Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

Advertising



Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 55 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4970 Week
» 16207 Month
» 249127 Year
» 1914503 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Depot: Dover Marine


Type Class Wheels Number Date to Previous Shed Code Previous Shed Date to Dover Marine Code Date to Next Shed Code Next Shed
Steam B4 0-4-0T 83       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 07/10/1950 74A Ashford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 767       on 01/01/1948 DOV 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 768       on 01/01/1948 DOV 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 769       on 01/01/1948 DOV 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 770       on 01/01/1948 DOV 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 771       on 01/01/1948 DOV 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Schools 4-4-0 924       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 925       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 926       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 17/06/1950 74C Dover Marine
Steam Schools 4-4-0 927       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam P 0-6-0T 1027       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 19/03/1952 71A Eastleigh
Steam H 0-4-4T 1161       on 01/01/1948 DOV 5w/e 14/02/1953 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam D1 4-4-0 1246       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C Dover Marine
Steam C 0-6-0 1252       on 01/01/1948 DOV 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 1255       on 01/01/1948 DOV 7w/e 27/06/1951 73E Faversham
Steam H 0-4-4T 1276       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 1291       on 01/01/1948 DOV 7w/e 27/06/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam P 0-6-0T 1325       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 05/02/1951 75A Brighton
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1443       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 03/1951 Withdrawn
Steam Flying Bedsteads 4-4-0 1450       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 04/1948 Withdrawn
Steam D1 4-4-0 1470       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 01/10/1953 73E Faversham
Steam H 0-4-4T 1512       on 01/01/1948 DOV 7w/e 19/12/1955 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam H 0-4-4T 1517       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 06/10/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 1520       on 01/01/1948 DOV 6w/e 20/03/1951 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam H 0-4-4T 1530       on 01/01/1948 DOV 8w/e 20/07/1953 74D Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 1531       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 04/1955 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 1532       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 08/12/1950 73E Faversham
Steam D1 4-4-0 1545       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 05/02/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam H 0-4-4T 1548       on 01/01/1948 DOV q/e 06/06/1958 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam P 0-6-0T 1555       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 07/10/1950 74C Dover Marine
Steam P 0-6-0T 1556       on 01/01/1948 DOV w/e 24/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 1673       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 10/1952 Withdrawn
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1705       on 01/01/1948 DOV w/e 09/06/1951 Withdrawn
Steam R1 0-4-4T 1708       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 12/05/1951 73E Faversham
Steam D1 4-4-0 1727       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 11/04/1951 74D Tonbridge
Steam D1 4-4-0 1735       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 05/02/1951 73D Gillingham (Kent)
Steam L1 4-4-0 1753       on 01/01/1948 DOV 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam L1 4-4-0 1754       on 01/01/1948 DOV 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam L1 4-4-0 1755       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 17/06/1950 74C Dover Marine
Steam L1 4-4-0 1756       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford
Steam L1 4-4-0 1757       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1819       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 10/02/1961 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1820       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 10/02/1961 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1821       on 01/01/1948 DOV 3w/e 26/05/1961 75C Norwood Junction
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 1823       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 27/07/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2108       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 17/12/1956 71A Eastleigh
Steam E2 0-6-0T 2109       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 17/12/1956 71A Eastleigh
Steam D Tanks 0-4-2T 2359       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31373       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31381       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 05/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 1065       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 27/07/1951 74A Ashford
Steam O1 0-6-0 31108       on 01/01/1948 DOV m/e 07/1951 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C156       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 30/06/1949 BAT Stewarts Lane
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 21C157       on 01/01/1948 DOV 4w/e 11/04/1951 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30926 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 17/06/1950 74C 4w/e 07/10/1950 74B Ramsgate
Steam L1 4-4-0 1755 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 17/06/1950 74C 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford
Steam O1 0-6-0 31383 on 01/01/1948 EKR East Kent Railway 4w/e 09/09/1950 74C w/e 07/04/1951 Withdrawn
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34074       4w/e 09/09/1950 74C 4w/e 07/10/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34075       4w/e 09/09/1950 74C 4w/e 07/10/1950 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam P 0-6-0T 31555 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 07/10/1950 74C 5w/e 11/12/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42075       on 30/11/1950 (New) 74C 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A Brighton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42076       on 07/12/1950 (New) 74C w/e 05/12/1959 6H Bangor
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30794 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30795 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30796 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30926 4w/e 07/10/1950 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam German Engines 4-4-0 31767 4w/e 17/06/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C 4w/e 05/02/1951 74E St Leonards
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31859 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 4w/e 08/12/1950 74C 4w/e 27/07/1951 73C Hither Green
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42077       on 14/12/1950 (New) 74C 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A Brighton
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42078       on 21/12/1950 (New) 74C w/e 05/12/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42079       on 04/01/1951 (New) 74C 6w/e 22/10/1959 73F Ashford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30772 4w/e 08/12/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30773 4w/e 08/12/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30774 on 01/01/1948 9E Nine Elms 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 9w/e 30/06/1952 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30775 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70B Feltham
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30776 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C w/e 24/01/1959 Withdrawn
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30922 4w/e 07/10/1950 74E St Leonards 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 4w/e 07/10/1950 74E St Leonards 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam D1 4-4-0 31145 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 4w/e 17/12/1956 70C Guildford
Steam P 0-6-0T 1178 on 01/01/1948 BTN Brighton 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 7w/e 08/10/1957 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam D1 4-4-0 31246 on 01/01/1948 DOV Dover Marine 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 4w/e 10/10/1955 74D Tonbridge
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34074 4w/e 07/10/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 4w/e 24/02/1958 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34075 4w/e 07/10/1950 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 05/02/1951 74C 9w/e 30/06/1952 74B Ramsgate
Steam R1 0-6-0T 31339 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 4w/e 12/05/1951 74C 7w/e 27/06/1951 74A Ashford
Steam S 0-4-0ST 31685 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 12/05/1951 74C m/e 10/1951 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30796 4w/e 05/02/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30797 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C 6w/e 27/03/1953 74A Ashford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30798 4w/e 12/05/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam R1 0-6-0T 31047 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31150 on 01/01/1948 TON Tonbridge 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham
Steam C 0-6-0 31317 4w/e 12/05/1951 73E Faversham 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C 9w/e 12/06/1957 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31817 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951 74C 4w/e 10/10/1955 75B Redhill
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31818 on 01/01/1948 RED Redhill 4w/e 27/07/1951 74C m/e 10/02/1961 73J Tonbridge
Steam O1 0-6-0 31369 on 01/01/1948 FAV Faversham 4w/e 27/07/1951 74C m/e 09/1951 Withdrawn
Steam O1 0-6-0 31258 on 01/01/1948 HIT Hither Green 4w/e 27/07/1951 74C 9w/e 12/06/1957 74A Ashford
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30777 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70B Feltham
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30778 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C 8w/e 20/07/1953 70A Nine Elms
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30779 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C 8w/e 20/07/1953 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C 4w/e 19/03/1952 74C Dover Marine
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30924 4w/e 12/05/1951 73B Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C 4w/e 19/03/1952 74C Dover Marine
Steam Large Radials 0-6-2T 32593 4w/e 05/02/1951 75G Eastbourne 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C w/e 14/01/1956 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42073 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C 6w/e 13/08/1952 74A Ashford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42074 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C 6w/e 21/06/1955 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 19/03/1952 74C 5w/e 11/12/1952 74E St Leonards
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30924 4w/e 06/10/1951 74C Dover Marine 4w/e 19/03/1952 74C 9w/e 30/06/1952 73B Bricklayers Arms
Steam H 0-4-4T 31328 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 19/03/1952 74C 4w/e 08/07/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30918 4w/e 06/10/1951 74B Ramsgate 9w/e 30/06/1952 74C 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate
Steam R1 0-6-0T 31069 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 9w/e 30/06/1952 74C w/e 07/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31521 on 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 9w/e 30/06/1952 74C 4w/e 26/05/1953 74A Ashford
Steam L1 4-4-0 31755 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford 9w/e 30/06/1952 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam L1 4-4-0 31756 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford 9w/e 30/06/1952 74C 8w/e 07/10/1952 74B Ramsgate
Steam L1 4-4-0 31757 4w/e 21/01/1952 74A Ashford 9w/e 30/06/1952 74C 8w/e 07/10/1952 74B Ramsgate
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30923 5w/e 11/12/1952 74E St Leonards 4w/e 08/01/1953 74C 3w/e 17/11/1956 74E St Leonards
Steam Z 0-8-0T 30952 on 01/01/1948 ELH Eastleigh 5w/e 14/02/1953 74C 4w/e 01/10/1953 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30769 7w/e 27/06/1951 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 27/03/1953 74C 8w/e 20/07/1953 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30918 6w/e 27/03/1953 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 26/05/1953 74C 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C Dover Marine
Steam H 0-4-4T 31278 4w/e 12/05/1951 74A Ashford 4w/e 26/05/1953 74C 7w/e 20/04/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30797 6w/e 27/03/1953 74A Ashford 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C m/e 08/1959 Withdrawn
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30798 7w/e 27/06/1951 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 72B Salisbury
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30918 4w/e 26/05/1953 74C Dover Marine 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C 6w/e 18/06/1954 74B Ramsgate
Steam P 0-6-0T 31027 9w/e 30/06/1952 71D Fratton 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C w/e 25/03/1961 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31329 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C 7w/e 20/04/1956 75F Tunbridge Wells West
Steam Bob Tails 0-4-4T 31661 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C m/e 09/1955 Withdrawn
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42075 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C 7w/e 19/12/1955 74B Ramsgate
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42077 6w/e 27/03/1953 75A Brighton 8w/e 20/07/1953 74C 4w/e 10/12/1953 75B Redhill
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42077 4w/e 10/12/1953 75B Redhill 4w/e 08/02/1954 74C w/e 05/12/1959 6C Birkenhead Mollington Street
Steam B4 0-4-0T 30086 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 8w/e 13/05/1954 74C 5w/e 12/08/1955 70C Guildford
Steam O1 0-6-0 31065 4w/e 27/07/1951 74A Ashford 6w/e 18/06/1954 74C w/e 24/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31407 4w/e 05/02/1951 74A Ashford 6w/e 21/06/1955 74C 4w/e 10/10/1955 74A Ashford
Steam L1 4-4-0 31788 6w/e 18/06/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 21/06/1955 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam L1 4-4-0 31789 6w/e 18/06/1954 73B Bricklayers Arms 6w/e 21/06/1955 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34070 on 01/01/1948 RAM Ramsgate 6w/e 21/06/1955 74C 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34071       6w/e 21/06/1955 74C 8w/e 17/01/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam R1 0-6-0T 31147 9w/e 30/06/1952 74A Ashford 4w/e 10/10/1955 74C m/e 09/1958 Withdrawn
Steam R1 0-6-0T 31339 7w/e 27/06/1951 74A Ashford 4w/e 10/10/1955 74C w/e 14/06/1958 Withdrawn
Steam H 0-4-4T 31542 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 3w/e 17/11/1956 74C 4w/e 08/07/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34103       3w/e 17/11/1956 74C 8w/e 17/01/1961 71B Bournemouth
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34104       3w/e 17/11/1956 74C 4w/e 24/02/1958 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42075 6w/e 15/06/1956 75A Brighton 3w/e 17/11/1956 74C w/e 05/12/1959 6H Bangor
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30804 on 01/01/1948 AFD Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam King Arthur 4-6-0 30805 4w/e 17/06/1950 74A Ashford 9w/e 12/06/1957 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 71A Eastleigh
Steam O1 0-6-0 31258 9w/e 12/06/1957 74A Ashford 5w/e 19/07/1957 74C m/e 02/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 11220 on 10/04/1957 73C Hither Green (New) 7w/e 08/10/1957 74C 5w/e 10/06/1960 73F Ashford
Steam R1 0-6-0T 31010 5w/e 12/08/1955 74E St Leonards 7w/e 08/10/1957 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam R1 0-6-0T 31174 on 01/01/1948 STL St Leonards 7w/e 08/10/1957 74C 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34083 4w/e 12/05/1951 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 24/02/1958 74C 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34085 4w/e 12/05/1951 74B Ramsgate 4w/e 24/02/1958 74C 4w/e 22/03/1958 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34086 7w/e 08/10/1957 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/02/1958 74C 4w/e 22/03/1958 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34082 4w/e 14/01/1958 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 22/03/1958 74C 3w/e 26/05/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34084 4w/e 24/02/1958 73A Stewarts Lane 4w/e 22/03/1958 74C 4w/e 24/11/1960 72A Exmouth Junction
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42092 3w/e 17/11/1956 74A Ashford q/e 06/06/1958 74C 3w/e 13/10/1958 73H Dover Marine
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42095 4w/e 06/10/1951 74A Ashford q/e 06/06/1958 74C 3w/e 13/10/1958 73H Dover Marine
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42092 q/e 06/06/1958 74C Dover Marine 3w/e 13/10/1958 73H 6w/e 22/10/1959 73F Ashford
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42095 q/e 06/06/1958 74C Dover Marine 3w/e 13/10/1958 73H 6w/e 22/10/1959 73F Ashford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4601 4w/e 30/11/1957 88E Abercynon w/e 11/03/1959 73H m/e 09/11/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4610 4w/e 26/01/1957 88C Barry w/e 11/03/1959 73H 2w/e 10/10/1961 70B Feltham
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4616 4w/e 29/11/1958 88C Barry w/e 11/03/1959 73H 2w/e 10/10/1961 70D Basingstoke
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4626 4w/e 07/09/1957 88E Abercynon w/e 11/03/1959 73H m/e 09/11/1961 72B Salisbury
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4630 3w/e 19/05/1951 88D Merthyr Tydfil w/e 11/03/1959 73H m/e 09/11/1961 72B Salisbury
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 4631 4w/e 07/09/1957 88E Abercynon w/e 11/03/1959 73H m/e 09/11/1961 73A Stewarts Lane
Steam 4P 2-6-4T 42074 4w/e 22/03/1958 75E Three Bridges w/e 11/03/1959 73H w/e 05/12/1959 6H Bangor
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30938 q/e 06/06/1958 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H 4w/e 08/07/1960 73F Ashford
Steam Schools 4-4-0 30939 q/e 06/06/1958 73A Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H 4w/e 08/07/1960 73F Ashford
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31413 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31414 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H 8w/e 17/01/1961 70B Feltham
Steam Mongolipers 2-6-0 31810 on 01/01/1948 BAT Stewarts Lane 6w/e 14/06/1959 73H 3w/e 26/05/1961 71A Eastleigh
Steam C 0-6-0 31112 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/08/1959 73H 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford
Steam H 0-4-4T 31326 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/08/1959 73H 4w/e 08/07/1960 70A Nine Elms
Steam C 0-6-0 31481 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 4w/e 19/08/1959 73H 4w/e 08/07/1960 70B Feltham
Steam C 0-6-0 31720 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 22/10/1959 73H 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80043 on 24/07/1952 1E Bletchley (New) 5w/e 31/12/1959 73H 6w/e 09/02/1960 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80059 4w/e 04/10/1958 14D Neasden 5w/e 31/12/1959 73H 6w/e 09/02/1960 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80064 on 09/06/1953 1C Watford (New) 5w/e 31/12/1959 73H 6w/e 09/02/1960 73F Ashford
Steam Standard Class 4 Tank 2-6-4T 80065 on 25/06/1953 1C Watford (New) 5w/e 31/12/1959 73H 6w/e 09/02/1960 73F Ashford
Steam C 0-6-0 31004 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73H 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford
Steam O1 0-6-0 31370 m/e 02/1960 Withdrawn 6w/e 09/02/1960 (R) 73H      
Steam O1 0-6-0 31048 6w/e 14/06/1959 70A Nine Elms 6w/e 09/02/1960 73H w/e 15/10/1960 Withdrawn
Steam E6 0-6-2T 32410 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/03/1960 73H w/e 17/06/1961 Withdrawn
Steam E6 0-6-2T 32415 on 01/01/1948 BA Bricklayers Arms 4w/e 10/03/1960 73H w/e 23/09/1961 Withdrawn
Diesel 04 0-6-0 D2287       on 09/04/1960 (New) 73H 5w/e 10/06/1960 73F Ashford
Steam 57xx 0-6-0PT 3633 5w/e 31/12/1959 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 06/05/1960 73H 2w/e 10/10/1961 70A Nine Elms
Steam West Country/Battle of Britain 4-6-2 34061 7w/e 27/06/1951 72A Exmouth Junction 4w/e 24/11/1960 73H 3w/e 26/05/1961 73F Ashford