Depot: Bury
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Bury | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12326 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26D | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 18A | Toton | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 25839 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26D | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 25839 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 26D | m/e | 01/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Prince of Wales | 4-6-0 | 25842 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 26D | m/e | 06/1936 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12149 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 19C | Canklow | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12164 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12170 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12207 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12245 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12247 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12326 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | on | 01/01/1948 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8768 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 25C | Goole | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8769 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 20/03/1948 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 898 | 0-6-0 | 12554 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11338 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11489 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 10/02/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11481 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 28B | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11419 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11486 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51487 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 23/10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11504 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26F | Belle Vue | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12580 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12129 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 17B | Burton | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 02/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12139 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 22B | Gloucester Barnwood | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12159 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 23D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12164 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | Bury | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 04/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12165 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12581 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 18/04/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12245 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26D | Bury | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 20/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12246 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 26C | Bolton | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 07/03/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12615 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 27B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12579 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12382 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 02/05/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12608 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 30/10/1948 | 24D | Lower Darwen | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12455 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9557 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9590 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 08/01/1949 | 26F | Lees (Oldham) | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9591 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9594 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | on | 29/09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9665 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 23B | Aintree | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9666 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 25A | Wakefield | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9667 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50823 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 10872 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50875 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50892 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2473 | on | 16/12/1936 | 10C | Patricroft (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2474 | on | 22/12/1936 | 10C | Patricroft (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2476 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 26A | Newton Heath | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2629 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26D | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8036 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 26D | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8120 | on | 01/01/1948 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 26D | w/e | 21/01/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 9514 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 26D | on | 04/08/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 11458 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 26D | w/e | 17/12/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44544 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 12/02/1949 | 26D | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52137 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26D | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52137 | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 26D | Bury | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 26D | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52326 | w/e | 08/05/1948 | 26E | Bacup | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 26D | on | 31/12/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90364 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26D | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90419 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26D | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26D | Bury | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90364 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26D | Bury | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26D | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90419 | w/e | 03/12/1949 | 26D | Bury | 5w/e | 24/12/1949 | 26D | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12159 | w/e | 24/12/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26D | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52334 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26D | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12159 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26D | Bury | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26D | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52334 | w/e | 07/01/1950 | 26D | Bury | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 26D | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 28A | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51376 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24F | Fleetwood | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 26D | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 23 | 0-6-0ST | 51376 | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 7F | 0-8-0 | 49508 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 26D | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52271 | w/e | 01/07/1950 | 27C | Southport | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26D | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52328 | w/e | 24/06/1950 | 27E | Walton on the Hill | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26D | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52271 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26D | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52328 | w/e | 21/10/1950 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 26D | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50647 | w/e | 22/04/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50651 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50656 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26E | Bacup |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50829 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 26D | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50647 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50655 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23B | Aintree | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50647 | w/e | 26/05/1951 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50655 | w/e | 09/06/1951 | 26D | Bury | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50651 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50731 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26C | Bolton | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50650 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90123 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90555 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90194 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90413 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90718 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 26D | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52268 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 26D | on | 21/03/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52405 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 26D | w/e | 22/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90626 | w/e | 14/05/1949 | 24C | Lostock Hall | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26D | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90408 | 8w/e | 27/06/1951 | 27B | Aintree | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26D | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52179 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 23B | Aintree | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26D | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 24D | Lower Darwen |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52427 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 26D | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90359 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26D | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40586 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26D | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40690 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 24A | Accrington | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26D | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90219 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 26D | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52094 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 26D | w/e | 18/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52239 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 26D | w/e | 18/02/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90308 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25E | Sowerby Bridge | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26D | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52237 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 25F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 26D | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52207 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 26D | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 99C | Crewe Works |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84016 | on | 07/10/1953 (New) | 26D | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84017 | on | 13/10/1953 (New) | 26D | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84018 | on | 23/10/1953 (New) | 26D | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84019 | on | 31/10/1953 (New) | 26D | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 24F | Fleetwood | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90568 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26D | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 26F | Patricroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90226 | w/e | 27/10/1951 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 26D | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42651 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90205 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 26D | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80086 | on | 14/06/1954 (New) | 26D | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 25A | Wakefield | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42473 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42474 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 24B | Rose Grove |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42476 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42625 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80087 | on | 29/06/1954 (New) | 26D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80088 | on | 14/07/1954 (New) | 26D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80089 | on | 03/08/1954 (New) | 26D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80090 | on | 12/08/1954 (New) | 26D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6H | Bangor | ||||
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52443 | w/e | 24/09/1949 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | w/e | 21/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50647 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50829 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 1008 | 2-4-2T | 50887 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42619 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42620 | w/e | 29/10/1949 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42649 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42650 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26E | Bacup | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 25F | Low Moor |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42719 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26D | on | 01/02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42731 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26D | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42820 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26A | Newton Heath | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26D | on | 18/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42865 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 25G | Farnley Junction | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 26D | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26B | Agecroft |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42110 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 26D | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 24A | Accrington |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80046 | on | 17/09/1952 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80060 | on | 19/03/1953 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80061 | on | 08/04/1953 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | Standard Class 4 Tank | 2-6-4T | 80093 | on | 11/10/1954 | 15D | Bedford (New) | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46406 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46414 | on | 01/01/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46416 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46417 | on | 01/01/1948 | 23A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52350 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 26D | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47584 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26B | Agecroft | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 26D | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42700 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26D | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42712 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 25A | Wakefield | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 26D | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46436 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 25C | Goole | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42444 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26D | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42455 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 6H | Bangor | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26D | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 24E | Blackpool Central |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42460 | on | 01/01/1948 | 7B | Bangor | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26D | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42588 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 7B | Bangor | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 26D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 14D | Neasden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42652 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 26D | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52289 | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26D | w/e | 10/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52387 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 27D | Wigan Central (L&Y) | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 26D | w/e | 10/05/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42565 | on | 01/01/1948 | 26C | Bolton | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 26D | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42730 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 26B | Agecroft | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 26D | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 27B | Aintree |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52527 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 24E | Blackpool Central | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 26D | on | 22/08/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42932 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 26D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42550 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 24J | Lancaster Green Ayre | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 26D | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42286 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 27A | Bank Hall | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 26D | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 24C | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52201 | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 26D | w/e | 04/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 11 | 0-6-0 | 52207 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 05/09/1959 | 26D | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43880 | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 24A | Accrington | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 26D | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 26D | Bury |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43880 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 26D | Bury | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 26D | on | 02/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90226 | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 26E | Lees (Oldham) | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 26D | w/e | 21/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43913 | w/e | 30/07/1949 | 20G | Hellifield | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 26D | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44096 | on | 01/01/1948 | 22C | Bath Green Park (S&D) | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 26D | w/e | 22/02/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 27 | 0-6-0 | 52526 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 24B | Rose Grove | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 26D | w/e | 25/03/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47621 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 26D | w/e | 12/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44311 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 26A | Newton Heath | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90413 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 26D | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90398 | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 26D | w/e | 11/08/1962 | 24B | Rose Grove | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44567 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 24G | Skipton | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26D | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46405 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46412 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46439 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 27B | Aintree | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 26D | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90227 | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 16/03/1963 | 26D | w/e | 18/05/1963 | 26C | Bolton |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47602 | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 26D | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 10C | Fleetwood |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48164 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 26F | Patricroft | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9M | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48333 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48469 | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48652 | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46501 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 24C | Lostock Hall | w/e | 11/01/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48224 | w/e | 23/11/1963 | 10C | Fleetwood | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9M | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 9J | Agecroft |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90205 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9M | w/e | 07/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42831 | w/e | 29/12/1962 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 29/02/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90408 | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 28/03/1964 | 9M | w/e | 28/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44131 | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9M | w/e | 14/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42855 | w/e | 23/12/1961 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 9M | on | 12/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42905 | w/e | 13/04/1963 | 26B | Agecroft | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44063 | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9M | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 44779 | on | 01/01/1948 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9M | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45318 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45377 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45415 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 24E | Blackpool Central | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48106 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48523 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46504 | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46506 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 12C | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45104 | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45381 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 14/11/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45252 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 9M | w/e | 10/04/1965 | 9K | Bolton |