Depot: Cardiff Cathays
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Cardiff Cathays | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | Unclassified | 0-4-0ST | 1338 | on | 15/01/1931 | CHYS | 4w/e | 14/02/1931 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 46 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5672 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CHYS | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6401 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CHYS | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6654 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CHYS | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | R | 0-6-2T | 38 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | RYR | Radyr | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | CHYS | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | RYR | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5644 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | CHYS | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5684 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | CHYS | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6635 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | RYR | Radyr | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 64 | 4w/e | 14/12/1935 | RYR | Radyr | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | RYR | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5607 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 301 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | RYR | Radyr | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6401 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon |
Steam | B1 | 0-6-2T | 267 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | RYR | Radyr | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 4w/e | 08/02/1936 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 4820 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6433 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | CHYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 301 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | CV.FDL | Ferndale |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2066 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 2721 | 0-6-0PT | 2724 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1420 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1425 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1461 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5605 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5614 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 05/11/1949 | CV.BRY | Barry | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5617 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5623 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5624 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | OXY | Oxley | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5646 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5651 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5658 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5659 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | THT | Treherbert | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | m/e | 30/06/1948 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5661 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 58 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5672 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5681 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5687 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 58 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6402 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83D | Laira | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6416 | 4w/e | 20/04/1946 | CVAYN | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6423 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6433 | 4w/e | 18/05/1946 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6435 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6436 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6615 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 58 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CV.BRY | Barry | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6626 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | m/e | 30/06/1948 | RHY | Rhymney | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6627 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6635 | 4w/e | 11/01/1936 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 84C | Banbury |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6648 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | THT | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6655 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | THT | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6659 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | ||||
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6660 | 4w/e | 01/12/1945 | 58 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | THT | Treherbert | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6661 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | Metro | 2-4-0T | 3597 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | ||||||||
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 1375 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 305 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | on | 01/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 343 | 8w/e | 23/03/1946 | CVCYS | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | on | 05/10/1955 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 344 | 4w/e | 16/11/1935 | rhy | Dowlais Central | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | on | 18/11/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 346 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | on | 05/10/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 347 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | on | 04/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 348 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | RHY | Rhymney | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 360 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | RHY | Rhymney | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 364 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | on | 04/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 367 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | on | 23/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 370 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 4w/e | 07/03/1936 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | RHY | Rhymney |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 375 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 16/06/1951 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 376 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 383 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88E | Abercynon | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 384 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 88F | Treherbert | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 390 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 391 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | on | 03/09/1956 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 393 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 406 | 4w/e | 03/11/1945 | 58 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 88E | Abercynon | |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1461 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 24/01/1948 | CHYS | m/e | 31/03/1948 | CV.AYN | Abercynon |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 301 | 4w/e | 21/02/1948 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | m/e | 31/03/1948 | CHYS | m/e | 12/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5659 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CHYS | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6626 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | RHY | Rhymney | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CHYS | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 433 | on | 15/06/1947 | RYR | Radyr | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CHYS | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | RYR | Radyr |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 348 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | RHY | Rhymney | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CHYS | on | 05/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 360 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | RHY | Rhymney | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CHYS | on | 10/02/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 371 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | RHY | Rhymney | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CHYS | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1461 | m/e | 31/03/1948 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CHYS | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6627 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CHYS | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6660 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CHYS | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6659 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | on | 14/10/1948 | CHYS | m/e | 10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2140 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4601 | on | 15/06/1947 | DID | Didcot | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 54xx | 0-6-0PT | 5411 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CHYS | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 83B | Taunton |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9631 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 23/04/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CV.BRY | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5601 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5636 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5669 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 04/10/1958 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5670 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 17/05/1958 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6612 | on | 15/06/1947 | NPT | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6647 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | m/e | 09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6665 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | on | 06/09/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6682 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXF | Oxford | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | m/e | 02/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6684 | on | 15/06/1947 | STB | Stourbridge Junction | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 345 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | on | 22/09/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 377 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5697 | m/e | 30/04/1948 | DYD | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 2021 | 0-6-0PT | 2140 | 4w/e | 26/03/1949 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 10/09/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1425 | 4w/e | 08/10/1949 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 03/12/1949 | CHYS | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 81F | Oxford |
Steam | P | 0-6-2T | 83 | on | 15/06/1947 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 4w/e | 20/05/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5659 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 286 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5678 | on | 15/06/1947 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7722 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | O4 | 0-6-2T | 286 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88A | m/e | 10/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5678 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7722 | 4w/e | 12/08/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1629 | on | 01/09/1950 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1629 | on | 01/09/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays (New) | 4w/e | 09/09/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5630 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5653 | on | 15/06/1947 | CH | Cae Harris (Dowlais) | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5654 | on | 15/06/1947 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5683 | on | 15/06/1947 | RHY | Rhymney | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5692 | on | 15/06/1947 | RHY | Rhymney | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5630 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5653 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5654 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5683 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | m/e | 03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5692 | 4w/e | 17/10/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3672 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3672 | 4w/e | 04/11/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 87D | Swansea East Dock |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1629 | 4w/e | 30/11/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4618 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 16xx | 0-6-0PT | 1629 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4618 | 4w/e | 02/12/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/12/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 66 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7242 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | A1 | 0-6-2T | 66 | w/e | 31/12/1950 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 73 | m/e | 30/06/1948 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7242 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 73 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 88A | m/e | 07/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6604 | on | 15/06/1947 | LDR | Landore | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 45 | 0-6-2T | 434 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 30/04/1951 | 88A | m/e | 09/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6664 | 4w/e | 28/02/1951 | 88C | Barry | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8420 | 4w/e | 31/08/1950 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8424 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 87F | Llanelli | 3w/e | 19/05/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6603 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 88A | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6626 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 88A | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6603 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6626 | 4w/e | 14/07/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | m/e | 31/07/1951 | 88A | on | 06/09/1964 | 6C | Croes Newydd |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6607 | 4w/e | 31/03/1951 | 86C | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6607 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 88A | m/e | 03/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 58 | 4w/e | 10/07/1948 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 59 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 58 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 59 | 4w/e | 08/09/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 30/09/1951 | 88A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 57 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | m/e | 31/10/1951 | 88A | m/e | 04/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5659 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 8w/e | 03/11/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5617 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8471 | 6w/e | 30/06/1951 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 88A | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5617 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 88A | 3w/e | 17/05/1952 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8471 | 4w/e | 29/12/1951 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 31/01/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 24/03/1962 | 88A | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1461 | 4w/e | 04/09/1948 | CHYS | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8481 | on | 31/03/1952 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9470 | on | 31/03/1952 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8481 | on | 31/03/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays (New) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/01/1960 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9470 | on | 31/03/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays (New) | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 14xx | 0-4-2T | 1461 | 4w/e | 22/03/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 4w/e | 30/04/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8482 | on | 30/04/1952 (New) | 88A | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | ||||
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8482 | on | 30/04/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays (New) | 4w/e | 17/05/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 82D | Westbury |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8484 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 88A | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8484 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 88A | Cardiff Cathays | 7w/e | 31/08/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8489 | 4w/e | 09/08/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5650 | 4w/e | 28/01/1950 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8470 | on | 31/05/1951 | 88C | Barry (New) | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 88A | m/e | 01/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8478 | 2w/e | 12/07/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5639 | 4w/e | 01/11/1952 | 87F | Llanelli | 4w/e | 29/11/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87H | Neyland |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8455 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88C | Barry | ||||
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 362 | on | 15/06/1947 | ABDR | Aberdare | 4w/e | 24/01/1953 | 88A | on | 28/05/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5639 | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 87H | Neyland | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 81E | Didcot |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4581 | 4w/e | 31/01/1951 | 83B | Taunton | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4580 | on | 15/06/1947 | BRD | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 4589 | on | 15/06/1947 | TR | Truro | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8495 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9470 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5511 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5534 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5572 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 83D | Laira |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5663 | on | 15/06/1947 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 31/10/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5568 | on | 15/06/1947 | WTD | Whitland | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7779 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88A | m/e | 10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 80 | on | 15/06/1947 | RHY | Rhymney | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88A | m/e | 02/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7726 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 88A | 4w/e | 09/08/1958 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5680 | 4w/e | 29/02/1952 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8489 | 4w/e | 21/03/1953 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 86H | Aberbeeg |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5677 | on | 15/06/1947 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9747 | on | 15/06/1947 | OXY | Oxley | 4w/e | 27/02/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7249 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7252 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 81F | Oxford | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | AP | 0-6-2T | 79 | on | 15/06/1947 | RHY | Rhymney | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 88A | m/e | 07/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 399 | 4w/e | 25/11/1953 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5793 | 4w/e | 31/12/1949 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 87K | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7249 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 87B | Duffryn Yard |
Steam | 72xx | 2-8-2T | 7252 | 4w/e | 17/07/1954 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5600 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5608 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5610 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.FDL | Ferndale | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6638 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 85C | Hereford | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88A | on | 11/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 378 | 4w/e | 04/12/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 88A | on | 17/12/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 42xx | 2-8-0T | 4224 | 4w/e | 05/09/1953 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 307 | 8w/e | 26/03/1955 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 23/04/1955 | 88A | on | 13/03/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5626 | 4w/e | 26/12/1953 | 87B | Duffryn Yard | 4w/e | 18/06/1955 | 88A | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7772 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86B | Newport Pill |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 9426 | 4w/e | 21/05/1955 | 84E | Tyseley | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 88A | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 86C | Cardiff Canton |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5637 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.AYN | Abercynon | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 88A | 4w/e | 27/02/1960 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6689 | on | 15/06/1947 | STJ | Severn Tunnel Junction | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 88A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4101 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88A | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 88F | Treherbert |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4177 | 4w/e | 31/10/1950 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88A | m/e | 05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 384 | 4w/e | 30/01/1954 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88A | on | 13/02/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 312 | 4w/e | 29/01/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 08/10/1955 | 88A | on | 11/06/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4634 | on | 15/06/1947 | TDU | Tondu | 4w/e | 05/11/1955 | 88A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4105 | 8w/e | 11/07/1953 | 84G | Shrewsbury | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 88A | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 83A | Newton Abbot |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 381 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/12/1955 | 88A | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5627 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 28/01/1956 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5724 | 4w/e | 10/09/1955 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 88A | m/e | 08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 385 | 4w/e | 09/10/1954 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 88A | on | 01/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5636 | 4w/e | 24/03/1956 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 88A | 4w/e | 24/01/1959 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5710 | 4w/e | 17/06/1950 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 88A | m/e | 08/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6435 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 88A | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 387 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 88A | on | 05/11/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5574 | 4w/e | 31/12/1955 | 86H | Aberbeeg | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88A | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6614 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 84E | Tyseley | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88A | m/e | 06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 94xx | 0-6-0PT | 8469 | 4w/e | 14/08/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88A | m/e | 11/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 388 | 4w/e | 15/07/1950 | 88C | Barry | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 88A | on | 01/10/1956 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 361 | on | 15/06/1947 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 14/07/1956 | 88A | on | 29/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4101 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 88F | Treherbert | 4w/e | 08/09/1956 | 88A | 4w/e | 22/02/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7751 | on | 15/06/1947 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 376 | 4w/e | 01/01/1955 | 88C | Barry | 4w/e | 06/10/1956 | 88A | on | 14/01/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6606 | 4w/e | 13/08/1955 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1964 | 88B | Radyr |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6648 | 4w/e | 21/05/1949 | THT | Treherbert | 4w/e | 03/11/1956 | 88A | m/e | 05/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4575 | 2-6-2T | 5545 | 4w/e | 03/10/1953 | 86F | Tondu | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 86F | Tondu |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 5622 | on | 14/10/1948 | CV.BRY | Barry | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88C | Barry |
Steam | A | 0-6-2T | 390 | 4w/e | 11/08/1956 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 26/01/1957 | 88A | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88E | Abercynon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 3727 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88A | Radyr |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4122 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 87E | Landore |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4123 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 22/03/1958 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4124 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 85A | Worcester |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4126 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 84E | Tyseley |
Steam | 5101 | 2-6-2T | 4129 | on | 15/06/1947 | BHD | Birkenhead Mollington Street | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 21/02/1959 | 82C | Swindon |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4672 | 4w/e | 23/02/1957 | 88E | Abercynon | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 4698 | 4w/e | 24/04/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 8w/e | 20/04/1957 | 88A | w/e | 11/03/1959 | 70A | Nine Elms |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6434 | 4w/e | 07/08/1948 | MTHR | Merthyr Tydfil | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 45xx | 2-6-2T | 4553 | m/e | 16/06/1956 | 85B | Gloucester Horton Road | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 5727 | on | 15/06/1947 | SHL | Southall | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 81C | Southall |
Steam | 43xx | 2-6-0 | 7312 | on | 15/06/1947 | CHEL | Cheltenham Malvern Road | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 85C | Hereford |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7738 | 4w/e | 19/06/1954 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 12/06/1958 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9769 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9776 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 88E | Abercynon | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil |
Steam | 64xx | 0-6-0PT | 6434 | 4w/e | 05/10/1957 | 86G | Pontypool Road | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 07/10/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Steam | 56xx | 0-6-2T | 6624 | w/e | 06/09/1952 | 84D | Leamington | 4w/e | 02/11/1957 | 88A | m/e | 06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 7722 | 4w/e | 31/03/1952 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 25/01/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock |
Steam | 57xx | 0-6-0PT | 9679 | 4w/e | 30/11/1957 | 88A | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 88D | Merthyr Tydfil | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3258 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3259 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3260 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3261 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3262 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3263 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3264 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3265 | 4w/e | 10/08/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3266 | 4w/e | 07/09/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3267 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3362 | 4w/e | 13/07/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3363 | on | 24/05/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3364 | on | 24/05/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13365 | on | 31/05/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3366 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3397 | on | 08/11/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3398 | on | 15/11/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3399 | on | 15/11/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3400 | on | 23/11/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3401 | on | 23/11/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | 4w/e | 29/06/1963 | 87C | Danygraig |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3402 | on | 29/11/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3404 | on | 06/12/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3405 | on | 13/12/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3407 | on | 27/12/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3419 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3420 | on | 07/12/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3421 | on | 20/12/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3422 | on | 31/12/1957 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3423 | on | 18/01/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3424 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3425 | on | 20/02/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3426 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3427 | on | 10/03/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3428 | on | 21/03/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock (New) | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3527 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3593 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3594 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3595 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3596 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87F | Llanelli |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3603 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3605 | 4w/e | 16/05/1959 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3606 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | 4w/e | 02/11/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3607 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3747 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3749 | 4w/e | 31/12/1960 | CED | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 02/12/1972 | 86B | Ebbw Junction (Newport) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3823 | 4w/e | 19/05/1962 | 88L | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15101 | 4w/e | 01/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15102 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15103 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15104 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15105 | 4w/e | 27/12/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | D3/11 | 0-6-0 | 15106 | 4w/e | 29/11/1958 | 88B | Cardiff East Dock | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3186 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 15/12/1962 | 88M | 3w/e | 04/05/1964 | 87B | Margam |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3748 | 4w/e | 09/09/1961 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/02/1963 | 88M | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3807 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3808 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 09/03/1963 | 88M | 7w/e | 22/06/1964 | 87F | Llanelli |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3255 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | 4w/e | 20/07/1964 | 87E | Landore |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3256 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3257 | 4w/e | 04/11/1961 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3403 | 4w/e | 14/07/1962 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 4w/e | 06/04/1963 | 88M | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3520 | 4w/e | 06/09/1958 | 83D | Laira | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88M | 4w/e | 27/07/1963 | 87A | Neath (Court Sart) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3809 | 4w/e | 18/06/1960 | 86A | Ebbw Junction (Newport) | 4w/e | 01/06/1963 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3823 | 4w/e | 03/11/1962 | 88M | Cardiff Cathays | 6w/e | 13/04/1964 | 88M | w/e | 29/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton |