Depot: Buxton (LNWR)
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Buxton (LNWR) | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | George V | 4-4-0 | 5350 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9D | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 7A | Llandudno Junction | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9051 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9D | on | 01/01/1948 | 4D | Abergavenny | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 8936 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9D | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9132 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9D | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 332 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9D | on | 01/01/1948 | 10C | Patricroft | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 462 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 9D | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 1532 | 0-4-4T | 1278 | m/e | 09/1933 | W16 | Longsight | m/e | 11/1945 | 9D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 1420 | m/e | 09/1933 | 20 | Buxton (MR) | m/e | 11/1945 | 9D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2306 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 9D | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2315 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 9D | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 3842 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4019 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 12D | Workington | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8326 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8451 | on | 15/06/1947 | GLO | Gloucester Horton Road | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8464 | on | 15/06/1947 | CDF | Cardiff Canton | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8558 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8D | Widnes | ||||
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8712 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 24L | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3268 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 17/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3269 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 29/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3271 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3274 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 10/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3278 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 19/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3282 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3296 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 13/03/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 3387 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4080 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 31/12/1949 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4309 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 28/02/1948 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4360 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4365 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 3E | Monument Lane | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4382 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4548 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 30/04/1949 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9009 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9059 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9386 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9376 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 4B | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9347 | 4w/e | 11/04/1936 | 8D | Widnes | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | m/e | 01/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9331 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9132 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9212 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9214 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 8C | Speke Junction | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9216 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3A | Bescot | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9224 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9225 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 20/03/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9240 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9305 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9315 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 10D | Plodder Lane | ||||
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 9326 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7936 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 7F | 0-8-4T | 7954 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | m/e | 10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2234 | 2-4-0T | 6428 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 14/03/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 6738 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | on | 08/05/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2942 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||||
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 2943 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2306 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2315 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 6A | Chester (MR) |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2318 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2365 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2366 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2367 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5D | Stoke | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2368 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 5E | Alsager | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2370 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 30/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2371 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 28/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 693 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 483 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 2C | Northampton | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 438 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 2A | Rugby | ||||
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 479 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 2372 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 10/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8731 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8734 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8740 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9D | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 8E | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8741 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8742 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 9G | Northwich |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8745 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8746 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8749 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8466 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 9D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9093 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2B | Bletchley | w/e | 10/04/1948 | 9D | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 9450 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 9D | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 2B | Bletchley |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9322 | on | 01/01/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 9D | w/e | 29/05/1948 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8127 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9D | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8166 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9D | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8268 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9D | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 8C | Speke Junction |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8322 | on | 01/01/1948 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9D | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 9G | Gorton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8421 | on | 01/01/1948 | 16C | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 9D | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 40655 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 2P | 4-4-0 | 692 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coal Tank | 0-6-2T | 7757 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 9D | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 4E | Tredegar | ||||
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49057 | w/e | 06/03/1948 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 9D | w/e | 18/05/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9281 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 9D | w/e | 21/08/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8166 | w/e | 03/07/1948 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9D | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 8D | Widnes |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8519 | w/e | 27/03/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9D | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 1P | 2-4-2T | 46616 | on | 01/01/1948 | 2C | Northampton | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 531 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9D | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49348 | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9D | w/e | 14/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49092 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9D | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 531 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9D | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 4B | Northampton |
Steam | G1 | 0-8-0 | 49092 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 9D | w/e | 19/02/1949 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 9387 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25B | Huddersfield Hillhouse | w/e | 02/04/1949 | 9D | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49454 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 07/05/1949 | 9D | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8514 | on | 01/01/1948 | 25A | Wakefield | w/e | 25/06/1949 | 9D | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48465 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 27/08/1949 | 9D | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43562 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 16A | Nottingham | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 9D | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43562 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | w/e | 04/02/1950 | 9D | 4w/e | 08/08/1953 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8278 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9D | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 8278 | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 9D | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40433 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 9D | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40433 | w/e | 28/07/1951 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 9D | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42350 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 9D | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 1P | 0-4-4T | 58083 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 9D | m/e | 09/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2228 | 0-4-4T | 58083 | m/e | 11/1945 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 9D | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49210 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 9D | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 483 | 4-4-0 | 40536 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 35C | Spital Bridge | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9D | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48342 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 9D | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 11E | Lancaster Green Ayre |
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 41905 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 9D | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43300 | w/e | 08/07/1950 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 9D | on | 13/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42344 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 9D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5D | Stoke |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12073 | on | 30/09/1950 | 18A | Toton (New) | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 18D | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12072 | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 41906 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12071 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 9D | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12072 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 18A | Toton | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48165 | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 6F | Bidston | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12073 | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12072 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42673 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 2A | Rugby | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12073 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42308 | w/e | 17/07/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12072 | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12073 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 9D | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12072 | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48106 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48679 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 3A | Bescot | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 9D | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13120 | on | 08/07/1955 | 18A | Toton (New) | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 13A | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13123 | on | 03/09/1955 | 18A | Toton (New) | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9D | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48479 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13121 | on | 05/08/1955 | 18A | Toton (New) | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12073 | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13123 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 18A | Toton | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48734 | w/e | 17/01/1948 | 9D | Buxton (LNWR) | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5B | Crewe South |
Diesel | D3/3 | 0-6-0 | 13120 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 13A | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 01/12/1956 | 9D | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43836 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 6B | Mold Junction | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 9D | on | 11/07/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48932 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9D | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49395 | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 8C | Speke Junction | 4w/e | 20/04/1957 | 9D | w/e | 07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48917 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 9D | w/e | 09/11/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49315 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10A | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 9D | on | 27/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48709 | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 16A | Nottingham | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9D | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 5B | Crewe South |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43329 | w/e | 03/04/1948 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 9D | on | 04/06/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2P | 0-4-4T | 41906 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 9D | w/e | 28/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48275 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 9D | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48505 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5B | Crewe South | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 9D | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42886 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9D | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49400 | w/e | 15/07/1950 | 10C | Patricroft | w/e | 01/11/1958 | 9D | w/e | 07/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49423 | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 03/01/1959 | 9D | w/e | 11/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43538 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 9G | Northwich | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 9D | on | 05/12/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49391 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 9D | w/e | 20/01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49281 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 17/01/1959 | 9D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43562 | w/e | 10/01/1959 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 14/02/1959 | 9D | on | 18/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49433 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 8C | Speke Junction | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 9D | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44375 | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 9G | Gorton | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 9D | w/e | 15/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49277 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 9D | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 2B | Nuneaton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44059 | 4w/e | 19/05/1956 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 9D | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49406 | w/e | 15/08/1959 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 9D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48165 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 9D | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 16D | Nottingham |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48558 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 9D | w/e | 09/05/1964 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44504 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 9D | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44125 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 5E | Alsager | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 9D | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49401 | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 9D | w/e | 14/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49453 | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 30/07/1960 | 9D | w/e | 07/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44596 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9D | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49352 | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 9D | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49262 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 9D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43185 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 9D | on | 19/08/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43213 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 10D | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 9D | w/e | 19/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44490 | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 3E | Monument Lane | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 9D | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 5F | Uttoxeter |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48275 | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9D | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48389 | w/e | 15/10/1949 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9D | w/e | 21/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48727 | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 9D | w/e | 12/01/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44508 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 9D | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48062 | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 2A | Rugby | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 9D | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48465 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 9D | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48428 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 9D | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43822 | w/e | 28/02/1959 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 9D | on | 11/08/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49446 | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 5C | Stafford | w/e | 06/05/1961 | 9D | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 21C | Bushbury |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43760 | w/e | 24/01/1959 | 3A | Bescot | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 9D | w/e | 31/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42314 | on | 01/01/1948 | 11D | Oxenholme | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 9D | w/e | 29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43257 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9D | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42379 | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 12H | Tebay | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9D | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0 | 43514 | w/e | 15/10/1960 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 23/09/1961 | 9D | w/e | 13/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49403 | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 1E | Bletchley | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 9D | w/e | 02/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41286 | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 10E | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 16/12/1961 | 9D | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49439 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 9D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 48898 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 4A | Bletchley | w/e | 03/02/1962 | 9D | w/e | 30/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44016 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 9D | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44083 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 21/04/1962 | 9D | w/e | 14/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2A | 0-8-0 | 49350 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3C | Ryecroft (Walsall) | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 9D | w/e | 08/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G2 | 0-8-0 | 49425 | w/e | 15/11/1958 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 9D | w/e | 15/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44364 | w/e | 12/05/1962 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 02/06/1962 | 9D | w/e | 04/01/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42391 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 16/06/1962 | 9D | w/e | 02/03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44553 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | 22A | Bristol Barrow Road | on | 12/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44247 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 2E | Northampton | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44454 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 12E | Barrow in Furness | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 5D | Stoke |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44497 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 14/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46465 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 31B | March | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 04/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46480 | 4w/e | 16/08/1958 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42772 | w/e | 18/11/1961 | 6C | Birkenhead Mollington Street | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 23/03/1963 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42926 | w/e | 05/05/1962 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | CRAB | 2-6-0 | 42940 | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 24F | Fleetwood |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46430 | w/e | 28/04/1962 | 21B | Bescot | w/e | 25/08/1962 | 9D | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 21B | Bescot |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44315 | w/e | 20/02/1960 | 8G | Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | w/e | 01/09/1962 | 9D | w/e | 02/05/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44110 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 9D | m/e | 04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44524 | w/e | 30/06/1962 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 06/10/1962 | 9D | w/e | 19/01/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44271 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 5D | Stoke | w/e | 10/11/1962 | 9D | m/e | 12/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46401 | w/e | 30/03/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 25/05/1963 | 9D | w/e | 07/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48472 | w/e | 20/08/1949 | 20A | Holbeck (MR) | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 9L | w/e | 21/05/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43947 | w/e | 06/04/1963 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 02/11/1963 | 9L | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48261 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 6B | Mold Junction | w/e | 14/03/1964 | 9L | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44165 | w/e | 11/03/1950 | 21A | Saltley | w/e | 25/04/1964 | 9L | m/e | 08/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44076 | w/e | 13/07/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 9L | w/e | 10/07/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48773 | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9L | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68012 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9L | w/e | 13/05/1967 | 16G | Westhouses |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68079 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9L | w/e | 29/10/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43947 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 9L | w/e | 17/10/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44025 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 39A | Gorton | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9L | w/e | 07/11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48039 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 8E | Northwich | w/e | 22/08/1964 | 9L | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 10D | Lostock Hall |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 43967 | w/e | 24/10/1964 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 9L | on | 28/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44599 | w/e | 10/10/1964 | 16G | Westhouses | w/e | 07/11/1964 | 9L | m/e | 11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44169 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 9L | w/e | 28/08/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44353 | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 9L | w/e | 13/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44425 | w/e | 21/11/1964 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 12/12/1964 | 9L | w/e | 06/02/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48464 | w/e | 19/12/1964 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 20/03/1965 | 9L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44587 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | w/e | 27/03/1965 | 9L | w/e | 15/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44310 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 9L | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44389 | w/e | 02/01/1965 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 17/04/1965 | 9L | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 10G | Skipton |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68006 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 9L | w/e | 06/05/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68068 | w/e | 02/05/1964 | 16C | Derby | w/e | 24/04/1965 | 9L | w/e | 08/05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44063 | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 10G | Skipton | w/e | 01/05/1965 | 9L | w/e | 12/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48011 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9L | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48166 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 16E | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9L | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48088 | w/e | 24/07/1965 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 9L | w/e | 17/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48495 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 9K | Bolton | w/e | 31/07/1965 | 9L | w/e | 21/10/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48748 | w/e | 12/06/1965 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9L | w/e | 30/04/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 44394 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 9B | Stockport Edgeley | w/e | 18/09/1965 | 9L | w/e | 11/12/1965 | 12C | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48532 | w/e | 08/08/1964 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 30/10/1965 | 9L | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48171 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/11/1965 | 9L | w/e | 23/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46402 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 9L | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46484 | w/e | 03/07/1965 | 8K | Bank Hall | w/e | 13/11/1965 | 9L | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48190 | on | 01/01/1948 | 19D | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 9L | w/e | 23/12/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48327 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 9F | Heaton Mersey | w/e | 20/11/1965 | 9L | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9H | Patricroft |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48369 | w/e | 21/08/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9L | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 9D | Newton Heath |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48744 | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 08/01/1966 | 9L | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9K | Bolton |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48108 | w/e | 03/04/1965 | 8L | Aintree | w/e | 14/05/1966 | 9L | w/e | 02/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48753 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9L | w/e | 11/03/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48456 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 2B | Nuneaton | w/e | 04/06/1966 | 9L | w/e | 02/09/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46485 | w/e | 10/07/1965 | 12D | Workington | w/e | 25/06/1966 | 9L | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48424 | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 2C | Stourbridge Junction | w/e | 23/07/1966 | 9L | w/e | 24/02/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48552 | w/e | 25/12/1965 | 40E | Colwick | w/e | 03/09/1966 | 9L | w/e | 29/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46492 | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2E | Saltley | w/e | 15/10/1966 | 9L | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48376 | w/e | 22/10/1966 | 16B | Colwick | w/e | 14/01/1967 | 9L | w/e | 22/07/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48442 | w/e | 24/06/1961 | 16B | Kirkby in Ashfield | w/e | 18/02/1967 | 9L | w/e | 02/03/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-0 | 46505 | w/e | 06/08/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 06/05/1967 | 9L | m/e | 06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48471 | w/e | 28/05/1966 | 9D | Newton Heath | w/e | 11/11/1967 | 9L | w/e | 09/03/1968 | 9F | Heaton Mersey |
Steam | 8F | 2-8-0 | 48336 | w/e | 11/03/1967 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 18/11/1967 | 9L | w/e | 09/12/1967 | Withdrawn |