Depot: Brunswick
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/03/1925 | 4670 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 18/04/1925 | 4443 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 28/04/1925 | 4443 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 29/04/1925 | 4402 | Transfer in from: | DON | Doncaster | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 07/09/1925 | 3280 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 04/12/1925 | 4654 | Transfer in from: | ARD | Ardsley | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 05/02/1926 | 4437 | Transfer in from: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 15/06/1926 | 3280 | Transfer out to: | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 12/02/1927 | 4654 | Transfer out to: | NWE | New England | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 08/03/1927 | 4437 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | C1 | 4-4-2 | on | 14/03/1927 | 4402 | Transfer out to: | KX | Kings Cross | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 23/04/1927 | 1497 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | K2 | 2-6-0 | on | 13/06/1927 | 4670 | Transfer out to: | CAM | Cambridge | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1929 | 1255 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 20/05/1929 | 1497 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1929 | 1497 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 29/11/1929 | 1255 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1931 | 2703 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 30/03/1931 | 1497 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 04/06/1931 | 2703 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/06/1931 | 2694 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/06/1933 | 2695 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 21/06/1933 | 2694 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 03/11/1933 | 6637 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/08/1935 | 2691 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/08/1935 | 2695 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 6627 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | m/e | 11/1935 | 6637 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1935 | 6627 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 29/11/1935 | 6627 | Transfer out to: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | m/e | 01/1936 | 5777 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 26/10/1936 | 6315 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 14/11/1936 | 6627 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1937 | 1295 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 08/02/1937 | 2691 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | on | 08/01/1938 | 6315 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/02/1938 | 5031 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1938 | 2692 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1938 | 1295 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/08/1940 | 5037 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/08/1940 | 5031 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1940 | 5031 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 20/09/1940 | 5037 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1941 | 1296 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 26/07/1941 | 2692 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 1286 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B7 | 4-6-0 | on | 03/05/1943 | 5031 | Transfer out to: | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 09/05/1943 | 6111 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 27/06/1943 | 6112 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 18/07/1943 | 6111 | Transfer out to: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 31/07/1943 | 6112 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1943 | 1286 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 05/11/1943 | 1296 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 11/03/1945 | 6106 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 26/08/1945 | 6114 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/04/1947 | 4714 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 06/04/1947 | 4954 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 10/12/1947 | 1478 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2302 | Snapshot | LIN | Lincoln | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2303 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2304 | Snapshot | SHF | Sheffield Neepsend | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2306 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2308 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2309 | Snapshot | PBE | Peterborough East | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2315 | Snapshot | PBE | Peterborough East | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2318 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2319 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2321 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2324 | Snapshot | PBE | Peterborough East | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2332 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2333 | Snapshot | RET | Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2653 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2658 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | F2 | 2-4-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 7105 | Snapshot | ANN | Annesley | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8547 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | on | 01/01/1948 | 8559 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9250 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9258 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9288 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9337 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9339 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | on | 01/01/1948 | 9342 | Snapshot | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 13/05/1948 | 4714 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 62658 | Transfer out to: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | B9 | 4-6-0 | on | 19/11/1948 | 61470 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9250 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1949 | 62306 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 12/06/1949 | 64879 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 18/07/1949 | 62315 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 18/07/1949 | 62319 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 14/08/1949 | 64879 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 15/08/1949 | 62303 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 15/08/1949 | 62308 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 09/1949 | 62332 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 02/10/1949 | 62020 | Transfer in from: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/10/1949 | 62321 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | K1 | 2-6-0 | on | 16/10/1949 | 62020 | Transfer out to: | GOR | Gorton | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 07/11/1949 | 62324 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 21/11/1949 | 62309 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 21/11/1949 | 62318 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 12/12/1949 | 62333 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 40936 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 41173 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 62304 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | m/e | 01/1950 | 62304 | Transfer out to: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 16/01/1950 | 62304 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | D9 | 4-4-0 | on | 20/03/1950 | 62302 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | on | 22/05/1950 | 64954 | Transfer out to: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 41118 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 41162 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 40936 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 41118 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 41162 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 41118 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 41162 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 42949 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 24/07/1950 | 40180 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 69337 | Transfer out to: | 35A | New England | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 40180 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 40180 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 40583 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 40679 | Transfer in from: | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 40683 | Transfer in from: | 24A | Accrington | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 16/09/1950 | 40180 | Transfer out to: | 5E | Alsager | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58272 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58280 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58283 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58285 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58286 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 58302 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40203 | Transfer in from: | 2E | Warwick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40583 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40679 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40683 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58272 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58280 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58283 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58285 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58286 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58302 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40583 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40679 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 40683 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58272 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58280 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58283 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58285 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58286 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 58302 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 40085 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 40103 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 40127 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58272 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58280 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58283 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58285 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58286 | Transfer out to: | 3B | Bushbury | ||
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 58302 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 44392 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 47309 | Transfer in from: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 47320 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 40103 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40085 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40127 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 44392 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 44494 | Transfer in from: | NTH | Northwich | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 47309 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 47320 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40085 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 40127 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 44392 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 47309 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 47320 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 69288 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 69339 | Transfer out to: | 6F | Bidston | ||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 69342 | Transfer out to: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44494 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 47327 | Transfer in from: | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 44494 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 41115 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 47327 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 47327 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 41116 | Transfer in from: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44308 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 44421 | Transfer in from: | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 68071 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 68547 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 41173 | Transfer out to: | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 68547 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 41152 | Transfer in from: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 44064 | Transfer in from: | 12D | Workington | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 44396 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 44438 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 41162 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 44308 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 44421 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 41152 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 44064 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 44396 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 44438 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 41152 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 44064 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 44396 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 44438 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | on | 04/02/1951 | 68071 | Transfer out to: | 39A | Gorton | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 41170 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 41115 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 41170 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 41115 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 41170 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 68499 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45217 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 45346 | Transfer in from: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68499 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 41115 | Transfer out to: | 7C | Holyhead | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 68499 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | w/e | 14/04/1951 | 41151 | Transfer in from: | 5A | Crewe North | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 41151 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 41151 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44760 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 40679 | Transfer out to: | 7D | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 45333 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 44760 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 42448 | Transfer in from: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68559 | Transfer in from: | LIV | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 68559 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 42479 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 42664 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 40085 | Transfer out to: | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42466 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42598 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 41152 | Transfer out to: | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42598 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 42598 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40118 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 42584 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 42612 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40583 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 40683 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43864 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 43980 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68499 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 68499 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 44489 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 43980 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 44489 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 44489 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 65145 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 68499 | Transfer out to: | 40A | Lincoln | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 47566 | Transfer in from: | 16B | Spital Bridge | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 65166 | Transfer in from: | TFD | Trafford Park (LNER) | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 65196 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 65147 | Transfer in from: | STV | Staveley (G.C.) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 40093 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 42349 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 42352 | Transfer in from: | 6J | Holyhead | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 44064 | Transfer out to: | 2A | Rugby | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 65185 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 44392 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 68559 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 68559 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 42121 | Transfer in from: | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42597 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 68547 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 42121 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 68547 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 42628 | Transfer in from: | 7B | Bangor | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 41170 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 43864 | Transfer out to: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 44438 | Transfer out to: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 42445 | Transfer in from: | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||
Steam | D10 | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 62653 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 42580 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40093 | Transfer out to: | 9A | Longsight | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 40118 | Transfer out to: | 6K | Rhyl | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 42596 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 42664 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 41116 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 41118 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 41151 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 68598 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 68559 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 68559 | Transfer in from: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 42597 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 68559 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 44341 | Transfer in from: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 47309 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | J67 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 21/04/1956 | 68547 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 43915 | Transfer in from: | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 47367 | Transfer in from: | 2D | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 44341 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Northwich | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 47325 | Transfer in from: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 47566 | Transfer out to: | 8A | Edge Hill | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 42445 | Transfer out to: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/12/1956 | 65185 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 42445 | Transfer in from: | 6A | Chester (MR) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 47530 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | J69 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 68598 | Transfer out to: | 6E | Wrexham Rhosddu | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 43910 | Transfer in from: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44015 | Transfer in from: | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44127 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44232 | Transfer in from: | 19C | Canklow | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44293 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 44587 | Transfer in from: | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 47228 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 47530 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 65145 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 65147 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 65196 | Transfer out to: | 53E | Goole | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 47432 | Transfer in from: | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 42445 | Transfer out to: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 42466 | Transfer out to: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 42479 | Transfer out to: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 45333 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 42448 | Transfer in from: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 42448 | Transfer out to: | 8E | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 42628 | Transfer out to: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42319 | Transfer in from: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42356 | Transfer in from: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42386 | Transfer in from: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 42423 | Transfer in from: | 9C | Macclesfield | ||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 48295 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | N5 | 0-6-2T | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 69258 | Transfer out to: | 34E | New England | ||
Steam | J10 | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 65166 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 44154 | Transfer in from: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 42183 | Transfer in from: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 44589 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 45262 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 47228 | Transfer out to: | 27E | Walton on the Hill | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 47432 | Transfer out to: | 14A | Cricklewood East | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 47611 | Transfer in from: | 17B | Burton | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 45444 | Transfer in from: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 44015 | Transfer out to: | 9F | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/03/1959 | 42146 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | w/e | 14/03/1959 | 42949 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 42050 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 04/04/1959 | 44842 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 02/05/1959 | 42050 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 42146 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 44154 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44842 | Transfer in from: | 27F | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44842 | Transfer out to: | 27F | Brunswick | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 44842 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42186 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 42349 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 42490 | Transfer in from: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 42352 | Transfer out to: | 18C | Hasland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 44775 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 40203 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 10/10/1959 | D3855 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 44775 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 17/10/1959 | D3856 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | on | 24/10/1959 | D3857 | 1st Allocation | ||||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 21/11/1959 | 40127 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | on | 05/12/1959 | 43910 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 44293 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 42137 | Transfer in from: | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 42181 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 42137 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 45269 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 42181 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | on | 14/05/1960 | 42490 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 42628 | Transfer in from: | 17F | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 45217 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 45444 | Transfer out to: | 16D | Annesley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 45269 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 43915 | Transfer out to: | 9G | Gorton | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 44489 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47325 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 47327 | Transfer out to: | 17A | Derby | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 42333 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 42339 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 44378 | Transfer in from: | 17E | Heaton Mersey | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 42339 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 47611 | Transfer out to: | 14B | Kentish Town | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 44118 | Transfer in from: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 42333 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 03/06/1961 | 42113 | Transfer in from: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 42319 | Transfer out to: | 24L | Carnforth | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 42113 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 42448 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 42596 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 44118 | Transfer out to: | 18B | Westhouses | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 42628 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 19/08/1961 | 44804 | Transfer in from: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 44804 | Transfer out to: | 21A | Saltley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3855 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3856 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | D3857 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42183 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42186 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42580 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42584 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42598 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 42612 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44127 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44232 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44378 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44396 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44494 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44587 | Transfer out to: | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | ||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 44589 | Transfer out to: | 8C | Speke Junction | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45262 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 45346 | Transfer out to: | 15C | Leicester Midland | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 47320 | Transfer out to: | 16A | Nottingham | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 47367 | Transfer out to: | 18A | Toton | ||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 10/1961 | 42356 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 10/1961 | 42386 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | m/e | 10/1961 | 42423 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 48295 | Transfer out to: | 9K | Bolton |