Depot: Wolverton Works
Type | Class | Wheels | Period | Date | Number | Event | Code | Depot | Length of Stay | Notes |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 2069 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 40002 | Transfer in from: | 6D | Chester Northgate | ||
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 2069 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 47286 | Transfer in from: | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 40047 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 40047 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 40006 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 47500 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 47478 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 47479 | Transfer in from: | 87D | Swansea East Dock | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | on | 07/11/1959 | 40002 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 47500 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 47348 | Transfer in from: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Steam | 3P | 2-6-2T | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 40006 | Transfer out to: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47648 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47659 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47665 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47286 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47478 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 47479 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47286 | Transfer in from: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47478 | Transfer in from: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47479 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47648 | Transfer out to: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47659 | Transfer out to: | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 17/03/1962 | 47665 | Transfer out to: | 5C | Stafford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 47294 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 47318 | Transfer in from: | 2C | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 47385 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 47286 | Transfer out to: | 2E | Northampton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 47478 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 07/07/1962 | 47479 | Transfer out to: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 08/09/1962 | 47348 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/02/1963 | 47606 | Transfer in from: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 47606 | Transfer out to: | 1C | Watford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 47396 | Transfer in from: | 2B | Nuneaton | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 47451 | Transfer in from: | 5D | Stoke | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 47294 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 47341 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 04/1964 | 47385 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | m/e | 09/1965 | 47451 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 47435 | Transfer in from: | 1A | Willesden | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2709 | Transfer in from: | 62B | Dundee Tay Bridge | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2726 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2732 | Transfer in from: | 64A | St Margarets | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 06/11/1965 | D2733 | Transfer in from: | 65B | St Rollox (Balornock) | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D2709 | Transfer in from: | Wolverton Works | |||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 13/11/1965 | D2709 | Transfer out to: | Wolverton Works | |||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2903 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2904 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2905 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 30/04/1966 | D2906 | Transfer in from: | 30A | Stratford | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 16/07/1966 | 47341 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 17/09/1966 | D3228 | Transfer in from: | 51A | Darlington | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D2236 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 08/10/1966 | D2385 | Transfer in from: | 5B | Crewe South | ||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 47318 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 47396 | Condemned | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 47435 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D2903 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D2904 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D2905 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | D3/1 | 0-4-0 | w/e | 12/11/1966 | D2906 | Transfer out to: | 5A | Crewe Diesel | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 07/01/1967 | D2301 | Transfer in from: | 40E | Colwick | ||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2709 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2726 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2732 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | D2/10 | 0-4-0 | on | 11/02/1967 | D2733 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 03/02/1968 | D2383 | Transfer in from: | 17A | Derby | ||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | on | 03/02/1968 | D2236 | Condemned | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D2301 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D2383 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D2385 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley | ||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | w/e | 18/05/1968 | D3228 | Transfer out to: | 1E | Bletchley |