Depot: Hull Dairycoates
Type | Class | Wheels | Number | Date to Previous Shed | Code | Previous Shed | Date to Hull Dairycoates | Code | Date to Next Shed | Code | Next Shed | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 2004 | m/e | 12/1899 (New) | HLD | on | 29/08/1928 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 2009 | m/e | 06/1900 (New) | HLD | on | 07/07/1931 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 2010 | m/e | 06/1900 (New) | HLD | on | 07/07/1931 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 130 | m/e | 03/1902 (New) | HLD | on | 18/06/1931 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1002 | m/e | 03/1902 (New) | HLD | on | 26/08/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1682 | m/e | 12/1902 (New) | HLD | on | 19/03/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1694 | m/e | 02/1903 (New) | HLD | on | 19/03/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 715 | m/e | 09/1903 (New) | HLD | on | 30/01/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 785 | m/e | 09/1903 (New) | HLD | on | 10/10/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 443 | m/e | 03/1904 (New) | HLD | on | 10/10/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1173 | m/e | 05/1904 (New) | HLD | on | 07/02/1925 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 726 | m/e | 04/1906 (New) | HLD | on | 26/12/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 740 | m/e | 04/1906 (New) | HLD | on | 03/09/1932 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 760 | m/e | 05/1906 (New) | HLD | on | 26/03/1931 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 763 | m/e | 06/1906 (New) | HLD | on | 16/04/1929 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 768 | m/e | 06/1906 (New) | HLD | on | 25/05/1929 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1062 | m/e | 10/1907 (New) | HLD | on | 19/06/1924 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1177 | m/e | 10/1907 (New) | HLD | on | 21/10/1931 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1215 | m/e | 11/1907 (New) | HLD | on | 21/10/1931 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 645 | m/e | 12/1907 (New) | HLD | on | 26/08/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 652 | m/e | 03/1908 (New) | HLD | on | 30/01/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 744 | m/e | 07/1908 (New) | HLD | on | 07/07/1925 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 746 | m/e | 08/1908 (New) | HLD | on | 07/07/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 748 | m/e | 09/1908 (New) | HLD | on | 22/10/1938 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 749 | m/e | 10/1908 (New) | HLD | on | 15/04/1930 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 751 | m/e | 11/1908 (New) | HLD | on | 07/05/1936 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 755 | m/e | 01/1909 (New) | HLD | on | 01/02/1934 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 758 | m/e | 02/1909 (New) | HLD | on | 12/05/1930 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1126 | m/e | 11/1910 (New) | HLD | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 669 | m/e | 07/1911 (New) | HLD | on | 24/05/1927 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 771 | m/e | 09/1911 (New) | HLD | on | 22/10/1931 | MAR | March | ||||
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 773 | m/e | 09/1911 (New) | HLD | on | 15/12/1933 | MEX | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 786 | m/e | 12/1911 (New) | HLD | on | 18/09/1937 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2217 | m/e | 06/1917 (New) | HLD | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2218 | m/e | 06/1917 (New) | HLD | on | 27/11/1933 | HTN | Heaton | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2220 | m/e | 06/1917 (New) | HLD | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2221 | m/e | 06/1917 (New) | HLD | on | 07/10/1939 | SEL | Selby | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2233 | m/e | 08/1918 (New) | HLD | on | 22/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2234 | m/e | 09/1918 (New) | HLD | on | 12/05/1923 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2239 | m/e | 12/1918 (New) | HLD | on | 17/02/1937 | EHL | East Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2241 | m/e | 12/1918 (New) | HLD | on | 18/10/1943 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2246 | m/e | 05/1919 (New) | HLD | on | 13/05/1944 | CUD | Cudworth | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | m/e | 06/1919 (New) | HLD | on | 15/12/1933 | MEX | Mexborough | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2250 | m/e | 07/1919 (New) | HLD | on | 25/03/1940 | CUD | Cudworth | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2252 | m/e | 08/1919 (New) | HLD | on | 08/12/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 901 | m/e | 10/1919 (New) | HLD | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 902 | m/e | 10/1919 (New) | HLD | on | 24/04/1926 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 904 | m/e | 11/1919 (New) | HLD | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 905 | m/e | 11/1919 (New) | HLD | on | 19/07/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2270 | m/e | 04/1920 (New) | HLD | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2272 | m/e | 05/1920 (New) | HLD | on | 29/07/1939 | TDK | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2278 | m/e | 05/1920 (New) | HLD | on | 20/03/1944 | CUD | Cudworth | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2297 | m/e | 12/1920 (New) | HLD | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2301 | m/e | 03/1921 (New) | HLD | on | 17/05/1923 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2244 | on | 18/12/1922 | HLD | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | N9 | 0-6-2T | 1647 | by | 01/01/1923 | HLD | on | 01/01/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 782 | m/e | 12/1911 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 24/10/1923 | HLD | on | 06/09/1926 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 2001 | m/e | 06/1899 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | m/e | 01/1924 | HLD | on | 10/06/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 2003 | m/e | 09/1899 | HTN | Heaton (New) | m/e | 01/1924 | HLD | on | 07/07/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 625 | on | 18/03/1924 (New) | HLD | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 624 | on | 19/03/1924 (New) | HLD | on | 22/09/1924 | DON | Doncaster | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 626 | on | 01/04/1924 (New) | HLD | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 628 | on | 03/04/1924 (New) | HLD | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 629 | on | 08/04/1924 (New) | HLD | on | 24/04/1926 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 630 | on | 16/04/1924 (New) | HLD | on | 24/05/1928 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 815 | m/e | 09/1912 | DON | Doncaster (New) | on | 01/05/1924 | HLD | on | 06/09/1926 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 764 | m/e | 08/1911 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 31/05/1924 | HLD | on | 15/04/1935 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2234 | on | 12/05/1923 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 01/07/1924 | HLD | on | 06/07/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 747 | m/e | 09/1908 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 07/07/1924 | HLD | on | 04/08/1932 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 785 | on | 10/10/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 30/01/1925 | HLD | on | 21/02/1927 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2111 | on | 07/11/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | on | 01/07/1929 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2112 | on | 07/10/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | on | 14/04/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2113 | on | 07/11/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | on | 07/07/1925 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2114 | on | 07/10/1924 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | on | 17/10/1930 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1128 | m/e | 10/1903 | SKN | Stockton (New) | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | on | 19/03/1928 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 443 | on | 10/10/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 07/02/1925 | HLD | on | 12/03/1928 | TSK | Thirsk |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 624 | on | 22/09/1924 | DON | Doncaster | on | 27/02/1925 | HLD | on | 19/07/1928 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1384 | on | 08/05/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 07/07/1925 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2113 | on | 07/07/1925 | SEL | Selby | on | 28/09/1925 | HLD | on | 17/10/1930 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 652 | on | 30/01/1925 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 14/12/1925 | HLD | on | 28/00/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 656 | m/e | 05/1908 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 24/12/1925 | HLD | on | 28/10/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1110 | on | 10/10/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | m/e | 03/1926 | HLD | on | 21/02/1927 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2233 | on | 22/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 03/1926 | HLD | on | 22/02/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 902 | m/e | 10/1919 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 24/04/1926 | HLD | on | 02/03/1927 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q7 | 0-8-0 | 629 | on | 08/04/1924 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates (New) | on | 24/04/1926 | HLD | on | 02/03/1927 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 782 | on | 06/09/1926 | YK | York (North) | on | 22/09/1926 | HLD | on | 21/12/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 815 | on | 06/09/1926 | YK | York (North) | on | 22/09/1926 | HLD | on | 31/05/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1451 | on | 15/10/1926 (New) | HLD | on | 25/11/1927 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1452 | on | 21/10/1926 (New) | HLD | on | 25/11/1927 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1454 | on | 21/10/1926 (New) | HLD | on | 25/11/1927 | BLA | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1291 | on | 22/05/1923 | TDK | Tyne Dock | m/e | 1927 | HLD | on | 02/03/1927 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2264 | on | 17/11/1924 | HLS | Hull Springhead | m/e | 01/1927 | HLD | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 752 | on | 20/09/1926 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 18/02/1927 | HLD | on | 07/04/1927 | TWD | Tweedmouth |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 754 | on | 07/01/1925 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 18/02/1927 | HLD | on | 04/04/1927 | TWD | Tweedmouth |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 756 | on | 07/09/1924 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 18/02/1927 | HLD | on | 21/09/1934 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1247 | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 21/02/1927 | HLD | on | 18/04/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2223 | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 21/02/1927 | HLD | on | 18/12/1933 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2501 | m/e | 03/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 27/05/1927 | HLD | on | 22/10/1928 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2502 | m/e | 08/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 27/05/1927 | HLD | on | 22/10/1928 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2229 | on | 08/03/1924 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 25/08/1927 | HLD | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1939 | on | 11/10/1927 | HLD | on | 02/01/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1976 | on | 27/10/1927 | HLD | on | 15/06/1928 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6616 | on | 29/10/1927 | HLD | on | 24/03/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 925 | m/e | 12/1920 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 25/11/1927 | HLD | on | 01/06/1939 | SCA | Scarborough |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 1962 | on | 30/11/1927 | HLD | on | 15/06/1928 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6578 | 06/1920 | ROD | on | 21/01/1928 | HLD | on | 18/11/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6583 | on | 24/01/1928 | DON | Doncaster | on | 28/01/1928 | HLD | on | 24/03/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6615 | on | 11/02/1928 | HLD | on | 18/11/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6618 | on | 10/03/1928 | HLD | on | 18/11/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6630 | on | 10/03/1928 | HLD | on | 07/04/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6632 | on | 17/03/1928 | HLD | on | 07/04/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 2043 | on | 20/03/1928 | HLD | on | 23/10/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6584 | on | 24/03/1928 | HLD | on | 18/11/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6577 | on | 31/03/1928 | HLD | on | 18/11/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | B14 | 4-6-0 | 2115 | on | 27/02/1925 | YK | York (North) | on | 21/05/1928 | HLD | on | 19/06/1929 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6581 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 26/05/1928 | HLD | on | 27/09/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 936 | m/e | 04/1921 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 15/06/1928 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 942 | on | 28/09/1925 | YK | York (North) | on | 15/06/1928 | HLD | on | 30/05/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6608 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 30/06/1928 | HLD | on | 02/01/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6613 | on | 30/06/1928 | HLD | on | 27/09/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 757 | on | 22/09/1926 | YK | York (North) | on | 19/07/1928 | HLD | on | 03/05/1932 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 738 | on | 04/02/1927 | SKN | Stockton | on | 19/07/1928 | HLD | on | 30/07/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 744 | on | 07/07/1925 | YK | York (North) | on | 19/07/1928 | HLD | on | 15/12/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6612 | on | 11/08/1928 | HLD | on | 23/10/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6609 | 08/1921 | ROD | on | 22/09/1928 | HLD | on | 18/11/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2380 | on | 31/07/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1371 | on | 29/09/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | on | 11/05/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1374 | on | 23/10/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 27/05/1929 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2501 | on | 22/10/1928 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 06/07/1929 | HLD | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 788 | on | 09/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 22/07/1929 | HLD | on | 02/09/1937 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 823 | on | 01/04/1926 | YK | York (North) | on | 22/07/1929 | HLD | on | 21/10/1944 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 928 | m/e | 01/1921 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 01/08/1929 | HLD | on | 06/03/1940 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 933 | on | 22/10/1927 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 09/08/1929 | HLD | on | 04/04/1942 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1376 | on | 31/10/1923 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 29/08/1929 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 909 | m/e | 08/1920 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 30/08/1929 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1375 | on | 30/10/1923 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 16/09/1929 | HLD | on | 06/03/1940 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1378 | on | 15/11/1923 | TWD | Tweedmouth (New) | on | 09/10/1929 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2500 | on | 01/07/1924 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 23/10/1929 | HLD | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2510 | m/e | 10/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 23/10/1929 | HLD | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2512 | m/e | 11/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 12/11/1929 | HLD | on | 01/10/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1362 | m/e | 08/1913 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | on | 18/05/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2224 | m/e | 08/1917 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | on | 18/04/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2226 | m/e | 09/1917 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2251 | m/e | 07/1919 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | on | 20/03/1944 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2273 | m/e | 05/1920 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | on | 21/05/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2283 | m/e | 06/1920 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 18/11/1929 | HLD | on | 20/01/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1276 | on | 02/04/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 02/01/1930 | HLD | on | 18/10/1943 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1361 | on | 08/03/1924 | YK | York (North) | on | 02/01/1930 | HLD | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2503 | m/e | 04/1907 | HLS | Hull Springhead (New) | on | 07/04/1930 | HLD | on | 29/12/1930 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 840 | m/e | 12/1919 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 27/11/1930 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 841 | m/e | 12/1919 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 27/11/1930 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 842 | m/e | 12/1919 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 27/11/1930 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1385 | on | 01/01/1924 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 27/11/1930 | HLD | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2248 | on | 27/11/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 04/12/1930 | HLD | on | 24/06/1939 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2255 | on | 27/11/1930 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 04/12/1930 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2511 | on | 18/11/1929 | SEL | Selby | on | 29/12/1930 | HLD | on | 08/08/1931 | MAR | March |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 930 | m/e | 02/1921 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 934 | m/e | 04/1921 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | on | 27/05/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 937 | m/e | 05/1921 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2367 | on | 17/01/1923 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2369 | on | 08/03/1923 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | on | 30/05/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2379 | on | 30/06/1923 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 30/03/1931 | HLD | on | 04/06/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2500 | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 27/04/1931 | HLD | on | 02/05/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2510 | on | 02/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 30/07/1931 | HLD | on | 06/08/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2501 | on | 01/01/1931 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 06/08/1931 | HLD | on | 13/08/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2511 | on | 08/08/1931 | MAR | March | on | 18/09/1931 | HLD | on | 01/10/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q10 | 0-8-0 | 2502 | on | 15/07/1931 | MAR | March | on | 24/10/1931 | HLD | on | 04/11/1931 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1177 | on | 21/10/1931 | MAR | March | on | 05/02/1932 | HLD | on | 20/09/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 1215 | on | 21/10/1931 | MAR | March | on | 05/02/1932 | HLD | on | 13/06/1935 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 652 | on | 28/00/1931 | MAR | March | on | 05/02/1932 | HLD | on | 20/09/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 656 | on | 28/10/1931 | MAR | March | on | 05/02/1932 | HLD | on | 20/09/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | Q5 | 0-8-0 | 771 | on | 22/10/1931 | MAR | March | on | 05/02/1932 | HLD | on | 20/09/1934 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1170 | m/e | 12/1910 | SBK | Starbeck (New) | on | 12/09/1932 | HLD | on | 04/04/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1179 | on | 12/12/1927 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 12/09/1932 | HLD | on | 06/06/1935 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1195 | m/e | 01/1927 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 12/09/1932 | HLD | on | 06/07/1940 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6580 | on | 05/10/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 11/07/1933 | HLD | S | 01/1936 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6614 | on | 23/10/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 11/07/1933 | HLD | on | 04/12/1935 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6615 | on | 18/11/1929 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 11/07/1933 | HLD | S | 01/1936 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | on | 15/12/1933 | MEX | Mexborough | m/e | 1934 | HLD | on | 02/10/1935 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 906 | m/e | 06/1920 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 16/10/1934 | HLD | on | 26/08/1941 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 843 | m/e | 12/1919 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 18/10/1934 | HLD | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 846 | m/e | 03/1920 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 18/10/1934 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 753 | m/e | 12/1908 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 21/10/1935 | HLD | H | 12/1935 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6580 | on | 11/07/1933 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | S | 01/1936 | HLD | on | 30/10/1936 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6614 | on | 04/12/1935 | CUD | Cudworth | S | 01/1936 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | HTN | Heaton |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6615 | on | 11/07/1933 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | S | 01/1936 | HLD | on | 02/08/1937 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 754 | on | 04/04/1927 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 13/06/1936 | HLD | on | 26/12/1936 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | on | 07/12/1935 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 28/06/1936 | HLD | on | 05/05/1937 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 922 | m/e | 01/1925 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 29/12/1936 | HLD | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1373 | on | 23/06/1931 | YK | York (North) | on | 19/01/1937 | HLD | on | 04/06/1939 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2262 | m/e | 02/1920 | BLA | Blaydon (New) | on | 07/02/1937 | HLD | on | 27/02/1938 | EHL | East Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1262 | on | 18/06/1931 | EHL | East Hartlepool | on | 01/03/1937 | HLD | on | 06/01/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 943 | on | 07/01/1925 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 22/03/1937 | HLD | on | 25/03/1940 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | B13 | 4-6-0 | 759 | on | 05/12/1936 | YK | York (North) | on | 06/05/1937 | HLD | on | 22/10/1938 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1113 | m/e | 10/1910 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 22/06/1937 | HLD | on | 22/10/1944 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 817 | m/e | 10/1912 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/09/1937 | HLD | on | 06/04/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2377 | on | 15/01/1937 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 28/09/1937 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 2365 | m/e | 01/1925 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 30/09/1937 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1487 | on | 18/01/1930 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 22/10/1937 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | Stockton |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1179 | on | 06/06/1935 | GHD | Gateshead | on | 23/10/1937 | HLD | w/e | 30/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 690 | on | 12/10/1933 | MID | Middlesbrough | on | 28/10/1937 | HLD | m/e | 06/1938 | MID | Middlesbrough |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1470 | on | 13/01/1930 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 28/10/1937 | HLD | on | 20/11/1940 | DAR | Darlington |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 686 | on | 23/06/1923 | WBY | Whitby | on | 01/11/1937 | HLD | m/e | 06/1938 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | A6 | 4-6-2T | 688 | on | 13/02/1924 | WBY | Whitby | on | 02/11/1937 | HLD | on | 07/06/1938 | WBY | Whitby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1508 | on | 16/12/1937 (New) | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1114 | on | 10/03/1924 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 14/01/1938 | HLD | on | 06/07/1940 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1509 | on | 25/01/1938 (New) | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | SKN | Stockton | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 1534 | on | 11/11/1936 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/07/1938 | HLD | on | 12/10/1938 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 795 | m/e | 03/1912 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 30/03/1939 | HLD | on | 08/12/1945 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 796 | m/e | 03/1912 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 30/03/1939 | HLD | on | 27/05/1940 | SBK | Starbeck |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 798 | m/e | 06/1912 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 30/03/1939 | HLD | on | 16/10/1945 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 825 | m/e | 03/1913 | HTN | Heaton (New) | on | 30/03/1939 | HLD | on | 26/02/1944 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1185 | m/e | 08/1924 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 10/04/1939 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2261 | on | 27/01/1927 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 12/04/1939 | HLD | on | 06/01/1940 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2287 | m/e | 08/1920 | BOR | Borough Gardens (New) | on | 12/04/1939 | HLD | on | 20/03/1944 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2291 | m/e | 10/1920 | BOR | Borough Gardens (New) | on | 24/04/1939 | HLD | on | 02/03/1940 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1182 | on | 28/09/1938 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 08/06/1939 | HLD | on | 06/03/1955 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1191 | on | 27/09/1938 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 10/06/1939 | HLD | on | 25/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2249 | on | 26/11/1938 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 01/07/1939 | HLD | on | 07/10/1939 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2219 | m/e | 06/1917 | SEL | Selby (New) | on | 07/08/1939 | HLD | on | 18/10/1943 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 820 | on | 10/04/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/03/1940 | HLD | on | 27/12/1947 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 821 | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 06/03/1940 | HLD | on | 02/11/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1382 | on | 13/12/1923 | DAR | Darlington (New) | on | 29/08/1941 | HLD | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 787 | on | 03/10/1938 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 21/12/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 796 | on | 27/05/1940 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 18/12/1945 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 813 | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 18/03/1944 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 819 | m/e | 10/1912 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 21/12/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 822 | on | 14/04/1939 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 05/02/1944 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B15 | 4-6-0 | 824 | on | 20/11/1939 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 27/04/1946 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2234 | on | 06/07/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2275 | on | 10/05/1941 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 27/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2291 | on | 25/05/1940 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 28/03/1943 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1276 | on | 18/10/1943 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 13/05/1944 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2219 | on | 18/10/1943 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 13/05/1944 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2241 | on | 18/10/1943 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 13/05/1944 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2278 | on | 20/03/1944 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 13/05/1944 | HLD | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q1 | 0-8-0T | 5087 | on | 19/07/1944 | MEX | Mexborough | on | 17/09/1944 | HLD | on | 13/12/1944 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 1257 | on | 08/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/11/1944 | HLD | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2228 | on | 14/07/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/11/1944 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2235 | on | 04/12/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/11/1944 | HLD | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2242 | on | 04/12/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/11/1944 | HLD | on | 27/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6566 | on | 20/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/03/1945 | HLD | on | 31/03/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6584 | on | 10/05/1941 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/03/1945 | HLD | on | 15/04/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6265 | on | 08/03/1943 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/03/1945 | HLD | on | 20/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6608 | on | 17/05/1940 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/03/1945 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6612 | on | 11/05/1940 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 05/03/1945 | HLD | on | 20/08/1950 | 53E | Cudworth |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1113 | on | 22/10/1944 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 12/03/1945 | HLD | w/e | 13/10/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 1129 | on | 23/06/1943 | SBK | Starbeck | on | 12/03/1945 | HLD | on | 23/03/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 6350 | on | 02/03/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 04/06/1945 | HLD | on | 26/08/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5404 | on | 02/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 29/04/1946 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6211 | on | 06/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 29/04/1946 | HLD | on | 13/05/1951 | 53E | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6581 | on | 13/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 29/04/1946 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6606 | on | 12/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 29/04/1946 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 5008 | on | 12/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 29/04/1946 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 9772 | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | on | 27/11/1955 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 9778 | on | 24/06/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | on | 03/10/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 9780 | on | 10/04/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | on | 17/06/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 9783 | on | 10/04/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | on | 14/09/1952 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 9788 | on | 04/05/1934 | YK | York (North) | on | 28/07/1946 | HLD | on | 16/10/1955 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2246 | on | 13/05/1944 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 29/07/1946 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 6616 | on | 10/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 29/09/1946 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3408 | on | 20/03/1944 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 29/09/1946 | HLD | on | 05/10/1947 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 2287 | on | 20/03/1944 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 29/09/1946 | HLD | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | K5 | 2-6-0 | 1863 | on | 13/09/1945 | NWE | New England | on | 27/10/1946 | HLD | on | 15/01/1947 | STM | St Margarets |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4867 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/12/1947 | HLD | w/e | 03/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4914 | on | 13/04/1947 | DAR | Darlington | on | 28/12/1947 | HLD | w/e | 03/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 9777 | m/e | 01/1911 | SHI | Shildon (New) | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 12/05/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7171 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 01/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | F4 | 2-4-2T | 7175 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 01/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 5619 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 21/11/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65621 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | ||||||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65631 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50G | Whitby | ||||
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65639 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 07/02/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5647 | on | 13/08/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 53E | Cudworth |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65651 | on | 03/01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 09/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5660 | m/e | 01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 06/03/1948 | HAV | Haverton Hill |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5663 | m/e | 01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5666 | m/e | 08/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 21/01/1950 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5671 | on | 13/08/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5679 | m/e | 01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 31/05/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5705 | m/e | 01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5712 | m/e | 01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 53E | Cudworth |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5713 | on | 12/08/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5690 | m/e | 01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 50G | Whitby |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5698 | m/e | 01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 53E | Cudworth |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 5699 | m/e | 01/1946 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8232 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 04/02/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8242 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 5w/e | 23/04/1955 | 51E | Stockton | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8252 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 15/04/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8277 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 25/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8288 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 25/11/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8304 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 09/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8311 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 08/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8316 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 14/02/1953 | 54C | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8673 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLA | |||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8676 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 28/05/1949 | HLA | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1813 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 09/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1814 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 27/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1819 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1871 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1872 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1874 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 22/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1883 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1892 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 30/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1899 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 13/12/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1902 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 03/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1903 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 23/11/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1920 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 18/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1922 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 07/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1923 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1927 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1932 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1934 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1935 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 23/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1941 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 31/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1945 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 26/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 1965 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9373 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 03/1950 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9374 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9375 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 03/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9376 | m/e | 03/1939 | 91NE | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 21/08/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9377 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9379 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 20/10/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9381 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 28/06/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9382 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 17/07/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9383 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9385 | H | 12/1935 | WAS | Waskerley | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 27/10/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9386 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 28/02/1955 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9389 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 07/07/1952 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9391 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 28/01/1950 | BOR | Borough Gardens | ||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9392 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 54A | Sunderland | ||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9393 | H | 12/1935 | TWD | Tweedmouth | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 27/10/1952 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9396 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9397 | H | 12/1935 | BOR | Borough Gardens | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 08/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9398 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 21/08/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9399 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 04/10/1948 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9401 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 28/08/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9094 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 01/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9096 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 27/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9098 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9104 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 17/03/1958 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9108 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | on | 30/07/1957 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 9912 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 51E | Stockton | ||||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 9915 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 9920 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock | ||||
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 9922 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68137 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 12/1953 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68139 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | m/e | 09/1951 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 8140 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 31/05/1954 | Withdrawn | |||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4867 | on | 28/12/1947 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 03/01/1948 | HLD | on | 20/05/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4914 | on | 28/12/1947 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 03/01/1948 | HLD | on | 21/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4864 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4897 | on | 07/01/1945 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4931 | on | 28/08/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4939 | on | 14/01/1946 | DAR | Darlington | on | 04/01/1948 | HLD | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4864 | on | 04/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | on | 03/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4897 | on | 04/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4931 | on | 04/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4939 | on | 04/01/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/01/1948 | HLD | on | 03/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4870 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 15/02/1948 | HLD | w/e | 21/02/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4870 | on | 15/02/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 21/02/1948 | HLD | on | 24/12/1950 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4928 | on | 28/03/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 01/03/1948 | HLD | w/e | 06/03/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4978 | on | 22/11/1943 | DAR | Darlington | on | 01/03/1948 | HLD | w/e | 06/03/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4928 | on | 01/03/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 06/03/1948 | HLD | on | 26/10/1952 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4978 | on | 01/03/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 06/03/1948 | HLD | on | 20/03/1949 | WHL | West Hartlepool |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61304 | on | 31/03/1948 (New) | HLD | on | 16/05/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61305 | on | 01/04/1948 (New) | HLD | on | 16/05/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61306 | on | 05/04/1948 (New) | HLD | on | 16/05/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4926 | on | 27/07/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 09/05/1948 | HLD | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4927 | on | 16/07/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 09/05/1948 | HLD | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4941 | on | 14/07/1943 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 09/05/1948 | HLD | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4926 | on | 09/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | on | 04/02/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4927 | on | 09/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | on | 04/02/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 4941 | on | 09/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLD | on | 20/05/1951 | 54C | Borough Gardens |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61060 | on | 01/08/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1068 | on | 23/08/1946 | NEV | Neville Hill (New) | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61074 | on | 07/09/1946 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens (New) | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1080 | on | 26/09/1946 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens (New) | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61060 | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLD | on | 24/02/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1068 | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLD | on | 14/02/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61074 | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLD | on | 24/02/1957 | 35B | Grantham |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 1080 | on | 16/05/1948 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLD | on | 15/12/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5027 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 21/08/1948 | HLD | on | 27/02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5037 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 21/08/1948 | HLD | w/e | 23/10/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63014 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLD | w/e | 16/04/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63021 | w/e | 17/04/1948 | CLK | Colwick | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63022 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63026 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5056 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | on | 20/12/1948 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5102 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 51F | West Auckland |
Steam | J24 | 0-6-0 | 65606 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | ||||
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9105 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | GHD | Gateshead |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 9106 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 25/09/1948 | HLD | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9376 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 23/10/1948 | HLD | m/e | 02/1950 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N8 | 0-6-2T | 9398 | w/e | 21/08/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | w/e | 23/10/1948 | HLD | on | 15/10/1951 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5029 | w/e | 21/02/1948 | SBH | Blyth (South) | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HLD | m/e | 05/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 5086 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HLD | m/e | 02/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65112 | on | 01/01/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | w/e | 08/01/1949 | HLD | w/e | 01/10/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63603 | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3753 | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | on | 15/04/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3754 | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3769 | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63828 | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63835 | on | 23/07/1945 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3845 | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3857 | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63881 | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63057 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77055 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 16/04/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63009 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63011 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77390 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77445 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78601 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 16/04/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79182 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79227 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63603 | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3754 | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3769 | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63828 | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63835 | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3845 | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 12/11/1950 | 53E | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3856 | on | 08/09/1946 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 22/10/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 3857 | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 12/11/1950 | 53E | Cudworth |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63881 | on | 06/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 9914 | on | 01/01/1948 | SEL | Selby | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90571 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63129 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63157 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | J21 | 0-6-0 | 65026 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | SBH | Blyth (South) | w/e | 26/03/1949 | HLD | m/e | 10/1949 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 8748 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLA | w/e | 28/05/1949 | HLD | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51A | Darlington | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90006 | w/e | 23/07/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63162 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | TWD | Tweedmouth | w/e | 23/07/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 8298 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 23/07/1949 | HLD | on | 27/03/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64705 | on | 25/11/1927 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64812 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64858 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63348 | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63358 | on | 20/09/1944 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63395 | on | 05/03/1945 | WHL | West Hartlepool | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63431 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3437 | on | 05/10/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63448 | on | 20/07/1947 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64705 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 02/10/1949 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64812 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 02/10/1949 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64858 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 02/10/1949 | BLA | Blaydon |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63348 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 20/11/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63358 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 11/12/1949 | BOR | Borough Gardens |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63395 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 01/12/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63431 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 20/11/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 3437 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 01/12/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | Q6 | 0-8-0 | 63448 | on | 04/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/09/1949 | HLD | on | 24/11/1949 | SEL | Selby |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61404 | m/e | 12/1919 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61408 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1416 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1419 | on | 03/10/1929 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1426 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61430 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61443 | on | 17/04/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1450 | on | 04/06/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1452 | on | 29/06/1936 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1456 | on | 04/06/1939 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1458 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61460 | on | 10/11/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1466 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63740 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63755 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63673 | on | 11/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63676 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63760 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63712 | on | 06/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63849 | on | 05/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63874 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63732 | on | 12/01/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61404 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61408 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1416 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1419 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1423 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1426 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61430 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61441 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61443 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1450 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61451 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1452 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1456 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1458 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61459 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61460 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61462 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61465 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 1466 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | YK | York (North) |
Steam | D7 | 4-4-0 | 5707 | m/e | 05/1933 | Withdrawn | w/e | 17/09/1949 (R) | HLD | |||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68296 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 19/07/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63740 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 05/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63755 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 05/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63673 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63676 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 05/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63760 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 05/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63712 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 05/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63849 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 16/10/1949 | CUD | Cudworth |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63874 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 05/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63732 | on | 11/09/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLD | on | 04/12/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69093 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69099 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | on | 10/02/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69102 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69105 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | N10 | 0-6-2T | 69107 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | w/e | 24/09/1949 | HLD | on | 27/12/1957 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65654 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 01/10/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 54A | Sunderland |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63856 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 22/10/1949 | HLD | on | 05/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90571 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90021 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90006 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90008 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90026 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90272 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90382 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90450 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90478 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90661 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90677 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90695 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69010 | m/e | 12/1949 (New) | HLD | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69011 | m/e | 12/1949 (New) | HLD | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63057 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90571 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90021 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63022 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90006 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | on | 02/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90008 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63009 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63011 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90026 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90272 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77445 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | on | 29/01/1950 | TDK | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 78532 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90382 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90450 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90478 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63162 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 31/08/1951 | 91W | To Western Region / GWR |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90661 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79186 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90677 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79227 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90695 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLD | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 63052 | on | 29/08/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53A | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77104 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53A | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90586 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53A | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90217 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53A | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90007 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53A | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90010 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53A | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90470 | w/e | 04/09/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53A | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 69771 | on | 06/07/1940 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 12/03/1950 | 53A | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 69771 | on | 12/03/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 53A | on | 03/10/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63740 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63754 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 12/11/1950 | 53E | Cudworth |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63755 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63673 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63676 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63760 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63712 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63856 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | O1 | 2-8-0 | 63874 | w/e | 11/02/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63732 | w/e | 10/12/1949 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65712 | w/e | 18/03/1950 | 53E | Cudworth | w/e | 20/08/1950 | 53A | on | 22/10/1950 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90007 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 53A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 53A | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43076 | on | 04/10/1950 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43077 | on | 11/10/1950 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 14/08/1965 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43078 | on | 19/10/1950 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43079 | on | 20/10/1950 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55D | Royston | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90007 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 53A | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | w/e | 24/09/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 53A | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90047 | on | 29/08/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77175 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90435 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79264 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53A | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90047 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77175 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | w/e | 13/02/1960 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90435 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | 4w/e | 15/11/1952 | 51B | Newport (Teeside) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 79264 | 4w/e | 25/11/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 30/11/1950 | 53A | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63620 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 01/01/1951 | 53A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63843 | on | 20/08/1950 | 53E | Cudworth | on | 01/01/1951 | 53A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90072 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 53A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90001 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 53A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65647 | 4w/e | 23/12/1950 | 53E | Cudworth | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 53A | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90072 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90001 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 38B | Annesley |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65647 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63620 | on | 01/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63843 | on | 01/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 36A | Doncaster |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90210 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90026 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 53A | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90272 | w/e | 25/02/1950 | 54B | Tyne Dock | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90210 | w/e | 04/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 17/12/1955 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90272 | w/e | 11/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 17/02/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68673 | w/e | 17/09/1949 | HLA | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 53A | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43100 | on | 28/02/1951 (New) | 53A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56C | Copley Hill (Leeds) | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43101 | on | 28/02/1951 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43102 | on | 02/03/1951 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 14/06/1952 | 51D | Middlesbrough | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68673 | w/e | 25/02/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43103 | on | 09/03/1951 (New) | 53A | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 21A | Saltley | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68673 | w/e | 03/03/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 53A | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 53CALEX | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90233 | w/e | 15/05/1948 | HLS | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 53A | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63667 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | CUD | Cudworth | on | 22/04/1951 | 53A | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63667 | on | 22/04/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | w/e | 28/04/1951 | 53A | on | 02/09/1951 | 40E | Langwith Junction |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90427 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90030 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90008 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90479 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | TWD | Tweedmouth | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90674 | on | 14/07/1947 | WD | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90427 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | w/e | 14/07/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90030 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90008 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | w/e | 10/04/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90479 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51G | Haverton Hill |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90674 | w/e | 05/05/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 19/05/1951 | 53A | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69919 | on | 01/01/1948 | NPT | Newport (Teeside) | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90061 | on | 13/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | on | 19/08/1951 | 53A | on | 21/03/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43122 | on | 21/08/1951 (New) | 53A | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90450 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64713 | on | 28/02/1940 | DON | Doncaster | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 30/11/1952 | 52C | Blaydon |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64725 | w/e | 01/10/1949 | LIN | Lincoln | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 10/10/1954 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64730 | m/e | 30/06/1950 | 40A | Lincoln | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 17/11/1951 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64910 | on | 23/08/1946 | DON | Doncaster | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 18/11/1951 | 51D | Middlesbrough |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61844 | m/e | 31/12/1950 | 31B | March | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61846 | 4w/e | 25/12/1948 | MAR | March | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61847 | w/e | 09/10/1948 | NOR | Norwich Thorpe | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61869 | 5w/e | 26/02/1949 | MAR | March | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61893 | on | 01/01/1948 | MAR | March | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63620 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 16/09/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63673 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 23/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63816 | on | 29/04/1946 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 23/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63823 | on | 05/03/1945 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 16/09/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63835 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 23/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63628 | on | 29/04/1946 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 23/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63881 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | on | 16/09/1951 | 40B | Immingham |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90423 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90430 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90022 | m/e | 31/01/1951 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90078 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77283 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90609 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77497 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90089 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90099 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90382 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90449 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | DAR | Darlington | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90458 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90482 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90695 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 51G | Haverton Hill | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | O4 | 2-8-0 | 63812 | on | 05/03/1945 | HLD | Hull Dairycoates | on | 20/09/1951 | 53A | on | 23/09/1951 | 38A | Colwick |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90423 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90430 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51E | Stockton |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90022 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90078 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77283 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90609 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | on | 17/08/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 77497 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90089 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90099 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90382 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90449 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90450 | w/e | 25/08/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90458 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90482 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90695 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61844 | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61846 | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61847 | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | on | 10/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61869 | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61893 | on | 02/09/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 53A | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43124 | on | 30/09/1951 (New) | 53A | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43125 | on | 30/09/1951 (New) | 53A | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8183 | on | 01/01/1948 | TDK | Tyne Dock | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43127 | on | 12/10/1951 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 34E | Neasden | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90432 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90235 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90432 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 53A | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90235 | w/e | 13/10/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 53A | w/e | 16/02/1952 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 8183 | w/e | 06/10/1951 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 53A | m/e | 01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43128 | on | 31/10/1951 (New) | 53A | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 52B | Heaton | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90704 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 03/11/1951 | 53A | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43126 | on | 05/12/1951 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64709 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | on | 11/02/1952 | 53A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64947 | w/e | 13/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | on | 11/02/1952 | 53A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43015 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 53A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43038 | 4w/e | 16/07/1949 | 19A | Sheffield Grimesthorpe (New) | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 53A | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43015 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43038 | 5w/e | 16/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64709 | on | 11/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | on | 23/11/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64947 | on | 11/02/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | on | 25/04/1954 | 50F | Malton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64971 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 52B | Heaton | 4w/e | 23/02/1952 | 53A | on | 25/06/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43069 | 4w/e | 21/04/1951 | 34E | Neasden | 4w/e | 19/04/1952 | 53A | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 55A | Holbeck (MR) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64703 | on | 25/11/1927 | BLA | Blaydon | on | 06/07/1952 | 53A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64904 | w/e | 08/09/1951 | 51A | Darlington | on | 06/07/1952 | 53A | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64703 | on | 06/07/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 53A | on | 07/12/1952 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64904 | on | 06/07/1952 | 53A | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 53A | on | 07/12/1952 | 52B | Heaton |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12113 | on | 19/07/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12114 | on | 19/07/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12115 | on | 23/08/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12116 | on | 20/09/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12117 | on | 20/09/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12118 | on | 20/09/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12119 | on | 20/09/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12120 | on | 20/09/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12121 | on | 18/10/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12122 | on | 18/10/1952 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 4 | 2-6-0 | 76022 | m/e | 12/1952 (New) | 53A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | ||||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 69781 | on | 16/10/1939 | SKN | Stockton | on | 15/02/1953 | 53A | on | 03/10/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 69787 | on | 01/04/1940 | SKN | Stockton | on | 15/02/1953 | 53A | on | 10/05/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68402 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 53A | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 52D | Tweedmouth | ||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68413 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 53A | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 50C | Selby | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61884 | w/e | 16/10/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 4w/e | 16/05/1953 | 53A | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68281 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 20/06/1953 | 53A | on | 23/11/1953 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13071 | on | 21/11/1953 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13072 | on | 19/12/1953 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13073 | on | 19/12/1953 (New) | 53A | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 52A | Gateshead | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13074 | on | 19/12/1953 (New) | 53A | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68743 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLA | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68747 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLA | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13075 | on | 23/01/1954 (New) | 53A | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13076 | on | 23/01/1954 (New) | 53A | w/e | 08/04/1961 | 52G | Sunderland | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13077 | on | 23/01/1954 (New) | 53A | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13078 | on | 23/01/1954 (New) | 53A | w/e | 29/07/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13079 | on | 23/01/1954 (New) | 53A | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68148 | on | 01/01/1948 | BRI | Bridlington | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 53A | on | 19/12/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13080 | on | 20/02/1954 (New) | 53A | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13081 | on | 20/02/1954 (New) | 53A | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68429 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53A | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 50C | Selby | ||||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68284 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53A | on | 10/10/1955 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68751 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLA | 4w/e | 20/03/1954 | 53A | on | 18/05/1959 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | A7 | 4-6-2T | 69776 | on | 12/03/1945 | HLS | Hull Springhead | on | 21/03/1954 | 53A | on | 02/05/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13070 | on | 21/11/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead (New) | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53A | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68670 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLA | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53A | w/e | 25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68718 | 4w/e | 20/09/1952 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53A | on | 30/06/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68741 | 4w/e | 24/10/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53A | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68753 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLA | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 53A | on | 15/08/1960 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64819 | on | 27/08/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 13/06/1954 | 53A | on | 12/09/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64864 | on | 04/01/1953 | 52C | Blaydon | on | 13/06/1954 | 53A | on | 16/06/1957 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64904 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 52B | Heaton | on | 13/06/1954 | 53A | on | 10/10/1954 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64949 | on | 20/08/1950 | 50B | Neville Hill | on | 13/06/1954 | 53A | on | 16/06/1957 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68182 | w/e | 24/11/1951 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 24/07/1954 | 53A | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 50C | Selby |
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68151 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 23/10/1954 | 53A | w/e | 08/11/1954 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13071 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 53A | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13072 | 4w/e | 20/02/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 53A | w/e | 20/05/1961 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13142 | on | 08/06/1955 (New) | 53A | on | 22/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Diesel | 10 | 0-6-0 | 13143 | on | 08/06/1955 (New) | 53A | on | 22/01/1956 | 51A | Darlington | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65655 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | on | 02/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65693 | 5w/e | 24/04/1954 | 51A | Darlington | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | w/e | 11/03/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65695 | on | 14/05/1950 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 54B | Tyne Dock |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65726 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 51J | Northallerton | 5w/e | 23/07/1955 | 53A | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 50B | Neville Hill |
Steam | Y1 | 0-4-0T | 68145 | on | 01/01/1948 | AUK | West Auckland | 4w/e | 20/08/1955 | 53A | 4w/e | 25/05/1956 | 53D | Bridlington |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61899 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | 4w/e | 17/09/1955 | 53A | on | 18/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68230 | on | 01/01/1948 | YK | York (North) | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 53A | w/e | 25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61904 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 53A | on | 05/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61932 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 52B | Heaton | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 53A | on | 12/02/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Y3 | 0-4-0T | 68160 | on | 01/01/1948 | GHD | Gateshead | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 53A | 4w/e | 17/11/1956 | 96F | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13230 | on | 29/12/1955 (New) | 53A | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13231 | on | 30/12/1955 (New) | 53A | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13232 | on | 12/01/1956 (New) | 53A | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13233 | on | 18/01/1956 (New) | 53A | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13234 | on | 25/01/1956 (New) | 53A | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13235 | on | 02/02/1956 (New) | 53A | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13236 | on | 07/02/1956 (New) | 53A | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | ||||
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65677 | 4w/e | 19/01/1952 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 53A | on | 14/10/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64910 | on | 25/09/1955 | 54A | Sunderland | on | 10/06/1956 | 53A | on | 11/09/1960 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64939 | on | 01/02/1953 | 54A | Sunderland | on | 10/06/1956 | 53A | on | 16/06/1957 | 52B | Heaton |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64940 | on | 25/09/1955 | 54A | Sunderland | on | 10/06/1956 | 53A | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43122 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 51H | Kirkby Stephen | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53A | w/e | 16/05/1959 | 21A | Saltley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90100 | w/e | 13/08/1949 | YK | York (North) | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 53A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90670 | 4w/e | 22/05/1954 | 50C | Selby | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13323 | on | 13/11/1956 (New) | 53A | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61854 | on | 01/01/1948 | CAR | Carlisle Canal | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 53A | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 52D | Tweedmouth |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61857 | on | 01/01/1948 | STM | St Margarets | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 53A | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61897 | w/e | 19/02/1949 | STM | St Margarets | 4w/e | 16/03/1957 | 53A | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68251 | 4w/e | 19/12/1953 | 52B | Heaton | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 53A | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68672 | on | 01/01/1948 | NEV | Neville Hill | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 53A | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68264 | on | 01/01/1948 | HTN | Heaton | 4w/e | 18/05/1957 | 53A | w/e | 25/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65654 | 5w/e | 18/06/1955 | 50B | Neville Hill | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | on | 05/05/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65663 | 4w/e | 12/07/1952 | 50G | Whitby | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65685 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | J25 | 0-6-0 | 65691 | 5w/e | 22/09/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68042 | 5w/e | 24/03/1951 | 50A | York (North) | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | w/e | 23/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69918 | on | 01/01/1948 | SKN | Stockton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | T1 | 4-8-0T | 69921 | 4w/e | 17/09/1955 | 51E | Stockton | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53A | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68746 | w/e | 12/02/1949 | HLA | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53A | on | 15/12/1958 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68752 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLA | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53A | w/e | 01/02/1960 | Withdrawn | ||
Steam | J71 | 0-6-0T | 68251 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 53A | on | 12/01/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 53A | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90677 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 53A | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead |
Steam | J50 | 0-6-0T | 68912 | 4w/e | 08/02/1958 | 56F | Low Moor | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 53A | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53E | Goole |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64947 | on | 12/01/1958 | 56F | Low Moor | on | 08/06/1958 | 53A | on | 11/09/1960 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67280 | 5w/e | 20/04/1957 | 53D | Bridlington | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53A | on | 22/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | G5 | 0-4-4T | 67341 | 4w/e | 09/11/1957 | 53D | Bridlington | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53A | on | 06/11/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68409 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 53A | on | 06/11/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68425 | 4w/e | 08/03/1958 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 19/07/1958 | 53A | on | 11/01/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61065 | on | 15/09/1957 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 14/09/1958 | 53A | on | 01/09/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61256 | on | 15/09/1957 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 14/09/1958 | 53A | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J77 | 0-6-0T | 68414 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 52F | Blyth (North) | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 53A | on | 24/12/1958 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J94 | 0-6-0ST | 68011 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 53A | w/e | 07/01/1961 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90571 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 53A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90217 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | 5w/e | 15/11/1958 | 53A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77000 | 2w/e | 28/12/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 01/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77010 | w/e | 11/10/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead | on | 01/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | 13232 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90427 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90586 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | on | 13/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90352 | 5w/e | 22/10/1955 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90233 | 4w/e | 20/10/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90011 | on | 21/05/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90623 | 5w/e | 21/06/1952 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90378 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90482 | 5w/e | 19/01/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 25/07/1964 | 56A | Wakefield |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90503 | 4w/e | 14/12/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90677 | 4w/e | 10/05/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90688 | 4w/e | 30/06/1950 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90511 | 4w/e | 18/04/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 55D | Royston |
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 68360 | 4w/e | 08/01/1958 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 08/02/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 68361 | 4w/e | 21/04/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 06/12/1958 | 53A | m/e | 10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69008 | 5w/e | 20/07/1957 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 53A | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64943 | w/e | 04/02/1950 | NEV | Neville Hill | on | 22/01/1959 | 53A | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2051 | on | 27/01/1959 (New) | 53A | w/e | 04/04/1970 | 55F | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2052 | on | 04/02/1959 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 13/08/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68672 | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 53A | on | 23/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68741 | 5w/e | 24/08/1957 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 07/02/1959 | 53A | on | 22/06/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2053 | on | 11/04/1959 (New) | 53A | 4w/e | 13/08/1966 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2054 | on | 11/04/1959 (New) | 53A | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 50A | York (North) | ||||
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64831 | w/e | 07/04/1951 | 37A | Ardsley | on | 10/05/1959 | 53A | on | 20/06/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64833 | on | 27/09/1953 | 37A | Ardsley | on | 10/05/1959 | 53A | on | 13/12/1959 | 52G | Sunderland |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77001 | 4w/e | 16/07/1955 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 53A | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61010 | on | 02/11/1946 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 53A | on | 07/11/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61080 | on | 15/12/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 53A | on | 30/03/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61215 | on | 19/07/1947 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens (New) | on | 14/06/1959 | 53A | on | 25/11/1962 | 56B | Ardsley |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61289 | on | 13/01/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 53A | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61306 | w/e | 22/05/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | on | 14/06/1959 | 53A | on | 25/06/1967 | 56F | Low Moor |
Steam | Standard Class 2 Tank | 2-6-2T | 84009 | 8w/e | 16/07/1955 | 20C | Royston | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 6G | Llandudno Junction |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62701 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 24/09/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62707 | 4w/e | 19/10/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 06/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62710 | 5w/e | 22/01/1955 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 03/10/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62717 | 4w/e | 20/01/1951 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 13/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62720 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 06/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62722 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 20/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62723 | on | 01/01/1948 | HLB | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 16/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62760 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 21/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J73 | 0-6-0T | 68363 | 4w/e | 23/01/1954 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 26/10/1959 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67635 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67638 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V1 | 2-6-2T | 67640 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51L | Thornaby |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67663 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67677 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67682 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | w/e | 25/11/1961 | 51A | Darlington |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67684 | 4w/e | 21/09/1957 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 52A | Gateshead |
Steam | V3 | 2-6-2T | 67686 | 3w/e | 16/06/1956 | 53B | Hull Botanic Gardens | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 53A | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43097 | m/e | 01/1951 | 50C | Selby (New) | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | w/e | 04/08/1962 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43098 | on | 31/01/1951 | 50C | Selby (New) | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | 4w/e | 09/10/1965 | 55E | Normanton |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43123 | on | 28/08/1951 | 50C | Selby (New) | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62727 | 4w/e | 21/10/1950 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | on | 16/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62740 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | on | 01/08/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62759 | 5w/e | 18/12/1954 | 50D | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | on | 13/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62763 | w/e | 28/02/1948 | SBK | Starbeck | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | on | 16/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Shire/Hunt | 4-4-0 | 62765 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 50C | Selby | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53A | on | 16/01/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68705 | w/e | 22/08/1959 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 14/11/1959 | 53A | on | 10/11/1960 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64904 | on | 13/09/1959 | 50A | York (North) | on | 22/11/1959 | 53A | on | 11/09/1960 | 50E | Scarborough |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68716 | w/e | 31/01/1959 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 09/01/1960 | 53A | on | 20/02/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47580 | w/e | 31/10/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 16/01/1960 | 53A | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61869 | 4w/e | 20/10/1956 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 50B | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61875 | w/e | 06/11/1948 | HTN | Heaton | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 50B | on | 10/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61923 | 4w/e | 11/10/1958 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 50B | on | 30/04/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61927 | 4w/e | 04/10/1952 | 52B | Heaton | w/e | 23/01/1960 | 50B | on | 17/07/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47632 | w/e | 20/06/1959 | 56D | Mirfield | w/e | 30/01/1960 | 50B | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 2MT | 2-6-2T | 41262 | 4w/e | 11/09/1954 | 25F | Low Moor | w/e | 06/02/1960 | 50B | w/e | 09/11/1963 | 8B | Warrington Dallam |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47334 | w/e | 27/12/1958 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50B | on | 26/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69020 | m/e | 01/1951 | YK | York (North) (New) | w/e | 27/02/1960 | 50B | on | 28/12/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | 3F | 0-6-0T | 47589 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 56B | Ardsley | w/e | 05/03/1960 | 50B | w/e | 18/06/1960 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61305 | on | 14/06/1959 | 50E | Scarborough | on | 20/03/1960 | 50B | on | 21/10/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3944 | on | 31/03/1960 (New) | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3945 | on | 31/03/1960 (New) | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2151 | on | 16/06/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 25/06/1960 | 50B | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2064 | on | 23/07/1959 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50B | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2268 | w/e | 17/10/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50B | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61012 | on | 30/11/1946 | GHD | Gateshead (New) | on | 17/07/1960 | 50B | on | 18/12/1966 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2101 | on | 09/08/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 50B | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2156 | on | 08/08/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 20/08/1960 | 50B | w/e | 28/12/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2100 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2102 | on | 17/08/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 55F | Manningham |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2155 | w/e | 06/08/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | 4w/e | 22/04/1961 | DG | Danygraig |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2157 | on | 16/08/1960 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 27/08/1960 | 50B | w/e | 21/12/1968 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64904 | on | 11/09/1960 | 50E | Scarborough | on | 09/10/1960 | 50B | on | 22/10/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2168 | on | 08/11/1960 (New) | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2169 | on | 15/11/1960 (New) | 50B | 4w/e | 22/06/1968 | 50D | Goole | ||||
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68673 | 4w/e | 21/07/1951 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 50B | on | 08/05/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 68745 | 4w/e | 13/11/1954 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 50B | on | 04/09/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69009 | m/e | 12/1949 | HLA | (New) | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 50B | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69010 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 50B | on | 01/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J72 | 0-6-0T | 69011 | 5w/e | 21/03/1953 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 19/11/1960 | 50B | w/e | 26/01/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2170 | on | 21/11/1960 (New) | 50B | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61901 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 50B | on | 27/12/1961 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61985 | 4w/e | 26/01/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 26/11/1960 | 50B | on | 21/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2171 | on | 28/11/1960 (New) | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2172 | on | 06/12/1960 (New) | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3233 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3675 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3676 | w/e | 29/11/1958 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2173 | on | 14/12/1960 (New) | 50B | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | ||||
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2174 | on | 31/12/1960 (New) | 50B | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | ||||
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43096 | w/e | 24/10/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 50B | w/e | 28/07/1962 | 56D | Mirfield |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61818 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 50B | on | 05/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61986 | w/e | 24/12/1960 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 17/06/1961 | 50B | w/e | 28/05/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61906 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 22/07/1961 | 50B | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61884 | w/e | 21/01/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 50B | w/e | 23/07/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61987 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 05/08/1961 | 50B | on | 19/03/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61854 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50B | on | 29/10/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61952 | 4w/e | 27/12/1952 | 52D | Tweedmouth | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50B | on | 06/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6730 | on | 16/10/1961 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6731 | on | 23/10/1961 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61930 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 50B | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61962 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 50B | on | 19/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | K3 | 2-6-0 | 61969 | w/e | 14/10/1961 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 20/01/1962 | 50B | on | 17/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | J39 | 0-6-0 | 64850 | on | 09/07/1961 | 50F | Malton | on | 25/02/1962 | 50B | on | 03/12/1962 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61255 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 04/03/1962 | 50B | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61303 | on | 14/06/1959 | 51L | Thornaby | on | 04/03/1962 | 50B | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6732 | on | 09/03/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6733 | on | 20/03/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6734 | on | 26/03/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6735 | on | 01/04/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90435 | w/e | 24/02/1962 | 50D | Goole | w/e | 14/04/1962 | 50B | on | 02/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6736 | on | 25/04/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6737 | on | 04/05/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6738 | on | 11/05/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6739 | on | 18/05/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3234 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3236 | 5w/e | 24/03/1956 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 11 | 0-6-0 | 12122 | 4w/e | 19/03/1955 | 53C | Hull Springhead | w/e | 26/05/1962 | 50B | w/e | 29/11/1969 | 40B | Immingham |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6740 | on | 01/06/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6741 | on | 07/06/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 04 | 0-6-0 | D2268 | w/e | 13/05/1961 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 50B | 4w/e | 09/09/1967 | 50D | Goole |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3318 | on | 09/10/1956 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 15/09/1962 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6779 | on | 06/11/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6780 | on | 14/11/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6781 | on | 22/11/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6782 | on | 29/11/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61472 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 20/04/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61418 | on | 01/06/1940 | YK | York (North) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61420 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 23/09/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61435 | m/e | 11/1922 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 21/07/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61437 | on | 04/01/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61438 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61444 | on | 04/05/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61453 | on | 31/08/1923 | YK | York (North) (New) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 17/06/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61463 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 29/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61467 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 02/12/1962 | 50B | on | 08/06/1964 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6783 | on | 05/12/1962 (New) | 50B | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | ||||
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77002 | w/e | 22/12/1962 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 05/01/1963 | 50B | w/e | 21/09/1963 | 55B | Stourton |
Steam | B16 | 4-6-0 | 61475 | on | 28/03/1943 | YK | York (North) | on | 13/01/1963 | 50B | w/e | 15/04/1963 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3235 | w/e | 10/12/1960 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 19/01/1963 | 50B | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2098 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 50B | 4w/e | 20/07/1968 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2081 | on | 05/02/1960 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street (New) | w/e | 08/06/1963 | 50B | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90091 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50B | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90462 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 24/08/1963 | 50B | on | 23/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90172 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 51A | Darlington | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50B | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90092 | w/e | 29/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool | w/e | 31/08/1963 | 50B | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90044 | w/e | 19/09/1959 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | on | 01/12/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90262 | on | 01/07/1950 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90265 | 5w/e | 14/06/1958 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90478 | w/e | 22/11/1958 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 51C | West Hartlepool |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90704 | w/e | 07/11/1959 | 53E | Goole | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50B | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61032 | on | 20/09/1959 | 51A | Darlington | on | 15/12/1963 | 50B | on | 27/11/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61176 | on | 16/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool | on | 15/12/1963 | 50B | on | 06/09/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90057 | w/e | 08/12/1962 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 50B | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90452 | w/e | 22/06/1963 | 52H | Tyne Dock | w/e | 21/12/1963 | 50B | on | 21/06/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2065 | on | 11/08/1959 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 25/01/1964 | 50B | w/e | 21/03/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43138 | w/e | 12/10/1963 | 51F | West Auckland | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 50B | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 50A | York (North) |
Steam | 4MT | 2-6-0 | 43141 | w/e | 19/10/1963 | 51F | West Auckland | w/e | 08/02/1964 | 50B | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 56F | Low Moor |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3313 | on | 25/06/1956 | 50A | York (North) (New) | w/e | 23/05/1964 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6775 | on | 24/09/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 06/06/1964 | 50B | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6783 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 06/06/1964 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6781 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6782 | w/e | 15/06/1963 | 51L | Thornaby | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90213 | 4w/e | 11/08/1951 | 25C | Goole | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50B | on | 13/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90092 | w/e | 30/11/1963 | 50D | Goole | w/e | 13/06/1964 | 50B | on | 11/10/1965 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6758 | on | 10/10/1962 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | w/e | 15/08/1964 | 50B | 4w/e | 27/01/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3070 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 08 | 0-6-0 | D3071 | w/e | 09/07/1960 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 12/09/1964 | 50B | 4w/e | 19/06/1965 | 56G | Bradford Hammerton Street |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90030 | w/e | 16/09/1961 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 27/03/1965 | 50B | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61002 | w/e | 17/11/1951 | 50A | York (North) | on | 06/06/1965 | 50B | on | 24/06/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | B1 | 4-6-0 | 61322 | on | 16/06/1963 | 52A | Gateshead | on | 31/10/1965 | 50B | on | 20/02/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90240 | w/e | 23/06/1962 | 56B | Ardsley | 4w/e | 06/11/1965 | 50B | on | 09/01/1967 | Withdrawn | |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77001 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 55F | Manningham | 4w/e | 06/12/1965 | 50B | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | Standard Class 3 | 2-6-0 | 77012 | w/e | 05/12/1964 | 55F | Manningham | 4w/e | 06/12/1965 | 50B | 4w/e | 01/01/1966 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90016 | 4w/e | 27/02/1965 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 50B | 4w/e | 31/12/1966 | 50D | Goole |
Steam | WD/8 | 2-8-0 | 90479 | w/e | 01/06/1963 | 51C | West Hartlepool | 4w/e | 26/03/1966 | 50B | on | 11/09/1966 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2100 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 21/05/1966 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6835 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6836 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 91N | To North Eastern Region | 4w/e | 03/12/1966 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 55C | Healey Mills |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9503 | on | 30/07/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 29/12/1966 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9504 | on | 08/08/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 29/12/1966 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9505 | on | 12/08/1964 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 29/12/1966 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9516 | 5w/e | 16/05/1965 | 87E | Landore | on | 29/12/1966 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9525 | on | 13/01/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 09/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9546 | 4w/e | 08/08/1965 | 87E | Landore | on | 09/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9547 | 8w/e | 30/10/1966 | 87E | Landore | on | 09/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9551 | on | 02/09/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 12/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9552 | on | 06/09/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 12/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9541 | on | 27/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 18/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9548 | on | 26/07/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 18/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9549 | on | 19/08/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 18/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9550 | on | 27/08/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 18/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9512 | on | 29/09/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 20/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9523 | 7w/e | 07/11/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | on | 20/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9520 | on | 12/11/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 23/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9542 | 4w/e | 13/06/1965 | 87E | Landore | on | 23/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9553 | on | 16/09/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 23/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9554 | on | 06/10/1965 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road (New) | on | 23/01/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6785 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6786 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6787 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6788 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6789 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6790 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/02/1967 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6791 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | w/e | 12/10/1968 | 52A | Gateshead |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6792 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6793 | 4w/e | 05/11/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6794 | on | 27/02/1963 | 52A | Gateshead (New) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6795 | 4w/e | 16/07/1966 | 50A | York (North) | 4w/e | 25/03/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 51L | Thornaby |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9511 | 2w/e | 07/05/1967 | 98S | on | 07/05/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | ||
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9507 | q/e | 15/01/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | m/e | 31/05/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9510 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | m/e | 31/05/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9533 | on | 19/02/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9534 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 86A | Cardiff Canton | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | m/e | 31/05/1967 | To Store | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9537 | on | 16/03/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9539 | on | 09/04/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9532 | on | 18/02/1965 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9533 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9535 | 10w/e | 15/01/1966 | 82A | Bristol Bath Road | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | on | 21/12/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9537 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9539 | 4w/e | 20/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 37 | Co-Co | D6784 | 4w/e | 28/01/1967 | 56B | Healey Mills | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9532 | 2w/e | 31/05/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9543 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9544 | 4w/e | 11/07/1965 | 87E | Landore | 4w/e | 17/06/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9540 | 2w/e | 15/01/1967 | 87E | Landore | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9540 | m/e | 30/06/1967 | 50B | Hull Dairycoates | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9545 | on | 08/06/1965 | 87E | Landore (New) | 4w/e | 15/07/1967 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2155 | 4w/e | 22/04/1967 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 50B | 4w/e | 24/02/1968 | 51A | Darlington |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2170 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 50B | w/e | 23/11/1968 | 55H | Neville Hill |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2174 | w/e | 03/03/1962 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens | 4w/e | 02/12/1967 | 50B | w/e | 26/09/1970 | 50C | Hull Botanic Gardens |
Diesel | 14 | 0-6-0 | D9515 | on | 17/10/1964 | 86A | Cardiff Canton (New) | on | 08/01/1968 | 50B | on | 01/04/1968 | Withdrawn | |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8310 | on | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8311 | on | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8312 | on | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8313 | on | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8314 | on | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 27/04/1968 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 20 | Bo-Bo | D8315 | on | 20/05/1967 | 51L | Thornaby (New) | 4w/e | 25/05/1968 | 50B | w/e | 11/10/1969 | 41A | Tinsley |
Diesel | 03 | 0-6-0 | D2062 | w/e | 11/07/1959 | 50A | York (North) | w/e | 01/03/1969 | 50B | w/e | 13/12/1969 | 41E | Staveley (Barrow Hill) |