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D1071 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6313 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6315 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6317 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D6342 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7028 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 10w/e | 01/06/1968 | D7030 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | D3186 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/06/1968 | D3505 | Transfer out to: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D2133 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D2134 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4019 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4021 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4022 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4023 | Transfer in from: | 82D | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4122 | Transfer in from: | 83B | Taunton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4163 | Transfer in from: | 83C | Westbury | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D4166 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 27/07/1968 | D6338 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1968 | D2195 | Transfer out to: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 03/08/1968 | D6321 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3506 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/08/1968 | D3516 | Transfer out to: | 36A | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/08/1968 | D3507 | Transfer out to: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/09/1968 | D6324 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 14/09/1968 | D6349 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 05/10/1968 | D6325 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1937 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1938 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D2190 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7047 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7048 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7049 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1603 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1606 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1648 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1927 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D1934 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3195 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3196 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D3964 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D4015 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D6319 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D6323 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 09/11/1968 | D7045 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 21/12/1968 | D6342 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 28/12/1968 | D2190 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 29/12/1968 | D1757 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D1756 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D1676 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/01/1969 | D1677 | Transfer out to: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1012 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1040 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D2136 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D6331 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7056 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7057 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7059 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7060 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D7100 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1025 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D1026 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 25/01/1969 | D4017 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D138 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D141 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D142 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D143 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D149 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D151 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D154 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D156 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D157 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/03/1969 | D165 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D146 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D150 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 08/03/1969 | D155 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1059 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1065 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1067 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1012 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1020 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1021 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1610 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1611 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1613 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1614 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1615 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1652 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1653 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1756 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D1757 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D3001 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 15/03/1969 | D7100 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1034 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1038 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D839 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1024 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 6w/e | 03/05/1969 | D1030 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1032 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1055 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1072 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D2128 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D4169 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D6348 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D6352 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D845 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1040 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1053 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1674 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D1675 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D2134 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D3183 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 14/06/1969 | D4122 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 07/1969 | D2133 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1605 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1641 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1753 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D6310 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D6354 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D1609 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D839 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 43 | B-B | 8w/e | 16/08/1969 | D845 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | D3255 | Transfer in from: | 84B | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | D4125 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 27/09/1969 | D3000 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D1596 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D6608 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 01/11/1969 | D7056 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D1587 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/12/1969 | D4166 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D2136 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D2121 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D3990 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D4122 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D4123 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D4025 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D4163 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D4165 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D2136 | Transfer in from: | 98S | |||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D3972 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/01/1970 | D2121 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1035 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1643 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1644 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1645 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1646 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D2121 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D3517 | Transfer in from: | 84B | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D6327 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D1055 | Transfer out to: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 04/04/1970 | D2128 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7047 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7048 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7057 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7059 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D7060 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D6348 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 9w/e | 04/04/1970 | D6348 | Transfer out to: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D6308 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D3990 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D4023 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 22/08/1970 | D7049 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D3000 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D6338 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D6352 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7031 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7032 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7033 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D7037 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D6352 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 14/11/1970 | D6338 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/12/1970 | D1200 | Transfer in from: | MANUF | Manufacturer | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 01/01/1971 | D3815 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/01/1971 | D3815 | Transfer out to: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/01/1971 | D140 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 02/01/1971 | D144 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | D6328 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | D7047 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 7w/e | 02/01/1971 | D3355 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D145 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 06/02/1971 | D147 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | D4013 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 27/02/1971 | D3972 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 27/03/1971 | D6310 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 27/03/1971 | D6331 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D152 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D158 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 03/04/1971 | D159 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D161 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D162 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 01/05/1971 | D163 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | on | 02/05/1971 | D6352 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6312 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6320 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6327 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6354 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D3807 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4160 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4173 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 4w/e | 22/05/1971 | D7054 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4013 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4019 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4021 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D4022 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6308 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6328 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 22 | B-B | q/e | 22/05/1971 | D6348 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D3509 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D3754 | Transfer in from: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D4183 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D3807 | Transfer out to: | 81D | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D4160 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 03/07/1971 | D3754 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 14/08/1971 | D3513 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 11/09/1971 | D7006 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 10/1971 | D7044 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/10/1971 | D7002 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Western | C-C | on | 05/10/1971 | D1035 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7074 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7075 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7011 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7016 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7017 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7022 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 09/10/1971 | D7024 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1593 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1647 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1680 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D184 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D185 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D186 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D188 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D189 | Transfer in from: | 55A | Holbeck (MR) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1936 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D2122 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D4016 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D5809 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D5812 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1027 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1029 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1032 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1034 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1038 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1059 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1065 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1067 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | Western | C-C | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D1072 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D2136 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D3185 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D3509 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D3806 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D2136 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 16/10/1971 | D2122 | Transfer out to: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | m/e | 11/1971 | D7019 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 04/12/1971 | D5692 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 04/12/1971 | D5695 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7004 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7005 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7007 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7038 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7054 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/01/1972 | D2136 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7003 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7010 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7012 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7013 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7014 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7020 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7021 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7025 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7040 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7042 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/01/1972 | D7047 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 02/01/1972 | D7000 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 02/01/1972 | D7001 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/01/1972 | D7004 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/01/1972 | D7005 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/01/1972 | D7007 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 08/01/1972 | D7038 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1726 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D2122 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3526 | Transfer in from: | 84B | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D3811 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D4121 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5202 | Transfer in from: | D08 | Liverpool Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5230 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5823 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5824 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5826 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5827 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5828 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5837 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5842 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5843 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7045 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7050 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7068 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7076 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7077 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7080 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7100 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7569 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7588 | Transfer in from: | D09 | Manchester Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7625 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7656 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7657 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7676 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7677 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D1936 | Transfer out to: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 08/01/1972 | D4024 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5809 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D5812 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7015 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7023 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 08/01/1972 | D7087 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | D3810 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | D3989 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | D3255 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 11/03/1972 | D4016 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 19/04/1972 | D7007 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 01/05/1972 | D7054 | Reinstated | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 5w/e | 08/05/1972 | D7089 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1601 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1602 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1603 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1604 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1715 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1941 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D3509 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1641 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1644 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1645 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D1928 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D4125 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 2w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7054 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7569 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7588 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7625 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7656 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7657 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7676 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 13/05/1972 | D7677 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 03/06/1972 | D7039 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/06/1972 | D1940 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 16/06/1972 | D7004 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 02/07/1972 | D7005 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 02/07/1972 | D7038 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 02/07/1972 | D7077 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D1682 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D1936 | Transfer in from: | 52A | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D3797 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/07/1972 | D5617 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1972 | D3002 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/07/1972 | D3003 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D1948 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/07/1972 | D3835 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 53 | Co-Co | m/e | 08/1972 | D1200 | Transfer out to: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1595 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1598 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D4125 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5209 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5213 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D5227 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D7087 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1646 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1647 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D1930 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D3509 | Transfer out to: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 12/08/1972 | D3513 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D1945 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/08/1972 | D1931 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1590 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1949 | Transfer in from: | D01 | London Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 02/09/1972 | D1680 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 16/09/1972 | D1933 | Transfer out to: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D1942 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D4118 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D7096 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D1935 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 30/09/1972 | D4122 | Transfer out to: | 73F | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 07/10/1972 | D7087 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 21/10/1972 | D400 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D7502 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/10/1972 | D7577 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 28/10/1972 | D5227 | Transfer out to: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/11/1972 | D7050 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 01/11/1972 | D7100 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 07/11/1972 | D7080 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1591 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1728 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1729 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D1730 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5803 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5809 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5814 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5818 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7028 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7044 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7054 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7097 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7503 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D7504 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D138 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D140 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5617 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5692 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/11/1972 | D5695 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 11/11/1972 | D7045 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 19/11/1972 | D3000 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1972 | D1959 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 25/11/1972 | D4175 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/11/1972 | D1608 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/11/1972 | D2122 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/12/1972 | D2382 | Transfer in from: | 16C | Derby | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7507 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7502 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7503 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/12/1972 | D7504 | Transfer out to: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D7093 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 30/12/1972 | D7028 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 30/12/1972 | D7054 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 30/12/1972 | D7068 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 30/12/1972 | D7074 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 30/12/1972 | D7096 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 30/12/1972 | D7097 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 13/01/1973 | D3964 | Transfer in from: | 85A | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 13/01/1973 | D3750 | Transfer out to: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1973 | D4004 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/01/1973 | D4125 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D1676 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 27/01/1973 | D1607 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D3992 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/02/1973 | 47057 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D141 | Transfer out to: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/02/1973 | D3964 | Transfer out to: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5528 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D5842 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | w/e | 10/03/1973 | D7044 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/03/1973 | D1947 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 17/03/1973 | 47057 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D5617 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 24/03/1973 | D5814 | Transfer out to: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/04/1973 | D3797 | Transfer out to: | OC | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/05/1973 | D1753 | Transfer out to: | BS | |||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/05/1973 | D1947 | Transfer out to: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/05/1973 | D7093 | Transfer out to: | 98W | |||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/05/1973 | D7009 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/05/1973 | D7075 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/05/1973 | D7076 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | Hymek | B-B | on | 06/05/1973 | D7089 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1710 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1711 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1712 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1714 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1719 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1720 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1722 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1732 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | 47132 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D7508 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D142 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D143 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D146 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D1959 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5617 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5803 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/05/1973 | D5809 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | 47133 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | D5530 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 02/06/1973 | D5824 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/06/1973 | D4159 | Transfer in from: | 83D | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1741 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D5617 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D1672 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/07/1973 | D7508 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/07/1973 | D401 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1973 | D3816 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/07/1973 | D4018 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 9w/e | 19/07/1973 | D4159 | Transfer out to: | EH | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/08/1973 | D3994 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5554 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5655 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D5668 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7624 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7625 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1673 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1676 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D1712 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/10/1973 | 47548 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/10/1973 | D7507 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D1676 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D402 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D4130 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 47185 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D7507 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D3810 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/11/1973 | 47132 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 10/11/1973 | D5668 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/12/1973 | 47484 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/02/1974 | 50011 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D3040 | Transfer in from: | 70D | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 31279 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D405 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 50003 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/03/1974 | 50027 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7624 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 09/03/1974 | D7625 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 08089 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | D3208 | Transfer in from: | 67C | Ayr | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | 08826 | Transfer out to: | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | D3989 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/03/1974 | D4020 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 50003 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/04/1974 | 50027 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 08003 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 31256 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 31257 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 31291 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 27/04/1974 | 31295 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/04/1974 | D3805 | Transfer out to: | WS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1974 | 50020 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1974 | 50025 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1974 | 50038 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 04/05/1974 | 50044 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 08951 | Transfer in from: | 84D | Penzance | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25077 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25220 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47056 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47063 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47064 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47097 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47104 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47106 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47111 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47112 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50006 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50016 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50017 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50018 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50019 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50023 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50024 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50030 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50032 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50033 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50037 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50039 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50040 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50042 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50043 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50046 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50047 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50048 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50049 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 08945 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | D1940 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25059 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25063 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 25157 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 31279 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | D405 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47464 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47466 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47467 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47469 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47470 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47471 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47473 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47474 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47475 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47476 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47484 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47493 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47494 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47495 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47498 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47499 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47502 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47505 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 47506 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50001 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50002 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50011 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/05/1974 | 50050 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 46016 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 46023 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 18/05/1974 | 50006 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1974 | 50017 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 25/05/1974 | 50040 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 08377 | Transfer in from: | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/06/1974 | 08935 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47142 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 29/06/1974 | 47096 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/07/1974 | 47090 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 09025 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 47472 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 47478 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 08943 | Transfer out to: | WN | Willesden | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 47059 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 13/07/1974 | 47185 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1974 | 09024 | Transfer in from: | 8J | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/07/1974 | 08939 | Transfer out to: | AN | Allerton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 27/07/1974 | 08113 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/08/1974 | 47119 | Transfer in from: | D02 | Birmingham Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/08/1974 | 47064 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47104 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47106 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47111 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47112 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47063 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47104 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47106 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47111 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/08/1974 | 47112 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/09/1974 | 25156 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/09/1974 | 47477 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/09/1974 | 47024 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/09/1974 | 47104 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 14/09/1974 | 47104 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47106 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47111 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47112 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47106 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47111 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 05/10/1974 | 47112 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25059 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25063 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25152 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25153 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25155 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 25158 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47464 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47479 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 46007 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 46008 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 46010 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47129 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47131 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47134 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 12/10/1974 | 47258 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 02/11/1974 | 08113 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47128 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47142 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 09/11/1974 | 47148 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47008 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 25158 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47119 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47121 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47122 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47124 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 07/12/1974 | 47133 | Transfer out to: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/01/1975 | 31257 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1975 | 08855 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 25/01/1975 | 08891 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47028 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/02/1975 | 47140 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1975 | 08839 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1975 | 08841 | Transfer in from: | 83E | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1975 | 08928 | Transfer in from: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1975 | 08377 | Transfer out to: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1975 | 08402 | Transfer out to: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/02/1975 | 08824 | Transfer out to: | BZ | St Blazey | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08149 | Transfer in from: | DY | Derby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08800 | Transfer in from: | 84E | Tyseley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31230 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31231 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 47093 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08140 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 08584 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31229 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31293 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 08/03/1975 | 31309 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 08091 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 08810 | Transfer in from: | 2F | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 47032 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 08841 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 08928 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 15/03/1975 | 47478 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/03/1975 | 08322 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/03/1975 | 08855 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 31230 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 31231 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 12/04/1975 | 50016 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25093 | Transfer in from: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25094 | Transfer in from: | SP | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25096 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25098 | Transfer in from: | D16 | Nottingham Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25157 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25158 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25159 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25160 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25161 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25162 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25171 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25172 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 25219 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31165 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31261 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31262 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31296 | Transfer in from: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47066 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47075 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31256 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 31304 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46021 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46022 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46023 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46024 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46025 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46026 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46028 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46047 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46048 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46049 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 46051 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 47464 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 10/05/1975 | 50020 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/05/1975 | 08414 | Transfer in from: | 65F | Grangemouth | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/05/1975 | 08478 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | 25171 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 07/06/1975 | 25172 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1975 | 08006 | Transfer in from: | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1975 | 08936 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/06/1975 | 08893 | Transfer out to: | SY | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08479 | Transfer in from: | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 46011 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 47464 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/07/1975 | 08028 | Transfer out to: | EH | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 12/07/1975 | 25220 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 19/07/1975 | 50019 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 47074 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25093 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25094 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25096 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 25098 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 46020 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/08/1975 | 47032 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 06/09/1975 | 25077 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 20/09/1975 | 08053 | Transfer in from: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1975 | 08185 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 20/09/1975 | 08839 | Transfer out to: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 20/09/1975 | 08888 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 04/10/1975 | 08479 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31295 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31309 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47001 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47054 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47063 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47129 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 25063 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 31262 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46011 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46012 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46013 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46014 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46015 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46016 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46017 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46018 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46019 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 46 | 1Co-Co1 | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 46052 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 11/10/1975 | 47093 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1975 | 08003 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1975 | 08006 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/11/1975 | 08053 | Transfer out to: | DR | Doncaster | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 08816 | Transfer in from: | WS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25163 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25164 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 31229 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 31293 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 47091 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 08836 | Transfer out to: | WS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25155 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 25219 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 31136 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 4w/e | 08/11/1975 | 31286 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1975 | 08281 | Transfer in from: | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 13/12/1975 | 08091 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25167 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25168 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 50035 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 50041 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25161 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25162 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25163 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 25164 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47020 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/01/1976 | 47054 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/01/1976 | 08089 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1976 | 09024 | Transfer out to: | EH | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 09 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1976 | 09025 | Transfer out to: | EH | Eastleigh | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 25156 | Transfer out to: | LO | Longsight | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 25157 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 25158 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 25159 | Transfer out to: | TO | Toton | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | 2w/e | 07/02/1976 | 25160 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1976 | 08756 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/02/1976 | 08850 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 25152 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 25153 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 25167 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 28/02/1976 | 25168 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 08821 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 31136 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 31254 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 50022 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 50029 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/03/1976 | 08281 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50008 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 50040 | Transfer in from: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 10/04/1976 | 47464 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 31209 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 31210 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 31213 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47020 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47024 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25052 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25059 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25080 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 25 | Bo-Bo | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 25227 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47074 | Transfer out to: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 47472 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50008 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50018 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50022 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50023 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | w/e | 08/05/1976 | 50024 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 23/05/1976 | 08816 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 05/06/1976 | 08218 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | 03128 | Transfer in from: | 98W | |||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | 03134 | Transfer in from: | 84A | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 19/06/1976 | 47056 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1976 | 03128 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/07/1976 | 03134 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47061 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47020 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | w/e | 10/07/1976 | 47024 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 24/07/1976 | 47317 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 08823 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47059 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 08850 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 07/08/1976 | 47317 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/08/1976 | 08810 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 04/09/1976 | 08816 | Transfer in from: | 91W | To Western Region / GWR | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 2w/e | 18/09/1976 | 31260 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1976 | 08492 | Transfer in from: | 82C | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1976 | 47148 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1976 | 08823 | Transfer out to: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/10/1976 | 08414 | Transfer out to: | AF | Ashford Chart Leacon | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31124 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31132 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31110 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 31112 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47056 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 47059 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 50032 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 09/10/1976 | 50033 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1976 | 08492 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1976 | 08636 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1976 | 08140 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1976 | 08410 | Transfer in from: | 83A | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 12/1976 | 08936 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 47465 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 50025 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 50029 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 50030 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | 2w/e | 11/12/1976 | 50035 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1977 | 08825 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 01/1977 | 08185 | Transfer out to: | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 01/1977 | 47138 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 04/1977 | 50046 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 04/1977 | 50047 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 04/1977 | 50048 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 04/1977 | 50049 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 05/1977 | 08140 | To Store | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 05/1977 | 31265 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47478 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47484 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47493 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47494 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47495 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47496 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47497 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47498 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47499 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47500 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47502 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47066 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47075 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47097 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47104 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47106 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47111 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47112 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47129 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47136 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47137 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 47148 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 50037 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | m/e | 05/1977 | 50038 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47284 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47285 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47286 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47493 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 06/1977 | 47494 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 07/1977 | 31209 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 07/1977 | 31265 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08185 | Transfer in from: | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08638 | Transfer in from: | WS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 08/1977 | 31421 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08816 | Transfer out to: | RG | Reading (W.R.) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 08/1977 | 08951 | Transfer out to: | WS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 08/1977 | 31165 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31414 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31416 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31422 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31423 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31424 | Transfer in from: | FP | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31213 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31229 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31261 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31296 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 09/1977 | 31309 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08238 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 10/1977 | 08480 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31419 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47159 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31124 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31136 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31254 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | m/e | 10/1977 | 31260 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 10/1977 | 47465 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | 31258 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | 47140 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | 47142 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | 47500 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 26/11/1977 | 47502 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/12/1977 | 08478 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 09/01/1978 | 31132 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/02/1978 | 08338 | Transfer in from: | WS | Worcester | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31135 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31154 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31158 | Transfer in from: | 31B | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31401 | Transfer in from: | 34G | Finsbury Park | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31193 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31293 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 19/02/1978 | 31295 | Transfer out to: | MR | March | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | 47138 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 25/02/1978 | 08410 | Transfer out to: | EJ | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | 08411 | Transfer out to: | SW | Swindon | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 6w/e | 13/05/1978 | 08480 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/07/1980 | 08218 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/12/1980 | 08949 | Transfer in from: | 81A | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 05/01/1981 | 47254 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/04/1981 | 08149 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1981 | 03121 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1981 | 08584 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37127 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37134 | Transfer in from: | 41A | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | m/e | 07/1981 | 37135 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 07/1981 | 08668 | Transfer out to: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 09/1981 | 08486 | Transfer in from: | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | m/e | 09/1981 | 47001 | Transfer out to: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/09/1981 | 08185 | Transfer out to: | TE | Thornaby | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08259 | Transfer in from: | NA | Newton Abbot | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08322 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08638 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08322 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08338 | Transfer out to: | GL | Gloucester Horton Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08638 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | m/e | 11/1981 | 08953 | Transfer out to: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1981 | 47477 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1981 | 37187 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1981 | 37188 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 22/11/1981 | 37189 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/09/1983 | 08322 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | on | 02/10/1983 | 03382 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 18/03/1984 | 08238 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 27/11/1986 | 08486 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 01/07/1987 | 08992 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37142 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37146 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37158 | Transfer in from: | 65A | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37174 | Transfer in from: | 40B | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37207 | Transfer in from: | 87A | Landore | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37232 | Transfer in from: | 87E | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47466 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47535 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47537 | Transfer in from: | BS | Bescot | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47556 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47557 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47558 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47559 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47564 | Transfer in from: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47565 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47567 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47575 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47584 | Transfer in from: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47589 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47592 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47596 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47600 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47603 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47607 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47615 | Transfer in from: | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47616 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47624 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47625 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47626 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47627 | Transfer in from: | 64B | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31135 | Transfer out to: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/10/1987 | 31421 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 37127 | Transfer out to: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47063 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47140 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47142 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47285 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47286 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47479 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47607 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47615 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47704 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47709 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47710 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 47711 | Transfer out to: | ED | Eastfield | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50039 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 04/10/1987 | 50040 | Transfer out to: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/10/1987 | 08756 | Transfer out to: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/03/1988 | 31401 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47500 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47508 | Transfer in from: | OC | Old Oak Common | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47519 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47525 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47551 | Transfer in from: | YK | York (North) | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47552 | Transfer in from: | GD | Gateshead | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47553 | Transfer in from: | HA | Haymarket | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47560 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47566 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47591 | Transfer in from: | IM | Immingham | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47609 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47611 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47613 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47620 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47621 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47629 | Transfer in from: | D05 | Stoke Division | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47650 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47651 | Transfer in from: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47652 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47653 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47654 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47655 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47656 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47657 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47658 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47659 | Transfer in from: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47660 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47661 | Transfer in from: | LE | Landore | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47662 | Transfer in from: | LA | Laira | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47663 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47664 | Transfer in from: | SF | Stratford | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47665 | Transfer in from: | 86A | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31414 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31416 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31422 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31423 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 15/05/1988 | 31424 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37142 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37146 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37158 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37174 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37207 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 37232 | Transfer out to: | CF | Cardiff Canton | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47497 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47607 | Transfer out to: | TI | Tinsley | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 15/05/1988 | 47651 | Transfer out to: | BR | Bristol Bath Road | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/05/1988 | 47159 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 22/05/1988 | 47553 | Transfer out to: | CD | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 17/10/1989 | 47008 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 17/04/1990 | 50041 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/10/1990 | 50042 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/1991 | 50044 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 50 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1991 | 50043 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/08/1991 | 47466 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/08/1991 | 08584 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1991 | 47837 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1992 | 08638 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 11/12/1992 | 08821 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 25/01/1993 | 08800 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/04/1993 | 08935 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/05/1993 | 47508 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/05/1993 | 08949 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/12/1995 | 31519 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1996 | 47566 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/1998 | 47484 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 01/11/1998 | 31434 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/1998 | 47624 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/1999 | 47535 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/1999 | 47596 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/2000 | 47565 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 14/01/2000 | 47284 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 04/02/2000 | 31294 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2000 | 47584 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2000 | 47627 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/2000 | 47603 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 07/07/2000 | 31158 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/12/2000 | 47592 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/03/2002 | 47558 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/04/2002 | 47557 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/2002 | 47844 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/2002 | 47801 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/2002 | 47809 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/2003 | 47559 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2003 | 47567 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/09/2003 | 47808 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/09/2003 | 47820 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/11/2003 | 47564 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/01/2004 | 47616 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2004 | 47819 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/02/2004 | 47834 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/06/2004 | 47626 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/06/2005 | 08825 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 30/06/2005 | 47519 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/12/2005 | 47478 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | on | 31/03/2006 | 37188 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 31 | A1A-A1A | on | 31/05/2006 | 31154 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 01/05/2007 | 47840 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 47 | Co-Co | on | 31/10/2007 | 47525 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/09/2008 | 08900 | Condemned |