Depot: Camden
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Camden | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6202 | on | 29/06/1935 (New) | 1B | on | 22/02/1936 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 01/07/1935 (New) | 1B | on | 24/08/1935 | 27A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6204 | on | 19/07/1935 (New) | 1B | on | 24/12/1935 | 27A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6205 | on | 24/07/1935 (New) | 1B | on | 03/08/1935 | 27A | Polmadie | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6206 | on | 01/08/1935 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | on | 24/08/1935 | 1B | on | 15/07/1939 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6207 | on | 09/08/1935 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | on | 31/08/1935 | 1B | on | 04/08/1938 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6208 | on | 16/08/1935 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | on | 31/08/1935 | 1B | on | 16/07/1938 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6210 | on | 06/09/1935 (New) | 1B | on | 22/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6209 | on | 23/08/1935 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | on | 07/09/1935 | 1B | on | 12/02/1938 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6211 | on | 18/09/1935 (New) | 1B | on | 22/01/1938 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6205 | on | 03/08/1935 | 27A | Polmadie | on | 28/09/1935 | 1B | on | 21/10/1939 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6212 | on | 21/10/1935 (New) | 1B | on | 16/10/1939 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5512 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1B | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5516 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1B | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5524 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1B | on | 01/01/1948 | 10B | Preston | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5529 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1B | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5530 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 1B | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 24/08/1935 | 27A | Polmadie | on | 29/02/1936 | 1B | on | 21/10/1939 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6204 | on | 24/12/1935 | 27A | Polmadie | on | 29/02/1936 | 1B | on | 16/09/1939 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6202 | on | 22/02/1936 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 19/04/1936 | 1B | on | 16/09/1939 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6211 | on | 18/09/1935 | 1B | Camden (New) | on | 22/01/1938 | 1B | on | 26/02/1938 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6209 | on | 07/09/1935 | 1B | Camden | on | 12/02/1938 | 1B | on | 19/02/1938 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6209 | on | 12/02/1938 | 1B | Camden | on | 19/02/1938 | 1B | on | 06/09/1939 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6211 | on | 22/01/1938 | 1B | Camden | on | 26/02/1938 | 1B | on | 22/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6208 | on | 31/08/1935 | 1B | Camden | on | 16/07/1938 | 1B | on | 06/08/1938 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6208 | on | 16/07/1938 | 1B | Camden | on | 06/08/1938 | 1B | on | 21/10/1939 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6207 | on | 04/08/1938 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 27/08/1938 | 1B | on | 16/09/1939 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6201 | on | 06/01/1934 | 27A | Polmadie | on | 24/06/1939 | 1B | on | 15/07/1939 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6201 | on | 15/07/1939 | 9A | Longsight | on | 16/09/1939 | 1B | on | 21/10/1939 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6212 | on | 16/10/1939 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 21/10/1939 | 1B | on | 22/05/1943 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6207 | on | 21/10/1939 | 9A | Longsight | on | 02/12/1939 | 1B | on | 01/06/1940 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6208 | on | 21/10/1939 | 9A | Longsight | on | 02/12/1939 | 1B | on | 08/06/1940 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6209 | on | 06/09/1939 | 9A | Longsight | on | 02/12/1939 | 1B | on | 02/05/1942 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6206 | on | 02/12/1939 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 06/04/1940 | 1B | on | 02/06/1942 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6202 | on | 16/09/1939 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 09/08/1941 | 1B | on | 27/06/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6203 | on | 09/11/1940 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 26/12/1942 | 1B | on | 03/04/1943 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 6206 | on | 02/06/1942 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 22/05/1943 | 1B | on | 16/10/1943 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6100 | on | 08/06/1946 | 1B | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4120 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 10C | Patricroft | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 1B | on | 01/01/1948 | 11B | Barrow in Furness |
Steam | 4F | 0-6-0 | 4121 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 1B | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6151 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 1B | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | 10000 | on | 30/11/1947 (New) | 1B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7354 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7356 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7358 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7359 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 1C | Watford | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 2D | Coventry |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7467 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7522 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7527 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7529 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 5B | Crewe South | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7667 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7668 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7669 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 7671 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 8F | Springs Branch (Wigan) | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5601 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 2A | Rugby | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5606 | 4w/e | 30/11/1935 | 17A | Derby | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5617 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 19/08/1950 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5669 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5735 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5736 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6101 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | ||||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6116 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6118 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6119 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6123 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 13/03/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6130 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6139 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6140 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 3B | Bushbury | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6141 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6142 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6148 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6151 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 1B | Camden | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 28/10/1950 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6152 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6153 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 22/05/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6159 | 4w/e | 02/11/1935 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6168 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24K | Preston | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6170 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6225 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6237 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6239 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 6J | Holyhead | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6240 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6241 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6243 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6244 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6245 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6246 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6247 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6248 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6253 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6254 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6255 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6256 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46154 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 1B | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46162 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46236 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 24/04/1948 | 1B | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5676 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1B | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 5529 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 1B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45555 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 5647 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/06/1948 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45741 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 1B | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 1B | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | 10001 | on | 10/07/1948 (New) | 1B | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 6126 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 1B | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46242 | on | 01/01/1948 | 27A | Polmadie | w/e | 14/08/1948 | 1B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46119 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 13/11/1948 | 1B | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45735 | w/e | 02/10/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 1B | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45735 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | 1B | Camden | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 1B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46138 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 15/01/1949 | 1B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 7C | Holyhead |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45672 | on | 01/01/1948 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45531 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45532 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45540 | on | 01/01/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45545 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46249 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46250 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 6253 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | 5w/e | 16/07/1949 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45514 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45522 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46148 | 3w/e | 11/12/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46238 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46252 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46253 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45514 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | Camden | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 41C | Sheffield Millhouses |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45522 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | Camden | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46148 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | Camden | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46238 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | Camden | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | Camden | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46252 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | Camden | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46253 | w/e | 10/06/1950 | 1B | Camden | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 1B | w/e | 30/09/1950 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45535 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 1B | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45703 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 1B | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46252 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 1B | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45703 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 1B | Camden | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 1B | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46252 | 4w/e | 24/02/1951 | 1B | Camden | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45669 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1B | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45676 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1B | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46141 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46143 | m/e | 28/02/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70015 | on | 12/06/1951 (New) | 1B | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 30A | Stratford | ||||
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45677 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45523 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45525 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45528 | w/e | 05/06/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45535 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46228 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46238 | 4w/e | 07/10/1950 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45677 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45523 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45525 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45528 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45535 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46226 | on | 01/01/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46228 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46236 | w/e | 10/07/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46238 | w/e | 07/07/1951 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 1B | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45534 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 1B | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46252 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 10/11/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45738 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 01/12/1951 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46138 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 7C | Holyhead | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46146 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46147 | w/e | 12/03/1949 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46237 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45591 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45606 | w/e | 08/10/1949 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45625 | on | 01/01/1948 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45525 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45529 | w/e | 28/05/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46101 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46125 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46155 | w/e | 15/09/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46161 | w/e | 20/10/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46166 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46225 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46229 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46252 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46255 | w/e | 26/06/1948 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46162 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46144 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 1B | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46144 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 1B | Camden | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 1B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45502 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 1A | Willesden | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46126 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 3w/e | 24/01/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45686 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 1B | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46167 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46119 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46138 | 8w/e | 14/06/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1B | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47350 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1A | Willesden | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 12D | Workington |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45592 | 4w/e | 21/02/1953 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45603 | w/e | 29/04/1950 | 9A | Longsight | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45740 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45528 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45529 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46101 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46125 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46128 | 8w/e | 29/11/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46138 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 1B | Camden | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46254 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45529 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | Camden | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 1B | 4w/e | 02/01/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45634 | 2w/e | 17/06/1950 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46146 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 1B | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45606 | 5w/e | 03/01/1953 | 8A | Edge Hill | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45528 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 1B | Camden | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46119 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 6J | Holyhead | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46128 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46159 | 4w/e | 28/11/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46163 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46166 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46167 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45703 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46101 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46157 | 4w/e | 24/03/1951 | 7C | Holyhead | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46118 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46101 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46134 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 06/11/1954 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46242 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 1B | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 66A | Polmadie |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46254 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 26/02/1955 | 1B | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | 10001 | on | 19/04/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 26/03/1955 | 1B | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | 10201 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | on | 02/04/1955 | 1B | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | 10202 | 4w/e | 19/03/1952 | 70A | Nine Elms | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 1B | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 1B | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | D16/1 | Co-Co | 10000 | on | 19/04/1953 | 70A | Nine Elms | on | 30/04/1955 | 1B | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46114 | on | 01/01/1948 | 9A | Longsight | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46119 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46127 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46159 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | D16/2 | 1Co-Co1 | 10203 | on | 07/1954 | 70A | Nine Elms (New) | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 1B | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46255 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 1B | 4w/e | 25/02/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46151 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 6J | Holyhead | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 1B | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46161 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 9A | Longsight | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 1B | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45553 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45591 | 8w/e | 19/06/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1B | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46110 | 4w/e | 27/03/1954 | 8A | Edge Hill | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 1B | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | DELTIC | Co-Co | DP1 | m/e | 06/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | m/e | 10/1956 | 1B | m/e | 01/1959 | 34B | Hornsey |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46159 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 1B | 4w/e | 29/12/1956 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46250 | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 1B | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45545 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 1B | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45672 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 1B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3B | Bushbury |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45722 | 4w/e | 23/03/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1B | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46106 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46127 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46129 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1B | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46148 | 4w/e | 17/07/1951 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1B | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46150 | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 1B | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45672 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 3B | Bushbury | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47302 | 4w/e | 28/12/1957 | 1A | Willesden | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47310 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 3A | Bescot |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47348 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1E | Bletchley |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47495 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 19/04/1958 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 6F | Bidston |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47304 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47307 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1C | Watford |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47514 | on | 01/01/1948 | 13B | Devons Road (Bow) | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1B | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46110 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46119 | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46120 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46157 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 14B | Kentish Town | 4w/e | 14/06/1958 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46116 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46131 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46152 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 1B | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46170 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 18/10/1958 | 1B | w/e | 28/11/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 5MT | 4-6-0 | 45146 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 1B | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45624 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 6E | Chester West | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45632 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 6E | Chester West | w/e | 11/04/1959 | 1B | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46154 | w/e | 09/05/1959 | 14B | Kentish Town | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45599 | 4w/e | 06/10/1951 | 12A | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46101 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46118 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 16A | Nottingham |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46135 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46161 | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46163 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 24K | Preston |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46221 | 4w/e | 12/07/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 01/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46234 | on | 01/01/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45592 | w/e | 30/05/1959 | 3B | Bushbury | w/e | 01/08/1959 | 1B | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D211 | on | 20/05/1959 | 1A | Willesden (New) | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 1B | w/e | 02/12/1961 | CMEE, Derby | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D219 | on | 10/07/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 08/08/1959 | 1B | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D1 | on | 15/08/1959 (New) | 1B | on | 15/08/1959 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D1 | on | 15/08/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | on | 15/08/1959 | 1B | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D210 | on | 11/05/1959 | 1A | Willesden (New) | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D224 | on | 10/08/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 1B | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5015 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/08/1959 | 1B | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D3 | on | 18/09/1959 (New) | 1B | on | 19/09/1959 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D2 | on | 19/09/1959 (New) | 1B | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D3 | on | 18/09/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | on | 19/09/1959 | 1B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D2 | on | 19/09/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 1B | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D4 | on | 26/09/1959 (New) | 1B | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D4 | on | 26/09/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 1B | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3850 | on | 05/09/1959 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) (New) | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46207 | on | 25/02/1956 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 03/10/1959 | 1B | on | 11/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3847 | on | 15/08/1959 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) (New) | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3848 | on | 22/08/1959 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) (New) | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3849 | on | 29/08/1959 | 9E | Trafford Park (LMS) (New) | w/e | 10/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D5 | on | 14/10/1959 (New) | 1B | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5015 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5016 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | Bletchley |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5018 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1B | on | 01/01/1966 | 1E | Bletchley |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5019 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | Bletchley |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D226 | on | 21/08/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D229 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D232 | on | 14/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5008 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46100 | 4w/e | 22/06/1946 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 05/11/1959 | 1B | on | 27/12/1959 | 16A | Nottingham |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D5 | on | 14/10/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46234 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1B | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46256 | w/e | 24/01/1948 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1B | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D6 | on | 12/11/1959 (New) | 1B | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D7 | on | 28/11/1959 (New) | 1B | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D6 | on | 12/11/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1B | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D7 | on | 28/11/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70045 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1B | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70048 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1B | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 26A | Newton Heath |
Steam | Britannia | 4-6-2 | 70049 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1B | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D8 | on | 18/12/1959 (New) | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D9 | on | 24/12/1959 (New) | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D8 | on | 18/12/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D9 | on | 24/12/1959 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5008 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D233 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 1B | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D10 | on | 05/02/1960 (New) | 1B | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 1B | Camden | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D9 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 1B | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8037 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8039 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 1B | on | 01/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 4P | 2-6-4T | 42601 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 14D | Neasden | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 1B | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 6H | Bangor |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D267 | on | 25/03/1960 (New) | 1B | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D10 | on | 05/02/1960 | 1B | Camden (New) | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 1B | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3017 | on | 21/03/1953 | 1A | Willesden (New) | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D4 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 02/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D269 | on | 04/04/1960 (New) | 1B | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 9A | Longsight | ||||
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D1 | on | 15/08/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 09/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D3 | on | 19/09/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D5 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D7 | w/e | 12/12/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D10 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D5 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D6 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D6 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D8 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D8 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | Camden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D10 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | 14/05/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D217 | w/e | 18/07/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46233 | w/e | 23/04/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46256 | w/e | 21/11/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 1B | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D2 | w/e | 26/09/1959 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 07/05/1960 | 1B | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D255 | w/e | 26/03/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 14/05/1960 | 1B | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45586 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45704 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 21D | Aston |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45733 | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 6G | Llandudno Junction | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46243 | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46246 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | w/e | 26/01/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46248 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 1B | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45551 | 3w/e | 14/01/1950 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 1B | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45624 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 02/07/1960 | 1B | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D2 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 18A | Toton |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D5 | w/e | 21/05/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 18A | Toton |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45606 | w/e | 02/01/1960 | 24L | Carnforth | w/e | 23/07/1960 | 1B | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 24L | Carnforth |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46170 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D213 | w/e | 27/06/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 1B | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D227 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 1B | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46203 | on | 20/09/1958 | 8A | Edge Hill | on | 20/08/1960 | 1B | on | 10/09/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D225 | w/e | 28/05/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 1B | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D288 | on | 08/08/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 1B | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46248 | w/e | 13/08/1960 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 1B | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Patriot | 4-6-0 | 45530 | w/e | 13/06/1959 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46120 | w/e | 11/06/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1B | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D268 | w/e | 30/04/1960 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D291 | on | 29/08/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1B | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3015 | on | 24/01/1953 | 1A | Willesden (New) | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3016 | on | 24/01/1953 | 1A | Willesden (New) | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 1B | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D292 | on | 05/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 1B | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D11 | on | 01/10/1960 (New) | 1B | w/e | 08/10/1960 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Diesel | 45 | 1Co-Co1 | D12 | on | 15/10/1960 (New) | 1B | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 17A | Derby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D296 | on | 03/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 1B | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46170 | w/e | 03/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8000 | w/e | 27/09/1958 | 5B | Crewe South | w/e | 29/10/1960 | 1B | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41239 | w/e | 16/07/1960 | 8D | Widnes | w/e | 05/11/1960 | 1B | w/e | 07/09/1963 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D297 | on | 10/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 1B | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D298 | on | 17/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 1B | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D299 | on | 24/10/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 1B | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5026 | w/e | 17/09/1960 | 30A | Stratford | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45624 | w/e | 10/09/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 1B | w/e | 15/04/1961 | 2A | Rugby |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45722 | w/e | 03/10/1959 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 1B | w/e | 03/12/1960 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D212 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 17/12/1960 | 1B | on | 01/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D301 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 55H | Neville Hill | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1B | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D304 | on | 28/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1B | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D310 | on | 29/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1B | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46155 | w/e | 12/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 1B | w/e | 31/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D314 | on | 29/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1B | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D326 | on | 21/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 14/01/1961 | 1B | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D325 | on | 09/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 1B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D327 | on | 29/12/1960 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D329 | on | 18/01/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 28/01/1961 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D307 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D308 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5059 | w/e | 22/10/1960 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 1B | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 34G | Finsbury Park |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D331 | on | 06/02/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 1B | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D332 | on | 16/02/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 25/02/1961 | 1B | w/e | 09/09/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5022 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 32B | Ipswich | w/e | 18/03/1961 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D318 | on | 20/02/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 25/03/1961 | 1B | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D233 | w/e | 12/11/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 1B | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D302 | w/e | 11/02/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 1B | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D318 | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 1B | w/e | 04/11/1961 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46205 | on | 11/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden | on | 15/07/1961 | 1B | on | 09/09/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46207 | on | 11/03/1961 | 1A | Willesden | on | 15/07/1961 | 1B | on | 09/09/1961 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D211 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | CMEE, Derby | w/e | 09/12/1961 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D369 | on | 07/12/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D370 | on | 13/12/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D371 | on | 20/12/1961 | 5A | Crewe North (New) | w/e | 30/12/1961 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D373 | on | 05/01/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D372 | on | 03/01/1962 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5134 | on | 06/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 06/01/1962 | 1B | w/e | 26/12/1964 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D374 | on | 17/01/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 5A | Crewe North | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5142 | on | 19/11/1960 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 27/01/1962 | 1B | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 17A | Derby |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46206 | on | 09/09/1961 | 2A | Rugby | on | 27/01/1962 | 1B | w/e | 03/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Princess Royal | 4-6-2 | 46209 | on | 03/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | on | 27/01/1962 | 1B | w/e | 29/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D375 | on | 31/01/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D376 | on | 05/02/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D377 | on | 09/02/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D378 | on | 16/02/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D379 | on | 21/02/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D380 | on | 05/03/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D381 | on | 12/03/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D382 | on | 14/03/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D384 | on | 19/03/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 02/10/1965 | 1E | Bletchley | ||||
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D383 | on | 21/03/1962 (New) | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot | ||||
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5142 | w/e | 10/03/1962 | 17A | Derby | w/e | 24/03/1962 | 1B | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5135 | on | 08/10/1960 | 9A | Longsight (New) | w/e | 07/04/1962 | 1B | on | 17/06/1968 | D09 | Manchester Division |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5008 | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 1B | Camden | w/e | 21/07/1962 | 1B | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D299 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 1B | w/e | 23/02/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D326 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46252 | w/e | 11/04/1961 | 12A | Carlisle Kingmoor | w/e | 22/09/1962 | 1B | w/e | 01/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5008 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 1B | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | 6P | 4-6-0 | 45736 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 1B | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | 7P | 4-6-0 | 46156 | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 6J | Holyhead | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 1B | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 6J | Holyhead |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46251 | 8w/e | 05/10/1957 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 1B | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Steam | Coronation (Semi) | 4-6-2 | 46254 | w/e | 24/09/1960 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 09/03/1963 | 1B | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D225 | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 1B | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D269 | w/e | 20/04/1963 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 1B | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 9A | Longsight |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D296 | w/e | 02/12/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 1B | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D325 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 12B | Carlisle Upperby | w/e | 27/07/1963 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D269 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 9A | Longsight | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1B | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8040 | w/e | 05/12/1959 | 1D | Devons Road (Bow) | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1B | on | 01/01/1966 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D231 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 8A | Edge Hill | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1B | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D343 | on | 10/05/1961 | 8A | Edge Hill (New) | w/e | 07/03/1964 | 1B | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North |
Diesel | Peak | 1Co-Co1 | D2 | w/e | 13/10/1962 | 18A | Toton | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 1B | w/e | 27/06/1964 | 16A | Toton |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D374 | w/e | 06/07/1963 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D229 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D231 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D269 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D310 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D314 | w/e | 18/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D343 | w/e | 20/06/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/09/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D214 | w/e | 14/07/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D217 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D230 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D233 | w/e | 10/06/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D292 | w/e | 04/07/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D297 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D298 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 28/11/1964 | 1B | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1F | Rugby |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5000 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5001 | w/e | 14/09/1963 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5004 | w/e | 29/09/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | w/e | 27/02/1965 | 1A | Willesden |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5007 | w/e | 24/11/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | Bletchley |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5009 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 1E | Bletchley |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5020 | w/e | 29/04/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5021 | w/e | 27/05/1961 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 24 | Bo-Bo | D5023 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 1A | Willesden | w/e | 09/01/1965 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D313 | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1B | w/e | 16/10/1965 | 2F | Bescot |
Diesel | 40 | 1Co-Co1 | D321 | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 5A | Crewe North | w/e | 19/06/1965 | 1B | w/e | 03/01/1966 | 2F | Bescot |