Depot: Agecroft
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Agecroft | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 12826 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26B | ||||||||
Steam | 9 | 0-8-0 | 12828 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26B | on | 01/01/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2866 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26B | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12358 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26B | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 1546 | 0-8-0 | 12844 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26B | ||||||||
Steam | 5P | 4-6-0 | 10451 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26B | m/e | 08/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8425 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8444 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8446 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 10/12/1949 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8766 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 12549 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11230 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 23A | Bank Hall | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | m/e | 12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 11240 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11474 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 19/03/1949 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11464 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11512 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 39A | Gorton | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12137 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12162 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12203 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12293 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12304 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52353 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12411 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 25F | Low Moor | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12461 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 23B | Aintree |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7572 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7573 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7574 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 15/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7578 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 27/03/1965 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7579 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 04/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7583 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 23/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7584 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7585 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 19/03/1960 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9599 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9631 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2715 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 25G | Farnley Junction | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2716 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2717 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2718 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 24A | Accrington | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2719 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 05/02/1949 | 25D | Mirfield | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2720 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2721 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2722 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2723 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 24F | Fleetwood | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | on | 31/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2724 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | on | 18/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2725 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2734 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 24F | Fleetwood | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64C | Dalry Road |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2753 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2755 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64C | Dalry Road | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2796 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2819 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2838 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2860 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | on | 05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2864 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2868 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 09/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2645 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87E | Landore | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2646 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2647 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 8P | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2648 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 24H | Hellifield | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5104 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5219 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5220 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5223 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5337 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 27C | Southport | ||||
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 5338 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9502 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 07/02/1948 | 26B | on | 09/06/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8760 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 26B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8762 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 26B | w/e | 06/08/1949 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4781 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 26B | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4782 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 26B | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 4823 | on | 01/01/1948 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 26B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9532 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 26B | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51500 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 26B | w/e | 16/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11390 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 26B | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42878 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 26B | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52219 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 25/12/1948 | 26B | m/e | 04/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4311 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4460 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4543 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26B | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9510 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26B | w/e | 04/06/1949 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49520 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26B | on | 03/05/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49519 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49570 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49575 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49621 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49519 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | on | 23/03/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49570 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49575 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | on | 03/05/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49621 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26B | Agecroft | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26B | on | 25/01/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8732 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 26B | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 84G | Shrewsbury |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49511 | w/e | 24/07/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 26B | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49578 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 26B | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48724 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26B | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48725 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26B | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51240 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26B | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49555 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25D | Mirfield | w/e | 01/04/1950 | 26B | on | 06/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49538 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 26B | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49627 | w/e | 22/10/1949 | 25G | Farnley Junction | w/e | 06/05/1950 | 26B | on | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41100 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41189 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41191 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41100 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26B | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41189 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26B | w/e | 02/06/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | Compound | 4-4-0 | 41191 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 26B | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52138 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52279 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26B | w/e | 28/03/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49544 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26B | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49638 | w/e | 19/11/1949 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 26B | w/e | 14/10/1950 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52357 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48738 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48738 | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52333 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52333 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42730 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25G | Farnley Junction | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77001 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90546 | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | w/e | 08/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90186 | on | 15/06/1947 | NA | Newton Abbot | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 25C | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90359 | on | 15/06/1947 | LA | Laira | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90307 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42730 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 70876 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26B | 4w/e | 27/01/1951 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90324 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 26B | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90324 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26B | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51206 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26B | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90254 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52102 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52358 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52102 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52358 | w/e | 30/06/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90556 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 25A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90564 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 91M | To London Midland Region | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50788 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50840 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26B | w/e | 23/02/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90610 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90632 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90713 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90610 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26B | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90632 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26B | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90713 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90216 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26B | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90306 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26B | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49603 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26B | on | 03/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42843 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 26B | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51207 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 26B | w/e | 17/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52124 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | 23C | Southport | 4w/e | 06/09/1952 | 26B | w/e | 23/01/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44987 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26B | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42734 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64C | Dalry Road | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42755 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 64C | Dalry Road | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26B | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90354 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26B | w/e | 10/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46412 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46485 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26B | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46486 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 28A | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 26B | w/e | 09/06/1962 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90413 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 26B | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45450 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 26G | Belle Vue | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 26B | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49648 | w/e | 12/11/1949 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26B | on | 21/09/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42862 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26B | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42865 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26B | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90372 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26B | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 36A | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42845 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90292 | on | 15/06/1947 | SPM | St Philips Marsh | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 26B | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51241 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 26B | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51499 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26B | m/e | 06/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45234 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26B | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44929 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44932 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45223 | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45261 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 26B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45116 | on | 01/01/1948 | 31A | St Rollox (Balornock) | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 26B | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51496 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 26B | w/e | 18/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51413 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | 4w/e | 16/06/1957 | 26B | w/e | 12/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90123 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26B | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90589 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26B | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90359 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26D | Bury | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26B | w/e | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49505 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26B | on | 29/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49509 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26B | on | 16/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49578 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26B | on | 02/05/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42461 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 26B | on | 28/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47224 | on | 01/01/1948 | 14A | Cricklewood East | w/e | 08/11/1958 | 26B | w/e | 28/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90558 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 26B | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51204 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 26B | w/e | 08/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49674 | on | 13/02/1959 | Withdrawn | w/e | 02/05/1959 (R) | 26B | |||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61201 | on | 26/10/1958 | 15E | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 29/08/1959 | 26B | on | 01/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61008 | on | 10/06/1956 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 26/09/1959 | 26B | on | 21/07/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61269 | on | 11/11/1956 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 03/10/1959 | 26B | on | 21/07/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61298 | on | 11/03/1948 | LEI | Leicester (G.C.) (New) | on | 03/10/1959 | 26B | on | 05/05/1962 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61369 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 38C | Leicester (G.C.) | on | 03/10/1959 | 26B | on | 21/07/1962 | 2F | Woodford Halse |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42287 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 26B | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42474 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 26B | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90599 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26B | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49637 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 26B | on | 03/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49668 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 26B | w/e | 11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42645 | 4w/e | 28/11/1959 | 87E | Landore | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 26B | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 27C | Southport |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51229 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 26B | w/e | 21/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49508 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 26B | w/e | 20/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90626 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 26B | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45103 | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 26B | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51237 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 26B | w/e | 25/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90142 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 26B | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42901 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 26B | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45195 | w/e | 04/07/1959 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 26B | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 12C | Carlisle Canal |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47678 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | on | 14/07/1961 | 26B | w/e | 20/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49618 | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 15/07/1961 | 26B | on | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90564 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 26B | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90306 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 07/10/1961 | 26B | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 2F | 0-6-0T | 47165 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 26B | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51408 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 26B | w/e | 17/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44928 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 13/01/1962 | 26B | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | Standard Class 9F | 2-10-0 | 92110 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 15C | Leicester Midland | w/e | 10/02/1962 | 26B | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 15A | Wellingborough |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45590 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 26B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45607 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 26B | w/e | 01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45654 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 26B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45664 | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 41D | Canklow | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 26B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51206 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 26B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45716 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 26B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45718 | 8w/e | 21/03/1953 | 68A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 26B | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45728 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 26B | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45729 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 26B | w/e | 20/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1153 | 0-4-0ST | 51232 | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 27A | Bank Hall | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 26B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47428 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 20F | Skipton | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26B | w/e | 09/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42718 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26B | on | 18/05/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42838 | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24D | Lower Darwen | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26B | w/e | 30/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47631 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 15/12/1962 | 26B | w/e | 18/01/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90222 | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26B | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42905 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 26B | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 9M | Bury |
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47001 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 26B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90261 | on | 15/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 26B | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90268 | on | 15/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 26B | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90140 | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 26B | w/e | 19/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90170 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 26B | m/e | 07/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 02 | 0-4-0 | D2866 | on | 10/11/1961 | 27A | Bank Hall (New) | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 26B | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90555 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | w/e | 06/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 0F | 0-4-0ST | 47009 | on | 30/01/1954 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street (New) | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | w/e | 05/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42787 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42856 | w/e | 01/07/1961 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 8H | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90315 | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 26B | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42703 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 9J | on | 03/10/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42721 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 9J | on | 12/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90110 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9J | w/e | 07/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45096 | w/e | 18/04/1959 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 26/10/1963 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42952 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 6P5F | 2-6-0 | 42960 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 8L | Aintree |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45095 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45133 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45294 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 11B | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45420 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45424 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44817 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44822 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45368 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 11/11/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45437 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 9J | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 10A | Carnforth |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45239 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 04/01/1964 | 9J | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90533 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 9J | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90725 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 9J | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90448 | w/e | 18/04/1964 | 1G | Woodford Halse | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9J | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 10F | Rose Grove |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90315 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9J | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 36C | Frodingham |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48634 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 03/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 14/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48026 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48521 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9H | Patricroft | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 07/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48536 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 02/04/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48682 | w/e | 26/09/1964 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 25/09/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48318 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48397 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 08/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48708 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48250 | w/e | 22/04/1961 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 16/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48535 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 31/10/1964 | 9J | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48164 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9M | Bury | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48224 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9M | Bury | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48539 | w/e | 07/12/1963 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 9J | w/e | 08/01/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48679 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 9J | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 10J | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47681 | w/e | 14/12/1963 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 9J | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45062 | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48011 | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48743 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47429 | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 99H | Horwich Works | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 9J | w/e | 04/12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47202 | w/e | 15/02/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 09/10/1965 | 9J | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48714 | w/e | 11/05/1963 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48745 | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 15/01/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45258 | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 2441 | 0-6-0T | 47201 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall | w/e | 09/04/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48223 | w/e | 19/02/1966 | 10F | Rose Grove | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73000 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73025 | w/e | 06/03/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73034 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 84G | Shrewsbury | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73050 | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73067 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 6D | Shrewsbury | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | Standard Class 5 | 4-6-0 | 73095 | w/e | 28/08/1965 | 6C | Croes Newydd | w/e | 30/04/1966 | 9J | w/e | 27/08/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48381 | w/e | 26/06/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48411 | w/e | 23/04/1966 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48666 | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48671 | w/e | 08/05/1965 | 15A | Leicester Midland | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48111 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48263 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | m/e | 09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48264 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | w/e | 16/07/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48289 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48775 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48417 | 4w/e | 25/03/1961 | 84F | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48266 | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48700 | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 16F | Burton | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 9J | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 9H | Patricroft |