Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 1007 Today
» 887 Yesterday
» 6809 Week
» 18046 Month
» 250966 Year
» 1916342 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Chester Northgate


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Chester Northgate Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam C12 4-4-2T 7366       on 01/01/1948 CHRN 4w/e 14/02/1953 35A New England
Steam C13 4-4-2T 7400       on 01/01/1948 CHRN 4w/e 05/11/1955 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam C13 4-4-2T 7413       on 01/01/1948 CHRN w/e 07/12/1957 Withdrawn
Steam C13 4-4-2T 7414       on 01/01/1948 CHRN 8w/e 19/06/1954 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam C13 4-4-2T 7430       on 01/01/1948 CHRN w/e 28/04/1956 Withdrawn
Steam C13 4-4-2T 7436       on 01/01/1948 CHRN w/e 25/02/1956 Withdrawn
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9274       on 01/01/1948 CHRN 4w/e 10/05/1958 34E New England
Steam N5 0-6-2T 9281       on 01/01/1948 CHRN 8w/e 16/07/1955 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam C13 4-4-2T 67433 on 01/01/1948 WRX Wrexham Rhosddu 2w/e 17/06/1950 6D 3w/e 12/11/1955 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.)
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69293 on 01/01/1948 NTH Northwich 4w/e 09/09/1950 6D 4w/e 10/05/1958 34E New England
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69342 on 01/01/1948 LIV Brunswick 4w/e 04/11/1950 6D 4w/e 10/05/1958 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40425 on 01/01/1948 2A Rugby 4w/e 27/01/1951 6D 4w/e 19/05/1951 5A Crewe North
Steam 1P 2-4-2T 46643 on 01/01/1948 7B Bangor 4w/e 27/01/1951 6D 4w/e 19/05/1951 10E Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross)
Steam J10 0-6-0 65140       4w/e 18/04/1953 6D 4w/e 29/12/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam J10 0-6-0 65208       4w/e 18/04/1953 6D 4w/e 29/12/1956 17F  
Steam N5 0-6-2T 69332 on 01/01/1948 STP Heaton Mersey 4w/e 18/04/1953 6D 4w/e 10/05/1958 41A Sheffield Darnall
Steam 2P 4-4-0 40527 4w/e 27/01/1951 5A Crewe North 4w/e 16/05/1953 6D 4w/e 10/12/1953 71H Templecombe (S&D)
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41234       4w/e 05/09/1953 6D 4w/e 08/10/1955 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41235       4w/e 05/09/1953 6D 4w/e 08/10/1955 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41239 4w/e 12/07/1952 6H Bangor 4w/e 05/09/1953 6D 8w/e 19/06/1954 6H Bangor
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41215       4w/e 03/10/1953 6D 4w/e 24/04/1954 6H Bangor
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41216       4w/e 03/10/1953 6D 4w/e 05/11/1955 6K Rhyl
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41215 4w/e 24/04/1954 6H Bangor 8w/e 19/06/1954 6D w/e 09/01/1960 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84001 4w/e 27/03/1954 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 08/10/1955 6D w/e 09/01/1960 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam Standard Class 2 Tank 2-6-2T 84002 4w/e 27/03/1954 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 08/10/1955 6D 4w/e 11/08/1956 1E Bletchley
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41232       4w/e 08/10/1955 6D 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41321 8w/e 16/07/1955 6K Rhyl 4w/e 05/11/1955 6D 4w/e 11/08/1956 2C Warwick
Steam J10 0-6-0 65146 8w/e 11/07/1953 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 05/11/1955 6D 4w/e 29/12/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam J10 0-6-0 65156 4w/e 18/04/1953 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 05/11/1955 6D 4w/e 29/12/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam J10 0-6-0 65170 5w/e 03/01/1953 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 05/11/1955 6D 4w/e 29/12/1956 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48296 4w/e 19/05/1951 5B Crewe South 4w/e 03/12/1955 6D 4w/e 23/03/1957 9G Northwich
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48626 8w/e 19/06/1954 5B Crewe South 4w/e 03/12/1955 6D 4w/e 06/10/1956 5B Crewe South
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41280 4w/e 14/08/1954 26F Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 03/12/1955 6D 4w/e 19/05/1956 26E Lees (Oldham)
Steam J10 0-6-0 65181 4w/e 04/10/1952 9E Trafford Park (LMS) 4w/e 25/02/1956 6D on 06/12/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 8F 2-8-0 48135 4w/e 06/10/1951 9F Heaton Mersey 4w/e 21/04/1956 6D 4w/e 23/03/1957 9G Northwich
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41324 4w/e 21/04/1956 6H Bangor m/e 16/06/1956 6D 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78055       m/e 08/1956 (New) 6D 4w/e 10/08/1957 3A Bescot
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78056       m/e 08/1956 (New) 6D w/e 11/04/1959 6K Rhyl
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41231 4w/e 08/10/1955 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 11/08/1956 6D 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41237 4w/e 09/08/1952 6G Llandudno Junction 4w/e 11/08/1956 6D 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41244 8w/e 16/07/1955 2B Nuneaton 4w/e 11/08/1956 6D 4w/e 03/11/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78057       m/e 09/1956 (New) 6D 4w/e 26/01/1957 6K Rhyl
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78058       m/e 09/1956 (New) 6D w/e 20/06/1959 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78059       m/e 09/1956 (New) 6D w/e 11/04/1959 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78031 m/e 09/1954 11E Lancaster Green Ayre (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6D w/e 20/06/1959 6K Rhyl
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78038 on 20/11/1954 3A Bescot (New) 4w/e 06/10/1956 6D 4w/e 22/03/1958 6K Rhyl
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42417 4w/e 24/04/1954 6H Bangor 4w/e 06/10/1956 6D w/e 09/01/1960 6A Chester (MR)
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40002 4w/e 18/04/1953 1A Willesden 4w/e 03/11/1956 6D 4w/e 16/06/1957 Wolverton Works
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40004 on 01/01/1948 1C Watford 4w/e 03/11/1956 6D 4w/e 23/03/1957 2A Rugby
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40069 4w/e 18/04/1953 1A Willesden 4w/e 03/11/1956 6D 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40070 4w/e 19/05/1956 6E Wrexham Rhosddu 4w/e 03/11/1956 6D 4w/e 10/08/1957 1A Willesden
Steam 3P 2-6-2T 40202 4w/e 08/08/1953 8B Warrington Dallam 4w/e 26/01/1957 6D 4w/e 10/08/1957 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42303 4w/e 23/02/1957 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 10/08/1957 6D w/e 09/01/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42308 4w/e 23/02/1957 6A Chester (MR) 4w/e 10/08/1957 6D on 29/08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42415 4w/e 24/04/1954 6H Bangor 4w/e 10/08/1957 6D w/e 07/11/1959 9B Stockport Edgeley
Steam Standard Class 2 2-6-0 78055 4w/e 10/08/1957 3A Bescot 4w/e 07/09/1957 6D w/e 20/06/1959 6G Llandudno Junction
Steam 2MT 2-6-2T 41323 w/e 15/11/1958 6G Llandudno Junction w/e 25/07/1959 6D w/e 09/01/1960 24J Lancaster Green Ayre
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42317 on 01/01/1948 11D Oxenholme w/e 17/10/1959 6D w/e 09/01/1960 8F Springs Branch (Wigan)
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75030 4w/e 29/12/1956 1E Bletchley w/e 07/11/1959 6D w/e 09/01/1960 1A Willesden
Steam Standard Class 4 4-6-0 75052 m/e 12/1956 1E Bletchley (New) w/e 07/11/1959 6D w/e 09/01/1960 1A Willesden